Scott v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Joyce-Summerfeld, Parithan Kungsuvvan, Luz Martinez Acosta, Amanda Fisher, Benjamin D Howard, Erin Durkin, Heather Richards, Laura Knight, Brittney Miller, Ramon A. Ramos, Stacy Higgs, Raul Ruiz, Jr., Eustolia Medina, Susan C Strunk, Stephen Preisiglle, Brandon Keller, Nicole Perkins, Abraham Moraga, Amanda Marks, Maxcimo Scott, Nichole R Hundley, Kalinda Flores, Brittney Alston, Carlos Fraguada, Joshua Jr Dameron, Dieshon Clark, Natanael Diaz Portillo, Maddie Brennan, Paul Bissett, Derek A. Gassaway, Natalia Barker, Dustin Schreiber, Elizabeth H Gomula, Sarah Noah, Corey Pauley, Shakira Hawthorne, Eric Buttner, Jessica L Kaczmarek, Octavio Mora, Elizabeth Diaz, Steven Hastings, Victoria Gutierrez, Rafael Escalante, Joe Rostyne, Chris Perry, Kerstina Caggiano, Karl Hasendehrl, Daniel Dalton, Andrew J. Hirsch, Josh Venverlon, Eric Lewis, Kayla M. Davis, Alberto Mendoza Chavez, Donnell Harris, Alex D-B Poon, Jason Kern, Luis Torres II, Michael Hamilton, Sgt. Carlos Fernandez, Derek Case, Mark Giordano, Raul Cruz, Kate Kuzmeskus, Kevin Scott, Sarah Valderrama, Julie Anne Cortizo, Candice VanCamp, Shenise Williams, Rachel Spalth, Steven Halstead, Charlotte R. Maxwell, Sandra K. Stewart, Omar Casillas, Jonathan Streetman, Aaron Horner, Jose Perez, Leticia Quintero, Kofi Bossman, Ben Camarone Garr, Roberta Factor, Lorena A. Chaparro, Karismarie Niedzwiecki, Nicole Watts, Eric Rios-Ferman, Robert Stedem, Krystal Parker, James Lee Perkins III, Consuelo V. Perez, Christian Armenta, Carlos Romero, Daniel Neff, Reyna C. Cruz, Cruz Flores, Maria Reyes, Wanda A. Hary, Paul A Andorfer, Scott Mumford, Uri Antonio Aguilar, Christina G. West, Guillermo Jr Martinez, Christopher Bassford, Gerald V. Labensky, Jr., Lauren Kelsch, Matthew A. Medina, Claudia E. Taylor, Rudy Nunez, Nathan Fenwick, Roberto Gout, April L. Miller (Delsol), Brian Short, Sarah Elizabeth Wills, Suzanne Anderson, Gabriel White, Kristin Lombardi, Eva Angel, Matt Rommel, Police Officer Vanessa Acevedo, William R. Downard, Sarah L. Meyer-Allen, Ramon Alonso, Jose Raul Barrios, Sara Garner, Zakaria Fessikh, Deniene Gorey, Freddie Ahumada, Tanner L Renninger, Nick Dwyer, Roxana Morales, Crystal Berry, Dawn Akason, Sara Murray, Kelly Palecek, Alfredo Cuate Briones, Chris Haller, Ryan Tracy, Bernardu Escobar Perez, Jessica Garcia, Melissa Sosa, Meaghan McClugaia, Jose Rafael Lopez, Holly Kennell, Joseph Rostyn, Brian D. Rogers, Reyna M Ryes Larios, Justin Breeden, Wayne Charles Franz, Christina Gateley, Christina Hollingshead, Daniel Argo, Mark A. Wilson, Amanda Henry, Patrice Derflinger, Russell Fliddy, Abigail Vega, Maylin Lee Schofield, Anna Dillon, Kayla Newsom, Isabel Pritchett, Kelly Nitzsche, Joel Gosnell, Robert J. Gallagher, Ryan Christopher Furst, Sandra Church, Maricela Ventura, Jose Villafranco, Michael J. Wood, Renee Pope-Macedo, Jamie Lamb, Daniel Howling, Iah Marols, Ryan M. Cassler, William Aviles, Jose A. Santiago, Rachael Casciano, Amy Tullis, Ana Luisa Vidal, Brandon W. Doran, Oridio Castro-Delcid, Christian Rocha, Marissa Cooley, Justin Grazuna, Brian P. Howell, Rowana Anthony, Peter C. Delgado, Joshua Gottlob, Stephanie Portillo, Alexis Martinez, Alma Delia Calderon Velazquez, Michael Carver, Aubry Baird, Rebecca Plant, Nicole Recco, Jeffrey E. Rupard, Jesus Ortegon, Edith Sigaran, Olguimar Rodriguez-Ramos, Nicole Faulkner, Angel Gesario, Steven Cramp, Vanessa Gonzalez and Carla M Carrabbia
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv08333
Filed: November 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 ORDER RESCHEDULING ORAL ARGUMENT granting #1121 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court is in receipt of parties' request for adjournment of the previously ordered oral argument. The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 2/17/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 444, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/8/2017) (anc)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated January 31, 2017 re: Withdrawal of Julia Rabinovich as Attorney of Record. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Plaintiffs' Request to Adjourn Oral Argument regarding Class Certification addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated January 27, 2017. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT: The Court is in receipt of parties' motions regarding class certification which contest several requirements set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 23. The Court hereby schedules oral argument for February 2, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. The parties should appear in person at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, in Courtroom 1306 on the date and time specified above. (Oral Argument set for 2/2/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1306, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/24/2017) (cf)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER denying #1116 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated 10/18/2016. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. Plaintiffs' request to file sur-reply is DENIED. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/30/2016) (rjm)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated October 25, 2016 re: #1116 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated 10/18/2016. . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated October 21, 2016 re: #1116 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated 10/18/2016. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated 10/18/2016. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swartz, Justin)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Support re: #1072 MOTION for Judgment Denying Class Certification of Plaintiffs' State Law Claims Pursuant to Rule 23., #1071 MOTION for Judgment Decertifying the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 124, #2 Exhibit 125, #3 Exhibit 126, #4 Exhibit 127, #5 Exhibit 128, #6 Exhibit 129, #7 Exhibit 130, #8 Exhibit 131, #9 Exhibit 132, #10 Exhibit 133, #11 Exhibit 134, #12 Exhibit 135)(Murphy, Brian)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1072 MOTION for Judgment Denying Class Certification of Plaintiffs' State Law Claims Pursuant to Rule 23. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1071 MOTION for Judgment Decertifying the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #1073 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 85, #2 Exhibit 104, #3 Exhibit 106, #4 Exhibit 116, #5 Exhibit 119, #6 Exhibit 122, #7 Exhibit 123, #8 Exhibit 125, #9 Exhibit 126, #10 Exhibit 128, #11 Exhibit 130, #12 Exhibit 131, #13 Exhibit 142, #14 Exhibit 145, #15 Exhibit 147, #16 Exhibit 148, #17 Exhibit 153, #18 Exhibit 154, #19 Exhibit 155, #20 Exhibit 160, #21 Exhibit 161, #22 Exhibit 164, #23 Exhibit 165, #24 Exhibit 174, #25 Exhibit 184, #26 Exhibit 187, #27 Exhibit 188, #28 Exhibit 192, #29 Exhibit 199, #30 Exhibit 203, #31 Exhibit 206, #32 Exhibit 209, #33 Exhibit 242, #34 Exhibit 245, #35 Exhibit 249, #36 Exhibit 251, #37 Exhibit 252, #38 Exhibit 263, #39 Exhibit 272, #40 Exhibit 276, #41 Exhibit 284)(Swartz, Justin)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1073 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Opposition re: #1073 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 95, #2 Exhibit 96, #3 Exhibit 97, #4 Exhibit 98, #5 Exhibit 99, #6 Exhibit 100, #7 Exhibit 101, #8 Exhibit 102, #9 Exhibit 103, #10 Exhibit 104, #11 Exhibit 105, #12 Exhibit 106, #13 Exhibit 107, #14 Exhibit 108, #15 Exhibit 109, #16 Exhibit 110, #17 Exhibit 111, #18 Exhibit 112, #19 Exhibit 113, #20 Exhibit 114, #21 Exhibit 115, #22 Exhibit 116, #23 Exhibit 117, #24 Exhibit 118, #25 Exhibit 119, #26 Exhibit 120, #27 Exhibit 121, #28 Exhibit 122, #29 Exhibit 123)(Murphy, Brian)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1073 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #1071 MOTION for Judgment Decertifying the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA., #1072 MOTION for Judgment Denying Class Certification of Plaintiffs' State Law Claims Pursuant to Rule 23.. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1-10, #4 Exhibit 11-20, #5 Exhibit 21-30, #6 Exhibit 31-40, #7 Exhibit 41-50, #8 Exhibit 51-60, #9 Exhibit 61-70, #10 Exhibit 71-80, #11 Exhibit 81-91, #12 Exhibit 93-100, #13 Exhibit 101-110, #14 Exhibit 111-120, #15 Exhibit 121-130, #16 Exhibit 131-140, #17 Exhibit 141-150, #18 Exhibit 151-160, #19 Exhibit 161-170, #20 Exhibit 171-180, #21 Exhibit 181-190, #22 Exhibit 191-200, #23 Exhibit 201-210, #24 Exhibit 211-220, #25 Exhibit 221-230, #26 Exhibit 231-240, #27 Exhibit 241-250, #28 Exhibit 251-260, #29 Exhibit 261-270, #30 Exhibit 271-280, #31 Exhibit 281-291)(Swartz, Justin)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1072 MOTION for Judgment Denying Class Certification of Plaintiffs' State Law Claims Pursuant to Rule 23. . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1071 MOTION for Judgment Decertifying the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA. . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 DECLARATION of Appendix of Declarations in Support re: #1072 MOTION for Judgment Denying Class Certification of Plaintiffs' State Law Claims Pursuant to Rule 23., #1071 MOTION for Judgment Decertifying the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1-22, #2 Affidavit 23-35, #3 Affidavit 36-45, #4 Affidavit 46-57, #5 Affidavit 58-70, #6 Affidavit 71-81, #7 Affidavit 82-94, #8 Affidavit 95-102, #9 Affidavit 103-110, #10 Affidavit 111-118, #11 Affidavit 119-128, #12 Affidavit 129-138, #13 Affidavit 139-149, #14 Affidavit 150-160, #15 Affidavit 161-173, #16 Affidavit 174-184, #17 Affidavit 185-192, #18 Affidavit 193-198, #19 Affidavit 199-209, #20 Affidavit 210-217, #21 Affidavit 218-227, #22 Affidavit 228-235, #23 Affidavit 236-244)(Murphy, Brian)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 DECLARATION of David Gottlieb (and Exhibits A-L) in Support re: #1072 MOTION for Judgment Denying Class Certification of Plaintiffs' State Law Claims Pursuant to Rule 23., #1071 MOTION for Judgment Decertifying the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Support re: #1072 MOTION for Judgment Denying Class Certification of Plaintiffs' State Law Claims Pursuant to Rule 23., #1071 MOTION for Judgment Decertifying the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compendium (Exhibit 1), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7-25, #8 Exhibit 26-45, #9 Exhibit 46-65, #10 Exhibit 66-85, #11 Exhibit 86-94)(Murphy, Brian)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1072 MOTION for Judgment Denying Class Certification of Plaintiffs' State Law Claims Pursuant to Rule 23. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1071 MOTION for Judgment Decertifying the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 DECLARATION of Brian S. Schaffer in Support re: #1073 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 DECLARATION of Gregg I. Shavitz in Support re: #1073 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #1073 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-20, #3 Exhibit 21-30, #4 Exhibit 31-40, #5 Exhibit 41-50, #6 Exhibit 51-60, #7 Exhibit 61-70, #8 Exhibit 71-80, #9 Exhibit 81-90, #10 Exhibit 91-92, #11 Exhibit 93-98, #12 Exhibit 99-100, #13 Exhibit 101-110, #14 Exhibit 111-120, #15 Exhibit 121-130, #16 Exhibit 131-140, #17 Exhibit 141-150, #18 Exhibit 151-160, #19 Exhibit 161-170, #20 Exhibit 171-173)(Swartz, Justin)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1073 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' letter from August 25, 2016 and Defendants' response dated August 29, 2016. Plaintiffs object to the Defendants' submission of a Chart submitted in support of its certification reply briefs and seek to have this "Contradictions Chart" stricken. Plaintiffs' request is denied. Furthermore, the Court is in receipt of parties' jointly submitted letter dated September 9, 2016. The proposed schedule regarding the redaction of the submissions is approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/15/2016) (kko)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Melissa L. Stewart dated September 9, 2016 re: Updated Proposal for Filing Class Certification Briefs. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Stewart, Melissa)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Paul W. Mollica on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. New Address: Outten & Golden LLP, 161 N Clark Street, Suite 1600, Chicago, Illinois, United States 60601, 3128097010. (Mollica, Paul)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Justin Mitchell Swartz on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. New Address: Outten & Golden LLP, 685 Third Avenue, 25th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10017, 2122451000. (Swartz, Justin)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ossai Miazad on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. New Address: Outten & Golden LLP, 685 Third Avenue, 25th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10017, 2122451000. (Miazad, Ossai)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Melissa Lardo Stewart on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. New Address: Outten & Golden LLP, 685 Third Avenue, 25th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10017, 2122451000. (Stewart, Melissa)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #1089 Notice of Change of Address) - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Melissa E. Pierre-Louis on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. New Address: Outten & Golden LLP, 685 Third Avenue, 25th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10017, 2122451000. (Pierre-Louis, Melissa) Modified on 9/2/2016 (db).
