Abbey House Media, Inc. v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Abbey House Media, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Apple Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers, L.L.C., Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH, Holtzbrinck Publishers, L.L.C., The Penguin Group, Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Penguin Group (USA) LLC, the successor to the named Defendant The Penguin Group |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv02000 |
Filed: |
March 21, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
Denise L. Cote |
Nature of Suit: |
Antitrust |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 22, 2016 |
Filing
183
OPINION & ORDER.....The Publisher Defendants September 18 motion for summary judgment is granted and the claims asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall close the case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/22/2016) (gr)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing
82
OPINION & ORDER...Abbey House's September 9 motion to dismiss is granted in part. The counterclaims by S&S and Penguin are dismissed with one exception: the motion to dismiss the S&S counterclaim for breach of contract is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/21/2014) (gr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Abbey House Media, Inc. v. Apple Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Abbey House Media, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Maxwell M. Blecher |
Represented By: |
Eric M. Creizman |
Represented By: |
Jordan Lee Ludwig |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Apple Inc. |
Represented By: |
Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Cynthia E. Richman |
Represented By: |
Daniel G. Swanson |
Represented By: |
Lawrence Jay Zweifach |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Samuel Joseph Rubin |
Represented By: |
Richard Sutton Snyder, Sr. |
Represented By: |
Walter B. Stuart, IV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Charles Scott Lent |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH |
Represented By: |
John J. Lavelle |
Represented By: |
Joel M. Mitnick |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Publishers, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
John J. Lavelle |
Represented By: |
Joel M. Mitnick |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: The Penguin Group |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Yehudah Lev Buchweitz |
Represented By: |
James W. Quinn |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey Leonard White |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Penguin Group (USA) LLC, the successor to the named Defendant The Penguin Group |
Represented By: |
Amanda Christine Croushore |
Represented By: |
Saul P Morgenstern |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?