Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd. v. Griffith et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Hall and Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.
Defendant: Rupert Dorey, David Jeffreys, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, TFG Investment Manager, Polygon Management LP, Patrick Dear, David Wishnow, Polygon Global Partners LP, Polygon Global Partners LLP, Michael Rosenberg, Greville V.B. Ward, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd. and Jeff Herlyn
Nominal Defendant: Tetragon Financial Group Limited
Case Number: 1:2013cv04202
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Richard J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2014 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (jno)
August 11, 2014 Filing 105 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated August 7, 2014, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted and all of Plaintiffs' non-federal claims are dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 8/11/2014) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)(jno)
August 7, 2014 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #104 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (cd)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 OPINION AND ORDER re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiffs have failed to state a claim under the IAA. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' federal claim is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT all of Plaintiffs' non-federal claims are dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate all motions and close this case. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/7/2014) (cd) Modified on 9/11/2014 (tp).
June 18, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/23/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 18, 2014 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/23/2014 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sabrina D'Emidio, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 5, 2014 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #103 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (mt)
June 5, 2014 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #102 TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (mt)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Joseph McLaughlin, William G. McGuiness, Herbert M. Wachtell, and Karin A. DeMasi dated 5/30/2014 re: Errors found in transcript to be rectified by the court reporter. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/30/2014) (cd)
May 23, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Oral Argument was held on 5/23/2014 re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint. filed by David Wishnow, Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, David Jeffreys, Jeff Herlyn, Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Reade Griffith, Greville V.B. Ward, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC. Defense counsel Karin DeMasi, Noah Liebowitz, Joseph McLaughlin, Herbert Wachtell, and Bradley Wilson were present. Plaintiff counsel Randall Baron, A. Rick Atwood, Brian Cochran, and Darren Robbins were present. The Court heard argument from the parties. The Court reserved. (sc)
May 21, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE of English Translation of Article 45 of the Dutch Securities Act re: #82 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, English Translation)(Baron, Randall)
May 16, 2014 Filing 99 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's May 8, 2014 Order. Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Baron, Randall)
May 16, 2014 Filing 98 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint. . Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, no later than May 16, 2014, the parties shall each submit supplemental briefing, not to exceed 10-pages double-spaced, addressing whether the Amended Complaint states a claim under 215(b) of the IAA. The parties shall also be prepared to discuss this issue at oral argument on May 23, 2014. (Brief due by 5/16/2014.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/8/2014) (tro)
April 11, 2014 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Papers in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss served on Plaintiffs on 4/11/2014. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Mock, Jasand)
April 11, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Supplemental Compendium of Foreign Authorities re: #90 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Attachments: #1 Tab 37, #2 Tab 38, #3 Tab 39, #4 Tab 40, #5 Tab 41, #6 Tab 42, #7 Tab 43, #8 Tab 44, #9 Tab 45, #10 Tab 46, #11 Tab 47, #12 Tab 48, #13 Tab 49, #14 Tab 50, #15 Tab 51)(Wachtell, Herbert)
April 11, 2014 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Scott M. Danner in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 76, #2 Exhibit 77, #3 Exhibit 78, #4 Exhibit 79, #5 Exhibit 80, #6 Exhibit 81, #7 Exhibit 82, #8 Exhibit 83, #9 Exhibit 84, #10 Exhibit 85, #11 Exhibit 86)(Wachtell, Herbert)
April 11, 2014 Filing 93 DECLARATION of Scott M. Danner in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
April 11, 2014 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Alan Merrien in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
April 11, 2014 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Richard Snowden QC in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
April 11, 2014 Filing 90 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #88 Letter, filed by David Wishnow, Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, David Jeffreys, Jeff Herlyn, Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Reade Griffith, Greville V.B. Ward, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants may submit a single 20-page reply brief addressing all of their arguments. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' request to submit three additional declarations and one transmittal declaration is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Court will inform the parties if it determines that a sur-reply or additional declarations are necessary. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/24/2014) (ajs)
March 18, 2014 Filing 88 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Bradley R. Wilson dated 3/18/2014 re: Omega Overseas Partners Ltd. v. Griffith, 13-cv-4202 (RJS). Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow.(Wilson, Bradley)
March 14, 2014 Filing 87 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Brian E. Cochran [con't] in Opposition re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40, #11 Exhibit 41, #12 Exhibit 42, #13 Exhibit 43, #14 Exhibit 44, #15 Exhibit 45, #16 Exhibit 46, #17 Exhibit 47, #18 Exhibit 48, #19 Exhibit 49, #20 Exhibit 50, #21 Exhibit 51, #22 Exhibit 52, #23 Exhibit 53, #24 Exhibit 54, #25 Exhibit 55, #26 Exhibit 56, #27 Exhibit 57, #28 Exhibit 58, #29 Exhibit 59, #30 Exhibit 60, #31 Exhibit 61)(Baron, Randall) Modified on 3/17/2014 (db).
