Soto et al v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Edgar Soto, Jr., Flora Soto and Edgar Soto, Sr.
Defendant: The City of New York, Francis Levelle and John Does 1-8
Case Number: 1:2012cv06911
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 OPINION & ORDER re: 233 MOTION for Directed Verdict pursuant to Fed. R.Civ.P. 50(b) in favor of plaintiff EDGAR SOTO JR.. filed by Edgar Soto, Sr., Edgar Soto, Jr., Flora Soto. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Docket Number 233 and enter judgment in favor of Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/27/2017) (rj)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiffs' letter motion to set aside the Opinion is denied. Not only does the Court agree with Judge Gorenstein's thoughtful analysis, but Plaintiffs' argument at best establishes th at "reasonable minds may differ" as to whether HIPAA permits Plaintiffs to withhold their consent to allow Defendants' counsel to communicate with Plaintiffs' medical providers. Tiffany & Co., 2013 WL 5677020, at * 1. Accordingl y, Plaintiffs have failed to meet their burden to establish that the Opinion is clearly erroneous or contrary to law. In their joint letter due on or before December 7, 2015, see Dkt. 144, the parties shall inform the Court whether - and if so, how - this order affects the status of the case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/24/2015) (kgo)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Plaintiffs have brought suit against the City of New York and other defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 alleging claims that include alleged physical and psychological injuries resulting from the defendants' use of e xcessive force. The defendants have sought an order from this Court compelling the plaintiffs to provide releases compliant with the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996, Pub. L. 104-191, 110 Stat. 1936 ("HIPAA") and its regulations that would authorize plaintiffs' medical providers to orally discuss plaintiffs' health information with defense counsel. See Letter from Brian Francolla, filed October 9, 2015 (Docket #129) ("Def. Let."). Plaintif fs have opposed this request. See Letter from Fred Lichtmacher, filed October 16, 2015 (Docket #131) ("Pl. Let."). The Court granted the application at oral argument on October 20, 2015. This Memorandum Opinion sets forth the reasons for that ruling, and as further set forth in this Memorandum Opinion. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/20/2015) (rjm)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 OPINION AND ORDER re: 85 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Edgar Soto, Sr., Edgar Soto, Jr., Flora Soto. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion to amend is granted. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to file the Third Amended Complaint and to close item 85 on the docket. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/28/2015) (ajs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto et al v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Soto, Jr.
Represented By: Fred Lichtmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Soto
Represented By: Fred Lichtmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Soto, Sr.
Represented By: Fred Lichtmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Levelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?