January 19, 2023 |
Filing
80
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 79 Order on Motion to Dismiss in favor of Fifth Third Bank, N.A. against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, ex rel. Lee Moncho. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court 's Memorandum Decision and Order dated January 19, 2023, because Moncho's qui tam action is based upon the public disclosure of allegations or transactions within the meaning of§ 3 730(e)(4 )(A), and because Moncho is not an "o riginal source" of the pertinent information within the meaning of § 3730(e)(4)(A) and (B), this case must be dismissed under the FCA' s public disclosure provision. Defendant's motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 66), is GRANTED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/19/2023) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal) (km)
|
July 6, 2022 |
Filing
78
ORDER: The oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, (ECF No. 66), scheduled for July 13, 2022 is adjourned to August 10, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 8/10/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/06/2022) (ama)
|
May 9, 2022 |
Filing
76
ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, (ECF No. 66), on July 13, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 7/13/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/09/2022) (ama)
|
March 14, 2022 |
Filing
69
ORDER: moot by ECF No. 65 43 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the open motion at ECF No. 43 (Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint) as having been rendered moot by ECF No. 65 (Second Amended Complaint). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/14/2022) (ama)
|
October 6, 2021 |
Filing
55
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: 54 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Ex tension of Time We write to request: (1)an adjournment of the oral argument on Defendant's motion to dismiss, presently scheduled for October 13, 2021, and (ii) the Court's entry of the attached Stipulated Conf filed by ex rel. Lee Moncho. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/06/2021) (ama)
|
May 25, 2021 |
Filing
51
ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, (ECF 43), on July 28, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. ( Oral Argument set for 7/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/25/2021) (vfr)
|
February 18, 2021 |
Filing
42
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss the amended complaint on or before March 4, 2021. 2. Relator shall file his opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss the amended complaint on or before April 1, 2021. 3. Defendant shall file its reply to Relator's opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss on or before April 15, 2021. ( Motions due by 3/4/2021., Responses due by 4/1/2021, Replies due by 4/15/2021.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/18/2021) (mro)
|
January 6, 2021 |
Filing
38
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Relator shall file his opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss or amended complaint on or before January 19, 2021. 2. Defendant shall file: a. its reply to Relator's opposition to Defendant's mo tion to dismiss on or before February 9, 2021; or b. its response to Relator's amended complaint on or before February 18, 2021. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2021. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 30 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 1/19/2021, Replies due by 2/9/2021.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/6/2021) (jwh)
|
July 20, 2020 |
Filing
21
ORDER All documents filed in this action prior to the entry of this Order shall remain under seal and not be made public, except for, thirty days after the entry of this Order, relator's complaint, this Order, and the Government's Notice of Decision to Decline Intervention (the "Government's Notice of Decision"). (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 06/17/2020) (mhe)
|