In re: Facebook, Inc., IPO Securities and Derivative Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Faisal Sami, Colin Suzman, Sanjay Israni, Nuhket Kayahan, Elbita Alfonso, Goldrich Cousins P.C. 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Janis Fleming, Joe Johnson, Stewart D. Pollack, Brian Gralnick, David Goldberg, Hal Hubuschman, Rock Southward, Lorrain Chin, Eric Hamrick, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Barbara Steinman, Mary Galvan, John Gregory, Avatar Securities, LLC, Ryan Cefalu, Gaye Jones, Edward Childs, Elliot Leitner, Irving S. Braun, Steve Sexton, Robert Herpst, Michael Lieber, Brian Roffe Profit Sharing Plan, Sameer Ansari, Steve Jarvis, Garrett Garrison, Kevin Hyms, Jerry Rayborn, Karen Cuker, Mark Eshehata, Sanjeev Sharma, Robert Lowinger, Dmitri Bougakov, Holly McConnaughey, Jonathan R. Simon, Jun Yan, Lidia Levy, Alexis Alexander, Vicky Jones, Katerhine Loiacono, Richard P. Eannarino, Meredith Bailey, Vernon R. DeMois, Jr., David Kenton, Crystal McMahon, Darryl Lazar, Steve Griffis, Jose Galvan, Chad Roderick, Howard Savitt, Benjamin Levine, James Chang, Justin F. Lazard, Phillip Goldberg, First New York Securities L.L.C., Edward Vernoff, Kathy Reichenbaum, Rick Pond, Michael Spatz, KBC Asset Management NV, Jennifer Stokes, Thomas J. Ahrendtsen, Randy Teresa Mielke, Khodayar Amin, William Cole, Phyllis Peterson, Sylvia Gregorcyzk, Eugene Stricker, Keith Wise, Vijay Akkaraju, Dennis Palkon, Jacinto Rivera, Douglas M. Lightman, Atish Gandhi, T3 Trading Group, LLC, Peter Brinckerhoff, George Michalitsianos, Peter Mamula, Maren Twining, Edward Shierry, Aaron M. Levine, Dennis Kuhn, Jacob Salzmann and Thomas E. Nelson
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc., David A. Ebersman, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Castleoak Securities, L.P., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Cipora Herman, Nick E. Tran, Linh Luu, Harvey Lapin, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Kevin Hicks, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Jill D. Simon, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Uma M. Swaminathan, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Robert Greifeld, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Lawrence Corneck, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., King & Associates, Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Blaylock Robert Van LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., E* Trade Securities LLC, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., M.R. Beal & Company, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., C.L. King & Associates, Inc. and Loop Capital Markets LLC
Petitioner: William H. Anhood, A. Marcus Gerber, Eric Rand, Facebook Investor Group, The GAF Unit Trust, Donald Pompliano, Desmond Doris, Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC, Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, White Dune LLC and Randford Williams
Intervenor Plaintiff: Marc L. Andreessen, Reed Hastings, Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Spillane, David Ebersman, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel and Erskine B. Bowles
Lead Plaintiff: Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Institutional Investor Group and Arkansas Teacher Retirement System
Interested Party: Nasdaq claimant group
Other: James J. Hayes
Not Yet Classified: Jerry Rayburn
Intervenor Defendant: Nasdaq Stock Market LLC
Case Number: 1:2012md02389
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Referring Judge: Robert W Sweet
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 606 DIRECTION TO THE BAR AND INTERIM ORDER OF REFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, pending the reassignment of Judge Sweet's civil cases, all urgent matters should be taken either to the Magistrate Judge who is assigned to the case or to the District Judge sitting in Part I. In cases in which Judge Sweet did not sign an order of reference, this order operates as an interim order of reference to the Magistrate Judge for interim pre-trial supervision. Routine case management requests (such as, for extension of time) should be directed to the Magistrate Judge, not to the Part I Judge. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/27/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 1:12-cv-07550-RWS(anc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 605 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #604 Order, #603 Judgment. Document filed by James J. Hayes. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401225267. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp)
December 21, 2018 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #605 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
December 21, 2018 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #605 Notice of Appeal filed by James J. Hayes were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This Order incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement, dated as of February 26, 2018 (the "Stipulation"), and all capitalized terms not otherwise defined herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Stipulation. Lead Counsel are hereby awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of 25% of the Settlement Fund and $4,962,978.46 in payment of Plaintiffs' Counsel's Litigation Expenses (which fees and expenses shall be paid from the Settlement Fund), which sums the Court finds to be fair and reasonable. The Settlement has created a fund of $35,000,000 in cash that has been funded into escrow pursuant to the terms of the Stipulation, and that numerous Class Members who submit acceptable Claim Forms will benefit from the Settlement that occurred because of the efforts of Plaintiffs' Counsel; More than 1,387,738 copies of the Settlement Notice were mailed to potential Class Members and nominees stating that Lead Counsel would apply for attorneys' fees in an amount not to exceed 25% of the Settlement Fund and Litigation Expenses in an amount not to exceed $5.6 million; Plaintiffs' Counsel devoted more than 94,317 hours, with a lodestar value of $50,042,638.00 to achieve the Settlement; and Lead Plaintiff Arkansas Teacher Retirement System is hereby awarded $6,012.53 from the Settlement Fund as reimbursement for its reasonable costs and expenses directly related to its representation of the Class. Lead Plaintiff Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association is hereby awarded $5,000.00 from the Settlement Fund as reimbursement for its reasonable costs and expenses directly related to its representation of the Class. Class Representative Mary Jane Galvan and Jose Galvan are hereby awarded $15,000 from the Settlement Fund as reimbursement for their reasonable costs and expenses directly related to their representation of the Class. Class Representative Lynn Melton is hereby awarded $6,300 from the Settlement Fund as reimbursement for her reasonable costs and expenses directly related to her representation of the Class. Class Representative Paul Melton is hereby awarded $9,450.00 from the Settlement Fund as reimbursement for his reasonable costs and expenses directly related to his representation of the Class. Class Representative Sharon Morley is hereby awarded $7,605 from the Settlement Fund as reimbursement for her reasonable costs and expenses directly related to her representation of the Class. Class Representative Eric E. Rand is hereby awarded $7,425.00 from the Settlement Fund as reimbursement for his reasonable costs and expenses directly related to his representation of the Class. There is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Order, and immediate entry by the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed...and as further set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(jca)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 603 JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: The Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action,and all matters relating to the Settlement, as well as personal jurisdiction over all of the Parties and each of the Class Members. The Action and all of the claims asserted against Defendants in the Action by Lead Plaintiffs and the other Class Members are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Parties shall bear their own costs and expenses, except as otherwise expressly provided in the Stipulation; and as further set forth herein. There is no just reason to delay the entry of this Judgment as a final judgment in this Action. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed to immediately enter this final judgment in this Action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/26/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(anc) Modified on 5/10/2019 (anc).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. This Order incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement dated as of February 26, 2018 ( the "Stipulation"), and all capitalized terms not otherwise defined herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Stipulation. 2. The Court has jurisdiction to enter this Order and over the subject matter of the Action and all parties to the Action, including all Class Members. 3. Notice of Lead Plaintiffs' motion for approval of the proposed Plan of Allocation was given to all Class Members who could be identified with reasonable effort. The form and method of notifying the Class of the motion for approval of the proposed Plan of Allocation satisfied the notice requirements of Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the United States Constitution (including the Due Process Clause), and Section 27 of the Securities Act of 1933, 15 U.S.C. 77zl(a)(7), as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 (the "PSLRA"); constituted the best notice practicable under the circumstances; and constituted due, adequate, and sufficient notice to all Persons entitled thereto. 4. Copies of the Settlement Notice, which included the Plan of Allocation, were mailed to more than 1,387,738 potential Class Members and nominees. No objections to the Plan of Allocation have been received. 5. The Court hereby finds and concludes that the Plan of Allocation mailed to Class Members provides a fair and reasonable basis upon which to allocate the proceeds of the Net Settlement Fund among Class Members with due consideration having been given to administrative convenience and necessity. 6. The Court hereby finds and concludes that the Plan of Allocation is, in all respects, fair and reasonable to the Class. 7. There is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Order, and immediate entry by the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed. IT rs so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/26/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(jca)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 601 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motions for final approval of the Proposed Settlement and for approval of the Plan of Allocation are granted. Also for the foregoing reasons, Lead Counsel's motion for approval of the attorneys' fee award and attorneys' expenses, and for approval of the Class Representatives' expenses is also granted. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/26/2018) (jca)
October 9, 2018 Filing 600 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James J. Hayes, dated 9/28/18 re: Non-Party James J. Hayes writes to the Court to rebut arguments by Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs and the Class that the Class was adequately represented in the settlement by their counsel or the named plaintiffs appointed by the Court in its December 2015 certification decision. (sc)
September 28, 2018 Filing 599 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 9/5/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 28, 2018 Filing 598 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 9/5/2018 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 21, 2018 Filing 597 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from John Rizio-Hamilton and James W. Johnson dated 09/21/2018 re: September 17, 2018 Letter of James J. Hayes. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - September 17, 2018 Letter from James J. Hayes to Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 8, 2016 Letter from James J. Hayes to Elizabeth Cabraser, #3 Exhibit 3 - July 8, 2016 Letter from Nicholas Diamand to James J. Hayes)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
September 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 9/5/2018 re: #586 MOTION for Settlement LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION filed by Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Motion Pending. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) (Chan, Tsz)
August 29, 2018 Filing 596 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Charles S. Duggan dated August 29, 2018 re: Response on behalf of Defendants to Objection of James J. Hayes. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..(Duggan, Charles)
August 29, 2018 Filing 595 DECLARATION of John Rizio Hamilton and James W. Johnson in Support re: #588 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES., #586 MOTION for Settlement LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION.. Document filed by Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Johnson, James)
August 29, 2018 Filing 594 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #586 MOTION for Settlement LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION., #588 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES. . Document filed by Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Approving Plan of Allocation, #3 Text of Proposed Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses)(Johnson, James)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER granting #592 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/24/2018) (ne)
August 24, 2018 Filing 592 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from John Rizio-Hamilton and James W. Johnson dated 08/24/2018. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
August 15, 2018 Filing 591 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James J. Hayes, dated 8/13/18 re: OBJECTION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND UNTIMELY NOTICE PACKETS TO RETAIL SUBCLASS INVESTORS SERVED BY E*TRADE & OTHER UNIDENTIFIED BROKERS. (sc)
August 1, 2018 Filing 590 DECLARATION of John Rizio-Hamilton and James W. Johnson in Support re: #588 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES., #586 MOTION for Settlement LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Walter Decl. re: Notice, #2 Exhibit 2A - Arkansas Teacher Decl., #3 Exhibit 2B - Fresno Decl., #4 Exhibit 2C - Galvan Decl., #5 Exhibit 2D - Morley Decl., #6 Exhibit 2E - Rand Decl., #7 Exhibit 2F - Paul Melton Decl., #8 Exhibit 2G - Lynn Melton Decl., #9 Exhibit 3 - Summary of Lodestar & Expenses, #10 Exhibit 3A - Labaton Sucharow Decl., #11 Exhibit 3B - BLBG Decl., #12 Exhibit 3C - Lieff Cabraser Decl, #13 Exhibit 3D - HRS&C Decl., #14 Exhibit 3E - Baron & Budd Decl., #15 Exhibit 3F - Motley Rice Decl., #16 Exhibit 3G - KTMC Decl., #17 Exhibit 4 - Expenses by Category, #18 Exhibit 5 - Compendium of Unreported Decisions)(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 589 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #588 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES. . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 588 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 587 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #586 MOTION for Settlement LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION. . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 586 MOTION for Settlement LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
July 24, 2018 Filing 585 LETTER from Larry Gilbert, a non-party dated 7/17/18 re: Non-party Larry Gilbert submits this letter with attached copoies of his investment records from CIBC for the purchase on 5/23/12 and sale of those shares on 8/22/12; and he writes to the Court that he objects to the Settlement and the Proposed Plan of Allocation on the basis that he was unable to buy the Facebook common shares until 5/23/12 because he lives in Canada. (sc)
June 13, 2018 Filing 584 MOTION for Michael W. Stocker to Withdraw as Attorney and be Removed from the Court's Service List for the Institutional Investor Group, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association and North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. Document filed by Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Institutional Investor Group, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Johnson, James)
June 7, 2018 Filing 583 MOTION for Fred Taylor Isquith, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Phillip Goldberg.(Lovell, Christopher)
April 30, 2018 Filing 582 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joel C. Feffer on behalf of Stewart D. Pollack. New Address: Harwood Feffer LLP, 712 Fifth Avenue, 31st Floor, New York, New York, USA 10019, 212-935-7400. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF DISTRIBUTION PLAN granting #564 Motion to Approve. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Lead Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the proposed Distribution Plan for the Net Settlement Fund is approved...A.B. Data shall be paid the sum of $101,865.30 from the Net Settlement Fund as payment for its outstanding fees and expenses incurred and to be incurred in connection with administration of the Settlement and the Distribution Plan...The Court retains jurisdiction over the Actions and all parties thereto, including the Class Members and over any further application or matter which may arise herein, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/11/2018) (ras)
April 11, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 4/11/2018 re: #564 MOTION to Approve Distribution Plan Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. Motion granted.This resolved document #564. (Chan, Tsz)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting #579 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/22/2018) (ras)
March 21, 2018 Filing 579 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference re Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Christopher Lovell dated March 21, 2018. Document filed by Phillip Goldberg, T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Lovell, Christopher)
March 20, 2018 Filing 578 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Adam Seeger on behalf of Thomas J. Ahrendtsen. New Address: Seeger Weiss LLP, 55 Challenger Road, 6th FL, Ridgefield Park, New Jersey, 07660, 212-584-0700. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Seeger, Christopher)
March 20, 2018 Filing 577 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Thomas J. Ahrendtsen. New Address: Seeger Weiss LLP, 55 Challenger Road, 6th FL, Ridgefield Park, New Jersey, 07660, 212-584-0700. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Buchanan, David)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #575 Motion for Andrew M. Sher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/15/2018) (rjm)
March 15, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #575 MOTION for Andrew M. Sher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14812585. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 14, 2018 Filing 575 MOTION for Andrew M. Sher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14812585. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew M. Sher in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Sher, Andrew)
March 2, 2018 Filing 574 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole M. Zeiss on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Zeiss, Nicole)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE granting (569) Motion in case 1:12-md-02389-RWS. The Court will hold a settlement hearing (the "Settlement Hearing" on September 5, 2018 at 10 A.M at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl St., New York, NY 10007-1312, in Courtroom 18C for the following purposes: (a) to determine whether the proposed Settlement on the terms and conditions provided for in the Stipulation is fair, reasonable, and adequate to the Class, and should be approved by the Court; as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/26/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (cf) Modified on 4/24/2018 (cf).
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting #568 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/26/2018) (cf)
February 26, 2018 Filing 571 DECLARATION of Thomas A. Dubbs in Support re: #569 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Approval of Notice to the Class .. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement, #2 Exhibit 2 - AB Data Ltd. Resume)(Dubbs, Thomas)
February 26, 2018 Filing 570 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #569 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Approval of Notice to the Class . . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Dubbs, Thomas)
February 26, 2018 Filing 569 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Approval of Notice to the Class . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Approval)(Dubbs, Thomas)
February 26, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cf)
February 23, 2018 Filing 568 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference re: Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Vincent R. Cappucci dated 2/23/2018. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Cappucci, Vincent)
February 15, 2018 Filing 567 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Susan Elisabeth Engel on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. New Address: Latham & Watkins LLP, 555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20004, (202) 637-2200. (Engel, Susan)
January 23, 2018 Filing 566 DECLARATION of Eric Schachter in Support re: #564 MOTION to Approve Distribution Plan Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan.. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F PART 1, #7 Exhibit F PART 2, #8 Exhibit F PART 3, #9 Exhibit G)(Cappucci, Vincent)
January 23, 2018 Filing 565 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #564 MOTION to Approve Distribution Plan Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan. . Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
January 23, 2018 Filing 564 MOTION to Approve Distribution Plan Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cappucci, Vincent)
December 22, 2017 Filing 563 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated December 22, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' letter dated 12-22-17. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
December 22, 2017 Filing 562 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Thomas A. Dubbs and Salvatore J. Graziano dated December 22, 2017 re: Witnesses. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -List of Witnesses)(Dubbs, Thomas)
December 18, 2017 Filing 561 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Elizabeth L. Deeley on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. New Address: Latham & Watkins LLP, 505 Montgomery Street, San Francisco, California, USA 94111, (415) 391-0600. (Deeley, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2017 Filing 560 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew Brian Clubok on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. New Address: Latham & Watkins LLP, 555 11th St. NW, Ste 1000, Washington, D.C., USA 20004, (202) 637-2200. (Clubok, Andrew)
December 14, 2017 Filing 559 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/16/2017 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 13, 2017 Filing 558 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: Notice is hereby given that the parties have resolved this action and therefore, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff, Janis Fleming, dismisses this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/13/2017) (ap) Modified on 12/14/2017 (ap). Modified on 12/15/2017 (ap).
November 28, 2017 Filing 557 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/16/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 28, 2017 Filing 556 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/16/2017 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 16, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 11/16/2017 re: #539 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial filed by Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley).Motion to Bi-Furcate Pending. (Chan, Tsz)
November 10, 2017 Filing 555 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #539 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial. . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Graziano, Salvatore)
October 27, 2017 Filing 554 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
October 25, 2017 Filing 553 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Glenn McLellan on behalf of Meredith Bailey, Atish Gandhi, Phillip Goldberg, Colin Suzman. New Address: Finkelstein Thompson LLP, 3201 New Mexico Avenue, Suite 395, Washington, D.C., United States 20016, 2023378000. (McLellan, Michael)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 552 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #551 Letter, filed by Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/24/2017) (anc)
October 20, 2017 Filing 551 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano dated 10/20/2017 re: Withdrawing Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal Dkt# 545. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association.(Graziano, Salvatore)
October 18, 2017 Filing 550 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER: granting #548 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. Response due by 10/18/2017. Reply due by 10/23/2017. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/9/2017) (ap) Modified on 10/10/2017 (ap).