March 14, 2014 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Brian E. Cochran in Opposition re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30)(Baron, Randall)
March 14, 2014 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Professor Marcelle Arak in Opposition re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Baron, Randall)
March 14, 2014 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Andrew Douglas Laws in Opposition re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Baron, Randall)
March 14, 2014 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Benedict John Wakelin Hubble QC in Opposition re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Baron, Randall)
March 14, 2014 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Baron, Randall)
March 12, 2014 Filing 81 MOTION for David Wissbroecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment: Certificate of Good Standing)(Reich, Mark)
March 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #81 MOTION for David Wissbroecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-9440688, paid on 3/11/2014. (wb)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON ORAL MOTION. Attorney David T. Wissbroecker for Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd. admitted Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Counsel shall immediately forward the Pro Hae Vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/11/2014) (cd)
March 11, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Samuel Reich on behalf of Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Reich, Mark)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re: #77 Letter, filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs'request to compel Defendants to produce documents on the issue of personal jurisdiction beyond what Defendants offer to provide in the joint letter (Doc. No. 77 at 4) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' request to compel discovery on forum non conveniens beyond interrogatories is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants need not make anyone available for a deposition on the issue of forum non conveniens, provided, however, that if Defendants choose not make an individual available for a deposition on this issue, the Court will not consider any affidavits or declarations submitted by that individual on this issue. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/3/2014) (cd)
February 28, 2014 Filing 77 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Randall J. Baron dated 02/28/14 re: discovery dispute. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised discovery requests)(Baron, Randall)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' motion is denied to the extent that it seeks discovery on any merits issues. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall amend their discovery request to comply with this Order. To the extent any disputes on these issues remain, the parties shall submit a joint letter addressing those disputes no later than February 28, 2014. If, after considering the evidence submitted in support of and in opposition to the motion to dismiss, the Court finds that Plaintiffs have established a genuine issue of material fact as to the existence of personal jurisdiction, and if at that point Defendants still wish to contest the issue, Defendants may then seek an evidentiary hearing to determine whether Plaintiff has proven by a preponderance of the evidence that personal jurisdiction exists. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/25/2014) (cd)
February 20, 2014 Filing 75 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Randall J. Baron dated 02/20/14 re: Discovery dispute. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery requests)(Baron, Randall)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re: #72 Letter filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd., #73 Letter, filed by David Wishnow, Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, David Jeffreys, Jeff Herlyn, Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Reade Griffith, Greville V.B. Ward, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, to allow for limited discovery, the deadline for Plaintiffs' opposition memorandum is adjourned to 3/14/2014. Defendants shall submit their reply memoranda no later than 4/11/2014. No further extensions will be permitted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for oral argument on these motions on 5/23/2014 at 2:00 p.m. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #72 Letter, #73 Letter, #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint: (Responses due by 3/14/2014, Replies due by 4/11/2014.), ( Oral Argument set for 5/23/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/4/2014) (tro)
February 3, 2014 Filing 73 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Bradley R. Wilson dated 2/03/2014 re: Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd. v. Griffith, 13-cv-4202 (RJS). Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow.(Wilson, Bradley)
January 31, 2014 Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Randall J. Baron dated 01/31/2014 re: Extension of time to file Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd..(Baron, Randall)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: For the forgoing reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants' request to compel is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/27/2014) (cd)
January 13, 2014 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion Papers served on Plaintiffs on 1/13/2014. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Mock, Jasand)
