In Re: MF Global Holdings Ltd. Investment Litigation
Plaintiff: Daniel M Pierce, Joseph Niciforo, Jerome Vrabel, City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement and Palisade Strategic Master Fund (Cayman) Limited, Paul Hamann, Joseph Deangelis, Sapere CTA Fund, LP, Henning-Carey Proprietary Trading, LLC, Gregory Bartell, Juan P Arvelo, Bearing Fund LP, Charles Carey, Michael Mette, James Groth, Shane McMahon, Timothy Zaug, Robert Tierney and Brian Fisher
Defendant: Thomas F. Connolly, Michael G. Stockman, Frederick R. Demler, John Ranald MacDonald, Richard W Moore, Martin J. Glynn, Bradley Abelow, Rick D. Leesley, The MF Global Ltd. 2007 Long Term Incentive Plan, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Donna Dellosso, David Gelber, Vinay Mahajan, David Dunne, The MF Global Ltd Approved Saving-Related Share Option Plan, Laurie R. Ferber, Alison J. Carnwath, Christine A. Serwinski, Jon S. Corzine, Craig Donohue, Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., Bernard Dan, Eileen S. Fusco, David I. Schamis, Henri J, Steenkamp, Dennis A. Klejna, Robert S Sloan, David P. Bolger, The MF Global LTD. Employee Stock Purchase Plan, Bradley I. Abelow, Edward L. Goldberg, Stephen Grady, David Simons, Tracey A. Lowery Whille, J.C. Flowers & Co. LLC, Richard W. Gill, Christy Vavra and J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Petitioner: Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Union Asset Management Holding AG, Paradigm Equities Ltd., Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Futures Capital Management, LLC, Banyan Capital Master Fund, Ltd., Rocking K Land and Cattle, Inc., Philip Timothy Johnson, LRI Invest S.A., H. Martin Klinker, Jr., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., The Bagwell Group, Robert Marcin, Wade Jacobsen, Zybr Holdings, LLC, Ali A. Rangchi Bozorki, Paradigm Asia Ltd. and William Schur
Consolidated Plaintiff: Robert A. Daly, Jr., Juan P. Arvelo, PS Energy Group Inc, Thomas G. Moran, Cyrille Guillaume, Davide Accomazzo, Ernesto Espinoza, Donald Tran, Kay P. Tee, LLC, Monica Rodriguez, IBEW Local 90 Pension Fund, John Andrew Szokolay, Roberto Calle Gracey, Plumbers' & Pipefitters' Local 562 Pension Fund, Summit Trust Company, Double D Trading, LLC and Vasil Petro
Consolidated Defendant: Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Commerz Markets LLC, Natxis Securities North America, Inc., Deutsche Bank & Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., John Does 1-10, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Jeffries & Company, Inc., CME Group Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., J. Randy Macdonald, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Edith O'Brien, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Bank Of America Corporation and RBS Securities Inc.
Lead Plaintiff: Virginia Retirement System and Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta
Not Yet Classified: Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System, MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator and Rogers Varner, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2012md02338
Filed: April 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER withdrawing (1115) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/3/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (anc)
March 3, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE of Voluntary Withdrawal of Fee Motion with Prejudice re: #163 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator. (Rue, Jane)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, Customer Class Counsel are not entitled to additional attorneys fees under the JPMorgan Settlement, the Net Equity Settlement Assignment, or the CME Settlement. Furthermore, the Allocation Agreement describes the amount of the common fund from which Customer Class Counsel's fees shall be paid. The Plan Administrator shall promptly release $1,537,521.33 as reimbursement for Customer Class Counsel's litigation expenses to Customer Class Counsel as outlined in Paragraph 8 of the Global Settlement. Finally, within seven days, Customer Class Counsel shall file publicly a copy of the November 2, 2016 Letter of Merrill G. Davidoff and Andrew J. Entwistle as required by footnote 15 of this Memorandum and Order. A conference will be held on February 16, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 18-D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. (As further set forth in this Memorandum and Order.) ( Status Conference set for 2/16/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/2/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF Copies Sent By Chambers. (mro)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DISPOSITION ON MOTION re (1115 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion by Customer Counsel for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, with Proposed Order as Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/6/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(kgo)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #148 Motion of Jeffrey C. Jarvis to Withdraw as Attorney. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis)(Text Only Order) (Francis, James)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying as moot #120 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis)(Text Only Order) (Francis, James)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER denying as moot #111 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis)(Text Only Order) (Francis, James)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Customer Class Action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Settlement Fund, as defined and provided for in the Settlement Agreement, is approved. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(kgo)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Litigation Trust Action is dismissed with prejudice. The Settlement Agreement is approved, solely with respect to the settlement of the Litigation Trust Action, and without prejudice to approval of other settlements or compromises contained therein, including, without limitation, the Settlement Fund established thereby. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/30/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(ama)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 JUDGMENT AND FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Sapere Action is dismissed with prejudice. 2. The Settlement Agreement, solely with respect to the settlement of the Sapere Action, and without prejudice to approval of other settlements or compromises contained therein, is approved. 3. In the event that the Settlement Agreement terminates according to its terms prior to the Effective Date (as defined in the Settlement Agreement), this Judgment and Order of Dismissal shall be rendered null and void and shall be vacated. 4. Without affecting the finality of this Judgment in any way, the Court retains continuing jurisdiction over: (i) the administration and consummation of the Settlement as to the Sapere Action and (ii) the entry of orders relating to matters addressed in the Settlement Agreement as co settlement of the Sapere Action. 5. There is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Judgment and immediate entry by the Clerk of Court is expressly directed pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/30/2016) (kgo)
September 9, 2016 Filing 163 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1115 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion by Customer Counsel for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, with Proposed Order as Exhibit A. (Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion by Customer Counsel for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses from the Global Settlement Fund). Document filed by Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Entwistle, Andrew)
September 9, 2016 Filing 162 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1122 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF) MOTION for Final Approval of the Final Customer Settlement . Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Further Support of Their Motion for Final Approval of the Final Customer Settlement. Document filed by Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Entwistle, Andrew)
September 7, 2016 Filing 161 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Andrew J. Entwistle dated 9/7/2016 re: Customer Counsel respectfully request an extension of the 10-page limitation on our reply, set forth in the Court's Individual Practices, to 20 pages total. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED in part. The underlying issue has already been extensively briefed by the parties and addressed by the Court in its previous ruling. The Court is not persuaded that much more is warranted. In view of the Plan Administrators lengthy submission, the Court will grant approval for a reply of 15 pages. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/7/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(lmb)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (1130) Motion for William S. Freeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/6/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (lmb)
August 22, 2016 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 154 and 155 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #159 Order Striking Document from Record. (cf)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: The documents appearing at ECF Nos. 1123 and 1124 in Case No. 11 Civ. 7866, and ECF Nos. 154 and 155 in Case No. 12 MD 2338 are stricken. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to delete these four entries from the docket entirely. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 8/22/2016) Copies Sent By Chambers. (cf)
August 19, 2016 Filing 158 DECLARATION of Merrill G. Davidoff and Andrew J. Entwistle in Support re: (1122 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF) MOTION for Final Approval of the Final Customer Settlement .. Document filed by Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Bearing Fund LP, Thomas G. Moran, Kay P. Tee, LLC, Mark Kennedy, Robert Marcin, PS Energy Group Inc, Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Summit Trust Company, Rogers Varner, Jr, Thomas S. Wacker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Davidoff, Merrill)
August 19, 2016 Filing 157 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1122 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF) MOTION for Final Approval of the Final Customer Settlement . . Document filed by Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Bearing Fund LP, Kay P. Tee, LLC, Robert Marcin, Thomas G. Moran, PS Energy Group Inc, Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Mark Kennedy, Summit Trust Company, Rogers Varner, Jr, Thomas S. Wacker. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Davidoff, Merrill)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the request of MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator, MF Global Assigned Assets, LLC, and Nader Tavakoli, as Trustee of the MF Global Litigation Trustee (collectively "MFG Plaintiffs") for the scheduling of a joint status conference between this Court and the Bankruptcy Court relating to this action prior to this Court's settlement fairness hearing scheduled for September 16, 2016 is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/19/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(lmb)
August 19, 2016 Filing 153 MOTION for Final Approval of the Final Customer Settlement . Document filed by Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Bearing Fund LP, Kay P. Tee, LLC, Mark Kennedy, Robert Marcin, Thomas G. Moran, PS Energy Group Inc, Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Summit Trust Company, Rogers Varner, Jr, Thomas S. Wacker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal, #2 Exhibit B - [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order Approving the Plan of Allocation)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Davidoff, Merrill)
August 18, 2016 Filing 152 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jane Rue Wittstein dated 8/18/2016 re: We write on behalf of the MFG Plaintiffs in reply to the response letter sent by Class Counsel to Your Honors dated August 17, 2016 (the "August 17 Letter"). ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by MFG Plaintiffs as defined above. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/17/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(lmb)
August 18, 2016 Filing 151 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Andrew J. Entwistle and Merrill G. Davidoff dated 8/17/2016 re: The MFG Plaintiffs' request for a joint status conference and, more specifically, their argument that the putative Allocation Motion in the Chapter 11 proceedings, if any (such a motion is not required under the Settlement Agreement), must precede the determination of Customer Counsel's Fee Motion should be seen for what it is - an effort to delay resolution of the Fee Motion to gain a tactical advantage for their anticipated opposition. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Customer Counsel. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/17/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(lmb)
July 14, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 9/16/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Victor Marrero. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(lmb)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE FINAL CUSTOMER SETTLEMENT WITH THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS, APPROVING THE PROPOSED NOTICE TO THE CLASS, AND SETTING A SCHEDULE FOR FINAL APPROVAL: Preliminary Approval of the Customer Settlement: Based on the Court's review of the Settlement Agreement, including consideration of the amount of the Customer Settlement Fund and the subrogated and subordinated nature of the Customer Interest Claims to the Net Equity Claims, the Court hereby approves the Customer Settlement as fair, reasonable and adequate, and in the best interest of the Customer Class, subject to further consideration at the final approval hearing (the "Final Hearing") as further set forth in this order. Settlement Hearing: The Court will hold the Final Hearing, if necessary, on September 16, 2016 at 2:00 p.m., or as soon thereafter as the Court is available, at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 11B, New York, NY 10007-1312 as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(lmb)
July 13, 2016 Filing 149 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Andrew J. Entwistle and Merrill G. Davidoff dated July 13, 2016 re: Letter Requesting Preliminary Approval of the Final Customer Settlement with the Individual Defendants, Approving the Proposed Notice to the Class, and Setting a Schedule for Final Approval. Document filed by Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Notice to Former Commidity Futures Custumers))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Entwistle, Andrew)
April 25, 2016 Filing 148 MOTION for Geoffrey C. Jarvis to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Robert Marcin.(Sabella, James)
April 25, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Joseph Sabella on behalf of Robert Marcin. (Sabella, James)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING THE FIDELITY BONDS INSURERS ACCESS TO CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS PRODUCED IN THE MF GLOBAL ACTIONS. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the MF Global Parties as follows: 1. Paragraph 7 of the Protective Order is hereby amended to include the following sub-section K, thereby including the FI Bonds Insurers as a separate class of Designated Persons: "K. The fidelity bonds insurers of Holdings and their counsel, accountants, auditors, regulators and reinsurers." 2. The FI Bonds Insurers agree to be subject to the Protective Order, as evidenced by their certifications attached hereto as Exhibit B. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/11/2016) (adc)
January 15, 2016 Filing 145 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joshua Killion Porter on behalf of Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10171, 212-894-7200. (Porter, Joshua)
January 15, 2016 Filing 144 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jordan Abraham Cortez on behalf of Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10171, 212-894-7200. (Cortez, Jordan)
January 15, 2016 Filing 143 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Arthur V. Nealon on behalf of Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10171, 212-894-7200. (Nealon, Arthur)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: For the foregoing reasons, the CFTCs motion to compel is denied. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/7/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(cdo) Modified on 1/7/2016 (cdo).
