Bouveng v. NYG Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hanna Bouveng
Defendant: NYG Capital LLC and Benjamin Wey
Case Number: 1:2014cv05474
Filed: July 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Paul G. Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332ac Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court believes monetary sanctions in the form of defense counsel's fees for preparation for and attendance at the conference are appropriate. However, the Court believes that the 17.8 hours that two attorneys billed for preparing the ex parte settlement letter were slightly excessive and, accordingly, finds it appropriate to reduce the amount sought by defense counsel. In its discretion, the Court directs that counsel for plaintiff reimburse Colton and his firm in the amount of $5,000 for the work related to the letter and $1,250 for attendance at the conference for a total of $6,250. In addition, the Court concludes that in evaluating the totality of the circumstances here, a fine is also appropriate. Accordingly, the Court directs that plaintiff's counsel pay a fine of $1,000 to the Clerk of the Court. For all these reasons, the Morelli Law Firm is directed to pay the sum of $6,250 to the Dentons law firm, and to pay $1,000 to the Clerk of the Court. These payments should be made no later than 14 days from the date of this Opinion and Order, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 12/7/2017) (ap)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: 255 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law . MOTION for New Trial and/or for Remittur of Compensatory and Punative Damages filed by NYG Capital LLC, Benjamin Wey.Defendants' motion for judgment as a matter of law is denied. Defendants' motion for a new trial as to liability is denied. Defendant's motion for a new trial as to damages is granted unless Plaintiff agrees in writing by April 10, 2016, to a remittitur reducin g the (1) compensatory damage award on the NYSHRL and NYCHRL quid pro quo sexual harassment claims to $150,000; (2) punitive damage award on the defamation claim against Wey to $1.5 million; and (3) punitive damage award on the defamation claim against FNL Media to $1.5 million. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 255). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/31/2016) (tro)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: 48 MOTION to Dismiss the 2nd Amended Complaint filed by FNL Media LLC, NYG Capital LLC, Benjamin Wey. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted as to: (1) the assault and battery claim against Defendants NYGG and FNL Media; (2) the intentional infliction of emotional distress claim against all Defendants, and (3) the breach of contract claims against FNL Media. Defendants' motion to dismiss is otherwise denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 48). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/1/2015) (tro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouveng v. NYG Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna Bouveng
Represented By: Martha Martin McBrayer
Represented By: Benedict P. Morelli
Represented By: David S. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYG Capital LLC
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Joanna Riesman
Represented By: Justin M. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Wey
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Joanna Riesman
Represented By: Justin M. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?