Eastman Kodak Company v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Eastman Kodak Company
Defendant: Apple Inc. and FlashPoint Technology, Inc.
Intervenor: Second Lien Notes Trustee and Second Lien Noteholders Committee
Miscellaneous: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Eastman Kodak Company, et al.
Cross_defendant: Apple Inc.
Counter_claimant: FlashPoint Technology, Inc. and Apple Inc.
Cross_claimant: FlashPoint Technology, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Debtor: Eastman Kodak Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv04881
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: George B. Daniels
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2012 34 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 7/26/2012 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 6, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion for Michael D. Warner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/06/2012) (ama)
August 1, 2012 32 MOTION for Michael D. Warner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7694992. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FlashPoint Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Warner, Michael)
July 30, 2012 31 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Eastman Kodak Company. Document filed by Apple Inc..(Lennon, Brian)
July 30, 2012 30 ANSWER to 4 Crossclaim. Document filed by Apple Inc..(Lennon, Brian)
July 27, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER denying 27 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Flashpoint Technologies, Inc.'s ex parte motion to consolidate cases 12-CV-4881 and 12-CV-5047 is DENIED without prejudice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/27/2012) (pl)
July 27, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER denying 1 Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference. Apple Inc.'s motion to withdraw the reference to the bankruptcy court is DENIED without prejudice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/27/2012) (pl)
July 26, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 7/26/2012 re: (1 in 1:12-cv-05047-GBD) MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 12-1720A, 12-B-10202 (ALG). filed by FlashPoint Technology, Inc., (1 in 1:12-cv-04881-GBD) MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 12-1720A, 12-B-10202 (ALG) filed by Apple Inc. (cd)
July 13, 2012 27 EX PARTE MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-5047 / Flashpoint Technology, Inc.s Ex Parte Motion to Consolidate Civ. Action Nos. 12-4881 (GBD) and 12-5047 (GBD) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). Document filed by FlashPoint Technology, Inc..(Kovsky-Apap, Deborah)
July 11, 2012 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Other Documents served on Counsel to Eastman Kodak Company, Counsel to Apple, Inc., Counsel to Flashpoint Technology, Counsel to the Second Lien Noteholders Committee on July 10, 2012. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Eastman Kodak Company, et al.. (Oswald, Frank)
July 10, 2012 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Eastman Kodak Company, et al. (Oswald, Frank)
July 10, 2012 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Second Lien Noteholders Committee, Second Lien Notes Trustee. Document filed by Second Lien Noteholders Committee, Second Lien Notes Trustee.(Qureshi, Abid)
July 10, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 07/03/2012, Receipt Number 1042647. (jd)
July 10, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Abid Qureshi to RE-FILE Document 22 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (lb)
July 9, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 20 Motion for William D. Belanger to Appear Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes ascounsel for FlashPoint Technology, Inc. in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/9/2012) (pl)
July 6, 2012 22 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Second Lien Noteholders Committee, Second Lien Notes Trustee.(Qureshi, Abid) Modified on 7/10/2012 (lb).
July 6, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Note to Attorney Abid Qureshi to RE-FILE Document 21 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. (lb)
July 6, 2012 21 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Second Lien Noteholders Committee, Second Lien Notes Trustee.(Qureshi, Abid) Modified on 7/6/2012 (lb).
July 6, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $400.00, paid on 07/02/2012, Receipt Number 1042512, 1042514. (jd)
July 5, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Abid Qureshi to RE-FILE Document 13 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (lb)
July 5, 2012 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 12-1720A, 12-B-10202 (ALG).. Document filed by Apple Inc.. (Lennon, Brian)
July 5, 2012 18 JOINDER to join re: 7 Response in Opposition to Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Reference. Document filed by Second Lien Noteholders Committee, Second Lien Notes Trustee.(Qureshi, Abid)
July 5, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 10 Motion for Todd A. Feinsmith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/5/2012) (ft)
July 5, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 9 Motion for Lana A. Gladstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/5/2012) (ft)
July 3, 2012 20 MOTION for William D. Belanger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by FlashPoint Technology, Inc.(pgu)
July 3, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Abid Qureshi to RE-FILE Document 14 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Joinder found under the event list Other Documents. (ldi)
July 3, 2012 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexis Freeman on behalf of Second Lien Noteholders Committee, Second Lien Notes Trustee (Freeman, Alexis)
July 3, 2012 14 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 12-1720A, 12-B-10202 (ALG). (JOINDER). Document filed by Second Lien Noteholders Committee, Second Lien Notes Trustee. (Qureshi, Abid) Modified on 7/5/2012 (ldi).
July 3, 2012 13 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Second Lien Noteholders Committee, Second Lien Notes Trustee.(Qureshi, Abid) Modified on 7/5/2012 (lb).
July 3, 2012 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abid Qureshi on behalf of Second Lien Noteholders Committee, Second Lien Notes Trustee (Qureshi, Abid)
July 3, 2012 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company (Glueckstein, Brian)
July 2, 2012 10 MOTION for Todd A. Feinsmith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by FlashPoint Technology, Inc..(bwa)
July 2, 2012 9 MOTION for Lana A. Gladstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by FlashPoint Technology, Inc..(bwa)
July 2, 2012 8 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (pgu)
June 28, 2012 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 12-1720A, 12-B-10202 (ALG).. Document filed by Eastman Kodak Company. (Glueckstein, Brian)
June 27, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER: Oral Argument re Apple's motion to withdraw the reference, set for 7/26/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/27/2012) (cd)
June 25, 2012 Mailed notice re: 4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 12-1720A, 12-B-10202 (ALG)., 5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Mail Letter of Notification to Bankruptcy Court, 2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, Case Designation to the attorney(s) of record. (pgu)
June 25, 2012 Mailed letter to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York as notification of filing of Bankruptcy Motion to Withdraw Reference (Case Number: 12-01720A (BRL).) with the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y. and the assignment of S.D.N.Y. Case Number: 12-cv-4881. (pgu)
June 25, 2012 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FlashPoint Technology, Inc..(Kovsky-Apap, Deborah)
June 22, 2012 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Apple Inc.., COUNTERCLAIM against Eastman Kodak Company. Document filed by FlashPoint Technology, Inc..(Kovsky-Apap, Deborah)
June 22, 2012 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Apple Inc..(Lennon, Brian)
June 22, 2012 2 ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Eastman Kodak Company. Document filed by Apple Inc..(Lennon, Brian)
June 21, 2012 Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (bkar)
June 21, 2012 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 12-1720A, 12-B-10202 (ALG).Document filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastman Kodak Company v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Second Lien Notes Trustee
Represented By: Alexis Freeman
Represented By: Abid Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Second Lien Noteholders Committee
Represented By: Alexis Freeman
Represented By: Abid Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Eastman Kodak Company, et al.
Represented By: Frank A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Brian Sinclair Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: FlashPoint Technology, Inc.
Represented By: William D. Belanger
Represented By: Todd A. Feinsmith
Represented By: Lana A. Gladstein
Represented By: Deborah Tamara Kovsky-Apap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Brian Sinclair Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: FlashPoint Technology, Inc.
Represented By: William D. Belanger
Represented By: Todd A. Feinsmith
Represented By: Lana A. Gladstein
Represented By: Deborah Tamara Kovsky-Apap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Dietderich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Eastman Kodak Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastman Kodak Company
Represented By: Brian D. Glueckstein
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Dietderich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Brian Sinclair Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FlashPoint Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Tamara Kovsky-Apap
Represented By: Lana A. Gladstein
Represented By: Todd A. Feinsmith
Represented By: William D. Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?