DeMois v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Vernon R. DeMois, Jr.
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel and Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv07551
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Filing 61 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:12-cv-03196. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC., IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. MDL No. 2389. Signed by John H. Heyburn, II; Chairman of the Panel on 10/4/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
October 9, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 60 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 13, 2012 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr re 55 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 8/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Hearing in United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/8/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 10, 2012 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW DITCHFIELD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES S. DUGGAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Ditchfield) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983633.) filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Charles S. Duggan) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983399.) filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Chi v Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3498 MEJ; and (2) Levy v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3642 PJH. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr re 47 Declaration in Support, 46 Reply to Opposition/Response (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 47 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 46 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byVernon R. DeMois, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 46 ) (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 46 REPLY (re 27 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) filed byVernon R. DeMois, Jr. (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 43 Reply to Opposition/Response, 44 Declaration in Support,, (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 44 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 43 Reply to Opposition/Response, Declaration of James F. Basile In Support Of Defendants Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Decision On Transfer By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 43 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 43 REPLY (re 28 MOTION to Stay re 24 MOTION to Stay Third Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. ROUHANDEH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD D. BERNSTEIN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 13, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James P. Rouhandeh ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6961763.) filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr re 37 Opposition/Response to Motion, 38 Declaration in Support and Proposed Order (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified on 7/11/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 38 Declaration of Samuel M. Ward in Support of 37 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byVernon R. DeMois, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 37 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 37 RESPONSE (re 28 MOTION to Stay re 24 MOTION to Stay Third Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byVernon R. DeMois, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 35 Declaration in Support,, 34 Opposition/Response to Motion and[Proposed] Order (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified on 7/11/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 35 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 34 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 34 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 34 RESPONSE (re 27 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo; [Proposed] Order filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Ahrendtsen, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3212 CRB;(2) Hicks, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3353 RS; (3) Hubuschman v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3366 LHK; (4) Cole v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3367 PJH; and (5) Nelson v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3418 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Richard D. Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6955205.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW B. CLUBOK PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 9, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRANT W. BISHOP PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 9, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING. All briefing in response to the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 10, 2012, and all reply briefs in support of the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay re 24 MOTION to Stay Third Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/10/2012. Replies due by 7/18/2012. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 27 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 3, 2012 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 25 Amended MOTION to Remand , 24 MOTION to Stay Stipulation Regarding Scheduling filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 25 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/16/2012. Replies due by 7/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION; filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/13/2012. Replies due by 7/20/2012. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 29, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related: Spatz, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC, Offner v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2666 MMC, Chang, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2680, Gregory v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2815 MMC, Lapin v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3195 SBA, DeMois. Jr. v. Facebook, Inc. et al., C 12-3196 LHK, Pilgram v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3197 EMC, Alfonso v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3198 YGR, Lazar v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3199 JSW, Shierry v. Facebook, Inc., et al. C 12-3200 RS, Cuker, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3201 CW, Lieber v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3202 EMC, Stokes v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3203 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 22 AMENDED MOTION for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/9/2012. Replies due by 7/16/2012. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6920116.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant Bishop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6920110.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr re 7 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo, 9 Declaration in Support, 8 Memorandum in Support, 6 Notice of Appearance, 11 Certificate of Interested Entities, 10 Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 10 Proposed Order re 7 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 9 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 7 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr. (Related document(s) 7 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re 7 MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr. (Related document(s) 7 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Vernon R. DeMois, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/6/2012. Replies due by 7/13/2012. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance Vernon R. DeMois, Jr (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 *** Attorney Samuel M. Ward,Stephen R. Basser,Daniel E. Bacine,Mark Robert Rosen,Beth T. Seltzer for Vernon R. DeMois, Jr added. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 20 Proposed Order re 18 MOTION for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 19 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 18 MOTION for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 18 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Facebook, Inc. Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC re 16 Disclosure Statement (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 16 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donad E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superior Court. No process. Jury Demand. Their case number is CIV514163. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611075448). Filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMois v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon R. DeMois, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Bacine
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosen
Represented By: Casey Edwards Sadler
Represented By: Beth T. Seltzer
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?