De La Cruz et al v. City of New York, New York
Plaintiff: Rozana Mandelberg, Raphael Oliver, Maria Luz Almonte, Deborah Robinson, Daisy Guilf, Linda Dennis, Juan Estrada, Delores Johnson, Joselin Checo, Jeffery Campbell, Yvonne Reynolds, Debora Junior, Dean Martinez, Kathleen Dyett, Gertie Augusto, Donna Harden, Lunilda Escolestio, Nivedita Komar, Daphne Caldwell, Tameka Jones, Aramis Lee, Luis Lucas, Miguelina Reyes, Juanita Fuller, Patricia Garrison, Andre Carter, Bernadette Jayco, Tamara Gorelik, Marcia Patterson, Evelin Diaz, Sherriel Fords, Eula Mae Patterson, Shirley Guerrant, Sandra Ludd, Ibilola Awosika, Jonnie Bennett, Kalyani Natarajan, Tyease Gatewood, Rosa Luciano, Debora Chandler, Marcelyn Dupree, Katherine Paulino, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Muriel Dawson, Lorriane Edinboro, Marvin Clear, Jeannine Carter, Jurema Hadley, Bennie Green, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Dealphia Carroll, Natasha Lyons, Cherita Jones, Shiela Alieva, Ayeasha Bishop, Carolyn Frazier, Melodie Crowell, Abimbola Adeyeri, Idalia Avila, Silvia Danens, Jeannette Mota, Vivek Kumar, Darlington Nlemchukwu, Maryann Obilor, Jacqueline Gordon, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Bernard Marti, Minam Hernandez, Sandra Bell, Tajudeen Omamuga, Tiffany Moore, Nina Jones, Thomas Jean-Baptiste, Orlando Norman, Atlanta Okhiria, Alexander Gelpern, Kabir Adiro, Horng Yu Chou, Lindita Loma, Jamie Cooper, Valle Gedeon, Luisa Haddock, Rachel Kemp, Carmen Dominguez, Angela Andino, Elina Kvasha, Peter Kaleeny, Linda Gary, Marlenny Estevez, Victor Ochiobi, Irenna Orzikh, Natasha Moncherry-Polius, Tony Edwards, Ernestine Ragin, Melda Bashien, Patricia Cooper-Small, Emiliya Revich, Maxine Roberts, Mayra Infante, Melissa Enyiema, John Parks, Rosa Parra, Eunice Martin, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Oluwasegun Filani, Sylvia Bashford, Ada Laboy, Angelica Callahan, Felicia Johnson, Veronika Lodzhevskaya, Lorine Coleman, Yuvelky Cruz, Alfred Gonzalez, Emma Brew, Mario Rivera, Varetta Harris, Sheila Aniekwe, Oleksandra Panchyskym, Isabella Bishop-George, Pamela Alfred, Jamila Jones, Margaret Otone, James Cameron, Cheryl Melton, Michael Chapman, Sabrina Little, Dorie Quan, Maria Almonte, Juanita Ancrum, Mena Hernandez, Giovanna Benitez, Cecilia Malone, Claudette Grizzalti, Craig McCosker, Maria Burton, Vinette Fisher, Ann Cato, Thomas Osei, Catherine Desmaratte, Andrew Dalgetty, Arlene Holland, Grace Ndubuisi, Angela Gonzalez, Alfred Johnson, Lyneth Murray, Bernadette Chin-On, Ashley Alleyne, Diomaris Capellaw, Argenis Aristizabal, Jerome Batts, Jr, Larisa Abramova, Ebony Delerme, Caroline Hogans, Alicia Mendez, Linda Ojeda, Marie Francis, Myra McNeal, Svetlana Koverzneva, Doretha Davis, Michemello Jeam-Michel, Maria Gonzalez, Jacqueline Marte, Karen Jeanty-Byer, Eileen Avery, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Igor Monastyrsky, Opal Phillips, Maritza Quinones, Ahesha Fullwood, Lillian Henry, Christian Gomez, Mary Akarumeh, Rosemary Odeyemi, Jacqueline Atalede, Victoria Boyce, Yolette Lissade, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Ashley Reed, Alberto Estrada, Lea Marshall, Osman Mat, Deonarine Pitamber, Marie Jadotte, Shatina Brown, Maria Diaz, Gizella Frost, Kristie Mack, George Foulkes, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, Grace Delgado, Naresh Bhowmik, Luisa Felix, Nicole Barker, Jocelyn Gillot, Mark Meachem, Esmeralda Gerena, Jacqueline Lauretano, Roseann Henry, Alcelio Rivera, William Dabney, Laura Barnes, Brenda Boyce, Dawda Bah, Elsie Ortiz, Allison Ball, Joseph Andrews, Lance Jones, Lucila Montero, Yoselin Perdomo, Junius Perry, Joan Hamilton, Judy Kendrick, Cathy Camacho, Eliana Bauta, Jimmy Cora, Karen Facey, Brian Medas, Barbara Nibot, Jessica Reyes-Peterson, Stephen Asante, Comlan Madou, Judith Guerrier, Yeva Beydieiman, Jahin Jacobs, Deborah Graham, Subedat Habeeb, John James, Sandra Felton, Crisanta Leiva, Sandra Howell-Jones, Denise Robinson, Regina Hardy, Laura Ring, Shu Mei Li, Tiffany Covington, Lillie Rich, Luz Gonzalez, Miguel Hernandez, Jaqueline Raymomb, Patricia James, Howard Fink, Erik Mendez, George Grellet, Dawn Jones, Candice Odom, Letricia Leverett-Williams, Deidre Pryce, P.O. Denise Emanuel, Corthaner Littles-James, Edwin George, Emily Arowolo, Sharon Jackson, Eliana De La Cruz, AKM Amran, Cliff Ali, Juana Colon-Rivera, Angela Hart, Kendrah Johnson, Belinda Hodges, Milagros Perez, Jennifer Jordan, Daniel Ducasse, Yomyra Lopez, Monica Hooper, Maribel Pagan, Natalie Colon, Yetunde Abe, Alice Carrington, Argentina Batistia, Zoila Lorenzo, Diana Lee-Lewis, Josefina Infante, Shereen Gerges, Pamela Farquharson, Robert Mensah, Denise Collum, Elaine Burriss, Shanda Maldon, Janice McNeil, Karen Douglas, Nury Ramirez, Shayne Roberts, Mayra Mercado, Koren Adams, Millicent Crisp, Brenda Hooper, Moustapha Boukari, Dorothy Glover, Thomas Lucas, Dimuthu Ranasinghe, Tiniekqua Dockery, Faye Blue, Sandra Morgan, Johnathan Guzman, Karlene Dacres, Shirley Odom, Cassandra Lattimore, Nadhege Caze, Islyn Chase-Dillon, Deborah Rozier, Forsett Newby, Ayesha Johnson, Venus Mercer, Terry Fulton, Theresa Matos, Obehi Ebesunun, Sharon Gayle, Ynique Jones, Sabrina Davis, Yadirys Estefany, Adenola Ojunda, Janice Joseph, Boby Mathew, Valanza Robinson, Maria Campbell, Andrea Leslie, Tammy Clark, Gloria Ormsby, Renita Bates, Diane Gray, Amelia Hendricks, Regina French, Diane Ramos, Fatima Diaz, Ina Linette Grant, Ismael Almondovar, Kissena Jones, Tracey Jimenez, Augusto DePass, Eldora Logan, Charell Butler, Wayne Edwards, Cleante Jean, Maritza Cordeva, Shirley Bramble, Cheryl Leone, Olawabukola Oladoja, Margarita Minino, Bertha Adedapo, Nurul Huda, Sharon Harris-McGeachy, Valencia Pierre, Julia Bekerman, Eduard Lazarovich, Dawn Moses, Chanize Clark, Josephine Colon, Terence Dixon, Liliya Ladyzhenskya, Tracy Evelyn, Tiffany Broadwater, Altagracia Pena, Ambrose Olayiniyi, Sharina Edwards, David Martinez, Anh Pham, Brian Ferguson, Gladys Castillo, Luis Caballero, Kenneth Romero, Pamela Miller, Charlotte Burris, Telee Brown, Lillian Koeiman, Carolyn McBean, Sherman Richmond, Dulce Guerrero, Aretha Gary, Yvette Gary-Price, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Rita Concepcion, Stefi Moskovits, Ida Peterson, Arisbelkis Moreno, Elaine Frank, Travis Letbetter, Luis Melendez, Camille Lindor, Laura Roberts, Rafael Del Valle, Rosa Hernandez, Zuleyka Morales-Francis, Linda Jones, Radharaus Nuoez, Rowena Lee, Robert Jones, Tatiana Lora, Oladipo Olaleye, Carol Phillips, Elizabeth Rivera, Connie Mason, Andra Cojoc, Motolani Aiku, Chinyere Igboekwe, Kalu Kalu, Lindita Deloj, Nicole Ashman, Rashminda Patel, Galina Grabovsky, Elizabeth Ofikuru, Anatoly Frenkel, Rosa Altamirano, Gernald DeShong, James Alapat, Crystal Grant-Dockery, Michel George, Gregory Davis, Joanna Polidura, Marcella Figueroa, Lillian Irizary, Shatina Allen, Jeranny Liriano, Joanne Glasgow, Gustina Gonzalez, Antonio Mojica, Paul Oyeinole, Shera Evans, Akita Jefferson, Evelyn Dupree, Austin Greaves, Tracie Crane, Rosa Hidalgo, Takina Robinson, William Pereina, Catalina Lebron, Patricia Horsford, Luis Joglar, Marjorie Irigoyen, Vanessa Lee, Otto Flores, Diane Joiner, Nichole Alexander, Leslyn Eastmond, Nolvia Alvarez, Maxime Jean-Pierre, Adrien Egalite, Jane Richardson, Anna Balock, Aghavese Enadeghe, Debra Rivera, Demetry Anemojanis, Yesenia Pagan, Cynthia Murden, Adeline Medard, Kathleen Best, Gaurish Malhotra, Solomon Folashade, Svetlana Cernei, Lillian Dixon, Lola Ingram, Nathaniel Koszer, Ginette Coppex, Maria Ferrer, Jagdish Patel, Wanda Alexander, Rosanna Betances, Mojisola Edun, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Ngozika Frank, Olitan Adedapo, Lizeth Blanco, Titilayo Akuyemi, Shalonda Ross, Maria Mariani, Donna Doxen-Williams, Jerome Pope, Alphonse Rimpel, Natasha Glasgow, Lionel Beaubrun, Sofia Diggs, Elise Garner, Adeline Joseph-Senat, Lydia Mingo, George Nathaniel, Joanne Dash, Carmen Albelo, Lisa Rivers, Maxine Gordon, Jovan Roman, Marcella Greene, Luz Garcia-Martin, Nadine Cenard, Annette Rivera, Carmen Granados, Carmen Cordero, Anthony Riley, Christina Lebron, Marjorie Campbell, Georges Aumoithe, Christina Bermudez, Errol Giordani, Aninder Anra, Leslie McKinnon, Andrea Grace, Donna Gayle-Francis, Chavelis Nunez, Annie McClain, Sameson Louis, Jorge Ortiz, Jr, Kapo Guandique-Li, Ferdine Polynice, Lori Mayers, Jennifer Jones, Sharon Newell, Emily Ikpaha, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Asra Horton, Sandra Reves-Gil, Minerva Moreno-Roman, Taschica Pickering, Siobhan Glynn, Jacob Abadariki, Trevor Bedeau, Ramon Franco, Kevin Pritchett, Sharon Dolphin, Helen Iyasere, Sandra Anglin, Marvin Glover, Marjorie Dorsaint, Birmania Garcia Pineiro, Morufu Animashaun, Diego Curatolo, Ijeoma Murray, Janea Gilford, Errol Brown, Mirna Robles, Emily Fayomi, Cassandra Fonollosa, Mercedes Espinal, Tracy Campbel, Myrtle Petrus, Nina Louissaint, Angela Contreras, Joan Alvarado, Joan Higgins, Regina Allen, Elaine Harbin, David Butler, Janet James, Saskia Medford, Michelle Feller, Sharon Joyner, Deborah Reyes, Rosaline Iwuagwu, Robertino Cox, Silvia Lester, Israel Blanco, Joy Durrant, Cesarina Martinez, Maria Morel, Maritza Dilone, Diana Carlo, Wendy Marte, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Michael Henderson, Maya Entin, Titilayo Osindero, Lulu Hopkins, Nurys Gonzalez, Napoleon Imarhiagbe, Felix Rodriguez, Vibha Raval, Horace Friend, Rosa Candelario, Nicole Bowen, Olasupo Kofoworola, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Carlos Espinal, Bonita Johnson, Karlin Romain, Dalia Butcher, Sunday Ayanfodun, Angela Garcia, Tamikka McCray, Belkis Araujo, Joy Brewster, Annmarie Robinson-Warren, Velda Ingus, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Deyanira De Los Santos, Ginette Moore, Nina Mantelman, Ramachandran Kumaran, Michael Jacob, Sariya Brown, Linda Moses, Nelly Jacome, Lavone Epps, Sherene Cato, Nilsa Demorizi, Tina Johnson, Anne McClellan, Djuana Copeland, Madeline Goodwin, Ligia Medina, Janet Hughes, Tremayne Bunche, Florence Fanja, Esther Agront, Sabrina Dennis, Barbara Jackson-Neville, Virginia Hernandez, Lillian Rodriguez, Sunday Nwachukwu, Diana Gray, Sharon Fuller, Shirley Griffin, Diana Kearney, Jacqueline Hunter, Sheila Hudson, Cynthia Depeiza, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Maya ElSayed, Madelyn Naves, Sheila Butler, Henry Bonilla, Lueverna Jackson, Collette Johnson, Nicole Brown, Zaida Miranda, Evelyn Hernandez, Risikat Hassan, LaShonna Fullen, Modesta Baltazar, Evelyn Brito, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Ananias Moran, Mirlande Cadet, Madeline Candeloria, Michael Medua, James Parker, Delores Gibson, Cameron Pierce, Lawrence Fondiller, Tabitha Lawson, Carmen Charriez, Bailey Latonya, Ednita Cheek, Winston Morris, Charles Garcia, Carmen Freeman, Musaddeque Choudhury, Junior Bontemps, Eula Campbell, Marilyn Matheson, Lorraine Crockett, Darlene Peay, Evelyn Cheng, Atiya Boyd, Patricia Marrow, Yvetter LeCraft, Thomas Kamara, Joan Anderson, Yolanda Mejias, Maria Rosales, Clarence Everett, Derrick Hawkins, Migdalia Moore, . Terry Payton, Donalyn Edwards, Latanya Johannes, Kathleen Beckles, Daniel Akpata, Carmen Libran, Bertha Mitchell, Andrea Patterson, Idowu Kingsley, Evelyn Echevarria, Jenny Fuentes, Vivian Rubio, Ninotte Nelson, Juan Faria, Awilda Gamboa, Altagracia Brito, Emmanuella Amazan, Rhonda Roker, Ana Abreu, Natasha McGriff, Antwain Letbetter, Haydee Medina, Felicia Palmer, Awilda Guadalupe, Ludmila Matseleker, Sherryl Reese, Tommy Lau, Cecilia Nwachukwu, Angela Carr, Daisy Davis, Freddy Rodriguez, Akeem Onilenla, Edward Green, Larisa Manuk, Lydia Parsons-Williams, Amarilis Batista, Mirta Pagliaro, Juan Carlos Mejia-Velez, Naomi Robinson, Dara Chapman, Tina Odom-Ashton, Katia Cociffi, Aurea Bonet, Janet Romero, Rosa Acosta, Conchetta Riddick, Shameeka Hill, Alba Reves, David Bartolo, Deborah Haines, Emmanuel Auguste, Ana Perez, Debra Lowers, Evelyn Flaharty, Ramona Nunez, Tayisha Butler, Andrea Morgan-Hargett, Jesus Rodriguez, Glenda Peterson, Yolanda DeJesus, Bessie Rodriguez, Charles Oliva, Janice French-Garrett, Vickie Matheny, Fiona Chen, Tawa Bakarey, Marilyn Mizzell, Keena James, Paula McIntosh, Izobella Beskin, Carmelitta Cunningham, Shondell Charles, Maria Lopez, Tracey Flood, James Cottrell, Hilda Hernandez, Melvin Irby, Joan Boston, Sandra Ramos, Ronald Adams, Maria Buffa, Elethia Giff, Marcel Harding, Temidopi Olaky, Linda Heastie-Haddock, Djavhir Rakhamimou, Michael Domingo, Clara Luker, Justin Kinney, Sandra Heller, Donella Bell and Nicole Kelly
