In Re: Term Commodities Cotton Futures Litigation
Plaintiff: Mark Allen
Defendant: Term Commodities Inc., Allenberg Cotton Company, Joseph Nicosia, Louis dreyfus Commodities B.V., Louis Dreyfus Commodities LLC and John Does Nos. 1-10
Consolidated_plaintiff: Robert Walford, Christopher Pinkham, William Meierfeld, Stuart Satullo and Raymond C. Crosta
Case Number: 1:2012cv05126
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Kevin Nathaniel Fox
Presiding Judge: Andrew L. Carter
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER: The parties are directed to submit letter briefs, not to exceed five pages, addressing the issues set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/3/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-JW et al. (ate)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER: The telephonic conference scheduled for August 2, 2022 is hereby ADJOURNED until August 19, 2022 at 2:00PM Eastern Time. All Parties shall appear and should contact the Court at 1-888-363-4749 (access code: 3768660). ( Telephone Conference set for 8/19/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/2/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-JW et al. (ate)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER: The Court will hold a telephonic conference in this action on August 2, 2022 at 2:00PM Eastern Time. All Parties shall appear and should contact the Court at 1-888-363-4749 (access code: 3768660). ( Telephone Conference set for 8/2/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/27/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-JW et al. (ate)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 628 OPINION & ORDER re: (592 in 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-JW) MOTION to Seal Declaration of Christopher M. McGrath In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. filed by Mark Allen, Brian Ledwith, (605 in 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-JW) MOTION to Seal Notice of Motion To File Under Seal. filed by Mark Allen, (597 in 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-JW) MOTION to Seal Certain of Defendants' March 9, 2021 Submissions. filed by LD Commodities Cotton LLC, Louis Dreyfus Commodities LLC, Louis dreyfus Commodities B.V., Term Commodities Inc., Joseph Nicosia, LDC Holding Inc., Allenberg Cotton Company, (595 in 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-JW) MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Mark Allen, Brian Ledwith, ( 607 in 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-JW) MOTION to Seal Notice of Motion To File Under Seal. filed by Mark Allen. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is GRANTED. The Parties' motions to seal, ECF Nos. 592, 597, 607, are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to file redacted versions of the documents referenced above on ECF within 30 days of the filing of this Order. The Court reserves the right to request additional briefing on whether these do cuments should remain sealed at a later stage in this litigation. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 592, 595, 597, 605, 607. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/15/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-JW et al. (ate)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to provide justification for their respective motions to seal by December 3, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/15/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-KNF et al. (yv)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 575 OPINION & ORDER re: (533 in 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-KNF) MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by LD Commodities Cotton LLC, Louis Dreyfus Commodities LLC, Louis dreyfus Commodities B.V., Term Commodities Inc., Joseph Nicosia, LDC Hol ding Inc., Allenberg Cotton Company, (535 in 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-KNF) MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Craig Pirrong. filed by LD Commodities Cotton LLC, Louis Dreyfus Commodities LLC, Louis dreyfus Commodities B.V. , Term Commodities Inc., Joseph Nicosia, LDC Holding Inc., Allenberg Cotton Company, (534 in 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-KNF) MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Gerald C. Marshall. filed by LD Commodities Cotton LLC, Louis Drey fus Commodities LLC, Louis dreyfus Commodities B.V., Term Commodities Inc., Joseph Nicosia, LDC Holding Inc., Allenberg Cotton Company. Defendants filed motions in limine to exclude the testimony of two of Plaintiffs' experts, as well as a motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' remaining claims. The Parties filed motions to seal certain of their submissions in connection with the above motions. For the reasons set forth below, the Parties' motions to seal are GRAN TED, Defendants' motions in limine are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. In a case as complex, and with as much at stake, as this one, it is inevitable tha t the Parties will have significant disputes. The question for the Court today is whether Defendants have demonstrated, as a matter of law, that Plaintiffs' claims must fail. They have not. For the reasons set forth above, Defendants' motio n for summary judgment is denied. The Parties should submit a joint status report indicating how they would like to proceed within 30 days of the filing of this Opinion & Order. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/30/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-KNF, 1:12-cv-05269-ALC-KNF, 1:12-cv-05334-ALC-KNF, 1:12-cv-05380-ALC-KNF, 1:12-cv-05732-ALC (rro)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 518 OPINION & ORDER re: (505 in 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-KNF) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by LD Commodities Cotton LLC, Louis Dreyfus Commodities LLC, Louis dreyfus Commodities B.V., Term Commodities Inc., Joseph Nicosia, LDC Holding Inc., Allenberg Cotton Company. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings ishereby DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05126-ALC-KNF et al.(anc)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the defendants' motion for a stay of discovery, Docket Entry No. 47, is granted. All discovery is stayed until the resolution of the motion to dismiss. Granting 47 Motion for Protective Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 5/8/2013) (rdz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Term Commodities Cotton Futures Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Allen
Represented By: Benjamin Martin Jaccarino
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Christopher Michael McGrath
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Miller
Represented By: Ian Trevor Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Term Commodities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allenberg Cotton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Nicosia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis dreyfus Commodities B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Dreyfus Commodities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Nos. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: Robert Walford
Represented By: Benjamin Martin Jaccarino
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Christopher Michael McGrath
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Miller
Represented By: Ian Trevor Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: Christopher Pinkham
Represented By: Benjamin Martin Jaccarino
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Christopher Michael McGrath
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Miller
Represented By: Ian Trevor Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: William Meierfeld
Represented By: Benjamin Martin Jaccarino
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Christopher Michael McGrath
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Miller
Represented By: Ian Trevor Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: Stuart Satullo
Represented By: Benjamin Martin Jaccarino
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Christopher Michael McGrath
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: Raymond C. Crosta
Represented By: Benjamin Martin Jaccarino
Represented By: Christopher Lovell
Represented By: Christopher Michael McGrath
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Miller
Represented By: Ian Trevor Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?