Anwar et al v. Executive Transportation Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad N. Mustafa, Shahzad Qureshi, Khurram S. Cheena, Suleman J. Mian, Fiaz Hussain, Imtiaz Sheikh, Mohammad Z. Khan, Paramjit Singh, Esskandan H. Cholam, Shamiq Sohail, Jashim Uddin, Azher Hussain, Farid Ali, Mohammad A. Warraich, Manzoor A Chaudhry, Malik Faisal, Maged Hanna, Mubashar Khan, Muhammad F. Siddiqui, Adnan Ahmad, Yousuf Salehjee, Hamatoun Rafagat, Abdul Rahman, Abdul Khokhar, Atta Ullah, Joseph George, Narenda K. Patel, Afzal Chaudry, Sasheer Malik, Tasawar Hussain, Naeem U. Khan, Zakaullah Niazi, Rizman UR Rahman Khan, Ahmad Munir, Syed S. Haider, Waqar Ahmed, Sukhdev Singh, Mohammad A. Faridi, Zia Khokhar, Naushad Khan, Mubashar Irshad, Chaudhary U. Arshad, Chaudhry Ahmed, Sidander Hajah, Ahmed Alamgir, Mohammad Saeed, Ibrahim Abdelqader, Emel Eskamdar, Ahmet Gungor, Bruce Lopez, Qamar Ali, Iftikhar A Virk, Imran U. Haq, Tariq Farooq, Ashan Ullah, Mian M. Bilal, Suepaul Rampersaud, Mohammad Ashraf, PH Sunil Bandusiri, Willphine Chakkattil, Idrees Khan, Karem Abdelhafez, Saqib H. Chaudhry, Rasheed Ahmed, Bilal Mustafa, Zulfqar A. Virk, Emile Vassor, Afsar Shaikh, Muhammad Sulehria, Khamis Aburmeileh, Durrani A. Salim, Billy Z. Anwar, Sat Lum Don, Mian M. Usman, Syed Qadri, Khurram Shahzad, Iltafat Hussain, Mirza M. Daud, Simon Yablochnik, Taranum Javed, Mian B. Sadiq, Muhammad A. Khan, Muhammad Iqbal, Ishtiaq Ahmed, Shahzad Awan, Dawood Butt, Altaf H. Shahid, Mohammad R. Bhatti, Mehboob Ashraf, Waseem Zafar, Sinna Gnanaraj, Kamran Arif, Willio Mardi, Mustafa Hemeda, Zahid Majid, Pannesheluam Rathan, Muhammad Afzal, Jawad Ihsan, Justin M. Demian, Bkal Malik, Mohammad Aliquraishi, Khalid M. Chohan, Farzaw A. Khan, Ishrat H. Zaidi, Manuel Sanchez, Amer S. Bhatti, Ahmad F. Sheikh, Khawar Shuja, Victor Rodriguez, Nadeem A. Butt, Tom K. Mathew, Fakhar Abass, Hany I. Bishard, Habib Waqar, Safdar Iqbal, Saleem Ashraf, Choudhary A Manzoor, Khurram N. Rao, Khawar M. Shabbir, Tallal Bhatti, Bertrand Choute, Mohammad S. Albrashi, Abdul Waheed, Subhani Zahoor, Mohammad Hafeez, Jorge Verdejo, Muhammad Ali, Irfan A Cheema, Mohammad A. Abdelyou, Mohammad Ayub, Mohammad Chaudhry, Chaudhry-Ijaz N. Farrukh, Shoukat Hassan, Zaheer Ahmed, Hossameid Allakan, Syed Bilgrami, Mohammad A Rana, Zafar I. Chaudhry, Hassaan Gilani, Tarlochan S. Parhar, Mazhar Ahmad, Muhammad Saleem, Mohammad Qacleer, Asif Muhammad, Chaudhary U. Ghaffar, Mahmood Khalid, Muhammad Sajid, Javid A. Mehdi, Ashfaq Ahmed, Khalid Imran, Mohammad S. Butt, Shafi U. Ahmed, Solat Sedid, Imran Ashraf, Wajahat Hussain, Sarwar Naseer, Hamedy Ahmed, Ravinder Singh, Qamar Saeed, Muhammad Arshad, Mudassar Ayub, Joseph Thaiyil, Hassan R. Khan, Sarfraz Ahmed, Nasir Ahmed, Mohammad Darr, Tario Malik, Guluam M. Chodry, Adbul Merchant, Hamayan Mumtaz, Akram Mughal, Nazrul Islam, Asif Raiz, Mian Shahid, Muhammad Anwar, Naseer Malik, Tariq Q. Siddiqui, Mohammad Yousuf, Mohammad M. Cheema, Shaheryar Qureshi, Ahmed Nadeem, Essam Shamron, Sayed N. Raza, Markandu Kirupananthan, Rashad Shuja, Khalid Ahmed, Raza Muhammad, Jean C. Jean-Pierre, Osman Khan, Jim S. Lee, Saifullah Hijazi, Naveed Ahmed, Wai L. Ng, Imran Ahmed, Abbas K. Qaiser, Muhammad A. Shaikh, Ali A. Khan, Muhammad A. Iqbal, Usman O. Sheikh, Chaudry Ahmed, Malik Makhtar, Tariq Wain, Dariusz Kosewski, Naeem Arshad, Gurjeet Singh, Umar Aziz, Hafiz U. Farooq, Muhmmad Cheema, Afzal Ahmad, Ayman Habib, Choudry M. Hussain, Shuab Ahmad, Arfan Syed, Abdelkader Feki, Farhan Mushtaq, Muhammad Assad, Junaid L. Khan, Mohammad M. Virk, Liliana Luna, Jawad Ishan, Ayyaz Ahmad, Salak Nawaz, Magdy S. Guirgis, Muhammad Naveed, Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Adel Michael, Muhammad J. Sugger, Zahur U. Shamid, Salman Durrani, Shahid Majid, Waseem Ahmed, Arif Azi, Urrehman Habib, Ugur Oral, Mohammed J. Choudhary and Shabbir Anjum
Defendant: Bell Radio, Inc., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc., John L. Acierno, III, Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Allen Management Company, L.L.C., One Corporate Car Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., John L. Acierno, Fone-A-Car Management Corp., All City Corporate Car, Citywide Corporate Car, N.Y. Ace Corp., Newport Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, N.Y. One Corporate Car Inc., ETG Green, Summit Corporate Car Inc., Love Corporate Car Inc., Ozocar Transportation of New York, L.L.C. and Jeffrey Acierno
Intervenor Defendant: Ghazi Elreda, Rurik Meurs and Muhammed Akhtar
Case Number: 1:2013cv02666
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' February 2, 2015 letter stating that all distributions under the parties' settlement agreement have been made, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the Court's November 17, 2014 order approving that agreement. See Doc. 134 at paragraph 15. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/3/2015) (mro)
February 3, 2015 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (mro)
February 2, 2015 Filing 136 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Rachel Bien dated February 2, 2015 re: Settlement Distribution. Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem.(Bien, Rachel)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: In light of this Courts November 17, 2014 order approving the parties' settlement agreement, the case management conference scheduled for December 12, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/11/2014) (kgo)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT SETTLEMENT granting #131 Motion for Settlement. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: The Court has determined that the Settlement Agreement satisfies the requirements for settlement approval under federal law. Courts approve FLSA settlements when they are reached as a result of contested litigation to resolve bona fide disputes. The Court also approves the proposed Settlement Notice ("Notice"), with the amendment noted below. The Notice provides sufficient information regarding the terms of the settlement, including the allocation formula, the exclusion process, and the settlement process. The Court awards Plaintiffs' counsel one-third of the settlement fund, $120,000, for their attorneys' fees and reimbursement of $20,000 of their out-of-pocket litigation costs. Within 10 days of this Order, the claims administrator will mail the Notice to the Settlement Participants. The Settlement Participants will have 45 days from the date of the mailing to exclude themselves from the settlement ("Notice Period"). Defendants will deposit $240,000 into the escrow account controlled by the claims administrator 10 days after the end of the Notice Period. The claims administrator will mail Settlement Participants who do not exclude themselves their settlement payments 10 days after the expiration of the Notice Period. The Court retains jurisdiction over this action for purposes of enforcing the Settlement Agreement and overseeing the distribution of the settlement fund. The parties shall abide by all terms of the Settlement Agreement, which are incorporated herein, and this Order. No later than 10 days after the deadline for the distributions described in Paragraph 12 above, the parties shall confirm in a letter to the Court that the distributions have occurred. The Court will then enter an order dismissing the action with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/17/2014) (ama)