October 10, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/18/2017. Replies due by 10/23/2017. (ap)
October 6, 2017 Filing 548 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated October 6, 2017. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
October 5, 2017 Filing 547 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated October 5, 2017 re: Subsequent Authority. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Second Circuits recent decision in Federal Housing Finance Agency v. Nomura Holding America, Inc. (2d Cir. Sept. 28, 2017))(Clubok, Andrew)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to unseal, dated October 4, 2017, shall be heard at 11:00 AM on Wednesday, October 18, 2017 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/5/2017) (cf)
October 4, 2017 Filing 545 MOTION to Unseal Memoranda of Law, Declaration, Exhibits, and Local Rule 56.1 Statements in Opposition to Facebook's and the Individual Defendant's Motions For Summary Judgment. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. Return Date set for 10/18/2017 at 11:00 AM.(Johnson, James)
October 4, 2017 Filing 544 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
October 2, 2017 Filing 543 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano dated 10/02/2017 re: Subsequent Authority. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Housing Finance Agency v. Nomura Holding America, Inc. (2d Cir. Sept. 28, 2017))(Graziano, Salvatore)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting #537 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/29/2017) (kgo)
September 29, 2017 Filing 541 DECLARATION of Thomas G. Hoffman, Jr. in Support re: #539 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Dubbs, Thomas)
September 29, 2017 Filing 540 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #539 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial. . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Dubbs, Thomas)
September 29, 2017 Filing 539 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. Return Date set for 11/16/2017 at 11:00 AM.(Dubbs, Thomas)
September 29, 2017 Filing 538 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kate Whitman Aufses on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Aufses, Kate)
September 28, 2017 Filing 537 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of pre-trial deadlines and rescheduling the trial from October 23, 2017 to February 26, 2018 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James W. Johnson and Salvatore J. Graziano dated September 28, 2017. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule)(Johnson, James)
August 30, 2017 Filing 536 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 8/16/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 30, 2017 Filing 535 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 8/16/2017 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 30, 2017 Filing 534 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/22/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 30, 2017 Filing 533 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/22/2017 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 532 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on denying #46 (in case 13cv1999) Motion to Transfer Case. ENDORSEMENT: Motion denied at this time with leave granted to renew after completion of discovery the schedule for which will be submitted after the parties meet and confer. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/30/2017) (ap)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 531 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on denying #60 (in 12cv9308) in Motion to Transfer Case. ENDORSEMENT: Motion denied at this time with leave granted to renew after completion of discovery, the schedule for which will be submitted after the parties met and confer. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/30/2017) (ap)
August 22, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2017 from continuation of motion hearing on Aug. 16th, 2017. re: [492. 493, 494, 495, 496, 497, 499] AMENDED MOTION to Strike. Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions on State of Mind. filed by Marc L. Andreessen, James W. Breyer, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Erskine B. Bowles, Mark Zuckerberg, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Donald E. Graham. Decision Reserved. (See transcript for complete details.) (Skolnik, Brandon)
August 16, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 8/16/2017 re: #503 MOTION to Strike the Expert Opinions of David Stowell, Brian Cartwright, Anindya Ghose, Maureen O'Hara, and Paul Gompers filed by Eric Rand, Mary Galvan, Jose Galvan, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Parties to return on August 22, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to continued the argument.(Court Reporter Pam Utter) (Chan, Tsz)
August 10, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #537 MEMO ENDORSEMENT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ap)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 530 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Steven B. Singer terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/10/2017) (ap)
August 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 8/9/2017 re: #476 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Their Due Diligence Defense filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, E* Trade Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Allen & Company LLC, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Castleoak Securities, L.P., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., M.R. Beal & Company, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., #478 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Outside Directors and the Officer Defendants on Their Due Diligence and Reasonable Care Defenses filed by David M. Spillane, Reed Hastings, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, David A. Ebersman, Erskine B. Bowles, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Marc L. Andreessen, Mark Zuckerberg, Donald E. Graham, #479 MOTION for Summary Judgment(Omnibus) filed by David M. Spillane, Reed Hastings, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, David A. Ebersman, Erskine B. Bowles, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Marc L. Andreessen, Mark Zuckerberg, Donald E. Graham, #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant James W. Breyer's Joinder, Notice of Motion, and Motion for Summary Judgment on His Due Diligence and Reasonable Care Defenses filed by James W. Breyer. Motion Pending. (Chan, Tsz)
August 1, 2017 Filing 529 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 1, 2017 Filing 528 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 1, 2017 Filing 527 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER granting #525 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/1/2017) (rj)
July 28, 2017 Filing 525 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano dated 07/28/2017. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association.(Graziano, Salvatore)
July 20, 2017 Filing 524 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant James W. Breyer's Motion for Summary Judgment on His Due Diligence and Reasonable Care Defenses and supporting documents served on Thomas A. Dubbs, James W. Johnson, Salvatore J. Graziano, John Rizio-Hamilton, James R. Rouhandeh, Charles S. Duggan, Andrew Ditchfield, Andrew B. Clubok, Nathaniel J. Kritzer, Richard D. Bernstein, Elizabeth J. Bower, Tariq Mundiya, Todd G. Cosenza and Sameer Advani on 07/20/17. Service was made by Express mail service via next-day delivery. Document filed by James W. Breyer. (Locker, Nina)
July 20, 2017 Filing 523 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 20, 2017 Filing 522 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C.. (Duggan, Charles)
July 20, 2017 Filing 521 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 20, 2017 Filing 520 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 519 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #518 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated July 18, 2017 re: Requesting that the Court extend the page limits for the SJ Reply Briefs. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Eb ersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/19/2017) (rjm)
July 18, 2017 Filing 518 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated July 18, 2017 re: Requesting that the Court extend the page limits for the SJ Reply Briefs. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
July 18, 2017 Filing 517 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (60 in 1:12-cv-09308-RWS) FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case ., (46 in 1:13-cv-01999-RWS) FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by The NASDAQ OMX Group Inc, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 1:13-cv-01999-RWS(Lantieri, Paul)
July 13, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (ap)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER: with respect to #46 Motion to Transfer Case. Plaintiff's motion to transfer, dated July 10, 2017, shall be heard at 11:00 AM on Wednesday, July 26, 2017, in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. Papers in opposition shall be served on or before July 18, 2017, at noon, and any reply papers shall be served on or before July 21, 2017. Motion hearing set for 7/26/2017, at 11:00 A.M. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/12/2017) (ap)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER: with respect to #46 Motion to Transfer Case. Plaintiff's motion to transfer, dated July 10, 2017, shall be heard at 11:00 AM on Wednesday, July 26, 2017, in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. Papers in opposition shall be served on or before July 18, 2017, at noon, and any reply papers shall be served on or before July 21, 2017. Motion hearing set for 7/26/2017, at 11:00 A.M. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/12/2017) (ap)
June 15, 2017 Filing 514 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
June 15, 2017 Filing 513 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #511 Letter, filed by Marc L. Andreessen, James W. Breyer, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Erskine B. Bowles, Mark Zuckerberg, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Donald E. Graham. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/12/2017) (jwh)
June 9, 2017 Filing 511 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated June 9, 2017 re: Daubert Motions. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
June 8, 2017 Filing 510 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER granting #508 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/7/2017) (jwh)
June 6, 2017 Filing 508 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James W. Johnson dated June 6, 2017. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association.(Johnson, James)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER: with respect to #503 Motion to Strike. Oral arguments to be heard on 8/16/2017 at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Plaintiffs', Defendants', and Underwriters' motions to strike filed on April 28, 2017 shall be heard at 11:00 AM on Wednesday, August 16, 2017 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All papers shall be served in accordance with the February 14, 2017 scheduling order (Dkt. No. 452) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/28/2017) (ap) Modified on 5/11/2017 (ap).
April 28, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 8/16/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (ap)
April 27, 2017 Filing 506 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 27, 2017 Filing 505 JOINDER to join re: #497 AMENDED MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions on State of Mind., #496 MOTION to Strike Portions of Brian Sheehan's Expert Reports and Testimony., #493 MOTION to Strike Irrelevant and Prejudicial Opinions of Plaintiffs' Experts., #495 MOTION to Strike The Reports of Plaintiffs' Expert Harvey Pitt., #494 MOTION to Strike Portions of John Finnerty's Expert Opinions Regarding NASDAQ's Impact on Facebook's Stock Price. Notice of Joinder of Underwriters in The Facebook Defendants' Motion to Strike. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..(Ditchfield, Andrew)
April 27, 2017 Filing 504 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Strike the Expert Opinions of David Stowell, Brian Cartwright, Anindya Ghose, Maureen O'Hara, and Paul Gompers and Supporting Memorandum of Law and Declaration served on Defendants on 04/27/2017. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Jose Galvan, Mary Galvan, Eric Rand. (Chandrasekhar, Jai)
April 27, 2017 Filing 503 MOTION to Strike the Expert Opinions of David Stowell, Brian Cartwright, Anindya Ghose, Maureen O'Hara, and Paul Gompers. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Jose Galvan, Mary Galvan, Eric Rand.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
April 27, 2017 Filing 502 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C.. (Rouhandeh, James)
April 27, 2017 Filing 501 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Strike Portions of Brian Sheehans Expert Reports and Testimony; Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Experts Improper Opinions on State of Mind; Motion to Strike the Reports of Plaintiffs Expert Harvey L. Pitt; Motion to Irrelevant and Prejudicial Opinions of Plaintiffs Experts; Motion to Strike Portions of John Finnertys Expert Opinions Regarding NASDAQs Impact on Facebooks Stock Price; Amended Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Experts Improper Opinions on State of Mind served on Plaintiffs on 04-27-2017. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Kritzer, Nathaniel)
April 27, 2017 Filing 500 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 27, 2017 Filing 499 MOTION to Strike /Notice of Underwriters' Motion to Exclude the Report and Proffered Testimony of James F. Miller Regarding the Underwriters' Due Diligence. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..(Rouhandeh, James)
April 27, 2017 Filing 498 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 27, 2017 Filing 497 AMENDED MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions on State of Mind. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 27, 2017 Filing 496 MOTION to Strike Portions of Brian Sheehan's Expert Reports and Testimony. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 27, 2017 Filing 495 MOTION to Strike The Reports of Plaintiffs' Expert Harvey Pitt. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 27, 2017 Filing 494 MOTION to Strike Portions of John Finnerty's Expert Opinions Regarding NASDAQ's Impact on Facebook's Stock Price. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 27, 2017 Filing 493 MOTION to Strike Irrelevant and Prejudicial Opinions of Plaintiffs' Experts. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 27, 2017 Filing 492 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions on State of Mind. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER: granting #490 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/25/2017) (ap)
April 24, 2017 Filing 490 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano dated 04/24/2017. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association.(Graziano, Salvatore)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #488 Letter, filed by Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. ENDORSEMENT: Hearing August 9, 2017. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/21/2017) (mro)
April 20, 2017 Filing 488 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano dated 04/20/2017 re: Hearing Date for Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association.(Graziano, Salvatore)
April 18, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (ama)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER: The motion for summary judgment filed April 13, 2017 shall be heard at 11:00 AM on Wednesday, May 10, 2017 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/14/2017) (ama)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER: The motions for summary judgment filed April 14, 2017 shall be heard at 11:00 AM on Wednesday, May 10, 2017 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #479 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #476 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #478 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/17/2017) (jwh)
April 17, 2017 Filing 485 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 17, 2017 Filing 484 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 14, 2017 Filing 483 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 14, 2017 Filing 482 JOINDER to join re: #479 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Omnibus). . Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..(Rouhandeh, James)
April 14, 2017 Filing 481 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of the Facebook Defendants Omnibus Motion for Summary Judgment, Memorandum in Support of the Facebook Defendants Omnibus Motion for Summary Judgment, The Facebook Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of their Omnibus Motion for Summary Judgment, Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment of Outside Directors Mark Andreessen, Erskine Bowles, Donald Graham, Reed Hastings, and Peter Thiel, and the Officer Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, David Ebersman, and David Spillane on their Due Diligence and Reasonable Care Defenses, Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Outside Directors Mark Andreessen, Erskine Bowles, Donald Graham, Reed Hastings, and Peter Thiel, and the Officer Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, David Ebersman, and David Spillane on their Due Diligence and Reasonable Care Defenses, Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Outside Directors Mark Andreessen, Erskine Bowles, Donald Graham, Reed Hastings, and Peter Thiel, and the Officer Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, David Ebersman, and David Spillane on their Due Diligence and Reasonable Care Defenses, and the Declaration of Nathaniel J. Kritzer in Support of the Facebook Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment and all accompanying exhibits served on Salvatore J. Graziano, John Rizio-Hamilton, Thomas A. Dubbs, James W. Johnson, James R. Rouhandeh, and Charles S. Duggan on April 14, 2017. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Kritzer, Nathaniel)
April 14, 2017 Filing 480 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 14, 2017 Filing 479 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Omnibus). Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 14, 2017 Filing 478 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Outside Directors and the Officer Defendants on Their Due Diligence and Reasonable Care Defenses. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting #472 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #472 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #472 Motion to Seal Document: So ordered. (Motions due by 4/14/2017.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/13/2017) (jwh)
April 14, 2017 Filing 476 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Their Due Diligence Defense. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..(Rouhandeh, James)
April 13, 2017 Filing 475 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant James W. Breyer's Joinder, Notice of Motion, and Motion for Summary Judgment on His Due Diligence and Reasonable Care Defenses and supporting documents served on Thomas A. Dubbs, James W. Johnson, Salvatore J. Graziano, John Rizio-Hamilton, James R. Rouhandeh, Charles S. Duggan, Andrew Ditchfield, Andrew B. Clubok, Nathaniel J. Kritzer, Richard D. Bernstein, Elizabeth J. Bower, Tariq Mundiya, Todd G. Cosenza, Sameer Advani on 04/13/2017. Service was made by Express mail service via next-day delivery. Document filed by James W. Breyer. (Gavril, Doru)
April 13, 2017 Filing 474 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant James W. Breyer's Joinder, Notice of Motion, and Motion for Summary Judgment on His Due Diligence and Reasonable Care Defenses. Document filed by James W. Breyer. Responses due by 6/8/2017(Locker, Nina)
April 13, 2017 Filing 473 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 12, 2017 Filing 472 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of the filing deadline for motions for summary judgment addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated April 12, 2017., CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re summary judgment motions addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated April 12, 2017., CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal Document re summary judgment motions addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated April 12, 2017. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 6, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Status Conference held on 4/6/2017. Trial set for October 23, 2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Chan, Tsz)
April 5, 2017 Filing 471 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (207 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 70 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 100 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 67 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS) Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. USCA Case Number 14-0457. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered".. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 04/05/2017. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(nd)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF NINA F. LOCKER granting #465 Motion for Nina F. Locker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/3/2017) (jwh)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DORU GAVRIL granting #466 Motion for Doru Gavril to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/3/2017) (jwh)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF LILES H. REPP granting #467 Motion for Liles H. Repp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/3/2017) (jwh)
March 31, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #466 MOTION for Doru Gavril to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13487167. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #467 MOTION for Liles H. Repp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13487184. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #465 MOTION for Nina F. Locker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13487139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 30, 2017 Filing 467 MOTION for Liles H. Repp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13487184. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James W. Breyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liles H. Repp, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Repp, Liles)
March 30, 2017 Filing 466 MOTION for Doru Gavril to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13487167. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James W. Breyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Doru Gavril, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Gavril, Doru)
March 30, 2017 Filing 465 MOTION for Nina F. Locker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13487139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James W. Breyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nina F. Locker, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Locker, Nina)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ESTATE OF LAWRENCE CORNECK BY EXECUTOR STEWART D. POLLAK FOR PLAINTIFF LAWRENCE CORNECK: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. the motion of Stewart D. Pollak is granted; and 2. Stewart D. Pollak, as executor of the estate of Lawrence Comeck, is hereby substituted for Mr. Comeck as a plaintiff in the within consolidated action and in 12-cv-4215 (RWS). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/24/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ama)
March 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 3/9/2017 re: (453 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of the Facebook Defendants and the Underwriter Defendants to request additional time to depose Plaintiffs' expert James F. Miller addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Charles S. Duggan dat filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., RBC Capital Markets LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, E* Trade Securities LLC, Allen & Company LLC, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Castleoak Securities, L.P., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Chan, Tsz)Defendant motion is granted.