Defendant: City of New York, New York
Case Number: 1:2014cv09220
Filed: November 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Bronx
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Referring Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit re: #179 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #182 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Pestana Deposition)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER denying #184 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal. The application is denied. The Lugosch standard is not met. The testimony was taken because the City sought to rely of the advise of its lawyer and thus waived the privilege. The fact that testimony involves a waiver of the attorney-client privilege does not support a request for sealing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/20/2019) (jca)
April 12, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Molly Ann Elkin on behalf of Eliana De La Cruz. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Elkin, Molly)
April 12, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Diana J. Nobile on behalf of Eliana De La Cruz. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Nobile, Diana)
April 12, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Eliana De La Cruz. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Block, Sarah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David William Ricksecker on behalf of Eliana De La Cruz. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Ricksecker, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory Keith McGillivary on behalf of Eliana De La Cruz. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (McGillivary, Gregory)
March 19, 2019 Filing 186 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated March 19, 2019 re: Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Providing Notice of Supplemental Authority on Plaintiffs' Motion. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
March 18, 2019 Filing 185 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated March 18, 2019 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Finding that Plaintiffs Are Similarly Situated. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion and Order, Perry v. City of New York)(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 5, 2018 Filing 184 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 10/5/2018. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory McGillivary, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 183 DECLARATION of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support re: #178 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated under the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Hearing Transcripts, #2 Exhibit 2. Trial Plan, #3 Exhibit 3. Chart of Plf. Testimony Re: Preapproval, #4 Exhibit 4. Chart of Plf. Testimony Re: Management Knowledge, #5 Exhibit 5. Employee Code of Conduct, #6 Exhibit 6. Buchanan 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit 7. Campbell 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8. Ospino 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #9 Exhibit 9. Pestana 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #10 Exhibit 10. Ross 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, #11 Exhibit 11. Ataliede Deposition Transcript, #12 Exhibit 12. Bhowmick Deposition Transcript, #13 Exhibit 13. Caze Deposition Transcript, #14 Exhibit 14. Chou Deposition Transcript, #15 Exhibit 15. Cirigliano-Doria Deposition Transcript, #16 Exhibit 16. Cordova Deposition Transcript, #17 Exhibit 17. Davis Deposition Transcript, #18 Exhibit 18. De La Cruz Deposition Transcript, #19 Exhibit 19. Epps Deposition Transcript, #20 Exhibit 20. Felton Deposition Transcript, #21 Exhibit 21. Frazier Deposition Transcript, #22 Exhibit 22. Hardy Deposition Transcript, #23 Exhibit 23. Hernandez Deposition Transcript, #24 Exhibit 24. Johnson Deposition Transcript, #25 Exhibit 25.Lucas Deposition Transcript, #26 Exhibit 26. Luciano Deposition Transcript, #27 Exhibit 27. McNeil Deposition Transcript, #28 Exhibit 28. Miller Deposition Transcript, #29 Exhibit 29. Minino Deposition Transcript, #30 Exhibit 30. Moreno Deposition Transcript, #31 Exhibit 31. Morris Deposition Transcript, #32 Exhibit 32. Oliver Deposition Transcript, #33 Exhibit 33. Pierre Deposition Transcript, #34 Exhibit 34. Pritchett Deposition Transcript, #35 Exhibit 35. Ramos Deposition Transcript, #36 Exhibit 36. Ranasinghe Deposition Transcript, #37 Exhibit 37. Reyes-Peterson Deposition Transcript, #38 Exhibit 38. Rosales Deposition Transcript, #39 Exhibit 39. Sapp Deposition Transcript, #40 Exhibit 40. St. Cloud Deposition Transcript, #41 Exhibit 41. Tingling Deposition Transcript, #42 Exhibit 42. Yuen Deposition Transcript)(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 182 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #178 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated under the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 181 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelman in Opposition re: #178 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated under the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-S, #2 Exhibits T-AQ)(Ekelman, Felice)
September 6, 2018 Filing 180 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #178 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated under the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
September 6, 2018 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #178 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated under the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 178 MOTION for a Finding that the Plaintiffs are Similarly Situated under the Fair Labor Standards Act . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #176 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/6/2018) (ne)
September 4, 2018 Filing 176 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated September 4, 2018. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(Nobile, Diana)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to briefing concerning the issue of whether Plaintiffs in these two actions are "similarly situated": 1. Plaintiffs' briefs are due on July 2, 2018; 2. Defendant's briefs are due on August 23, 2018; and 3. Plaintiffs' replies, if any, are due on September 6, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the page limit will be extended to 30 pages for Plaintiffs' moving briefs and Defendant's opposition papers. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 7/2/2018., Responses due by 8/23/2018, Replies due by 9/6/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/20/2018) (ama)
June 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 6/19/2018. (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum) (mr)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying #159 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. For the reasons stated above, the City's motion to certify this Court's September 30, 2017 Summary Judgment Order for interlocutory appeal is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. No. 163 in 14 Civ. 4142; Dkt. no. 159 in 14 Civ. 9220). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/18/2018) (mro)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for May 10, 2018 is adjourned to June 19, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 6/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/9/2018) (cf)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for April 24, 2018 is adjourned to May 10, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 5/10/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/23/2018) (rj)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for April 11, 2018 is adjourned to April 24, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 4/24/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/10/2018) (cf)
March 28, 2018 Filing 170 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated March 28, 2018 re: Reply to Defendant's March 27, 2018 Letter. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
March 27, 2018 Filing 169 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated March 27, 2018 re: Defendant's 1292(b) Motion. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Perry v. City of New York, Case No. 13-01015, ECF Dkt. 168, (S.D.N.Y Mar. 26, 2018), #2 Lynch v. City of New York, Case No. 16-05677, ECF Dkt. 112, (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 12, 2018))(Ekelman, Felice)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for February 07, 2018 is adjourned to April 11, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 4/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Docketed in 14cv4142 and 14cv9220) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/6/2018) (ap)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for January 19, 2018 is adjourned to February 7, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 2/7/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/18/2018) (ama)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for January 05, 2018 is adjourned to January 19, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 1/19/2018 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/4/2018) (cf)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for December 21, 2017 is adjourned to January 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/15/2017) (cf)
December 1, 2017 Filing 164 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated December 1, 2017 re: Trial Plan Proposals. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Trial Plan Summary, #2 Exhibit 1 - Monroe v. FTS USA Verdict Form, #3 Exhibit 2 - Abadeer v. Tyson Order re. Bifurcation)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #158 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated November 28, 2017. Document filed by City of New York, New York. So ordered. (Status Conference set for 12/21/2017 at 10:15 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/29/2017) (rjm)
November 29, 2017 Filing 162 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #159 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)). . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
November 29, 2017 Filing 161 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #159 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)). . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nov. 2, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Decision, Perez v. City of NY, #3 Exhibit C - Exhibit C - Status Report, Perez v. City of NY, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Settlement, Perez v. City of NY)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 29, 2017 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #159 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)). . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
November 29, 2017 Filing 159 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)). Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 28, 2017 Filing 158 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated November 28, 2017. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 3, 2017 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger, for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute. Magistrate Judge James C. Francis no longer referred to the case. (bcu) Modified on 11/7/2017 (gp).
November 2, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 11/2/2017, ( Status Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (mr)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMO ENDORSED on re: (155 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF)(158 in 1:14-cv-4142-PGG-JCF) (155 in 1:14-cv-9220-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The conference will proceed as scheduled on Nov.2, 2017. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/1/2017) (js) Modified on 12/13/2017 (js).