November 11, 2014 Filing 133 DECLARATION of Rachel Bien in Support re: #131 MOTION for Settlement For Approval Of Fair Labor Standards Act Settlement.. Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bien, Rachel)
November 11, 2014 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #131 MOTION for Settlement For Approval Of Fair Labor Standards Act Settlement. . Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem. (Bien, Rachel)
November 11, 2014 Filing 131 MOTION for Settlement For Approval Of Fair Labor Standards Act Settlement. Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bien, Rachel)
October 30, 2014 Filing 130 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Rachel Bien dated 10/30/14 re: Motion for Court Approval of Settlement. Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem.(Bien, Rachel)
June 25, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/23/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 25, 2014 Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/23/2014 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 23, 2014 Filing 127 ANSWER to #125 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, All City Corporate Car, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Citywide Corporate Car, ETG Green, Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., N.Y. One Corporate Car Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Newport Corporate Car, Inc., One Corporate Car Inc., Ozocar Transportation of New York, L.L.C., Summit Corporate Car Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc..(Piesco, Joseph)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties hereby dismissed without prejudice the claims of opt-in Plaintiffs Narenda K. Patel; Muhammad Arshad; Manuel Sanchez; and Jorge Verdejo. ECF Nos. 65, 78, 83. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/6/2014) (tro)
June 6, 2014 Filing 125 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #92 Amended Complaint,,, against Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, All City Corporate Car, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Citywide Corporate Car, ETG Green, Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., N.Y. One Corporate Car Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Newport Corporate Car, Inc., One Corporate Car Inc., Ozocar Transportation of New York, L.L.C., Summit Corporate Car Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Iltafat Hussain, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Ahmed Nadeem. Related document: #92 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Salman Durrani, Ahmed Nadeem, Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar.(Bien, Rachel)
May 28, 2014 Filing 124 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #123 Letter, filed by Iltafat Hussain, Salman Durrani, Ahmed Nadeem, Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2014.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/28/2014) (ajs)
May 28, 2014 Filing 123 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Rachel Bien dated May 28, 2014 re: filing of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem.(Bien, Rachel)
May 28, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Pre-Motion Conference held on 5/23/2014. (Court Reporter Kristin Carranante) (Daniels, Anthony)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c).Plaintiffs shall move for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint from the Court on or before May 28, 2014. Responses due by 6/4/2014 Replies due by 6/11/2014. All Discovery due by 12/1/2014. Initial requests for production of documents pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 34, and Interrogatories pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 33, shall be served by June 13, 2014. Deposition due by 12/1/2014. Requests to Admit shall be served no later than November 1, 2014. Motions due by 1/15/2015. This case is to be tried to a jury with respect to all issues so triable. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 14 days. Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The next joint status letter shall be submitted by December 5, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/27/2014) (ama)
May 27, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/28/2014. (ama)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying #108 Motion to Intervene. The Motion to Intervene is denied for the reasons stated on the record on May 23, 2014 following oral argument. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
May 22, 2014 Filing 120 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #108 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Muhammed Akhtar, Ghazi Elreda, Rurik Meurs. (Cardi, Dawn)
May 20, 2014 Filing 119 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Rachel Bien dated May 20, 2014 re: Status Letter in advance of the May 23, 2014 initial conference. Document filed by Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Salman Durrani, Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Iltafat Hussain, Love Corporate Car Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., N.Y. One Corporate Car Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Ahmed Nadeem, Newport Corporate Car, Inc., Summit Corporate Car Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc..(Bien, Rachel)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying #117 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The defendants' May 16, 2014 request is denied. Pursuant to Rule 1(E) of my Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, requests for extensions of time must be made at least two business days prior to the original due date. The parties are directed to submit their proposed case management plan and joint status letter forthwith. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
May 16, 2014 Filing 117 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Case Management Order and Status Letter addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Eric J. Wallach dated May 16, 2014. Document filed by Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., N.Y. One Corporate Car Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Summit Corporate Car Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc..(Wallach, Eric)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re: #108 MOTION to Intervene . filed by Muhammed Akhtar, Rurik Meurs, Ghazi Elreda. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for the plaintiffs and for the proposed intervenor-defendants Ghazi Elreda, Muhammed Akhtar, and Rurik Meurs appear for oral argument on the proposed intervenor-defendants' motion to intervene on May 23, 2014 at 9:30 a.m., immediately prior to the scheduled status conference in this case. The oral argument will be heard in Courtroom 9A of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. ( Oral Argument set for 5/23/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/14/2014) (djc)
May 12, 2014 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Rachel Bien in Opposition re: #108 MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bien, Rachel)
May 12, 2014 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #108 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem. (Bien, Rachel)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #112 Letter,, filed by Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Transportation Systems, Inc., Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, Summit Corporate Car Inc., N.Y. One Corporate Car Inc., One Corporate Car Inc., Love Corporate Car Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., U.S.A. Limo, Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., N.Y. Ace Corp., Allen Management Company, L.L.C., John L. Acierno, III. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The status conference scheduled for May 16, 2014 is adjourned until May 23, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/6/2014) (kgo)