January 13, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Compendium of Foreign Authorities - Volume Two re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Attachments: #1 Tab 21, #2 Tab 22, #3 Tab 23, #4 Tab 24, #5 Tab 25, #6 Tab 26, #7 Tab 27, #8 Tab 28, #9 Tab 29, #10 Tab 30, #11 Tab 31, #12 Tab 32, #13 Tab 33, #14 Tab 34, #15 Tab 35, #16 Tab 36)(Wachtell, Herbert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Compendium of Foreign Authorities - Volume One re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Attachments: #1 Tab 1, #2 Tab 2, #3 Tab 3, #4 Tab 4, #5 Tab 5, #6 Tab 6, #7 Tab 7, #8 Tab 8, #9 Tab 9, #10 Tab 10, #11 Tab 11, #12 Tab 12, #13 Tab 13, #14 Tab 14, #15 Tab 15, #16 Tab 16, #17 Tab 17, #18 Tab 18, #19 Tab 19, #20 Tab 20)(Wachtell, Herbert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Scott M. Danner in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75)(Wachtell, Herbert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Alan Merrien in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Richard Snowden QC in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Attachments: #1 Annex A)(Wachtell, Herbert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Philip Bland in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 63 DECLARATION of David Jeffreys in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Rupert Onesimus Dorey in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. Responses due by 2/17/2014(Wachtell, Herbert)
January 6, 2014 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Bradley R. Wilson in Support re: #55 Order, #54 Letter,. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mock, Jasand)
January 6, 2014 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Sean Andrew Cote in Support re: #55 Order, #54 Letter,. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Mock, Jasand)
January 6, 2014 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT of David Bloom in Support re: #55 Order. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Cochran, Brian)
January 6, 2014 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Brian E. Cochran in Support re: #55 Order. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit 2 - email, #3 Exhibit 3 - memorandum, #4 Exhibit 4 - email, #5 Exhibit 5 - email, #6 Exhibit 6 - email, #7 Exhibit 7 - email, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt from Cooperman deposition transcript)(Cochran, Brian)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall submit any affidavits, deposition excerpts, or other evidence concerning this issue no later than January 6, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/30/2013) (ama)
December 27, 2013 Filing 54 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Herbert M. Wachtell and Randall J. Baron dated December 27, 2013 re: Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd. v. Griffith, 13-cv-4202 (RJS). Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd., Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP.(Wachtell, Herbert)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #52 Letter, filed by David Wishnow, Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, David Jeffreys, Jeff Herlyn, Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Reade Griffith, Greville V.B. Ward, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all Defendants shall submit a single brief, up to 50 pages in length, addressing all grounds for dismissal. Plaintiffs may also use up to 50 pages in their opposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' request for leave to submit additional affidavits and exhibits is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/13/2013) (ama)
December 13, 2013 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Herbert M. Wachtell dated 12/13/2013 re: Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd. v. Griffith, 13-cv-4202 (RJS). Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow.(Wachtell, Herbert)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re: #50 Letter filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd., #49 Letter, filed by David Wishnow, Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, David Jeffreys, Jeff Herlyn, Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Reade Griffith, Greville V.B. Ward, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants shall submit their motions to dismiss no later than January 13, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall submit their opposition no later than February 17, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants shall submit their reply no later than March 3, 2014. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 1/13/2014., Responses due by 2/17/2014, Replies due by 3/3/2014.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/09/2013) (ama)
December 5, 2013 Filing 50 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Randall J. Baron dated 12/05/2013 re: Plaintiffs' pre-motion letter regarding anticipated motion to dismiss. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd..(Baron, Randall)
December 2, 2013 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Defendants dated 12/02/2013 re: Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd. v. Griffith, 13-cv-4202 (RJS). Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow.(Wachtell, Herbert)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants shall submit a pre-motion letter regarding any anticipated motions to dismiss no later than December 2, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall submit a letter in response no later than December 5, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the time to answer the Amended Complaint is stayed pending resolution of any motions to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/18/2013) (ama)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by Friday, November 1, 2013 at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: A brief statement of the nature of the action and the principal defenses, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/23/2013) (cd)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying #27 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #30 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #33 Motion to Compel. For the foregoing reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants' requests to compel Plaintiffs to produce (a) responsive documents in the possession of any Omega person; (b) Cooperman's and Omega's arrangements with regard to litigation financing; (c) documents relating to the potential recruitment of derivative plaintiffs; (d) documents relating to potential arrangements with others concerning Tetragon; and (e) Omega's trading records for Tetragon stock are DENIED. Because the documents were provided by Plaintiffs only after Defendants submitted their motion to compel, Defendants may submit a motion for reasonable expenses incurred in submitting these requests. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(A), (C). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' requests to compel Plaintiffs to produce documents withheld on grounds of privilege, to provide a new privilege log, and to search for documents using new search terms are DENIED. Because the request is denied, Plaintiffs may submit a motion for reasonable expenses incurred in opposing these requests. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(B), (C). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' requests to compel Plaintiffs to produce documents withheld on grounds of privilege, to provide a new privilege log, and to search for documents using new search terms are DENIED. Because the request is denied, Plaintiffs may submit a motion for reasonable expenses incurred in opposing these requests. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(B), (C). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' requests to compel Hall to appear for a deposition prior to Defendants' filing of a motion to dismiss and to produce documents In response to Defendants' August 30 request sufficiently in advance of the deposition IS GRANTED. Because the request is granted. Defendants may submit a motion for reasonable expenses incurred in submitting these requests. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(A), (C). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' motion to compel Defendants to produce documents concerning the adequacy of Omega to represent the interests of shareholders, including all documents to, from, or referencing Omega and Cooperman is DENIED. Because the motion is denied, Defendants may submit a motion for reasonable expenses incurred in opposing this motion. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(B). The clerk of the court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at docket numbers 27, 30, and 33. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/22/2013) (ama) Modified on 10/24/2013 (ama).
September 20, 2013 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Randall J. Baron in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected). MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected).. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 7-9-13 letter, #2 Exhibit B - 8-30-13 email chain, #3 Exhibit C - 9-6-13 email chain, #4 Exhibit D - 9-13-13 email chain, #5 Exhibit E - 9-13-13 email chain, #6 Exhibit F - Transcription of recording, #7 Exhibit G - 7-13-11 email chain, #8 Exhibit H - Draft of Joint Report, #9 Exhibit I - Privilege Log, #10 Exhibit J - 9-9-13 email chain)(Baron, Randall)
September 20, 2013 Filing 44 DECLARATION of A. Rick Atwood in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected). MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected).. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Baron, Randall)
September 20, 2013 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Brian E. Cochran in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected). MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected).. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Retainer Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - 9-28-09 email chain)(Baron, Randall)
September 20, 2013 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected). MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected).. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Hall, Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Baron, Randall)
September 20, 2013 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Opposition papers served on All parties on 9/20/2013. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
September 20, 2013 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Jasand Mock in Support re: #39 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,,. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Wachtell, Herbert)
September 20, 2013 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Plaintiff Omega Overseas Partners, LTD's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff Omega's Motion to Compel. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Wachtell, Herbert)
September 19, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Samuel Howard Rudman for noncompliance with Section 14.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #1 Complaint, to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (laq)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... This Addendum is an integral part of the Order of today's date granting confidentiality protection to certain materials. Notwithstanding any other provision of the Order, no document may be filed with the Clerk under seal without a further Order of this Court addressing the specific documents to be sealed. Any application to seal shall be accompanied by an affidavit or affidavits and a memorandum of law, demonstrating that the standards for sealing have been met and specifically addressing Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d Cir. 2006) and any other controlling authority. Nothing herein is intended to alter or modify the applicability of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 to this case. The redactions expressly authorized by Rule 5.2 may be made without further application to the Court.- (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/16/2013) (ja)
