Lieber v. Facebook Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Michael Lieber
Defendant: Facebook Inc., Mark Zukerburg (sic), Donald E. Graham, David A. Ebersman, James W. Breyer, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Marc L. Andreessen, Reed Hastings, Erskine B. Bowles, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Merrill Lynch, E*Trade Securities LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Barclays Capital Inc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Castleoak Securities, L.P., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Allen & Company LLC, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated and William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2012cv07548
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
October 11, 2012 Filing 122 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:12-cv-03202. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC., IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. MDL No. 2389. Signed by John H. Heyburn, II; Chairman of the Panel on 10/4/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
October 9, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 121 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
September 5, 2012 Filing 120 Summons Issued as to BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 13, 2012 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Lieber re 115 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 8/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 116 NOTICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic) Notice of Hearing in United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/8/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 10, 2012 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 6, 2012 Filing 113 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Raul Perez (Perez, Raul) (Filed on 8/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW DITCHFIELD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES S. DUGGAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 110 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Ditchfield) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983699.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 109 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Charles S. Duggan) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983515.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Chi v Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3498 MEJ; and (2) Levy v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3642 PJH. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Lieber re 105 Reply to Opposition/Response, 106 Declaration in Support (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 106 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 105 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byMichael Lieber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 105 ) (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 105 REPLY (re 30 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) filed byMichael Lieber. (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic) re 103 Declaration in Support,, 102 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 103 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 102 Reply to Opposition/Response, Declaration of James F. Basile In Support Of Defendants Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Decision On Transfer By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 102 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 102 REPLY (re 31 MOTION to Stay re 26 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. ROUHANDEH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD D. BERNSTEIN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 13, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 99 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James P. Rouhandeh ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6961849.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 98 Certificate of Interested Entities by William Blair & Company, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent WBC Holdings, L.P. for William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 97 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 96 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Williams Capital Group, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent The Williams Capital Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Finopco Holdings Co., Other Affiliate David Finkelstein, Other Affiliate Christopher J. Williams, Other Affiliate Bruce Usher, Other Affiliate David Coard, Other Affiliate Jonathan Levin, Other Affiliate DiAnne Calabrisotto for The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 95 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 94 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp. (NYSE:SF) for Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 93 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 92 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc identifying Corporate Parent SAR Holdings, Inc. for Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 91 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 90 Certificate of Interested Entities by Raymond James & Associates Inc identifying Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 89 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Raymond James & Associates Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 88 Certificate of Interested Entities by Piper Jaffray & Co identifying Corporate Parent Piper Jaffray Companies for Piper Jaffray & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 87 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Piper Jaffray & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 86 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific Crest Securities LLC (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 85 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Pacific Crest Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Entities by Oppenheimer & Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Oppenheimer Holdings Inc. for Oppenheimer & Co Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 83 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Oppenheimer & Co Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 82 Certificate of Interested Entities by Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc identifying Corporate Parent Seibert Financial Corp. for Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 81 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Macquarie Group Limited for Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 79 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by M.R. Beal & Company identifying Corporate Parent MRB Securities Corporation, Other Affiliate Bernard Beal for M.R. Beal & Company. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 77 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by M.R. Beal & Company. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 76 Certificate of Interested Entities by Loop Capital Markets LLC (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 75 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Loop Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 74 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lebenthal & Co., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alexandra & James LLC for Lebenthal & Co., LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 73 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Lebenthal & Co., LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 72 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lazard Capital Markets LLC identifying Corporate Parent LFCM Holdings LLC for Lazard Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 71 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Lazard Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 70 Certificate of Interested Entities by Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Itau USA Inc., Corporate Parent Itau Corretora da Valores, S.A., Corporate Parent Itau Unibanco Holding S.A. for Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 69 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 68 Certificate of Interested Entities by ETrade Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent E*Trade Financial Corporation for. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 67 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by ETrade Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cowen and Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cowen Group, Inc. for Cowen and Company, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 65 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Cowen and Company, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by Castleoak Securities, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent CastleOak Management, LLC, Corporate Parent CastleOak Management Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. for Castleoak Securities, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 63 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Castleoak Securities, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 62 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cabrera Capital Inc., Corporate Parent RCF-Cabrera Holdings, Inc. for Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 61 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by C.L. King & Associates, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Katherine Weir, Other Affiliate Candace King Weir, Other Affiliate Amelia Weir for C.L. King & Associates, Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 59 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by C.L. King & Associates, Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMO Capital Markets Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 57 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Blaylock Robert Van LLC identifying Corporate Parent Blaylock & Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Robert Van Securities, Inc. for Blaylock Robert Van LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 55 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Blaylock Robert Van LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 53 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G. for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 51 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 49 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Market Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup, Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 47 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allen & Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allen Operations LLC, Corporate Parent Allen Holding Inc. for Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 45 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Capital Inc identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 43 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Barclays Capital Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merrill Lynch identifying Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 41 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Merrill Lynch. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Lieber re 39 Declaration in Support, 38 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 39 Declaration of Samuel M. Ward in Support of 38 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMichael Lieber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 38 RESPONSE (re 31 MOTION to Stay re 26 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byMichael Lieber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic) re 35 Opposition/Response to Motion,, 36 Declaration in Support,, Certificate of Service of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo; Declaration of James F. Basile In Support; [Proposed] Order (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 36 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 35 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Declaration of James F. Basile In Support of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 35 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 35 RESPONSE (re 30 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo; [Proposed] Order filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Ahrendtsen, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3212 CRB;(2) Hicks, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3353 RS; (3) Hubuschman v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3366 LHK; (4) Cole v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3367 PJH; and (5) Nelson v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3418 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Richard D. Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6955326.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING. All briefing in response to the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 10, 2012, and all reply briefs in support of the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION to Stay re 26 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/10/2012. Replies due by 7/18/2012. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 30 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Michael Lieber. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 3, 2012 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 26 MOTION to Stay, 28 Amended MOTION to Remand Stipulation Regarding Scheduling filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 28 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Michael Lieber. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/16/2012. Replies due by 7/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Lionel Z. Glancy (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION; filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/13/2012. Replies due by 7/20/2012. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 29, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related: Spatz, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC, Offner v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2666 MMC, Chang, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2680, Gregory v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2815 MMC, Lapin v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3195 SBA, DeMois. Jr. v. Facebook, Inc. et al., C 12-3196 LHK, Pilgram v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3197 EMC, Alfonso v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3198 YGR, Lazar v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3199 JSW, Shierry v. Facebook, Inc., et al. C 12-3200 RS, Cuker, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3201 CW, Lieber v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3202 EMC, Stokes v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3203 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Clubok) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Bishop) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. of Standing Orders (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6920048.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant Bishop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6920016.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Lieber re 13 Declaration in Support, 9 Notice of Appearance, 12 Brief, 14 Certificate of Interested Entities, 11 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael Lieber (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 13 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 12 Brief, 11 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byMichael Lieber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 12 , 11 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 12 Brief re 11 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byMichael Lieber. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012)[Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.] Modified on 10/11/2012 (sjo).
June 22, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Michael Lieber. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/6/2012. Replies due by 7/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel M. Ward (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 19 Proposed Order re 17 MOTION to Stay by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 18 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 17 MOTION to Stay filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (Related document(s) 17 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 17 MOTION for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC re 8 Certificate of Interested Entities, 7 Certificate of Interested Entities, 6 Certificate of Interested Entities. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 8 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certificate of Interested Entities by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 6 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goldman Sachs & Co identifying Other Affiliate The Goldman Sachs Group Inc, Other Affiliate The Goldman Sachs & Co LLC for Goldman Sachs & Co. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Francis Basile, Elizabeth L. Deeley. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 3 Facebook Inc's Rule 7.1. Disclosure Statement by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zukerburg (sic). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (no process) from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV-514193. (Filing fee $350; receipt number 34611075442). Filed by Facebook Inc., David M. Spillane, Mark Zukerburg (sic), David A. Ebersman, Peter A. Thiel, Reed Hastings, Erskine B. Bowles, Donald E. Graham, Marc L. Andreessen, James W. Breyer. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lieber v. Facebook Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lieber
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Represented By: Sue Jin Kim
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosen
Represented By: Casey Edwards Sadler
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Sokolowski
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zukerburg (sic)
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleoak Securities, L.P.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazard Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Crest Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaylock Robert Van LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebenthal & Co., LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic)
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.L. King & Associates, Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R. Beal & Company
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?