May 6, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/23/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (kgo)
May 5, 2014 Filing 112 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Eric J. Wallach dated 5/5/2014 re: requesting the status conference be adjourned until the following week. Document filed by Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., N.Y. One Corporate Car Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, One Corporate Car Inc., Summit Corporate Car Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc..(Wallach, Eric)
May 1, 2014 Filing 111 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Tariq Q. Siddiqui.(Scimone, Michael)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for a status conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Counsel who appear must be prepared to discuss the merits of the case, argue any motions and discuss any pending discovery issues. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: May 16, 2014 at 11:30 a.m., in Courtroom 9A of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED.( Status Conference set for 5/16/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/28/2014) (ama)
April 28, 2014 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #108 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Muhammed Akhtar, Ghazi Elreda, Rurik Meurs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 1, #3 Exhibit A Part 2, #4 Exhibit A Part 3, #5 Exhibit A Part 4, #6 Exhibit A Part 5, #7 Exhibit A Part 6, #8 Exhibit A Part 7, #9 Exhibit A Part 8, #10 Exhibit A Part 9, #11 Exhibit A Part 10)(Cardi, Dawn)
April 28, 2014 Filing 108 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Ghazi Elreda, Muhammed Akhtar, Rurik Meurs.(Cardi, Dawn)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: This case has been reassigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that this case remains referred to Magistrate Judge Dolinger for settlement purposes, and that any previously imposed deadlines remain in effect. Counsel are directed to review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/21/2014) (ama)
April 16, 2014 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
April 14, 2014 Filing 106 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Eric J. Wallach dated 4/11/2014 re: At the conclusion of the parties' settlement conference with the Court, Defendants indicated that they would try to decide by the end of the day today whether they would accept the current settlement proposal. Due to the upcoming holidays, Defendants respectfully request an additional week, i.e., until April 18, 2014, to make their decision. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/11/2014) (rjm)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a settlement conference has been scheduled in the above-captioned action on WEDNESDAY, APRIL 9, 2014 at 2:30 P.M., at which time you are directed to appear in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007-1312, and as further set forth. (Settlement Conference set for 4/9/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17D, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/1/2014) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (rjm)
March 27, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger: Telephone Conference held on 3/27/2014. (Snell, Kevin)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. The parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Dolinger to schedule a settlement conference by: March 21, 2014. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/20/2014) (cd)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference has been scheduled in the above-captioned action on THURSDAY, MARCH 27, 2014 at 3:00 P.M. (Telephone Conference set for 3/27/2014 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 3/20/2014) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (ajs)
March 17, 2014 Filing 102 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Rachel Bien dated March 17, 2014 re: Settlement Discussions. Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem.(Bien, Rachel)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #100 Letter filed by Executive Transportation Group, Inc. et al. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties' adjournment request is GRANTED. The parties shall submit a joint letter by March 16, 2014, apprising the Court of the status of settlement discussions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/6/2014) (cd)
March 6, 2014 Filing 100 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Eric J. Wallach dated March 6, 2014 re: requesting an additional ten days to pursue settlement discussions and the continued adjournment of pending deadlines. Document filed by Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., N.Y. One Corporate Car Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Summit Corporate Car Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc..(Wallach, Eric)
February 27, 2014 Filing 99 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Dawood Butt.(Scimone, Michael)
February 12, 2014 Filing 98 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C 216(b). Document filed by Tasawar Hussain.(Scimone, Michael)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #96 Letter, filed by Iltafat Hussain, Salman Durrani, Ahmed Nadeem, Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall send a joint status letter to the Court by Friday, March 7, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/07/2014) (ama)
February 6, 2014 Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Rachel Bien dated 02/06/2014 re: Status of settlement discussions. Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem.(Scimone, Michael)
February 4, 2014 Filing 95 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C 216(b). Document filed by Hamedy Ahmed.(Scimone, Michael)
January 22, 2014 Filing 94 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #93 Letter, filed by Iltafat Hussain, Salman Durrani, Ahmed Nadeem, Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar. ENDORSEMENT: The adjournment reqeust is GRANTED. The joint letter and Defendants' anser to the Second Amended Complaint shall both be filed by 2/6/2014. Jeffrey Acierno answer due 2/6/2014; John L. Acierno, III answer due 2/6/2014; John L. Acierno answer due 2/6/2014; Allen Management Company, L.L.C. answer due 2/6/2014; Avalon Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 2/6/2014; Bell Radio, Inc. answer due 2/6/2014; Fone-A-Car Management Corp. answer due 2/6/2014; Love Limousine NYC, Ltd. answer due 2/6/2014; N.Y. Ace Corp. answer due 2/6/2014; Newport Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 2/6/2014; Transportation Systems, Inc. answer due 2/6/2014; U.S.A. Limo, Inc. answer due 2/6/2014. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/22/2014) (cd)
January 22, 2014 Filing 93 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Michael J. Scimone dated January 22, 2014 re: Requesting an Adjournment of Upcoming Deadlines. Document filed by Sheikh Z. Ahmad, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Salman Durrani, Iltafat Hussain, Ahmed Nadeem.(Scimone, Michael)
