Rates Technology Inc. v. Broadvox Holding Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rates Technology Inc.
Defendant: ABC Companies, Broadvox Holding Company, LLC and Cypress Communications Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00152
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 OPINION AND ORDER re: 142 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Broadvox Holding Company, LLC, Cypress Communications Operating Company, LLC, 163 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 USC 1927 And The Inherent Power Of The Court Against Defendants And Their Counsel filed by Milton Springut, Scott Spencer, Tal S Benschar, 171 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiff Rates Technology Inc. filed by Broadvox Holding Company, LLC, Cypress Communicatio ns Operating Company, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, Broadvox's motion for attorneys' fees and nontaxable costs against RTI is DENIED and Springut's motion for sanctions is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions [Dkt. Nos. 142, 163, 171]. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/7/2014) Copies Sent by Chambers.(ajs)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 OPINION AND ORDER: For the aforementioned reasons, I construe the disputed terms as follows re 085 Patent, Claim 1 and 769 Patent, Claim 1, and as further set forth in this opinion. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/28/2014) (cd)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Broadvox Holding's motion to dismiss and the motion for sanctions are both denied. RTI's motion for a protective order is moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions [Docket Nos. 30, 57, and 71]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/6/2014) (cd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rates Technology Inc. v. Broadvox Holding Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadvox Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Communications Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rates Technology Inc.
Represented By: Milton Springut
Represented By: Tal S. Benschar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?