Cargo Agents, Inc. v. Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha et al
Plaintiff: Cargo Agents, Inc.
Defendant: Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha, Eukor Car Carriers Inc., Wallenius Lines AB, Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., Wilh. Wilhemsen ASA, Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd., Toyofuji Shipping Co., Ltd., "K" Line America, Inc., Compania Sud Americana De Vapores S.A., CSAV Agency North America, LLC, Wilh. Wilhemsen Holding ASA, Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas LLC, Nissan Motor Car Carrier Co., Ltd., Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics ASA, Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (USA), Inc. and NYK Line (North America), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv07216
Filed: October 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Queens
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2013 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:13-cv-06902, filed on 11/14/2013. (sjo)
November 13, 2013 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo)
November 13, 2013 Filing 3 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 11/13/2013) (sjo)
October 21, 2013 Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (pgu)
October 21, 2013 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
October 21, 2013 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:13-cv-05243-PKC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (msa)
October 11, 2013 CASE REFERRED TO Judge P. Kevin Castel as possibly related to 1:13-cv-5243. (msa)
October 11, 2013 Case Designated ECF. (msa)
October 11, 2013 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CSAV Agency North America, LLC, Compania Sud Americana De Vapores S.A., "K" Line America, Inc., Eukor Car Carriers Inc., Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (USA), Inc., Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd., NYK Line (North America), Inc., Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha, Nissan Motor Car Carrier Co., Ltd., Toyofuji Shipping Co., Ltd., Wallenius Lines AB, Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics ASA, Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas LLC, Wilh. Wilhemsen Holding ASA, Wilh. Wilhemsen ASA. (msa)
October 11, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSAV Agency North America, LLC, Compania Sud Americana De Vapores S.A., "K" Line America, Inc., Eukor Car Carriers Inc., Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd., Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (USA), Inc., NYK Line (North America), Inc., Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha, Nissan Motor Car Carrier Co., Ltd., Toyofuji Shipping Co., Ltd., Wallenius Lines AB, Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics ASA, Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas LLC, Wilh. Wilhemsen Holding ASA, Wilh. Wilhemsen ASA. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401078733)Document filed by Cargo Agents, Inc.(msa) Modified on 10/17/2013 (msa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargo Agents, Inc. v. Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eukor Car Carriers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallenius Lines AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilh. Wilhemsen ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyofuji Shipping Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "K" Line America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compania Sud Americana De Vapores S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAV Agency North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilh. Wilhemsen Holding ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Car Carrier Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYK Line (North America), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargo Agents, Inc.
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Richard J. Kilsheimer
Represented By: Gregory Keith Arenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?