Spatz et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Michael Spatz, Sanjay Israni, William H. Anhood, Jose and Mary Galvan and KBC Asset Management NV
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Barclays Capital Inc, Allen & Company LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Movant: A. Marcus Gerber, Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, The GAF Unit Trust, White Dune LLC, Facebook Investor Group, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Hal Hubuschman and William Cole
Case Number: 1:2012cv07586
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
October 15, 2012 Filing 136 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:12-cv-02662. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 15, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 15, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 15, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
October 15, 2012 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 15, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC., IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. MDL No.2389. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel on 10/4/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
October 9, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 135 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 29, 2012 *** Attorney Darren J. Check, Esq for Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd. added. Re 134 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DARREN J. CHECK PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 29, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 24, 2012 Filing 133 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Darren J. Check to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305.00, receipt number 34611077938.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/28/12 filed by Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SEAN M. HANDLER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 22, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 130 EXHIBITS re 129 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit F to the Reply Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange in Further Support of the Motion of the Institutional Investor Group For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed byArkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Related document(s) 129 ) (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 8/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 20, 2012 Filing 129 Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange in Support of 128 Reply to Opposition/Response, Of The Institutional Investor Group For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, Approval Of Its Selection Of Co-Lead Counsel, And Consolidation Of All Related Actions filed byArkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 128 ) (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 20, 2012 Filing 128 REPLY (re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions ) filed byArkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 8/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 20, 2012 Filing 127 NOTICE by Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, The GAF Unit Trust, White Dune LLC Notice of Filing in Related Actions in SDNY (Attachments: # 1 Reply Memorandum Filed in SDNY, # 2 Exhibit A to Reply Memorandum Filed in SDNY, # 3 Exhibit B to Reply Memorandum Filed in SDNY, # 4 Joint Declaration Filed in SDNY, # 5 Exhibit A to Joint Declaration Filed in SDNY)(Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 8/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 20, 2012 Filing 126 REPLY (re 73 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byKBC Asset Management NV. (Labaton, Mark) (Filed on 8/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 20, 2012 Filing 125 REPLY (re 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation ) filed byJose and Mary Galvan. (Kruse, Joy) (Filed on 8/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 20, 2012 Filing 124 NOTICE by William H. Anhood Notice of Withdrawal of the Motion by William H. Anhood for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel (Kruse, Joy) (Filed on 8/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 16, 2012 Filing 131 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Sean M. Handler to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305.00, receipt number 34611077697.) filed by Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Filing 123 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz and Sanjay Israni for Consolidation of All Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of Lead Counsel (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 10, 2012 Filing 121 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark I. Labaton (Labaton, Mark) (Filed on 8/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions And In Opposition To The Competing Motions filed byArkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 84 ) (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 119 RESPONSE (re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions ) Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Institutional Investor Group For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And In Opposition To The Competing Motions filed byArkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 118 NOTICE by Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, The GAF Unit Trust, White Dune LLC Notice of Filing in Related Actions (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition filed in SDNY, # 2 Declaration of David A. Rosenfeld in Support of Opposition filed in SDNY, # 3 Exhibit A to Rosenfeld Opp. Decl. filed in SDNY, # 4 Exhibit B to Rosenfeld Opp. Decl. filed in SDNY, # 5 Exhibit C to Rosenfeld Opp. Decl. filed in SDNY, # 6 Exhibit D to Rosenfeld Opp. Decl. filed in SDNY, # 7 Exhibit E to Rosenfeld Opp. Decl. filed in SDNY)(Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 117 RESPONSE (re 73 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byKBC Asset Management NV. (Labaton, Mark) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 116 Declaration of Joy A. Kruse in Support of 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation, 115 Brief, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of the Motion of William H. Anhood and Jose and Mary Galvan for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Co-Lead Counsel filed byWilliam H. Anhood, Jose and Mary Galvan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 64 , 115 ) (Kruse, Joy) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 115 Brief re 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of the Motion of William H. Anhood and Jose and Mary Galvan for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Co-Lead Counsel filed byWilliam H. Anhood, Jose and Mary Galvan. (Related document(s) 64 ) (Kruse, Joy) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.] Modified on 10/15/2012 (sjo).
