American Lecithin Company et al v. Rebmann
Plaintiff: American Lecithin Company, Lipoid GmbH, Lipoid, LLC and Phospholipid GmbH
Defendant: Carsten Matthias Rebmann
Case Number: 1:2012cv00929
Filed: February 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Jed S. Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER, As stated in today's hearing, this action is hereby STAYED for 60 days so that Defendant Carsten Matthias Rebmann ("Matthias") may retain new counsel; Matthias' current counsel's application to withdraw as counsel i n this action, (Doc. 303), is GRANTED; and I will hold another conference on July 13, 2022 at 2 p.m. using the dial-in 888-363-4749 and the access code 2682448. SO ORDERED. Attorney Samuel Goldman terminated., ( Telephone Conference set for 7/13/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/10/2022) (kv)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER: Within thirty days of entry of this order, the parties shall file a joint letter informing me as to the status of this action. In particular, the parties should inform me whether discovery is still ongoing, and if so, they must explain (1) w hy the parties have been unable to complete discovery; (2) what discovery remains outstanding; and (3) how much time the parties anticipate needing to complete discovery. In addition, if discovery is still ongoing, the parties must file with their letter a proposed amended case management plan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/3/2022) (kv)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/23/2020) (rjm)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER: The parties in this matter were directed to appear before me for a telephonic post-discovery conference on September 3, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The conference did not proceed as scheduled. It is hereby: ORDERED the parties are directed to appear for a rescheduled telephonic post-discovery conference on September 11, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall enter the conference by dialing 1-888-363-4749 and entering access code 2682448. ( Telephone Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/9/2020) (cf)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 OPINION AND ORDER re: 270 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . filed by HERBERT REBMANN, 282 SECOND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Amended. filed by Carsten Matthias Rebmann. Because there is a triable issue of fac t as to whether, among other things, Dr. Rebmann personally participated in the alleged conversion of Plaintiff's shares, Dr. Rebmann's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART a nd DENIED IN PART. Because there is an issue of fact as to whether Defendant has retained the domain names at issue in bad faith, his motion for summary judgment dismissing Plaintiffs' cybersquatting claim is DENIED. Because there are multiple i ssues of fact as to Plaintiffs' conversion and breach of fiduciary duty claims relating to the domain names, Defendant's motion for summary judgment dismissing those claims is DENIED. Because there are disputes of fact as to Defendant' s affirmative defenses of laches and unclean hands, his motion for summary judgment dismissing Plaintiffs' claims for injunctive relief is DENIED. The remainder of the motion is GRANTED. Because Defendant undisputedly purchased the Laptop from P laintiffs and becausehis retention of the Laptop and CRM Software undisputedly did not interfere with Plaintiffs' rights, Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' claim of conversion is GRANTED and that claim is DISMI SSED. Because Plaintiffs have pointed to no evidence in the record demonstrating damages, Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs claims for breach of fiduciary duty relating to the Laptop and the CRM Software is GRANTED. The pa rties are directed to appear for a telephonic post-discovery conference on August 27, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall enter the conference by dialing 1-888-363-4749 and entering access code 2682448. The parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter on or before August 20, 2020, (1) stating whether they seek to conduct any additional discovery on Plaintiffs' claims and on Defendant's counterclaims and third-party claims, and if so setting forth what discovery they seek, a nd detailing any disputes as to the purportedly outstanding discovery; (2) if there are no issues as to discovery, (a) proposing trial dates38 beginning in or after October 2020, (b) setting forth a proposed schedule for submission of a joint pretria l order and motions in limine, and (c) indicating whether they intend to call any witnesses who reside abroad, and if so whether those witnesses will appear in person or by deposition; and (3) indicating whether they wish to be referred to a magistra te judge for settlement. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at Document 270 and 274. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/24/2020) (kv)
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: For the foregoing reasons: Movants' motion to dismiss for forum non conveniens is DENIED. Movants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is DENIED. Movants' motion to dismiss for lack of p ersonal jurisdiction and insufficient process is GRANTED with respect to a Lipoid V, Lipoid G, Lipoid B, Lipoid S, and Phospholipid F, and is DENIED with respect to Dr. Rebmann. 1. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for wrongf ul termination is DENIED; 2. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for breach of contract relating to Defendant's employment is GRANTED; 3. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for breach of contract relating to Defendant's equity in the Lipoid Group is GRANTED; 4. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for fraud is GRANTED; 5. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for breach of fiduciary duties is GRANTED; 6. Mova nts' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for oppression is GRANTED; 7. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for tortious interference with business relations is GRANTED; 8. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant' ;s claim for misappropriation is GRANTED; 9. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for conversion is DENIED; 10. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for defamation is GRANTED; 11. Movants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim for appraisal and accounting is DENIED solely with respect to information sufficient to establish the value of Defendant's former 10% equity interest in Lipoid G, and is GRANTED in all other respects; and 12. Movan ts' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's claim on behalf of Lipoid G for breach of fiduciary duties is GRANTED. In light of the fact that the SAA represents Defendant's third attempt to adequately state a claim, and he has already been affo rded two opportunities to re-plead, the dismissals set forth herein are made with prejudice. The Clerk's Office is respectfully directed to terminate Docs. 170, 197, and 214. The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on Octob er 27, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 518 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. The parties are further directed to submit a joint letter on or before October 20, 2017, addressing: (1) the st atus of discovery on Plaintiff's original claims; (2) a proposed schedule for completing discovery on the remaining counterclaims/third-party claims; (3) the status of settlement discussions, if any; and (4) any other issue the parties wish to address at the October 27 conference. ( Status Conference set for 10/27/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 518, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/30/2017) (rj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Lecithin Company et al v. Rebmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Lecithin Company
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lipoid GmbH
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lipoid, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phospholipid GmbH
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carsten Matthias Rebmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?