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Derek Hammond terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/2/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(jwh) Modified on 3/3/2017 (jwh).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #460 Motion for Jacob H. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/24/2017) (mro)
February 23, 2017 Filing 461 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Charles S. Duggan dated February 23, 2017 re: #453 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of the Facebook Defendants and the Underwriter Defendants to request additional time to depose Plaintiffs' expert James F. Miller addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Charles S. Duggan dat . Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C.. (Duggan, Charles)
February 23, 2017 Filing 460 MOTION for Jacob H. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13347613. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob Johnston in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Johnston, Jacob)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #457 Motion for Mark B. Salomon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 02/23/2017) (ap)
February 23, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #460 MOTION for Jacob H. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13347613. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #454 Motion for Ashley Littlefield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 02/22/2017) (ap)
February 22, 2017 Filing 457 MOTION for Mark B. Salomon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13342678. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Salomon in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Salomon, Mark)
February 22, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #457 MOTION for Mark B. Salomon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13342678. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER: Defendants' letter dated February 16, 2017 shall be treated as a motion and heard at noon on Thursday, March 9, 2017 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #453 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of the Facebook Defendants and the Underwriter Defendants to request additional time to depose Plaintiffs' expert James F. Miller addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Charles S. Duggan. (Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/21/2017) (jwh)
February 21, 2017 Filing 455 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano dated 02/21/2017 re: #453 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of the Facebook Defendants and the Underwriter Defendants to request additional time to depose Plaintiffs' expert James F. Miller addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Charles S. Duggan dat . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 21, 2017 Filing 454 MOTION for Ashley Littlefield to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13337492. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Littlefield in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Littlefield, Ashley)
February 21, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #454 MOTION for Ashley Littlefield to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13337492. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
February 16, 2017 Filing 453 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of the Facebook Defendants and the Underwriter Defendants to request additional time to depose Plaintiffs' expert James F. Miller addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Charles S. Duggan dated February 16, 2017. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..(Duggan, Charles)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 452 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Depositions Complete; Close of Expert Discovery: March 15, 2017. Deadline to file Dispositive Motions: April 13, 2017. Deadline to file Daubert Motions: April 27, 2017. Oppositions to Dispositive Motions: June 8, 2017. Oppositions to Daubert Motions: June 15, 2017. Replies in Support of Dispositive Motions: July 20, 2017. Replies in Support of Daubert Motions: August 1, 2017. Motions due by 4/27/2017. Responses due by 6/15/2017 Replies due by 8/1/2017. Deposition due by 3/15/2017. Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2017. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/13/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(mro)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #207 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. USCA Case Number 14-457. By order dated April 27, 2015, the Court granted the parties joint motion to hold this appeal in abeyance pending settlement approval proceedings in the district court. Following the district court's approval of the settlement, the parties requested that the Court continue to hold this appeal in abeyance pending the disposition of a related appeal docketed under 15-3987. The appeal docketed under 15-3987 was determined in a summary order dated December 27, 2016.Upon consideration thereof, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this appeal is lifted out of abeyance. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Appellants must inform the Court in writing regarding whether they wish to continue with this appeal. If Appellants wish to withdraw the appeal, they should file either a motion or a FRAP 42 stipulation Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 02/10/2017. (nd)
January 19, 2017 Filing 450 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (91 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 380 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 127 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 98 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 103 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 93 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 94 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS) Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,, filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., James W. Breyer, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Facebook, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Peter A. Thiel, Ita BBA USA Securities, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Erskine B. Bowles, E* Trade Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Allen & Company LLC, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., E Trade Securities, LLC., Sheryl K. Sandberg, William Blair & Company, LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., M.R. Beal & Company, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Mark Zuckerberg, William Blair & Company L.L.C., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Donald E. Graham.UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the judgment of the district court be AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 01/19/2017. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(nd)
November 28, 2016 Filing 449 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (252 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 40 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert Lowinger USCA Case Number 14-3800. The appeal in the above captioned case from orders and a judgment of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York was argued on the district courts record and the parties' briefs. Upon consideration thereof, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the district courts decision dismissing Appellants complaint is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/28/2016. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(tp)
November 28, 2016 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: (449 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 49 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS) USCA Mandate. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS. (tp)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, NORTH CAROLINA DST, THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, AND DEFENDANTS STIPULATE AND AGREE, SUBJECT TO APPROVAL BY THE COURT, THAT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 21, North Carolina DST hereby voluntarily withdraws from this Action as Co-Lead Plaintiff and Class Representative, relinquishes any rights or obligations attendant to those positions, and relinquishes its right to "opt out" of this Action or bring a related action, while retaining only its rights as an absent class member, and as further specified and set forth in this Stipulation and Order. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/9/2016) (rjm)
October 26, 2016 Filing 447 DECLARATION of Adam Walter re: #429 Order on Motion to Approve,,,,,,,, DECLARATION OF ADAM WALTER REGARDING (A) MAILING AND PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF CLASS ACTION, AND (B) REQUESTS FOR EXCLUSIONS RECEIVED. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
October 25, 2016 Filing 446 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #447 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Adam Walter re: #429 Order on Motion to Approve DECLARATION OF ADAM WALTER REGARDING (A) MAILING AND PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF CLASS ACTION, AND (B) REQUESTS FOR EXCLUSIONS RECEIVED. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Rizio-Hamilton, John) Modified on 10/26/2016 (db).
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL #444 Notice (Other) filed by A. Marcus Gerber. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Rosemary Farrales Luzon terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/20/2016) (cf)
July 18, 2016 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 443 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. This document was also filed in the wrong Court. It was intended for the USDC-SDCA, Case Number - 3:15-cv-01458 (AJB)(DHB). As per ecf_error email correspondence received on 7/18/16 @ 6:44pm. (db)
July 18, 2016 Filing 444 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Rosemary Luzon for Movant Marcus Gerber. Document filed by A. Marcus Gerber. (Luzon, Rosemary)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 OPINION re: #400 LETTER MOTION to Compel plaintiffs to respond to defendants' interrogatories addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 4/4/16 filed by Marc L. Andreessen, James W. Breyer, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Erskine B. Bowles, Mark Zuckerberg, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Donald E. Graham. Based on the conclusions set forth above, Defendants' motion to compel is denied. Individualized discovery will not commence at this time. In light of the confidentiality stipulation and order entered in this case, the parties are directed to jointly submit a redacted version of this opinion to be filed publicly within two weeks of the date of distribution of this opinion. It is so ordered. (As further set forth in this Opinion.) (This document was previously filed under seal in envelope number 418, and unsealed pursuant to dkt. #441 ) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/10/2016) (kko) Modified on 7/11/2016 (kko).
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #440 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano and James W. Johnson dated 06/28/2016 re: Unsealing May 10, 2016 Opinion. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/5/2016) (rjm)
July 7, 2016 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #441 Memo Endorsement to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (rjm)
June 28, 2016 Filing 440 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano and James W. Johnson dated 06/28/2016 re: Unsealing May 10, 2016 Opinion. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Graziano, Salvatore)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER: Underwriter Defendants, by letter dated June 9, 2016, have requested clarification of the Court's June 8, 2016 Order, particularly the following paragraph: The Court directs the Underwriter Defendants to provide or cause to be provided to the Administrator within ten (10) business days of entry of this Order a list of names and addresses in electronic form, such as Microsoft Excel, of all known retail investors that purchased Class A shares of Facebook in Facebook's IPO, which occurred on or about May 17, 2012 (the "List"). The letter was treated as a motion, oral argument was heard on June 23, 2016, and the matter deemed fully submitted. The Underwriter Defendants argue Administrator AB Data should "maintain strict confidentiality over the names and addresses of retail investors to be provided by the Underwriter Defendants, and that such information will not be provided to any other person or party, including Lead Plaintiffs and their counsel, or used for any purpose other than to provide notice." Letter of J.P. Rouhandeh, June 9, 2016. Plaintiffs object and seek the names and addresses provided. Letter of S.J. Graziano and J.W. Johnson, June 17, 2016. The information Plaintiffs request and the Underwriter Defendants seek to "maintain confidential" will not be subject to discovery without prior order of the court. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/27/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(tn)
June 23, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 6/23/2016. Decision Reserved. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Chan, Tsz)
June 21, 2016 Filing 438 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James P. Rouhandeh dated June 21, 2016 re: Lead Plaintiffs' June 17, 2016 Letter. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..(Rouhandeh, James)
June 17, 2016 Filing 437 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano dated June 17, 2016 re: Response to the June 9, 2016 Letter from the Underwriter Defendants' Counsel. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Graziano, Salvatore)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 436 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery - July 8, 2016. Expert Depositions Complete; Close of Expert Discovery - January 27, 2017. Deadline to File Dispositive Motions - March 1, 2017. Opposition to Dispositive Motions - April 19, 2017. Replies in support of Dispositive Motions - May 19, 2017. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Deposition due by 1/27/2017., Expert Discovery due by 1/27/2017., Fact Discovery due by 7/8/2016., Motions due by 3/1/2017., Responses due by 4/19/2017, Replies due by 5/19/2017.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cf)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER. Defendants' letter dated June 9, 2016 shall be heard at noon on Thursday, June 23, 2016 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (Oral Argument set for 6/23/2016 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/13/2016) (rjm)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Granting #433 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Frank J. Johnson, Jr. terminated. Attorney David Elliot terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/13/2016) (rjm) Modified on 6/16/2016 (rjm).
June 10, 2016 Filing 433 MOTION for Frank J. Johnson to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Edward Shierry.(Johnson, Frank)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: in case 1:12-cv-04081-RWS; granting (430) Motion for Derek Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/10/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (ama)
June 10, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #430 MOTION for Derek Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12401786. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 9, 2016 Filing 431 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James P. Rouhandeh dated June 9, 2016 re: In Response to the Court's June 8, 2016 Order. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rouhandeh, James)
June 9, 2016 Filing 430 MOTION for Derek Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12401786. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit MD Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER: in case 1:12-cv-04081-RWS; granting (411) Motion to Approve Motion for an Order Approving of the Form in case 1:12-md-02389-RWS. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Approving of the Form, Content and Method for Providing Class Notice and Compelling the Underwriter Defendants to Provide a List of Potential Members of the Retail Subclass (the "Motion"), the Court finds that good cause exists for granting the Motion and further finds and orders as follows: The Court approves the form, substance and requirements of the Notice of Class Action By First-Class Mailing of Notice on Postcard (the "First-Class Mailing Notice"); the Notice of Pendency of Class Action By Internet Distribution (the "Internet Notice") ; and the Notice of Pendency of Class Action for Distribution via Financial Publications (the "Publication Notice" and, collectively with the First-Class Mailing Notice and the Internet Notice, the "Notices"), as agreed by the parties and submitted as of June 6, 2016. Within fifteen (15) business days following the expiration of the exclusion deadline, Class Counsel shall file with the Court proof of mailing of the First-Class Mailing Notice, proof of publication of the Internet Notice and Publication Notice, and an affidavit setting forth a list of all persons and entities who have validity and timely requested exclusion from the Class. The Court directs the Underwriter Defendants to provide or cause to be provided to the Administrator within ten (10) business days of entry of this Order a list of names and addresses in electronic form, such as Microsoft Excel, of all known retail investors that purchased Class A shares of Facebook in Facebook's IPO, which occurred on or about May 17, 2012 (the "List " ). This Order may be modified by the Court upon motion by either or both parties, for good cause shown. And as set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/08/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (ama)
June 3, 2016 Filing 428 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano and James W. Johnson dated 06/03/2016 re: Class Notice. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Graziano, Salvatore)
June 2, 2016 Filing 427 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Charles S. Duggan dated June 2, 2016 re: #411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass . . Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C.. (Duggan, Charles)
June 1, 2016 Filing 426 DECLARATION of John Rizio-Hamilton in Support re: #411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass .. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Graziano, Salvatore)
June 1, 2016 Filing 425 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass . . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Graziano, Salvatore)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting #423 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/31/2016) (kko)
May 31, 2016 Filing 423 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Charles S. Duggan dated 5/31/16. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..(Duggan, Charles)
May 31, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing as to #411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass: Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (kko)
May 23, 2016 Filing 422 DECLARATION of James P. Rouhandeh re: #421 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,,,,, In Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Approve Notice and to Compel the Underwriter Defendants to Produce Client Lists to Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Rouhandeh, James)
May 23, 2016 Filing 421 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass . Underwriter Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Approve Notice and to Compel the Underwriter Defendants to Produce Client Lists to Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C.. (Rouhandeh, James)
May 23, 2016 Filing 420 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass . Facebook Defendants' Limited Objections to Plaintiffs' Class Notice Motion. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Clubok, Andrew)
May 12, 2016 Filing 419 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 15-4167. Petitioners move, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f), for leave to appeal the district court's order granting Respondents' motion for class certification, and for leave to file a reply brief in support of their Rule 23(f) motion. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion for leave to file a reply brief is GRANTED, but the Rule 23(f) motion is DENIED because an immediate appeal is not warranted. See Sumitomo Copper Litig. v. Credit Lyonnais Rouse, Ltd., 262 F.3d 134, 139-40 (2d Cir. 2001).. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/12/2016. (nd)
May 12, 2016 Filing 418 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
May 10, 2016 Filing 417 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
May 10, 2016 Filing 416 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated May 10, 2016 re: Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Letter dated May 4, 2016. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an order approving the form, content and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass, filed 4/4/2016, shall be heard at noon on Thursday, 6/2/2016 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass :(Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/6/2016) (tro)
May 4, 2016 Filing 414 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano and James W. Johnson dated May 4, 2016 re: response to the Facebook Defendants' April 29, 2016 letter to the Court. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Graziano, Salvatore)
May 4, 2016 Filing 413 DECLARATION of Thomas G. Hoffman, Jr. in Support re: #411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass .. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Hoffman, Thomas)
May 4, 2016 Filing 412 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass . . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Dubbs, Thomas)
May 4, 2016 Filing 411 MOTION to Approve the form, content, and method for providing class notice and compelling the underwriter defendants to provide a list of potential members of the retail subclass . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dubbs, Thomas)
April 29, 2016 Filing 410 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated April 29, 2016 re: Discovery. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 27, 2016 Filing 409 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #400 LETTER MOTION to Compel plaintiffs to respond to defendants' interrogatories addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 4/4/16. Facebook Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of their Motion to Compel Lead Plaintiffs to Respond to Interrogatories. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Kritzer, Nathaniel)
April 27, 2016 Filing 408 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER granting #406 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #406 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/20/2016) (mro)
April 20, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 4/27/2016. (mro)
April 20, 2016 Filing 406 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Susan E. Engel dated 4/20/2016., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Susan E. Engel dated 4/20/2016. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Engel, Susan)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER: The Facebook Defendants' motion to compel, filed April 4, 2016, previously scheduled to be heard April 22, 2016, shall instead be heard at noon on May 5, 2016 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. (Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2016 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/19/2016) (spo)
April 15, 2016 Filing 404 DECLARATION of Salvatore J. Graziano in Opposition re: #400 LETTER MOTION to Compel plaintiffs to respond to defendants' interrogatories addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 4/4/16.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted Version), #3 Exhibit 3 (Redacted Version), #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (Redacted Version))(Graziano, Salvatore)
April 15, 2016 Filing 403 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #400 LETTER MOTION to Compel plaintiffs to respond to defendants' interrogatories addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 4/4/16. (Redacted Version). Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 15, 2016 Filing 402 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER: The Facebook Defendants' motion to compel, filed April 4, 2016, shall be heard at noon on April 22, 2016 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. Any opposition shall be filed by April 15, 2016. Any reply shall be filed by April 21, 2016. (Responses due by 4/15/2016.) (Replies due by 4/21/2016.) (Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2016 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/6/2016) (spo)
April 4, 2016 Filing 400 LETTER MOTION to Compel plaintiffs to respond to defendants' interrogatories addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 4/4/16. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Clubok, Andrew)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER granting (397) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:12-md-02389-RWS. Plaintiffs' motion for an order directing the withdrawal of Domenico Minerva as counsel for Plaintiffs is GRANTED. Attorney Domenico George Minerva terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04777-RWS (mro)
March 7, 2016 Filing 398 DECLARATION of Domenico Minerva in Support re: (84 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS) MOTION for Domenico Minerva to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Steve Sexton, Maren Twining, Keith Wise. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04777-RWS(Minerva, Domenico)
March 7, 2016 Filing 397 MOTION for Domenico Minerva to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Steve Sexton, Maren Twining, Keith Wise. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04777-RWS(Minerva, Domenico)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTE THAT attorney Brant W. Bishop is no longer associated with Kirkland & Ellis LLP and should be removed as counsel of record for Facebook, Inc. and the Individual Defendants and from the service list. Kirkland & Ellis LLP continues to represent Facebook, Inc. and the Individual Defendants and requests that all future correspondence and papers in this action continue to be directed to them. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/4/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(spo)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 395 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Section VII of the Original Scheduling Order, which permits the Parties to seek further modification of the pretrial schedule, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(t)(3), the Parties jointly propose the following Modified Pretrial Scheduling Order (As further set forth in this Order). (Motions due by 1/20/2017., Responses due by 3/20/2017, Replies due by 4/20/2017., Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2016., Expert Discovery due by 11/18/2016.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/13/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cf)
January 15, 2016 Filing 394 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Vincent Roger Cappucci on behalf of Avatar Securities, LLC, T3 Trading Group, LLC. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10171, 212-894-7200. (Cappucci, Vincent)
January 15, 2016 Filing 393 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert N Cappucci on behalf of Avatar Securities, LLC, T3 Trading Group, LLC. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, New York, USA 11385, 212-894-7200. (Cappucci, Robert)
January 15, 2016 Filing 392 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jordan Abraham Cortez on behalf of Avatar Securities, LLC, T3 Trading Group, LLC. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10171, 212-894-7200. (Cortez, Jordan)
January 15, 2016 Filing 391 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew J Entwistle on behalf of Avatar Securities, LLC, T3 Trading Group, LLC. New Address: Entwistle & Cappucci LLP, 299 Park Avenue, 20th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10171, 212-894-7200. (Entwistle, Andrew)
January 13, 2016 Filing 390 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #385 Memorandum & Opinion. (sj)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 STATEMENT OF PROCEEDINGS: On September 16, 2015, the Court held a Settlement Fairness Hearing ("Hearing") in the above-captioned Consolidated Nasdaq Actions (the "Nasdaq Action") in which counsel for the Nasdaq Plaintiffs and Nasdaq Defendants in the Nasdaq Action, as well as counsel for the Facebook Plaintiffs and the Intervenors-Facebook Defendants in the related Facebook Securities action (the "Facebook Action"), presented arguments regarding the judgment reduction provisions in Paragraph 11 of the [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment. (See ECF No. 326.) No electronic recording or stenographic report of the Hearing was made. The following is a statement of the Hearing proceedings pursuant to Rule 10(c) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure: (As further set forth in this Order.) This statement is approved. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/7/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(kko)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 OPINION re: #255 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer: For the foregoing reasons and as set forth above, the motions for class certification, appointment as Class Representatives, and appointment of Class Counsel are granted. In light of the confidentiality stipulation and order entered in this case, the parties are directed to jointly submit a redacted version of this opinion to be filed publicly. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/11/2015) ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope number 383, and unsealed pursuant to dkt. #384 . (tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER: This Court's Opinion dated December 11, 2015 was initially sealed, consistent with the parties' representations that submissions and facts upon which the Opinion was based were confidential non-public information subject to a protective order. As counsel have indicated by correspondence with the Court on December 21, 2015 that they have conferred and agreed to submit no requests for redactions, the December 11, 2015 Opinion is hereby unsealed. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/26/2015) (lmb)
December 29, 2015 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #384 Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (lmb)
December 28, 2015 Filing 383 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 23, 2015 Filing 382 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Gregory Hoffman, Jr on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Hoffman, Thomas)
December 22, 2015 Filing 381 NOTICE of Submission for Court Approval of Statement Pursuant to FRAP 10(c). Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman, Sachs & Co, Ita BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., William Blair & Company L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Sheryl K. Sandberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement of Proceedings)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Bernstein, Richard)
December 10, 2015 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (91 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 380 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 127 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 98 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 103 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 93 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 94 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., James W. Breyer, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Facebook, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Peter A. Thiel, Ita BBA USA Securities, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Erskine B. Bowles, E* Trade Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Allen & Company LLC, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., E Trade Securities, LLC., Sheryl K. Sandberg, William Blair & Company, LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., M.R. Beal & Company, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Mark Zuckerberg, William Blair & Company L.L.C., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Donald E. Graham were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (tp)
December 10, 2015 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (91 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 380 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 127 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 98 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 103 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 93 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 94 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS) Notice of Appeal. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(tp)
December 9, 2015 Filing 380 NOTICE OF APPEAL from (126 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 126 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 373 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 373 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 96 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 96 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 102 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 102 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 93 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 93 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 90 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 90 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) Judgment, Add and Terminate Parties,,,,,,,,,,,, (372 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman, Sachs & Co, Ita BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., William Blair & Company L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Sheryl K. Sandberg. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-11718749. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Bernstein, Richard)
December 3, 2015 Filing 378 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Adam Henry Wierzbowski on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. New Address: Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 44th, New York, New York, 10020, 212-554-1510. (Wierzbowski, Adam)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 OPINION #106042 re: #315 CONSENT MOTION to Vacate (87 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,, filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. In the absence of extraordinary circumstance that would justify withdrawing the December 12, 2013 Opinion, the motion to vacate is denied. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/24/2015) (spo) Modified on 11/30/2015 (ca).
