Roland III v. McMayle et al
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Roland III
Defendant: McMayle, Taft, Saul, Beny, Linterman, Barkley, Weir, Susan Smith, James Walsh and Donald Sawyer
Case Number: 1:2012cv06331
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OPINION AND ORDER re: 122 MOTION for Reconsideration re: 118 Memorandum & Opinion filed by Jed Saul, Daniel McMonagle, Justin Taft. Having reviewed the record and the parties' memoranda of law, including each of the cases Defend ants' cite to support their argument, the Court concludes that it overlooked neither a controlling issue of law nor a crucial fact in the record. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider is therefore DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 122. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/16/2015) (kko)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 OPINION AND ORDER re: 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jed Saul, Daniel McMonagle, Justin Taft. Daniel McMonagle, Justin Taft, Jed Saul, Joseph Horos, and Michael McCooey (collectively "Defendants") move for partia l summary judgment on Roland's First and Fourteenth Amendment claims. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. With respect to Roland's due process claim, the motion is GRANTED as to Defendants Horos and McCooey, but DENIED as to Defendants McMonagle, Saul, and Taft. With respect to Roland's retaliation claim, the motion is DENIED as to all five Defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 99. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/9/2015) (kko)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION AND ORDER re: 79 MOTION to Amend/Correct 58 Amended Complaint filed by Thomas M. Roland III. For the foregoing reasons, Roland's motion for leave to file an amended complaint is hereby GRANTED. The Second Amended Complaint att ached to Roland's motion is deemed filed. Defendants' answer to the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed within 14 days. Discovery is hereby reopened for a period of 45 days for the purposes of discovery relating to the two new defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at docket number 79. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/24/2014) (lmb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roland III v. McMayle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Roland III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?