Southward v. Zuckerberg et al. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Rock Southward
Defendant: Mark E. Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, James W. Breyer, Peter A. Thiel, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv07813
Filed: October 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
October 22, 2012 Filing 17 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:12-cv-04144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 22, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 22, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
October 22, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 22, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 22, 2012 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 18, 2012 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC., IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITICATION. MDL No.2389. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 10/18/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
October 18, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 16 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/21/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW B. CLUBOK PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRANT W. BISHOP PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew B. Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7060731.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant W. Bishop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7060677.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 16, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 15, 2012 ***Deadlines terminated. 10 Order Relating the case to MMC cases. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, Inc., C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 10, 2012 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark E. Zuckerberg re 7 MOTION to Stay Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, 8 Declaration in Support,, (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 10, 2012 Filing 8 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 7 MOTION to Stay Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark E. Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 7 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 8/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 10, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark E. Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 8/24/2012. Replies due by 8/31/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Rock Southward, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel & Mark E. Zuckerberg. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Filing 5 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-16 filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel & Mark E. Zuckerberg. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel & Mark E. Zuckerberg. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Facebook, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 10/23/2012 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 10/30/2012 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - [No Process] from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV515176. [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611077234] Filed by Defendants Erskine B. Bowles, Facebook, Inc., Mark E. Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, Donald E. Graham, Marc L. Andreessen, Peter A. Thiel, David M. Spillane, James W. Breyer, Sheryl K. Sandberg & Reed Hastings.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2012: # 1 Exhibit "A") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2012: # 2 Exhibit "B") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2012: # 3 Exhibit "C") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2012: # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]
August 7, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southward v. Zuckerberg et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock Southward
Represented By: Kwasi Abraham Asiedu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl K. Sandberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?