United States of America v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2012cv07527
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Jesse M. Furman
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2015 306 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 296 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability /Notice of Defendant Kurt Lofrano's Motion to Amend and Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal, dated October 7, 2015, re 295 filed by Kurt Lofrano: that, Lofrano's motion is denied, as further set forth in this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 296. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/2/2015) (tn)
October 22, 2015 302 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 276 MOTION to Compel the production of documents withheld by Plaintiff filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.: For the foregoing reasons, Wells Fargo's motion to compel is granted in part and denied in pa rt. Specifically, it is denied as to all documents except for Log Entries 1,307-1,310; 1,353-1,354; and 4,412, which must be disclosed to Wells Fargo. Log Entry 18,658, the final version of the letter contained in Log Entry 41,369, and portions of Log Entries 41,369; 41,376; and 41,377 may also have to be disclosed, pending further clarification from the Government. The Government is hereby directed to submit a copy of all the materials that were submitted to the Court for its in camera rev iew to the Sealed Records Department so that they may be made part of the record in this matter. Additionally, the Government shall promptly file on ECF a copy of its letter dated September 14, 2015, accompanying some of the documents submitted to the Court, as the Court sees no basis for the letter itself (which was copied to defense counsel) to be kept under seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 276. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/21/2015) (tn)
September 22, 2015 295 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 274 MOTION for Protective Order - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.: The Second Circuit has acknowledged that commitment to the policies a nd values underlying the attorney-client privilege can result in injustice in individual cases. "Recognition of the privilege," the Court has explained, "reflects a judgment that impairment of the search for truth in some instanc es is outweighed by the social and moral values of confidential consultations. The law accepts the risks of factual error and injustice in individual cases in deference to the values that the privilege vindicates." In re Grand Jury Inves tigation, 399 F.3d 527, 531 (2d Cir. 2005) (internal quotation marks and alterations omitted)). No doubt, that is cold comfort to Lofrano - who may well have taken actions on Wells Fargo's behalf in the good-faith belief that he was acting in compliance with the law, and cannot make that argument at trial in light of Wells Fargo's refusal to waive its attorney-client privilege. But the reality is that the privilege at issue here does not belong to Lofrano - it belongs to We lls Fargo, and only Wells Fargo can elect to waive it. Wells Fargo has refused to do so, and Lofrano is ultimately asking the Court to disregard - or do an end run around - that refusal. For the reasons stated above, the Court cannot do so. Accordingly, Wells Fargo's motion for a protective order is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 274. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/22/2015) (tn)
August 26, 2015 294 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 235 MOTION to Compel plaintiff to re-produce "clawed-back" documents, and produce an adequate and complete privilege log filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.: For the reasons stated abov e, the Bank's motion is GRANTED with respect to the documents used during depositions, but DENIED with respect to all other documents. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 235. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/26/2015) (tn)
June 30, 2015 243 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Government's motion to reopen discovery and compel the production of documents is DENIED, but without prejudice to renewal based on further developments. No later than July 10, 2015, the parties shall meet and confer, and submit a joint letter to the Court proposing both a procedure and a scheduling for resolving the issues identified in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/30/2015) (ab)
September 24, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 14 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., 26 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. For the reasons stated above, there is no basis to dismiss any of the Government 's federal statutory claims. Wells Fargo's motion to dismiss is therefore DENIED as to these claims. Any tort claims arising before June 25, 2009, however, are untimely and therefore dismissed. In addition, the Government's mistake of fact and unjust enrichment claims are dismissed in their entirety. Wells Fargo's motion is therefore GRANTED as to these claims. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion (Docket No. 26). In addition, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Wells Fargos previous motion to dismiss (Docket No. 14) as moot. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/24/2013) (tro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Jean North
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher
Represented By: Rebecca Sol Tinio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Represented By: William Farnham Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer M Wollenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?