January 7, 2016 Filing 141 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joshua Killion Porter on behalf of Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10171, 2128947200. (Porter, Joshua)
January 7, 2016 Filing 140 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert N Cappucci on behalf of Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10171, 212-894-7200. (Cappucci, Robert)
January 6, 2016 Filing 139 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew J Entwistle on behalf of Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10171, (212) 894-7200. (Entwistle, Andrew)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 DECISION AND ORDER denying 1028 Motion for Hearing; denying 1028 Motion for Reconsideration in 11-cv-7866. For the reasons stated above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion of MF Global Holdings, Ltd. as Plan Administrator and Nader Tavakoli as Litigation Trustee, co-lead counsel for the customer representatives, and Bradley Abelow (collectively "Movants") for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt. No. 1028) is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/23/2015) (lmb)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: that the time for parties to update the Court as to prospects for global settlement is extended to December 23, 2015 at 3:00 P.M. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/18/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(tn)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 DECISION AND ORDER granting (998) Motion to Approve in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Objection and Reservation of Rights with Respect to Final Approval of Securities Plaintiffs' Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Individual Defendants (Dkt. No. 1006) of MF Global Holdings Limited as Plan Administrator and Nader Tavakoli as Trustee of the Litigation Trust (collectively, the "Plan Administrator") is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that Lead Plaintiffs the Virginia Retirement System and Her Majesty The Queen in Right of Alberta's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements and Plan of Allocation (Dkt. No. 998) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Motion of Co-Lead Counsel Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP and Bleichmar Fonti Tountas & Auld LLP for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/25/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (lmb)
November 23, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Settlement Conference held on 11/23/2015. (Bacchus, Michael)
November 18, 2015 Filing 135 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jai Kamal Chandrasekhar on behalf of Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, Virginia Retirement System. New Address: Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 44th Floor, New York, New York, 10020, 212-554-1484. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Chandrasekhar, Jai)
November 18, 2015 Filing 134 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Hannah Elizabeth Ross on behalf of Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, Virginia Retirement System. New Address: Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 44th Floor, New York, New York 10020, 212-554-1411. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Ross, Hannah)
November 17, 2015 Filing 133 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Salvatore Jo Graziano on behalf of Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, Virginia Retirement System. New Address: Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 44th Floor, New York, New York, 10020, 212-554-1538. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Graziano, Salvatore)
July 24, 2015 Filing 132 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Andrew J. Entwistle dated July 24, 2015 re: Letter Concerning Sequence of Expert Reports and Request for Brief Extension. Document filed by Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd..(Entwistle, Andrew)
July 22, 2015 Filing 131 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to ( 711 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF, #88 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Paradigm Asia Ltd., Summit Trust Company, Mark Kennedy, Rogers Varner, Jr., Kay P. Tee, LLC, Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Thomas G. Moran, Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Bearing Fund LP, Robert Marcin, PS Energy Group Inc, Thomas S. Wacker. USCA Case Number 14-1249-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/22/2015. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(nd)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AGAINST INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: 1. Jurisdiction - This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action, and all matters relating to the Settlement, as well as personal jurisdiction over all of the Settling Parties. 2. Incorporation of Settlement Documents - This Judgment incorporates and makes part hereof the Settlement Agreement (including its defined terms). All terms with initial capitalization not otherwise defined herein shall have the meanings ascribed to them in Paragraph 1 of the Settlement Agreement. 3. Dismissal of Claims - All of the claims asserted against the Individual Defendants in the Actions by Plaintiffs are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Settling Parties shall bear their own costs and expenses as further set forth in this Order. 9. Entry of Final Judgment - There is no reason to delay the entry of this Judgment as a final judgment in this Action as against the Individual Defendants pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed to immediately enter this final judgment as against the Individual Defendants. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/10/2015) (lmb) Modified on 4/15/2016 (lmb).
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH CERTAIN UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS: This Judgment incorporates and makes a part hereof: (a) the Underwriter Stipulation filed with the Court on December 11, 2014; and (b) the Underwriter Notice and the Underwriter Summary Notice, both of which were filed with the Court on May 15, 2015. The Court hereby affirms its determinations in the Underwriter Preliminary Approval Order certifying, for the purposes of the Underwriter Settlement only, the Action as a class action pursuant to Rules 23(a) and (b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on behalf of a class consisting of all persons and entities who or which purchased or otherwise acquired, during the Settlement Class Period (i.e., the period beginning on May 20, 2010 through and including November 21, 2011), any of the MF Global Settling Underwriter Securities and were damaged thereby (the "Underwriter Settlement Class"). This Court hereby fully and finally approves the Underwriter Settlement set forth in the Underwriter Stipulation in all respects (including, without limitation: the amount of the Underwriter Settlement. All of the claims asserted against the Settling Underwriter Defendants in the Action by Lead Plaintiffs and the other Underwriter Settlement Class Members are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Settling Parties shall bear their own costs and expenses, except as otherwise expressly provided in the Underwriter Stipulation, and as further set forth in this judgment. The Clerk of the Court is expressly directed to immediately enter this final judgment as against the Settling Underwriter Defendants. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/26/2015) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(tn)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT COMMERZ MARKETS LLC: This Judgment incorporates and makes a part hereof: (a) the Commerz Stipulation filed with the Court on March 17, 2015; and (b) the Commerz Notice and the Commerz Summary Notice, both of which were filed with the Court on May 15, 2015. The Court hereby affirms its determinations in the Commerz Preliminary Approval Order certifying, for the purposes of the Commerz Settlement only, the Action as a class action pursuant to Rules 23(a) and (b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on behalf of a class consisting of all persons and entities who or which purchased or otherwise acquired, during the Commerz Settlement Class Period (i.e., the period beginning on August 1, 2011 through and including November 21, 2011), MF Global 6.25% Senior Notes due August 8, 2016 issued on or about August 1, 2011 ("6.25% Senior Notes") and were damaged thereby (the "Commerz Settlement Class"). This Court hereby fully and finally approves the Commerz Settlement set forth in the Commerz Stipulation in all respects (including, without limitation: the amount of the Commerz Settlement; the Releases provided for therein, including the release of the Released Plaintiffs' Claims as against the Commerz Releasees; and the dismissal with prejudice of the claims asserted against Commerz in the Action), and finds that the Commerz Settlement is, in all respects, fair, reasonable and adequate to the Commerz Settlement Class. All of the claims asserted against Commerz in the Action by Settling Plaintiffs and the Commerz Settlement Class Members are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Settling Parties shall bear their own costs and expenses, except as otherwise expressly provided in the Commerz Stipulation, and as further set forth in this judgment. The Clerk of the Court is expressly directed to immediately enter this final judgment as against Commerz. Commerz Markets LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/26/2015) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(tn)
June 22, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 11/23/2015. Motions due by 1/11/2016. Responses due by 3/2/2016. Replies due by 4/11/2016. (tn)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting (958) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF; granting (125) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-md-02338-VM: The schedule set forth above is adopted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/22/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (tn)
June 22, 2015 Filing 126 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (952 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF; 32 in 1:14-cv-02197-VM; 122 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Letter, filed by MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator. ENDORSEMENT: The application for issuance of Letters of Request is denied as untimely. The depositions requested could not be completed prior to the fact discovery deadline, and no compelling explanation has been provided for requesting them at this late stage of the litigation. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/22/2015) (tn) Modified on 6/22/2015 (tn).
