United Realty Advisors, LP et al v. Verschleiser et al
Plaintiff: United Realty Advisors, LP and Jacob Frydman
Defendant: Eli Verschleiser, Raul Delforno, Ophir Parnasi and Alexandru Onica
Case Number: 1:2014cv05903
Filed: July 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: John G. Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER ADJOURNING TRIAL. Due to the coronavirus outbreak, and the unavailability of courtroom space for the foreseeable future, the October 19, 2020, trial date in this matter is adjourned. The trial will be rescheduled when a courtroom becomes ava ilable and the trial can be conducted in a matter that safeguards the safety of the parties, counsel, witnesses, jurors, and Court staff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Bernard A. Friedman, SITTING BY SPECIAL DESIGNATION on 8/12/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05903-BAF, 1:14-cv-08084-BAF (yv)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER: By Orders of Reference dated June 3, 2020 (Dkt. Nos. 414, 512), Judge Friedman referred the above-captioned cases to me for settlement. The parties are directed to advise the Court within 30 days of the date of this Order when they wish to schedule a settlement conference. The parties should do so by filing a letter-motion on the docket that indicates at least three dates that are mutually convenient for the parties. Alternatively, counsel are free to e-mail my deputy clerk, David Tam, at David_Tam@nysd.uscourts.gov to find a mutually convenient date for the parties and the Court. Given the state's extension of the current stay-at-home policy in light of the COVID-19 pandemic, any settlement conference in the fore seeable future will likely be conducted telephonically. Using the Court's conference line system, the Court will begin the settlement conference in joint session with all parties on the line before breaking into private session and speaking t o the parties individually, as the technology the Court is using can facilitate breakout sessions with each side. The Court will email a copy of this Order to all pro se defendants in the above-referenced cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 6/3/2020) (jca)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER RESCHEDULING TRIAL: Due to the coronavirus outbreak, the June 15, 2020, trial in these consolidated matters is here by rescheduled for Monday, October 19, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. ( Jury Selection set for 10/19/2020 at 09:00AM before Judge Bernard A. Friedman., Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Bernard A. Friedman.) (Signed by Judge Bernard A. Friedman on 4/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05903-BAF, 1:14-cv-08084-BAF (cf) (Main Document 511 replaced on 4/2/2020) (cf).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ADJOURN TRIAL denying 508 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Accordingly, on January 9, the Court issued an amended trial notice resetting the trial for June 15. The trial is expected to last approximat ely two weeks. Given the Court's own busy schedule, and the limited availability of courtrooms for visiting judges at the federal courthouse in Manhattan, June 15-26 is the only two-week period in the reasonably foreseeable future when this case, which is now nearly six years old, can be tried. Under these circumstances, defendant Verschleiser's motion to adjourn the trial must be denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Bernard A. Friedman on 1/23/2020) (jca)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ADJOURN THE TRIAL granting (504) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:14-cv-05903-BAF; granting (406) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:14-cv-08084-BAF.Plaintiffs have filed a letter mo tion in this matter [docket entry 504 in 14-cv-5903, docket entry 406 in 14-cv-8084] requesting that the trial be adjourned because their attorney will undergo surgery in February 2020. For cause shown, and in the absence of any objection from defend ants, the motion is granted. Trial will commence on Monday, June 15, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. (Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Bernard A. Friedman.) (Signed by Judge Bernard A. Friedman, Sitting By Designation on 1/9/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05903-BAF, 1:14-cv-08084-BAF (rro)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 503 TRIAL NOTICE: Be advised that the trial in this matter will commence with jury selection on Monday, March 2, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The parties are to inqu ire with the Clerk's Office to learn the courtroom number. The trial schedule will be Monday through Friday from 9:00 a.m. to 5:00 p.m. with fifteen-minute breaks in the morning and afternoon and a one-hour lunch break. Each side is limited t o a total of forty-five hours to argue and to examine and cross-examine witnesses. The parties' proposed joint final pretrial order, as well as any proposed voir dire questions, are due by February 21, 2020. All trial exhibits must be marked (e.g., P-1, P-2, etc.; D-1, D-2, etc.) in advance of trial and each side must exchange its exhibit books, as well as any demonstrative exhibits, with each other no later than one week before trial. Additionally, each side must provide the Court wi th two copies of its exhibit book (one for the Court, one for the Court's clerks). (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2020., Jury Selection set for 3/2/2020 at 09:00AM before Judge Bernard A. Friedman.) (Signed by Senior United States District Judge Bernard A. Friedman, Sitting by Special Designation on 12/20/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05903-BAF, 1:14-cv-08084-BAF(jca)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER TO UPDATE THE PARTIES' CONTACT INFORMATION: The Court has reviewed the docket sheets in these matters and notes that they lack complete contact information for pro se defendants Eli Verschleiser, Raul Del Forno, Ophir Pinhasi, and Alexan dru Onica. To rectify this oversight, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court update the docket sheets in the above-referenced matters to reflect the following contact information as it pertains to each defendant. The Court also notes that t he docket sheet for civil action number 14-cv-8084 indicates that plaintiff Jacob Frydman is pro se; however, plaintiff Frydman is currently represented by attorney Neal Brickman. Therefore, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court delete plai ntiff Frydman's pro se contact information from the docket sheet for civil action number 14-cv-8084. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pro se defendants Raul Del Forno and Ophir Pinhasi provide their telephone numbers to the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a). They may do so by mailing a letter with this information, addressed to the Clerk of Court at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of the pro se defendants and att orneys of record promptly notify the Court if (1) any of the contact information contained on page 1 of this order is incorrect, and (2) any of their addresses or telephone numbers change. (And as further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Bernard A. Friedman, Sitting by Special Designation on 12/6/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05903-BAF, 1:14-cv-08084-BAF(jca)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: (412 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK, 317 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK) MOTION in Limine Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs from Offering Evidence Related to Our Place In NY, Inc. or Magenu.. filed by Eli Verschleiser , (491 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK, 393 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK) LETTER MOTION for Conference re: (308 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK, 403 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK) MOTION in Limine Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs from Offering Evidence that Has Not Been Produced and Evidence Whose Relevance is Unsupported by Evi filed by Jacob Frydman, United Realty Advisors, LP, United Realty Advisors, L.P., (308 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK, 403 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK) MOTION in Limine Motion in Limine to Exclu de Plaintiffs from Offering Evidence that Has Not Been Produced and Evidence Whose Relevance is Unsupported by Evidence that Has Been Produced. filed by Eli Verschleiser, (326 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK, 421 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK) MOTION in Limine Preclude Veens Testimony and Evidence Obtained By Him. filed by Eli Verschleiser, (314 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK, 409 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK) MOTION in Limine Exclude Plaintiffs from Offering Evidence of Defendants Prior Arrest History, Cr iminal History, or Drug History. filed by Eli Verschleiser, (406 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK, 311 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK) MOTION in Limine Exclude Transcript and Recording of Conversation Between Gould and Verschleiser. filed by Eli Verschl eiser, (385 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK, 290 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK) MOTION in Limine Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs from Offering Evidence that Has Not Been Produced and Evidence Whose Relevance is Unsupported by Evidence that Has Been Produc ed.. filed by Raul Delforno, Alex Onica, Multi Capital Group of Companies, L.L.C., Eli Verschleiser, Ophir Parnasi, (329 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK, 424 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK) MOTION in Limine Preclude Veens Recordings and Evidence Related . filed by Eli Verschleiser, (323 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK, 418 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK) MOTION in Limine Preclude Testimony that is the Subject of Plaintiffs' Precluded Expert Testimony. filed by Eli Verschleiser, (386 in 1:14-cv-059 03-JGK, 291 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK) MOTION in Limine 1.Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs from Offering Evidence that Has Not Been Produced and Evidence Whose Relevance is Unsupported by Evidence that Has Been Produced.. filed by Eli V erschleiser, (415 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK, 320 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK) MOTION in Limine Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence as to Speculative Losses. filed by Eli Verschleiser. For the reasons set out above, the plaintiffs' motio n to strike the defendants' witness list is denied. The defendants' motions in limine are denied in part and granted in part as explained above. The Clerk is directed to close all pending motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05903-JGK, 1:14-cv-08084-JGK(ks)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: (212 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK-JLC) MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Albert Akerman. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the motion for summary judgment by defendant Akerman is granted. All claims against defendant Akerman are dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to close Dkt. No. 212 in 14-cv-8084. SO ORDERED., (Albert Akerman and Albert Akerman terminated.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/2/17) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05903-JGK-JLC, 1:14-cv-08084-JGK-JLC(yv)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM OPINION ANDORDER re: (182 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK-JLC) LETTER MOTION for Discovery to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Reports and to Preclude their Testimony in this Action. addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Joshua S ummers, Esq. dated January 17, 2017. filed by Multi Capital Group of Companies, L.L.C., Eli Verschleiser. Pending before the Court are the plaintiffs' objections to Magistrate Judge Cott's January 18, 2017 Order (the "Order") striking two expert reports because they were filed after the court-ordered deadline for expert disclosure. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addr essed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The objections are overruled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close all open motions. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/25/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05903-JGK-JLC, 1:14-cv-08084-JGK-JLC(cf)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the motion to abstain is denied. The motion t o dismiss the Complaint brought by Verschleiser, Multi Group, Delforno, Pinhasi, and Onica is denied in part and granted in part; and the motion to dismiss brought by Wright is granted. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 100 in Case No. 14cv08 084 and Docket Nos. 86 and 105 in Case No. 14cv05903. So ordered. re: (105 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK) MOTION to Dismiss filed by David O. Wright, (86 in 1:14-cv-05903-JGK) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Raul Delforno, Ophir Pinhasi, Multi Capital Group of Companies, L.L.C., Alexandru Onica, Eli Verschleiser, Ophir Parnasi, (100 in 1:14-cv-08084-JGK) MOTION to Dismiss filed by David O. Wright. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/22/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05903-JGK, 1:14-cv-08084-JGK (rjm)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed above, they are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the defendants' application for sanctions in connection with the temporary restraining order application is denied. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/3/2015) (rjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Realty Advisors, LP et al v. Verschleiser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Realty Advisors, LP
Represented By: Mary Katherine Sherman
Represented By: David C. Wrobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Frydman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Verschleiser
Represented By: Shmuel Kadosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Delforno
Represented By: Shmuel Kadosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ophir Parnasi
Represented By: Shmuel Kadosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandru Onica
Represented By: Shmuel Kadosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?