September 16, 2013 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Jasand Mock in Support re: #33 MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected). MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected).. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Wachtell, Herbert)
September 16, 2013 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected). MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected).. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Wachtell, Herbert)
September 16, 2013 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Compel served on All Parties on 09/13/2013. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Wachtell, Herbert)
September 16, 2013 Filing 33 MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery (Corrected). Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. Return Date set for 9/20/2013 at 11:59 PM.(Wachtell, Herbert)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan, from Bradley R. Wilson, dated 9/13/2013, re: We represent defendants.... In accordance with the Court's Order dated September 4, 2013, we will be filing papers this evening in support of a motion to compel discovery from plaintiffs, which will include a memorandum of law, supporting affidavits, and related exhibits.... The parties have been negotiating a proposed protective order.... it is our understanding that the absence of a protective order will prevent Defendants from filing their motion papers under seal. To address this issue, and to ensure compliance with the Court's Order, Defendants intend to file redacted versions of their motion papers on the ECF system to preserve confidentiality with respect to the documents produced by plaintiffs.... Defendants will hand deliver to Chambers on Monday morning, September 16 - or earlier, if so requested - working copies of the motion papers, which will be appropriately stamped as including information designated as confidential. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/13/2013) (ja)
September 13, 2013 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (SEE ENTRY# 36)DECLARATION of Jasand Mock in Support re: #30 MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Wachtell, Herbert) Modified on 9/19/2013 (kj).
September 13, 2013 Filing 31 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (SEE ENTRY# 35) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #30 MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery.. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Wachtell, Herbert) Modified on 9/19/2013 (kj).
September 13, 2013 Filing 30 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (SEE ENTRY# 33) MOTION to Compel Omega/Hall to Discovery. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. Return Date set for 9/20/2013 at 11:59 PM.(Wachtell, Herbert) Modified on 9/19/2013 (kj).
September 13, 2013 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Randall J. Baron in Support re: #27 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Plaintiff Omega Overseas Partners, LTD's Motion to Compel Production of Documents.. Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Request for Production, #2 Exhibit B - Baron 7-22-13 letter, #3 Exhibit C - Wilson 7-25-13 letter, #4 Exhibit D - Baron 7-26-13 letter, #5 Exhibit E - Baron 9-6-13 email, #6 Exhibit F - search terms)(Baron, Randall)
September 13, 2013 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Plaintiff Omega Overseas Partners, LTD's Motion to Compel Production of Documents.. Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Baron, Randall)
September 13, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Plaintiff Omega Overseas Partners, LTD's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd..(Baron, Randall)
September 11, 2013 Filing 26 CONSOLIDATED VERIFIED DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE INVESTMENT ADVISERS ACT OF 1940, BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND UNJUST ENRICHMENT against Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow, TFG Investment Manager, Polygon Management LP, Polygon Global Partners LP, Polygon Global Partners LLP, Perella Weinberg Partners LP, Perella Weinberg Partners UK LLP. Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd., Jeffrey D. Hall.(lmb)
September 9, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/4/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
September 9, 2013 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/4/2013 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari)
September 4, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Pre-Motion Conference held on 9/4/2013. Plaintiff counsel A. Rick Atwood, Darren J. Robbins, and Randall J. Baron were present. Defense counsel Herbert Wachtell, Noah Leibowitz, Israel David, Karin DeMasi, and Bradley Wilson were present. Parties agreed to consolidate cases under Omega Overseas Partners Ltd.(13 Civ. 4202) and to dismiss Hall v. Griffith(13 Civ. 5791). Plaintiff counsel stated that they would file an amended complaint on 9/11/13. The Parties argued whether the plaintiffs had complied with discovery requests pursuant to an informal discovery request. Defendant agreed to file a motion on 9/13/13. Plaintiff will file a response on 9/20/13. The Court stayed all discovery in Omega Overseas Partners and all related actions. (sc)