June 22, 2015 Filing 125 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: the Schedule after the July 1, 2015 Deadline for Completion of Fact Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from David J. Mark dated June 22, 2015. Document filed by MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Mark, David)
June 21, 2015 Filing 124 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from James J.Capra, Jr. dated June 21, 2015 re: opposition to the June 19 application of the Plan Administrator and Litigation Trustee for entry of Letters of Request seeking the assistance of English courts to obtain the testimony of three witnesses in the United Kingdom. Document filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Capra, James)
June 21, 2015 Filing 123 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Matthew L. Mazur dated June 21, 2015 re: response to letter dated June 19, 2015. Document filed by Jon S. Corzine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mazur, Matthew)
June 19, 2015 Filing 122 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from David J. Mark dated June 19, 2015 re: Letters of Requests seeking the assistance of the English courts to obtain witness testimonies. Document filed by MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Main Letter of Request, #2 Schedules to Main Letter of Request, #3 Exhibit A to the Main Letter of Request, #4 Exhibit B to the Main Letter of Request, #5 Exhibit C to the Main Letter of Request, #6 Exhibit D to the Main Letter of Request, #7 Exhibit E-1 to the Main Letter of Request, #8 Exhibit E-2 to the Main Letter of Request, #9 Exhibit F-1 to the Main Letter of Request, #10 Exhibit F-2 to the Main Letter of Request, #11 Exhibit F-3 to the Main Letter of Request, #12 Exhibit G to the Main Letter of Request, #13 Exhibit H to the Main Letter of Request, #14 Exhibit I to the Main Letter of Request, #15 Exhibit J to the Main Letter of Request, #16 Exhibit K to the Main Letter of Request, #17 Exhibit L to the Main Letter of Request, #18 Exhibit M to the Main Letter of Request, #19 Exhibit N-1 to the Main Letter of Request, #20 Exhibit N-2 to the Main Letter of Request, #21 Exhibit N-3 to the Main Letter of Request, #22 Exhibit O to the Main Letter of Request, #23 Exhibit P to the Main Letter of Request, #24 Exhibit Q to the Main Letter of Request, #25 Exhibit R to the Main Letter of Request, #26 Letter of Request for Litigation Trustee Action, #27 Letter of Request for Sapere Action, #28 Letter of Request for Securities Class Action, #29 Letter of Request for CFTC Action, #30 Letter of Request for Customer Class Action)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Mark, David)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING EXPERT DISCOVERY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the parties hereto, through their undersigned counsel, subject to the approval of the Court, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 and 29 ("Rule 26" and "Rule 29"), that the following procedures shall govern discovery in connection with expert witnesses in this action: With respect to any person or entity whom a party to this action expects to call as a witness at trial or any hearing to present evidence under Rules 702, 703, or 705 of the Federal Rules of Evidence (an "Expert"), the party shall serve an opening expert report by July 31, 2015 or a rebuttal expert report by September 30, 2015 in accordance with the Scheduling Order, as may be amended or modified by the parties and the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(kl)
June 4, 2015 Filing 120 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Paul H. Schoeman dated June 4, 2015. Document filed by Bradley I. Abelow.(Schoeman, Paul)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 12/21/2015, Responses due by 2/10/2016, Replies due by 3/21/2016. Deposition due by 10/30/2015. Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2015. Expert Discovery due by 10/30/2015. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for TBD. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(kl)
May 4, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Coyle Jarvis on behalf of Robert Marcin. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM et al.(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER: PwC's pending motion to dismiss [ECF No. 814] shall be held in abeyance and, upon the Court's approval of the parties' settlement in a final order, be deemed withdrawn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/4/2015) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (tn)
April 24, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2015. (Bacchus, Michael)
April 21, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Settlement Conference held on 4/21/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Bacchus, Michael)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned In Re: MF Global Holdings Ltd. Investment Litigation (11-Civ-7866 (VM)), No. 12md2338, on 4/21/2015: John F. McCarrick - cell phone and blackberry. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/17/2015) ***As per chambers, filed in 12md2338 only. (tn)
April 14, 2015 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin Marie Wilcox on behalf of Bradley I. Abelow. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Wilcox, Robin)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: A settlement conference having been held on March 18, 2015, it is hereby ORDERED that a further settlement conference will be held on April 1, 2015, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 18D of the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Settlement Conference set for 4/1/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(kko)
March 6, 2015 Filing 113 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeffry M. Henderson on behalf of Christy Vavra. New Address: Greeberg Traurig, LLP, 77 W. Wacker Dr, Ste 3100, Chicago, IL, 60601, (312) 456-8400. (Henderson, Jeffry)
March 4, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Harris Lee Kay on behalf of Christy Vavra. New Address: Greenberg Traurig, LLP, 77 W. Wacker Dr., Ste. 3100, Chicago, IL, 60601, (312) 456-8400. (Kay, Harris)
March 3, 2015 Filing 111 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Paul H. Schoeman dated March 3, 2015. Document filed by Bradley I. Abelow.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Schoeman, Paul)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying (789) Motion to Compel in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF: For these reasons, the Individual Defendants' Motion to Compel Trustee's Production of EY Documents (Docket no. 789) is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/9/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (tn)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re: (839 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF) Letter, filed by Nader Tavakoli, As Litigation Trustee Of The MF Global Litigation Trust, (840 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF) Letter filed by Jon S. Corzine: Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. The Plaintiff Group and the Individual Defendants shall each submit to the Court, ex parte, a detailed pre-mediation memo. The memos shall be due in chambers before close of business on March 11, 2015. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/4/2015) (tn)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), upon the stipulation of all named Plaintiffs and the undersigned Defendants in the above-captioned action, by and through their respective counsel, Plaintiff Monica Rodriguez's claims asserted in the Consolidated Second Amended Securities Class Action Complaint, including Plaintiff Rodriguez's Section 10(b) and Section 20(a) claims under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (the "Exchange Act") against Defendants Jon S. Corzine, J. Randy MacDonald, Henri J. Steenkamp, and PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, are hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice, with each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Nothing in this Stipulation and Order has dismissed, or shall be deemed to have dismissed, the claims of Lead Plaintiffs The Virginia Retirement System and Her Majesty The Queen In Right Of Alberta, and additional named plaintiffs The Government Of Guam Retirement Fund, The West Virginia Laborers' Pension Trust Fund, LRI Invest S.A., and Jerome Vrabel brought pursuant to the Exchange Act or the Securities Act of 1933 in this consolidated securities action. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/3/2015) (lmb)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part (798 in 11cv7866): that the application is granted in part. Within fourteen days of the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer to agree on a reasonable list of additional custodians -- no more than six -- whose files shall be produced. In addition, they shall confer to identify a reasonable subset of file systems likely to contain relevant documents, which the Litigation Trustee shall produce. This resolves Docket no. 798 in Case no. 11 Civ. 7866. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/15/2015) (tn) Modified on 1/16/2015 (tn).
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AGAINST CERTAIN UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: 1. This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action, and all matters relating to the Settlement, as well as personal jurisdiction over all of the Settling Parties. 2. This Judgment incorporates and makes a part hereof the Settlement Agreement (including its defined terms). 3. All of the claims asserted against the Settling Underwriter Defendants in the Action by Plaintiffs are hereby dismissed with prejudice. 4. Plaintiffs' claims against the Non-Settling Underwriter Defendants in this Action are hereby dismissed without prejudice, subject to the provision of Paragraph 10 of the Settlement Agreement. 5. The Settling Parties shall bear their own costs and expenses. 6. The Releases set forth in Paragraphs 3 and 4 of the Settlement Agreement, together with the definitions contained in Paragraph 1 of the Settlement Agreement, are expressly incorporated herein in all respects and shall be effective without further action by anyone as of the Effective Date. 7. The Court hereby: (a) permanently bars, enjoins and restrains any person or entity from commencing, prosecuting, or asserting any Barred Claims against any of the Settling Underwriter Defendants' Releasees, whether as claims, cross-claims, counterclaims, third-party claims, or otherwise, and whether asserted in the Action or any other proceeding, in this Court, in any federal or state court, or in any other court, arbitration proceeding, administrative agency, or other forum in the United States or elsewhere; and (b) permanently bars, enjoins, and restrains the Settling Underwriter Defendants' Releasees from commencing, prosecuting, or asserting any Barred Claims against any person or entity, whether as claims, cross-claims, counterclaims, third-party claims or otherwise, and whether asserted in the Action or any other proceeding, in this Court, in any federal or state court, or in any other court, arbitration proceeding, administrative agency, or other forum in the United States or elsewhere as further set forth in this order. 9. If the Settlement is terminated as provided in the Settlement Agreement or the Effective Date of the Settlement otherwise fails to occur, this Judgment shall be vacated, rendered null and void and be of no further force and effect, except as otherwise provided by the Settlement Agreement, and this Judgment shall be without prejudice to the rights of Plaintiffs and the Settling Underwriter Defendants, and the Settling Parties shall revert to their respective positions in the Action on April 24, 2014, as provided in the Settlement Agreement. 10. There is no just reason to delay the entry of this Judgment as a final judgment in this Action as against the Settling Underwriter Defendants pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed to immediately enter this final judgment as against the Settling Underwriter Defendants. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/5/2015) (lmb)
December 18, 2014 Filing 105 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin Y. Kaufman dated 12/17/2014 re: I respectfully request that the Court remove me as counsel in these matters. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove attorney Benjamin Y. Kaufman from the list of counsel in the referenced litigation., Attorney Benjamin Yehuda Kaufman terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(lmb)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting (797) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF: Application granted, with the caveats that: (1) partial motions to dismiss are disfavored, and (2) discovery will not be stayed during the pendency of any such motion. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/17/2014) ***As per instructions from chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (tn)
December 11, 2014 Filing 103 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Thomas A. Arena dated 12/9/2014 re: Counsel requests that James N. Benedict of this firm be removed from the ECF service list for these matters. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Attorney James N. Benedict from the ECF service list for this matter. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/11/2014) ***As per instructions from chambers, filed in all Member and Related cases: 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF et al.(tn)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WAIVE THE REQUIREMENT FOR DEFENDANTS OTHER THAN DEFENDANT PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: that the Individual Defendants and Senior Notes Underwriter Defendants are not required to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. The Individual Defendants and the Senior Notes Underwriter Defendants, in response to the Second Amended Complaint, hereby re-assert the responses and defenses contained in their Answers to the First Amended Complaint. As to any new or modified allegations in the Second Amended Complaint which are not contained in the First Amended Complaint, none of the Individual Defendants or Senior Notes Underwriter Defendants shall be deemed to have admitted any such allegations, and the Securities Plaintiffs shall not assert at any time that any of the Individual Defendants or Senior Notes Underwriter Defendants has made such admissions, or has defaulted, on the basis of not having filed a separate response to the Second Amended Complaint. The parties agree that the Individual Defendants and Senior Notes Underwriter Defendants reserve their rights to file amended Answers, and that they may modify existing defenses and/or assert new defenses in response to the Second Amended Complaint at a later date. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/3/2014) ***As per chambers, filed in 11cv7866 and 12md2338 only. (tn)
October 23, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 11/20/2014. Responses due by 2/20/2015. Replies due by 4/20/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (tn) Modified on 10/27/2014 (tro). Modified on 10/27/2014 (tro).
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting (780) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF: The parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties shall confer regarding the number, timing, and length of depositions following the commencement of fact discovery. The parties will seek to coordinate witness depositions with the parties in all actions consolidated and/or coordinated as part of In re MF Global Holdings Ltd. Investment Litigation, MDL No. 12-2338, and/or under the caption DeAngelis v. Corzine, 11 Civ. 7866, and/or under the caption MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, 14 Civ. 2197. Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP ("PwC") shall have until December 19, 2014 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Second Amended Securities Class Action Complaint filed October 3, 2014 [ECF No. 779]. All other Defendants in the Securities Action shall have until December 19, 2014 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Should PwC move to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs' opposition papers shall be due on February 6, 2015, and PwC's reply papers shall be due on March 6, 2015. All discovery relating to class certification in the Securities Action shall be stayed until November 20, 2014. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/22/2014) ***As per instructions from chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (tn) Modified on 10/23/2014 (tn).