November 19, 2015 Filing 376 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John James Rizio-Hamilton on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. New Address: Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 1251 Ave. of the Americas, 44th floor, New York, New York, 10020, 212-554-1505. (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
November 17, 2015 Filing 375 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gerald H. Silk on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. New Address: Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 44th Floor, New York, New York, 10020, 212-55401282. (Silk, Gerald)
November 17, 2015 Filing 374 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Salvatore Jo Graziano on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. New Address: Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 44th Floor, New York, New York, 10020, 212-554-1538. (Graziano, Salvatore)
November 9, 2015 Filing 379 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #372 Memorandum & Opinion. (Attachments: #1 Citation) (vf)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT: The Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Consolidated Nasdaq Actions and personal jurisdiction over the Lead Plaintiffs, the members of the Class, the Nasdaq Defendants and the Non-Settling Defendants. Pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure the Court hereby certifies for purposes of the Settlement the Consolidated Nasdaq Actions as a class action on behalf of all persons and entities that entered retail pre-market and aftermarket orders to purchase and/or sell the common stock of Facebook, Inc. on May 18, 2012, and who suffered monetary losses as a result of the conduct alleged in the CAC, including persons and entities (i) alleging claims for violations of the federal securities laws, and (ii) alleging claims for common law negligence; The Settlement is approved and so ordered as fair, reasonable and adequate, and the parties, the members of the Class and their respective counsel are authorized and directed to consummate the Settlement in accordance with the terms and conditions of the Stipulation. The CAC is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs. In accordance with Rule 54 (b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that there is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Order and Final Judgment as a final judgment with respect to the claims asserted against the Nasdaq Defendants. The Clerk is accordingly directed to enter this Order and Final Judgment as such forthwith. IT IS SO ORDERED. (As further set forth in this Order and Judgment.) NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Anna M. Ewing and Robert Greifeld terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/9/2015) (kko) Modified on 11/10/2015 (kko).
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 OPINION #106014 re: #308 MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC, #312 MOTION to Approve Co-Lead Counsel's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, the motion for final approval of the settlement and plan of allocation is grant. The motion for an award of attorney's fees, expenses, and incentive awards is granted as detailed above. It is so ordered. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/9/2015) (kko) Modified on 11/16/2015 (soh).
October 30, 2015 Filing 371 PLAINTIFF MAREN TWINING'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Maren Twining, by and through her counsel, hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action, Twining v. Facebook, Inc. et al., No. 12-cv-4099 (RWS), is voluntarily dismissed as to all defendants. This dismissal shall apply to that action only, and shall not constitute a dismissal of any other actions in In re: Facebook, Inc. IPO Securities & Derivative Litigation, No. 12-md-2389 (RWS). (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04099-RWS (spo)
October 27, 2015 Filing 370 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/07/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Grant, Patricia)
October 27, 2015 Filing 369 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 10/7/2015 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2016.(Grant, Patricia)
October 23, 2015 Filing 368 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from John J. Rizio-Hamilton and James W. Johnson dated 10/23/2015 re: Nasdaq Actions. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
October 22, 2015 Filing 367 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Richard D. Bernstein dated October 22, 2015 re: Nasdaq Actions. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg.(Bernstein, Richard)
October 22, 2015 Filing 366 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Richard D. Bernstein dated October 22, 2015 re: Nasdaq Actions. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David Ebersman, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg.(Bernstein, Richard)
October 21, 2015 Filing 365 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Vincent R. Cappucci dated October 21, 2015 re: Final Approval of Settlement of the Consolidated Nasdaq Actions. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cappucci, Vincent)
October 8, 2015 Filing 364 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Counsel Joseph P. Guglielmo. Document filed by Lidia Levy. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04315-RWS(Guglielmo, Joseph)
October 7, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 10/7/2015 for Class Certification and motion to exclude expert testimony.The motion are pending. (Court Reporter Lisa Fellis) Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Chan, Tsz)
October 7, 2015 Filing 363 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #255 MOTION to Certify Class . Redacted. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Graziano, Salvatore)
October 7, 2015 Filing 362 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #255 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Goldman Sachs & CO., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg. (Clubok, Andrew)
October 7, 2015 Filing 361 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #255 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Goldman Sachs & CO., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg. (Clubok, Andrew)
October 6, 2015 Filing 360 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
October 6, 2015 Filing 359 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano and Thomas A. Dubbs dated October 6, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' October 5, 2015 Letter re: Brecher. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Graziano, Salvatore)
October 5, 2015 Filing 358 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated October 5, 2015 re: Brecher v Argentina. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
September 21, 2015 Filing 357 Costs Taxed as to #327 USCA Mandate,,, USCA Case Number 14-632. in the amount of $255.80. on 09/21/2015 in favor of Appellee Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel and Mark E. Zuckerberg against Gaye Jones and Holly McConnaughey. (nd)
September 21, 2015 Filing 356 Costs Taxed as to #327 USCA Mandate,,, USCA Case Number 14-1445. in the amount of $629.40. on 09/21/2015 in favor of Appellees Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Cipora Herman, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David Spillane and Peter A. Thiel against Appellant Lidia Levy. (nd)
September 16, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Motion held on 9/16/2015. Fairhess Hearing, Motion to Vacate, Motion for Fees are all Reserved Judgment. (Chan, Tsz)
September 15, 2015 Filing 355 DECLARATION of Eric S. Schachter on behalf of A.B. Data, Ltd. in Support re: #308 MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation .. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER on NOTICE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL in case 1:12-cv-04081-RWS; granting (352) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Arun Srinivas Subramanian terminated in case 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (ajs)
September 14, 2015 Filing 353 DECLARATION of Arun Subramanian in Support re: #352 MOTION for Arun Subramanian to Withdraw as Attorney Arun Subramanian.. Document filed by Howard Savitt. (Subramanian, Arun)
September 14, 2015 Filing 352 MOTION for Arun Subramanian to Withdraw as Attorney Arun Subramanian. Document filed by Howard Savitt.(Subramanian, Arun)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting #345 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/14/2015) (ajs)
September 14, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Arun Srinivas Subramanian to RE-FILE Document #344 MOTION for Arun Subramanian to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
September 11, 2015 Filing 350 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Avatar Securities, LLC, Meredith Bailey, Anna M. Ewing, Atish Gandhi, Phillip Goldberg, Robert Greifeld, Steve Jarvis, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Faisal Sami, Colin Suzman, T3 Trading Group, LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C..Document filed by Goldman Sachs & CO., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Castleoak Securities, L.P., C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Allen & Company LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, E Trade Securities LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., M.R. Beal & Company, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Barclays Capital Inc., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Cowen and Company, LLC.(Rouhandeh, James)
September 11, 2015 Filing 349 DECLARATION of of Elizabeth Bower in Support re: #347 Response,,,,,. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Bernstein, Richard)
September 11, 2015 Filing 348 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum and Supplemental Declaration of Vincent R. Cappucci in Further Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Co-Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses on September 11, 2015. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
September 11, 2015 Filing 347 RESPONSE re: #326 Objection (non-motion), to the Terms of the Proposed Judgment in the Consolidated Nasdaq Actions. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg. (Bernstein, Richard)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Deposition due by 7/3/2016. Expert Discovery due by 7/3/2016. Fact Discovery due by 12/4/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2016. Responses due by 11/4/2016, Replies due by 12/9/2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/9/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ajs)
September 10, 2015 Filing 345 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Anindya Ghose, Ph.D. from September 16, 2015 to October 7, 2015 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from John Rizio-Hamilton dated September 10, 2015. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Rizio-Hamilton, John)
September 10, 2015 Filing 344 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Arun Subramanian to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. Document filed by Howard Savitt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration by Counsel of Arun Subramanian)(Subramanian, Arun) Modified on 9/14/2015 (db).
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER: The Plaintiffs' motion for class certification will be heard at noon on Wednesday, October 7, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/1/2015) (ajs)
September 9, 2015 Filing 342 JOINT RESPONSE re: #326 Objection (non-motion), to the proposed settlement of the Consolidated Nasdaq Actions. Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., T3 Trading Group, LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. (Slaughter, William)
September 9, 2015 Filing 341 DECLARATION of Vincent R. Cappucci in Support re: #312 MOTION to Approve Co-Lead Counsel's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses ., #308 MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation .. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibit 1 (Part 4 of 4), #5 Exhibit 2)(Cappucci, Vincent)
September 9, 2015 Filing 340 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #308 MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation ., #312 MOTION to Approve Co-Lead Counsel's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses . . Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting #322 Motion to Intervene; granting #330 Motion to Intervene. The motions filed by the Facebook Parties (Dkt. No. 322) and the Underwriter Parties (Dkt. No. 330) seeking to intervene in the settlement approval proceedings in the NASDAQ Action, being unopposed, are granted. Any papers shall be filed by Friday, September 11, 2015. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/8/2015) (spo)
September 2, 2015 Filing 338 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Vincent R. Cappucci dated September 2, 2015 re: NASDAQ Actions. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Cappucci, Vincent)
August 28, 2015 Filing 337 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Richard D. Bernstein dated 8/28/2015 re: Response opposing letter request filed by Lead Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Nasdaq Actions seeking extension to file an opposition to Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Cosenza, Todd)
August 28, 2015 Filing 336 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Vincent R. Cappucci dated August 28, 2015 re: Motions to Intervene and Objections to the Settlement. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Cappucci, Vincent)
August 26, 2015 Filing 335 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated August 26, 2015 re: responding to Mr. Rizio-Hamilton's letter dated Aug. 25 re class certification hearing. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #325 Letter filed by Marc L. Andreessen, James W. Breyer, David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, David M. Spillane, Erskine B. Bowles, Mark Zuckerberg, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Donald E. Graham. Because Rule 24(c) requires that a pleading be filed in connection with our motion, which seeks leave to intervene for the purposes set forth in the proposed pleading, we respectfully request that the Court accept the document filed as ECF No. 324 (attached hereto as Ex. A) as satisfaction of Rule 24(c)'s requirement that a pleading be filed with a motion to intervene.ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/22/2015) (ama)
August 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER: The Facebook Parties' motion to intervene will be heard on submission on Friday, September 4, 2015. All papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. In the event the motion to intervene is granted, the Facebook Parties shall file their brief within 2 days of the motion's resolution. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/22/2015) (ajs)
August 21, 2015 Filing 332 DECLARATION of James P. Rouhandeh in Support re: (86 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rouhandeh, James)
August 21, 2015 Filing 331 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (86 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rouhandeh, James)
August 21, 2015 Filing 330 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rouhandeh, James)
August 19, 2015 Filing 327 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (237 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 86 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Facebook, Inc., (224 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Lidia Levy, (238 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 105 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS) Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Facebook Inc., (211 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey. USCA Case Number 14-1445; 14-1784; 14-1788; 14-632. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/19/2015. (Attachments: #1 Opinion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(nd)
August 19, 2015 Filing 326 Objection re: #308 MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation . . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Graziano, Salvatore)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #307 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/18/2015) (ajs)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER: The NASDAQ Defendants' motion to vacate the Court's December 12, 2013 Opinion and the Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel's motion for fees and expenses related to the proposed settlement in the NASDAQ Actions will be heard as part of the already scheduled fairness hearing on Wednesday, September 16, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/18/2015) (ajs)
August 18, 2015 Filing 325 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Nathaniel J. Kritzer dated 8/18/2015 re: Intervenor Complaint [ECF No. 324]. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kritzer, Nathaniel)
August 18, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrew Clubok re: Document No. #324 Intervenor Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): opposing party did not consent to the amendment of the pleading; Court's leave has not been granted. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (moh)
August 17, 2015 Filing 324 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against T3 Trading Group, LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC, Phillip Goldberg, Steve Jarvis, Atish Gandhi, Colin Suzman, Meredith Bailey, Faisal Sami, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld, Anna M. Ewing.Document filed by Donald E. Graham, David M. Spillane, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, Erskine B. Bowles, David Ebersman, Mark Zuckerberg, Reed Hastings, Marc L. Andreessen, Sheryl K. Sandberg, James W. Breyer.(Clubok, Andrew) Modified on 8/18/2015 (moh). Modified on 8/26/2015 (laq).
August 17, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrew Clubok to RE-FILE Document No. #321 Intervenor Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Intervenor Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (moh)
August 14, 2015 Filing 323 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (83 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
August 14, 2015 Filing 322 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
August 14, 2015 Filing 321 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Peter A. Thiel, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Spillane, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, David A. Ebersman, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Thomas J. Ahrendtsen, Vijay Akkaraju, Alexis Alexander, Elbita Alfonso, Allen & Company LLC, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Khodayar Amin, Sameer Ansari, Avatar Securities, LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Meredith Bailey, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Dmitri Bougakov, Irving S. Braun(Individually), Irving S. Braun(on Behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian Roffe Profit Sharing Plan, Peter Brinckerhoff, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Ryan Cefalu, James Chang, Edward Childs, Lorrain Chin, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., William Cole, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Company, LLC, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Karen Cuker, Vernon R. DeMois, Jr, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Richard P. Eannarino, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Mark Eshehata, Anna M. Ewing, First New York Securities L.L.C., Janis Fleming, Jose Galvan, Mary Galvan, Atish Gandhi, Garrett Garrison, David Goldberg, Phillip Goldberg, Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldrich Cousins P.C. 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan & Trust, Brian Gralnick, Sylvia Gregorcyzk, John Gregory, Robert Greifeld, Steve Griffis, Eric Hamrick, Cipora Herman, Robert Herpst, Kevin Hicks, Hal Hubuschman, Kevin Hyms, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Sanjay Israni, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Steve Jarvis, Joe Johnson, Gaye Jones, Gaye Jones(Derivatively on Behalf of Facebook Inc.), Vicky Jones, KBC Asset Management NV, Nuhket Kayahan, David Kenton, King & Associates, Inc., Dennis Kuhn, Harvey Lapin, Darryl Lazar, Justin F. Lazard, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Elliot Leitner, Aaron M. Levine, Benjamin Levine, Lidia Levy, Michael Lieber, Douglas M. Lightman, Katerhine Loiacono, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Robert Lowinger, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Company, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Peter Mamula, Holly McConnaughey, Holly McConnaughey(Derivatively on Behalf of Facebook Inc.), Crystal McMahon, Merrill Lynch, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, George Michalitsianos, Randy Teresa Mielke, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Thomas E. Nelson, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Dennis Palkon, Phyllis Peterson, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stewart D Pollak, Rick Pond, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Jerry Rayborn, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Kathy Reichenbaum, Jacinto Rivera, Chad Roderick, Jacob Salzmann, Faisal Sami, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Howard Savitt, Steve Sexton, Sanjeev Sharma, Edward Shierry, Jill D. Simon, Jonathan R. Simon, Rock Southward, Michael Spatz, Barbara Steinman, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jennifer Stokes, Eugene Stricker, Colin Suzman, Uma M. Swaminathan, T3 Trading Group, LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Maren Twining, Edward Vernoff, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Keith Wise, Jun Yan.Document filed by Peter A. Thiel, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Spillane, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, David A. Ebersman, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg.(Clubok, Andrew) Modified on 8/17/2015 (moh).
August 14, 2015 Filing 320 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 14, 2015 Filing 319 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated August 14, 2015 re: Requesting a hearing be scheduled for Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD on re: #306 Notice (Other) filed by Elliot Leitner. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Leigh R. Lasky terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/11/2015) (ajs)
August 12, 2015 Filing 317 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Consent Motion of the Nasdaq Defendants to Withdraw and Vacate Opinion of December 12, 2013 and Memorandum of Law served on Lead Counsel and Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs on August 12, 2015. Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaq claimant group, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
August 12, 2015 Filing 316 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (86 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 80 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 82 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 87 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 315 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 115 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS) CONSENT MOTION to Vacate (87 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,, . Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
August 12, 2015 Filing 315 CONSENT MOTION to Vacate (87 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, . Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
August 12, 2015 Filing 314 DECLARATION of Vincent R. Cappucci and Christopher Lovell in Support re: #312 MOTION to Approve Co-Lead Counsel's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses .. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (Part 1), #5 Exhibit D (Part 2), #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Cappucci, Vincent)
August 12, 2015 Filing 313 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #312 MOTION to Approve Co-Lead Counsel's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses . . Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
August 12, 2015 Filing 312 MOTION to Approve Co-Lead Counsel's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses . Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Cappucci, Vincent)
August 12, 2015 Filing 311 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #310 MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation . . Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent) Modified on 8/13/2015 (kj).
August 12, 2015 Filing 310 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation . Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Cappucci, Vincent) Modified on 8/13/2015 (kj).
August 12, 2015 Filing 309 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #308 MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation . . Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
August 12, 2015 Filing 308 MOTION to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation . Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Cappucci, Vincent)
August 10, 2015 Filing 307 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: sur-reply in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 8/10/2015. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
August 6, 2015 Filing 306 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record. Document filed by Elliot Leitner. (Lasky, Leigh)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 OPINION #105754: For the reasons stated above, the request, treated as a motion, is denied. (As is further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 1:12-cv-04763-RWS (spo) Modified on 8/5/2015 (soh).
