Antwi v. FEGS Health and Human Services System
Plaintiff: Beverly Diane Antwi
Defendant: FEGS Health and Human Services System
Case Number: 1:2013cv00835
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is GRANTED. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over her remaining claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3) and therefore dismisses them without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Opinion to Plaintiff, terminate the motion (Doc. 32), and close the case. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/18/2018) (jwh)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMEDNED OPINION AND ORDER re: 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Beverly Diane Antwi and 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Beverly Diane Antwi. Given that Plaintiff has failed to adequately identify undisputed facts in the reco rd, and because she only offers unverified and conclusory assertions in support of her claims, she has failed to carry her burden at this juncture, leaving the Court no choice but to rule against her. Accordingly, the Court DENIES her motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of the instant Amended Opinion and Order to Plaintiff and terminate the pending motion (Docs. 27, 42). (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/15/2014) (kgo)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPINION AND ORDER re: 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Beverly Diane Antwi. Given that Plaintiff has failed to adequately identify undisputed facts in the record, and because she only offers unverified assertions in support of her cla ims, she has failed to carry her burden at this juncture, leaving the Court no choice but to rule against her. Accordingly, the Court DENIES her motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of the instant Opinion and Order to Plaintiff and terminate the pending motion (Doc. 27). (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/11/2014) (kgo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antwi v. FEGS Health and Human Services System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Diane Antwi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEGS Health and Human Services System
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?