August 9, 2012 Filing 114 RESPONSE (re 70 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and For Consolidation of Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation, 73 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 67 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz and Sanjay Israni For Consolidation Of All Related Actions, Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs And For Approval Of Lead Counsel, 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions ) filed byA. Marcus Gerber. (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 113 RESPONSE (re 70 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and For Consolidation of Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation, 73 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 67 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz and Sanjay Israni For Consolidation Of All Related Actions, Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs And For Approval Of Lead Counsel, 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions ) Defendants Omnibus Response to Motions for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel and Certificate of Service filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 112 RESPONSE (re 67 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz and Sanjay Israni For Consolidation Of All Related Actions, Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs And For Approval Of Lead Counsel ) filed byHal Hubuschman, William Cole. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shane P. Sanders, # 2 Exhibit A)(Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 111 RESPONSE (re 70 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and For Consolidation of Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation, 73 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 67 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz and Sanjay Israni For Consolidation Of All Related Actions, Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs And For Approval Of Lead Counsel, 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions ) [State Court Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Lead Plaintiff Movants' Motions to Consolidate All Related Actions] filed byDarryl Lazar, Vernon R. DeMois, Jr., Edward J. Shierry, Karen Cuker, Brian Graknick, Harvey Lapin. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 110 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by the Facebook Investor Group (Dkt. No. 75) (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 109 MOTION to Relate Case Notice of Administrative Motion and Motion to Consider Whether Cases are Related and Certificate of Service filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Hearing in United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Filing 107 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Case Management Conference from 8/24/2012 to 10/26/2012 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; ORDER VACATING HEARING. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, all opposition briefing on the pending lead plaintiff motions shall be filed no later than August 9, 2012, and all replies shall be filed no later than August 20, 2012. The hearing scheduled for August 31, 2012 is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
August 2, 2012 Filing 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 75 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 70 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and For Consolidation of Cases, 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation, 73 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , 67 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz and Sanjay Israni For Consolidation Of All Related Actions, Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs And For Approval Of Lead Counsel, 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, The GAF Unit Trust, White Dune LLC. (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 8/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Filing 104 Statement Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Local Rule 3-16 by Institutional Investors. (Labaton, Mark) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Filing 103 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Institutional Investors. (Labaton, Mark) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW DITCHFIELD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES S. DUGGAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 70 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and For Consolidation of Cases by Rosemary Farrales Luzon on behalf of A. Marcus Gerber (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 70 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and For Consolidation of Cases by Rosemary Farrales Luzon on behalf of A. Marcus Gerber (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 70 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and For Consolidation of Cases by Rosemary Farrales Luzon on behalf of A. Marcus Gerber (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of David A. Rosenfeld Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, The GAF Unit Trust, White Dune LLC (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 7/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Samuel H. Rudman Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, The GAF Unit Trust, White Dune LLC (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 7/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Trig R. Smith Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, The GAF Unit Trust, White Dune LLC (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 7/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 94 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 93 Certificate of Interested Entities by Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd. re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions Pursuant to Local Rule 3-16 (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions for Michael W. Stocker by Timothy Alan DeLange on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions for Eric J. Belfi by Timothy Alan DeLange on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions for Christopher J. Keller by Timothy Alan DeLange on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions for Timothy A. DeLange by Timothy Alan DeLange on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions for Thomas A. Dubbs by Timothy Alan DeLange on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions for Ross Shikowitz by Timothy Alan DeLange on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions for Gerald H. Silk by Timothy Alan DeLange on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 85 Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange in Support of 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed byArkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 84 ) (DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 84 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed by North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/6/2012. Replies due by 8/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeLange, Timothy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, The GAF Unit Trust, White Dune LLC (Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Investor Group re 75 