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER MAKING THE STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL FILED IN THE MDL 12-MD-2338 AND ll-CIV-7866 APPLICABLE TO 14-CIV-2197 AND GRANTING THE PARTIES TO 14-CIV-2197 ACCESS TO ALL DOCUMENTS PRODUCED IN 12-MD-2338 AND 11-CIV-7866...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/7/2014) ***As per chambers, filed in 12md2338, 11cv7866 and 14cv2197 only. (tn)
October 6, 2014 Filing 99 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Daniel J. Fetterman dated 10-6-2014 re: Requesting entry of the Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Making the Stipulation and Protective Order Governing Confidentially of Discovery Material Filed in the MDL 12-MD-2338 and 11-CV-7866 Applicable to 14-CV-2197 and Granting the Parties to the 14-CV-2197 Access to all Documents Produced in MDL 12-MD-2338 and 11-CV-7866. Document filed by MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Fetterman, Daniel)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties to the Plan Administrator Action do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Fact discovery shall be completed in the Plan Administrator Action by April 1, 2015, including requests for the production of documents, interrogatories, and depositions, except that requests for admission must be completed by April 15, 2015. Expert discovery shall be completed by September 30, 2015. The deadlines for completion of expert discovery shall be as set forth herein. All depositions of experts (whether initial or rebuttal experts) shall be completed by September 30, 2015. Any motion for summary judgment the Court permits shall be filed by November 20, 2015. Any opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by January 8, 2016. Any reply in support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by February 19, 2016. The next Case Management Conference is TBD. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 9/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(mro)
September 17, 2014 Filing 97 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Daniel J. Fetterman dated 9/17/2014 re: (Proposed) Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(Fetterman, Daniel)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (95 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 748 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF, 37 in 1:12-cv-03589-VM) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Wade Jacobsen, Rocking K Land and Cattle, Inc., H. Martin Klinker, Jr., Philip Timothy Johnson. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF, 1:12-cv-03589-VM(tn)
July 18, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Matthew Edling Document #95 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge Victor Marrero for approval. (km)
July 17, 2014 Filing 95 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Jon S. Corzine, JP Morgan Chase & Co., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Christine A. Serwinski, David Simons. Document filed by Philip Timothy Johnson, H. Martin Klinker, Jr, Rocking K Land and Cattle, Inc., Wade Jacobsen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF, 1:12-cv-03589-VM(Edling, Matthew) Modified on 7/18/2014 (km).
April 28, 2014 Filing 94 ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Bradley I. Abelow.(Aufses, Arthur)
April 28, 2014 Filing 93 ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jon S. Corzine.(Streeter, Jonathan)
April 28, 2014 Filing 92 ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Henri J, Steenkamp.(Binder, Neil)
April 28, 2014 Filing 91 ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by David Dunne.(Steinberg, Laura)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The CFTC Action shall not be included in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Cases in the Southern District of New York, and, accordingly, the parties will instead proceed in accordance with this Plan and Judge Marrero's Individual Rules of Practice and Orders. The parties to the CFTC Action ("the CFTC Action parties") do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Jury trial has been demanded in the CFTC Action. Fact discovery shall be completed in the CFTC Action by April 1, 2015, including requests for production, interrogatories, and depositions, except that requests for admission must be completed by April 15, 2015. Expert discovery shall be completed by September 30, 2015. All depositions of experts (whether initial or rebuttal experts) shall be completed by September 30, 2015. Any motion for summary judgment the Court permits shall be filed by November 20, 2015. Any opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by January 8, 2016. Any reply in support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by February 19, 2016. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(mro)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(mro) (Main Document 89 replaced on 4/24/2014) (mro).
April 15, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Note to Attorney Entwistle, Andrew to RE-FILE Document No. 87 and 88 belonging to case 11-cv-7866 ONLY that was incorrectly filed on 4/11/2014 in case 12-md-02338 and assigned payment receipt number 0208-9555338. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM.(tp)
April 11, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files ONLY for (708 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 88 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Corrected Notice of Appeal,, filed by Paradigm Asia Ltd., Summit Trust Company, Mark Kennedy, Rogers Varner, Jr., Kay P. Tee, LLC, Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Thomas G. Moran, Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Bearing Fund LP, Robert Marcin, PS Energy Group Inc, Thomas S. Wacker were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(nd)
April 11, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (88 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 708 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Corrected Notice of Appeal,,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(nd)
April 11, 2014 Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for (88 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 708 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Corrected Notice of Appeal,,. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-9555338, paid on 04/10/2014. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(nd)
April 11, 2014 Filing 88 CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (707 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 87 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Notice of Appeal,, (702 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Judgment,, (641 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 641 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Kay P. Tee, LLC, Thomas G. Moran, PS Energy Group Inc, Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Rogers Varner, Jr, Bearing Fund LP, Mark Kennedy, Robert Marcin, Summit Trust Company, Thomas S. Wacker. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Entwistle, Andrew)
April 11, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Note to Attorney Entwistle, Andrew to RE-FILE Document No. (707 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 87 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Notice of Appeal. Not all Orders being appealed were selected. Re-file the document as a Corrected Notice of Appeal event and select the correct Orders being appealed. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(tp)
April 10, 2014 Filing 87 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL ORDERS SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL from (641 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 641 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., Bearing Fund LP, Kay P. Tee, LLC, Thomas G. Moran, PS Energy Group Inc, Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Rogers Varner, Jr, Mark Kennedy, Robert Marcin, Summit Trust Company, Thomas S. Wacker. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9555338. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Entwistle, Andrew) Modified on 4/11/2014 (tp).
March 24, 2014 Filing 86 JUDGMENT: This Judgment is final as to the Customer Representatives' claims against PwC (Counts XIII and XIV of the CAC). The Customer Representatives' claims against PwC in Counts XIII and XIV of the CAC are dismissed with prejudice. The Court finds that there is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Judgment and immediate entry by the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM (tn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2014: #2 Right to Appeal) (tn).
March 24, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CAUSE FOR HEARING proceeding held on 02/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
March 24, 2014 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CAUSE FOR HEARING held on 2/27/2014 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer/Mary Greco, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2014.(ca)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER AWARDING FEES AND EXPENSES on Attorney Fees: The Court hereby awards Class Counsel attorneys' fees of $2,722,023.42 and expenses of $177,976.58 (the "Fees and Expenses"). Interim Co-Lead Counsel shall allocate the Fees and Expenses in a manner which, in their good-faith judgment, reflects each Plaintiffs' Counsel's contribution to the institution and prosecution of the Customer Class Action and/or Settlement with CME Group. There is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Fees and Expenses Judgment and immediate entry by the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/17/2014) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(tn)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT BETWEEN THE FORMER COMMODITY FUTURES CUSTOMERS OF MF GLOBAL INC. AND THE MF GLOBAL INC. TRUSTEE PROVIDING FOR THE ASSIGNMENT OF THE COMMODITY FUTURES CUSTOMERS' UNPAID NET EQUITY CLAIMS IN EXCHANGE FOR PAYMENT OF 100% OF THE CLAIMS granting (656) Motion in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM: that the Court hereby approves the utilization of the Settlement Class it certified in connection with the JPMC Settlement Order. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, the Court hereby approves the Net Equity Settlement Assignment Agreement as fair, reasonable and adequate, and in the best interests of the Settlement Class Members. The Parties are directed to consummate the Net Equity Settlement Assignment Agreement pursuant to its terms, and the terms of the Allocation and Advance Order and Consent Order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/14/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM (tn)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: that for settlement purposes only, the Court hereby approves the utilization of the Settlement Class it certified in connection with the JPMC Settlement Order, as also defined above in paragraph 1(s). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, the Court hereby approves the Settlement as fair, reasonable and adequate, and in the best interests of the Settlement Class Members. The Parties are directed to consummate the Settlement in accordance with the terms and provisions of the Settlement Agreement. The Customer Class Action and any claims of the Settlement Class Members are dismissed on the merits as to the Released Defendant Persons, without costs, and with prejudice. Without affecting the finality of this Judgment in any way, the Court hereby retains continuing jurisdiction over: (i) implementation of this Settlement and any award or distribution of the Net Distribution Fund, including any interest earned thereon; (ii) disposition of the Net Distribution Fund; and (iii) all parties hereto for the purpose of construing, enforcing and administering the Net Distribution Fund. There is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Judgment and immediate entry by the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/14/2014) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(tn)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING THE PLAN OF ALLOCATION: After giving due consideration, the Court finds that the proposed Plan of Allocation (as set forth in the Notice Materials and related approval documents) is fair, reasonable and adequate, and is hereby approved. There is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Judgment and immediate entry by the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/14/2014) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM (tn)
March 12, 2014 PLEASE NOTE: As per instructions the Chambers on Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/12/2014, entry 79 terminates the case management conference which was erroneously scheduled before the wrong judge, Honorable Judge Victor Marrero in entry 68, on 3/18/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM et al.(tro)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re: (604 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 68 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Case Management Plan. The case management conference scheduled for 3/18/2014, at 9:30 a.m. is adjourned sine die. This order does not affect any conferences or other proceedings scheduled before the Honorable Victor Marrero, U.S.D.J. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM et al.(tro)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Upon entry of the Plan, the stay of discovery shall be lifted in the Actions subject to the following exceptions as set forth herein. 2. The Actions shall not be included in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Cases in the Southern District of New York, and, accordingly, the parties will instead proceed in accordance with this Plan and Judge Marrero's Individual Rules of Practice and Orders. 3. The parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). 4. Jury trial has been demanded in all actions. d. Fact discovery shall be completed in the Actions by April 1, 2015, including requests for the production of documents, interrogatories, and depositions, except that requests for admission must be completed by April 15, 2015. e. A motion for class certification in the Commodity Customer Class Action shall be filed by November 14, 2014. Any opposition papers shall be filed by January 16, 2015. Any reply in support of class certification shall be filed by March 11, 2015. Any expert discovery relating to class certification shall occur within the deadlines set forth in this subparagraph 6(e), rather than subparagraph 6(f) below. f. Expert discovery shall be completed by September 30, 2015. The deadlines for completion of expert discovery shall be as set forth below: All depositions of experts (whether initial or rebuttal experts) shall be completed by September 30, 2015. Any motion for summary judgment the Court permits shall be filed by November 20, 2015. Any opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by January 8, 2016, Any reply in support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by February 19, 2016. (Motions due by 11/20/2015. Responses due by 1/8/2016. Replies due by 2/19/2016. Deposition due by 9/30/2015. Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2015. Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2015).(Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/10/2014)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(djc) Modified on 3/11/2014 (djc). Modified on 3/12/2014 (djc). Modified on 3/12/2014 (djc).