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated August 29, 2016 re: Plaintiffs' Request to Strike the Chart Illustrating Contradictions in Deposition Testimony and Untimely Declaration Testimony. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated August 25, 2016 re: Plaintiffs' Request to Strike Chipotle's Chart Submitted in Violation of the Court's Page Limits. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swartz, Justin)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER granting #1084 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The proposed revisions to the briefing schedule are accepted. Moreover, the parties may bundle the public versions of the briefs by September 9, 2016 or after any remaining disputes relating to sealing or redaction are resolved by the Court. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/13/2016) (kgo)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/21/2016 Replies due by 8/22/2016. (kgo)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Class Certification Opposition Briefs and for Approval of Proposed Filing Procedure addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated 7/11/2016. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/6/2016. Justin M. Swartz, Melissa L. Stewart and Julia Rabinovich for Plaintiff(s). Brian D. Murphy and Lisa M. Lewis for Defendant(s). (tdh) Modified on 7/7/2016 (kgo).
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 ORDER granting #1082 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File response and reply briefs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/30/2016) (tro)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Response to Brief due by 8/15/2016. Responses to Brief due by 7/15/2016 (tro)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Class Certification Opposition briefs and Reply briefs addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated June 29, 2016. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: On June 22, 2016, Plaintiffs submitted a letter requesting leave to file a compendium. On June 23, 2016, Defendants filed a letter in response to Plaintiffs request. The Court will hold a telephone conference in this case on July 6 at 4:30 p.m. Plaintiffs should initiate the call to Defendants and, once all relevant parties are on the line, should contact the Court at (212) 805-4511 on the date and time specified above. Telephone Conference set for 7/6/2016 at 04:30 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/29/2016) (kgo)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated June 23, 2016 re: Plaintiffs' Request to File a Compendium. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated 06/22/2016 re: Request to File Compendium. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' letter dated June 7, 2016 and Defendants' response dated June 9, 2016. Plaintiffs' request for permission to file a consolidated opposition to Defendants' pending Motions is denied. Parties shall adhere to the page limits outlined in the Court's February 23, 2016 Order (ECF No. 1058). (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/15/2016) (kko)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated June 9, 2016 re: Plaintiffs' Request to File a Consolidated Opposition Brief to Separate Motions. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated 06/07/2016 re: Filing Consolidated Opposition Brief. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER granting #1074 Motion to Seal Document. Chipotle's request is granted. The parties may file the respective documents under seal. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/3/2016) (kgo)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated May 23, 2016. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Jay Francis Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 MOTION for Judgment Denying Class Certification of Plaintiffs' State Law Claims Pursuant to Rule 23. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 MOTION for Judgment Decertifying the Conditionally Certified Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #1069 Letter, filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Parties' proposed procedure is approved. ( Motions due by 5/9/2016.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/9/2016) (kgo)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy (On Behalf of All Parties) dated May 5, 2016 re: Adjustment of Filing Procedure for Certification/Decertification Motions. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Arsenio David Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Fitapelli & Schaffer LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, 10005, (212) 300-0375. (Rodriguez, Arsenio)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeffrey Hill Dorfman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, United States 10005, (212) 300-0375. (Dorfman, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Frank Joseph Mazzaferro on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Fitapelli & Schaffer, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, United States 10005, 2123000375. (Mazzaferro, Frank)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 OPINION & ORDER re: #1036 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. Phillip Johnson and Johnathan Gordon, #1039 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall. The defendants' motion to strike portions of Mr. Gordon's report is GRANTED with respect to the parts of his report that impute motives to the defendants and where Mr. Gordon proposes to testify about the actual duties and work performed by apprentices, but DENIED on all other grounds. The defendants' motion to strike Dr. Johnson's testimony regarding potential subclasses of plaintiffs is GRANTED, but defendants' remaining objections to Dr. Johnson's testimony are DENIED. The plaintiffs' motion to strike portions of Mr. Crandall's testimony is GRANTED to the extent he impermissibly testifies to legal argument or legal conclusions, and with respect to his use of benefits data in his hourly rate calculation, but DENIED with respect to all other grounds. For the reasons stated, the plaintiffs' motion to exclude testimony from Dr. Crandall is granted in part and denied in part. Chipotle's motion to exclude testimony from Mr. Gordon and Dr. Johnson is also granted in part and denied in part. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/15/2016) (kko)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian Scott Schaffer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, 10005, 2123000375. (Schaffer, Brian)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian Scott Schaffer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, 10005, 2123000375. (Schaffer, Brian)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a motion proceeding held on 3/3/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 3/3/2016 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Discovery Hearing held on 3/3/2016. (jnm)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 2/3/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/3/2016 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 ORDER. On February 19, 2016, the parties jointly submitted a letter proposing a briefing schedule and requesting leave to expand the page limits set out in the Court's Individual Rules. Parties' proposed briefing schedule is adopted. Parties are allotted 40 pages for opening and opposition briefs and 20 pages for reply briefs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/23/2016) (adc)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated February 19, 2016 re: Joint Proposal for Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 ORDER RESCHEDULING ORAL ARGUMENTS: The hearing originally scheduled for Wednesday, March 2, 2016, at 3:00 p.m. is hereby adjourned and rescheduled for Thursday, March 3, 2016, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. At the hearing, the Court will receive oral arguments on the defendant's fully briefed Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. Phillip Johnson and Jonathan Gordon and the plaintiffs' fully briefed Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall. (Oral Argument set for 3/3/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/16/2016) (kko)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENTS: A hearing is scheduled for Wednesday, March 2, 2016, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. At the hearing, the Court will receive oral arguments on the defendant's fully briefed Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. Phillip Johnson and Jonathan Gordon and the plaintiffs' fully briefed Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall. If this date is unavailable for any party, they must contact Courtroom Deputy Joseph Mendieta immediately at (212) 805-0286. ( Oral Argument set for 3/2/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/8/2016) (mro)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference held on 2/3/2016. Melissa Stewart and Justin Schwartz for Plaintiff(s). Brian Murphy, Bruce Montoya, John Shunk, Lou Grossman and Lisa Lewis for Defendant(s). (tdh)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #1052 Letter filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/2/2016) (kgo)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons outlined above, plaintiffs' limited objections to the R & R are granted. The parties have not filed objections to the remainder of the R & R. Having reviewed the portions of the R & R to which no objection was made, the Court finds no clear error in these portions. Accordingly, the Court adopts in part and modifies the Report and Recommendation. Defendants' motion is granted in part and denied in part. With the exception of the eleven plaintiffs that objected to the R & R, the unresponsive plaintiffs' FLSA claims are dismissed with prejudice. The withdrawing plaintiffs' motion is granted. Their FLSA Claims are dismissed without prejudice and tolled for 60 days following dismissal. All of these plaintiffs' rights to participate in the Rule 23 state law class actions are preserved. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/1/2016) (kgo)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated February 1, 2016 re: Participation in February 3 Conference by Telephone. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 ORDER granting #1049 Letter Motion for Conference. On January 15, 2016, the parties submitted a letter indicating that they have reached agreements in the time since they last proposed briefing dates for their upcoming motions. In light of these agreements, the Court will hold a conference in this case on February 3, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties should appear in person in Courtroom 1306 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, on the date and time specified above. Status Conference set for 2/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1306, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/15/2016) (kgo)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 1050 ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kgo)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference to Discuss Anticipated Briefings addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated January 15, 2016. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #1039 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall.. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J)(Swartz, Justin)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1039 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall. . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1036 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. Phillip Johnson and Johnathan Gordon. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #1036 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. Phillip Johnson and Johnathan Gordon.. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Swartz, Justin)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1036 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. Phillip Johnson and Johnathan Gordon. . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 DECLARATION of Brian Murphy in Opposition re: #1039 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1039 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #1039 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall.. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E)(Swartz, Justin)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1039 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall. . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Robert Crandall. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Support re: #1036 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. Phillip Johnson and Johnathan Gordon.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1036 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. Phillip Johnson and Johnathan Gordon. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. Phillip Johnson and Johnathan Gordon. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Responses due by 12/15/2015(Murphy, Brian)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated November 18, 2015 re: Briefing Schedule and Related Issues. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER granting #1033 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File joint letter to Judge Carter. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Letter with Judge Carter addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated November 13, 2015. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Hill Dorfman on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Dorfman, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Abigail Nitka on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. New Address: Messner Reeves, LLP, 805 Third Avenue, 18th FL, New York, New York, United States 10022, 6466631800. (Nitka, Abigail)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Abigail Nitka on behalf of All Parties. New Address: Messner Reeves, LLP, 805 Third Avenue, 18th FL, New York, New York, United States 10022, 646 663 1800. (Nitka, Abigail)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 10/9/2015. (jnm)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 ORDER granting #1028 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties shall file a joint letter with Judge Carter by November 13, 2015 to request a status conference to discuss motion practice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Melissa L. Stewart dated October 8, 2015. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Stewart, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Telephone Conference proceeding held on 09/25/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2016.(ca)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2015. (jnm)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #1024 Letter, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Christina Gateley, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker, re: Request for a Telephone Conference Regarding Expert Discovery. A telephone conference is scheduled for Friday, September 25 at 10:30 am to discuss the parties' letters regarding expert discovery issues, including Plaintiffs' request for a 3-week extension of the October 2 deadline for expert discovery. At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers, at (212) 805-0286, with all relevant individuals on the line. If this date is unavailable for any party, they must contact Courtroom Deputy Joseph Mendieta immediately at (212) 805-0286. SO ORDERED. (As further set forth within this Order.) ( Telephone Conference set for 9/25/2015 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/23/2015) (ajs)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated September 23, 2015 re: Request for a Telephone Conference Regarding Expert Discovery. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian Murphy dated 9/18/2015 re: Letter in response to Plaintiff's 9/17 letter regarding expert discovery. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated September 17, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' Request for an Extension of Expert Discovery Deadlines; Leave to Strike Portions of the Crandall Report; and Leave to Serve a Reply Expert Report. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 STIPULATION: 1. The Documents are authentic for purposes consistent with Article IX of the Federal Rules of Evidence; 2. The Documents reflect Defendants' business decision in or around 2002 or 2003 to convert California Assistant Managers from exempt to non-exempt. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/15/2015) (ajs)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Settlement Conference held on 9/11/2015. (jnm)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned Scott v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., No. 12-cv-8333. The date(s) for which such authorization is provided is (are) September 11, 2015. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/10/2015) (kl)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #1018 Brief,. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 BRIEF re: #1011 Objection to Report and Recommendations, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Limited Rule 72 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's July 31 Report and Recommendation. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 BRIEF re: #1011 Objection to Report and Recommendations, . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated August 21, 2015 re: Joint Letter Concerning Settlement Conference. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 ORDER: Having considered the parties' arguments, the Court orders the following: The Court grants Chipotle two additional weeks to submit its rebuttal expert report. The report shall be due by September 11, 2015. Depositions shall begin after September 11, 2015. All expert discovery shall close by October 2, 2015. The Court reminds the parties of their obligation to meet and confer and file a joint letter by Friday, August 21, 2015, indicating whether they wish (1) to go forward with the settlement conference currently scheduled for Friday, September 11, 2015; (2) if they prefer another date for the conference; or (3) if they feel such a conference would be unproductive. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 10/2/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/19/2015) (ajs)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated August 18, 2015 re: Chipotle's August 17, 2015 Request for Reconsideration and a Stay of the Court's August 14, 2015 Order, ECF No. 1010. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated August 17, 2015 re: Reconsideration of Order Denying Three-Week Extension of Expert Discovery Deadline. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #1011 Objection to Report and Recommendations,. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Swartz, Justin)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 OBJECTION to #1005 Report and Recommendations Plaintiffs' Limited Rule 72 Objections to the July 31 Report and Recommendation Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER: On August 13, 2015, the parties each filed letters seeking separate forms of relief (ECF Nos. 1006-07). On August 14, 2015, each party replied to the other's letter (ECF Nos. 1008-09). Accordingly, the Court orders the following: In their August 13, 2015 letter, the plaintiffs seek the reinstatement of claims by 11 opt-in plaintiffs who have become responsive since my July 31, 2015 Report and Recommendation recommending their dismissal. The defendant objects to this request. The plaintiffs' application should be made to the Hon. Andrew L. Carter, Jr. as part of any objection. In their August 13, 2015 letter, the defendant seeks a three-week extension of expert discovery. Its letter is filed more than two weeks after the plaintiffs served their reports. The defendant contends that an extension is necessary because of plaintiffs' two reports, one of which is "substantial," as well as for other, more mundane reasons. The plaintiffs argue that an extension is not appropriate given that defendant has failed to show compelling circumstances that justify the relief sought. In the alternative, the plaintiffs seek an opportunity to file a reply report with any revised discovery schedule. Defendant's apparent surprise by the size and scope of the plaintiffs' report is itself surprising given the history of this case. Moreover, the defendant has failed to act diligently in filing this request. Accordingly, the request to extend the deadline to file its rebuttal is denied. In light of the number of experts that remain to be deposed, and the need to exchange expert discovery before such depositions can occur, the Court will extend the final deadline for expert discovery to September 18, 2015. The parties are directed to meet and confer and file a joint letter by Friday, August 21, 2015, indicating whether they believe the settlement conference currently scheduled for Friday, September 11, 2015, will be productive. If they do not, the parties should propose three alternate dates for after the end of discovery. SO ORDERED. (Fact Discovery due by 9/18/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/14/2015) (ajs)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated August 14, 2015 re: In Response to Chipotle's Letter Dated August 13, 2015, ECF No. 1007, Regarding Extension of Expert Discovery Schedule. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated August 14, 2015 re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims of Reappearing Opt-In Plaintiffs. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated August 13, 2015 re: Extension of Expert Discovery Schedule. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated August 13, 2015 re: Notice of Appearance by Previously Unresponsive Plaintiffs Pursuant to ECF No. 1005. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Swartz, Justin)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons discussed above, the defendants' motion to dismiss the 66 unresponsive opt-in plaintiffs (listed in Attachment A) should be GRANTED with prejudice as to their FLSA claims under Rule 41(b) for failure to prosecute, or in the alternative, under Rule 37(b) for failure to comply with the Court's discovery orders, but without the award of costs to the defendants. The 11 plaintiffs' motion to withdraw should be GRANTED, and their FLSA claims should be dismissed without prejudice. The Court should permit the filing of such stipulations of withdrawal. All of these dismissals should preserve the plaintiffs' ability to participate in any Rule 23 state law class action relief. SO ORDERED. (As further set forth within this Report.) Objections to R&R due by 8/17/2015 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/31/2015) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(ajs)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 ORDER: On June 25, 2015, putative opt-in plaintiff Jason Lis filed his consent form to opt into the plaintiffs' claim under the Fair Labor Standards Act (the "FLSA"). As explained in my December 22, 2014 Order (ECF No. 841), the time for opting into the collective action ended approximately 16 months ago. On July 9, 2015, both parties filed letters addressing whether they believe there is good cause to accept Lis as a late opt-in filer (ECF Nos. 1001-02). The plaintiffs explain in their letter (ECF No. 1002) that Lis completed his form during the notice period but mistakenly failed to mail it until recently. This does not establish good cause, and accordingly, the Court denies his attempt to opt into the FLSA class. Lis's actions do not, however, preclude him from participating in this case as an absent Rule 23 class member. With this matter resolved, the telephone conference previously scheduled for July 13, 2015, is hereby ADJOURNED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/10/2015) (ajs)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated July 10, 2015 re: Untimely Consent Form. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Melissa L. Stewart dated 7/9/2015 re: Consent Form of Jason Lis. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Stewart, Melissa)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated July 9, 2015 re: Untimely Consent Form. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for Friday, September 11, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Procedures for Cases Referred for Settlement to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, a copy of which is available on the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Netburn. As further explained in my Procedures, all parties not just the attorneys must attend the settlement conference in person. The parties are strongly encouraged to engage in good-faith settlement negotiations before the settlement conference and preferably before the submission to the Court of the Ex Parte Settlement Letter, which is to be submitted by Friday, September 04, 2015. Should the parties believe in good faith that a settlement conference will not be productive, they shall notify the Court in writing and it will be adjourned. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 9/11/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/2/2015) (ajs) (Main Document 1000 replaced on 7/6/2015) (ajs). Modified on 7/6/2015 (ajs). Modified on 7/8/2015 (ajs).