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 80 Certificate of Counsel, 79 Certificate of Counsel, 81 Certificate of Counsel, 78 Certificate of Counsel, 76 Declaration in Support, (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 75 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 76 Declaration in Support, by Azra Z. Mehdi on behalf of Facebook Investor Group (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 75 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 76 Declaration in Support, by Azra Z. Mehdi on behalf of Facebook Investor Group (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 75 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 76 Declaration in Support, by Azra Z. Mehdi on behalf of Facebook Investor Group (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 75 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 76 Declaration in Support, by Azra Z. Mehdi on behalf of Facebook Investor Group (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 77 Declaration of Mark I. Labaton in Support of Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and of Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel filed byInstitutional Investors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Cert Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Loss Chart, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Facebook Lawsuit, # 4 Exhibit Joint Decl on Behalf of Institutional Investors, # 5 Exhibit Motley Rice Resume, # 6 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Labaton, Mark) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 76 Declaration of Azra Z. Mehdi in Support of 75 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFacebook Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 75 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Facebook Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/6/2012. Replies due by 8/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 74 Brief in Support of Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel filed byInstitutional Investors. (Labaton, Mark) (Filed on 7/23/2012)[Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.] Modified on 10/15/2012 (sjo).
July 23, 2012 Filing 73 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Institutional Investors. Responses due by 8/6/2012. Replies due by 8/13/2012. (Labaton, Mark) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark I. Labaton on behalf of Institutional Investors (Labaton, Mark) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 71 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, The GAF Unit Trust, White Dune LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/6/2012. Replies due by 8/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Motion, Memorandum of Law and Declaration with Exhibits Filed in S.D.N.Y.)(Myers, Danielle) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and For Consolidation of Cases filed by A. Marcus Gerber. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/6/2012. Replies due by 8/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 69 Declaration of Patrick H. Moran in Support of 67 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz and Sanjay Israni For Consolidation Of All Related Actions, Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs And For Approval Of Lead Counsel filed bySanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 68 Brief re 67 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz and Sanjay Israni For Consolidation Of All Related Actions, Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs And For Approval Of Lead Counsel Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Motion Of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz And Sanjay Israni For Consolidation Of All Related Actions, Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs And For Approval Of Lead Counsel filed bySanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. (Related document(s) 67 ) (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.] Modified on 10/15/2012 (sjo).
July 23, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs Michael Spatz and Sanjay Israni For Consolidation Of All Related Actions, Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs And For Approval Of Lead Counsel filed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/6/2012. Replies due by 8/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Entities by William H. Anhood, Jose and Mary Galvan re 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation (Attachments: # 1 Certification Pursuant to Civil Rule 3-7(d), # 2 Certification Pursuant to Civil Rule 3-7(d), # 3 Certification Pursuant to Civil Rule 3-7(d), # 4 Certification Pursuant to Civil Rule 3-7(d), # 5 Certification Pursuant to Civil Rule 3-7(d), # 6 Certification Pursuant to Civil Rule 3-7(d))(Kruse, Joy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 65 Declaration of Joy A. Kruse in Support of 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation filed byWilliam H. Anhood, Jose and Mary Galvan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Kruse, Joy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 64 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation filed by William H. Anhood, Jose and Mary Galvan. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/6/2012. Replies due by 8/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kruse, Joy) (Filed on 7/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Ditchfield) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983743.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Charles S. Duggan) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983565.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Chi v Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3498 MEJ; and (2) Levy v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3642 PJH. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 60 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Lidia Levy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 59 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goldman Sachs & Co identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Goldman, Sachs & Co. L.L.C. for Goldman Sachs & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 58 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Goldman Sachs & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. ROUHANDEH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 12, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION to Relate Case Notice of Administrative Motion and Motion to Consider Whether Cases are Related filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James P. Rouhandeh ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6961940.