January 9, 2014 Filing 92 SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT amending #47 Amended Complaint, against Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Newport Corporate Car, Inc., Summit Corporate Car, Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc. with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Iltafat Hussein, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Ahmed Nadeem, Salman Durrani, Sheikh Z. Ahmad. Related document: #47 Amended Complaint, filed by Essam Shamron, Ahmed Nadeem, Muhammad Anwar, Iltafat Hussein. (tn)
January 9, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Megan Bien on behalf of Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Iltafat Hussein, Ahmed Nadeem. (Bien, Rachel)
January 9, 2014 Filing 90 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Khalid Imran, Adbul Merchant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: that the parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court by Friday, January 24, 2014. At a minimum, the letter shall address (i) the parties' proposals for discovery in this case, including a statement as to what discovery Plaintiffs will need to make their motions concerning conditional collective certification and final collective and class certification, and, (ii) if applicable, any intervener motion filed in this matter, including the impact of such a motion on the proposed discovery schedule. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/8/2014) (tn)
January 8, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/8/2014. Counsel for plaintiffs was present. Counsel for the defendants was present. The Court directed the parties to submit a joint letter to the Court concerning their discovery proposals by Friday, 1/24/14. (sc)
January 7, 2014 Filing 88 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Mohammad Z. Khan, Chaudhry-Ijaz N. Farrukh, Nasir Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
December 31, 2013 Filing 87 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Mohammed J. Choudhary.(Scimone, Michael)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO REMOVE ESSAM SHAMRON AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF, TO ADD NEW NAMED PLAINTIFFS SALMAN DURRANI AND SHEIKH Z. AHMAD, AND TO ADD CLAIMS UNDER NEW JERSEY STATE WAGE AND HOUR LAW, N.J.S.A. 34:11-56a et seq.: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED TO AND AGREED, by and among counsel for the parties herein, and it is hereby ORDERED by the Court, that Plaintiff's may amend the Complaint in this action to add named Plaintiffs Salman Durrani and Sheikh Z. Ahmad, to remove Essam Shamron as a named plaintiff, and to plead claims pursuant to New Jersey State Wage And Hour Law,N.J.S.A. 34:11-56a et seq, by filing the Second Amended Complaint attached hereto as Exhibit A. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/23/2013) (ama)
December 20, 2013 Filing 85 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Michael J. Scimone dated December 20, 2013 re: proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, All City Corporate Car, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Muhammad Anwar, Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Citywide Corporate Car, Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Iltafat Hussein, Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Ahmed Nadeem, Newport Corporate Car, Inc., One Corporate Car Inc., Essam Shamron, Summit Corporate Car, Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Case Management Plan, #2 Defendants' Proposed Case Management Plan)(Scimone, Michael)
December 20, 2013 Filing 84 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Michael J. Scimone dated December 20, 2013 re: proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, All City Corporate Car, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Citywide Corporate Car, ETG Green, Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Iltafat Hussein, Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Ahmed Nadeem, Newport Corporate Car, Inc., One Corporate Car Inc., Essam Shamron, Summit Corporate Car, Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Case Management Plan, #2 Defendants' Proposed Case Management Plan)(Scimone, Michael)
December 19, 2013 Filing 83 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jorge Verdejo, Manuel Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #80 Letter, filed by Ahmed Nadeem, Muhammad Anwar, Iltafat Hussein. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request to adjourn the deadline for mediation to January 7, 2014 is GRANTED. The parties shall continue to comply with the Court's Orders -- including those dated August 26, 2013, October 10, 2013, and November 27, 2013 - to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan by December 20, 2013 and appear for an initial conference on January 8, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. SO ORDERED.( Initial Conference set for 1/8/2014 at 01:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/11/2013) (ama)
December 12, 2013 Filing 81 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216. Document filed by Afzal Ahmad, Naveed Ahmed, Mubashar Irshad, Syed Qadri, Malik Makhtar, Mehboob Ashraf, Osman Khan, Ahmad Munir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
December 11, 2013 Filing 80 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Michael Scimone dated December 11, 2013 re: Joint Request for extension of mediation deadline from December 13, 2013 to January 7, 2014. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar, Iltafat Hussein, Ahmed Nadeem.(Scimone, Michael)
December 5, 2013 Filing 79 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Naushad Khan.(Scimone, Michael)
December 3, 2013 Filing 78 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Ishtiaq Ahmed, Muhammad Arshad, Ahmet Gungor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CLAIMS OF OPT-IN PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): NOW, THEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED that the claim of Qureshi is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/26/2013) (ama)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Michael J. Scimone dated 11/26/2013 re: We represent Plaintiffs and the putative class and collective in the above-referenced matter. As previously ordered by the Court, the parties have been engaged in a process of targeted discovery in advance of mediation. Plaintiffs now write jointly with Defendants to request an extension of the deadlines to complete that discovery, to engage in mediation, and to provide the Court with status updates. A proposed revised scheduling order is enclosed with this letter. ENDORSEMENT: Having waited until the day before discovery was to conclude and offering no justification other than unnamed "unforeseen circumstances, "the parties" request for a further extension of the discovery deadlines in this action is DENIED. The parties shall comply with the deadlines in the Court's October 10, 2013 Order, including by appearing for an initial conference on January 8, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 1/8/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/26/2013) (ama)
November 27, 2013 Filing 75 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Justin M. Demian.(Scimone, Michael)
November 25, 2013 Filing 74 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Paramjit Singh, Jasawar Hussain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael) Modified on 2/19/2014 (db).
