Lisboa v. J Sisters 57, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paula Lisboa
Defendant: J Sisters 57, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv08115
Filed: October 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Vernon S. Broderick
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that this case is tentatively scheduled for a three-day jury trial beginning on May 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. While these dates are subject to change, particularly in light of the public health situation, th e parties are directed to be trial ready on that date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a final pretrial conference on April 23, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. I will submit an order closer to that date regarding the logistics for that conference., (Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick., Jury Trial set for 5/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/11/2021) (nb)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER: It is hereby: ORDERED the trial currently scheduled to begin in this case on January 25, 2021 is adjourned. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled in this case for January 11, 2021 is adjourned. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that Defendant and Plaintiffs shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter by no later than February 8, 2021, indicating potential trial dates for some time in April or May 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/7/2021) (rro)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER: It is hereby: ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on January 11, 2021 at 11 AM. The dial-in number is 888-363-4749 and the passcode is 2682448. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file her proposed verdict sheets and proposed jury instructions on or before January 6, 2021. In that filing, Defendant shall also provide a clarification regarding whether she intends to file any motions in limine and, if so, detail which evidence Defendant seeks to exclude. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/5/2021) (rro)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Defendant Santos shall submit her proposed jury instructions and proposed verdict sheets on or before 10 AM on January 4, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/29/2020) (ks)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER, It is hereby: ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for December 14, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. (Doc. 213) is adjourned. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on December 17, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The dial-in number is 888-363-4749 and the access code is 2682448. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/14/20) (yv)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER: The case is tentatively scheduled for trial beginning January 25, 2021. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on December 14, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. The dial-in number for the conference is 888-363-4749 and the access code is 2682448. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/09/2020) (ama)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER: In light of the current public health crisis, it is hereby: ORDERED that the post-discovery conference set for April 2, 2020, is adjourned sine die. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint letter within thirty (30) da ys summarizing the status of discovery in this case and any anticipated motion practice. If the parties anticipate motion practice, the letter shall include a proposed briefing schedule for the Court's review. If the parties anticipate proceeding to trial, the parties shall review Rule 6 of my Individual Rules & Practices in Civil Cases and proceed accordingly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/26/2020) (rro)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER: The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint statute update no later than February 21, 2020, providing the following: 1. A statement of all existing deadlines in the case; 2. A statement describing the status of discovery i n this case, and whether the Court should schedule a post-discovery conference; 3. A statement describing the status of any settlement discussions; 4. A statement as to whether any parties will be making post-discovery motions, and proposing a brie fing schedule for any such motions; 5. A statement as to the status of the defaulting Defendant J Sisters 57, Inc., and the status of the bankruptcy proceedings giving rise to a stay as to Defendants Jonice Padilha and Jocely Padilha. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/11/2020) (jca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisboa v. J Sisters 57, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Lisboa
Represented By: Andrea Maria Paparella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Sisters 57, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?