September 4, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Pre-Motion Conference held on 9/4/2013. Plaintiff counsel A. Rick Atwood, Darren J. Robbins, and Randall J. Baron present. Defense counsel Herbert Wachtell, Noah Leibowitz, Israel David, Karin DeMasi, and Bradley Wilson present. Court reporter present. Parties agreed to consolidate cases under Omega Overseas Partners Ltd. 13 Civ. 4202 and to dismiss Hall v. Griffith 13 Civ. 5791. Plaintiff counsel stated that they would file an amended complaint on September 11, 2013. Parties argued whether Plaintiffs had complied with discovery requests pursuant to an informal discovery request. Defendant agreed to file a motion on September 13, 2013. Plaintiff will file a response on September 20, 2013. The Court stayed all discovery in Omega Overseas Partners and all related actions. (mro)
September 4, 2013 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #24 ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ama)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #14 Motion for Darren J. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Darren J. Robbins for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/03/2013) (ama)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: On September 4, 2013, the Court held a conference to discuss Defendants' requests to consolidate the two above-captioned cases, to adjourn the deadline for their answer to the Complaint in Hall, and to make a motion to compel discovery. For the reasons discussed at the September 4 conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Hall v. Griffith, No. 13 Civ. 5791 (RJS), is dismissed. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint in Omega Overseas Partners no later than September 11, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants shall file their motion to compel discovery no later than September 13, 2013. Plaintiffs shall submit any response by September 20, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT all discovery in the above-captioned cases and all future related cases is stayed pending the disposition of the motion to compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' deadline to answer the forthcoming amended complaint is stayed pending the disposition of the motion to compel ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2013. Motions due by 9/13/2013. Responses due by 9/20/2013) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/4/2013) (djc)
September 4, 2013 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Omega Overseas Partners, LTD; Byron Knief; Greville V.B. Ward; Rupert Dorey; David Jeffreys; Jeff Herlyn; Michael Rosenberg; David Wishnow; Tetragon Financial Group Limited on 9-04-2013. Service was made by Mail and E-mail. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Wilson, Bradley)
September 4, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Reid Wilson on behalf of Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Wilson, Bradley)
September 3, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Israel David on behalf of Jeff Herlyn, Michael Rosenberg, David Wishnow. (David, Israel)
September 3, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Maxim Leibowitz on behalf of Rupert Dorey, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Greville V.B. Ward. (Leibowitz, Noah)
September 3, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Michael McLaughlin on behalf of Rupert Dorey, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Greville V.B. Ward. (McLaughlin, Joseph)
September 3, 2013 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Polygon Credit Holdings II Limited for Tetragon Financial Group Limited. Document filed by Tetragon Financial Group Limited.(DeMasi, Karin)
September 3, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karin A. DeMasi on behalf of Tetragon Financial Group Limited. (DeMasi, Karin)
August 30, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Darren J. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8830909. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bwa)
August 30, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION for Darren J. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8830909. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robbins, Darren)
August 30, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Randall J. Baron to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8828195. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bwa)
August 29, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION for Randall J. Baron to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8828195. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baron, Randall)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The pre-motion conference scheduled for Friday, August 30, 2013, at 4:00 p.m. IS HEREBY ADJOURNED TO Wednesday, September 4, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/4/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/27/2013) (tn)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Accordingly, It is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs in both of the above captioned cases shall submit a pre-motion letter responding to defendants' letter by August 26, 2013. The parties are further ordered to appear for a pre-motion conference on Friday, August 30, 2013, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 905 of the United States District Court for the Southern district of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/22/2013) (js)
August 22, 2013 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance and Letter served on Jeffrey D. Hall; Bryon Knief; Greville V.B. Ward; Rupert Dorey; David Jeffreys; Jeff Herlyn, Michael Rosenberg; David Wishnow; Tetragon Financial Group Limited. on 8/21/2013. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Mock, Jasand)
August 21, 2013 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent REG Holdco II Ltd., Corporate Parent AEJ Holdco Ltd. for Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd.; Corporate Parent HRW Holdings LLC for Tetragon Financial Management LP. Document filed by Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP.(Wachtell, Herbert)