November 22, 2013 Filing 73 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b),. Document filed by Mohammad Ashraf.(Scimone, Michael)
November 19, 2013 Filing 72 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b),. Document filed by Khurram Shahzad, Chaudry Ahmed, Ravinder Singh, Arif Azi, Afzal Chaudry, Sukhdev Singh, Ugur Oral, Farid Ali, Irfan A Cheema, Iftikhar A Virk, Mubashar Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
November 15, 2013 Filing 71 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Muhammad Sajid, Sarwar Naseer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
October 28, 2013 Filing 70 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Choudry M. Hussain, Safdar Iqbal, Muhammad N. Mustafa, Mohammad M. Virk, Zulfqar A. Virk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
October 23, 2013 Filing 69 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Guluam M. Chodry, Rizman UR Rahman Khan, Imtiaz Sheikh, Muhammad Sulehria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER: Regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. See Attached Addendum.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/18/2013) (ama)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER:All Discovery due by 11/27/2013. Status Conference reset for 1/18/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/10/2013) (cd)
October 8, 2013 Filing 66 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Mazhar Ahmad, Hossameid Allakan, Muhammad Assad, Mudassar Ayub, Esskandan H. Cholam, Hafiz U. Farooq, Chaudhary U. Ghaffar, Hassan R. Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
September 26, 2013 Filing 65 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Junaid L. Khan, Dariusz Kosewski, Bilal Mustafa, Narenda K. Patel, Emile Vassor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
September 20, 2013 Filing 64 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Sat Lum Don.(Scimone, Michael)
September 13, 2013 Filing 63 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Hamatoun Rafagat, Yousuf Salehjee, Mohammad A. Warraich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
September 11, 2013 Filing 62 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Chaudhry Ahmed, Jashim Uddin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 61 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Rashad Shuja, Idrees Khan, Khawar Shuja, Amer S. Bhatti, Waseem Zafar, Liliana Luna, Muhammad Saleem, Jawad Ishan, Joseph Thaiyil, Jawad Ihsan, Mian M. Bilal, Mohammad Saeed, Saleem Ashraf, Bertrand Choute, Abdul Khokhar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
September 5, 2013 Filing 60 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Shuab Ahmad, Jean C. Jean-Pierre, Muhammad A. Khan, Markandu Kirupananthan, Wai L. Ng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
September 4, 2013 Filing 59 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Pannesheluam Rathan, Sinna Gnanaraj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
September 3, 2013 Filing 58 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jim S. Lee, Mohammad S. Albrashi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
August 26, 2013 Filing 57 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Khamis Aburmeileh, Shabbir Anjum, Shahzad Awan, Joseph George, Azher Hussain, Willio Mardi, Javid A. Mehdi, Suleman J. Mian, Akram Mughal, Sayed N. Raza, Asif Raiz, Mian Shahid, Muhammad F. Siddiqui, Atta Ullah, Mian M. Usman, Zaheer Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the attached letter from the parties, dated August 21, 2013, concerning their agreement to conduct targeted discovery and participate in a mediation by November 14, 2013. The parties also submitted a Stipulation and Proposed Order (the "Order") along with the letter reflecting the terms to which they have agreed. The Court finds the plan and terms proposed by the parties to be reasonable. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Order, which is attached hereto, shall be implemented by the parties, but with the following amendments. First, in the event that the parties reach a settlement of this matter, the parties shall contact the Court for approval of the settlement, not Magistrate Judge Dollinger. Second, in light of the discovery plan set forth in the Order, the Court finds that the initial conference scheduled for September 3, 2013 is unnecessary and therefore this conference shall be cancelled. Third, unless the case has settled, the parties shall appear for a status conference on December 4, 2013 at 1 :00 p.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. In advance of the conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter, not to exceed five pages, as well as a proposed case management plan and scheduling order on or before November 21, 2013. ( Status Conference set for 12/4/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/26/2013) (djc) Modified on 8/26/2013 (djc).