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #303 Letter requesting an extension of Defendants time to respond to Plaintiffs reply in support of their motion for class certification, filed by Facebook, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Surreplies due by 8/13/2015.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/29/2015) (spo)
July 24, 2015 Filing 303 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated July 24, 2015 re: Requesting an extension of Defendants time to respond to Plaintiffs reply in support of their motion for class certification. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Clubok, Andrew)
July 16, 2015 Filing 302 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #292 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Anindya Ghose, Ph.D.. . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Graziano, Salvatore)
July 9, 2015 Filing 301 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #292 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Anindya Ghose, Ph.D.. . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Graziano, Salvatore)
July 9, 2015 Filing 300 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #292 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Anindya Ghose, Ph.D.. . Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Clubok, Andrew)
July 9, 2015 Filing 299 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated July 9, 2015 re: filing an unredacted Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Anindya Ghose, Ph.D.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Clubok, Andrew)
July 6, 2015 Filing 298 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #292 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Anindya Ghose, Ph.D.. . Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Clubok, Andrew)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE in case 1:12-cv-04054-RWS; granting (280) Motion for Settlement in case 1:12-md-02389-RWS. No opposition to preliminary approval having been secured and WHEREAS, all capitalized terms used herein and not otherwise defined have the meanings defined in the Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court has reviewed the Stipulation and does hereby preliminarily approve the Settlement set forth therein, and the Plan of Allocation, subject to further consideration at the Settlement Fairness Hearing described below. 2. Pursuant to Rule 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and for purposes of the Settlement only, the Consolidated Nasdaq Actions are hereby certified as a class action on behalf of all persons and entities that entered retail pre-market and aftermarket orders to purchase and/or sell the common stock of Face book, Inc. on May 18, 2012, and who suffered monetary losses as a result of the conduct alleged in the CAC, including persons and entities (i) alleging claims for violations of the federal securities laws, and (ii) alleging claims for common law negligence; provided however, that the Class shall not include: the Nasdaq Defendants or their parent companies, subsidiaries, or affiliates; the officers and directors of Nasdaq and the Exchange; the legal representatives and heirs or assigns of any Nasdaq Defendant; any federal governmental entities and instrumentalities of the federal government; any judicial officer presiding over the Consolidated Nasdaq Actions and any member of his or her immediate family and judicial staff; and any person or entity that was on May 18, 2012 a member of the Exchange, as set forth within. A hearing (the "Settlement Fairness Hearing") pursuant to Rule 23(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is hereby scheduled to be held before the Court on September 16, 2015, at 12:00 p.m. The Claims Administrator shall cause the Notice and Proof of Claim, substantially in the forms annexed hereto, to be mailed, by first class mail, postage prepaid, on or before July 1, 2015, as set forth within. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/24/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (ajs)
June 25, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 9/16/2015 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ajs)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting #295 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/22/2015) (ajs)
June 22, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Surreplies due by 7/30/2015. (ajs)
June 19, 2015 Filing 295 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion for class certification addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated June 19, 2015. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Clubok, Andrew)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER: The Lead Plaintiffs' Daubert motion, dated June 16, 2015, will be heard at noon on Wednesday, September 16, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/17/2015) (ajs)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #290 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/17/2015) (ajs)
June 16, 2015 Filing 292 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Anindya Ghose, Ph.D.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Graziano, Salvatore)
June 16, 2015 Filing 291 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
June 11, 2015 Filing 290 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re Reply brief to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James W. Johnson dated 6/11/2015. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Institutional Investor Group, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Johnson, James)
June 5, 2015 Filing 289 RESPONSE to Motion re: #280 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Consent Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. . Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg. (Clubok, Andrew)
May 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ESTATE OF LAWRENCE CORNECK BY EXECUTOR STEWART D. POLLAK FOR PLAINTIFF LAWRENCE CORNECK granting (137) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04081-RWS; granting (80) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04099-RWS; granting (71) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04131-RWS; granting (78) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04150-RWS; granting (79) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04157-RWS; granting (76) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04215-RWS; granting (77) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04184-RWS; granting (86) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04194-RWS; granting (77) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04252-RWS; granting (82) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04332-RWS; granting (77) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04291-RWS; granting (77) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04312-RWS; granting (72) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04362-RWS; granting (78) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04360-RWS; granting (68) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04551-RWS; granting (112) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04648-RWS; granting (73) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04763-RWS; granting (77) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-04777-RWS; granting (286) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-md-02389-RWS; granting (85) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07542-RWS; granting (89) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07544-RWS; granting (171) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07546-RWS; granting (171) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07548-RWS; granting (88) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07550-RWS; granting (84) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07552-RWS; granting (172) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07543-RWS; granting (171) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07545-RWS; granting (171) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07547-RWS; granting (110) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07551-RWS; granting (165) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07587-RWS; granting (186) Motion to Substitute Party. in case 1:12-cv-07586-RWS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. the motion of Stewart D. Pollak is granted; and 2. Stewart D. Pollak, as executor of the estate of Lawrence Corneck, is hereby substituted for Mr. Corneck as a plaintiff in the within consolidated action and in 12-cv-4215 (RWS). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (ajs)
May 29, 2015 Filing 287 DECLARATION of Stewart D. Pollak in Support re: (39 in 1:13-cv-01999-RWS, 165 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 71 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-08040-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07812-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 112 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 85 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 89 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 88 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 89 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 39 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS, 66 in 1:13-cv-02244-RWS, 84 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 171 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 68 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 84 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 25 in 1:14-cv-04185-RWS, 86 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 93 in 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 286 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 110 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 186 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 171 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 83 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 82 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 80 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-07813-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 171 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 112 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 171 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 111 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 45 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS) MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Lawrence Corneck, New Party: Stewart D. Pollak for the Estate of Lawrence Corneck .. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Lawrence Corneck. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
May 29, 2015 Filing 286 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Lawrence Corneck, New Party: Stewart D. Pollak for the Estate of Lawrence Corneck . Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Lawrence Corneck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
May 29, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Joel C. Feffer to RE-FILE Document (50 in 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 64 in 1:13-cv-02244-RWS, 169 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 169 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 37 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS, 169 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 23 in 1:14-cv-04185-RWS, 108 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 84 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 184 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 284 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 69 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 75 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 74 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 109 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 86 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 80 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 75 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 75 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 163 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 170 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 87 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 91 in 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 82 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 82 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 90 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 169 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 32 in 1:12-cv-08040-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 75 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 135 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 110 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 110 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 37 in 1:13-cv-01999-RWS, 75 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 71 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-07813-RWS, 83 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 87 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 70 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 43 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-07812-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 75 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS) MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Lawrence Corneck, New Party: Stewart D. Pollak for the Estate of Lawrence Corneck . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the Event Type - Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. First refile Motion and only attach the Proposed Order, then file and link any supporting documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(db)
May 28, 2015 Filing 285 SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record . Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Lawrence CorneckFiled In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
May 28, 2015 Filing 284 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Lawrence Corneck, New Party: Stewart D. Pollak for the Estate of Lawrence Corneck . Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Lawrence Corneck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel) Modified on 5/29/2015 (db).
May 27, 2015 Filing 283 DECLARATION of Vincent R. Cappucci in Support re: #280 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Consent Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement.. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cappucci, Vincent)
May 22, 2015 Filing 282 DECLARATION of Vincent R. Cappucci in Support re: #280 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Consent Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement.. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cappucci, Vincent)
May 22, 2015 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #280 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Consent Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. . Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
May 22, 2015 Filing 280 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Consent Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Cappucci, Vincent)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #278 Motion for Christopher W. Keegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/15/2015) (rjm)
May 14, 2015 Filing 278 MOTION for Christopher W. Keegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing [California], #2 Certificate of Good Standing [Illinois], #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
May 14, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #278 MOTION for Christopher W. Keegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
May 13, 2015 Filing 277 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christopher W. Keegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10917631. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing [California], #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing [Illinois], #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher) Modified on 5/13/2015 (sdi).
May 13, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #277 MOTION for Christopher W. Keegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10917631. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Missing Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of California with the Clerk of Courts Signature. Not from the State Bar Association. Provide only the MDL case number on the documents. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (sdi)
May 12, 2015 Filing 276 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated May 12, 2015 re: case schedule. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Clubok, Andrew)
May 5, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Chan, Tsz)
April 29, 2015 Filing 275 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, KBC Asset Management NV. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Katz, Rebecca)
April 29, 2015 Minute Entry The Court will hold a Conference on 5/4/2015 at 1:00 p.m. (Monday) Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Chan, Tsz)
April 29, 2015 Minute Entry The Conference regarding the issues raised in Lead Plaintiffs' 4/29/2015 letter to chambers, currently scheduled for 5/4/2015 (Monday) at 1:00pm is moved to 5/5/2015 at 10:00am. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Chan, Tsz)
April 28, 2015 Filing 274 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #233 Notice of Appeal, filed by William Cole USCA Case Number 14-1515....that the appeal is hereby WITHDRAWN pursuant to Rule 42 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 04/27/2015. (nd)
April 27, 2015 Filing 273 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #224 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lidia Levy. USCA Case Number 14-1515. The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 04/27/2015. (nd)
April 24, 2015 Filing 272 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan Shub on behalf of Thomas J. Ahrendtsen. New Address: KOHN, SWIFT & GRAF, P.C., One South Broad Street, Suite 2100, Philadelphia, PA, United States 19107-3304, 2152381700. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07550-RWS(Shub, Jonathan)
April 23, 2015 Filing 271 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Victor E. Stewart dated 23 April 2015 re: Settlement Agreement in Principle. Document filed by Meredith Bailey, Dmitri Bougakov, Ryan Cefalu, Lorrain Chin, Atish Gandhi, Phillip Goldberg, Eric Hamrick, Steve Jarvis, Joe Johnson, Nuhket Kayahan, David Kenton, Dennis Kuhn, Benjamin Levine, Katerhine Loiacono, Crystal McMahon, George Michalitsianos, Randy Teresa Mielke, Jacinto Rivera, Faisal Sami, Sanjeev Sharma, Colin Suzman.(Stewart, Victor)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting #269 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/7/2015) (ajs)
April 7, 2015 Filing 269 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: memorandum of law in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representation and Class Counsel addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 4/7/2015. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 1, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 4/1/2015 re: (21 in 1:14-cv-04185-RWS) Letter, filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Chan, Tsz)
March 30, 2015 Filing 268 BRIEF re: #265 Letter, #266 Scheduling Order, Letter response in opposition to request for a judgment dismissing the Exchange Act Plaintiffs' actions with prejudice. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Institutional Investor Group, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Johnson, James)
March 27, 2015 Filing 267 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James P. Rouhandeh dated March 27, 2015 re: Opposition to the March 23, 2015 Request on behalf of Lawrence Corneck and Eugene Stricker. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.(Rouhandeh, James)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs Corneck (12 Civ. 4215) and Stricker's (12 Civ. 4763) letter dated March 23, 2015 (ECF No. 265) will be treated as a motion and will be heard on Wednesday, April 1, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/24/2015) (ajs)
March 23, 2015 Filing 265 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Joel C. Feffer, Esq. dated 03/23/2015 re: Request for Court sua sponte enter a judgment dismissing Exchange Act Plaintiffs' actions with prejudice. Document filed by Eugene Stricker, Lawrence Corneck.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #263 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So ordered. Responses due by 4/10/2015 Replies due by 5/13/2015. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/19/2015) (ajs)
March 11, 2015 Filing 263 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's motion for class certification addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 03/11/15. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to this Court's approval, that this action be stayed pending resolution of NASDAQ's appeal of this Court's Order of December 12, 2013 granting in part and denying in part NASDAQ's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Upon issuance of the mandate from the Court of Appeals, the parties will confer further on how this case should proceed in view of the Court of Appeals decision. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/12/2015) (ajs)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to this Court's approval, that this action be stayed pending resolution of NASDAQ's appeal of this Court's Order of December 12, 2013 granting in part and denying in part NASDAQ's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Upon issuance of the mandate from the Court of Appeals, the parties will confer further on how this case should proceed in view of the Court of Appeals decision. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/12/2015) (ajs)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for class certification and appointment of class representative and class counsel, dated December 23, 2014, will be heard on Wednesday, May 13, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/30/2015) (ajs)
January 30, 2015 Minute Entry Oral Argument held on 1/30/2015 re: #260 Order, the motion for class certification will be held at 12:00 p.m. noon (Chan, Tsz)
January 13, 2015 Filing 259 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #255 MOTION to Certify Class . Redacted. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Graziano, Salvatore)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Salvatore J. Graziano dated 12/23/2014 re: Request to file redacted Motion to Certify Class via ECF. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/3/2015) (ajs)
December 29, 2014 Filing 257 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Patrick W. Flavin. Document filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey. (Rudman, Samuel)
December 23, 2014 Filing 256 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 23, 2014 Filing 255 MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Graziano, Salvatore)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from John Rizio-Hamilton dated 12/18/2014 re: Enlargement of page limitations. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/23/2014) (ajs)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline to Join Additional Parties and Amend Pleadings is 2/9/2015. Deposition due by 1/11/2016. Expert Discovery due by 1/11/2016. Fact Discovery due by 6/17/2015. Motions due by 3/2/2016. Responses due by 4/20/2016, Replies due by 6/1/2016. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/27/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ajs) Modified on 10/28/2014 (ajs).
October 28, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/9/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 2/9/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ajs)
October 1, 2014 Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for (252 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 40 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS) Notice of Appeal by Robert Lowinger. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-10159799, paid on 10/1/2014. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(nd)
October 1, 2014 Filing 252 NOTICE OF APPEAL from (39 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS, 251 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, (228 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 28 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS) Clerk's Judgment, (27 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS, 227 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Robert Lowinger. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(Abraham, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (40 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS, 252 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Notice of Appeal. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS. (tp)
October 1, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (252 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 40 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert Lowinger were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS. (tp)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 OPINION #104691 re: (32 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (27) Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Robert Lowinger. Based on the conclusions set forth within, Plaintiff's motions for reconsideration and leave to amend are denied. It is so ordered. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/1/2014) (ajs) Modified on 9/8/2014 (ca).
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 OPINION & ORDER #104645 re: #221 MOTION to Compel The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The NASDAQ Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld, Anna M. Ewing to To Participate In Limited Discovery Proceedings filed by First New York Securities L.L.C.: For the foregoing reasons, Lead Plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/22/2014) (tn) Modified on 8/27/2014 (ca).
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2014. Expert Discovery due by 11/20/2015. Fact Discovery due by 5/8/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2016. Responses due by 3/11/2016. Replies due by 4/22/2016. Deadline for the Lead Plaintiffs to file their class certification motion due by 11/14/2014. Response due by 2/18/2015. Reply due by 3/27/2015. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/15/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
July 24, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Courtney Keats on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Keats, Michael)
June 12, 2014 Filing 247 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notices of Appearance of William A. Slaughter, Stephen J. Kastenberg, and Paul Lantieri III served on all counsel and pro se plaintiffs on June 12, 2014. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:14-cv-04185-RWS(Kastenberg, Stephen)
June 12, 2014 Filing 246 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen J Kastenberg on behalf of Nasdaq omx group inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:14-cv-04185-RWS(Kastenberg, Stephen)
June 12, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Lantieri, III on behalf of Nasdaq omx group inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:14-cv-04185-RWS(Lantieri, Paul)
June 12, 2014 Filing 244 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William A. Slaughter on behalf of Nasdaq omx group inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:14-cv-04185-RWS(Slaughter, William)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. Filed In Associated Cases:1:14-cv-04185(RWS), 1:12-md-02389(RWS) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
June 11, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (237 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 86 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Facebook, Inc. USCA Case Number 14-1788, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS.(tp)
June 11, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (238 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 105 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS) Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Facebook Inc. USCA Case Number 14-1784, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS.(tp)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Granting #241 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Deborah R. Gross terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/9/2014) (rjm)
June 6, 2014 Filing 241 MOTION for Deborah R. Gross to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jacob Salzmann. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gross, Deborah)
May 30, 2014 Filing 240 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (32 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (27) Memorandum & Opinion, . Lead Underwriters' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration or Reargument. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(Rouhandeh, James)
May 30, 2014 Filing 239 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER... that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-5, filed on 5/7/2014, is LIFTED and the action is transferred to the United States District Court - Southern District of New York for the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/29/2014) (sjo)
May 27, 2014 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 465401095727 on 05/23/2014 re: (238 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 105 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS) Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Facebook Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(nd)
May 27, 2014 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 465401095728 on 05/23/2014 re: (237 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 86 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Facebook, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS(nd)
May 22, 2014 Appeal Fee Due: for (237 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 86 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS) Notice of Appeal, (238 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 105 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS) Notice of Cross Appeal,. Appeal fee due by 6/5/2014. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(nd)
May 22, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (237 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 86 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS) Notice of Appeal, (238 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 105 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS) Notice of Cross Appeal,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(nd)
May 21, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL from (101 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 218 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Judgment, (66 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Facebook Inc.. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
May 21, 2014 Filing 237 NOTICE OF APPEAL from (217 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Judgment, (219 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 82 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS) Judgment, (66 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (rjm)
May 12, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files ONLY for #233 Notice of Appeal, filed by William Cole were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
May 12, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #233 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
May 9, 2014 Filing 235 ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C..(Rouhandeh, James)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Kellen S. Dwyer dated 5/8/2014 re: Defendants respectfully request that the deadline for filing an Answer be extended to May 9, 2014, as the Parties had originally intended. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered., Allen & Company LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Marc L. Andreessen answer due 5/9/2014; BMO Capital Markets Corp. answer due 5/9/2014; Barclays Capital Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Blaylock Robert Van LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Erskine B. Bowles answer due 5/9/2014; James W. Breyer answer due 5/9/2014; C.L. King & Associates, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Castleoak Securities, L.P. answer due 5/9/2014; CitiGroup Global Market, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Citigroup Global Markets Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Lawrence Corneck answer due 5/9/2014; Cowen and Company, LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; E Trade Securities LLC answer due 5/9/2014; David A. Ebersman answer due 5/9/2014; David E. (sic) Ebersman answer due 5/9/2014; Anna M. Ewing answer due 5/9/2014; Facebook, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Goldman Sachs & CO. answer due 5/9/2014; Goldman, Sachs & Co. answer due 5/9/2014; Donald E. Graham answer due 5/9/2014; Robert Greifeld answer due 5/9/2014; Reed Hastings answer due 5/9/2014; Cipora Herman answer due 5/9/2014; Kevin Hicks answer due 5/9/2014; ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC. answer due 5/9/2014; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC answer due 5/9/2014; King & Associates, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Harvey Lapin answer due 5/9/2014; Lazard Capital Markets LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Lebenthal & Co., LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Loop Capital Markets LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Linh Luu answer due 5/9/2014; M.R. Beal & Company answer due 5/9/2014; M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic) answer due 5/9/2014; Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Merrill Lynch answer due 5/9/2014; Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated answer due 5/9/2014; Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Nasdaqomx Group, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Oppenheimer & CO. Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Pacific Crest Securities LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated answer due 5/9/2014; Piper Jaffray & Co. answer due 5/9/2014; RBC Capital Markets LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc answer due 5/9/2014; Sheryl K. Sandberg answer due 5/9/2014; Jill D. Simon answer due 5/9/2014; David M. Spillane answer due 5/9/2014; Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated answer due 5/9/2014; Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. answer due 5/9/2014; Uma M. Swaminathan answer due 5/9/2014; The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. answer due 5/9/2014; The Williams Capital Group, L.P. answer due 5/9/2014; Peter A. Thiel answer due 5/9/2014; Nick E. Tran answer due 5/9/2014; Wells Fargo Securities, LLC answer due 5/9/2014; William Blair & Company L.L.C. answer due 5/9/2014; William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC answer due 5/9/2014; Mark Zuckerberg answer due 5/9/2014. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/8/2014) (lmb)
May 9, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #217 Judgment, #219 Judgment, #220 Stipulation and Order, #216 Judgment, #218 Judgment, #66 Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by William Cole. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9659479. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Sanders, Shane)
May 9, 2014 Filing 232 ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg.(Clubok, Andrew)
May 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 5/7/2014 re: #221 MOTION to Compel The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The NASDAQ Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld, Anna M. Ewing to To Participate In Limited Discovery Proceedings. filed by First New York Securities L.L.C. (sc)
May 6, 2014 Filing 231 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #221 MOTION to Compel The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The NASDAQ Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld, Anna M. Ewing to To Participate In Limited Discovery Proceedings. . Document filed by First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cappucci, Vincent)
May 5, 2014 Filing 230 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response in Opposition to Motion served on Lead Counsel and Co-Lead Counsel on 5/5/2014. Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
May 5, 2014 Filing 229 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: (221 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Compel The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The NASDAQ Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld, Anna M. Ewing to To Participate In Limited Discovery Proceedings. . Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
May 5, 2014 Filing 228 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion (Doc. # 11 in case number 13-cv-401/Doc. # 160 in case number 12-md-02389), defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint is granted. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS (tn)
May 2, 2014 Filing 227 OPINION 104294 re: (11 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS, 160 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. Based on the conclusions set forth above, Defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint is granted. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/2/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(lmb) Modified on 5/6/2014 (nt).