November 1, 2017 Filing 156 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated November 1, 2017 re: Opposition to City's Request for Adjournment of the Nov. 2, 2017 Scheduling Conference. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 1, 2017 Filing 155 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated November 1, 2017 re: Status Conference. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for November 3, 2017 is adjourned to November 2, 2017 at 4:15 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 11/2/2017 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/31/2017) (cf)
October 12, 2017 Filing 153 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated October 12, 2017 re: Status Update. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to Nov. 3, 2017 at 12:30 p.m. Status Conference set for 11/3/2017 at 12:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/6/2017) (cf)
October 4, 2017 Filing 151 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated October 3, 2017. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
September 30, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/17/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (mro)
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #133 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-04142-PGG-JCF; denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion #137 Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-04142-PGG-JCF; granting in part and denying in part #132 Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF; granting in part and denying in part #135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF. The parties' motions for summary judgment are granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. To summarize, the Foster and De La Cruz Plaintiffs are granted as follows: (1) the FLSA's executive exemption does not apply to the Foster and De La Cruz Plaintiffs; (2) the City has violated the FLSA by failing to compensate Plaintiffs for time it suffered or permitted them to work before and after scheduled shifts, and during their unpaid lunch periods; (3) the City has violated the FLSA to the extent that meal allowances and night shift differentials have not been included in calculating the "regular rate of pay" that is relied on for purposes of computing overtime compensation; and (4) the City has violated the FLSA to the extent that it has "paid" compensatory time at a straight-time rate. Plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment are otherwise denied. The City's cross-motions for summary judgment are granted as to the twenty-seven Foster and De La Cruz Plaintiffs who did not disclose their FLSA claims on their bankruptcy petitions. The City's cross-motions are otherwise denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 133, 137 in 14 Civ. 4142; Dkt. Nos. 132, 135 in 14 Civ 9220). The Court will conduct a conference in these matters on October 17, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. The parties will submit a joint letter to the Court by October 12, 2017, addressing how they believe these cases should proceed in light of this Court's summary judgment decision. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/30/2017) (mro)
August 11, 2017 Filing 149 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 8/11/2017 re: Response to City's August 9, 2017 Letter. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 9, 2017 Filing 148 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated August 3, 2017 re: Seventh Circuit Court's Auguist 3, 2017 Decision in Allen v. City of Chicago. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ekelman, Felice)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/14/2017) (cf)
February 24, 2017 Filing 146 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated February 24, 2017 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 145 REPLY - DEFENDANT'S REBUTTAL TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S LOCAL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 144 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment (PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT). . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 143 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 2/24/2017 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 142 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendant's Additional Facts)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment (PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT). . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Response to Rule 56.1 Statement)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE of Filing Appendix Including Supporting Declarations re: #135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. JOS Position Description, #2 Exhibit 2. AJOS Position Description, #3 Exhibit 3. JOS Tasks and Standards, #4 Exhibit 4. AJOS Tasks and Standards, #5 Exhibit 5. CityTime User Training Manual, #6 Exhibit 6. Declaration of Dr. Louis Lanier (January 11, 2017), #7 Exhibit 7. Employee Time and Leave, Procedure No. P-14-03, #8 Exhibit 8. Overtime Authorization and Control, #9 Exhibit 9. E-mail Re Overtime Budget Reductions, #10 Exhibit 10. Employee Code of Conduct, #11 Exhibit 11. Interrogatories, #12 Exhibit 12. Tingling CityTime, #13 Exhibit 13. CityTime Self Paced Training Part I, #14 Exhibit 13.1 CityTime Self Paced Training Part II, #15 Exhibit 14. Expert Report of Dr. Christopher Erath (Oct.18, 2016), #16 Exhibit 15. Second Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Louis Lanier (Nov.18, 2016), #17 Exhibit 16. Declaration of Maikudi Okore, #18 Exhibit 17. Plaintiffs' Notices of Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions, #19 Exhibit 18. Second Declaration of Dr. Louis Lanier (February 10, 2017), #20 Exhibit 19. December 27, 2016 Order issued in Bland, et al. v. PNC Bank and Gokhberg, et al. v. PNC Bank, #21 Exhibit 20. Ataliede, Jacqueline, #22 Exhibit 21. Bhowmick, Naresh, #23 Exhibit 22. Caze, Nadhege, #24 Exhibit 23. Chou, Horng Yu, #25 Exhibit 24. Cirigliano-Doria, Victoria, #26 Exhibit 25. Cordova, Maritza, #27 Exhibit 26. Davis, Gregory, #28 Exhibit 27. De La Cruz, Eliana, #29 Exhibit 28. Epps, Lavone, #30 Exhibit 29. Felton, Sandra, #31 Exhibit 30. Frazier, Carolyn, #32 Exhibit 31. Hardy, Barberly, #33 Exhibit 32. Hernandez, Miguel, #34 Exhibit 33. Johnson, Kendrah, #35 Exhibit 34. Lucas, Thomas, #36 Exhibit 35. Luciano, Rosa, #37 Exhibit 36. McNeil, Janice, #38 Exhibit 37. Miller, Pamela, #39 Exhibit 38. Minino, Margarita, #40 Exhibit 39. Moreno-Roman, Minerva, #41 Exhibit 40. Morris, Winston, #42 Exhibit 41. Oliver, Raphael, #43 Exhibit 42. Pierre, Valencia, #44 Exhibit 43. Pritchett, Kevin, #45 Exhibit 44. Ramos, Diane, #46 Exhibit 45. Ranasinghe, Dimuthu, #47 Exhibit 46. Reyes-Petterson, Jessica, #48 Exhibit 47. Rosales, Maria, #49 Exhibit 48. Sapp, Trina, #50 Exhibit 49. St. Cloud, Lisa, #51 Exhibit 50. Tingling, Lanette, #52 Exhibit 51. Yuen, Henry, #53 Exhibit 52. Buchanan, Betty, #54 Exhibit 53. Campbell, Marlene, #55 Exhibit 54. Cullum, Mark, #56 Exhibit 55. Dannenberg, Barbara, #57 Exhibit 56. Gaut, Gwendolyn, #58 Exhibit 57. Ospino, Madeleine, #59 Exhibit 58. Pestana, Georgia (Filed Under Seal), #60 Exhibit 59. Ross, Pamela, #61 Exhibit 60. Logan, Heather, #62 Exhibit 61. Nicholas, William, #63 Exhibit 62. Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (Jan. 13, 2017), #64 Exhibit 63. Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (February 10, 2017), #65 Exhibit 64. Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support of Plaintiffs Appendix and Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment (February 24, 2017))(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 139 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #137 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 137 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 24, 2017 Filing 134 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Exhibit E - PART 1, #4 Exhibit E - PART 2, #5 Exhibit E - PART 3, #6 Exhibit E - PART 4, #7 Exhibit F - L, #8 Exhibit M - N, #9 Exhibit O - Q, #10 Exhibit R, #11 Exhibit S, #12 Exhibit T, #13 Exhibit U - W, #14 Exhibit X - Z, #15 Exhibit AA - AG, #16 Exhibit AH - AI, #17 Exhibit AJ - AP, #18 Exhibit AQ - AS, #19 Exhibit AT - AZ, #20 Exhibit BA - BE, #21 Exhibit BF-BG PART 1, #22 Exhibit BG - PART 2, #23 Exhibit BG - PART 3, #24 Exhibit BG - PART 4, #25 Exhibit BH-BI PART 1, #26 Exhibit BI - PART 2, #27 Exhibit BI - PART 3, #28 Exhibit BJ - BQ, #29 Exhibit BR, #30 Exhibit BS, #31 Exhibit BT, #32 Exhibit BU - BV, #33 Exhibit BW, #34 Exhibit BX - BY, #35 Exhibit BZ - CM, #36 Exhibit CN - PART 1, #37 Exhibit CN - PART 2, #38 Exhibit CN PART 3 - CU, #39 Exhibit CV - DE, #40 Exhibit DF - DL, #41 Exhibit DM - DT)(Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment (PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT). . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 24, 2017 Filing 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment (PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT). Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
December 23, 2016 Filing 131 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #130 Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/23/2016) (mro)
December 22, 2016 Filing 130 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated December 22, 2016 re: Request to Enlrage Memorandum of Law Page Limit. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for December 1, 2016 is adjourned sine die. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to the parties' motions for summary judgment: 1. Parties' motions are due on January 13, 2017; 2. Opposition papers are due on February 10, 2017; and 3. Replies, if any, are due on February 24, 2017. (Motions due by 1/13/2017., Responses due by 2/10/2017, Replies due by 2/24/2017.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/28/2016) (cf)
November 23, 2016 Filing 128 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated November 23, 2016 re: Opposition to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter (Summary Judgment). Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 23, 2016 Filing 127 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 23, 2016 re: Opposition to Plaintiff's Pre-motion Letter Regarding Summary Judgment. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 18, 2016 Filing 126 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 18, 2016 re: Pre-motion Letter (Summary Judgment). Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 18, 2016 Filing 125 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 11/18/2016 re: Pre-Motion Letter (Summary Judgment). Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this action previously scheduled for December 1, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. is adjourned to December 1, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York.(Status Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/15/2016) (cf)
October 27, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 10/27/2016. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley) (mr)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: that the conference in these matters previously scheduled for 10/18/2016 is adjourned to 10/27/2016 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 10/27/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/17/2016) (tro)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to Oct. 18, 2016 at 10:30 A.M. (Status Conference set for 10/18/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/5/2016) (cla)
September 27, 2016 Filing 121 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman dated 9/27/2016. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
September 26, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/12/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (kl)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying #84 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. On February 22, 2016, Defendant City of New York moved to disqualify Plaintiffs' counsel in both of these related actions. (Dkt. No. 87 in 14 Civ. 4142; Dkt. No. 84 in 14 Civ. 9220) For reasons that will be set forth on the record at the conference scheduled below, Defendant's motions are denied. It is hereby ORDERED that there shall be a conference in these matters on October 12, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. No. 87 in 14 Civ. 4142; Dkt. No. 84 in 14 Civ. 9220). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/26/2016) (kl)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF OUT-OF-TITLE PLAINTIFFS WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), the plaintiffs hereby stipulate to the dismissal without prejudice of the following individuals who did not work in the title of Job Opportunity Specialist or Associate Job Opportunity Specialist Level 1 during the relevant recovery period (i.e., three years prior to the date their claims were filed in court to the present). (As further set forth in this Order) Sylvia Bashford, Donella Bell, Israel Blanco, Diana Carlo, Dealphia Carroll, Jeannine Carter, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Denise Collum, Carmen Cordero, James Cottrell, William Dabney, Andrew Dalgetty, Joanne Dash, Sabrina Davis, Fatima Diaz, Sharon Dolphin, Wayne Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Pamela Farquharson, Maria Ferrer, Howard Fink, Vinette Fisher, Tracey Flood, Janice French-Garrett, Deborah Graham, Jurema Hadley, Sharon Harris-McGeachy, Michael Henderson, Amelia Hendricks, Mayra Infante, Rosaline Iwuagwu, Sharon Jackson, Janet James, Tracey Jimenez, Bonita Johnson, Cherita Jones, Debora Junior, Kalu Kalu, Cassandra Lattimore, Yvetter LeCraft, Larisa Manuk, Leslie McKinnon, Zaida Miranda, Dawn Moses, Jeannette Mota, Lyneth Murray, Ninotte Nelson, Maribel Pagan, Yesenia Pagan, William Pereina, Glenda Peterson, Valanza Robinson, Esther Agront and Stephen Asante terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/14/2016) (kl)
September 9, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE of Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Certain Out-of-Title Plaitniffs. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (McGillivary, Gregory)
August 26, 2016 Filing 117 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated August 26, 2016 re: Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel (DKT 84-89). Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REVISED ORDER DISMISSING NON-COMPLIANT PLAINTIFFS WITH PREJUDICE granting #111 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss sixteen Non- Complaint Plaintiffs with prejudice for failing to appear for deposition, as directed by the Court's Orders dated March 14, 2016 and May 4, 2016, is hereby GRANTED. These Phase-One Plaintiffs are: (1) Rosa Altamirano, (2) Gladys Castillo, (3) Cecilia Nwachukwu, (4) Evelin Diaz,(5) Joan Hamilton, (6) John James, (7) David Martinez, (8) Emiliya Revich, (9) Margarita Silverio, (10) Hilary Williams, (11) Andre Carter, (12) Yvette Gary-Price, (13) Andrea Morgan- Hargett, (14) Alphonse Rimpel, (15) Alfred Johnson, and ( 16) Mercedes Wolff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/23/2016) (ama)
August 19, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (kl)
August 19, 2016 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. (Supplemental Declaration) in Support re: #111 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs.. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Filing 114 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #111 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs. . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #111 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs. . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Filing 112 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. in Support re: #111 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs.. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Filing 111 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (109 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by Eliana De La Cruz, (110 in 1:14-cv-04142-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by Keisha Foster. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. The next conference in these cases will take place on Dec. 1, 2016 at 10:00 A.M. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 11/21/2016., Motions due by 1/13/2017., Status Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/19/2016) (kl)
August 10, 2016 Filing 109 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated August 10, 2016 re: Status Update. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 5, 2016 Filing 108 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/6/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
August 5, 2016 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 7/6/2016 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2016.(Siwik, Christine)
July 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 7/6/2016, ( Telephone Conference set for 9/8/2016 at 05:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (Court Reporter Jerry Harrison) (mr)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #105 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated June 8, 2016 re: Request to Reschedule July 7, 2016 Status Conference. Document filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. So ordered. The conference will proceed on July 6, 2016 at 11:30AM. (Status Conference set for 7/6/2016 at 11:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/10/2016) (rjm)
June 8, 2016 Filing 105 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated June 8, 2016 re: Request to Reschedule July 7, 2016 Status Conference. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
June 2, 2016 Filing 104 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated June 2, 2016 re: Response to Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #100 Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. With their moving papers, Defendant will submit a proposed order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/1/2016) (kl)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting #101 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to July 7, 2016 at 11:00 A.M. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 101. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 7/1/2016., Status Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/1/2016) (kl)
June 1, 2016 Filing 101 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated June 1, 2016., JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated June 1, 2016. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
May 27, 2016 Filing 100 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. re: Pre Motion Letter Dismissal of Plaintiffs who have Failed to Comply with Discovery. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #97 Motion for Steven J. Seidenfeld to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 97. SO ORDERED. Attorney Steven Joshua Seidenfeld terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/13/2016) (kl)
May 12, 2016 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Steven J. Seidenfeld in Support re: #97 MOTION for Steven J. Seidenfeld to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Seidenfeld, Steven)
May 12, 2016 Filing 97 MOTION for Steven J. Seidenfeld to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Seidenfeld, Steven)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #94 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to June 9, 2016 at 12:30 pm. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 94. (Status Conference set for 6/9/2016 at 12:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/4/2016) (spo) (Main Document 96 replaced on 5/4/2016) (spo). Modified on 5/4/2016 (spo).