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting (670) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Having set forth appropriate grounds, in accordance with Local Civil Rule 1.4, including Defendants' continued representation by members of the law firm of Jenner & Block LLP, Jeffrey S. Eberhard's Motion for Leave to Withdraw is here GRANTED and Jeffrey S. Eberhard is withdrawn as counsel effective immediately. Attorney Jeffrey S Eberhard terminated in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM; Attorney Jeffrey S Eberhard terminated in case 1:12-md-02338-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/4/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM (tn)
February 28, 2014 Filing 76 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Eberhard to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by CME Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Eberhard, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Status Conference held on 2/27/2014. Conference recorded. (Bacchus, Michael)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting (642) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: that the motion of Benjamin E. Rosenberg, of Dechert LLP, to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Jon S. Corzine in the above-caption action is granted. Attorney Benjamin E. Rosenberg terminated in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM. Attorney Benjamin E. Rosenberg terminated in case 1:12-md-02338-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM (tn)
February 11, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION for Benjamin E. Rosenberg to Withdraw as Attorney for Jon S. Corzine. Document filed by Jon S. Corzine. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Rosenberg, Benjamin)
February 4, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan R. Streeter on behalf of Jon S. Corzine. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Streeter, Jonathan)
January 31, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Hearing set for 3/14/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 20B, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Victor Marrero. (rjm)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Settlement Class Certification: Pursuant to Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and for purposes of the Settlement only, the Court approves the utilization of the Settlement Class it certified in connection with the JPMC Settlement by Order dated March 28, 2013, and as further set forth. The Court hereby preliminarily approves the Settlement, as memorialized in the Settlement Agreement, as fair, reasonable and adequate, and in the best interest of the Customer Representatives and the other Settlement Class Members, subject to further consideration at the Settlement Hearing to be conducted as described below. The Court will hold a settlement hearing (the "Settlement Hearing") on March 14, 2014 at 1:00 pm. at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 20B, New York, NY 10007-1312, for the purposes as further specified in this Order. Co-Lead Counsel shall file and serve papers in support of the proposed Settlement no later than February 21, 2014; and reply papers, if any, shall be filed and served no later than March 12, 2014, and as further set forth. Granting [629 in Case No. 11-7866] MOTION for Preliminary Approval of the Settlement Between the Former Commodity Futures Customers of MF Global Inc. and The CME Group. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/31/2014) Entered as doc. no. 632 in case no. 11cv7866. (rjm)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING REQUIREMENT FOR NOTICE TO CUSTOMERS OF THE MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT BETWEEN THE FORMER COMMODITY FUTURES CUSTOMERS OF MF GLOBAL INC.AND THE MF GLOBAL INC. TRUSTEE PROVIDING FOR THE ASSIGNMENT OF THE COMMODITY FUTURES CUSTOMERS UNPAID NET EQUITY CLAIMS IN EXCHANGE FOR PAYMENT OF 100% OF THE CLAIMS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND ORDERED THAT 1. The Trustee and Customer Representatives can effectuate adequate notice to Customers concerning the Net Equity Settlement Assignment Agreement, including the deadline to object to the settlement, by instructing Epiq to mail to Settlement Class Members the contemplated Notice to Former Commodities Futures Customers of MF Global Inc. of the Settlement Between the Former Commodity Futures Customers of MF Global Inc. and the MF Global Inc. Trustee Providing for the Assignment of the Commodity Futures Customers' Unpaid Net Equity Claims in Exchange for Payment of 100% of the Claims (the "Notice"), which will include the hearing date, at the addresses compiled by the Trustee and Epiq from the Customer Claim Forms, MFGI's records, and the POCs submitted in connection with the JPMC Settlement. A copy of the Notice will also be sent, where appropriate, to the assignee or transferee of any Customer Claim Form as reflected on the Claims Register maintained in the SIPA proceeding. 2. The Trustee will make related materials seeking approval of the Net Equity Settlement Assignment Agreement, such as authorized Preliminary Approval Order, the Net Equity Settlement Assignment Agreement, the notice of motion, memorandum of law, declaration and exhibits, proposed final order, Allocation and Advance Order and so-ordered Consent Order available to Customers at http://dm.epiq11.com/MFG/Project and Co-lead counsel will make the same materials available on their respective websites. 3.The Trustee and the Customers Representatives have agreed that, in seeking expedited preliminary and final approval from this Court, the Customer Representatives are only required to submit one motion and set of supporting papers (rather than motions and supporting papers for both preliminary and final approval), which will include, among other things, both a proposed preliminary approval order and a proposed final order because of the unique circumstances present here, including that: (i) Customers are receiving payment of 100% of their net equity claims; and (ii) the approval motion will not seek an award of attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/26/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(js) Modified on 12/26/2013 (js).
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARILY APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT BETWEEN THE FORMER COMMODITY FUTURES CUSTOMERS OF MF GLOBAL INC TRUSTEE PROVIDING FOR THE ASSIGNMENT OF THE COMMODITY FUTURES CUSTOMERS UNPAID NET EQUITY CLAIMS IN EXCHANGE FOR PAYMENT OF 100% OF THE CLAIMS APPROVING NOTICE THROUGH THE SIPA PROCEEDING AND SETTING A HEARING DATE FOR FINAL APPROVAL: NOW THEREFORE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED:1. Settlement Class Certification: Pursuant to Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of civil Procedure, and for purposes of the Net Equity Settlement Assignment Agreement only, the Court approves the utilization of the Settlement Class it certified in connection with the JPMC Settlement by Order dated March 28, 2013 (the"JPMC") Settlement Order") (ECF No. 474). For ease of reference: the Court certified the Customer Class Action as a class action on behalf of the following Settlement Class: All other provisions as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(js) (PDF to large to attach) (js).
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT BETWEEN THE FORMER COMMODITY FUTURES CUSTOMER OF GLOBAL INC AND THE MF GLOBAL INC TRUSTEE PROVIDING FOR THE ASSIGNMENT OF THE COMMODITY FUTURES CUSTOMERS' UNPAID NET EQUITY CLAIMS IN EXCHANGE FOR PAYMENT OF 100% OF THE CLAIMS APPROVING NOTICE THROUGH THE SIPA PROCEEDING AND SETTING A HEARING DATE FOR FINAL APPROVAL: terminating (606) Motion to Approve settlement in case 1:11-cv-07866-VMNow therefore, it is hereby ordered 1. settlement class certification pursuant to Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of civil Procedure, and for purposes of the Net Settlement Assignment Agreement only, the Court approves the utilization of the Settlement Class it certified in connection with the JPMC Settlement by Order dated March 28, 2013 (the "JPMC" Settlement Order") (ECF No. 474). for ease of reference, the Court certified the Customer Class Action as a class action on behalf of the following Settlement Class as set forth in this Order.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM (js)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Securities Action shall not be included in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Cases in the Southern District of New York, and, accordingly, the parties will instead proceed in accordance with this Plan and Judge Marrero's Individual Rules of Practice and Orders. The parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. The case will be governed by the following schedule: Plaintiffs' initial requests for the production of documents shall be served in December 2013. Fact discovery shall be completed by April 1, 2015, including requests for the production of documents, interrogatories, and depositions, except that requests for admission must be completed by April 15, 2015. A motion for class certification shall be filed by September 15, 2014. Any opposition papers shall be filed by November 17, 2014. Any reply in support of class certification shall be filed by January 12, 2015. Expert discovery shall be completed by July 31, 2015. The deadlines for completion of expert discovery shall be as set forth herein: Opening expert witness reports, if any, shall be served by April 30, 2015. All depositions of experts (whether initial or rebuttal experts) shall be completed by July 31, 2015. Any motion for summary judgment the Court permits shall be filed by September 21, 2015. Any opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by November 10, 2015. Any reply in support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by December 21, 2015. Joinder of additional parties and any amendment of the pleadings without leave of the Court are to be accomplished by October 17, 2014. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for March 18 at 9:30 a.m. (See Order). Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 10/17/2014. Motions due by 9/21/2015. Responses due by 11/10/2015 Replies due by 12/21/2015. Deposition due by 7/31/2015. Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2015. Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2015. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Victor Marrero. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/12/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(ja)
December 12, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lee S Richards, III on behalf of Henri J, Steenkamp. New Address: Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP, 200 Liberty Street, New York, NY, USA 10281, 212-530-1800. (Richards, Lee)
December 2, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/2/2013. (sc)
November 13, 2013 Filing 66 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (563 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Letter filed by Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. ***Filed in 11cv7866 and 12md2338. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/13/2013) (tn)
November 5, 2013 Filing 65 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (558 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Letter, filed by Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. Lifting the stay selectively is not costless and risks generating additional disputes. ***Filed in 11cv7866 and 12md2338 (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/5/2013) (tn)
November 5, 2013 Filing 64 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (560 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Letter filed by Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (560 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Letter, (431 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint: Responses due by 11/11/2013, Replies due by 12/11/2013. ***Filed in 11cv7866 and 12md2338. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/5/2013) (tn)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Christopher J. Barber dated 9/16/2013 re: Counsel writes To date, the following three attorneys affiliated with Steptoe have entered appearances as counsel tor Ms. O'Brien in the above-captioned consolidated action: Christopher 1. Barber (ECF No. 320)Darren Semens Kinkead (ECF No. 308) Alejandro Gabriel Rosenberg (ECF No. 141 and ECF No. 245) As of August 9, 20l3, however, Mr. Rosenberg is nO longer affiliated with Steptoe. Accordingly, I respectfully request that Mr. Rosenberg's appearance as counsel for Ms. O'Brien be withdrawn on both Docket No. 11 Civ. 7866 (VM) and Docket No. 12 MD 2338 (VM). Steptoe continues to represent Ms. O'Brien in the above-captioned consolidated action, and Mr. Kinkead and I will continue to appear as counsel ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(js) Modified on 9/17/2013 (js).