May 2, 2014 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (27 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS, 227 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(lmb)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME. WHEREAS, Plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions filed the Consolidated Class Action Complaint (the "Complaint") on February 28, 2013. WHEREAS, pursuant to the agreed upon scheduling order entered by the Court on February 5, 2014, the deadline for Defendants to answer the Complaint is April 25, 2014. WHEREAS, Defendants have requested an extension of time to answer the Complaint and Plaintiffs have consented to Defendants' request: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the undersigned parties that the time for all Defendants to answer the Complaint is extended to May 8, 2014. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (rjm)
April 28, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants Answer due 5/8/2014. (rjm)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery dated April 25, 2015 will be heard on Wednesday, May 7, 2014. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/28/2014) (rjm)
April 28, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #217 Judgment, #219 Judgment, #220 Stipulation and Order, #216 Judgment, #218 Judgment, #66 Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Lidia Levy. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9609193. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
April 28, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #224 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
April 28, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files ONLY for #224 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lidia Levy were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
April 24, 2014 Filing 223 AFFIDAVIT of Vincent R. Cappucci in Support re: #221 MOTION to Compel The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The NASDAQ Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld, Anna M. Ewing to To Participate In Limited Discovery Proceedings.. Document filed by First New York Securities L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cappucci, Vincent)
April 24, 2014 Filing 222 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #221 MOTION to Compel The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The NASDAQ Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld, Anna M. Ewing to To Participate In Limited Discovery Proceedings.. Document filed by First New York Securities L.L.C.. (Cappucci, Vincent)
April 24, 2014 Filing 221 MOTION to Compel The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The NASDAQ Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld, Anna M. Ewing to To Participate In Limited Discovery Proceedings. Document filed by First New York Securities L.L.C..(Cappucci, Vincent)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Crocitto Amended Complaint is dismissed on the grounds set forth in Derivative Opinion I and Derivative Opinion II. The Clerk shall enter judgment in the above-noted actions on the basis of this order. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(lmb)
April 23, 2014 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (83 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 102 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 220 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 85 in 1:12-cv-07553-RWS) Stipulation and Order, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(lmb)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 JUDGMENT. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that for the reasons stated in the Court's February 12, 2013 Opinion and Order, and in the April 17, 2014 Stipulation and Order, final judgment is entered dismissing the action in its entirety. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS (rjm)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 JUDGMENT. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that for the reasons stated in the Court's February 12, 2013 Opinion and Order, and in the April 17, 2014 Stipulation and Order, final judgment is entered dismissing the action in its entirety. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS (rjm)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 JUDGMENT. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that for the reasons stated in the Court's February 12, 2013 Opinion and Order, and in the April 17, 2014 Stipulation and Order, final judgment is entered dismissing the action in its entirety. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS (rjm)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 JUDGMENT. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that for the reasons stated in Derivative Opinion I, in Derivative Opinion II, and in the April 17, 2014 Stipulation and Order, final judgment is entered dismissing the action in its entirety. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/21/2014). Relates to 12md2389, 13-786. (rjm)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PLAINTIFF EDWARD CHILDS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Edward Childs, by and through his counsel, hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action, 12-cv-4156 (RWS), is voluntarily dismissed as to all defendants. This dismissal shall apply to that action only, and shall not constitute a dismissal of any other actions in In re: Facebook, Inc. IPO Securities and Derivative Litigation, 12-md-2389 (RWS). So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS (rjm)
April 9, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 4/9/2014 re: #160 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co.. (cd)
March 27, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Henry Wierzbowski on behalf of Institutional Investor Group. (Wierzbowski, Adam)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 OPINION & ORDER #104064. Based upon the conclusions set forth above, Defendants' motion for interlocutory appeal is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/7/2014) (lmb) Modified on 3/17/2014 (ca).
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James P. Rouhandeh dated 2/24/2014 re: Request for an adjournment of the oral argument relating to the Lead Underwriters' motion to dismiss the complaint in Lowinger v. Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, No. 13 Civ. 4016, from its current scheduled date of 3/26/2014 to 4/9/2014 at 12:00 p.m. due to scheduling conflicts. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS (rjm)
March 4, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #160 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (rjm)
February 28, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #196 Judgment, #173 Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9403189. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Rudman, Samuel)
February 28, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #211 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
February 28, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files (ONLY) for #211 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
February 20, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stefanie Jill Sundel on behalf of Institutional Investor Group. (Sundel, Stefanie)
February 14, 2014 Filing 208 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appeal served on Lead and Co-Lead Counsel on February 14, 2014. Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
February 14, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from (87 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9358398. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 OPINION AND ORDER: #103976 re: #177 MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. Based upon the conclusions set forth above, Defendants' motion for interlocutory appeal is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/11/2014) (ama) Modified on 2/21/2014 (ca).
February 14, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (100 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 67 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 207 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 70 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS) Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(tp)
February 14, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files (ONLY) for (207 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 70 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 100 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 67 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS) Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(tp)
February 13, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE CORRECTED proceeding held on 2/4/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
February 13, 2014 Filing 204 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE CORRECTED held on 2/4/2014 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
February 13, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/4/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
February 13, 2014 Filing 202 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/4/2014 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER as to (160 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 11 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be heard at noon on March 26, 2014, in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. (Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2014 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(ja)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Parties have agreed to exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) on March 14, 2014. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3), the Parties jointly submit thefollowing Proposed Pretrial Schedule which is subject to Defendants' position (opposed by Plaintiffs) that further proceedings in this matter, including the commencement of discovery, should be stayed pending resolution of Defendants' 1292(b) motion. Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 12/5/2014. Motions due by 9/25/2015. Responses due by 11/13/2015 Replies due by 12/18/2015. Fact Discovery due by 1/30/2015. Expert Discovery due by 7/24/2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/03/2014) (ama)
February 5, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Allen & Company LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Marc L. Andreessen answer due 4/25/2014; BMO Capital Markets Corp. answer due 4/25/2014; Barclays Capital Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Blaylock Robert Van LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Erskine B. Bowles answer due 4/25/2014; James W. Breyer answer due 4/25/2014; C.L. King & Associates, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Castleoak Securities, L.P. answer due 4/25/2014; CitiGroup Global Market, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Citigroup Global Markets Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Lawrence Corneck answer due 4/25/2014; Cowen and Company, LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; E Trade Securities LLC answer due 4/25/2014; David A. Ebersman answer due 4/25/2014; David E. (sic) Ebersman answer due 4/25/2014; Anna M. Ewing answer due 4/25/2014; Facebook, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Goldman Sachs & CO. answer due 4/25/2014; Goldman, Sachs & Co. answer due 4/25/2014; Donald E. Graham answer due 4/25/2014; Robert Greifeld answer due 4/25/2014; Reed Hastings answer due 4/25/2014; Cipora Herman answer due 4/25/2014; Kevin Hicks answer due 4/25/2014; ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC. answer due 4/25/2014; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC answer due 4/25/2014; King & Associates, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Harvey Lapin answer due 4/25/2014; Lazard Capital Markets LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Lebenthal & Co., LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Linh Luu answer due 4/25/2014; M.R. Beal & Company answer due 4/25/2014; M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic) answer due 4/25/2014; Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Merrill Lynch answer due 4/25/2014; Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated answer due 4/25/2014; Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Nasdaqomx Group, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Oppenheimer & CO. Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Pacific Crest Securities LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated answer due 4/25/2014; Piper Jaffray & Co. answer due 4/25/2014; RBC Capital Markets LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc answer due 4/25/2014; Sheryl K. Sandberg answer due 4/25/2014; Jill D. Simon answer due 4/25/2014; David M. Spillane answer due 4/25/2014; Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated answer due 4/25/2014; Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. answer due 4/25/2014; Uma M. Swaminathan answer due 4/25/2014; The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. answer due 4/25/2014; The Williams Capital Group, L.P. answer due 4/25/2014; Peter A. Thiel answer due 4/25/2014; Nick E. Tran answer due 4/25/2014; Wells Fargo Securities, LLC answer due 4/25/2014; William Blair & Company L.L.C. answer due 4/25/2014; William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC answer due 4/25/2014; Mark Zuckerberg answer due 4/25/2014. (ama)
February 4, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 2/4/2014 re: #180 MOTION to Amend/Correct I>and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum > Opinion, Set Hearings, and c filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King > Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, C.L. King > Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner > Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley > Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey > Co., Piper Jaffray > Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal > Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus > Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal > Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner > Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert > Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James > Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner > Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer > Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus > Company, Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner > Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs > Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley > Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus > Company Incorporated, Allen > Company LLC, Morgan Stanley > Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer > Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer > Co. Inc.,, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez > Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert > Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley > Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert > Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair > Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert > Co Inc, Goldman, Sachs > Co., Samuel A. Ramirez > Company Inc, Oppenheimer > CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley > Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal > Co LLC, C.L. King > Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs > Co, Harvey Lapin, Facebook, Inc., Allen > Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair > Company LLC, Pierce Fenner > Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley > Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert > Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray > Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen > Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus > Company Incorporated, Allen > Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez > Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen > Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King > Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer > Co. Inc, Oppenheimer > CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus > Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James > Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley > Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez > Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas > Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs > CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley > Co. LLC, William Blair > Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal > Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner > Smith Inc., William Blair > Company L.L.C., Castleoak Securities LP, CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch. (sc)
February 3, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 2/3/2014 re: #177 MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. (sc)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet, from Andrew B. Clubok, dated 1/30/2014, re: We represent Facebook, Inc. and its officers and directors in the above referenced litigation... Defendants will be filing a reply brief in support their Motion To Amend and Certify December 12 Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) - request thirteen pages for this reply. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/31/2014) (ja)
February 3, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 2/3/2014. (Chan, Tsz)
January 31, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore Jo Graziano on behalf of Institutional Investor Group. (Graziano, Salvatore)
January 31, 2014 Filing 198 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 123 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 67 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 159 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 74 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 61 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 99 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 180 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 173 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 68 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 71 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, James Chang, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Rick Pond, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P., William H. Anhood. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
January 30, 2014 Filing 196 JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion dated December 20, 2013, the Nominal Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied in part and granted in part, and Plaintiffs' motion to remand is denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/29/14) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-02830-RWS(ml)
January 30, 2014 Filing 195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants Motion to Amend and Certify Order Entered December 16, 2013 for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) served on Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs on January 30, 2014. Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
January 30, 2014 Filing 194 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (62 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 58 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 60 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 177 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 69 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b).. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James P. Rouhandeh dated 1/21/2014 re: The Lead Underwriters request permission to file a reply brief of 17 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/23/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(cd)
January 24, 2014 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #180 MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Dubbs, Thomas)
January 22, 2014 Filing 191 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #177 MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). CORRECTED COPY. Document filed by First New York Securities L.L.C.. (Cappucci, Vincent)
January 21, 2014 Filing 190 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #191) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #177 MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b).. Document filed by First New York Securities L.L.C.. (Cappucci, Vincent) Modified on 1/24/2014 (lb).
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re: MOTIONS to Amend/Correct (in 1:12-md-02389-RWS), Memorandum & Opinion, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1292(b) as set forth in the case numbers listed in this Order. Defendants The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., the NASDAQ Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld and Anna M. Ewing ("Defendants") motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1292(b) to amend and certify the Order entered December 16, 2013 for interlocutory appeal, dated December 30, 2013 will be heard at noon on Wednesday, February 5, 2014, in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1 It is so ordered. (Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2014 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/14/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja) Modified on 1/16/2014 (ja). Modified on 1/17/2014 (ja).
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Vincent R. Cappucci dated 1/13/2014 re: We write on behalf of Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated NASDAQ Actions. Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Amend and Certify Order Entered December 16, 2013 for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) is due to be filed on January 16, 2014. We write to request that the Court extend this deadline five days, to January 21, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/13/2014) (ama)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER: Defendants' motion to amend and certify the December 12, 2013 order for interlocutory appeal, dated January 10, 2014, shall be heard at 10 a.m. on Tuesday, February 4, 2014, in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. ( Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/14/2014) (cd)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ENDORSED LETTER re: #174 MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5). MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5) filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Vincent R. Cappucci dated 1/13/2014 re: Request to extend time to 1/21/2014 for reply on motion to amend and certify order entered 12/16/2013. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #174 MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5). MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5). ( Replies due by 1/21/2014.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/13/2014) (cd)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER: in case 1:12-cv-04054-RWS et al; granting (183) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-md-02389-RWS. ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to file a notice of appeal is hereby extended to February 14, 2014. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/13/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (cd)
January 13, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc. answer due 2/17/2014; The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC answer due 2/17/2014; The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. answer due 2/17/2014; The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. answer due 2/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: WHEREAS, Defendants The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The NASDAQ Stock Market LLC, Robert Greifeld, and Anna M. Ewing filed a Motion to Dismiss the CAC, which the Court granted in part and denied in part on December 16, 2013; the parties to this action agree that extending the time for Defendants to answer the CAC would serve the interests of the parties and the Court; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the approval of the Court, that the time for Defendants to answer the CAC is hereby extended to February 17, 2014. NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc. answer due 2/17/2014; The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC answer due 2/17/2014; Nasdaqomx Group, Inc. answer due 2/17/2014; The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. answer due 2/17/2014. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/9/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION: that the time for all Defendants to answer Plaintiffs' consolidated class action complaint shall be deferred until such time that the parties can meet and confer in good faith to determine a reasonable schedule. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/9/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
January 13, 2014 Filing 183 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Vincent R. Cappucci dated January 13, 2014. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Cappucci, Vincent)
January 13, 2014 Filing 182 RESPONSE to Motion re: #174 MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5). MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5). Lead Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5). Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
January 10, 2014 Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 123 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 67 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 159 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 74 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 61 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 99 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 180 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 173 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 68 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 71 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c and certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Anna M. Ewing, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Robert Greifeld, Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
January 10, 2014 Filing 180 MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
December 30, 2013 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Amend and Certify Order Entered December 16, 2013 for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof served on Lead Counsel and Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs on December 30, 2013. Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
December 30, 2013 Filing 178 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (62 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 58 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 60 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 177 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 69 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b).. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
December 30, 2013 Filing 177 MOTION to Amend/Correct (171 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, and certify Order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
December 30, 2013 Filing 176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Extend Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed R.A.P. 4(a)(5) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof served on Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Plaintiffs on December 30, 2013. Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
December 30, 2013 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (66 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 61 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 89 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 174 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS) MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5). MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5).. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
December 30, 2013 Filing 174 MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R.A.P. 4(a)(5). Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
December 23, 2013 Filing 173 OPINION re: (108 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 16 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint, filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook Inc., (85 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey. Based on the conclusions set forth above, (1) Nominal Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied in part and granted in part; and (2) Plaintiffs' motion to remand is denied as moot. (See Opinion). (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-02830-RWS(ja)
December 12, 2013 Filing 388 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #171 Memorandum & Opinion. (Attachments: #1 internet citation, #2 internet citation, #3 internet citation, #4 internet citation) (fk)
December 12, 2013 Filing 387 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #171 Memorandum & Opinion. (Attachments: #1 internet citation, #2 internet citation, #3 internet citation) (fk)
December 12, 2013 Filing 386 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #171 Memorandum & Opinion. (Attachments: #1 internet citation, #2 internet citation, #3 internet citation) (fk)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 OPINION & ORDER re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Uma M. Swaminathan, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Robert Herpst, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jose Galvan, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Company LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal & Co LLC, Linh Luu, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Harvey Lapin, Edward Shierry, Facebook, Inc., Rick Pond, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair & Company LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Jill D. Simon, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King & Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs & CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Castleoak Securities LP, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch. Based on the conclusions determined above, Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied. The parties will meet and confer upon the schedule for further proceedings which will be the subject of a pretrial conference at 10 a.m. February 4, 2014, or at such other time as determined by counsel and the Court. It is so ordered. (Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 OPINION & ORDER re: #103823 & 103824(46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., (117 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. Based upon the conclusions set forth above, (1) Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied in part and granted in part; (2) Plaintiffs' request to lift the PSLRA discovery stay is rendered moot; and (3) Plaintiff's motion to amend is granted in part and denied in part. The parties will meet and confer upon the schedule for further proceedings which will be the subject of a pretrial conference at 10 a.m. February 3, 2014, or at such other time as determined by counsel and the Court. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja) Modified on 12/17/2013 (ca). Modified on 12/17/2013 (ca).