May 4, 2016 Filing 95 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #93 Letter re: Outstanding Discovery, filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Discovery due by 6/1/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/4/2016) (spo)
May 3, 2016 Filing 94 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated May 3, 2016. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
May 3, 2016 Filing 93 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated May 3, 2016 re: Outstanding Discovery. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #90 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting #91 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is Granted. The April 7, 2016 conference is adjourned to May 5, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 93 and 94 in 14-cv-4142 and Dkt. No. 90 and 91 in 14-cv-9220. SO ORDERED.( Discovery due by 5/1/2016., Status Conference set for 5/5/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/14/2016) (ama)
March 11, 2016 Filing 91 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Reschedule addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 3/11/2016. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
March 11, 2016 Filing 90 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 3/11/2016. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 22, 2016 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #84 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary and Supporting Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Ronald Jones)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 22, 2016 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelam, Esq. (Reply Declaration) and in Support re: #84 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9)(Ekelman, Felice)
February 22, 2016 Filing 87 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #84 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 22, 2016 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. in Support re: #84 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14)(Ekelman, Felice)
February 22, 2016 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #84 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Ekelman, Felice)
February 22, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
February 9, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/12/2016. Replies due by 2/22/2016. (adc)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #79 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated February 2, 2016. The Application is granted. The Clerk will terminate Dkt No. 81 in Foster, 14 Civ. 4142 and Dkt. No. 79 in De la Cruz, 14 Civil 9220. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/9/2016) (adc)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act. The plaintiffs' motions to compel (Docket no. 57 in Foster v. City of New York, 14 Civ. 4142; Docket no. 56 in De la Cruz v. City of New York, No. 14 Civ. 9220) are granted in part and denied in part as discussed above. Within fourteen days of the date of this order, the defendant shall (1) produce the documents over which it has waived privilege, (2) serve a supplemented privilege log, and (3) designate a Rule 30(b)(6) witness. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/5/2016) Copies Sent By Chambers. (adc)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is granted. The conferences are adjourned to April 7, 2016 at 10:15 A.M. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 82 in 14 Civ 4142 and Dkt. No. 80 in 14 Civ. 9220. Status Conference set for 4/7/2016 at 10:15 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/2/2016) (mro)
February 2, 2016 Filing 80 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated February 2, 2016. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 2, 2016 Filing 79 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated February 2, 2016. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated January 21, 2016. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. The Application is granted. So ordered. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 79 in Foster and Dkt. No. 77 in De La Cruz. (Discovery due by 3/11/2016). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/28/2016) (rjm)
January 21, 2016 Filing 77 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated January 21, 2016. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
December 23, 2015 Filing 76 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Defendant's First Privilege Log)(McGillivary, Gregory)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to Defendant's motions to disqualify Plaintiffs' counsel: Defendant's motions are due on January 22, 2016. Plaintiffs' oppositions are due on February 8, 2016. Defendant's replies, if any, are due on February 16, 2016. (Motions due by 1/22/2016., Responses due by 2/8/2016, Replies due by 2/16/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/22/2015) (kko)
December 22, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 12/22/2015. (Court Reporter Sonya Huggins) (mr)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that there shall be a conference in these matters on December 22, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 12/22/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/18/2015) (kko)
December 14, 2015 Filing 73 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #67 Letter filed by Eliana De La Cruz. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted., Attorney Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/14/2015) (lmb)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #66 Motion for David Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/14/2015) (cdo) Modified on 12/23/2015 (cdo).
December 14, 2015 Filing 71 DECLARATION of G. Pestana, Esq. in Opposition re: #56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2015 Filing 70 DECLARATION in Opposition re: #56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Errata)(Brecher, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2015 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2015 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by Jacob Abadariki, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Yetunde Abe, Larisa Abramova, Ana Abreu, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Rosa Acosta, Koren Adams, Ronald Adams, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Bertha Adedapo, Olitan Adedapo, Abimbola Adeyeri, Kabir Adiro, Esther Agront, Motolani Aiku, Mary Akarumeh, Daniel Akpata, Titilayo Akuyemi, James Alapat, Carmen Albelo, Nichole Alexander, Wanda Alexander, Pamela Alfred, Cliff Ali, Shiela Alieva, Regina Allen, Shatina Allen, Ashley Alleyne, Ismael Almondovar, Maria Almonte, Maria Luz Almonte, Rosa Altamirano, Joan Alvarado, Nolvia Alvarez, Emmanuella Amazan, AKM Amran, Juanita Ancrum, Joan Anderson, Angela Andino, Joseph Andrews, Demetry Anemojanis, Sandra Anglin, Sheila Aniekwe, Morufu Animashaun, Aninder Anra, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Belkis Araujo, Argenis Aristizabal, Emily Arowolo, Stephen Asante, Nicole Ashman, Jacqueline Atalede, Emmanuel Auguste, Gertie Augusto, Georges Aumoithe, Eileen Avery, Idalia Avila, Ibilola Awosika, Sunday Ayanfodun, Dawda Bah, Tawa Bakarey, Allison Ball, Anna Balock, Modesta Baltazar, Nicole Barker, Laura Barnes, David Bartolo, Sylvia Bashford, Melda Bashien, Renita Bates, Amarilis Batista, Argentina Batistia, Jerome Batts, Jr, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Eliana Bauta, Lionel Beaubrun, Kathleen Beckles, Trevor Bedeau, Julia Bekerman, Donella Bell, Sandra Bell, Giovanna Benitez, Jonnie Bennett, Christina Bermudez, Izobella Beskin, Kathleen Best, Rosanna Betances, Yeva Beydieiman, Naresh Bhowmik, Ayeasha Bishop, Isabella Bishop-George, Israel Blanco, Lizeth Blanco, Faye Blue, Aurea Bonet, Henry Bonilla, Junior Bontemps, Joan Boston, Moustapha Boukari, Nicole Bowen, Brenda Boyce, Victoria Boyce, Atiya Boyd, Shirley Bramble, Emma Brew, Joy Brewster, Altagracia Brito, Evelyn Brito, Tiffany Broadwater, Nicole Brown, Sariya Brown, Telee Brown, Errol Brown, Shatina Brown, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Maria Buffa, Tremayne Bunche, Charlotte Burris, Elaine Burriss, Maria Burton, Dalia Butcher, Charell Butler, David Butler, Tayisha Butler, Sheila Butler, Luis Caballero, Mirlande Cadet, Daphne Caldwell, Angelica Callahan, Cathy Camacho, James Cameron, Tracy Campbel, Eula Campbell, Jeffery Campbell, Maria Campbell, Marjorie Campbell, Rosa Candelario, Madeline Candeloria, Diomaris Capellaw, Diana Carlo, Angela Carr, Alice Carrington, Dealphia Carroll, Andre Carter, Jeannine Carter, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Gladys Castillo, Ann Cato, Sherene Cato, Nadhege Caze, Nadine Cenard, Svetlana Cernei, Debora Chandler, Dara Chapman, Michael Chapman, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Shondell Charles, Carmen Charriez, Islyn Chase-Dillon, Joselin Checo, Ednita Cheek, Fiona Chen, Evelyn Cheng, Bernadette Chin-On, Horng Yu Chou, Musaddeque Choudhury, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, City of New York, New York, Chanize Clark, Tammy Clark, Marvin Clear, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Katia Cociffi, Andra Cojoc, Lorine Coleman, Denise Collum, Josephine Colon, Natalie Colon, Juana Colon-Rivera, Rita Concepcion, Angela Contreras, Jamie Cooper, Patricia Cooper-Small, Djuana Copeland, Ginette Coppex, Jimmy Cora, Carmen Cordero, Maritza Cordeva, James Cottrell, Tiffany Covington, Robertino Cox, Tracie Crane, Millicent Crisp, Lorraine Crockett, Melodie Crowell, Yuvelky Cruz, Carmelitta Cunningham, Diego Curatolo, William Dabney, Karlene Dacres, Andrew Dalgetty, Silvia Danens, Joanne Dash, Daisy Davis, Doretha Davis, Gregory Davis, Sabrina Davis, Muriel Dawson, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Eliana De La Cruz, Deyanira De Los Santos, Yolanda DeJesus, Augusto DePass, Gernald DeShong, Rafael Del Valle, Ebony Delerme, Grace Delgado, Lindita Deloj, Nilsa Demorizi, Linda Dennis, Sabrina Dennis, Cynthia Depeiza, Catherine Desmaratte, Evelin Diaz, Fatima Diaz, Maria Diaz, Maria Diaz, Sofia Diggs, Maritza Dilone, Lillian Dixon, Terence Dixon, Tiniekqua Dockery, Sharon Dolphin, Michael Domingo, Carmen Dominguez, Marjorie Dorsaint, Karen Douglas, Donna Doxen-Williams, Daniel Ducasse, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Evelyn Dupree, Marcelyn Dupree, Joy Durrant, Kathleen Dyett, Leslyn Eastmond, Obehi Ebesunun, Evelyn Echevarria, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Lorriane Edinboro, Mojisola Edun, Donalyn Edwards, Sharina Edwards, Tony Edwards, Wayne Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Maya ElSayed, Denise Emanuel, Aghavese Enadeghe, Maya Entin, Melissa Enyiema, Lavone Epps, Lunilda Escolestio, Carlos Espinal, Mercedes Espinal, Yadirys Estefany, Marlenny Estevez, Alberto Estrada, Juan Estrada, Shera Evans, Tracy Evelyn, Clarence Everett, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Karen Facey, Florence Fanja, Juan Faria, Pamela Farquharson, Emily Fayomi, Luisa Felix, Michelle Feller, Sandra Felton, Brian Ferguson, Maria Ferrer, Marcella Figueroa, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Oluwasegun Filani, Howard Fink, Vinette Fisher, Evelyn Flaharty, Tracey Flood, Otto Flores, Solomon Folashade, Lawrence Fondiller, Cassandra Fonollosa, Sherriel Fords, George Foulkes, Marie Francis, Ramon Franco, Elaine Frank, Ngozika Frank, Carolyn Frazier, Carmen Freeman, Regina French, Janice French-Garrett, Anatoly Frenkel, Horace Friend, Gizella Frost, Jenny Fuentes, LaShonna Fullen, Juanita Fuller, Sharon Fuller, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Ahesha Fullwood, Terry Fulton, Awilda Gamboa, Angela Garcia, Charles Garcia, Luz Garcia-Martin, Elise Garner, Patricia Garrison, Aretha Gary, Linda Gary, Yvette Gary-Price, Tyease Gatewood, Sharon Gayle, Donna Gayle-Francis, Valle Gedeon, Alexander Gelpern, Edwin George, Michel George, Esmeralda Gerena, Shereen Gerges, Delores Gibson, Elethia Giff, Janea Gilford, Jocelyn Gillot, Errol Giordani, Joanne Glasgow, Natasha Glasgow, Dorothy Glover, Marvin Glover, Siobhan Glynn, Christian Gomez, Alfred Gonzalez, Angela Gonzalez, Gustina Gonzalez, Luz Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Nurys Gonzalez, Madeline Goodwin, Jacqueline Gordon, Maxine Gordon, Tamara Gorelik, Galina Grabovsky, Andrea Grace, Deborah Graham, Carmen Granados, Ina Linette Grant, Crystal Grant-Dockery, Diana Gray, Diane Gray, Austin Greaves, Bennie Green, Edward Green, Marcella Greene, George Grellet, Shirley Griffin, Claudette Grizzalti, Awilda Guadalupe, Kapo Guandique-Li, Shirley Guerrant, Dulce Guerrero, Judith Guerrier, Daisy Guilf, Johnathan Guzman, Subedat Habeeb, Luisa Haddock, Jurema Hadley, Deborah Haines, Joan Hamilton, Elaine Harbin, Donna Harden, Marcel Harding, Regina Hardy, Varetta Harris, Sharon Harris-McGeachy, Angela Hart, Risikat Hassan, Derrick Hawkins, Linda Heastie-Haddock, Sandra Heller, Michael Henderson, Amelia Hendricks, Lillian Henry, Roseann Henry, Evelyn Hernandez, Hilda Hernandez, Mena Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Minam Hernandez, Rosa Hernandez, Virginia Hernandez, Rosa Hidalgo, Joan Higgins, Shameeka Hill, Belinda Hodges, Caroline Hogans, Arlene Holland, Brenda Hooper, Monica Hooper, Lulu Hopkins, Patricia Horsford, Asra Horton, Sandra Howell-Jones, Nurul Huda, Sheila Hudson, Janet