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: that Plaintiffs' responses to defendants' motions to dismiss in the Commodity Customer Class Action shall be filed by October 28, 2013; Defendants' reply in support of their motions to dismiss in the Commodity Customer Class Action shall be filed by November 27, 2013; Defendants' motion to dismiss in the Sapere action shall be filed by October 28, 2013; Plaintiffs' response to defendants' motions to dismiss in the Sapere action shall be filed by December 27, 2013; Defendants' reply in support of their motions to dismiss in the Sapere action shall be filed by January 27, 2014; and discovery shall continue to be stayed in all actions. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (422 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint For Violations Of The Commodity Exchange Act And Common Law, (426 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Customer Class Action Complaint, (431 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint: Responses due by 10/28/2013, Replies due by 11/27/2013. (Motions due by 10/28/2013, Responses due by 12/27/2013, Replies due by 1/27/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 9/12/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
July 24, 2013 Filing 61 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Andrew J. Entwistle dated 7/22/2013 re: Since our last letter to the Court on June 24, 2013, the parties have engaged in additional telephonic and in-person meetings with the mediators during which we believe adequate progress I has been made to request a brief additional extension of the stay until Friday, August 2,2013, on the same terms. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/24/2013) (lmb)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION OF RULE 41 DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed between Craig Donohue, Donna Dellosso, and Paul Hamann, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) that Paul Hamann's Complaint against Craig Donohue and Donna Dellosso is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, including attorneys' fees. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(js)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting (514) Motion for Bruce Scott Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM; granting [] Motion for Bruce Scott Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-md-02338-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(js)
July 11, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/3/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
July 11, 2013 Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/3/2013 before Judge Victor Marrero. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER AWARDING FEES AND EXPENSES: The Court hereby awards Class Counsel attorneys' fees of $7,237,600.81 and expenses of $262,399.19, together with interest on both amounts not to exceed the interest earned on the Fee and Expense payment, if any, after it has been deposited into escrow pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/3/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(dt)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE:The Released Defendant Persons hereby fully, finall, and forever release, relinquish and discharge each and all of the Customer Representative Plaintiffs', other Class Members, and Class Counsel from all claims arising out of, relating to, or in connectioon with the institution, prosecution, assertion, settlement, or resolution of the Customer Class Action of the released Plaintiffs' Claims. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/3/2013) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(dt)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING THE PLAN OF ALLOCATION: After giving due consideration, the Court finds that the proposed Plan of Allocation (as set forth in the Filed Claim Notice and Unfiled Claim Notice and related approval documents) is fair, reasonable and adequate, and are hereby approved. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/3/2013) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(dt)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED ORDER RESERVING RIGHTS: Whereas, certain objectors have agreed to withdraw their objections (ECF Nos. 491,494) concerning the settlement preliminarily approved by this Court on March 28, 2013 (ECF No. 474) on the terms set forth below, and the parties having appeared before the Court on July 3, 2013; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND ORDERED THAT: All issues related to whether or not the Remitted Clearance Collateral is customer property and the legal consequences of the distribution of the Remitted Clearance Collateral as among the parties to the Multi-District litigation are not before the Court and shall be addressed by separate motion to the Bankruptcy Court. All parties preserve and may raise any and all arguments with respect to the Remitted Clearance Collateral that they are entitled to raise in this Court, and nothing in the settlement agreement, the order approving the settlement agreement, or the withdrawal of the objections will constitute a waiver of any parties' rights or arguments. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/3/2013) (rsh)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from James B. Kobak Jr., Scott J. Greenberg, Bruce Bennett, Andrew J. Entwistle and Merrill G. Davidoff dated 7/1/2013 re: In sum, the issues raised in the Consent Order have no relevance to the relief sought by the Trustee and the Customer Representatives at the July 3, 2013 hearing and will be fully addressed at a future hearing in the Bankruptcy Court. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the Customer Representatives, SIPA Trustee, and MF Global Holdings. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/1/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(js)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from James B. Kobak, Jr., Scott J. Greenberg, Andrew J. Entwistle, Merrill G. Davidoff dated 7/1/2013 re: The issues raised in the Consent Order have no relevance to the relief sought by the Trustee and the Customer Representatives at the July 3, 2013 hearing and will be fully addressed at a future hearing in the Bankruptcy Court. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the Customer Representatives, SIPA Trustees, and MF Global Holdings. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/1/2013) (rsh)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PAUL HAMANN'S RESPONSE ANDOBJECTION TO MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTWITH JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between James W. Giddens, as Trustee for the SIPA liquidation of MF Global Inc.and Paul Hamann that the Objection is withdrawn with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/1/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(js)
June 25, 2013 Filing 49 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Merrill G. Davidoff and Andrew J. Entwistle dated 6/24/2013 re: As the Court knows, the parties participated in extensive meetings and mediation sessions last week, and sufficient progress appears to have been made to request an extension of the stay for one month, until July 20th, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(lmb)
June 12, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Tremonte on behalf of Bradley I. Abelow, Bradley Abelow (Tremonte, Michael)
May 21, 2013 Filing 47 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (457 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 40 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Paul Hamann USCA Case Number 13-0563. Appellant, pro se, moves for open discovery. This Court has determined sua sponte that it lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because a final order has not been issued by the district court as contemplated by 28 U.S.C. 1291. See Coopers & Lybrand v. Livesay, 437 U.S. 463, 467 (1978). Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the appeal is DISMISSED. It isfurther ORDERED that Appellants motion is DENIED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/21/2013. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(nd)
May 9, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 5/9/2013. (js)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: A pretrial conference having been held on May 9, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. In light of the mediation currently underway, the stay ordered in the Memorandum Endorsement dated February 6, 2013, shall be extended until June 24, 2013, at which time it shall dissolve absent further order of the Court. 2. The stay shall apply to all proceedings in this Court except the ongoing settlement proceedings with respect to the proposed JPMorgan Chase settlement. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb)
April 16, 2013 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Change of Address served on Jeffry Henderson, Matthew Crowl & Paul Hamann on April 2, 2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Henri J, Steenkamp. (Binder, Neil)
April 2, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Neil Stephen Binder on behalf of Henri J, Steenkamp. New Address: Binder & Schwartz LLP, 28 W. 44th Street, New York, New York, 10036, 347.334.5081. (Binder, Neil)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED:I. Settlement Class Certification: Pursuant to Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and for purposes of the Settlement only, the Court certifies the Customer Class Action as a class action on behalf of the following Settlement Class: Excluded from the Settlement Class are: (i) any person or entity named as a defendant in the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Commodity Exchange Act and Common Law, dated November 2, 2012 (including any immediate family members of such defendant and any parent, subsidiary or affiliate of any defendant) that held money, securities, or property at MFGI and that could otherwise be deemed to be a member of the Settlement Class; (ii) any parent, subsidiary or affiliate of MFGI that held money, securities, or property at MFGI and that could otherwise be deemed to be a member of the Settlement Class; and(iii) any person or entity that excludes him, her or itself from the Settlement Class by filing a request for exclusion that is accepted by the Court pursuant to this Order. The Court finds, for purposes of the Settlement only, that the prerequisites for certifying the Customer Class Action as a class action under Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure have been satisfied in that: (a) the number of Settlement Class Members is so numerous that joinder of all members thereof is impracticable; (b) there are questions of law and fact common to the Settlement Class which predominate over any individual questions; (c) the claims of the Customer Representatives are typical of the claims of the Settlement Class; (d) Customer Representatives and Co-Lead Counsel (as defined herein) have and will fairly and adequately represent the interests of the Settlement Class; and (e) a class action is superior to other available methods for the fair and efficient adjudication of the Customer Class Action. All other provisions as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/28/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(js)
February 26, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory M. Egleston on behalf of Juan P Arvelo. New Address: Gainey McKenna & Egleston, 440 Park Avenue South, 5th Fl., New York, New York, 10016, 212-983-1300. (Egleston, Gregory)
February 20, 2013 Filing 41 REPLY re: (435 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Paul Hamann. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(sac)
February 13, 2013 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 465401059972 on 2/13/2013 re: (457 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 40 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Paul Hamann. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(nd)
February 7, 2013 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (441 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Christine A. Serwinski, (177 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed, (74 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Henri J. Steenkamp, (101 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael G. Stockman, (31 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 406 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter, (402 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Virginia Retirement System, Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, (185 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Virginia Retirement System, Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, (277 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Davide Accomazzo, Roberto E. Calle Gracey, (270 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter, (374 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Henri J. Steenkamp, (106 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Letter, filed by Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System, (352 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Change of Address, filed by Alison J. Carnwath, (246 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Sapere CTA Fund, LP, (30 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 30 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 395 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 395 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (33 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 33 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 411 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 411 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order on Motion to Compel, (330 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Amended Complaint, filed by Jerome Vrabel, Virginia Retirement System, LRI Invest S.A., Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, Monica Rodriguez, (316 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter, (399 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order, (451 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Natixis Securities North America Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Commerz Markets LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Jefferies & Company, Inc., (29 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Context Partners Fund L.P., (78 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by J. Randy Macdonald, (323 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter, (429 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Declaration in Support of Motion filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, (414 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) FRCP Rule 5d Memo - Sent to Chambers, (24 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Jon S. Corzine, (405 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION to Compel Federal Reserve Bank of New York to discovery filed by Paul Hamann, (46 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, LRI Invest S.A., Union Asset Management Holding AG, (353 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., (378 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kay P. Tee, LLC, (210 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., (454 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Jon S. Corzine, (8 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Standing Order re Complex Civil Cases, (57 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 57 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Affidavit of Service Other, filed by IBEW Local 90 Pension Fund, (372 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Henri J. Steenkamp, (240 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Change of Address filed by Virginia Retirement System, Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, (377 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bearing Fund LP, (269 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order, (11 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) MDL Conditional Transfer In Order, (164 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Declaration in Support of Motion filed by H. Martin Klinker, Jr., (50 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 50 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Affidavit of Service Complaints, filed by IBEW Local 90 Pension Fund, (184 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal, (370 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Jon S. Corzine, (212 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RBS Securities Inc., (187 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Virginia Retirement System, Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, (446 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION for Ann K. Ritter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff filed by LRI Invest S.A., (102 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Letter, (200 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Donald Tran, John Andrew Szokolay, Thomas G. Moran, Kay P. Tee, LLC, (388 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, (60 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 60 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Affidavit of Service Other, filed by IBEW Local 90 Pension Fund, (228 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Futures Capital Management, LLC, William Schur, Zybr Holdings, LLC, Ali A. Rangchi Bozorki, Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., (11 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order, (310 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter, (21 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kay P. Tee, LLC, (364 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by RBS Securities Inc., Merril Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Deutsche Bank & Securities Inc., CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., (320 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (34 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 34 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 412 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 412 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order on Motion to Compel, (42 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 42 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION to Appoint Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Union Asset Management Holding AG, LRI Invest S.A. to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Union Asset Management Holding AG, LRI Invest S.A. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) filed by Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, LRI Invest S.A., Union Asset Management Holding AG, (107 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Letter, filed by Context Partners Fund L.P., (443 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 38 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Endorsed Letter, (10 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Order, (426 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Customer Class Action Complaint filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, (48 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 48 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Affidavit of Service Complaints, filed by IBEW Local 90 Pension Fund, (32 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 408 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION for Michael R. Pauze to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8106060. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, (366 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Senior Notes Underwriters' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Securities Class Action Complaint filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., Natxis Securities North America, Inc., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Commerz Markets LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Jefferies & Company, Inc., (335 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter, (108 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter, (13 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, (424 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Laurie R. Ferber, (56 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 56 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Affidavit of Service Other, filed by IBEW Local 90 Pension Fund, (306 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by David I. Schamis, David Gelber, Martin J. Glynn, Edward L. Goldberg, David P. Bolger, Robert S Sloan, Eileen S. Fusco, (97 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael G. Stockman, (425 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by David Dunne, (3 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Memorandum of Law, filed by Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., (129 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Virginia Retirement System, Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, (179 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Christy Vavra, (174 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter,, (118 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Certificate of Service Other, filed by Christine A. Serwinski, (27 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 391 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed, (201 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Donald Tran, John Andrew Szokolay, Thomas G. Moran, Kay P. Tee, LLC, (367 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., Natxis Securities North America, Inc., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Commerz Markets LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Jefferies & Company, Inc., (9 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 285 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Rogers Varner, Jr., (296 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter, (63 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 63 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Affidavit of Service Other, filed by IBEW Local 90 Pension Fund, (331 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Change of Address filed by Dennis A. Klejna, (211 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Deutsche Bank & Securities Inc., (358 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by David I. Schamis, David Gelber, Martin J. Glynn, Edward L. Goldberg, Robert S. Sloan, David P. Bolger, Eileen S. Fusco, (51 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 51 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Affidavit of Service Other, filed by IBEW Local 90 Pension Fund, (351 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Kay P. Tee, LLC, (413 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 413 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 35 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 35 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (265 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Waiver of Service Executed filed by Sapere CTA Fund, LP, (23 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by Jon S. Corzine, (169 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Notice of Appearance filed by CME Group Inc., (14 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, (294 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION for Brittany
February 7, 2013 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (457 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 40 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Notice of Appeal. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM.(tp)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Christopher M. Joralemon dated 1/25/2013 re: We write respectfully on behalf of all Defendants in the Securities Action to request a slight modification of the Court's January 17, 2013 Order (the "Order") granting in part Defendants' proposal for coordinated reply briefing in further support of the pending motions to dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Request GRANTED. Defendant may submit two 16-page reply briefs as set forth above. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/25/2013) (djc)
January 23, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/23/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(mro)
January 17, 2013 Filing 38 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Edmund Polubinski III dated 1/14/2013 re: On behalf of all 23 defendants in the securities action captioned In re MF Global Holdings Limited Securities Litigation (the "Securities Action"), we write regarding the briefing of replies on the motions to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Securities Class Action Complaint. In accordance with the Court's guidance on the November 20, 2012 conference call, defendants have jointly developed a proposal to consolidate briefing of common issues and avoid overlap, all while allowing discrete issues to be presented to the Court in a clear and logical way. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED in part. Counsel for defendants in the Securities Action are authorized to file a single 32-page brief addressing common issues, and up to five 4-page briefs addressing issues of individual defendant groups. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(lmb)
January 17, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Jayne S. Robinson to RE-FILE Document (37 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 421 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - Motion WAS NOT FILED. First file Motion, then file and link any supporting documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(db)
January 16, 2013 Filing 37 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Christine A. Serwinski.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Robinson, Jayne) Modified on 1/17/2013 (db).