December 12, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
November 11, 2013 Filing 170 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Rebecca M Katz on behalf of Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, KBC Asset Management NV. New Address: MOTLEY RICE LLC, 600 Third Avenue, 21st Floor, New York, NY, USA 10016, 2125770040. (Katz, Rebecca)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the undersigned parties, subject to the Court's approval, that: The time for Facebook to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including the date fourteen days after the Court's entry of an order deciding the Underwriters' motion to dismiss. This Stipulation and the extension provided for herein shall not be used as a basis for arguing for any additional or further relief. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/28/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(rsh)
October 22, 2013 Filing 168 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Christopher Lovell dated 10/22/13 re: Reply to Mr. Kastenberg's letter of October 15, 2013. Document filed by Phillip Goldberg.(Lovell, Christopher)
October 21, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/3/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 21, 2013 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 10/3/2013 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/15/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 17, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/8/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
October 17, 2013 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/8/2013 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James P. Rouhandeh dated 10/15/2013 re: The Lead Underwriters request that the Court extend the page limit for the memorandum in support of their motion to thirty five pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(js)
October 16, 2013 Filing 162 DECLARATION of James P. Rouhandeh in Support re: (11 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS, 160 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(Rouhandeh, James)
October 16, 2013 Filing 161 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (11 in 1:13-cv-04016-RWS, 160 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(Rouhandeh, James)
October 16, 2013 Filing 160 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(Rouhandeh, James)
October 15, 2013 Filing 159 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Stephen J. Kastenberg dated October 15, 2013 re: Letter from Christopher Lovell dated 10/11/13. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
October 11, 2013 Filing 158 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Christopher Lovell & Douglas Thompson dated 10/11/13 re: NASDAQ OMX By-Law Article XII. Document filed by Phillip Goldberg.(Lovell, Christopher)
October 8, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 10/8/2013 re: #85 MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware. filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey, #126 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. (sc)
October 7, 2013 Filing 157 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James W. Johnson dated October 7, 2013 re: Motion to Dismiss Oral Argument. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.(Johnson, James)
October 3, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 10/3/2013 on Motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, Motion for an order partially lifting the PSLRA discovery stay, and Motion to amend the Complaint, re: (95 in 1:12-md- 02389-RWS) Amended Complaint, filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, Steve Jarvis, First New York Securities L.L.C., Colin Suzman, Meredith Bailey, Atish Gandhi, T3 Trading Group, LLC, Phillip Goldberg, Faisal Sami, (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Uma M. Swaminathan, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Robert Herpst, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jose Galvan, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Company LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal & Co LLC, Linh Luu, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Harvey Lapin, Edward Shierry, Facebook, Inc., Rick Pond, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair & Company LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Jill D. Simon, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King & Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs & CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Castleoak Securities LP, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, (71 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Amended Complaint, filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Jose Galvan, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Mary Galvan, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, (46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv- 04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv- 04403-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv- 04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Anna M. Ewing, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, (117 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by First New York Securities L.L.C., Avatar Securities, LLC, T3 Trading Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
October 2, 2013 Filing 156 LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Christopher Lovell dated 10/2/2013 re: Motion to Dismiss Oral Argument. Document filed by Phillip Goldberg.(Lovell, Christopher)
September 26, 2013 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and Declaration of Paul Lantieri III served on Counsel and Unrepresented Parties on September 26, 2013. Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
September 26, 2013 Filing 154 DECLARATION of Paul Lantieri III in Support re: (46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NASDAQ OMX By-law Article XII)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
September 26, 2013 Filing 153 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Stephen J. Kastenberg dated 9/24/2013 re: Request that the Court extend the page limit for the reply to 40 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/25/2013) (cd)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: The previous scheduling order (Dkt. No. 140) is hereby amended as follows: Plaintiffs Gaye Jones and Holly McConnaughey's Motion to Remand, dated April 23, 2013 (Dkt. No. 85), will now be heard at noon on Tuesday, October 8, 2013 in Courtroom 18C,United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, at noon. Defendant Facebook, Inc., the individual Facebook defendants, and the underwriter defendants' (collectively, the "Defendants") Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, dated April 30, 2013 (Dkt. No. 89), will now be heard at noon on Tuesday, October 8, 2013 in Courtroom 18C, at noon. (Status Conference set for 10/8/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/30/2013) (rsh)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Vincent R. Cappucci dated 8/20/2013 re: Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs request that the Court extend a page limit for Lead Plaintiffs' opposition brief to 65 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/23/2013) (tro)
August 28, 2013 Filing 149 AFFIDAVIT of Vincent R. Cappucci in Opposition re: #126 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Cappucci, Vincent)
August 27, 2013 Filing 148 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (SEE ENTRY# 149)AFFIDAVIT of Vincent R. Cappucci in Opposition re: #126 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cappucci, Vincent) Modified on 8/30/2013 (kj).
August 27, 2013 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #126 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 8/13/2013 re: Facebook respectfully requests that the Court extend the page limit for its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss the Jones derivative suit to twenty-two pages. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/17/2013) (lmb)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER: The previous scheduling order is hereby amended as follows: Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Partially Lifting the PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, dated June 25, 2013 (Dkt. No. 117), will be heard at 11am on Thursday, October 3, 2013, in Courtroom 18C. NASDAQ's motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, dated July 2, 2013 (Dkt. No. 126), will be heard at 11am on Thursday, October 3, 2013, in Courtroom 18C. It is so ordered., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #117 MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #126 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. :( Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/17/2013) (lmb)
August 13, 2013 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Joseph Cascio in Support re: (16 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS, 108 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint.. Document filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-02830-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
August 13, 2013 Filing 143 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (108 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 16 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint.. Document filed by Facebook Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-02830-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
August 13, 2013 Filing 142 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #85 MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Document filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey. (Rudman, Samuel)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 OPINION & ORDER re: #103483 (39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS) MOTION to Sever filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Based upon the conclusions set forth above, the Exchange Act Plaintiffs' motion to sever is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd) Modified on 8/15/2013 (ca).
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: Amending scheduling order (Dkt. No. 96 and Dkt. No. 97)as follows: Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS). MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (108 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 16 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint., (85 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware. Motion Hearing(FOR #'S 85,89, AND 108) set for 9/26/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Partially Lifting the PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, dated June 25, 2013 (Dkt. No. 117), will be heard at l0am on Thursday, September 19, 2013, in Courtroom 18C. NASDAQ's motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, dated July 2, 2013 (Dkt. No. 126), will be heard at l0am on Thursday, September 19, 2013, in Courtroom 18C. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/5/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the undersigned parties, subject to the Court's approval, that: 1. Defendants accept service of process and agree not to contest sufficiency of service of process. 2. The time for Defendants to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including October 2, 2013. 3. This Stipulation and the extension provided for herein shall not be used as a basis for arguing for any additional or further relief., Facebook, Inc. answer due 10/2/2013; Goldman Sachs & Co. answer due 10/2/2013; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC answer due 10/2/2013; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC answer due 10/2/2013. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/5/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-04016-RWS(lmb)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Vincent R. Cappucci dated 7/16/2013 re: We write to request that the Court extend the page limit for Lead Plaintiffs' reply to fifteen pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/23/2013) (cd)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 7/12/2013 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court extend the page limit tor the reply brief to thirty-five pages. We believe this extension is appropriate because the reply brief must respond to a sixty-five page opposition brief and is being filed On behalf of several defendants who could have filed separate briefs. Defendants also respectfully request a two-day extension of the filing deadline, from July 16, 2013, to July 18, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/23/2013) (mt) Modified on 7/25/2013 (mt).
July 22, 2013 Filing 136 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #117 MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
July 18, 2013 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Clubok in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Anna M. Ewing, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Robert Greifeld, Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, Institutional Investor Group, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
July 18, 2013 Filing 134 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Anna M. Ewing, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Robert Greifeld, Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Avatar Securities, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
July 12, 2013 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum of Defendants in Opposition to Motion (Doc. 117) for an Order Lifting the PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint served on all designated counsel and unrepresented parties on July 12, 2013. Service was made by E-mail and Mail. Document filed by Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Lantieri, Paul)
July 12, 2013 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (117 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Lantieri, Paul)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Samuel H. Rudman dated 6/26/2013 re: The deadlines for the filing of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Plaintiffs' Opposition to Facebook's Threshold Motion to Dismiss are hereby extended to Friday, June 28, 2013, with the page limit extended to 30 and 35 pages, and as further set forth in this document. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Responses due by 6/28/2013) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/7/2013) (cd)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Samuel H. Rudman dated 6/26/2013 re: Joint request that an order be entered for the listed relief and that the parties, through their respective counsel, agree that any non-public documents related to Plaintiffs' purchase of Facebook common stock that Plaintiffs elect to file under seal will be kept confidential, but the parties will work together to try to resolve any confidentiality issues by redacting or otherwise, if possible. If the parties cannot agree on how to treat them, they will be filed under seal pending further guidance from the Court. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff, Part I on 7/8/2013) (cd)
July 2, 2013 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, Memorandum of Law, and Declaration in support thereof served on all designated counsel and unrepresented parties on July 2, 2013. Service was made by email. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
July 2, 2013 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Paul Lantieri III in Support re: (76 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
July 2, 2013 Filing 127 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
July 2, 2013 Filing 126 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Responses due by 8/27/2013Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
July 1, 2013 Filing 125 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from William A. Slaughter dated 6/25/2013 re: Counsel requests that the Court extend the page limit for the brief in support of the Motion to Dismiss to sixty-five pages. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/26/2013) (ft)
June 28, 2013 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman in Opposition re: #108 MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint.. Document filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Rudman, Samuel)
June 28, 2013 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #108 MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint. and in Support of Delaware Derivative Plaintiffs' Rule 56(d) Motion. Document filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey. (Rudman, Samuel)
June 28, 2013 Filing 121 DECLARATION of Richard D. Bernstein in Opposition re: #85 MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware.. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Clubok, Andrew)
June 28, 2013 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #85 MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware.. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Clubok, Andrew)
June 25, 2013 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT of Vincent R. Cappucci in Support re: #117 MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cappucci, Vincent)
June 25, 2013 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #117 MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
June 25, 2013 Filing 117 MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. Return Date set for 7/24/2013 at 12:00 PM.(Cappucci, Vincent)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James W. Johnson dated 6/11/2013 re: Lead Plaintiffs will file their memorandum in opposition to that motion on Friday, June 14th. Lead Plaintiffs respectfully request that the Court extend the page limitation for the opposition memorandum to sixty-five pages. We believe this extension is appropriate because the opposition memorandum must respond to the various arguments raised by Defendants in their fifty-five page brief. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/18/2013) (ama)
June 14, 2013 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Thomas A. Dubbs in Opposition re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Jose Galvan, Mary Galvan, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Dubbs, Thomas)
June 14, 2013 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Jose Galvan, Mary Galvan, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Dubbs, Thomas)
June 12, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Goldrich Cousins P.C. 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan & Trust. (Risen, Douglas)
June 10, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/29/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 10, 2013 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/29/2013 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 7, 2013 Filing 110 DECLARATION of Joseph Cascio in Support re: (16 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS, 108 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint.. Document filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-02830-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
June 7, 2013 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (108 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 16 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint.. Document filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-02830-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
June 7, 2013 Filing 108 MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint. Document filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 6/26/2013 Return Date set for 9/25/2013 at 12:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:13-cv-02830-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Samuel H. Rudman dated 6/4/2013 re: Request for the following briefing schedule: Facebook's motion on what it believes to be "threshold grounds" will be filed by June 7, 2013; Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to remand and Plaintiffs' opposition to Facebook's motion will be filed by June 26, 2013; and Replies in support of Facebook's motion and Plaintiffs' motion to remand will be filed on August 13,2013. Facebook's motion will be heard, along with Plaintiffs' motion to remand, at noon on Wednesday, September 25,2013. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Motion due by 6/7/2013. Responses due by 6/26/2013, Replies due by 8/13/2013.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/4/2013) (cd)
June 6, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #85 MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2013 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (cd)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS: Plaintiff, Michael Zack, and Defendants, The NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc. and The NASDAQ Stock Market LLC (collectively,"NASDAQ"), by their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate and agree as follows: This action is one of eleven class actions filed against NASDAQ relating to the initial public offering ("IPO") of Facebook, Inc. common stock. It is before this Court on removal from the Supreme Court in and for the State of New York, New York County, where it was originally filed on August 7, 2012. (Dkt. No.1). On April 30, 2013, lead plaintiffs in the consolidated class actions against NASDAQ (in which the Zack case is not consolidated) filed their Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (MDL No. 12-2389, Dkt. No. 95) ("Consolidated Class Action Complaint"). In view of the fact that the plaintiff and the putative class in this action contain claims which may overlap the claims in the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, the parties to this action agree that this action should not proceed prior to, at minimum, a determination of the motion to dismiss in the consolidated IPO action. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that this action be stayed pending determination of the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, at which time the parties herein and the Court will revisit whether further extension of the stay is warranted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/29/2013) (rsh)
May 29, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 5/29/2013 re: #77 MOTION to Sever, filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. (ja)
May 23, 2013 Filing 105 MOTION for Catherine McCaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8541495. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(McCaw, Catherine)
May 23, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #105 MOTION for Catherine McCaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8541495. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
May 16, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 5/1/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 16, 2013 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 5/1/2013 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 13, 2013 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Anna M. Ewing waiver sent on 5/2/2013, answer due 7/1/2013; Robert Greifeld waiver sent on 5/2/2013, answer due 7/1/2013. Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC; First New York Securities L.L.C.; Avatar Securities, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
May 13, 2013 Filing 101 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (75 in 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 35 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 31 in 1:12-cv-07813-RWS, 25 in 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 18 in 1:12-cv-08040-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 69 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 8 in 1:13-cv-01999-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-07812-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 29 in 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 22 in 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 36 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Eugene Stricker, Lawrence Corneck. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rouhandeh, James)
May 3, 2013 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Singer, Steven)
May 3, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal by Brian Roffe Profit Sharing Plan as a Named Plaintiff. Document filed by Brian Roffe Profit Sharing Plan. (Fruchter, Jack)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Defendant Facebook, Inc., the individual Facebook defendants, and the underwriter defendants' (collectively, the "Defendants") motion to dismiss the consolidated class action, dated April 30, 2013, will be heard at noon on Wednesday, September 18, 2013 in courtroom 18C. All papers shall be served in accordance with the parties' scheduling stipulations re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Uma M. Swaminathan, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Robert Herpst, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jose Galvan, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Company LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal & Co LLC, Linh Luu, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Harvey Lapin, Edward Shierry, Facebook, Inc., Rick Pond, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair & Company LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Jill D. Simon, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King & Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs & CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Castleoak Securities LP, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. ( Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: In consideration of the parties' submissions and the status conference held on May 1, 2013, Plaintiffs Gaye Jones and Holly McConnaughey's motion to remand, dated April 23, 2013 (Dkt. No. 85), will be heard at noon on Wednesday, September 25, 2013 in Courtroom 18C. Counsel shall meet and confer with respect to a briefing schedule for the remand motion as well as any additional anticipated motions. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #85 MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware. ( Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/2/2013) (cd)
May 1, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Letter Motion Oral Argument held on 5/1/2013. (mro)
May 1, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharan Nirmul on behalf of Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd. (Nirmul, Sharan)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from William J. Newsom dated 4/30/2013 re: Having dismissed the case, I would like to request that Your Honor remove myself and the following attorneys at my firm from the ECF notices, as we no longer represent any party to the Facebook IPO cases. Alexander Robert Safyan, Bruce Lee Simon, Clifford H. Pearson, George S. Trevor, William James Newsom, and Daniel L. Warshaw removed. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/1/2013) (cd)
May 1, 2013 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (CORRECTED). Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Avatar Securities, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Brian Gralnick, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, T3 Trading Group, LLC, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Rick Pond, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, First New York Securities, L.L.C., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 30, 2013 Filing 95 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT amending #71 Amended Complaint, against NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Robert Greifeld, Anna M. Ewing with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by T3 Trading Group, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., Colin Suzman, Meredith Bailey, Steve Jarvis, Avatar Securities, LLC, Faisal Sami, Phillip Goldberg, Atish Gandhi. Related document: #71 Amended Complaint, filed by Mary Galvan, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Jose Galvan, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(lmb)
April 30, 2013 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anna M. Ewing, Robert Greifeld, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C. (lmb)
April 30, 2013 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Clubok in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, John Gregory, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), First New York Securities L.L.C., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Jose and Mary Galvan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 30, 2013 Filing 90 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., A. Marcus Gerber, Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Kevin Hyms, J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Sylvia Gregorcyzk, Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Rick Pond, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, T3 Trading Group, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, John Gregory, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Dennis Palkon, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Karen Cuker, Vernon R. DeMois, Jr., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew) Modified on 5/1/2013 (ldi).
April 30, 2013 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Rick Pond, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Jose Galvan, Robert Herpst, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Edward Shierry, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Responses due by 6/14/2013Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 4/24/2013 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court extend the page limit for the memorandum in support of joint motion to dismiss to fifty-five pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
April 23, 2013 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman in Support re: #85 MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware.. Document filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rudman, Samuel)
April 23, 2013 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #85 MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware.. Document filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey. (Rudman, Samuel)
April 23, 2013 Filing 85 MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware. Document filed by Gaye Jones, Holly McConnaughey.(Rudman, Samuel)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Lawrence Corneck and Eugene Stricker's (the "Exchange Act Plaintiffs") motion to sever their actions, dated April 16, 2013 will be heard at noon on Wednesday, May 29, 2013, in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS) MOTION to Sever. ( Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 1:12-cv-04763-RWS(cd)
April 18, 2013 Filing 83 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-4) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Delaware, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Robert W. Sweet, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/18/2013) (sjo)
April 18, 2013 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notices of Appearance of William A. Slaughter, Stephen J. Kastenberg, and Paul Lantieri III served on all counsel and pro se plaintiffs on April 18, 2013. Document filed by NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 1:13-cv-01999-RWS(Slaughter, William)
April 18, 2013 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Lantieri, III on behalf of The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The NASDAQ OMX Group Inc, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 1:13-cv-01999-RWS(Lantieri, Paul)
April 18, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William A. Slaughter on behalf of The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The NASDAQ OMX Group Inc, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 1:13-cv-01999-RWS(Slaughter, William)
April 18, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen J Kastenberg on behalf of The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The NASDAQ OMX Group Inc, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 1:13-cv-01999-RWS(Kastenberg, Stephen)
April 16, 2013 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (75 in 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 35 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 31 in 1:12-cv-07813-RWS, 25 in 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 18 in 1:12-cv-08040-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 69 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 8 in 1:13-cv-01999-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-07812-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 29 in 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 22 in 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 36 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
April 16, 2013 Filing 77 MOTION to Sever. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Return Date set for 5/22/2013 at 12:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: The previous scheduling order is hereby amended as follows: Plaintiff's motion to remand, originally filed in the Southern District of Texas and dated December 11, 2012, will be heard will be heard at noon on Wednesday, April 24, 2013, in courtroom 18C. All papers will be subject to the parties' stipulation, filed on March 22, 2013 (Dkt. No. 19).( Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-09308-RWS(cd)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to remand, originally filed in the Southern District of Texas and dated December 11, 2012, will be heard will be heard at noon on Wednesday, April 10, 2013, in courtroom 18C. Any additional reply shall be submitted by April 5, 2013. ( Replies due by 4/5/2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-09308-RWS(cd)
March 18, 2013 Filing 75 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Texas, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Robert W. Sweet, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 3/18/2013) (sjo)
March 14, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal By Michael Spatz as a Named Plaintiff. Document filed by Michael Spatz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07586-RWS(Weintraub, Robert)
February 28, 2013 Filing 71 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mary Galvan, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Jose Galvan, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.***Certificate of Service Attached hereto. (Received in the night deposit box on 2/28/2013 at 8:07 p.m. and was received for docketing on 3/5/2013.) ***Also docketed in related civil cases listed herein. (mro)
February 26, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas James McKenna on behalf of Elbita Alfonso. New Address: Gainey McKenna & Egleson, 440 Park Avenue South, 5th Floor, New York, NY, 10016, 212-983-1300. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(McKenna, Thomas)
February 26, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory M. Egleston on behalf of Lidia Levy. New Address: Gainey McKenna & Egleston, 440 Park Avenue South, 5th Fl., New York, New York, 10016, 212-983-1300. (Egleston, Gregory)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SCHEDULING STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the schedule for filing amended complaints and any motions to dismiss in the NASDAQ Actions shall be as follows: Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2013. Motions due by 7/2/2013. Responses due by 8/27/2013 Replies due by 9/26/2013. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(js)
February 22, 2013 Filing 73 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #66 Memorandum & Opinion. (Attachments: #1 Internet Citation, #2 Internet Citation, #3 Internet Citation, #4 Internet Citation, #5 Internet Citation) (sj)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION AND ORDER #102912. Based upon the conclusions set forth in this Opinion and Order, the Plaintiff's motion to remand is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/12/2013). Relates to 12cv6439. (rjm) Modified on 2/14/2013 (rsh).