Hughes, Jacqueline Hunter, Chinyere Igboekwe, Emily Ikpaha, Napoleon Imarhiagbe, Josefina Infante, Mayra Infante, Lola Ingram, Velda Ingus, Melvin Irby, Marjorie Irigoyen, Lillian Irizary, Rosaline Iwuagwu, Helen Iyasere, Lueverna Jackson, Sharon Jackson, Barbara Jackson-Neville, Michael Jacob, Jahin Jacobs, Nelly Jacome, Marie Jadotte, Janet James, John James, Keena James, Patricia James, Bernadette Jayco, Michemello Jeam-Michel, Cleante Jean, Thomas Jean-Baptiste, Maxime Jean-Pierre, Karen Jeanty-Byer, Akita Jefferson, Tracey Jimenez, Luis Joglar, Latanya Johannes, Alfred Johnson, Ayesha Johnson, Bonita Johnson, Collette Johnson, Delores Johnson, Felicia Johnson, Kendrah Johnson, Tina Johnson, Diane Joiner, Cherita Jones, Dawn Jones, Jamila Jones, Jennifer Jones, Kissena Jones, Lance Jones, Linda Jones, Nina Jones, Robert Jones, Tameka Jones, Ynique Jones, Jennifer Jordan, Janice Joseph, Adeline Joseph-Senat, Sharon Joyner, Debora Junior, Peter Kaleeny, Kalu Kalu, Thomas Kamara, Diana Kearney, Nicole Kelly, Rachel Kemp, Judy Kendrick, Idowu Kingsley, Justin Kinney, Lillian Koeiman, Olasupo Kofoworola, Nivedita Komar, Nathaniel Koszer, Svetlana Koverzneva, Vivek Kumar, Ramachandran Kumaran, Elina Kvasha, Ada Laboy, Liliya Ladyzhenskya, Bailey Latonya, Cassandra Lattimore, Tommy Lau, Jacqueline Lauretano, Tabitha Lawson, Eduard Lazarovich, Yvetter LeCraft, Catalina Lebron, Christina Lebron, Aramis Lee, Rowena Lee, Vanessa Lee, Diana Lee-Lewis, Crisanta Leiva, Cheryl Leone, Andrea Leslie, Silvia Lester, Antwain Letbetter, Travis Letbetter, Letricia Leverett-Williams, Shu Mei Li, Carmen Libran, Camille Lindor, Jeranny Liriano, Yolette Lissade, Sabrina Little, Corthaner Littles-James, Veronika Lodzhevskaya, Eldora Logan, Lindita Loma, Maria Lopez, Yomyra Lopez, Tatiana Lora, Zoila Lorenzo, Sameson Louis, Nina Louissaint, Debra Lowers, Luis Lucas, Thomas Lucas, Rosa Luciano, Sandra Ludd, Clara Luker, Natasha Lyons, Kristie Mack, Comlan Madou, Shanda Maldon, Gaurish Malhotra, Cecilia Malone, Rozana Mandelberg, Nina Mantelman, Larisa Manuk, Maria Mariani, Patricia Marrow, Lea Marshall, Jacqueline Marte, Wendy Marte, Bernard Marti, Eunice Martin, Cesarina Martinez, David Martinez, Dean Martinez, Connie Mason, Osman Mat, Vickie Matheny, Marilyn Matheson, Boby Mathew, Theresa Matos, Ludmila Matseleker, Lori Mayers, Carolyn McBean, Annie McClain, Anne McClellan, Craig McCosker, Tamikka McCray, Natasha McGriff, Paula McIntosh, Leslie McKinnon, Myra McNeal, Janice McNeil, Mark Meachem, Adeline Medard, Brian Medas, Saskia Medford, Haydee Medina, Ligia Medina, Michael Medua, Juan Carlos Mejia-Velez, Yolanda Mejias, Luis Melendez, Cheryl Melton, Alicia Mendez, Erik Mendez, Robert Mensah, Mayra Mercado, Venus Mercer, Pamela Miller, Lydia Mingo, Margarita Minino, Zaida Miranda, Bertha Mitchell, Marilyn Mizzell, Antonio Mojica, Igor Monastyrsky, Natasha Moncherry-Polius, Lucila Montero, Ginette Moore, Migdalia Moore, Tiffany Moore, Zuleyka Morales-Francis, Ananias Moran, Maria Morel, Arisbelkis Moreno, Minerva Moreno-Roman, Sandra Morgan, Andrea Morgan-Hargett, Winston Morris, Dawn Moses, Linda Moses, Stefi Moskovits, Jeannette Mota, Cynthia Murden, Ijeoma Murray, Lyneth Murray, Kalyani Natarajan, George Nathaniel, Ma
December 11, 2015 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robin Burroughs dated 12/11/2015 re: Permission to Withdraw as Counsel. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(Burroughs, Robin)
December 10, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #66 MOTION for David William Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11722971. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 10, 2015 Filing 66 MOTION for David William Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11722971. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Ricksecker, David)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #64 Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 1/22/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/9/2015) (kl)
December 3, 2015 Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated December 3, 2015 re: Request for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Defendant's application to dismiss the following six (6) Plaintiffs with prejudice for failing to respond to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents by November 25, 2015 as directed by the Court on November 18, 2015 is hereby GRANTED. The Plaintiffs are as follows: (1) Joy Durrant, (2) Chinyere lgboekwe, (3) Jackline Lane, (4) Carol Phillips, (5) Katherine Paulino, and (6) Laura Roberts; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's application to dismiss the following twenty-nine (29) Plaintiffs, without prejudice, that did not work in the job classifications covered by this lawsuit during the limitations period is hereby GRANTED. The Plaintiffs are as follows: (I) Ernestine Racin, (2) Sawannah Kitt, (3) Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, (4) Alfredo Crossman, (5) Deborah Lucas, (6) Diana Gray, (7) Margaret Thomas, (8) Antonia Mojica, (9) Tracy Zimmerman, (10) Yvonne Palmer, (11) Tracy Evelyn, (12) Clara Luker, (13) Daryl Cyrus, (14) Majorie Campbell, (15) Modesta Baltazar, (16) David Bracero, (17) Carmen Diaz, (18) Errol Giordani, (19) Duwayne Boyce, (20) Thomas Swann, (21) Andrea Leslie, (22) Marilyn Matheson, (23) Cheryl Melton, (24) Barbara Nibot, (25) Charles Villegas, (26) Marvin Clear, (27) Isaac Williams, (28) Morufu Animashaun, and (29) Rose Webb. SO ORDERED. Marvin Clear, Joy Durrant, Tracy Evelyn, Errol Giordani, Diana Gray, Chinyere Igboekwe, Andrea Leslie, Clara Luker, Marilyn Matheson, Cheryl Melton, Barbara Nibot, Katherine Paulino, Carol Phillips, Ernestine Ragin, Laura Roberts, Morufu Animashaun and Modesta Baltazar terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/1/2015) (kko)
December 1, 2015 Filing 62 AMENDED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated December 1, 2015 re: Discovery and Enclosing Proposed Order Dismissing Certain Plaintiffs. Document filed by City of New York, New York. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ekelman, Felice)
November 30, 2015 Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 30, 2015 re: Discovery and Enclosing Proposed Order Dismissing Certain Plaintiffs. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 24, 2015 Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 11/24/15 re: Letter in Response to Defendant's 11/19/15 Letter. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 23, 2015 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support re: #56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act .. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 23, 2015 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act . . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (McGillivary, Gregory)
November 23, 2015 Filing 57 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (55 in 1:14-cv-04142-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by Keisha Foster, (54 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG-JCF) Letter filed by Eliana De La Cruz. ENDORSEMENT: The schedule set forth above is adopted. (Motions due by 11/23/2015. Responses due by 12/14/2015. Replies due by 12/23/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/23/2015) (tn)
November 23, 2015 Filing 56 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the Fair Labor Standards Act . Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 19, 2015 Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 19, 2015 re: Request for Pre-motion Conference to Seek Permission to File Motion. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 18, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Telephone Conference held on 11/18/2015. (mr)
November 18, 2015 Filing 54 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Gregory K. McGillivary dated November 18, 2015 re: Briefing Schedule - Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
November 17, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Katherine Hook on behalf of City of New York, New York. (Hook, Sarah)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #34 Motion for Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/17/2015) (kko)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #33 Motion for Diana Jane Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/17/2015) (kko)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference will take place in this matter on November 18, 2015 at 5:00 p.m. Once both sides are on the line, counsel should contact Chambers at 212-805-0224. (Telephone Conference set for 11/18/2015 at 05:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/16/2015) (kko)
November 16, 2015 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated November 16, 2015 re: Request for Permission to File Motion. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Regarding Defendant's Efforts to Comply with the FLSA pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(a). Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/9/2015) (kko)
November 5, 2015 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated November 5, 2015 re: Pre-motion Letter. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #44 Motion for Molly A. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/29/2015) (mro)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Application is granted. Discovery due by 12/23/2015. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/28/2015) (kko)
October 28, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #44 MOTION for Molly A. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11561170. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
October 28, 2015 Filing 44 MOTION for Molly A. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11561170. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Elkin, Molly)
October 27, 2015 Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory McGillivary dated October 27, 2015 re: Response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attached Letter)(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 26, 2015 Filing 42 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 10/26/15. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz.(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 23, 2015 Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, esq. dated October 23, 2015 re: Pre-motion Letter. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
September 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 9/17/2015, ( Status Conference set for 2/4/2016 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (mr)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (36 in 1:14-cv-04142-PGG) Letter filed by City of New York, New York, (36 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG) Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is Granted. The Conference will proceed at 11:30 a.m. on July 9, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/08/2015) (ama)
July 9, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 7/9/2015, ( Status Conference set for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (mr)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (36 in 1:14-cv-04142-PGG) Letter filed by City of New York, New York, (36 in 1:14-cv-09220-PGG) Letter filed by City of New York, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is Granted. The Conference is adjourned to 11:00 a.m. on July 9, 2015. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 7/9/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/07/2015) (ama)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #35 Motion for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/01/2015) (ama)
July 1, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Eliana De La Cruz. (Block, Sarah)
July 1, 2015 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Felice B. Ekelman, Esq. dated July 1, 2015 re: Request to Reschedule Conference on July 9, 2015 at 10:00 am to Another Time on July 9, 2015. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
June 19, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 AMENDED MOTION for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
June 19, 2015 Filing 35 AMENDED MOTION for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 12, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11029489. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 12, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION for Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11029489. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Robin)
June 12, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Diana Jane Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11028981. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 12, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION for Diana Jane Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11028981. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Proposed Order)(Nobile, Diana)
June 12, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #32 MOTION for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11028505. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (sdi)
June 12, 2015 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11028505. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eliana De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory) Modified on 6/12/2015 (sdi).
