Cole v. Zuckerberg et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: William Cole
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, James W. Bryer, Marc L. Andreessen, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Erskine B. Bowles and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv07549
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 - Petition for Removal: SEC Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Filing 51 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:12-cv-03367. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC., IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. MDL NO. 2389. Signed by John H. Heyburn, II; Chairman of the Panel on 10/4/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
October 9, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 50 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; VACATING HEARING. The motion to stay is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 11, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 31, 2012 Filing 48 REPLY (re 25 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) filed byWilliam Cole. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 31, 2012 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 46 Declaration in Support,, 45 Reply to Opposition/Response,,, (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 31, 2012 Filing 46 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 45 Reply to Opposition/Response,,, Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of Defendants Reply in Support of Motions For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 31, 2012 Filing 45 REPLY (re 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, 24 MOTION to Stay re 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, 16 Declaration in Support,, 17 Certificate of Service, A ) Defendants Reply in Support of Motions For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 44 RESPONSE (re 24 MOTION to Stay re 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, 16 Declaration in Support,, 17 Certificate of Service, A ) Opposition filed byWilliam Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shane P. Sanders, # 2 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation)(Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 41 Opposition/Response to Motion, 42 Declaration in Support,, (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 42 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 41 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand Actions to State Court filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 41 RESPONSE (re 25 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand Actions to State Court filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND VACATE HEARING ON NOMINAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss, currently set for September 7, 2012, is vacated. In the event defendants' motion to stay is denied, the Court will set a briefing schedule and hearing date on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 15, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 38 Declaration in Support, 37 Opposition/Response to Motion,, (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Filing 38 Declaration in Support of 37 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Extend the Breifing Schedule and Continue the Hearing on Nominal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 37 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Filing 37 RESPONSE (re 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6), and Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum in ) Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Extend the Breifing Schedule and Continue the Hearing on Nominal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 10, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6), and Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by William Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina Stassi, # 2 Proposed Order in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Extend the Briefing Schedule and Continue the Hearing on Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), 12(B)(6) and 23.1)(Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Hearing in United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/8/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 6, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION to Stay re 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, 16 Declaration in Support,, 17 Certificate of Service, A, 7 MOTION to Stay, 25 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court, 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, 29 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6), and Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum in Support of Motion. Motion Hearings Continued for 9/14/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Re 32 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULES ON MOTIONS FOR REMAND AND MOTIONS FOR STAY; CONTINUING HEARING. Opposition to the Stay Motion shall be filed no later than August 21, 2012, and the reply shall be filed no later than August 31, 2012. Opposition to the Remand Motion shall be filed no later than August 21, 2012, and the reply shall be filed no later than August 31, 2012. The hearing on the motions is continued to September 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 3, 2012 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6), and Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum in Support of Motion, 30 Declaration in Support,, (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 3, 2012 Filing 30 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 29 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6), and Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 3, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6), and Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 8/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 3, 2012 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 25 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court, 24 MOTION to Stay re 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, 16 Declaration in Support,, 17 Certificate of Service, A filed by William Cole. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 1, 2012 Filing 27 Proposed Order re 25 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court by William Cole. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 1, 2012 Filing 26 Declaration of Shane P. Sanders in Support of 25 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed byWilliam Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 1, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed by William Cole. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/15/2012. Replies due by 8/22/2012. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 1, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay re 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, 16 Declaration in Support,, 17 Certificate of Service, Amended Notice of Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/21/2012. Replies due by 8/31/2012. (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/1/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD D. BERNSTEIN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 31, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING HEARING DATES. Plaintiff need not file an opposition to defendants' pending Motion for Stay until the date set pursuant to further court order adopting a revised briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 27, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Hearing Dates filed by William Cole. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Richard D. Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7000708.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Chi v Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3498 MEJ; and (2) Levy v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3642 PJH. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 13, 2012 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, 16 Declaration in Support,, (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 13, 2012 Filing 16 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 15 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 13, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/27/2012. Replies due by 8/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 7/11/2012. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Ahrendtsen, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3212 CRB;(2) Hicks, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3353 RS; (3) Hubuschman v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3366 LHK; (4) Cole v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3367 PJH; and (5) Nelson v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3418 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 3, 2012 Filing 12 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Andrew B. Clubok.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 3, 2012 Filing 11 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Brant W. Bishop.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6937185.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant Bishop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6937027.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 29, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending decision on transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/13/2012. Replies due by 7/20/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Basile declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012) Modified on 7/5/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 29, 2012 Filing 6 STIPULATION extending time for defendants to respond to complaint filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, William Cole, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) (aaa, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) (aaa, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) (aaa, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (no process) from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is CIV 514327. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611075761). Filed byFacebook, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Erskine B. Bowles, Donald E. Graham, Peter A. Thiel, David M. Spillane, James W. Bryer, David A. Ebersman, Marc L. Andreessen, Reed Hastings, Mark Zuckerberg. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2012: # 1 Exhibit A) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2012: # 2 Exhibit B) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2012: # 3 Exhibit C) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2012: # 4 Exhibit D) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2012: # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Zuckerberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cole
Represented By: Felipe Javier Arroyo
Represented By: Brian James Robbins
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl K. Sandberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Bryer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?