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION AND ORDER #102911. Based upon the conclusions set forth in this Opinion and Order, the Facebook Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in part on the grounds of standing and ripeness, and the Derivative Plaintiffs' complaints are dismissed. Having dismissed the complaints, Plaintiffs' motions to remand are denied as moot. Derivative Plaintiffs are granted leave to replead within twenty days. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/12/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS (rjm) Modified on 2/14/2013 (rsh).
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: that in consideration of the parties' scheduling stipulations (Docket Nos. 61 and 62) and the pending motions in the instant case, the pre-trial conference scheduled for January 23, 2013 is cancelled. The parties are requested to advise the Court of any pre-trial issues. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(pl)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SCHEDULING STIPULATION AND ORDER: I. Plaintiffs in the NASDAQ Actions shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint on or before February 28, 2013 and plaintiff in the Simon, Tran, and Fleming actions shall file amended complaints, if any, on or before that same day; 2. Defendants shall file any motions to dismiss on or before April 30, 2013; 3. Plaintiffs shall file their papers in opposition to any motions to dismiss on or before June 14, 2013; and 4. Defendants shall file their reply papers on or before July 16, 2013. ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2013., Motions due by 4/30/2013., Responses due by 6/14/2013, Replies due by 7/16/2013.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/18/13) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(pl)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SCHEDULING STIPULATION AND ORDER: WHEREAS, the Court's December 6,2012 Order provided that, prior to the January 23, 2013 pre-trial conference, the parties to the Consolidated Securities Action shall meet and confer with respect to a schedule for filing a consolidated complaint and any attendant motions (see Docket No. 52 at 52); and WHEREAS, the parties to the Consolidated Securities Action have met and conferred in accordance with the Court's December 6 Order; NOW, THEREFORE, the parties to the Consolidated Securities Action hereby stipulate and agree, subject to the Court's approval, that the schedule for filing the consolidated complaint and any motion to dismiss in the Consolidated Securities Action shall be as follows: 1. Lead,Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated complaint on or before February 28,2013; 2. Defendants shall file any motion to dismiss on or before April 30, 2013; 3. Lead Plaintiffs shall file their papers in opposition to any motion to dismiss onor before June 14,2013; and 4. Defendants shall file their reply papers on or before July 16, 2013. ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2013., Motions due by 4/20/2013., Responses due by 6/14/2013, Replies due by 7/16/2013.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ago)
January 10, 2013 Filing 65 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #52 Memorandum & Opinion. (Attachments: #1 Internet Citation) (sj)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SCHEDULING STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, the parties to the Consolidated Securities Action hereby stipulate and agree, subject to the Court's approval, that the schedule for filing the consolidated complaint and any motion to dismiss in the Consolidated Securities Action shall be as follows: 1. Lead Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated complaint on or before February 28, 2013; 2. Defendants shall file any motion to dismiss on or before April 30, 2013; 3. Lead Plaintiffs shall file their papers in opposition to any motion to dismiss on or before June 14, 2013; and 4. Defendants shall file their reply papers on or before July 16, 2013. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2013. Motions due by 4/30/2013. Responses due by 6/14/2013. Replies due by 7/16/2013). (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (djc)
January 4, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Shane Palmesano Sanders on behalf of Khodayar Amin, William Cole, Hal Hubuschman. New Address: Robbins Arroyo LLP, 600 B Street, Suite 1900, San Diego, CA, USA 92101, 619-525-3990. (Sanders, Shane)
January 4, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Felipe J. Arroyo on behalf of Khodayar Amin, William Cole, Hal Hubuschman. New Address: Robbins Arroyo LLP, 600 B Street, Suite 1900, San Diego, CA, USA 92101, 619-525-3990. (Arroyo, Felipe)
January 4, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian James Robbins on behalf of Khodayar Amin, William Cole, Hal Hubuschman. New Address: Robbins Arroyo LLP, 600 B Street, Suite 1900, San Diego, CA, USA 92101, 619-525-3990. (Robbins, Brian)
December 20, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Rebecca M Katz on behalf of Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, KBC Asset Management NV. New Address: Motley Rice LLC, 275 Seventh Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10001, 212-577-0041. (Katz, Rebecca)
December 14, 2012 Filing 56 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-2)... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Texas, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Robert W. Sweet, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/14/2012) (sjo)
December 14, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John James Rizio-Hamilton on behalf of Institutional Investor Group (Rizio-Hamilton, John)
December 14, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven B. Singer on behalf of Institutional Investor Group (Singer, Steven)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSED granting (27) Motion for Mark R. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-04156-RWS; granting (45) Motion for Mark R. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [] Motion for Mark R. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-md-02389-RWS; granting [] Motion for Mark R. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-04156-RWS. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS(cd)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION & ORDER: #102654 Based upon the conclusions set forth above the Securities Actions and the NASDAQ Actions are each separately consolidated. The Institutional Investor Group is appointed lead plaintiff of the Securities Actions and its choice of co lead counsel is approved. The NASDAQ Claimant Group is appointed the lead plaintiff of the NASDAQ Actions and its choice of lead counsel is approved. The NASDAQ Negligence Parties will act as co lead plaintiff of the NASDAQ Actions and its choice of co-lead counsel is approved on a interim basis. The motions of the Eiffel Tower Group and Exchange Act Plaintiffs are denied. The parties will meet and confer with respect to a schedule for filing of consolidated complaints and attendant motions and any other preliminary issues which will be addressed in a pre trial conference at 2PM on January 23, 2013 or such other date and time agreed upon by counsel and the Court. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd) Modified on 12/11/2012 (jab).
December 6, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
December 5, 2012 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Clubok in Support. Document filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook Inc., Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
December 5, 2012 Filing 50 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Threshold Motion to Dismiss Derivative Complaints. Document filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook Inc., Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
December 5, 2012 Filing 49 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by William Cole, Hal Hubuschman. (Sanders, Shane)
December 5, 2012 Filing 48 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Lidia Levy. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 12/4/2012 re: Plaintiffs filed three separate opposition briefs totaling 73 pages. In order to respond to all three of these briefs in one reply brief, Facebook respectfully requests an extension of the page limit to forty pages. We have conferred with counsel for the Derivative Plaintiffs, who do not oppose this request. Relatedly. Plaintiffs Cole and Levy filed separate remand motions. With this Court's permission, Facebook responded with a thirty-five page opposition brief. Plaintiff Cole respectfully requests an extension of the page limit to forty pages for his reply brief. Facebook does not oppose this request ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/5/2012) (js)
December 4, 2012 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Pro Hac Vice served on All Counsel of Record on December 4, 2012. Document filed by Edward Childs. (Rosen, Mark)
December 4, 2012 Filing 45 MOTION for Mark R. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Edward Childs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosen, Mark)
December 4, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #45 MOTION for Mark R. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 11/27/2012 re: Joint request by Facebook and the Derivative Plaintiffs to extend the page limit to 35 pages for Facebook's consolidated remand opposition and to forty pages for opposition to Facebook's consolidated motion to dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/28/2012) (cd) Modified on 12/4/2012 (cd).
November 29, 2012 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Gregory Linkh in Opposition. Document filed by Edward Childs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS(Linkh, Gregory)
November 29, 2012 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Edward Childs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS(Linkh, Gregory)
November 28, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh to RE-FILE Document (24 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 35 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Declaration in Opposition to Motion, (34 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 23 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. ERROR(S): Wrong case number indicated on documents (for civil case). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS(ldi)
November 28, 2012 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by William Cole, Hal Hubuschman. (Sanders, Shane)
November 28, 2012 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Shane P. Sanders in Opposition. Document filed by William Cole, Hal Hubuschman. (Sanders, Shane)
November 28, 2012 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Richard D. Bernstein in Opposition re: (26 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Remand to State Court., (21 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L Andreessen, Facebook Inc., James W. Bryer, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (1 of 2), #5 Exhibit D (2 of 2), #6 Exhibit E (1 of 2), #7 Exhibit E (2 of 2), #8 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
November 28, 2012 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (26 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Remand to State Court., (21 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L Andreessen, Facebook Inc., James W. Bryer, Facebook, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
November 28, 2012 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Joseph P. Guglielmo in Opposition. Document filed by Lidia Levy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 28, 2012 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Nominal Defendant Facebook Inc's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Lidia Levy. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 28, 2012 Filing 35 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Gregory Linkh in Opposition. Document filed by Edward Childs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 11/29/2012 (ldi).
November 28, 2012 Filing 34 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Threshhold Motion to Dismiss the Derivative Complaints Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(`), 12(b)(3), 12(b)(6), and 23.1. Document filed by Edward Childs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 11/29/2012 (ldi).
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: various Plaintiffs' motions to remand will be heard on Wednesday, December 12, 2012, at 10 A.M. Courtroom 18C. The briefing schedule is outlined in Section VII, (B) (ii) of the Practice & Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 dated October 10, 2012. In addition, as set forth in the pre trial conference held at noon on Wednesday, November 7, 2012, a hearing will be held to resolve outstanding issues pertaining to the derivatives actions on Wednesday, December 12, 2012, at 10 A.M. in Courtroom 18C. The briefing schedule is outlined in Section VII, (B) (ii) of the Practice & Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sect. 1407 dated October 10, 2012. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(mt)
November 19, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/7/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 19, 2012 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2012 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 19, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Remand Hearing set for 12/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Status Conference set for 12/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(mt)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Todd Kammerman dated 11/14/2012 re: I, along with Sanford P. Dumain, Lori G. Feldman, and Andrei Rado of Milberg LLP, request to be permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04201-RWS(cd)
November 15, 2012 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Joseph P. Guglielmo in Support re: #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Lidia Levy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 14, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2012 re: motion for appointment for lead counsel held. (cd)
November 14, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph Peter Guglielmo to RE-FILE Document #22 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
November 14, 2012 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by William Cole, Hal Hubuschman. (Sanders, Shane)
November 14, 2012 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Shane P. Sanders in Support re: #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by William Cole, Hal Hubuschman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanders, Shane)
November 14, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by William Cole, Hal Hubuschman.(Sanders, Shane)
November 14, 2012 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Clubok in Support. Document filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook Inc., Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
November 14, 2012 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Threshold Motion to Dismiss Derivative Complaints Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), 12(B)(6), and 23.1. Document filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook Inc., Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
November 14, 2012 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaints Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), 12(B(6), and 23.1. Document filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook Inc., Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2012Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 1:12-cv-07815-RWS(Clubok, Andrew)
November 14, 2012 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Lidia Levy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joseph P. Guglielmo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Guglielmo, Joseph) Modified on 11/15/2012 (ldi).
November 14, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Lidia Levy.(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 11/12/2012 re: Facebook respectfully requests permission to file a forty-page omnibus motion to dismiss the five derivative suits on threshold grounds. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/13/2012) (lmb)
November 13, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Naumon A. Amjed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7969129. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 12, 2012 Filing 19 MOTION for Naumon A. Amjed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7969129. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Amjed, Naumon)
November 12, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas A. Dubbs on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Institutional Investor Group, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (Dubbs, Thomas)
November 12, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James W. Johnson on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Institutional Investor Group, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (Johnson, James)
November 9, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Kessler on behalf of Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd. (Kessler, David)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: As set forth in the pre-trial conference held at noon on Wednesday, November 7, 2012, a hearing will be held to resolve outstanding issues pertaining to the appointment of plaintiffs' lead counsel in the Securities Act actions and the NASDAQ actions on noon on Wednesday, November 14, 2012 in Courtroom 18C. As set forth in the pre-trial conference held at noon on Wednesday, November 7, 2012, a hearing will be held to resolve outstanding issues pertaining to the derivatives actions, including motions to remand1 and will be heard on Wednesday, December 12, 2012, in Courtroom 18C. The briefing schedule is outlined in Section VII, (B) (ii) of the Practice & Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 dated October 10, 2012., ( Status Conference set for 11/14/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(lmb)
November 7, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/7/2012. (ja)
November 7, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Elisabeth Engel on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreesen, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark E. Zuckerberg, Facebook Inc., Mark Zukerburg (sic), David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Marc L Andreessen, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Peter Thiel, James W. Bryer Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Engel, Susan)
November 6, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Walter Stocker on behalf of Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Institutional Investor Group, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (Stocker, Michael)
November 6, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Keller on behalf of Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Institutional Investor Group, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (Keller, Christopher)
November 6, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric James Belfi on behalf of Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Institutional Investor Group, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer (Belfi, Eric)
November 6, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca M Katz on behalf of Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, KBC Asset Management NV (Katz, Rebecca)
November 6, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory M. Egleston on behalf of Lidia Levy (Egleston, Gregory)
November 6, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Peter Guglielmo on behalf of Lidia Levy (Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: As per the Practice and Procedure Order filed on October 10, 2012 and in consideration of the parties' letters to the Court, a pre-trial conference to determine the briefing schedule and resolve the appointment of plaintiffs' lead counsel is set for 11/7/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
November 5, 2012 Filing 6 BRIEF re: (54 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 31 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 22 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 20 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 25 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 2 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 27 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 21 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS) Scheduling Order,,, Designation of Lead Counsel for NASDAQ Negligence Parties. Document filed by Meredith Bailey, Dmitri Bougakov, Ryan Cefalu, Lorrain Chin, Atish Gandhi, Phillip Goldberg, Eric Hamrick, Steve Jarvis, Joe Johnson, Nuhket Kayahan, David Kenton, Dennis Kuhn, Benjamin Levine, Katerhine Loiacono, Crystal McMahon, George Michalitsianos, Randy Teresa Mielke, Jacinto Rivera, Faisal Sami, Sanjeev Sharma, Colin Suzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael McLellan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to McLellan Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to McLellan Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(McLellan, Michael)
November 5, 2012 Filing 5 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: All motions pending as of the date of this Order in any of the actions transferred to this Court by the MDL Panel or removed to this Court are hereby denied without prejudice. Any party may file or refile any motion once liaison and lead counsel are designated and approved. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(lmb)
October 18, 2012 Filing 3 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-1)transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of California and District of Columbia, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Robert W. Sweet, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/18/2012) (sjo)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRACTICE & PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407: This Order shall govern the practice and procedure in those actions transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the "MDL Panel) pursuant to its Order of October 4, 2012, as well as all related actions originally filed in this Court or transferred or removed to this Court. Motions due by 11/14/2012. Responses due by 11/28/2012. Replies due by 12/5/2012. Status Conference set for 12/12/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. All other matters, including various pretrial issues, will be discussed at the initial conference which shall be scheduled once liaison and lead counsel are designated and approved. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ft)
October 4, 2012 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of New York (California and Florida), and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Robert W. Sweet, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/4/2012) (sjo)
October 4, 2012 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of New York (California and Florida), and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Robert W. Sweet, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/4/2012) (sjo)
October 4, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
October 4, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 4, 2012 CASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:12cv-4054 (RWS)1:12-cv-4081(RWS), 1:12-cv-4099(RWS),1:12-cv-4131(RWS),1:12-cv-4150(RWS),1:12-cv-4156(RWS), 1:12-cv-4157(RWS), 1:12-cv-4184(RWS), 1:12-cv-4194(RWS), 1:12-cv-4200(RWS), 1:12-cv-4201(RWS), 1:12-cv-4215(RWS), 1:12-cv-4252(RWS), 1:12-cv-4291(RWS), 1:12-cv-4312(RWS), 1:12-cv-4315(RWS), 1:12-cv-4332(RWS), 1:12-cv-4360(RWS), 1:12-cv-4362(RWS), 1:12-cv-4403(RWS), 1:12-cv-4551(RWS), 1:12-cv-4600(RWS), 1:12-cv-4648(RWS), 1:12-cv-4716(RWS), 1:12-cv-4763(RWS), 1:12-cv-4777(RWS). (sjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Facebook, Inc., IPO Securities and Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William H. Anhood
Represented By: Joy Ann Kruse
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A. Marcus Gerber
Represented By: Rosemary Farrales Luzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Rand
Represented By: John James Rizio-Hamilton
Represented By: Frank Rocco Schirripa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Facebook Investor Group
Represented By: Azra Zahoor Mehdi
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The GAF Unit Trust
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Pompliano
Represented By: Frank Rocco Schirripa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Desmond Doris
Represented By: Frank Rocco Schirripa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eiffel Tower Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands
Represented By: Rebecca M Katz
Represented By: William Stephen Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: White Dune LLC
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randford Williams
Represented By: Frank Rocco Schirripa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: Mark Bernard Salomon
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Represented By: Brant W Bishop, P.C.
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Ashley Littlefield
Represented By: