Eastman Kodak Company v. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eastman Kodak Company
Defendant: The Goldman Sachs Group Inc, Metro International Trade Services L.L.C., JP Morgan Chase & Company, Henry Bath LLC, Glencore Xstrata PLC, Glencore Ltd., Pacorini Metals USA L.L.C., Pacorini Metals AG and London Metal Exchange Ltd
Case Number: 1:2014cv06849
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Katherine B. Forrest
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 02 U.S.C. ยง 437 Federal Election Commission
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER TO WITHDRAW BRIAN O. O'MARA AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD granting (1386 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in 13-md-2481-PAE). The motion of Brian 0. O'Mara to withdraw as attorney of record in the above-referenced action is granted. As further set forth by this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/18/2023) (tg)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, the Court denies, without prejudice to Kodak's right to make a tailored application or applications under § 1782, Kodak's motion for wholesale export of the discoveryrecord in this case via modificati on of the Protective Order or an order pursuant to § 1782. Kodak is at leave to file proper § 1782 application(s), attaching proposed subpoenas, that make tailored requests for discovery from specified defendants who reside or are found in the district of filing.6 Any such applications must be made in a manner that allows for particularized and thorough analyses of the statutory and discretionary § 1782 factors, which the omnibus and overbroad request made here does not permi t. To the extent that Kodak prevails in any such § 1782 application as to designated documents or categories of documents, the Court would expect to order that Kodak can use its existing discovery database, for those categories of documents o nly, for the sole purpose of prosecuting the U.K. action. Finally, the Court further directs Kodak and Defendants to meet and confer to narrow the scope of contested categories of documents prior to Kodak's filing of any such § 1782 petit ions, and, in any event, no later than February 7, 2020. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at Docket 1212. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/31/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-PAE, 1:14-cv-06849-PAE(cf)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER with respect to (1212) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:13-md-02481-PAE; with respect to (143) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:14-cv-06849-PAE: The Court cannot, on these submissions, reliably determine its jurisdiction over the & #167; 1782(a) petition. The Court accordingly directs Kodak to submit a supplemental letter of no more than 4 pages that: (1) lists the specific persons (or corporate entities) from whom it seeks discovery pursuant to § 1782; (2) sets forth the bases for jurisdiction against each person from whom discovery is sought under del Valle Ruiz; and (3) addresses whether the Court's jurisdiction is impacted by the fact of its presiding over this MDL, see 28 U.S.C. § 1407(b) (allowing dist rict judge overseeing MDL to "exercise the powers of a district judge in any district" for pretrial proceedings), and/or the fact of defendants' participation therein. Kodak's letter is due Friday, January 24, 2020. Defendants ma y submit a response, also of no more than 4 pages, to the narrow issues presented in Kodaks supplemental letter by Tuesday, January 28, 2020. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/21/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-PAE, 1:14-cv-06849-PAE (jwh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastman Kodak Company v. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastman Kodak Company
Represented By: Andrea B. Bierstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goldman Sachs Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro International Trade Services L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Bath LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glencore Xstrata PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glencore Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacorini Metals USA L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacorini Metals AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: London Metal Exchange Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?