Restis et al v. American Coalition Against Nuclear Iran, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Victor Restis, Enterprises Shipping and Trading S.A. and First Business Bank S.A. |
Defendant: |
American Coalition Against Nuclear Iran, Inc., Mark D. Wallace, David Ibsen, Nathan Carleton and Does |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv05032 |
Filed: |
July 19, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
Edgardo Ramos |
Nature of Suit: |
Assault Libel & Slander |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 23, 2015 |
Filing
316
OPINION AND ORDER re: 291 MOTION to Compel Intervenor and Defendants to Provide Additional Information Relating to the Assertion of the State Secrets Privilege and Opposing Dismissal of the Case filed by Enterprises Shipping and Trading S.A., Victor Restis. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs' motion to compel is DENIED, and the Government's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions and close the case. Doc. 257, 291. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/23/2015) (ama)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Filing
273
OPINION AND ORDER: re: 257 MOTION to Intervene . MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States Of America. On October 8, 2014, the Court held a pre-motion conference in connection with Plaintiffs' request for leave to file a motion for disclosure of information relating to the assertion of the state secrets privilege by Intervenor the United States of America. At the conference, the Court granted Plaintiffs leave to file the motion and also directed the parties to brie f whether (1) Plaintiffs' counsel should, subject to required clearance(s), be allowed access to the relevant classified materials, and (2) the Court can grant Plaintiffs injunctive relief in the event it determines that the state secrets privil ege applies. Plaintiffs are directed to file their motion, not to exceed 25 pages, by Wednesday, October 29, 2014. Intervenor the United States of America and Defendants are directed to file their respective opposition briefs, not to exceed 25 pages, by Wednesday, November 12,2014. Plaintiffs' reply brief, not to exceed 10 pages, is due Wednesday, November 26,2014. It is SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 10/29/2014., Responses due by 11/12/2014, Replies due by 11/26/2014.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/09/2014) (ama)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
267
OPINION AND ORDER re: 25 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by David Ibsen, American Coalition Against Nuclear Iran, Inc., Nathan Carleton, Mark D. Wallace. For the reasons set forth above, Defendants' motion to dismiss is G RANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically, Defendants' motion to dismiss the tortious interference with prospective economic advantage, tortious interference with contract, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and prima facie tort claims is GRANTED; Defendants' motion to dismiss the defamation claim is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion (Doc. 25). It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/30/2014) (ama)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?