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER: On June 25, 2015, putative opt-in plaintiff Jason Lis filed his consent form to opt into the plaintiffs' claim under the Fair Labor Standards Act. As explained in my December 22, 2014 Order (ECF No. 841), the time for opting into the collective action ended approximately 16 months ago. In accordance with my previous order, the parties may address in their next weekly letters whether they believe there is good cause to accept Lis as a late opt-in filer. Absent good cause shown, the late filing will be denied as untimely. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/2/2015) (ajs)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 998 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jason Lis.(ca)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 997 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated June 25, 2015 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 996 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated June 11, 2015 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 995 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #994 Letter, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Christina Gateley, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker, re: Status Update. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' requests to (a) adjourn the June 8, 2015 conference call and (b) amend the discovery schedule as proposed are GRANTED. No further extensions of the discovery schedule will be granted absent compelling circumstances. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 9/11/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/5/2015) (ajs)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 994 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated June 4, 2015 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 993 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #942 Order. (vf)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER granting #991 Motion for Julia Rabinovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 991 MOTION for Julia Rabinovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinovich, Julia)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #991 MOTION for Julia Rabinovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 990 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated May 29, 2015 re: Deposition of Monty Moran and Plaintiffs' Improper and Unilateral Designation of him as a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 989 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Telephone Conference proceeding held on 05/26/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 988 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Telephone Conference held on 5/26/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Mary Greco, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2015.(ca)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 987 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Proceeding held on 03/30/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 986 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Proceeding held on 3/30/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2015.(ca)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 985 ORDER: On April 21, 2015, Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. ("Chipotle") filed objections under Rule 72(a) to Magistrate Judge Netburn's Order dated April 15, 2015, ECF No. 959, which memorialized a ruling made by Judge Netburn during a conference on April 7, 2015. As stated by Judge Netburn during a telephone conference attended by the parties on April 21, 2015, Chipotle's objection on the basis of the work product protection is OVERRULED as untimely, Swartz Decl. Ex. 1, at 6. Gramercy Advisors, LLC v. Ripley, No. 13 Civ. 9070, 2014 WL 5847444, at *3 (S.D.N.Y. Nov. 12, 2014); Pegoraro v. Marrero, No. 10 Civ. 00051, 2013 WL 1448769, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. April 9, 2013). Moreover, for the reasons stated in the April 15, 2015 Order, as well as in Judge Netburn's March 27, 2015 Memorandum and Order, ECF No. 942, Chipotle's objection on the basis of the inadvertent waiver doctrine is OVERRULED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/26/2015) (ajs)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 5/26/2015. (jnm)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 984 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated May 22, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiffs' May 21, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lewis, Lisa)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 983 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated May 21, 2015 re: Discovery Disputes Pursuant to Protocol Ordered by Court, ECF No. 922. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Swartz, Justin)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 982 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated May 19, 2015 re: Response to Chipotle's May 12, 2015 Letter, ECF No. 981. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 981 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated May 12, 2015 re: Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice the Claims of 66 Unresponsive Opt-In Plaintiffs and 11 Opt-In Plaintiffs that have Requested Permission to Withdraw. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 980 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNCE proceeding held on 4/21/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Grant, Patricia)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 979 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/21/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2015.(Grant, Patricia)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER denying #966 Motion to Set Aside. Accordingly, for both procedural reasons and on the merits, Chipotle's motion to be relieved from the March 27 Order is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/7/2015) (ajs)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 977 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Julia Rabinovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10895928. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinovich, Julia) Modified on 5/7/2015 (sdi).
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #977 MOTION for Julia Rabinovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10895928. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing. Missing Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of California with the Clerk of Courts Signature. Not from the State Bar Association. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (sdi)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 976 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 975 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #966 MOTION to Set Aside #959 Order,,,,,, Pursuant to Rule72(a).. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Swartz, Justin)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 974 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #966 MOTION to Set Aside #959 Order,,,,,, Pursuant to Rule72(a). . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER: On April 20, 2015, in accordance with my April 15, 2015 Order (ECF No. 958), the plaintiffs submitted a list (ECF No. 965) of opt-in plaintiffs who were unresponsive at close of discovery on April 14, 2015. In an accompanying letter, the plaintiffs requested a briefing schedule on the proposed dismissal of those plaintiffs. Both parties have already submitted letters on this topic (ECF Nos. 822, 824). Accordingly, the Court grants each party the opportunity to supplement their briefs with one letter, which is not to exceed three pages. Chipotle shall file its letter by May 12, 2015; the plaintiffs shall respond by May 19, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/5/2015) (ajs)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 972 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated 5/1/2015 re: Request to file the within specified Exhibit under seal. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/5/2015) (rjm)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #972 Endorsed Letter to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (rjm)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 971 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated April 24, 2015 re: Chipotle's April 22, 2015 Rule 60(b) Application, ECF No. 970. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Swartz, Justin)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 970 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated April 22, 2015 re: Motion Pursuant to Rule 60(b). Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lewis, Lisa)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 969 ORDER: On April 21, 2015, the Court received an e-mail (attached as Exhibit A) from Anna Boiko Weyrauch, a reporter for the Denver affiliate station of PBS. In her e-mail, Ms. Boiko-Weyrauch asks the Court to unseal discovery materials in this case. The Court, however, is not aware of any documents having been sealed in this case. Certain documents have been submitted to the Court in camera for a privilege ruling, but have not otherwise been filed in this case and thus are not publicly available. In any event, should a sealed document be filed, applications to unseal a document must address the governing legal standards. Because the Court does not believe that any discovery has been sealed in this case, it does not take any action on this request. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/22/2015) Copies Sent by Chambers.(ajs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2015: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (ajs).
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 968 DECLARATION of Lisa M. Lewis in Support re: #966 MOTION to Set Aside #959 Order,,,,,, Pursuant to Rule72(a).. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lewis, Lisa)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 967 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #966 MOTION to Set Aside #959 Order,,,,,, Pursuant to Rule72(a). . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Lewis, Lisa)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 966 MOTION to Set Aside #959 Order,,,,,, Pursuant to Rule72(a). Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Lewis, Lisa)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2015. (jnm)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 965 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 4/20/2015 re: Unresponsive and Withdrawing Opt-ins. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 964 ORDER REGARDING GOOD FAITH AND WILLFULNESS: 1. The Eleventh (29 U.S.C. 259) and Twelfth (29 U.S.C. 260) Affirmative Defenses that Chipotle asserted in its Answer to the Second Amended Complaint, ECF No. 756, are withdrawn with prejudice, subject to Paragraph 4 of this Stipulation. 2. Chipotle will not contest good faith or willfulness under 29 U.S.C. 255 or any comparable state law included in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, subject to Paragraph 4 of this Stipulation. 3. Chipotle will not be required to produce documents listed on its Privilege Log that the Court deems privileged, without prejudice to Plaintiffs' right to appeal or object to any rulings. 4. Notwithstanding the foregoing, Chipotle may reassert any defenses available under 29 U.S.C. 255, 259 or 260 or comparable state laws if: (i) the Court grants Chipotle's forthcoming motion to decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") collective in response to any individual claims that are filed; (ii) the Court denies class certification pursuant to Rule 23 in response to any individual claims that are filed; and (iii) if Chipotle seeks leave to amend its Answer pursuant to Rules l5(a)(2) and 16(b)(4) to assert any of these defenses at least 60 days prior to the due date for the Joint Pre-Trial Order and the Court grants Chipotle leave to do so. Plaintiffs may oppose this application. If leave to amend is granted, Chipotle will produce any documents listed on its privilege log that the Court deems privileged within 10 days; Chipotle will not object to Plaintiffs conducting further discovery, including depositions, with respect to any documents subject to the Court's December 18, 2014 Order; and Chipotle will reimburse Plaintiffs for all costs and expenses of such discovery and reasonable attorneys' fees incurred in connection with it. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/20/2015) (ajs)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 963 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated April 17, 2015 re: Response to Chipotle's April 16 letter, ECF No. 961. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 962 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated April 16, 2015 re: Discovery Disputes Pursuant to the Protocol Ordered by the Court. Document filed by Jay Francis Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 961 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated April 16, 2015 re: Weekly Discovery Status Report. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 960 ORDER: On April 14, 2015, the parties appeared before me telephonically for a discovery conference. As requested in the plaintiffs' April 9, 2015 letter (ECF No. 954) and consented to by the defendant (ECF No. 955), the discovery schedule is extended as follows: requests for admission shall be due by June 9, 2015; Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be due by June 16, 2015; rebuttal expert disclosures shall be due by July 16, 2015; and all expert discovery shall be completed by July 31, 2015. ( Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/15/2015) (mro)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ORDER: On March 27, 2015, I issued a Memorandum and Order (ECF No. 942) granting in part and denying in part the plaintiffs motion to compel the production of certain documents. In relevant part, I ruled that the report of Chipotle's consultant, Cinda Daggett, was not privileged because she was not an agent of Chipotle's counsel at the time, Messner Reeves LLC. On April 2, 2015, the plaintiffs submitted a letter (ECF No. 948) arguing that documents that Chipotle had produced in response to my March 27, 2015 Order showed that Chipotle had waived any privilege to advice from Messner Reeves and from Mountain States Employers Counsel, a legal group whose advice I also ruled was privileged in my March 27, 2015 Order. The parties developed this argument in subsequent letters and in a telephone conference before me on April 7, 2015. As I ruled during the April 7, 2015 conference, Chipotle has waived the privilege over any attorney-client communications made to Daggett, and documents should be produced related to communications with her. This limited waiver, however, does not broadly waive the attorney-client privilege under the circumstances and in fairness. See In re Grand Jury Proceedings, 219 F.3d 175, 183-84 (2d Cir. 2000) (explaining that "a more limited form of implied waiver may be appropriate where disclosure occurred in a context that did not greatly prejudice the other party in the litigation"). See also In re von Bulow, 828 F.2d 94, 102 (2d Cir. 1987) (applying fairness doctrine to limit scope of waiver). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/15/2015) (mro)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 958 ORDER; In light of the close of fact discovery on April 14, 2015, the plaintiffs are directed to provide the Court with a list of all opt-in and named class member plaintiffs who remained nonresponsive on that date. The list provided to the Court should include the following information for each plaintiff: (a) the plaintiffs name; (b) what counsel asked of them; (c) when counsel called upon them; (d) how many times counsel contacted them; (e) whether they replied to counsel, and if so, when they stopped responding; and (f) whether they are still employed by the defendant. The plaintiffs shall provide this information to the Court by April 20, 2015. The plaintiffs may file a redacted version, if they believe it to be necessary, to protect their attorney-client communications, and email ex parte an unredacted version to chambers. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/15/2015) (mro)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 957 NOTICE of Termination of Appearance. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Gitig, Eric)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 956 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated April 10, 2015 re: Response to Chipotle's April 9 letter, ECF. No. 953. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 955 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated April 10, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiffs' April 9 Status Letter. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 954 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated April 9, 2015 re: Discovery Disputes Pursuant to the Protocol Ordered by the Court. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Swartz, Justin)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 953 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated April 9, 2015 re: Weekly Discovery Status Report. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER: Following a phone conference I held with the parties telephonically on April 7, 2015, the defendant submitted a document for in camera review. The Court has reviewed the document in camera and finds that the redacted material contains privileged communication. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/9/2015) (ajs)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 951 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated April 3, 2015 re: Response to April 2 Status Letter. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Murphy, Brian)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 950 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #949 Letter, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Christina Gateley, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker, re: Request to Reschedule April 6, 2015 Telephone Conference. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 4/7/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/3/2015) (ajs)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 949 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Melissa L. Stewart dated April 2, 2015 re: Request to Reschedule April 6, 2015 Telephone Conference. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Stewart, Melissa)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 948 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated April 2, 2014 re: Discovery Disputes Pursuant to Protocol Ordered by Court, ECF No. 922. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Swartz, Justin)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 947 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated April 2, 2015 re: Weekly Status Report. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 4/1/2015. (jnm)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 946 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #886 Motion for Protective Order. For the reasons stated on the record at today's conference, Chipotle's motion for a protective order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Chipotle does not need to undergo efforts to review the archived backup tapes; but it must continue to search for and produce documents that concern the decision to classify California Assistant Managers as non-exempt. In addition, Chipotle shall provide the plaintiffs with a stipulation related to the "California document," as to both its authenticity and whether it reflects the final decision of the company with respect to the 2003 reclassification. The parties shall notify the Court by April 2, 2015 on the status of this stipulation. The plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery related to the Aloha, MenuLink and PeopleSoft programs is GRANTED. Chipotle must produce the data (either the entire program, what is requested in plaintiffs' March 6, 2015 email, or by agreement of the parties) by April 10, 2015. The data shall be produced pursuant to the parties' protective order. The parties may discuss additional protections that may be necessary or appropriate to ensure that Chipotle's data remains confidential and for use solely in this litigation. The parties shall notify the Court by April 2, 2015 as to their agreement. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Docket Entry 886. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/30/2015) (ajs)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 945 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 27, 2015 re: Response to Chipotle's March 26, 2015 Letter, ECF No. 940. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 944 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated March 27, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiffs' March 26 Status Letter. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 943 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #941 Letter filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., re: Withdrawal of attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Attorney Deborah J. Denenberg terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/27/2015) (ajs)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 942 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiffs' motion to compel is granted in part and denied in part. It is GRANTED as to Entry No. 1, which is the Daggett report, and PARTIALLY GRANTED as to Entry Nos. 7, 29 and 30. The defendant must produce the non-privileged documents within two business days of today's date. The motion is DENIED as to all other entries, over which the defendant validly claims attorney-client privilege. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/27/2015) (ajs)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 941 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jean-Claude Mazzola dated 03/27/2015 re: Removing attorney from record. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Mazzola, Jean Claude)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 940 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Lewis dated March 26, 2015 re: Status. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Lewis, Lisa)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 939 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 26, 2015 re: Scheduling the Deposition of Mr. Moran. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Swartz, Justin)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 938 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 25, 2015 re: Response to Chipotle's March 23, 2015 Letter Regarding Privilege Log Nos. 1, 3-7 and 23-30. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swartz, Justin)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 3/24/2015. (jnm)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 937 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian Murphy dated March 23, 2015 re: Privileged Documents. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, Part 1, #4 Exhibit B, Part 2)(Murphy, Brian)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER denying #906 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court has not overlooked any issues or binding case law, and the issue has already been decided. The defendant's motion for reconsideration is denied. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/20/2015) (ajs)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 935 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #886 MOTION for Protective Order . . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 934 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Support re: #886 MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 933 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 3/20/2015 re: Response to Chipotle's 3/19/15 Discovery Dispute Letter. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER: The telephone conference previously scheduled for Monday, March 23, 2015, at 9:15 a.m., is hereby RESCHEDULED for Tuesday, March 24, 2015, at 9:15 a.m. At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers, at (212) 805-0286, with all relevant individuals on the line. This rescheduling does not affect the timing of future Monday morning telephone conferences. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 3/24/2015 at 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/20/2015) (ajs)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 931 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #928 Letter, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Christina Gateley, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker, re: Three Discovery and Scheduling Matters. ENDORSEMENT: The plaintiffs's request to extend the expert discovery schedule is GRANTED. Requests for Admission shall be due on April 21, 2015; Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be due on May 26, 2015; rebuttal expert disclosures shall be due on June 25, 2015; and all expert discovery must be completed by July 10, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 7/10/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/20/2015) (ajs)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER: This case is brought under the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") and state law and alleges that the defendant Chipotle Mexican Gill, Inc. ("Chipotle") failed to pay overtime compensation to its "Apprentice Managers." You are receiving this Court Order because you are a named plaintiff, or because you have filed a Consent to Become a Party Under the FLSA (i.e., the "Plaintiff Consent Form") and have therefore elected to opt into this litigation. As a named plaintiff, you have agreed to represent the interests of people like yourself and in so doing, to participate in this litigation, including by appearing for a deposition. As an opt-in plaintiff, you were specifically advised that you "may be asked to provide documents, to sit for a deposition and/or testify at trial." The parties have selected you to participate in discovery, either by appearing for a deposition or by responding to discovery requests. You must contact the plaintiffs' counsel by March 27, 2015 to schedule your deposition or to acknowledge your duty to produce written responses. If you fail to contact plaintiffs' counsel, your claims may be dismissed, which means you may not be entitled to a share in any judgment or settlement that is favorable to the plaintiffs, and if such dismissal is with prejudice, you may be prevented from pursuing these claims against Chipotle at a later date. You must contact one of the plaintiffs' counsel listed below by March 27, 2015. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/20/2015) (ajs)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 929 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated March 19, 2015 re: Status Letter on Outstanding Discovery Issues. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Lewis, Lisa)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 928 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Melissa L. Stewart dated 3/19/2015 re: Three Discovery and Scheduling Matters. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Stewart, Melissa)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 927 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated March 19, 2015 re: Reply in Further Support of Motion for Partial Reconsideration of February 27, 2015 Order. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 926 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #925 Letter, filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., re: Request to Supplement Letter Briefing Regarding Applicability of Privilege to Documents on Chipotle's Privilege Log with Testimony of Witnesses Associated Therewith. ENDORSEMENT: The defendant's request is GRANTED. The defendant may file a short supplemental letter of no more than three pages regarding the privilege log dispute by March 23, 2015. The plaintiffs may reply by March 25, 2015, in a letter not to exceed two pages. These are to be the final letters on this matter until this Court has issued its Opinion and Order. The parties are reminded of my March 17, 2015 Order (ECF No. 922) and are ordered to comply with the protocol it establishes. The letters described above and the defendant's reply regarding its Motion for Reconsideration, which is expected today, are the only letters that are to be exempt from this protocol, which is to be strictly followed in the future. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/19/2015) (ajs)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 925 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated March 19, 2015 re: Request to Supplement Letter Briefing Regarding Applicability of Privilege to Documents on Chipotle's Privilege Log with Testimony of Witnesses Associated Therewith. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 924 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 3/18/2015 re: Contemplated Motion to Compel Production of Aloha, Menulink, and PeopleSoft Data. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swartz, Justin)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 923 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 17, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Justin Mitchell Swartz to RE-FILE Document #921 Response in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 922 ORDER: To facilitate the prompt resolution of discovery disputes and to conserve the resources of the Court and the parties, the Court is establishing the following protocol. On each Thursday before 5:00 p.m., a party may file a letter, no longer than three pages, raising any outstanding discovery matters (after having exhausted the parties' meet and confer obligations). The opposing party may file a responsive letter, no longer than two pages, by Friday before 5:00 p.m. (Accordingly, each side may, if necessary, submit two letters with a total page limit of five.) No other letters shall be submitted. The Court will conduct a telephone conference each Monday morning at 9:15 a.m. At that time, the parties shall jointly call chambers at (212) 805-0286. This protocol will remain in place until April 14, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/17/2015) (ajs)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 921 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #906 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #896 Order, . . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin) Modified on 3/18/2015 (db).
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 920 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian Murphy dated March 16, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiff's March 16, 2015 Letter, ECF No. 919. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 919 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 16, 2015 re: Response to Chipotle's March 16, 2015 Letter Regarding the California Classification Decision, ECF No. 918. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 918 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian Murphy dated March 16, 2015 re: Production of Document. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 3/12/2015. (jnm)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 917 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #886 MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Swartz, Justin)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 916 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #886 MOTION for Protective Order . . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 915 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Telephone Conference proceeding held on 3/2/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(soh)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 914 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2015.(soh)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 913 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated March 11, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiffs' March 10, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lewis, Lisa)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 912 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Joshua Gitig on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Gitig, Eric)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 911 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 10, 2015 re: Request a Pre-Motion Conference Regarding Intended Motion to Compel. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Swartz, Justin)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 910 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 9, 2015 re: Response to Chipotle's March 9, 2015 Letter, ECF No. 909. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 909 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated March 9, 2015 re: Defendant's Privilege Log. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 908 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #906 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #896 Order, . . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 907 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Support re: #906 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #896 Order, .. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 906 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #896 Order, . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 905 ORDER: The Court endorses the parties' joint application setting a briefing schedule for Chipotle's motion for a protective order. The parties agree and the Court acknowledges that if the Court denies the motion, there will be a limited period of discovery for purposes of producing responsive documents. The Court is not inclined to permit further discovery or depositions if the motion is denied, but defers ruling on facts not before it at this time. With respect to the plaintiffs' request that Chipotle supplement the ESI production from two corporate custodians (Kristen Dominguez and Christine Moore), the Court denies this request without prejudice to a showing, following their depositions, that the proposed expanded search is likely to result in the production of unique, relevant documents. These depositions, however, will not be held open and shall be completed on the date commenced regardless of any subsequent ruling. The Court directs Chipotle to undertake the revised search protocol proposed by the plaintiffs in connection with the ESI produced for Chipotle's manager declarants. This search shall include individual accounts. Chipotle may produce such documents four business days in advance of the declarant's deposition. The declarants will be produced for only one deposition; accordingly, the parties shall work together to schedule depositions in a manner that permits ESI disclosure four business days before a scheduled deposition. The Court declines to direct Chipotle to produce five declarants each week given the understandable difficulty in scheduling such depositions though it recommends a schedule of that magnitude. The Court denies the plaintiffs' request that Chipotle produce damages discovery for opt-in plaintiffs by March 9, 2015. Chipotle may produce such discovery after the close of fact discovery. With respect to outstanding depositions, Chipotle must produce (and therefore schedule) the depositions of Mr. Moran and Mr. Spong. Chipotle shall schedule Mr. Moran's deposition regardless of its decision to pursue reconsideration or an objection absent further court order. The plaintiffs may depose Pete Olds and Bethany Strong. In light of the deposition schedule and the press of work, the Court sua sponte grants the parties an additional two weeks, or until April 14, 2015 to complete fact discovery. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/6/2015) (ajs)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ORDER: This case is brought under the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") and state law and alleges that the defendant Chipotle Mexican Gill, Inc. ("Chipotle") failed to pay overtime compensation to its "Apprentice Managers." You are receiving this Court Order because you are a named plaintiff, or because you have filed a Consent to Become a Party Under the FLSA (i.e., the "Plaintiff Consent Form") and have therefore elected to opt into this litigation. As a named plaintiff, you have agreed to represent the interests of people like yourself and in so doing, to participate in this litigation, including by appearing for a deposition. As an opt-in plaintiff, you were specifically advised that you "may be asked to provide documents, to sit for a deposition and/or testify at trial." The parties have selected you to participate in discovery, either by appearing for a deposition or by responding to discovery requests. You must contact the plaintiffs' counsel by March 13, 2015 to schedule your deposition or to acknowledge your duty to produce written responses. If you fail to contact plaintiffs' counsel, your claims may be dismissed, which means you may not be entitled to a share in any judgment or settlement that is favorable to the plaintiffs, and if such dismissal is with prejudice, you may be prevented from pursuing these claims against Chipotle at a later date. You must contact one of the plaintiffs' counsel listed below by March 13, 2015 (see Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/6/2015) (ajs)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 4/14/2015. (ajs)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 903 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 5, 2015 re: Further Support for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Chipotle's Privilege Log (ECF Nos. 880 & 895), and Notice of Receipt of Subpoenaed Materials from Mark Parcheta. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Swartz, Justin)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 902 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated March 5, 2015 re: Status Update Concerning Various Discovery Issues. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 901 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 4, 2015 re: Status Update Concerning Various Discovery Disputes. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Swartz, Justin)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 900 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #899 Letter filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., re: Joint Request for One-Day Extension to Submit Joint Letter. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The parties shall file their joint letter by March 4, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/3/2015) (ajs)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 899 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated March 3, 2015 re: Joint Request for One-Day Extension to Submit Joint Letter. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 898 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #890 Letter, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Christina Gateley, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker, re: Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Chipotle to Produce Declarants for Depositions During the Week of March 2, and Plaintiffs' Request for a Schedule for Expert Discovery and Requests for Admission. ENDORSEMENT: On consent of the parties, the plaintiffs' requested deadlines for (1) expert discovery and (2) requests for admissions are GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 6/26/2015. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/2/2015) (ajs)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 897 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul W. Mollica on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Mollica, Paul)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2015. (jnm)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 895 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 1, 2015 re: Further Support for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Production of Documents Listed on Chipotle's Privilege Log (ECF No. 880). Document filed by Jay Francis Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER: The Court is mindful of Mr. Moran's schedule, and accepts that he may, indeed, have very little to testify about on the relevant topics. But the plaintiffs should be given a limited opportunity to probe his institutional memory. Accordingly, the Court grants the plaintiffs a four-hour deposition of Mr. Moran at a time and location of his convenience. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/27/2015) (lmb)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER finding as moot #860 Motion to Amend/Correct. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for Monday, March 2, 2015, at 2:30 p.m. to discuss the issues raised in the plaintiffs' February 26, 2015 letter (ECF No. 890), and to set a briefing schedule for the defendant's motion for a protective order (ECF No. 886). At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers, at (212) 805-0286, with all relevant individuals on the line. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 3/2/2015 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/27/2015) (ajs)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 892 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated February 27, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiffs' 2/26 Letter (Doc. 890) regarding Declarant depositions and expert deadlines [CORRECTED]. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lewis, Lisa)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 891 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated February 27, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiffs' 2/26 Letter (Doc. 890) regarding Declarant depositions and expert deadlines. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Lewis, Lisa)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 890 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 2/26/2015 re: Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Chipotle to Produce Declarants for Depositions During the Week of March 2, and Plaintiffs' Request for a Schedule for Expert Discovery and Requests for Admission. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 889 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #886 MOTION for Protective Order . . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 888 DECLARATION of Raymond Jones in Support re: #886 MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 887 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Support re: #886 MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 886 MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 885 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 2/9/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 884 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 2/9/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 883 ORDER granting #881 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Keith M. Stern terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 882 DECLARATION of Keith M. Stern in Support re: #881 MOTION for Keith M. Stern to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Stern, Keith)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 881 MOTION for Keith M. Stern to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker.(Shavitz, Gregg)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 880 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated February 24, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' request for in camera review of Privilege Log entries 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, and 30. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Swartz, Justin)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 879 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated February 20, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' Request to Depose Chipotle's Co-CEO, Montgomery F. Moran. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 878 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 2/20/2015 re: Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Letter Dated February 20, 2015, ECF No. 877. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 877 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated February 20, 2015 re: Motion to Compel Chipotle to Produce Mr. Moran for Deposition and Mr. Spong for Continued Deposition. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 876 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #875 Letter, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Christina Gateley, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker, re: Plaintiffs' Request for an Extension of Time to Submit Status Report Regarding Privilege Log Meet and Confer. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The parties shall file their joint status letter by Tuesday, February 24, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/20/2015) (ajs)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 875 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Melissa L. Stewart dated February 20, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' Request for an Extension of Time to Submit Status Report Regarding Privilege Log Meet and Confer. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stewart, Melissa)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ANSWER to #872 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 873 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated February 13, 2015 re: Plaintiffs Renewed Application to Compel Chipotle to Produce Monty Moran for Deposition, and Application for Leave to Complete the Deposition of Timothy Spong. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Christina Gateley, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Swartz, Justin)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 872 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #751 Amended Complaint, against All Defendants.Document filed by Maxcimo Scott, Matthew A. Medina, Jay F. Ensor, Krystal Parker, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Christina Gateley. Related document: #751 Amended Complaint, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker.(Swartz, Justin)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Discovery Hearing held on 2/9/2015. (jnm)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 871 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated February 6, 2015 re: Response to Chipotle's February 3, 2015 Letter Regarding the Scope of Depositions for Plaintiffs' Declarants and the February 2, 2015 Deadline. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Swartz, Justin)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 870 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian Murphy dated February 6, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiffs' February 3, 2015 Letter Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference regarding Chipotle's Privilege Log and Privilege Objections, California Classification Documents, and Motion to Amend the Complaint. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement B)(Murphy, Brian)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 869 ORDER: At the discovery conference on Monday, February 9, 2015, the Court will discuss the issues raised in the parties' letters found at ECF Nos. #855 , #856 , #857 , #865 , #866 , and #868 . In addition, the Court intends to discuss the status of the defendant's motion to amend its answer (ECF No. #860 ). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/5/2015) (ajs)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 868 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated February 4, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiffs' January 30, 2015 Letter regading motion to compel compliance with 30(b)(6) deposition notice. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lewis, Lisa)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER: On February 3, 2015, the defendant filed a Motion to Amend/Correct Chipotle's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. #860 ). The parties shall meet and confer on an appropriate schedule for briefing the motion, but that in no circumstances shall it be longer than what is provided for in Local Civil Rule 6.1(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/4/2015) (ajs)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 866 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated February 3, 2015 re: outstanding discovery disputes regarding declarant discovery. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lewis, Lisa)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Lisa M. Lewis to RE-FILE Document #864 LETTER MOTION for Conference on oustanding discovery disputes regrding declarant discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated February 3, 2015. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 865 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated February 3, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' Request for a Pre-Motion Conference regarding Chipotle's Privilege Log and Privilege Objections, California Classification Documents, and Plaintiffs' Contemplated Motion to Amend the Complaint. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Swartz, Justin)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 864 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference on oustanding discovery disputes regrding declarant discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated February 3, 2015. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lewis, Lisa) Modified on 2/4/2015 (db).
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ORDER granting #859 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The February 9, 2015 conference shall begin at 12:00. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 862 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Support re: #860 MOTION to Amend/Correct Chipotle's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B)(Murphy, Brian)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 861 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #860 MOTION to Amend/Correct Chipotle's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 860 MOTION to Amend/Correct Chipotle's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 859 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference from 2/9/2015 at 11:00 a.m. to 2/9/2015 at 12:00 p.m. addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Melissa L. Stewart dated 2/2/2015. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Stewart, Melissa)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ORDER granting #855 Letter Motion for Conference. The parties shall appear for a conference to address all of the outstanding disputes raised in the various letters recently filed. The conference shall be held on Monday, February 9, 2015 at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 219 at the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. Chipotle may file a response to plaintiff's January 30 letter by February 4, 2015. By February 5, the plaintiffs shall deliver courtesy copies to chambers of all of the letters and exhibits. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 857 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 1/30/2015 re: Pre-Motion Conference regarding Motion to Compel Production of Aloha and Menulink Data and Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Swartz, Justin)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 856 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated January 29, 2015 re: #855 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Discovery Disputes addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 1/26/2015. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lewis, Lisa)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 855 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Discovery Disputes addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 1/26/2015. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Swartz, Justin)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER. For the reasons stated in Magistrate Judge Netbum's thoughtful and well-written Memorandum and Order dated December 18, 2014, ECF No. 839, the Defendant's January 2, 2015 objections under Rule 72(a) to that Memorandum and Order, ECF No. 842, are OVERRULED. Moreover, the Defendant's January 20, 2015 request for a pre-motion conference to obtain leave to file a Motion to Stay the December 18, 2014 Order, ECF No. 853, is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate ECF No. 842. Terminating #842 MOTION to Set Aside #839 Memorandum & Opinion Pursuant to Rule 72(a). (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/23/2015) (rjm)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 853 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated January 20, 2015 re: Stay of December 18 Order Pending Ruling on Rule 72 Objections. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 852 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #842 MOTION to Set Aside #839 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Pursuant to Rule 72(a).. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Swartz, Justin)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 851 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #842 MOTION to Set Aside #839 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Pursuant to Rule 72(a). . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER: The Court issued an Opinion & Order on December 18, 2014, holding that Chipotle had waived the attorney-client privilege in connection with certain affirmative defenses it asserted and directed that Chipotle produce the relevant documents by January 9, 2015. On January 2, 2015, Chipotle moved before the Hon. Andrew L. Carter, Jr., to set aside that decision, and on January 7, 2015, Chipotle sought a stay of my decision. I granted a limited stay, until January 26, 2015, and directed that any subsequent stay application shall be presented to Judge Carter. Thereafter, the plaintiffs sought, among other things, a briefing scheduling for any subsequent stay application. Chipotle objects to a schedule as premature, and the Court agrees. Absent a ruling from Judge Carter, Chipotle shall produce all relevant documents by January 26, 2015. Chipotle is advised, however, that any subsequent stay application must be filed with sufficient time to permit the plaintiffs to respond and Judge Carter to rule in advance of January 26, 2015. The parties are encouraged to cooperate to set an appropriate schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/13/2015) (ajs)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 849 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated January 12, 2015 re: Stay of December 18 Order. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 848 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 1/9/2015 re: Chipotle's Request for a Stay of the Court's December 18, 2014 Order. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 847 ORDER: On January 7, 2015, the Court received a letter from the defendant (ECF No. #846 ) seeking a stay of the Court's December 18, 2014 Opinion & Order (ECF No. #839 ), pending a decision on defendant's motion to set aside that decision, which was filed before Judge Carter on January 2, 2015. The Opinion & Order denied the defendant's motion for a protective order and directed the defendant to produce all responsive documents previously withheld on the basis of privilege by January 9, 2015. The plaintiffs have not responded to the defendant's letter as of the filing of this order. Relevant to my consideration is the March 31, 2015 close of fact discovery. The Court has stated that no further extensions shall be granted. The Court further understands that electronically stored discovery will be completed by January 30, 2015, with the majority of depositions conducted in February and March. In light of this schedule and the unopposed request for a stay, I will grant a limited stay of the Opinion & Order until January 26, 2015. Any further stay must be sought from Judge Carter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/8/2015) (ajs)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 846 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated January 6, 2015 re: Stay of December 18 Order Pending Resolution of Rule 72 Objections. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Brian Daniel Murphy to RE-FILE Document #845 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #839 Memorandum & Opinion, Seeking Stay of Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated January 6, 2015. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 845 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #839 Memorandum & Opinion, Seeking Stay of Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated January 6, 2015. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian) Modified on 1/7/2015 (db).