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this matter presently scheduled for May 28, 2015 will take place on July 9, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 7/9/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/22/2015) (ama)
April 9, 2015 Filing 30 JOINT STIPULATION - PHASE ONE DISCOVERY: Five percent of the Plaintiffs shall be deemed a "Phase I Plaintiff" for the purposes of this Joint Stipulation and will be selected by the parties first generating a randomized list of Plaintiffs through a computer program agreed upon jointly and done jointly and then selecting the first name, and every twentieth Plaintiff (i.e., Plaintiffs 1, 20, 40, 60, etc.), as set forth within. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/9/2015) (ajs)
December 11, 2014 Filing 29 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(Ekelman, Felice)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties must complete the first phase of fact discovery relating to approximately 5% of the Plaintiffs (Phase I Discovery) on or before November 23, 2015. The parties will negotiate a Joint Stipulation and proposed order that will be submitted for Court approval within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Depositions of fact witnesses for Phase I Discovery due by 11/23/2015. Fact Discovery due by 11/23/2015. Status Conference set for 5/28/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/20/2014) (tn)
November 11, 2014 Filing 27 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 18 Amended Complaint, 2 Complaint, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Keisha Foster. Related document: 18 Amended Complaint, filed by Keisha Foster, 2 Complaint, filed by Kevin Pritchett, Keisha Foster, Jessica Reyes-Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix C - Consent Forms, # 2 Appendix D - List of All Plaintiffs)(McGillivary, Gregory)(laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing Documents Required by Court's September 10, 2014 Order served on City of New York on 10/30/14. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jacob Abadariki, Rossella Abbate, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Yetunde Abe, Fenise Abraham, Althea Abrahams, Larisa Abramova, Ana Abreu, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Herminia Acevedo, Miguelina Acevedo, Baffour Acheampong, Rosa Acosta, Koren Adams, Marlene Adams, Ronald Adams, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Curtis Addah, Adekemi Adebayo, Bertha Adedapo, Olitan Adedapo, Kayode Adeniyi, Margarette Adeyele, Abimbola Adeyeri, Kabir Adiro, Stephanie Adkins, Nancy Adolphe, Sakyiwa Adzenyah, Rumena Afruz, Esther Agront, Motolani Aiku, Rachel Airall, Bosede Akande, Mary Akarumeh, Anthony Akinduro, Olubusola Akinduro, Elizabeth Akinyemi, Daniel Akpata, Titilayo Akuyemi, Anne Alabre, James Alapat, Carmen Albelo, Lashonda Alderman, Nichole Alexander, Shaton Alexander, Wanda Alexander, Beverly Alexandre, Myrna Alexandre, Pamela Alfred, Cliff Ali, Lourdes Alicea, Shiela Alieva, Diane Allen, Ilicia Allen, Regina Allen, Shatina Allen, Sandra Allen, Ashley Alleyne, Yasarina Almanzar, Ismael Almondovar, Augustina Almonte, Jesse Almonte, Maria Almonte, Maria Luz Almonte, Eileen Alston, Rosa Altamirano, Daphne Altema, Daniel Alter, Joan Alvarado, Betsaira Alvarez, Nolvia Alvarez, Emmanuella Amazan, Frances Ambris, Samantha Amonoo-Thomas, Akm Amran, Moran Ananias, Juanita Ancrum, Annie Anderson, Irene Anderson, Joan Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Angela Andrew, Joseph Andrews, Demetry Anemojanis, Sandra Anglin, Sheila Aniekwe, Morufu Animashaun, Michael Anmane-Yeboah, Aninder Anra, Michael Antonello, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Belkis Araujo, Afrika Archer, Shondell Archibald, Argenis Aristizabal, Marleny Ariza, Catherine Armen, Andnenne Armstrong, Tracie Armstrong, Emily Arowolo, Tiffany Arrington, Natalie Arthur, RoseAnn Ashby, Nicole Ashman, Shannon Aste, Sharon Atkins, Michelle Attonis, Felisha Audain, Sheena Audain, Emmanuel Auguste, Dana Augustin, Gertie Augusto, Georges Aumoithe, Stacy Austin, Omogu Avianna-Wheeler, Idalia Avila, Dorcas Avitabile, Ibilola Awosika, Evelyn Awuah, Hyon Baek, Dawda Bah, Latonya Bailey, Tawa Bakarey, Cathy Baker, Ezequiel Balbuena, Allison Ball, Anna Balock, Modesta Baltazar, Marlene Bancharan, Ruth Banks, Judith Baptiste, Alonzo Barber, Jr, Nicole Barker, Joy Barnes, Laura Barnes, Michelle Barnes-Kerr, Andrew Bartley, David Bartolo, Melda Bashien, Anthony Baskerville, Athena Bass, Marie Bassene-Diedhiou, Kadija Bates, Renita Bates, Amarilis Batista, Tiffany Battee, Jerome Batts, Jr, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Eliana Bauta, Trudy Baxter, Tiffany Baylock, Michelle Baylor, Lionel Beaubrun, Jeanine Beauvil, Kathleen Beckles, Trevor Bedeau, Julia Bekerman, Donella Bell, Sandra Bell, Terrice Bell, Suzanne Bellocchio, Traci Belton, Danielle Bembury, Tisha Benbow, Giovanna Benitez, Nicholas Benitez, Jonnie Bennett, Beatrice Benon, Christina Bermudez, Marie Bernard, Ivonne Bernier, Kathleen Best, Rosanna Betances, Yeva Beydieiman, Naresh Bhowmik, Kembey Biewan, Brandi Billings, Ricardo Bilton, Ayeasha Bishop, Isabella Bishop-George, Desiree Blackwood, Bridgette Blackwood-Tajah, Israel Blanco, Lizeth Blanco, Aureole Blanding, Stacy Blease, Marissa Blinder, Faye Blue, Kathy Bly, Richard Bond, Aurea Bonet, Henry Bonilla, Yendry Bonilla, Junior Bontemps, Beverley Booker, Muslima Boon, Moustapha Boukari, Andrea Bourgeois, Chrisida Bourne, Regine Boutin, Nicole Bowen, Brenda Boyce, Dwayne Boyce, Isha Boyce, Atiya Boyd, Jacqueline Boyd, Phyllis Boyd, Olaguea Boyo-Bankle, David Bracero, Shirley Braithwaite-Crawford, Shirley Bramble, Nahema Brandon, Karen Bratton-Kilgore, Darlene Breland, Emma Brew, Joy Brewster, Vanessa Brezilus, Jonelle Bristol, Altagracia Brito, Evelyn Brito, Tiffany Broadwater, Valerie Brookshire, Constantia Brown, Dolores Brown, Irma Brown, Lakeisha Brown, Myrna Brown, Netia Brown, Newton Brown, Nicole Brown, Sariya Brown, Shanika Brown, Stacy Ann Brown, Telee Brown, Errol Brown, Jenise Brown, Shatina Brown, Victoria Brown, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Lee-Anne Browne, Sharlene Browne, Milagros Bueno, Maria Buffa, Tremayne Bunche, Geoffrey Burgess, Elaine Buriss, Rose Burke, Tasha Burke, Renarta Burnette, Charlotte Burris, Maria Burton, Dalia Butcher, Joan Butcher, Charell Butler, Tayisha Butler, Edna Butler, Sheila Butler, Tanya Bynes-Covington, Luis Caballero, Mirlande Cadet, Antilla Caldwell, Daphne Caldwell, Angelica Callahan, Shenita Calloway, Daisy Cama, Cathy Camacho, James Cameron, Tracy Campbel, Eula Campbell, Jeffery Campbell, Marjorie Campbell, Nicole Campbell, Alicia Camps, Rosa Candelario, Madeline Candeloria, Diomaris Capellaw, Jennifer Caravaglio, Alecia Carentz, Diana Carlo, Angela Carr, Alice Carrington, William Carrion, Andre Carter, Chantel Carter, Jeannine Carter, Shatonja Carter, Lania Carter-Johnson, Karol Casey, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Carla Casseus, Mario Castaneda, Teresa Castelli, Gladys Castillo, Jenny Castro, Ann Cato, Sherene Cato, Nadhege Caze, Gabriella Cedeno, Irlande Celestin, Svetlana Cernei, Tonilyn Cerrito, Holly Chambers, Debora Chandler, Dara Chapman, Michael Chapman, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Michelle Chapoteau, Shondell Charles, Carmen Charriez, Joselin Checo, Ednita Cheek, Evelyn Cheng, Obi Chife, Horng Yu Chou, Musaddeque Choudhury, Natasha Christian, Lakaya Christopher, Vincent Ciccarello, Dragana Ciric, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, Chanize Clark, Lashawn Clark, Robin Clark, Sandra Clark, Tammy Clark, Anika Clarke, Brenda Clarke, Natasha Clarke, Sandford Clarke, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Mamie Cobb, Katia Cociffi, Lorine Coelman, Sabrina Cohen, Andra Cojoc, Antoinetta Coleman, Cheri Coleman, Glenda Colon, Josephine Colon, Kenneth Colon, Natalie Colon, Juana Colon-Rivera, Rita Concepcion, Angela Contreras, Jamie Cooper, Patricia Cooper-Small, Djuana Copeland, Ginette Coppex, Jimmy Cora, Carmen Cordero, Maritza Cordeva, Christine Cornwall, Angel Cotto, Tiffany Covington, AnnKay Cowell, Robertino Cox, Kitisha Coy, Tracy Crane, Michel Crawford, Zenee Crews, Millicent Crisp, Lorraine Crockett, Alfredo Crossman, Melodie Crowell, Ulafayette Crump, Keila Cruz, Maria Cruz, Yuvelky Cruz, Massiel Cruz-Pichardo, Alexandra Cucchiaro, Carmelitta Cunningham, Dominque Cunningham, Diego Curatolo, Virginia Cureno, Leah Cutherbtson, Stephanie Cutignola, Carmalita Cyrus, Melissa D'Anna, Sharon Da Silva, Karlene Dacres, April Dail, Andrea Dallas, Silvia Danens, Calen Daniel, Shavonne Daniels-Martin, Barbara Daniely, Joanne Dash, Alanna Davis, Daisy Davis, Doretha Davis, Gregory Davis, Joshua Davis, Malika Davis, Rochelle Davis, Jacquelyn Davis O'Brien, Melody Davis-Casado, Deborah Davy, Svetlana Davydova, Muriel Dawson, Tanya Dawson, Maurice Day, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Eliana De La Cruz, Sergio De La Cruz, Sheila De La Cruz, Deyanira De Los Santos, Jeannie DeFelice, Yolanda DeJesus, Augusto DePass, Gernald DeShong, Karen Deans, Laura Decena, Brenda Defares, Andrea Deil, Yocasta Del Rosario, Rafael Del Valle, Yesenia DelValle, Ebony Delerme, Bernice Delgado, Grace Delgado, Marie Delice-Sheppard, Lindita Deloj, Nilsa Demorizi, Atnas Denis, Linda Dennis, Sabrina Dennis, Selasi Denu, Cynthia Depeiza, Nicole Desantis, Madelaine Desina-Chatoo, Catherine Desmaratte, Peter DiPaola, Carmen Diaz, Evelin Diaz, Fatima Diaz, Maria Diaz, Sairis Diaz, Tracy Diaz, Zuheidy Diaz, Sofia Diggs, Maritza Dilone, Lillian Dixon, Roxanne Dixon, Sparkle Dixon, Terence Dixon, Tiniekqua Dockery, Sharon Dolphin, Michael Domingo, Carmen Dominguez, Ashlei Donawa, Francis Donkor, Cynthia Donnelly, Jaella Dopwell, Geraldine Dorsaint, Marjorie Dorsaint, Jocelyn Dorset, Denise Dorsey, Rolsy Dorsinvil, Karen Douglas, Sheyna Douglas, Donna Doxen-Williams, Daniel Ducasse, Delarno Duncan, Ordella Dunn, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Evelyn Dupree, Marcelyn Dupree, Gerardo Duran, Zilly Duran, Bette Durham, Latasha Dyer, Kathleen Dyett, Leslyn Eastmond, Obehi Ebesunun, Genesis Ecclesiastes, Evelyn Echevarria, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Alexandra Echeverri, Edwin Edurie, Donalyn Edwards, Karen Edwards, Sharina Edwards, Tony Edwards, Tyanda Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Bidemi Ehimare, Chandra Eison, Florence Ekpenyong, Nadia El-Saieh, Maya ElSayed, Tameeka Elder, Maryem Elghazi, Lamar Ellerbe, Christine Ellis, Raquel Ellis, Tania Ellis, Aida Elshorbagi, Denise Emanuel, Chinedum Emenike, Ani Emenogu, Aghavese