August 23, 2013 Filing 55 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Mohammad A. Abdelyou, Ibrahim Abdelqader, Waseem Ahmed, Tariq Farooq, Abdelkader Feki, Hassaan Gilani, Fiaz Hussain, Zia Khokhar, Naseer Malik, Sasheer Malik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
August 15, 2013 Filing 54 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Mohammad Z. Khan.(Scimone, Michael)
August 13, 2013 Filing 53 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Ashfaq Ahmed, Sarfraz Ahmed, Imran Ashraf, Salak Nawaz, Solat Sedid, Mohammad S. Butt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
August 8, 2013 Filing 52 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Ayyaz Ahmad, Rasheed Ahmed, Waqar Ahmed, Mohammad Ayub, Khurram S. Cheena, Malik Faisal, Habib Waqar, Taranum Javed, Raza Muhammad, Hamayan Mumtaz, Shahzad Qureshi, Gurjeet Singh, Zakaullah Niazi, Hany I. Bishard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
August 8, 2013 Filing 51 ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Newport Corporate Car, Inc., Summit Corporate Car, Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc..(Wallach, Eric)
August 8, 2013 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent N.Y. Bell Car Corp. for Bell Radio, Inc.; Corporate Parent Charter Acquisition LLC for Allen Management Company, L.L.C.. Document filed by Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., N.Y. Ace Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car Management LLC, Newport Corporate Car, Inc., Summit Corporate Car, Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc..(Wallach, Eric)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Eric J. Wallach dated 7/29/2013 re: We therefore request that, if possible, the initial conference be adjourned to September 3, 9 or 12. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the initial conference, originally scheduled for August 28, 2013, shall instead be held on September 3, 2013 at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 905 of The Thurgood Marshall Courthouse. The deadline for submitting a joint letter and case management plan shall remain August 21, 2013. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 9/3/2013 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/30/2013) (ama)
July 29, 2013 Filing 48 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Khalid Ahmed, Mohammad M. Cheema, Muhmmad Cheema, Shoukat Hassan, Durrani A. Salim, Muhammad J. Sugger, Abbas K. Qaiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
July 25, 2013 Filing 47 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., NYC Green Car, Summit Corporate Car, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc., Transportation Systems, Inc., One Corporate Car Inc., N.Y. Ace Corp., Newport Corporate Car, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Essam Shamron, Muhammad Anwar, Muhammad Anwar(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Ahmed Nadeem, Iltafat Hussein. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Essam Shamron, Ahmed Nadeem, Muhammad Anwar, Iltafat Hussein.(cd)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Eric J. Wallach dated 7/19/2013 re: We write on behalf of certain of the individual and corporate defendants (the "ETG Defendants") and the plaintiffs. We jointly request a two week adjournment of all of the deadlines in the above-referenced matter so that the parties may continue to pursue these discussions. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all Defendants remaining in the case shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before August 5, 2013. The initial conference in this matter shall be held on Wednesday, August 28, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 905 at 40 Square. The parties shall submit their case management plan and joint letter on or before August 21, 2013., Jeffrey Acierno answer due 8/5/2013; John L. Acierno, III answer due 8/5/2013; John L. Acierno answer due 8/5/2013; Allen Management Company, L.L.C. answer due 8/5/2013; Avalon Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 8/5/2013; Bell Radio, Inc. answer due 8/5/2013; Executive Transportation Group, Inc. answer due 8/5/2013; Fone-A-Car Management Corp. answer due 8/5/2013; Love Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 8/5/2013; Love Limousine NYC, Ltd. answer due 8/5/2013; NY One Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 8/5/2013; NYC Green Car answer due 8/5/2013; Usman O. Sheikh answer due 8/5/2013; Summit Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 8/5/2013; U.S.A. Limo, Inc. answer due 8/5/2013.( Initial Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/23/2013) (ama)
July 24, 2013 Filing 45 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216. Document filed by Fakhar Abass, Muhammad Afzal, Adnan Ahmad, Shafi U. Ahmed, Qamar Ali, Mohammad Aliquraishi, Muhammad Anwar, Billy Z. Anwar, Kamran Arif, Chaudhary U. Arshad, Mohammad R. Bhatti, Tallal Bhatti, Nadeem A. Butt, Mohammad Chaudhry, Saqib H. Chaudhry, Zafar I. Chaudhry, Mohammad Darr, Mirza M. Daud, Emel Eskamdar, Magdy S. Guirgis, Urrehman Habib, Ayman Habib, Syed S. Haider, Sidander Hajah, Maged Hanna, Imran U. Haq, Mustafa Hemeda, Muhammad A. Iqbal, Muhammad Iqbal, Farzaw A. Khan, Ali A. Khan, Naeem U. Khan, Bruce Lopez, Shahid Majid, Zahid Majid, Bkal Malik, Tario Malik, Adel Michael, Asif Muhammad, Farhan Mushtaq, Muhammad Naveed, Mohammad Qacleer, Shaheryar Qureshi, Abdul Rahman, Khurram N. Rao, Victor Rodriguez, Qamar Saeed, Khawar M. Shabbir, Altaf H. Shahid, Muhammad A. Shaikh, Zahur U. Shamid, Usman O. Sheikh, Shamiq Sohail, Arfan Syed, Abdul Waheed, Tariq Wain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Scimone, Michael)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Plaintiffs hereby give notice of their voluntary dismissal without prejudice of Defendants Ozocar Transportation of New York LLC, All City Corporate Car, Citywide Corporate Car, and ETG Green, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendants have not filed an answer or other responsive pleading as of this time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/23/2013) (rsh)
July 23, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Michael Scimone Document #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Richard J. Sullivan for approval. (jno)
July 22, 2013 Filing 43 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All City Corporate Car, Citywide Corporate Car, ETG Green, Ozocar Transportation of New York, L.L.C.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Scimone, Michael) Modified on 7/23/2013 (jno).
July 22, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wayne Ian Baden on behalf of Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., ETG Green, Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., NY Ace Car Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car, Summit Corporate Car, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc.. (Baden, Wayne)
July 19, 2013 Filing 41 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by PH Sunil Bandusiri.(Scimone, Michael)
July 16, 2013 Filing 40 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Umar Aziz.(Scimone, Michael)
July 9, 2013 Filing 39 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Khalid M. Chohan, Mohammad A. Faridi, Tarlochan S. Parhar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
July 3, 2013 Filing 38 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Mohammad Yousuf.(Scimone, Michael)
July 1, 2013 Filing 37 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216. Document filed by Imran Ahmed, Mahmood Khalid, Muhammad A. Khan, Ashan Ullah, Subhani Zahoor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
June 14, 2013 Filing 36 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO CLASS & COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT: the parties stipulate and agree that the time for the ETG Defendants to answer the complaint be further extended to 7/22/2013. Jeffrey Acierno answer due 7/22/2013; John L. Acierno, III answer due 7/22/2013; John L. Acierno answer due 7/22/2013; Allen Management Company, L.L.C. answer due 7/22/2013; Avalon Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 7/22/2013; Bell Radio, Inc. answer due 7/22/2013; Executive Transportation Group, Inc. answer due 7/22/2013; Fone-A-Car Management Corp. answer due 7/22/2013; Love Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 7/22/2013; Love Limousine NYC, Ltd. answer due 7/22/2013; NY Ace Car Corp. answer due 7/22/2013; NY One Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 7/22/2013; NYC Green Car answer due 7/22/2013; Summit Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 7/22/2013. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/14/2013) (cd)