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 844 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #842 MOTION to Set Aside #839 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Pursuant to Rule 72(a). . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 843 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Support re: #842 MOTION to Set Aside #839 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Pursuant to Rule 72(a).. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 842 MOTION to Set Aside #839 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Pursuant to Rule 72(a). Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER: Accordingly, the parties shall comply with the following protocol for the declarant witnesses: The plaintiffs shall be permitted to depose 10% of the witnesses (or 21 individuals). The plaintiffs may select 75% (16) of the deponents, and Chipotle may select 25% (5). Depositions of declarant witnesses shall be limited only by the rules of relevancy. Although the Court sets no time limits on these depositions (other than the existing seven-hour rule, and the March 31, 2015 cut-off), the parties should endeavor to conduct a declarant witness deposition within four hours. Ten business days before a scheduled deposition, Chipotle shall produce for each declarant witness personnel files, pay data, scheduling data, prep deployment charts, schedules, and email discovery. The plaintiffs may not serve additional discovery demands seeking contact information for every employee who worked with the declarant or supplemental job histories and contact information for managers. The plaintiffs may, however, inquire into these subjects during the depositions. Chipotle will not be limited on the use of declarant witnesses at trial, but the plaintiffs shall be permitted an opportunity to depose any trial witness within two weeks of the start of trial. The plaintiffs will be entitled to the same paper discovery addressed above for any such trial witness. On mutual agreement of the parties, all new declarations shall be produced on a rolling basis, and no new declarations shall be produced after February 2, 2015. An additional, unrelated matter has also arisen recently concerning a late-filed opt-in consent form. Although dated December 31, 2013, the consent form is postmarked November 21, 2014. This postmark date is approximately ten months after the close of the opt-in period. The Court will permit plaintiffs' counsel to speak with this filer to see whether good cause can be established. Absent such a showing, however, the Court will deny this late-filed consent form. This case has been pending for several years, and the parties are working to wind down discovery. Although this is just one late filer, the need for certainty and closure outweighs the other interests presented. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/22/2014) (ajs)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ORDER granting #838 Motion for Louis Matthew Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 839 OPINION & ORDER re: #781 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. The defendant has invoked two statutory defenses requiring showings of good faith. Although the defendant attempts to disclaim any reliance on the advice of counsel, the parties have demonstrated that the defendant did in fact possess the advice of counsel on this issue. Where the defendant has clearly benefited from the advice of counsel on the very issue on which it asserts good faith, it puts its relevant attorney-client communications at issue and thereby waives its privilege. Therefore, the defendant's Motion for a Protective Order is DENIED. Chipotle shall produce all responsive documents previously withheld on privilege grounds by January 9, 2015. Chipotle shall also respond to Request No. 10 of Plaintiffs' Sixth Request for the Production of Documents by the same date. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Docket Number 781. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/18/2014) (mro)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 838 MOTION for Louis Matthew Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10423784. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grossman, Louis)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 837 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Louis Matthew Grossman on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grossman, Louis)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #838 MOTION for Louis Matthew Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10423784. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ORDER: This case is brought under the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") and state law and alleges that the defendant Chipotle Mexican Gill, Inc. ("Chipotle") failed to pay overtime compensation to its "Apprentice Managers." You are receiving this Court Order because you are a named plaintiff, or because you have filed a Consent to Become a Party Under the FLSA (i.e., the "Plaintiff Consent Form") and have therefore elected to opt into this litigation. As a named plaintiff, you have agreed to represent the interests of people like yourself and in so doing, to participate in this litigation, including by appearing for a deposition. As an opt-in plaintiff, you were specifically advised that you "may be asked to provide documents, to sit for a deposition and/or testify at trial." The parties have selected you to participate in discovery, either by appearing for a deposition or by responding to discovery requests. You must contact the plaintiffs' counsel by December 23, 2014 to schedule your deposition or to acknowledge your duty to produce written responses. If you fail to contact plaintiffs' counsel, your claims may be dismissed, which means you may not be entitled to a share in any judgment or settlement that is favorable to the plaintiffs, and if such dismissal is with prejudice, you may be prevented from pursuing these claims against Chipotle at a later date. You must contact one of the plaintiffs' counsel listed below by December 23, 2014. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/11/2014) (ajs)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 835 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated December 10, 2014 re: Order to Unresponsive Written Discovery Only Plaintiffs. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 834 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 12/9/2014 re: Plaintiffs' Support for the Proposition that Chipotle Received Legal Advice Regarding the Classification of Apprentices, and the Status of Unresponsive Plaintiffs. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Swartz, Justin)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 833 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 12/9/2014 re: Status Update Concerning the Scope of Discovery with Respect to Chipotle's 206 Declarant Witnesses and the Parties' Positions Regarding the Consent Form of Tony Smith. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Swartz, Justin)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 832 NOTICE of Declaration of David Gottlieb. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER: On November 25, 2014, the Court received a consent form from potential opt-in plaintiff Tony Smith. The form was signed on December 31, 2013 but was not postmarked until November 21, 2014. The parties are directed to address briefly, in their December 9, 2014 letters to the Court, their positions on whether or not Mr. Smith should be allowed to join this case as an opt-in plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/8/2014) (ajs)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 830 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 829 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 11/20/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER granting #827 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' submissions may be filed on December 9, 2014. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 827 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Letter and Other Filings addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Melissa L. Stewart dated December 3, 2014. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Stewart, Melissa)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER: The final deadline for fact discovery is March 31, 2015. This deadline will not be extended again. The defendant shall produce all electronically stored information ("ESI") on a rolling basis, to be completed no later than January 30, 2015. The ESI disclosures shall include the documents of custodian Monty Moran, under terms to be agreed upon by the parties. The plaintiffs are permitted to depose Restaurant Support Officer Michael Duffy as provided under Rule 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The plaintiffs' application to depose Co-CEO and Secretary Monty Moran is denied without prejudice. The plaintiffs may renew their application after the completion of ESI discovery. Such application may include excerpts from depositions and, if appropriate, an in camera review of certain documents that support the plaintiffs' position that Moran has unique non-cumulative information. The plaintiffs' application shall be filed no later than February 13, 2015, and defendant's response shall be filed no later than February 20, 2015. The plaintiffs shall file one or more letters on December 4, 2014, to address (1) the status of unresponsive plaintiffs, including a detailed chart as discussed at the hearing; (2) the plaintiffs' support for the proposition that the defendants actually received legal advice regarding the classification of "Apprentice Manager" employees, including any relevant deposition testimony, and (3) proposed discovery with respect to the defendants' 206 affiants. The defendant shall file by December 4, 2014, a declaration from its Rule 30(b)(6) witness, David Gottlieb, describing how long he has been at Chipotle, his title and duties there, his role in the classification of the apprentice position, and his prior work, generally, for the defendant as an attorney at Messner and Reeves LLP. The Court does not anticipate the disclosure of privileged information in this declaration. But to the extent defendant believes such information would be useful, defendant may file on ECF a redacted declaration and deliver an ex parte unredacted version to the Court. Finally, counsel for the plaintiffs shall immediately send to all unresponsive plaintiffs the Courts order filed simultaneously, which addresses plaintiffs need to comply with discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/21/2014) (ajs)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER: You are receiving this Court Order because you are a named plaintiff, or because you have filed a Consent to Become a Party Under the FLSA (i.e., the "Plaintiff Consent Form") and have therefore elected to opt into this litigation. As a named plaintiff, you have agreed to represent the interests of people like yourself and in so doing, to participate in this litigation, including by appearing for a deposition. As an opt-in plaintiff, you were specifically advised that you "may be asked to provide documents, to sit for a deposition and/or testify at trial." The parties have selected you to participate in discovery, either by appearing for a deposition or by responding to discovery requests. You must contact the plaintiffs' counsel by December 3, 2014 to schedule your deposition or to acknowledge your duty to produce written responses. If you fail to contact plaintiffs' counsel, your claims may be dismissed, which means you may not be entitled to a share in any judgment or settlement that is favorable to the plaintiffs, and if such dismissal is with prejudice, you may be prevented from pursuing these claims against Chipotle at a later date. You must contact one of the plaintiffs' counsel listed below by December 3, 2014. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/21/2014) (ajs)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2015. Motions due by 2/13/2015. Responses due by 2/20/2015 (ajs)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 824 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 11/18/2014 re: Outstanding Discovery Issues to be Addressed During November 20 Conference. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Swartz, Justin)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 823 STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report re Opt-in Discovery Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 822 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated November 18, 2014 re: Outstanding Discovery Issues to be Addressed During November 20 Conference. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 821 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated November 18, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Request to Depose Chipotle's Senior Executives. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 820 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Telephone Conference proceeding held on 10/17/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 819 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/17/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2015.(ca)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER granting #817 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The conference previously scheduled for November 17 is ADJOURNED and RESCHEDULED for Thursday, November 20, 2014 at 3:00 in Courtroom 219 at the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY. The parties may file their joint status letter by Tuesday, November 18. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 817 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Submit the Joint Status Letter and Other Filings Currently Due On November 14, 2014 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Melissa L. Stewart dated November 11, 2014. Document filed by Jay Francis Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Stewart, Melissa)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 816 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Telephone Conference proceeding held on 10/31/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 815 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2015.(ca) (Main Document 815 replaced on 11/12/2014) (ca).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 814 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated November 10, 2014 re: Rescheduled Conference Date. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 813 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #812 Letter filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: The Court cannot accommodate this particular change in its schedule. Therefore, the defendant's request is DENIED. If defendant feels that this will cause prejudice, it is invited to first check with the plaintiffs and then, upon their consent, request that the Court move the conference to either 4 p.m. November 18, or 3 p.m. November 20. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/7/2014) (kgo)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 812 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated November 7, 2014 re: Advancement of Start Time for November 17 Conference. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 811 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah J. Denenberg on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Denenberg, Deborah)
November 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER granting #804 Letter Motion for Conference. The parties shall meet and confer to discuss the issues raised in this letter. If no agreement can be reached, defendant shall respond in writing by no later than November 13, 2014. The issues raised shall be addressed at the conference on November 17, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER: The parties shall endeavor to locate replacement candidates for deposition for those opt-in plaintiffs who have been unresponsive to date, as set forth within. The parties shall file a joint letter with the Court on November 14, 2014, addressing the status of deposition scheduling. On that same date, each side may file a letter addressing any outstanding discovery issues, including the appropriate consequences for unresponsive opt-in plaintiffs. Status Conference set for 11/17/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/31/2014) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Information)(ajs)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER granting #803 Motion for Scott L. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 807 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2014. (jnm)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 806 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated October 30, 2014 re: Joint Status Update. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 805 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abigail Nitka on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Nitka, Abigail)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 804 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Fact Witness Depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 10/29/2014. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Swartz, Justin)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #803 MOTION for Scott L. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 803 MOTION for Scott L. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Evans, Scott)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 802 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jean Claude Mazzola on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Mazzola, Jean Claude)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 801 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Scott L. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10247072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Evans, Scott) Modified on 10/27/2014 (bcu).
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #801 MOTION for Scott L. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10247072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Expired Certificate of Good Standing. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (bcu)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 10/24/2014. (jnm)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 800 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 10/23/2014 re: the Status of Opt-In Deposition Scheduling and Replacements. Document filed by Jay Francis Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 799 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Discovery Hearing proceeding held on 09/12/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 798 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Discovery Hearing held on 9/12/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2015.(ca)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 797 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated October 16, 2014 re: In Response to Chipotle's October 10, 2014 Letter Motion (refiled October 14, 2014). Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Swartz, Justin)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER granting #795 Letter Motion for Conference. A telephone conference is scheduled for October 17, 2014, at 11 a.m. to discuss the defendant's October 14, 2014 letter regarding the dates for certain depositions. At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers, at (212) 805-0286, with all relevant individuals on the line. If the parties have already resolved this matter, they should notify the Court immediately. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 10/17/2014 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/16/2014) (ajs)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 795 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #781 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion. addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated October 14, 2014. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 794 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated October 10, 2014 re: Conference Directing Plaintiffs to Provide Dates for Depositions. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Brian Daniel Murphy to RE-FILE Document #793 LETTER MOTION for Conference Directing Plaintiffs to Provide Dates for Depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated October 10, 2014. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 793 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference Directing Plaintiffs to Provide Dates for Depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated October 10, 2014. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian) Modified on 10/14/2014 (db).
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 792 DECLARATION of Lisa M. Lewis in Support re: #781 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Lewis, Lisa)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 791 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #781 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Lewis, Lisa)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 790 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #781 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Lewis)(Lewis, Lisa) Modified on 10/8/2014 (db).
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Lisa M. Lewis to RE-FILE Document #790 Response in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 789 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #788 Letter filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The new deadline for the defendant's reply in further support of its motion for a protective order is October 8, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 10/8/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/2/2014) (ajs)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 788 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa M. Lewis dated October 2, 2014 re: Request for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Lewis, Lisa)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 787 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Opposition re: #781 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Swartz, Justin)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 786 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #781 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion. . Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER: Before the Court is plaintiffs' application seeking relief for the defendant's unauthorized ex parte communication with a class member. After considering the papers submitted by the parties, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIED IN PART the plaintiffs' application as set forth within. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/29/2014) (ajs)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 784 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #783 Letter, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The new briefing schedule to respond to the defendant's Motion for a Protective Order, ECF Nos. 781-82, is as follows: Plaintiff's Opposition Brief due October 1, 2014; Defendant's Reply (if any) due October 6, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 10/1/2014, Replies due by 10/6/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/22/2014) (ajs)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 783 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated September 22, 2014 re: Request for Extension of Time to respond to Chipotle's Motion for a Protective Order. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 782 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #781 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Lewis, Lisa)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 781 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Lewis, Lisa)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER: The discovery deadline set in the Court's May 6, 2014 schedule is extended from September 19, 2014, to December 31, 2014. No further extensions absent good cause shall be granted. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 12/31/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/16/2014) (ajs)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Discovery Hearing held on 9/12/2014. (jnm)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 779 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated September 11, 2014 re: Chipotle's Ex Parte Communication. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 778 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated September 11, 2014 re: Gabriel Vasquez Declaration. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER: The discovery conference originally scheduled for September 12, 2014, at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 219 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York is rescheduled for September 12, 2014, at 3 p.m. in the same location. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery Hearing set for 9/12/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/11/2014) (ajs)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 776 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Lewis dated September 10, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' September 4, 2014 Letter. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lewis, Lisa)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 775 STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Lewis, Lisa)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 9/5/2014. (jnm)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 774 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated September 4, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Request for a Pre-Motion Conference Regarding the Good Faith Defense, Instructions Not to Answer Deposition Questions, and Privilege Log Entries. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Swartz, Justin)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 773 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated September 3, 2013 re: Chipotle's September 2 Letter Requesting a Discovery Conference. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Swartz, Justin)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 772 CONFERENCE ORDER: A conference in this matter, has been scheduled for Friday, September 05, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 9/5/2014 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/3/2014) (ajs)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 771 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arsenio David Rodriguez on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Rodriguez, Arsenio)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 770 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated September 2, 2014 re: Request for a Discovery Conference. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 769 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #768 Letter, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall meet and confer regarding the use of the Vasquez Declaration. The parties are to submit a joint letter to the Court by September 11, 2014, either informing the Court of a resolution of the matter or setting forth the parties' positions regarding the use of the declaration. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/29/2014) (kgo)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 768 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 8/26/2014 re: Defendant's 8/25/2014 Letter Requesting Guidance Regarding Ex Parte Communication. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Swartz, Justin)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 767 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated 8/25/2014 re: Response to Defendant's 8/20/14 Letter Requesting Discovery Extension. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Swartz, Justin)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 766 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Lisa Lewis dated August 25, 2014 re: Request for Guidance Regarding Ex Parte Communication. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Lewis, Lisa)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 765 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated August 20, 2014 re: Extension of Discovery Deadline. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 764 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #763 Letter filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's request to withdraw its Motion to Compel is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at Docket Number 759. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/13/2014) (rjm)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 763 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated August 13, 2014 re: Withdrawl of Motion to Compel Tres Carnes, Inc. to Respond to Subpoena. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 762 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jaime Manzo.(Swartz, Justin)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 761 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Support re: #759 MOTION to Compel Tres Carnes, Inc. to Respond to Subpoena Duces Tecum .. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Murphy, Brian)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 760 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #759 MOTION to Compel Tres Carnes, Inc. to Respond to Subpoena Duces Tecum . . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 759 MOTION to Compel Tres Carnes, Inc. to Respond to Subpoena Duces Tecum . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER re: #752 Letter, filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. Chipotles request to file a motion to correct the Courts June 6, 2014 Order is DENIED, and as further set forth in this document. The Court further directs Chipotle to contact Tres Carnes informally, with a copy of any communications to be provided to plaintiffs counsel, to request a response to the subpoena by August 6, 2014. Chipotle should advise Tres Carnes that the Court has directed that any motion to compel enforcement is to be filed August 6, 2014, with any opposition briefs to be filed by August 11, 2014 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/1/2014) (cd)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 757 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated July 25, 2014 re: In Response to Chipotle's July 16, 2014 Letter. Document filed by Jay Francis Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Swartz, Justin)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ANSWER to #751 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 755 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #753 Letter, filed by Matthew A. Medina, Maxcimo Scott, Stacy Higgs, Jay F. Ensor, Eufemia Jimenez, Krystal Parker. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' request is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file any response by July 25, 2014. The parties are directed to continue discussions in an effort to reach a resolution of these matters without judicial intervention. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/18/2014) (rjm)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 754 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated July 18, 2014 re: Response to Plaintiffs' Extension Request. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 753 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated July 18, 2014 re: Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's July 16, 2014 Letter. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez, Matthew A. Medina, Krystal Parker, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 752 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated July 16, 2014 re: Request to File Motion to Correct, Motion for Clarification, and Motion to Compel Subpoena Compliance. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 751 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #17 Amended Complaint against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..Document filed by Maxcimo Scott, Matthew A. Medina, Jay F. Ensor, Krystal Parker, Stacy Higgs, Eufemia Jimenez. Related document: #17 Amended Complaint filed by Maxcimo Scott, Jay Francis Ensor.(Swartz, Justin)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 750 OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs have persuaded the Court that when balanced against Rule 15(a)'s lenient standard that leave be freely given, good cause exists to extend the deadline to amend the pleadings under Rule 16(b). Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to amend the First Amended Complaint to add Colorado, Illinois, North Carolina, and Washington class action claims, and to name Medina, Jimenez, Higgs, and Parker as named plaintiffs, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint by July 7, 2013. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Docket Number 726. re: #726 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Maxcimo Scott, Jay F. Ensor. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/2/2014) (rjm)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2014. (rjm)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER: Given the purpose of a collective action, the fact that Chipotle should be in possession of much of the information it seeks, and the burden to opt-in plaintiffs for what would likely be generic or inaccurate information, plaintiffs' request to limit written discovery to the opt-in plaintiffs to be deposed and the additional 15 randomly selected opt-ins is GRANTED. If an opt-in plaintiff fails to respond to the written discovery requests, he or she will be replaced by the original method of selection. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/6/2014) (lmb)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 748 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ana Laura Sanchez Infante.(Swartz, Justin)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 746 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Telephone Conference proceeding held on 5/6/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(nt)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 745 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Telephone Conference held on 5/6/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2014.(nt)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 747 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ana Maria Heredia.(mro)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 744 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated May 22, 2014 re: Response to Defendant's Letter re: Scope of Written Discovery. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 743 DECLARATION of Supplemental Declaration of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #726 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint.. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Swartz, Justin)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 742 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #726 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Reply Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 741 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated November 15, 2014 re: Scope of Opt-In Plaintiff Discovery. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER: On May 14, 2014, defendant filed a letter, with the consent of plaintiffs, requesting an extension in the time to submit letters regarding the scope of discovery for opt-in plaintiffs. The request for an extension is GRANTED. Defendant's letter is due by May 15, 2014, and plaintiffs' letter is due by May 22, 2014. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/14/2014) (lmb)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 739 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated May 14, 2014 re: Extension of Time to Submit Letters Concerning Scope of Opt-In Plaintiff Discovery. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 738 DECLARATION of Brian D. Murphy in Opposition re: #726 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint.. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 737 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #726 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. . Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER terminating #729 Letter Motion for Conference ; terminating #734 Motion for Leave to File Document. Based on the documents submitted, including plaintiffs' reply letter, and the information presented during the conference, the Court orders that the ten percent of the opt-in plaintiffs to be deposed will not include the two named plaintiffs or, if appropriate, the four proposed named plaintiffs identified in plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Class Complaint (Docket No. 728, Ex. A.) The depositions of each opt-in plaintiff may be conducted over four hours, though the parties should work cooperatively to allow adequate discovery for the defendant while making every effort to complete these depositions promptly and efficiently, with a goal of conducting two depositions per day. The parties shall meet and confer after 15 depositions to discuss whether a more limited number of opt-in depositions is appropriate, although this directive should not be interpreted as inviting further litigation before the Court on the number of permissible opt-in depositions. A decision regarding the dismissal of opt-in plaintiffs who fail to respond to discovery requests is unnecessary at this stage in the litigation. The discovery deadline is extended by three months, until September 19, 2014. As to the scope of written discovery for the opt-in plaintiffs, the parties shall discuss a possible resolution to the remaining disputes in light of the Court's discussion. If agreement is reached, a letter so indicating should be submitted to the Court by May 14, 2014. If no agreement can be reached, defendant will submit, by the same date, a detailed letter with proposed interrogatories and document requests and an explanation as to how the information sought in each discovery request is likely to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence related to the factors considered for determining whether an employee's primary duty is exempt work under FLSA, or evidence related to any other claim or defense in this case. The defendant may also address how the need for this discovery outweighs any burden upon the opt-in plaintiffs or their counsel. Plaintiffs may respond by May 19, 2014. This order resolves the motions at docket numbers 729 and 734. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/6/2014) (lmb)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/19/2014. (lmb)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 5/6/2014. (jnm)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 735 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated May 5, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a 2-page Reply. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 734 MOTION for Leave to File a 2-page Letter in Response to Chipotles Letter of May 2, 2014. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER: 5/7/2014 Telephone Conference reset for 5/6/2014 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. At that time, the parties are to call Chambers at (212) 805-0286, with all parties on the line. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/2/2014) (cd)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 732 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated May 2, 2014 re: Scope of Opt-In Plaintiff Discovery. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 731 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Alfredo Cuate Briones.(Swartz, Justin)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER: On April 28, 2014, plaintiffs filed a letter motion for a conference regarding the scope of discovery for opt-in plaintiffs. Defendant may file a response by May 2, 2014. A telephone conference is scheduled for May 7, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. At that time, the parties are to call Chambers at (212) 805-0286, with all parties on the line., ( Responses due by 5/2/2014.), ( Telephone Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/28/2014) (lmb)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 729 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding the Scope of Opt-In Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated April 28, 2014. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Swartz, Justin)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 728 DECLARATION of Justin M. Swartz in Support re: #726 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint.. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Swartz, Justin)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 727 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #726 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint.. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott. (Swartz, Justin)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 726 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 725 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Pre-Motion Conference proceeding held on 4/2/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(nt)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 724 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/2/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2014.(nt)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 722 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bryce Handy.(mro)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 721 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alyssa Ashley Chisholm.(mro)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 723 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gabriel Carrion Vellejo.(mro)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER. Having reviewed the undated letter by Tres Carnes, Inc. Director of Human Resources, and for the reasons stated at the April 2, 2014 Conference, defendant is granted leave to serve a subpoena on plaintiff Scott's current employer, Tres Carnes, Inc. The scope of that subpoena shall be limited as set forth in defense counsel's April 1, 2014 letter to the Court. On consent of plaintiffs' counsel, the Court adopts the schedule proposed by defendant for the briefing of plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint. The motion is due on April 25, 2014. Defendant may file an opposition by May 12, 2014, and plaintiffs may file a reply by May 19, 2014. So ordered. (Motions due by 4/25/2014. Responses due by 5/12/2014. Replies due by 5/19/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/10/2014) (rjm)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 719 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated April 10, 2014 re: Subpoena and Proposed Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 718 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated April 8, 2014 re: Subpoena/Proposed Amendment of Complaint. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 717 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #716 Letter filed by Maxcimo Scott, Jay F. Ensor. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' request for additional time to address the proposed amendment of the complaint is granted. The parties should provide the Court with an update on the status of the amendment by April 8, 2014. Defendants shall advise the Court in writing by the same date whether they accept the representation by the Director of Human Resources regarding plaintiff Scott's employment application process. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/8/2014) (rjm)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 716 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated April 7, 2014 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, Justin)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 715 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joshua Gottlob.(mro)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 714 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Hans Richter.(mro)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/2/2014. (jnm)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 712 STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 711 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Brian D. Murphy dated April 1, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Request for a Pre-Motion Conference and Anticipated Motion for a Protective Order. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 710 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joanny Alvarez.(mro)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER granting #708 Letter Motion for Conference. A conference is set for April 2, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Defendants should not serve the subpoenas pending court order. Defendants may respond to this letter by April 1, 2014. Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/2/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/28/2014) (lmb) Modified on 3/31/2014 (lmb).
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 708 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding an Application for Protective Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Justin M. Swartz dated March 28, 2014. Document filed by Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/1/2014. (lmb)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 713 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Corey Yeauger.(mro)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 707 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Yvette Dodge.(mro)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 706 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Trista P. Tague.(mro)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 705 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark A. Turner.(mro)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 704 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rodis Najarro.(lmb)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 703 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Maria Rosa. (tn)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 702 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Rodis Najarro. (tn)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 701 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Kai Clark.(ft)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 700 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Jacob Major. (tn)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 699 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Omar Casillas.(ft)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 698 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carmelo Mendez, Jr.(mro)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 697 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ernesto Baldelamar.(mro)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 694 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Ashley P. Green.(ft)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 695 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Michael Ierina.(ft)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 693 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Thomas Werner. (tn)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 692 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by John E. Hejduk. (tn)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 691 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ana Luisa Vidal.(mro)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 690 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joseph Rostyn.(mro)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 689 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rafael Escalante.(mro)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 688 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Alexis L. Martinez.(ft)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 687 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Brian Short. (tn)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 686 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Ryan Tracy. (tn)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 685 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by William R. Meyer. (tn)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 684 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Thomas Blake Dodson. (tn)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 674 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jose Villafranco.(Swartz, Justin)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 680 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Graciela Escobar.(lmb)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 679 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin Scott.(lmb)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 669 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Carlos Fraguada.(Swartz, Justin)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 662 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tiara Hughes.(mro)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 661 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ana Delgodilla.(mro)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 651 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/19/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 650 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2013 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 671 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by April L. Miller (Delsol).(mro)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 667 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Laura Knight.(ft)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 664 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nick Dwyer.(mro)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 663 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Roxana Morales.(mro)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 652 PLAINTIFF CONSENT FORM.Document filed by Cory Fasick on 1/19/14. (sc)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 670 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Peter C. Delgado.(mro)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 668 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laura Ybarra.(mro)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 666 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anthony Manco.(mro)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 665 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Freddie Ahumada.(ft)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 660 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Lourdes P. Flores.(ft)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 659 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Eva Angel.(ft)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 649 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Shalett Dovie. (tn)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 648 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Ernest M. Diaz. (tn)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 647 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Crystal Torres. (tn)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 646 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by William I. Lake. (tn)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 673 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christopher Aaron Armstrong.(mro)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 672 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brittany Link.(mro)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 658 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Sosa.(mro)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 657 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joe Dettlo.(mro)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 656 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Maddie Brennan.(mro)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 655 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Kern.(mro)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 654 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jossep Diaz.(mro)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 653 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian P. Howell.(mro)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 637 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Amie Myers.(ft)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 635 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Viviana Henriquez.(ama)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 634 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joel Gosnell.(ama)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 633 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Sarah Pape. (tn)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 632 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Vidalia Flores Trujillo. (tn)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 608 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christina G. West.(mro)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 607 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tara M Gentry.(mro)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 606 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Natanael Diaz Portillo.(mro)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 604 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jannelle Kirkwood.(Swartz, Justin)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 592 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mike Stelzer.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 682 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Shalett Doxie.(lmb)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 681 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mortimer Cadogan.(lmb)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 678 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bonnie Buss.(lmb)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 677 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ana Pimentel.(lmb)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 645 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jose Jacobs.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 644 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Bridgett Thomas.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 643 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Milagros M. de la Fuente.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 642 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by William R. Downard.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 640 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Adelina Sanchez.(djc)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 639 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Andrew Paolinetti.(djc)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 638 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Noel.(djc)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 636 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Alexandria Ramas.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 631 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Rebecca Damphousse Plant. (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 630 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Brandon Morgan.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 629 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Amber L. Fortson.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 628 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Luis Torres II.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 627 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Michelle Herrera.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 626 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Joseph F. DeMayo.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 625 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Nicole Perkins.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 624 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Kathryn Armstrong.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 623 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Renee Pope-Macedo.(ft)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 615 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carrie Swanson (Clemetson).(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 614 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Chun W. Yu.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 613 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Ringle.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 612 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sara Garner.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 611 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Freddy A. Diaz Vega.