January 14, 2013 Appeal Remark as to (457 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 40 in 1:12-md-02338-VM) Notice of Appeal, filed by Paul Hamann. $455.00 APPEAL FEE DUE. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM.(tp)
January 14, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEAL from (31 in 1:12-md-02338-VM, 406 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) Endorsed Letter. Document filed by Paul Hamann. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM.(tp)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: that Michael R. Pauze is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice for an purposes as counsel for PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP in the above- captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/4/13) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(pl)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (408) Motion for Michael R. Pauze to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM; granting (32) Motion for Michael R. Pauze to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (109) Motion for Michael R. Pauze to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM. Michael R. Pauze is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing the discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(ft)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on (404) Motion to Compel in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM. Application denied. Discovery shall not take place outside the consolidated discovery places. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(ft)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on (405) Motion to Compel in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM. Application denied. Discovery shall not take place outside the consolidated discovery places. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(ft)
January 3, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (408 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM) MOTION for Michael R. Pauze to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8106060. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(bcu)
January 2, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION for Michael R. Pauze to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8106060. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Illinois Certificate of Good Standing, #3 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Pauze, Michael)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Paul Hamann dated 11/26/2012 re: CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT & ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, on 11/15/2012. Paul Hamann is officially requesting a hearing, regarding whether his First Amendment Rights, are being violated, in the Confidentiality Agreement, to disseminate, in advance of the trial, information gained through the pretrial discovery process, or he is requesting a Certificate of Appealability. ENDORSEMENT: Upon review of the Confidentiality Agreement and Order dated 11-15-12 endorsed by Magistrate Judge James Francis, and objections thereto by plaintiff Paul Hamann, the Court is persuaded that the Order is not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. The request to disseminate information prior to trial is accordingly DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/02/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(ama)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (394) Motion for Laura Steinberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM; granting [] Motion for Laura Steinberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-md-02338-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/30/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-07866-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(cd)
November 28, 2012 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. David Dunne served on 11/16/2012, answer due 12/7/2012. Service was accepted by Margaret L. Dunne. Document filed by Augustus International Master Fund, L.P.; Paradigm Equities Ltd.; Paradigm Asia Ltd.; Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Entwistle, Andrew)
November 28, 2012 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP waiver sent on 11/17/2012, answer due 1/16/2013. Document filed by Augustus International Master Fund, L.P.; Paradigm Equities Ltd.; Paradigm Asia Ltd.; Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Entwistle, Andrew)
November 28, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice all claims against defendant Dennis A. Klejna, asserted in the above-captioned consolidated action, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. No defendant in this action has answered or filed for summary judgment and a class has not been certified. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(ja)
November 19, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David M. Fine on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(Fine, David)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM et al.(lmb)
November 8, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record. Document filed by Joseph Deangelis. (Block, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2012 Filing 24 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against David Dunne, Bradley I. Abelow, CME Group Inc., Jon S. Corzine, Laurie R. Ferber, Vinay Mahajan, Edith O'Brien, Christine A. Serwinski, Henri J. Steenkamp.Document filed by Bearing Fund LP, City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement and Palisade Strategic Master Fund (Cayman) Limited, Paradigm Asia Ltd., Joseph Deangelis, Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta, Virginia Retirement System, Paradigm Equities Ltd., Rogers Varner, Jr, PS Energy Group Inc, Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Jerome Vrabel.***Original document docketed in case number 11cv7866, #382.(mro) Modified on 11/13/2012 (mro).
November 5, 2012 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PS Energy Group Inc.(Davidoff, Merrill)
November 5, 2012 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kay P. Tee, LLC.(Davidoff, Merrill)
November 5, 2012 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bearing Fund LP.(Davidoff, Merrill)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING AMENDED AGREEMENT TO COOPERATE WITH AND ASSIGN CERTAIN CLAIMS TO CLASS ACTION PLAINTIFFS IN PENDING ACTIONS AND TO DISTRIBUTE FUNDS RECOVERED TO CUSTOMERS, AND RELATED ORDER BY THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT: The Assignment Agreement and Bankruptcy Court Order are approved in all respects in the form attached as Exhibit A. The deadline for the Customer Representatives and the plaintiff in Sapere CTA Fund, L.P. v. Corzine, 11 Civ. 9114 (VM) to file their respective amended complaints is 14 days from the date of this order, as set forth in Paragraph 2 of Judge Francis' September 14, 2012 order (the "Scheduling Order"). The other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order remain effective. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(ft) Modified on 10/25/2012 (ft).
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The deadline for filing the CAC and for filing any amended complaint in Sapere is extended until 14 days after any agreement assigning the claims of the SIPA Trustee is approved by the Bankruptcy Court and this Court. Defendants shall answer or move with respect to the CAC and the amended Sapere complaint 60 days after the Filing Deadline. Answers to any such motions shall be submitted 120 days after the Filing Deadline, and replies shall be submitted 150 days after the Filing Deadline. In the customer actions, initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26 (a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall be exchanged 30 days after the Filing Deadline. All other deadlines as set forth within this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 9/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(jar)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECISION AND ORDER: that for the reasons that are set forth in this Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, the motion of plaintiff Juan P. Arvelo to remand this action to state court (Docket No. 300), is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:12-cv-03884-VM(pl)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: An interim pretrial conference shall be held on August 27, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 18D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Although counsel for all parties may attend, counsel are urged to limit the number of attendees by designating representatives who will have the authority to discuss and enter into agreements concerning discovery on behalf of similarly situated parties. ( Initial Conference set for 8/27/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe)
July 9, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James P. Cusick on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:12-cv-03589-VM(Cusick, James)
July 9, 2012 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:12-cv-03589-VM(Capra, James)
July 9, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James J. Capra, Jr on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Capra, James)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05181-VM, 1:12-md-02338-VM (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
July 3, 2012 Filing 11 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-2)transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Illinois, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/25/2012) (sjo)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECISION AND ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions of H. Martin Klinker, Jr., Rocking K Land and Cattle, Inc., Philip Timothy Johnson and Wade Jacobsen (Docket No. 162) and David Accomazzo and Robert E. Calle Gracey (Docket No. 170) are DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the motions of Kay P. Tee, LLC, Thomas G. Moran, John Andrew Szokolay, Donald Tran, William Fleckenstein, Mark Dwyer, Thomas S. Wacker, and Summit Trust Company (Docket No. 155) and Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd., Paradigm Equities Ltd., Paradigm Asia Ltd., Zybr Holdings, LLC, Augustus International Master Fund, L.P., and William Schur (Docket No. 159) are GRANTED IN PART as modified by their subsequent filings (specifically Docket No. 280, filed Apr. 27, 2012). Accordingly, Berger & Montague, P.C. ("Berger") and Entwistle & Cappucci LLP ("Entwistle") are each designated Interim Co-Lead Counsel responsible for the tactical management and coordination of all legal work done on behalf of the putative commodities futures customer class. Further, Berger and Entwistle, along with Nisen & Elliot LLC, Susman Godfrey L.L.P., Grant & Eisenhofer P.A., and the Fleischman Law Firm are each designated as members of the Executive Committee, which will decide, by consensus, all issues of case strategy. Berger and Entwistle shall have joint authority to render final determinations as to strategic decisions on behalf of the putative class in the event that the Executive Committee cannot reach a consensus. And it is further ORDERED that the January 30, 2012 motion of Sapere CTA Fund, L.P. ("Sapere") (Docket No. 149) is hereby GRANTED to the extent that Berger and Entwistle are directed tocooperate with Sapere's counsel, Ford Marrin Esposito Witmeyer & Gleser, L.L.P., in the efficient and coordinated administration of the putative commodities class action and Sapere's individual action; and it is further ORDERED that nothing herein diminishes or effects Sapere's right to assert individual claims through an individual complaint. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/21/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM (djc)
May 16, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by R. Bryant McCulley on behalf of Rogers Varner, Jr Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM(McCulley, R.)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-03884-VM, 1:12-md-02338-VM (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
May 15, 2012 Filing 7 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER... that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-1, filed on 4/27/2012, is LIFTED and the action is transferred to the S.D.N.Y. for the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Victor Marrero. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/15/2012) (sjo)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-03589-VM, 1:12-md-02338-VM (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-03588-VM, 1:12-md-02338-VM (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10-31-2012) (sjo)
May 7, 2012 Filing 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-1) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Illinois and Montana, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/7/2012) (sjo)
April 27, 2012 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW Brief In Further Support Of The Consensus Leadership Groups Motion Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. 23(G) To Be Appointed As Interim Class Counsel And In Response To The Supplemental Brief Submitted By Counsel For Plaintiffs Davide Accomazzo And Robert E. Calle Gracey. Document filed by Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Entwistle, Andrew)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
April 24, 2012 CASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:11-cv-07866 (VM), 1:11-cv-09114 (VM). (sjo)
April 24, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
April 24, 2012 Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (sjo)
April 24, 2012 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of New York, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/23/2012) (sjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: MF Global Holdings Ltd. Investment Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert A. Daly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Juan P. Arvelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: PS Energy Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Thomas G. Moran
Represented By: Michael C. Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Daniel John Walker
Represented By: Merrill G Davidoff
Represented By: Roger Joel Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cyrille Guillaume
Represented By: Jacob H. Zamansky
Represented By: Edward H. Glenn, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda Marjorie Steiner
Represented By: Daniel Charles Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Davide Accomazzo
Represented By: Christopher J. Gray
Represented By: Stephen David Oestreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ernesto Espinoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Donald Tran
Represented By: Michael C. Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Daniel John Walker
Represented By: Merrill G Davidoff
Represented By: Roger Joel Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kay P. Tee, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Daniel John Walker