August 21, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert M Wachtell on behalf of Patrick Dear, Reade Griffith, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP. (Wachtell, Herbert)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #5 Motion for Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Brian E. Cochran for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/08/2013) (ama)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #4 Motion for A. Rick Atwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of A. Rick Atwood for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted.(Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/08/2013) (ama)
July 17, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8699542. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #4 MOTION for A. Rick Atwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8699443. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 17, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION for Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8699542. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cochran, Brian)
July 17, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for A. Rick Atwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8699443. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Atwood, A.)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties that: All defendants hereby agree to waive service of the summons and the Complaint. Nothing herein shall be deemed to constitute a waiver of, and defendants do not waive and expressly preserve, all rights, arguments, and defenses in the captioned action, including without limitation all defenses and objections related to personal jurisdiction and venue. For the avoidance of doubt, defendants expressly reserve the right to seek the dismissal of this action on the ground of forum non conveniens. Given the number of foreign defendants named in the Complaint, who pursuant to Rule 4(d)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are entitled to 90 days from the date a formal request for a waiver of service is sent to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, in the interest of orderly procedure, the time for all defendants to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be 90 days from the date of this stipulation. Nothing herein shall be deemed to preclude defendants from seeking an extension of their time to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on appropriate grounds. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/02/2013) (ama)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (jd)
June 18, 2013 Case Designated ECF. (jd)
June 18, 2013 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (jd)
June 18, 2013 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (jd)
June 18, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick Dear, Rupert Dorey, Reade Griffith, Jeff Herlyn, David Jeffreys, Byron Knief, Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd, Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd., Michael Rosenberg, Tetragon Financial Group Limited, Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC, Tetragon Financial Management LP, Greville V.B. Ward, David Wishnow. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401070052)Document filed by Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.(jd) (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd. v. Griffith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rupert Dorey
Represented By: Joseph Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Noah Maxim Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jeffreys
Represented By: Joseph Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Noah Maxim Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetragon Financial Management LP
Represented By: Herbert M Wachtell
Represented By: Bradley Reid Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetragon Financial Management GP LLC
Represented By: Herbert M Wachtell
Represented By: Bradley Reid Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TFG Investment Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polygon Management LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dear
Represented By: Herbert M Wachtell
Represented By: Bradley Reid Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wishnow
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polygon Global Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polygon Global Partners LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rosenberg
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greville V.B. Ward
Represented By: Joseph Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Noah Maxim Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Knief
Represented By: Joseph Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Noah Maxim Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polygon Credit Holdings II Ltd
Represented By: Herbert M Wachtell
Represented By: Bradley Reid Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reade Griffith
Represented By: Herbert M Wachtell
Represented By: Bradley Reid Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polygon Credit Holdings Ltd.
Represented By: Herbert M Wachtell
Represented By: Bradley Reid Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Herlyn
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Hall
Represented By: Mark Samuel Reich
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omega Overseas Partners, Ltd.
Represented By: Mark Samuel Reich
Represented By: Brian E Cochran
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: David T. Wissbroecker
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Represented By: Randall J. Baron
Represented By: A. Rick Atwood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Tetragon Financial Group Limited
Represented By: Karin A. DeMasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?