May 30, 2013 Filing 35 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216. Document filed by Karem Abdelhafez, Muhammad Ali, Naeem Arshad, Syed Bilgrami, Willphine Chakkattil, Mohammad Hafeez, Saifullah Hijazi, Wajahat Hussain, Tom K. Mathew, Suepaul Rampersaud, Afsar Shaikh, Ahmad F. Sheikh, Simon Yablochnik, Ishrat H. Zaidi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scimone, Michael)
May 28, 2013 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by All City Corporate Car.(Capetanakis, Charles)
May 28, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Capetanakis on behalf of All City Corporate Car (Capetanakis, Charles)
May 24, 2013 Filing 32 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO CLASS & COLLECTVIE ACTION COMPLAINT: The time for Defendant All City Corporate Car to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint shall be further extended to 7/22/2013. All City Corporate Car answer due 7/22/2013. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/23/2013) (tro)
May 23, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Capetanakis on behalf of All City Corporate Car (Capetanakis, Charles)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO CLASS & COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT: Plaintiffs, by and through their undersigned counsel, Outten & Golden LLP and Kahn Opton, LLP, consent that the time for ETG Defendants to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint be further extended to June 21, 2013. SO ORDERED. Jeffrey Acierno answer due 6/21/2013; John L. Acierno, III answer due 6/21/2013; John L. Acierno answer due 6/21/2013; Allen Management Company, L.L.C. answer due 6/21/2013; Avalon Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 6/21/2013; Bell Radio, Inc. answer due 6/21/2013; Executive Transportation Group, Inc. answer due 6/21/2013; Fone-A-Car Management Corp. answer due 6/21/2013; Love Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 6/21/2013; Love Limousine NYC, Ltd. answer due 6/21/2013; NY Ace Car Corp. answer due 6/21/2013; NY One Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 6/21/2013; NYC Green Car answer due 6/21/2013; Summit Corporate Car, Inc. answer due 6/21/2013; U.S.A. Limo, Inc. answer due 6/21/2013. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/21/2013) (ama)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO CLASS & COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT: Plaintiffs, by and through their undersigned counsel, Outten & Golden LLP and Kahn Opton, LLP, consent that the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint be further extended to July 22, 2013. SO ORDERED. Ozocar Transportation of New York, L.L.C. answer due 7/22/2013. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/21/2013) (ama)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The parties are HEREBY ORDERED to appear for a status conference on Friday, August 2, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 905 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by July 22, 2013, the parties shall jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by Tuesday, July 22, 2013, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. SO ORDERED.( Status Conference set for 8/2/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/22/2013) (ama)
May 21, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elisheva Miriam Hirshman on behalf of Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., NY Ace Car Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car, Summit Corporate Car, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc. (Hirshman, Elisheva)
May 21, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph A. Piesco on behalf of Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., NY Ace Car Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car, Summit Corporate Car, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc. (Piesco, Joseph)
May 21, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric J. Wallach on behalf of Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., NY Ace Car Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car, Summit Corporate Car, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc. (Wallach, Eric)
May 17, 2013 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Fone-A-Car Management Corp. served on 5/16/2013, answer due 6/6/2013. Service was accepted by Randall Eng, Senior Manager. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 17, 2013 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Citywide Corporate Car served on 5/16/2013, answer due 6/6/2013. Service was accepted by Randall Eng, Senior Manager. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 17, 2013 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Jeffrey Acierno served on 5/10/2013, answer due 5/31/2013. Service was accepted by Jeffrey Acierno. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 14, 2013 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Mian B. Sadiq.(Klein, Adam)
May 14, 2013 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Service was accepted by Maria Acierno, Family Member. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar, Ahmed Nadeem, Essam Shamron, Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 14, 2013 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. John L. Acierno, III served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Maria Acierno, Family Member. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 14, 2013 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. John L. Acierno served on 5/2/2010, answer due 5/23/2010. Service was accepted by Maria Acierno, Family Member. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam) Modified on 5/23/2013 (db).
May 13, 2013 Filing 17 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A., 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Ahmed Alamgir, Manzoor A Chaudhry, Nazrul Islam, Choudhary A Manzoor, Mohammad A Rana, Mian B Sadio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klein, Adam)
May 8, 2013 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. NY Ace Car Corp. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. U.S.A. Limo, Inc. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Summit Corporate Car, Inc. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. NYC Green Car served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. NY One Corporate Car, Inc. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Love Limousine NYC, Ltd. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Love Corporate Car, Inc. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Executive Transportation Group, Inc. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. ETG Green served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Bell Radio, Inc. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Avalon Corporate Car, Inc. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Allen Management Company, L.L.C. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 7, 2013 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. All City Corporate Car served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Scott Harwood, Vice President. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
May 6, 2013 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Ozocar Transportation of New York, L.L.C. served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by Bernadine Huang. Document filed by Muhammad Anwar; Ahmed Nadeem; Essam Shamron; Iltafat Hussein. (Klein, Adam)
April 26, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen H. Kahn on behalf of Muhammad Anwar, Iltafat Hussein, Ahmed Nadeem, Essam Shamron (Kahn, Stephen)
April 23, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, All City Corporate Car, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Citywide Corporate Car, ETG Green, Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., NY Ace Car Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car, Ozocar Transportation of New York, L.L.C., Summit Corporate Car, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1065725)Document filed by Muhammad Anwar, Ahmed Nadeem, Essam Shamron, Iltafat Hussein.(laq) (cde).