Represented By: Merrill G Davidoff
Represented By: Roger Joel Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Monica Rodriguez
Represented By: Christina H. C. Sharp
Represented By: Jacob H. Zamansky
Represented By: Edward H. Glenn, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda Marjorie Steiner
Represented By: Daniel Charles Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: IBEW Local 90 Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Andrew Szokolay
Represented By: Michael C. Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Daniel John Walker
Represented By: Merrill G Davidoff
Represented By: Roger Joel Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Roberto Calle Gracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Plumbers' & Pipefitters' Local 562 Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Summit Trust Company
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Krinsk
Represented By: Carla F. Fredericks
Represented By: Andrei V. Rado
Represented By: Charles Michael Plavi
Represented By: Benjamin Yehuda Kaufman
Represented By: Mark Leland Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Double D Trading, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Vasil Petro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Connolly
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Stockman
Represented By: Thomas A. Arena
Represented By: Sean Miles Murphy
Represented By: James N. Benedict
Represented By: Justin Anthony Alfano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick R. Demler
Represented By: Lisamarie Frances Collins
Represented By: Therese Marie Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ranald MacDonald
Represented By: Estela Diaz
Represented By: Dean Lindsay Chapman
Represented By: Robert Henry Hotz, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Lee Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. Glynn
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: David Brendan Toscano
Represented By: Julia Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Abelow
Represented By: Craig Louis Siegel
Represented By: Arthur Harold Aufses, III
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Paul Henry Schoeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick D. Leesley
Represented By: Lisamarie Frances Collins
Represented By: Therese Marie Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The MF Global Ltd. 2007 Long Term Incentive Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Represented By: James P. Cusick
Represented By: David M. Fine
Represented By: Michael Pauze
Represented By: James J. Capra, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Dellosso
Represented By: Matthew Charles Crowl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gelber
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: David Brendan Toscano
Represented By: Julia Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinay Mahajan
Represented By: Gregory John O'Connell
Represented By: Philip Canning Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dunne
Represented By: Laura Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The MF Global Ltd Approved Saving-Related Share Option Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie R. Ferber
Represented By: Daniel E. Reynolds
Represented By: Michael Dayton Longyear
Represented By: Frank H. Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison J. Carnwath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine A. Serwinski
Represented By: Brett Gerald Canna
Represented By: Jayne S. Robinson
Represented By: Kathryn Ann McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon S. Corzine
Represented By: Andrew J. Levander
Represented By: Benjamin E. Rosenberg
Represented By: Jonathan R. Streeter
Represented By: Matthew Lester Mazur
Represented By: Patrick M Collins
Represented By: Rebecca Kahan Waldman
Represented By: Caryn Lara Trombino
Represented By: Pravin B Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Donohue
Represented By: Gregory M Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P.
Represented By: H. Miriam Farber
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Stuart Jay Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Dan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen S. Fusco
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: David Brendan Toscano
Represented By: Julia Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David I. Schamis
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: David Brendan Toscano
Represented By: Julia Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henri J, Steenkamp
Represented By: Lee S Richards, III
Represented By: Neil Stephen Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis A. Klejna
Represented By: Helen Byung-Son Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S Sloan
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: David Brendan Toscano
Represented By: Julia Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Bolger
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: David Brendan Toscano
Represented By: Julia Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The MF Global LTD. Employee Stock Purchase Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley I. Abelow
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Arthur Harold Aufses, III
Represented By: Paul Henry Schoeman
Represented By: Robin Marie Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward L. Goldberg
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: David Brendan Toscano
Represented By: Julia Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Grady
Represented By: Lisamarie Frances Collins
Represented By: Therese Marie Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Simons
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey A. Lowery Whille
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Flowers & Co. LLC
Represented By: Helen Virginia Cantwell
Represented By: David William Feder
Represented By: Maeve L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Gill
Represented By: William Fleming
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Vavra
Represented By: Harris Lee Kay
Represented By: Jeffry M. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M Pierce
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Niciforo
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Represented By: Claire E. Gorman Kenny
Represented By: Peter B. Carey
Represented By: Hanh Diep Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Therese Hartmann
Represented By: Rowena T. Parma
Represented By: Michael H. Moirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Vrabel
Represented By: Christina H. C. Sharp
Represented By: Amanda Marjorie Steiner
Represented By: Daniel Charles Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement and Palisade Strategic Master Fund (Cayman) Limited
Represented By: Russell David Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hamann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Deangelis
Represented By: Scott A Mays
Represented By: Jason Mathew Leviton
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Block
Represented By: Brian C. Kerr
Represented By: Whitney Erin Street
Represented By: David A.P. Brower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sapere CTA Fund, LP
Represented By: Jon Ryan Grabowski
Represented By: John J. Witmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henning-Carey Proprietary Trading, LLC
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Represented By: Claire E. Gorman Kenny
Represented By: Peter B. Carey
Represented By: Hanh Diep Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Therese Hartmann
Represented By: Rowena T. Parma
Represented By: Michael H. Moirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bartell
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan P Arvelo
Represented By: Thomas James McKenna
Represented By: Gregory M. Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bearing Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Carey
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Represented By: Claire E. Gorman Kenny
Represented By: Peter B. Carey
Represented By: Hanh Diep Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Therese Hartmann
Represented By: Rowena T. Parma
Represented By: Michael H. Moirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mette
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Represented By: Claire E. Gorman Kenny
Represented By: Peter B. Carey
Represented By: Hanh Diep Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Therese Hartmann
Represented By: Rowena T. Parma
Represented By: Michael H. Moirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Groth
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Represented By: Claire E. Gorman Kenny
Represented By: Peter B. Carey
Represented By: Hanh Diep Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Therese Hartmann
Represented By: Rowena T. Parma
Represented By: Michael H. Moirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane McMahon
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Represented By: Claire E. Gorman Kenny
Represented By: Peter B. Carey
Represented By: Hanh Diep Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Therese Hartmann
Represented By: Rowena T. Parma
Represented By: Michael H. Moirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Zaug
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Represented By: Claire E. Gorman Kenny
Represented By: Peter B. Carey
Represented By: Hanh Diep Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Therese Hartmann
Represented By: Rowena T. Parma
Represented By: Michael H. Moirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tierney
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Represented By: Claire E. Gorman Kenny
Represented By: Peter B. Carey
Represented By: Hanh Diep Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Therese Hartmann
Represented By: Rowena T. Parma
Represented By: Michael H. Moirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fisher
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Represented By: Claire E. Gorman Kenny
Represented By: Peter B. Carey
Represented By: Hanh Diep Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Therese Hartmann
Represented By: Rowena T. Parma
Represented By: Michael H. Moirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Lebenthal & Co., LLC
Represented By: H. Miriam Farber
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Stuart Jay Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Commerz Markets LLC
Represented By: H. Miriam Farber
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Stuart Jay Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Natxis Securities North America, Inc.
Represented By: H. Miriam Farber
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Stuart Jay Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Deutsche Bank & Securities Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joralemon
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joralemon
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Steven Peter Winter
Represented By: Ralph M. Levene
Represented By: John F. Lynch
Represented By: John F Savarese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joralemon
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jeffries & Company, Inc.
Represented By: H. Miriam Farber
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Stuart Jay Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CME Group Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M Boyle
Represented By: Charles B. Sklarsky
Represented By: Brian Jason Fischer
Represented By: Jeffrey S Eberhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joralemon
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: J. Randy Macdonald
Represented By: Estela Diaz
Represented By: Dean Lindsay Chapman
Represented By: Robert Henry Hotz, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Lee Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CitiGroup Global Market, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joralemon
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Edith O'Brien
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Miller
Represented By: Christopher James Barber
Represented By: Alejandro Gabriel Rosenberg
Represented By: Darren Bernens Kinkead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: H. Miriam Farber
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Stuart Jay Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bank Of America Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joralemon
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: RBS Securities Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joralemon
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Augustus International Master Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Union Asset Management Holding AG
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paradigm Equities Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Futures Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Banyan Capital Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Curtis Victor Trinko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rocking K Land and Cattle, Inc.
Represented By: Imtiaz A. Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Philip Timothy Johnson
Represented By: Imtiaz A. Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LRI Invest S.A.
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: H. Martin Klinker, Jr.
Represented By: Imtiaz A. Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Bagwell Group
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Marcin
Represented By: James Joseph Sabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wade Jacobsen
Represented By: Imtiaz A. Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zybr Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ali A. Rangchi Bozorki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paradigm Asia Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Schur
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Virginia Retirement System
Represented By: Stephen William Tountas
Represented By: Salvatore Jo Graziano
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Ross
Represented By: Sean K. O'Dowd
Represented By: Dominic J. Auld
Represented By: Iona Maria May Evans
Represented By: Gerald H. Silk
Represented By: Stefanie Jill Sundel
Represented By: Christopher J. Keller
Represented By: Cynthia A Hanawalt
Represented By: Javier Bleichmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Alberta
Represented By: Stephen William Tountas
Represented By: Salvatore Jo Graziano
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Ross
Represented By: Sean K. O'Dowd
Represented By: Dominic J. Auld
Represented By: Iona Maria May Evans
Represented By: Gerald H. Silk
Represented By: Stefanie Jill Sundel
Represented By: Christopher J. Keller
Represented By: Cynthia A Hanawalt
Represented By: Javier Bleichmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Rehns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Rogers Varner, Jr.
Represented By: R. Bryant McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?