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 603 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Joe Rostyne. (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 602 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Jonathan R. Nichol. (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 601 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Matthew A. Medina. (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 600 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Vania Vasquez. (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 599 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Eric Low. (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 598 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Adan Castillo Ramos. (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 597 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Christina Hollingshead. (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 596 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Luis Alonso Ortegon. (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 590 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Emilee Calhoun.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 589 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kyle Richun.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 588 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Norma Ortega.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 587 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Collins.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 586 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cassandra Malak.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 585 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sarah L. Meyer-Allen.(mro)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 581 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jose Hernandez-Miranda.(ama)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 580 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lauren Kelsch.(ama)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 579 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Martha Lorenzo.(Swartz, Justin)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 578 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Alexis Martinez.(Swartz, Justin)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 577 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Lovana Taylor.(Swartz, Justin)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 576 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Robert Strausbaugh.(Swartz, Justin)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 575 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Steven Roper.(Swartz, Justin)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 574 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Appolonia Perez.(Swartz, Justin)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 573 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Luis Vicencio.(ama)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 572 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Chun W. Yu.(ama)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 571 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alma Delia Calderon Velazquez.(ama)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 610 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Roberto Gomez.(mro)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 584 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Steven Cramp.(mro)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 570 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Christopher Armstrong.(Schaffer, Brian)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 569 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jesus Ortegon.(Swartz, Justin)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 565 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by William Aviles.(Swartz, Justin)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 564 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Nicholas Dwyer.(Swartz, Justin)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 563 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Matthew Torno.(Swartz, Justin)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 562 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jonathan Popchoke.(Swartz, Justin)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 683 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ricardo Garcia.(lmb)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 583 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Reggie Coverson.(mro)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 582 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Seaven Cayson.(mro)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 568 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Nicholas Dwyer. (tn)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 567 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Abraham Moraga. (tn)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 566 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Ailin Reyes.(tn)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 561 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Dieshon Clark.(Swartz, Justin)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 560 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Roberto Gomez.(Swartz, Justin)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 559 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Daniel Dalton.(Swartz, Justin)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 558 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Shalett Doxie.(Swartz, Justin)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 696 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kate Kuzmeskus.(djc)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 676 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jose Ramirez.(lmb)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 622 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Robert J. Gallagher.(ft)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 609 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gerald V. Labensky, Jr.(mro)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 557 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Joseph F. De Mayo.(tn)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 556 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Nathaniel David Schnepple.(tn)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 553 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kathryn Diaz.(mro)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 552 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristina R. Rodriguez.(ama)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 551 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melvin Alvarez-Gregory.(ama)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 550 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Rosario Betancourt.(Swartz, Justin)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 675 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Consuelo V. Perez.(lmb)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 641 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Wayne Charles Franz.(djc)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 549 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Olguimar Rodriguez-Ramos.(ama)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 621 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jonathan M. Hays.(ft)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 618 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Joseph Jacobs.(ft)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 555 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Moises Ruidias.(mro)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 554 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sean Sullivan.(mro)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 548 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Underwood.(ama)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 541 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Isabel Pritchett.(lmb)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 540 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Karl Hasendehrl. (tn)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 539 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by April Leah Miller. (tn)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 620 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Sarah Noah.(ft)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 619 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Alexandria Ramas.(ft)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 617 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Parithan Kungsuvvan.(ft)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 616 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Felipe Navarro.(ft)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 605 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kofi Bossman.(mro)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 595 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Raul Lovato.(mro)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 594 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Raul Ruiz, Jr.(mro)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 593 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mortimer Cadogun.(mro)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 591 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Martha Lorenzo Morales.(mro)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 547 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Patricia Villanueva.(ama)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 546 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Eustolia Medina.(ama)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 545 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Merideth Elbrecht.(ama)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 544 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Adam Christian.(lmb)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 543 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anhara Rolon Yanez.(lmb)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 542 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ryan McIntyre.(lmb)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 538 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Emily A. Carr.(tn)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 537 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Kelly Nitzsche. (tn)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 536 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Marisol Ramirez.(tn)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 519 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Wanda A. Hary.(mro)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 518 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Abigail Vega.(mro)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 517 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ryan Christopher Furst.(mro)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 528 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jacob N. Wilde.(ft)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 526 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anthony Esquivel.(lmb)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 525 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ramel Crespo.(lmb)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 524 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gregorio Castillo.(lmb)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 509 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Aran Castillo.(Swartz, Justin)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 513 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Dustin Roberts. (tn)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 512 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Marisol I. Tellez.(tn)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 508 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lorena A. Chaparro.(mro)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 516 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joanna Williams.(mro)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 515 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jeffrey E. Rupard.(mro)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 514 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Steven Hastings.(mro)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 511 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark A. Gajda.(mro)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 510 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John J. Holland.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 534 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Michael Berlad.(ft)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 533 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Nathan Fenwick.(ft)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 532 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by John Joyce-Summerfeld.(ft)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 531 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Nicole Recco.(ft)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 523 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Matthew Werner.(lmb)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 522 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cruz Flores.(lmb)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 521 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marissa Cooley.(lmb)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 520 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Price.(lmb)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 506 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jeff Hable.(rsh)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 505 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sean Sullivan.(rsh)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 504 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nicholas Tellez.(rsh)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 503 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kenneth J. Stacy.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 502 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott M. Costello.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 501 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Darryl Milledge.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 500 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jose Raul Barrios.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 499 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephani Twidell.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 498 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathon Wolak.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 497 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dennis Miguel Ordonez Ramos.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 496 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Norma P. Morales.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 495 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Isela Hernandez. (tn)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 494 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard Butcher.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 493 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Alexandra Neal.(tn)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 492 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristin Vates.(mro)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 491 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Luis Vidal.(tn)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 527 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Octavio Mora.(ft)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 535 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jorge Lopez, Eua Angel.(ft)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 530 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jason A. Simon.(ft)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 529 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Christian Rocha.(ft)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 507 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Krystal Beining.(ft)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 490 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Daniel Howling.(tn)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 489 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Kelly Palecek.(tn)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 488 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Nicole Davis.(tn)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 487 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Gabriel Vasquez.(tn)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 486 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brittney Alston.(mro)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 485 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Keisler Baquiran.(mro)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 484 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carrie Swanson.(mro)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 483 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Erick Medina.(mro)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 478 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Ramon Alonso.(ca)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 480 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lydia Pieper.(mro)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 479 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Josie Hall.(mro)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 464 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jimmy Tucker.(ama)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 463 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amanda Henry.(ama)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 462 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jessica Davies.(ama)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 461 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Robyn Yeager.(ama)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 460 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Josh Paetz. (tn)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 459 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Eric Lund. (tn)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 458 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Danielle Engle. (tn)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 457 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Monica Garcia.(tn)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 456 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Rebecca Plant. (tn)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 455 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Marcos McAdoo. (tn)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 454 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Saias Martinez Mondragon.(ca)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 453 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Luis A. Vega.(ca)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 482 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael J. Wood.(mro)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 481 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Raul Cruz.(mro)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 451 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Matthew Rowedda.(ca)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 450 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Marvins Georges.(ca)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Zakaria Fessikh.(Swartz, Justin)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 444 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Joanny Alvarez.(ft)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 443 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Donna Lee Johnson.(mro)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 442 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Miriam Bautista.(mro)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 440 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristen King.(mro)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 439 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Daniel Ferrie.(mro)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 438 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Johnathan Morris.(ft)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 437 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Cole Holman.(ft)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 473 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carlos Alexi Avalos Granados.(lmb)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 472 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Chelsey Nicastro.(lmb)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 471 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kyle Fennessey.(lmb)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 470 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Oscar Pereira.(lmb)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 469 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Juvenal Vargas.(lmb)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 468 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jamie Lamb.(lmb)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dennis Miguel Ordones-Ramos.(js)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 445 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Kyle Yandenburgh.(ft)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 441 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Amanda Pastore.(ft)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 436 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by John Thomas Gonzalez.(ft)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 435 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Darlene Nichols.(ft)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 434 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Nichole R Hundley.(ft)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 433 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Steven Moo. (tn)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 432 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Steven Halstead. (tn)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 431 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Ramon A. Ramos. (tn)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 430 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Genifer Gelman. (tn)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 429 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Maylin Lee Schofield. (tn)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 424 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Tracie Shaltuck.(ama)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 423 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Holly Kennell.(ama)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 422 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ciara L. Huru.(mro)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 417 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Franko Merino.(cd)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 416 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Russell A. Caratanuto.(cd)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 415 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Victoria Gutierrez.(tn)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 414 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Andria Larson.(tn)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 413 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Richmond C. Frison.(ama)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 412 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Kevin Chan.(ama)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 411 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Lardo Stewart on behalf of Jay F. Ensor, Maxcimo Scott. (Stewart, Melissa)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER: On December 19, 2013, the Court held a telephone status conference with the parties in this matter. For the reasons set forth on the record, Plaintiffs' request for the dates of employment and work locations for all putative collective action members is DENIED at this time.The parties shall compile a list of all opt-in plaintiffs whose names are misspelled on the docket throughout the notice period. Once the notice period has concluded, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint stipulation, identifying all opt-in plaintiffs with misspelled names on the docket, listing the docket numbers of their consent forms, and providing the correct spelling of their names.The parties' joint request to have the Court compile all of the consent forms sent in by opt-in plaintiffs is GRANTED. The Court will maintain a master file containing the original copies of all consent forms sent in by opt-in plaintiffs, which the parties may inspect after the notice period closes,upon written application to the Court. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/20/2013) (js) Modified on 12/20/2013 (js).
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 408 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Soraya Kanou.(Swartz, Justin)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 407 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by James Bittner.(Swartz, Justin)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/19/2013. Frank Mazzaferro for Plaintiff(s). Gregg Shavitz and Ossai Miazad for Defendant(s). See Court's 12/20/13 order for complete details. (tdh)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kalinda Flores.(js)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 428 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Verenice Galvain.(djc)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 427 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jessica Garcia.(djc)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 425 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Giordano.(djc) Modified on 12/26/2013 (djc).
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 405 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Carla M Carrabbia.(ca)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 404 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Shenise Williams.(ca)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 403 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Mark B Paetz.(ca)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 402 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Joseph Deivecchio.(ca)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 401 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Uri Antonio Aguilar.(ca)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 400 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by David R Perruchon.(ca)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 477 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dennis Miguel Ordonez-Ramos.(js)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 474 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Heather Dornhecker.(js)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 466 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jose R Ortega.(js)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #357 Letter filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: A telephone status conference is scheduled for 12-19-13 at 2:30 p.m. (Telephone Conference set for 12/19/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/17/2013) (tn)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 392 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin M. Swartz dated December 17, 2013 re: Plaintiffs' Reply in Response to Chipotle's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Clarification of the Court's Conditional Certification Order. Document filed by Jay Francis Ensor, Maxcimo Scott.(Swartz, Justin)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 391 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Sarah Elizabeth Wills.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 390 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Andrew McIalwain.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 389 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Milton Chamberlain III.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 388 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Tony Lachel.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 387 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Sandra Church.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 386 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Zachary Sanford.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Maria Reyes.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 384 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Rowana Anthony.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 383 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Andres Quinones.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 382 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Chris Perry.(Swartz, Justin)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 378 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Elizabeth H Gomula.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 377 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Paul A Andorfer.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 376 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Robert O Smith.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 375 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Melissa Alvarado.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 374 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Kristian Pi.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Darell Anderson.(ca)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Carlos Romero.(ca)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 452 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathon Wolak.(js)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 409 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Martha Rodriguez.(djc)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 406 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephanie Portillo.(djc)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 399 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Fernando Barreto.(ama)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 397 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Arguro Ramon.(js)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 396 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jay F. Ensor.(ft)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 395 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Erika Mah.(ft)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 381 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Kayla M. Davis.(tn)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 380 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Joshua Middendorf.(tn)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 379 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Jeffrey A. Mobley.(tn)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karli Kopietz.(mro)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 370 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Derek Case.(mro)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 367 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Laura Ibarra.(ama)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 366 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Emily Edgar.(ca)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Scott Ramr.(ca)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Karismarie Niedzwiecki.(ca)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Roberta Okuadjo.(ca)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 362 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Grocaielo Hernandez.(ca)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Meaghan McClugaia.(ca)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 360 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Ben Camarone Garr.(ca)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 359 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Roberto Gout.(tn)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 358 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carmen M. Diaz.(mro)
December 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 475 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Patrice Derflinger.(js)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian D. Murphy dated December 13, 2013 re: Response to Plaintiffs' December 10 Letter. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Murphy, Brian)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Netanel Gutt.(Swartz, Justin)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Veronica Menchen.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Brittany Swa.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Aubry Baird.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Julie Anne Cortizo.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 351 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Michael S Moschini.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jonathan Bouyer.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Gabriel White.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 348 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Robert McCann.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Dusttin Nicholson.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Adam Davis.(ca)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 345 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Givonte Huey.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Melissa Martinez.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 343 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Eufemia Jimenez.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 342 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Meghan L Close.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Joel Mayo.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Michael Beer.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 339 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jessica L Kaczmarek.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Adam DiReisdorf.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 337 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Johnny Maldonado.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Danette Rodriguez.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 335 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Daniel Neff.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Frendira Gomez.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Scott Meister.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Gabriel O Guralieros.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jesse Wooten.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jessa Anderson.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 329 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Jennifer Curtis.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 328 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Reyna M Ryes Larios.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Justin Breeden.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Shelly M Stinson.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 325 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Barboa Caesar.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 324 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Elizabeth Hopkins.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 323 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Matthew Sauers.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Megan A Murray.(ca)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 321 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Daniel Argo.(ca)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 </