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent Everen Capital Corporation for Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 53 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 51 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G. for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 49 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 47 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Market Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup, Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 45 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allen & Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allen Operations LLC, Corporate Parent Allen Holding Inc. for Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 43 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Capital Inc identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 41 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Barclays Capital Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 39 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 37 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc. for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 35 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Ahrendtsen, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3212 CRB;(2) Hicks, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3353 RS; (3) Hubuschman v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3366 LHK; (4) Cole v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3367 PJH; and (5) Nelson v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3418 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION to Relate Case Notice of Administrative Motion and Motion to Consider Whether Cases are Related filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRANT W. BISHOP PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW B. CLUBOK PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related: Spatz, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC, Offner v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2666 MMC, Chang, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2680, Gregory v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2815 MMC, Lapin v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3195 SBA, DeMois. Jr. v. Facebook, Inc. et al., C 12-3196 LHK, Pilgram v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3197 EMC, Alfonso v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3198 YGR, Lazar v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3199 JSW, Shierry v. Facebook, Inc., et al. C 12-3200 RS, Cuker, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3201 CW, Lieber v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3202 EMC, Stokes v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3203 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant Bishop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6914131.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6914106.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION to Relate Case Notice of Administrative Motion and Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by James Francis Basile and Elizabeth L. Deeley (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER. Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662, is related to Offner v. Facebook, C 12-2666, Chang v. Facebook, C 12-2680, and Gregory v. Facebook, C 12-2815. Counsel are instructed that all future filings in the reassigned cases are to bear the initials MMC immediately after the case number. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 8, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. RBC Capital Markets, LLC served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Citigroup Global Markets Inc. served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Allen & Company LLC served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Barclays Capital Inc served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated served on 6/4/2012, answer due 6/25/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Goldman Sachs & Co served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 5, 2012 Filing 10 Response re 6 MOTION to Relate Case Response to Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related and Certificate of Service byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 5, 2012 Filing 9 Facebook, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Service by Facebook, Inc. (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/5/2012) Modified on 6/6/2012 (aaa, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 5, 2012 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 5, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Francis Basile Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Appearance and Certificate of Service (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
June 1, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION to Relate Case filed by John Gregory. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Trevor, George) (Filed on 6/1/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
May 31, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Wells Fargo Securities, LLC served on 5/24/2012, answer due 6/14/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 5/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
May 31, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. Facebook, Inc. served on 5/24/2012, answer due 6/14/2012. (Moran, Patrick) (Filed on 5/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
May 23, 2012 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, Barclays Capital Inc, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2012 10:30 AM. Signed by Senior Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/23/12. (Attachments: # 1 MMC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]
May 23, 2012 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, Barclays Capital Inc, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Mark Zuckerberg ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611074400.). Filed bySanjay Israni, Michael Spatz. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/15/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spatz et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Spatz
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Represented By: Patrick Hugh Moran
Represented By: Gregory Mark Nespole
Represented By: Rachele R Rickert
Represented By: Robert B. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanjay Israni
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Represented By: Patrick Hugh Moran
Represented By: Gregory Mark Nespole
Represented By: Rachele R Rickert
Represented By: Robert B. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Anhood
Represented By: Joy A. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose and Mary Galvan
Represented By: Joy A. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KBC Asset Management NV
Represented By: David P. Abel
Represented By: James M. Hughes
Represented By: Mark I. Labaton
Represented By: William Stephen Norton
Represented By: Joseph F. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: A. Marcus Gerber
Represented By: Rosemary Farrales Luzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: The GAF Unit Trust
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: White Dune LLC
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Facebook Investor Group
Represented By: Azra Zahoor Mehdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: North Carolina Department of State Treasurer
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Darren J. Check
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Represented By: Sean M. Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Arkansas Teacher Retirement System
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association
Represented By: Timothy Alan DeLange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Hal Hubuschman
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: William Cole
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?