April 23, 2013 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Acierno, John L. Acierno, III, John L. Acierno, All City Corporate Car, Allen Management Company, L.L.C., Avalon Corporate Car, Inc., Bell Radio, Inc., Citywide Corporate Car, ETG Green, Executive Transportation Group, Inc., Fone-A-Car Management Corp., Love Corporate Car, Inc., Love Limousine NYC, Ltd., NY Ace Car Corp., NY One Corporate Car, Inc., NYC Green Car, Ozocar Transportation of New York, L.L.C., Summit Corporate Car, Inc., U.S.A. Limo, Inc.. (laq)
April 23, 2013 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
April 23, 2013 Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (laq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anwar et al v. Executive Transportation Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad N. Mustafa
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahzad Qureshi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khurram S. Cheena
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suleman J. Mian
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiaz Hussain
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imtiaz Sheikh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Z. Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramjit Singh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esskandan H. Cholam
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamiq Sohail
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jashim Uddin
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azher Hussain
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farid Ali
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad A. Warraich
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manzoor A Chaudhry
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Faisal
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maged Hanna
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mubashar Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad F. Siddiqui
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adnan Ahmad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yousuf Salehjee
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamatoun Rafagat
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Rahman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Khokhar
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atta Ullah
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph George
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narenda K. Patel
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afzal Chaudry
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sasheer Malik
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasawar Hussain
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naeem U. Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zakaullah Niazi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rizman UR Rahman Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Munir
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed S. Haider
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waqar Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukhdev Singh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad A. Faridi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zia Khokhar
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naushad Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mubashar Irshad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaudhary U. Arshad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaudhry Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidander Hajah
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Alamgir
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Saeed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Abdelqader
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emel Eskamdar
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmet Gungor
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lopez
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qamar Ali
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iftikhar A Virk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imran U. Haq
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tariq Farooq
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashan Ullah
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mian M. Bilal
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suepaul Rampersaud
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Ashraf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PH Sunil Bandusiri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willphine Chakkattil
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idrees Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karem Abdelhafez
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saqib H. Chaudhry
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheed Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilal Mustafa
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zulfqar A. Virk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emile Vassor
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afsar Shaikh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Sulehria
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khamis Aburmeileh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durrani A. Salim
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Z. Anwar
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sat Lum Don
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mian M. Usman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Qadri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khurram Shahzad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iltafat Hussain
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Represented By: Stephen H. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirza M. Daud
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Yablochnik
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taranum Javed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mian B. Sadiq
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad A. Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Iqbal
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishtiaq Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahzad Awan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawood Butt
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altaf H. Shahid
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad R. Bhatti
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehboob Ashraf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waseem Zafar
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinna Gnanaraj
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamran Arif
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willio Mardi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa Hemeda
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahid Majid
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pannesheluam Rathan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Afzal
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawad Ihsan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin M. Demian
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bkal Malik
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Aliquraishi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid M. Chohan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farzaw A. Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishrat H. Zaidi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Sanchez
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amer S. Bhatti
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad F. Sheikh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khawar Shuja
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadeem A. Butt
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom K. Mathew
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fakhar Abass
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hany I. Bishard
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Habib Waqar
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safdar Iqbal
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saleem Ashraf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choudhary A Manzoor
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khurram N. Rao
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khawar M. Shabbir
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tallal Bhatti
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertrand Choute
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad S. Albrashi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Waheed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subhani Zahoor
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Hafeez
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Verdejo
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Ali
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irfan A Cheema
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad A. Abdelyou
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Ayub
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Chaudhry
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaudhry-Ijaz N. Farrukh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoukat Hassan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaheer Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hossameid Allakan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Bilgrami
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad A Rana
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zafar I. Chaudhry
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassaan Gilani
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarlochan S. Parhar
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazhar Ahmad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Saleem
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Qacleer
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asif Muhammad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaudhary U. Ghaffar
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmood Khalid
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Sajid
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javid A. Mehdi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashfaq Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid Imran
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad S. Butt
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shafi U. Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solat Sedid
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imran Ashraf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wajahat Hussain
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarwar Naseer
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamedy Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravinder Singh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qamar Saeed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Arshad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mudassar Ayub
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thaiyil
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan R. Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarfraz Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasir Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Darr
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tario Malik
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guluam M. Chodry
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adbul Merchant
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamayan Mumtaz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akram Mughal
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazrul Islam
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asif Raiz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mian Shahid
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Anwar
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Represented By: Stephen H. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naseer Malik
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tariq Q. Siddiqui
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Yousuf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad M. Cheema
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaheryar Qureshi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Nadeem
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Represented By: Stephen H. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essam Shamron
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Represented By: Stephen H. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayed N. Raza
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markandu Kirupananthan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashad Shuja
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raza Muhammad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean C. Jean-Pierre
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osman Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim S. Lee
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saifullah Hijazi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naveed Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wai L. Ng
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imran Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbas K. Qaiser
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad A. Shaikh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali A. Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad A. Iqbal
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Usman O. Sheikh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaudry Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Makhtar
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tariq Wain
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dariusz Kosewski
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naeem Arshad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurjeet Singh
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umar Aziz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hafiz U. Farooq
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhmmad Cheema
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afzal Ahmad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayman Habib
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choudry M. Hussain
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuab Ahmad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arfan Syed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdelkader Feki
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farhan Mushtaq
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Assad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junaid L. Khan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad M. Virk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Luna
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawad Ishan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayyaz Ahmad
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salak Nawaz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdy S. Guirgis
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Naveed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheikh Z. Ahmad
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Represented By: Stephen H. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adel Michael
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad J. Sugger
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahur U. Shamid
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salman Durrani
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Represented By: Stephen H. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahid Majid
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waseem Ahmed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arif Azi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urrehman Habib
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ugur Oral
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed J. Choudhary
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shabbir Anjum
Represented By: Michael Joseph Scimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Radio, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Corporate Car, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.A. Limo, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Acierno, III
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Transportation Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Management Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Corporate Car Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Limousine NYC, Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Acierno
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fone-A-Car Management Corp.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All City Corporate Car
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Charles Capetanakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citywide Corporate Car
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.Y. Ace Corp.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Corporate Car, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Green Car Management LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.Y. One Corporate Car Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETG Green
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Corporate Car Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Corporate Car Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozocar Transportation of New York, L.L.C.
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Acierno
Represented By: Joseph A. Piesco
Represented By: Elisheva Miriam Hirshman
Represented By: Wayne Ian Baden
Represented By: Eric J. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Ghazi Elreda
Represented By: Dawn Marcella Cardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Rurik Meurs
Represented By: Dawn Marcella Cardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Muhammed Akhtar
Represented By: Dawn Marcella Cardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?