Enadeghe, Vanessa Encarnacion-King, Melissa Enyiema, Yemisi Epemolu, Falin Epps, Lavone Epps, Moronke Eromosele, Linilda Escolestio, Omo Esere, Carlos Espinal, Mercedes Espinal, Daiana Esquea, Yadirys Estefany, Marlenny Estevez, Alberto Estrada, Juan Estrada, Nadine Evans, Shera Evans, Tracy Evelyn, Charisse Everett, Clarence Everett, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Karen Facey, Jacquene Fairclough, Florence Fanja, Bridget Fannins, Donna Farray, Shateema Farris, Marzan Fatema, Sharon Faulk Jean-Pierre, Bridgette Faustin, Oladipo Fayemi, Emily Fayomi, Renata Felder, Cindy Feliciano, Luisa Felix, Michelle Feller, Sandra Felton, Brian Ferguson, Rashima Ferguson, Erica Fernandez, Janet Fernandez, Maria Ferrer, Latisha Fields, Norman Fields, Marcella Figueroa, Maria Figueroa, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Oluwasegun Filani, Nancy Fine, Howard Fink, Joshua Finkelstein, Mary Fitch, Evelyn Flaharty, Tracey Flood, Billie Flores, Otto Flores, Solomon Folashade, Lawrence Fondiller, Cassandra Fonollosa, Florence Fontaine, Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth, Atille Forbes, Mona Ford, Taramatie Forde, Sherriel Fords, Pamela Foreman, Dawn Forrester, Michelet Fortune, Denise Foster, Keisha Foster, George Foulkes, Aletnea Francis, Debra Francis, Elma Francis, Ramon Franco, Elaine Frank, Ngozika Frank, Sonia Fraser, Carolyn Frazier, Lorraine Frazier, Carmen Freeman, Regina French, Janice French-Garrett, Anatoly Frenkel, Dolores Frias, Horace Friend, Loquesha Frith, Gizella Frost, Jacqueline Fuentes, Jenny Fuentes, LaShonna Fullen, Juanita Fuller, Sharon Fuller, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Ahesha Fullwood, Terry Fulton, Christine Gabriel, Sandra Gabriel, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Yarjaira Galindez, Christopher Galligan, Jessica Gamble, Awilda Gamboa, Angela Garcia, Charles Garcia, Clarita Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Jr, Luz Garcia-Martin, Elise Garner, Patricia Garrison, Aretha Ga
November 11, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of of Filing Documents Required by Court's September 10, 2014 Order. Document filed by Jacob Abadariki, Rossella Abbate, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Yetunde Abe, Fenise Abraham, Althea Abrahams, Larisa Abramova, Ana Abreu, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Herminia Acevedo, Miguelina Acevedo, Baffour Acheampong, Rosa Acosta, Koren Adams, Marlene Adams, Ronald Adams, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Curtis Addah, Adekemi Adebayo, Bertha Adedapo, Olitan Adedapo, Kayode Adeniyi, Margarette Adeyele, Abimbola Adeyeri, Kabir Adiro, Stephanie Adkins, Nancy Adolphe, Sakyiwa Adzenyah, Rumena Afruz, Esther Agront, Motolani Aiku, Rachel Airall, Bosede Akande, Mary Akarumeh, Anthony Akinduro, Olubusola Akinduro, Elizabeth Akinyemi, Daniel Akpata, Titilayo Akuyemi, Anne Alabre, James Alapat, Carmen Albelo, Lashonda Alderman, Nichole Alexander, Shaton Alexander, Wanda Alexander, Beverly Alexandre, Myrna Alexandre, Pamela Alfred, Cliff Ali, Lourdes Alicea, Shiela Alieva, Diane Allen, Ilicia Allen, Regina Allen, Shatina Allen, Sandra Allen, Ashley Alleyne, Yasarina Almanzar, Ismael Almondovar, Augustina Almonte, Jesse Almonte, Maria Almonte, Maria Luz Almonte, Eileen Alston, Rosa Altamirano, Daphne Altema, Daniel Alter, Joan Alvarado, Betsaira Alvarez, Nolvia Alvarez, Emmanuella Amazan, Frances Ambris, Samantha Amonoo-Thomas, Akm Amran, Moran Ananias, Juanita Ancrum, Annie Anderson, Irene Anderson, Joan Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Angela Andrew, Joseph Andrews, Demetry Anemojanis, Sandra Anglin, Sheila Aniekwe, Morufu Animashaun, Michael Anmane-Yeboah, Aninder Anra, Michael Antonello, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Belkis Araujo, Afrika Archer, Shondell Archibald, Argenis Aristizabal, Marleny Ariza, Catherine Armen, Andnenne Armstrong, Tracie Armstrong, Emily Arowolo, Tiffany Arrington, Natalie Arthur, RoseAnn Ashby, Nicole Ashman, Shannon Aste, Sharon Atkins, Michelle Attonis, Felisha Audain, Sheena Audain, Emmanuel Auguste, Dana Augustin, Gertie Augusto, Georges Aumoithe, Stacy Austin, Omogu Avianna-Wheeler, Idalia Avila, Dorcas Avitabile, Ibilola Awosika, Evelyn Awuah, Hyon Baek, Dawda Bah, Latonya Bailey, Tawa Bakarey, Cathy Baker, Ezequiel Balbuena, Allison Ball, Anna Balock, Modesta Baltazar, Marlene Bancharan, Ruth Banks, Judith Baptiste, Alonzo Barber, Jr, Nicole Barker, Joy Barnes, Laura Barnes, Michelle Barnes-Kerr, Andrew Bartley, David Bartolo, Melda Bashien, Anthony Baskerville, Athena Bass, Marie Bassene-Diedhiou, Kadija Bates, Renita Bates, Amarilis Batista, Tiffany Battee, Jerome Batts, Jr, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Eliana Bauta, Trudy Baxter, Tiffany Baylock, Michelle Baylor, Lionel Beaubrun, Jeanine Beauvil, Kathleen Beckles, Trevor Bedeau, Julia Bekerman, Donella Bell, Sandra Bell, Terrice Bell, Suzanne Bellocchio, Traci Belton, Danielle Bembury, Tisha Benbow, Giovanna Benitez, Nicholas Benitez, Jonnie Bennett, Beatrice Benon, Christina Bermudez, Marie Bernard, Ivonne Bernier, Kathleen Best, Rosanna Betances, Yeva Beydieiman, Naresh Bhowmik, Kembey Biewan, Brandi Billings, Ricardo Bilton, Ayeasha Bishop, Isabella Bishop-George, Desiree Blackwood, Bridgette Blackwood-Tajah, Israel Blanco, Lizeth Blanco, Aureole Blanding, Stacy Blease, Marissa Blinder, Faye Blue, Kathy Bly, Richard Bond, Aurea Bonet, Henry Bonilla, Yendry Bonilla, Junior Bontemps, Beverley Booker, Muslima Boon, Moustapha Boukari, Andrea Bourgeois, Chrisida Bourne, Regine Boutin, Nicole Bowen, Brenda Boyce, Dwayne Boyce, Isha Boyce, Atiya Boyd, Jacqueline Boyd, Phyllis Boyd, Olaguea Boyo-Bankle, David Bracero, Shirley Braithwaite-Crawford, Shirley Bramble, Nahema Brandon, Karen Bratton-Kilgore, Darlene Breland, Emma Brew, Joy Brewster, Vanessa Brezilus, Jonelle Bristol, Altagracia Brito, Evelyn Brito, Tiffany Broadwater, Valerie Brookshire, Constantia Brown, Dolores Brown, Irma Brown, Lakeisha Brown, Myrna Brown, Netia Brown, Newton Brown, Nicole Brown, Sariya Brown, Shanika Brown, Stacy Ann Brown, Telee Brown, Errol Brown, Jenise Brown, Shatina Brown, Victoria Brown, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Lee-Anne Browne, Sharlene Browne, Milagros Bueno, Maria Buffa, Tremayne Bunche, Geoffrey Burgess, Elaine Buriss, Rose Burke, Tasha Burke, Renarta Burnette, Charlotte Burris, Maria Burton, Dalia Butcher, Joan Butcher, Charell Butler, Tayisha Butler, Edna Butler, Sheila Butler, Tanya Bynes-Covington, Luis Caballero, Mirlande Cadet, Antilla Caldwell, Daphne Caldwell, Angelica Callahan, Shenita Calloway, Daisy Cama, Cathy Camacho, James Cameron, Tracy Campbel, Eula Campbell, Jeffery Campbell, Marjorie Campbell, Nicole Campbell, Alicia Camps, Rosa Candelario, Madeline Candeloria, Diomaris Capellaw, Jennifer Caravaglio, Alecia Carentz, Diana Carlo, Angela Carr, Alice Carrington, William Carrion, Andre Carter, Chantel Carter, Jeannine Carter, Shatonja Carter, Lania Carter-Johnson, Karol Casey, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Carla Casseus, Mario Castaneda, Teresa Castelli, Gladys Castillo, Jenny Castro, Ann Cato, Sherene Cato, Nadhege Caze, Gabriella Cedeno, Irlande Celestin, Svetlana Cernei, Tonilyn Cerrito, Holly Chambers, Debora Chandler, Dara Chapman, Michael Chapman, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Michelle Chapoteau, Shondell Charles, Carmen Charriez, Joselin Checo, Ednita Cheek, Evelyn Cheng, Obi Chife, Horng Yu Chou, Musaddeque Choudhury, Natasha Christian, Lakaya Christopher, Vincent Ciccarello, Dragana Ciric, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, Chanize Clark, Lashawn Clark, Robin Clark, Sandra Clark, Tammy Clark, Anika Clarke, Brenda Clarke, Natasha Clarke, Sandford Clarke, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Mamie Cobb, Katia Cociffi, Lorine Coelman, Sabrina Cohen, Andra Cojoc, Antoinetta Coleman, Cheri Coleman, Glenda Colon, Josephine Colon, Kenneth Colon, Natalie Colon, Juana Colon-Rivera, Rita Concepcion, Angela Contreras, Jamie Cooper, Patricia Cooper-Small, Djuana Copeland, Ginette Coppex, Jimmy Cora, Carmen Cordero, Maritza Cordeva, Christine Cornwall, Angel Cotto, Tiffany Covington, AnnKay Cowell, Robertino Cox, Kitisha Coy, Tracy Crane, Michel Crawford, Zenee Crews, Millicent Crisp, Lorraine Crockett, Alfredo Crossman, Melodie Crowell, Ulafayette Crump, Keila Cruz, Maria Cruz, Yuvelky Cruz, Massiel Cruz-Pichardo, Alexandra Cucchiaro, Carmelitta Cunningham, Dominque Cunningham, Diego Curatolo, Virginia Cureno, Leah Cutherbtson, Stephanie Cutignola, Carmalita Cyrus, Melissa D'Anna, Sharon Da Silva, Karlene Dacres, April Dail, Andrea Dallas, Silvia Danens, Calen Daniel, Shavonne Daniels-Martin, Barbara Daniely, Joanne Dash, Alanna Davis, Daisy Davis, Doretha Davis, Gregory Davis, Joshua Davis, Malika Davis, Rochelle Davis, Jacquelyn Davis O'Brien, Melody Davis-Casado, Deborah Davy, Svetlana Davydova, Muriel Dawson, Tanya Dawson, Maurice Day, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Eliana De La Cruz, Sergio De La Cruz, Sheila De La Cruz, Deyanira De Los Santos, Jeannie DeFelice, Yolanda DeJesus, Augusto DePass, Gernald DeShong, Karen Deans, Laura Decena, Brenda Defares, Andrea Deil, Yocasta Del Rosario, Rafael Del Valle, Yesenia DelValle, Ebony Delerme, Bernice Delgado, Grace Delgado, Marie Delice-Sheppard, Lindita Deloj, Nilsa Demorizi, Atnas Denis, Linda Dennis, Sabrina Dennis, Selasi Denu, Cynthia Depeiza, Nicole Desantis, Madelaine Desina-Chatoo, Catherine Desmaratte, Peter DiPaola, Carmen Diaz, Evelin Diaz, Fatima Diaz, Maria Diaz, Sairis Diaz, Tracy Diaz, Zuheidy Diaz, Sofia Diggs, Maritza Dilone, Lillian Dixon, Roxanne Dixon, Sparkle Dixon, Terence Dixon, Tiniekqua Dockery, Sharon Dolphin, Michael Domingo, Carmen Dominguez, Ashlei Donawa, Francis Donkor, Cynthia Donnelly, Jaella Dopwell, Geraldine Dorsaint, Marjorie Dorsaint, Jocelyn Dorset, Denise Dorsey, Rolsy Dorsinvil, Karen Douglas, Sheyna Douglas, Donna Doxen-Williams, Daniel Ducasse, Delarno Duncan, Ordella Dunn, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Evelyn Dupree, Marcelyn Dupree, Gerardo Duran, Zilly Duran, Bette Durham, Latasha Dyer, Kathleen Dyett, Leslyn Eastmond, Obehi Ebesunun, Genesis Ecclesiastes, Evelyn Echevarria, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Alexandra Echeverri, Edwin Edurie, Donalyn Edwards, Karen Edwards, Sharina Edwards, Tony Edwards, Tyanda Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Bidemi Ehimare, Chandra Eison, Florence Ekpenyong, Nadia El-Saieh, Maya ElSayed, Tameeka Elder, Maryem Elghazi, Lamar Ellerbe, Christine Ellis, Raquel Ellis, Tania Ellis, Aida Elshorbagi, Denise Emanuel, Chinedum Emenike, Ani Emenogu, Aghavese Enadeghe, Vanessa Encarnacion-King, Melissa Enyiema, Yemisi Epemolu, Falin Epps, Lavone Epps, Moronke Eromosele, Linilda Escolestio, Omo Esere, Carlos Espinal, Mercedes Espinal, Daiana Esquea, Yadirys Estefany, Marlenny Estevez, Alberto Estrada, Juan Estrada, Nadine Evans, Shera Evans, Tracy Evelyn, Charisse Everett, Clarence Everett, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Karen Facey, Jacquene Fairclough, Florence Fanja, Bridget Fannins, Donna Farray, Shateema Farris, Marzan Fatema, Sharon Faulk Jean-Pierre, Bridgette Faustin, Oladipo Fayemi, Emily Fayomi, Renata Felder, Cindy Feliciano, Luisa Felix, Michelle Feller, Sandra Felton, Brian Ferguson, Rashima Ferguson, Erica Fernandez, Janet Fernandez, Maria Ferrer, Latisha Fields, Norman Fields, Marcella Figueroa, Maria Figueroa, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Oluwasegun Filani, Nancy Fine, Howard Fink, Joshua Finkelstein, Mary Fitch, Evelyn Flaharty, Tracey Flood, Billie Flores, Otto Flores, Solomon Folashade, Lawrence Fondiller, Cassandra Fonollosa, Florence Fontaine, Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth, Atille Forbes, Mona Ford, Taramatie Forde, Sherriel Fords, Pamela Foreman, Dawn Forrester, Michelet Fortune, Denise Foster, Keisha Foster, George Foulkes, Aletnea Francis, Debra Francis, Elma Francis, Ramon Franco, Elaine Frank, Ngozika Frank, Sonia Fraser, Carolyn Frazier, Lorraine Frazier, Carmen Freeman, Regina French, Janice French-Garrett, Anatoly Frenkel, Dolores Frias, Horace Friend, Loquesha Frith, Gizella Frost, Jacqueline Fuentes, Jenny Fuentes, LaShonna Fullen, Juanita Fuller, Sharon Fuller, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Ahesha Fullwood, Terry Fulton, Christine Gabriel, Sandra Gabriel, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Yarjaira Galindez, Christopher Galligan, Jessica Gamble, Awilda Gamboa, Angela Garcia, Charles Garcia, Clarita Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Jr, Luz Garcia-Martin, Elise Garner, Patricia Garrison, Aretha Gary, Linda Gary, Yvette Gary-Price, Michelle Gaskin, Carol Gaston, Verna Gaston, Tyease G
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION TO STAY DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT PENDING THE SEVERING OF THE CASE INTO SEPARATE MATTERS: THEREFORE, IT IS HEARBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that during the forty-five (45) day period that the deadline for defendant to file its answer to plaintiffs' amended complaint in the above referenced matter is stayed. SO ORDERED. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/17/2014) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this matter presently scheduled for November 6, 2014 will take place on November 12, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York.SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 11/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/11/2014)(laq)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: re: Letter 20. ENDORSEMENT: The Parties Joint Proposal is Adopted by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/10/2014) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 9/10/14 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Jacob Abadariki, Rossella Abbate, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Yetunde Abe, Fenise Abraham, Althea Abrahams, Larisa Abramova, Ana Abreu, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Herminia Acevedo, Miguelina Acevedo, Baffour Acheampong, Rosa Acosta, Koren Adams, Marlene Adams, Ronald Adams, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Curtis Addah, Adekemi Adebayo, Bertha Adedapo, Olitan Adedapo, Kayode Adeniyi, Margarette Adeyele, Abimbola Adeyeri, Kabir Adiro, Stephanie Adkins, Nancy Adolphe, Sakyiwa Adzenyah, Rumena Afruz, Esther Agront, Motolani Aiku, Rachel Airall, Bosede Akande, Mary Akarumeh, Anthony Akinduro, Olubusola Akinduro, Elizabeth Akinyemi, Daniel Akpata, Titilayo Akuyemi, Anne Alabre, James Alapat, Carmen Albelo, Lashonda Alderman, Nichole Alexander, Shaton Alexander, Wanda Alexander, Beverly Alexandre, Myrna Alexandre, Pamela Alfred, Cliff Ali, Lourdes Alicea, Shiela Alieva, Diane Allen, Ilicia Allen, Regina Allen, Shatina Allen, Sandra Allen, Ashley Alleyne, Yasarina Almanzar, Ismael Almondovar, Augustina Almonte, Jesse Almonte, Maria Almonte, Maria Luz Almonte, Eileen Alston, Rosa Altamirano, Daphne Altema, Daniel Alter, Joan Alvarado, Betsaira Alvarez, Nolvia Alvarez, Emmanuella Amazan, Frances Ambris, Samantha Amonoo-Thomas, Akm Amran, Moran Ananias, Juanita Ancrum, Annie Anderson, Irene Anderson, Joan Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Angela Andrew, Joseph Andrews, Demetry Anemojanis, Sandra Anglin, Sheila Aniekwe, Morufu Animashaun, Michael Anmane-Yeboah, Aninder Anra, Michael Antonello, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Belkis Araujo, Afrika Archer, Shondell Archibald, Argenis Aristizabal, Marleny Ariza, Catherine Armen, Andnenne Armstrong, Tracie Armstrong, Emily Arowolo, Tiffany Arrington, Natalie Arthur, RoseAnn Ashby, Nicole Ashman, Shannon Aste, Sharon Atkins, Michelle Attonis, Felisha Audain, Sheena Audain, Emmanuel Auguste, Dana Augustin, Gertie Augusto, Georges Aumoithe, Stacy Austin, Omogu Avianna-Wheeler, Idalia Avila, Dorcas Avitabile, Ibilola Awosika, Evelyn Awuah, Hyon Baek, Dawda Bah, Latonya Bailey, Tawa Bakarey, Cathy Baker, Ezequiel Balbuena, Allison Ball, Anna Balock, Modesta Baltazar, Marlene Bancharan, Ruth Banks, Judith Baptiste, Alonzo Barber, Jr, Nicole Barker, Joy Barnes, Laura Barnes, Michelle Barnes-Kerr, Andrew Bartley, David Bartolo, Melda Bashien, Anthony Baskerville, Athena Bass, Marie Bassene-Diedhiou, Kadija Bates, Renita Bates, Amarilis Batista, Tiffany Battee, Jerome Batts, Jr, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Eliana Bauta, Trudy Baxter, Tiffany Baylock, Michelle Baylor, Lionel Beaubrun, Jeanine Beauvil, Kathleen Beckles, Trevor Bedeau, Julia Bekerman, Donella Bell, Sandra Bell, Terrice Bell, Suzanne Bellocchio, Traci Belton, Danielle Bembury, Tisha Benbow, Giovanna Benitez, Nicholas Benitez, Jonnie Bennett, Beatrice Benon, Christina Bermudez, Marie Bernard, Ivonne Bernier, Kathleen Best, Rosanna Betances, Yeva Beydieiman, Naresh Bhowmik, Kembey Biewan, Brandi Billings, Ricardo Bilton, Ayeasha Bishop, Isabella Bishop-George, Desiree Blackwood, Bridgette Blackwood-Tajah, Israel Blanco, Lizeth Blanco, Aureole Blanding, Stacy Blease, Marissa Blinder, Faye Blue, Kathy Bly, Richard Bond, Aurea Bonet, Henry Bonilla, Yendry Bonilla, Junior Bontemps, Beverley Booker, Muslima Boon, Moustapha Boukari, Andrea Bourgeois, Chrisida Bourne, Regine Boutin, Nicole Bowen, Brenda Boyce, Dwayne Boyce, Isha Boyce, Atiya Boyd, Jacqueline Boyd, Phyllis Boyd, Olaguea Boyo-Bankle, David Bracero, Shirley Braithwaite-Crawford, Shirley Bramble, Nahema Brandon, Karen Bratton-Kilgore, Darlene Breland, Emma Brew, Joy Brewster, Vanessa Brezilus, Jonelle Bristol, Altagracia Brito, Evelyn Brito, Tiffany Broadwater, Valerie Brookshire, Constantia Brown, Dolores Brown, Irma Brown, Lakeisha Brown, Myrna Brown, Netia Brown, Newton Brown, Nicole Brown, Sariya Brown, Shanika Brown, Stacy Ann Brown, Telee Brown, Errol Brown, Jenise Brown, Shatina Brown, Victoria Brown, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Lee-Anne Browne, Sharlene Browne, Milagros Bueno, Maria Buffa, Tremayne Bunche, Geoffrey Burgess, Elaine Buriss, Rose Burke, Tasha Burke, Renarta Burnette, Charlotte Burris, Maria Burton, Dalia Butcher, Joan Butcher, Charell Butler, Tayisha Butler, Edna Butler, Sheila Butler, Tanya Bynes-Covington, Luis Caballero, Mirlande Cadet, Antilla Caldwell, Daphne Caldwell, Angelica Callahan, Shenita Calloway, Daisy Cama, Cathy Camacho, James Cameron, Tracy Campbel, Eula Campbell, Jeffery Campbell, Marjorie Campbell, Nicole Campbell, Alicia Camps, Rosa Candelario, Madeline Candeloria, Diomaris Capellaw, Jennifer Caravaglio, Alecia Carentz, Diana Carlo, Angela Carr, Alice Carrington, William Carrion, Andre Carter, Chantel Carter, Jeannine Carter, Shatonja Carter, Lania Carter-Johnson, Karol Casey, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Carla Casseus, Mario Castaneda, Teresa Castelli, Gladys Castillo, Jenny Castro, Ann Cato, Sherene Cato, Nadhege Caze, Gabriella Cedeno, Irlande Celestin, Svetlana Cernei, Tonilyn Cerrito, Holly Chambers, Debora Chandler, Dara Chapman, Michael Chapman, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Michelle Chapoteau, Shondell Charles, Carmen Charriez, Joselin Checo, Ednita Cheek, Evelyn Cheng, Obi Chife, Horng Yu Chou, Musaddeque Choudhury, Natasha Christian, Lakaya Christopher, Vincent Ciccarello, Dragana Ciric, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, Chanize Clark, Lashawn Clark, Robin Clark, Sandra Clark, Tammy Clark, Anika Clarke, Brenda Clarke, Natasha Clarke, Sandford Clarke, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Mamie Cobb, Katia Cociffi, Lorine Coelman, Sabrina Cohen, Andra Cojoc, Antoinetta Coleman, Cheri Coleman, Glenda Colon, Josephine Colon, Kenneth Colon, Natalie Colon, Juana Colon-Rivera, Rita Concepcion, Angela Contreras, Jamie Cooper, Patricia Cooper-Small, Djuana Copeland, Ginette Coppex, Jimmy Cora, Carmen Cordero, Maritza Cordeva, Christine Cornwall, Angel Cotto, Tiffany Covington, AnnKay Cowell, Robertino Cox, Kitisha Coy, Tracy Crane, Michel Crawford, Zenee Crews, Millicent Crisp, Lorraine Crockett, Alfredo Crossman, Melodie Crowell, Ulafayette Crump, Keila Cruz, Maria Cruz, Yuvelky Cruz, Massiel Cruz-Pichardo, Alexandra Cucchiaro, Carmelitta Cunningham, Dominque Cunningham, Diego Curatolo, Virginia Cureno, Leah Cutherbtson, Stephanie Cutignola, Carmalita Cyrus, Melissa D'Anna, Sharon Da Silva, Karlene Dacres, April Dail, Andrea Dallas, Silvia Danens, Calen Daniel, Shavonne Daniels-Martin, Barbara Daniely, Joanne Dash, Alanna Davis, Daisy Davis, Doretha Davis, Gregory Davis, Joshua Davis, Malika Davis, Rochelle Davis, Jacquelyn Davis O'Brien, Melody Davis-Casado, Deborah Davy, Svetlana Davydova, Muriel Dawson, Tanya Dawson, Maurice Day, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Eliana De La Cruz, Sergio De La Cruz, Sheila De La Cruz, Deyanira De Los Santos, Jeannie DeFelice, Yolanda DeJesus, Augusto DePass, Gernald DeShong, Karen Deans, Laura Decena, Brenda Defares, Andrea Deil, Yocasta Del Rosario, Rafael Del Valle, Yesenia DelValle, Ebony Delerme, Bernice Delgado, Grace Delgado, Marie Delice-Sheppard, Lindita Deloj, Nilsa Demorizi, Atnas Denis, Linda Dennis, Sabrina Dennis, Selasi Denu, Cynthia Depeiza, Nicole Desantis, Madelaine Desina-Chatoo, Catherine Desmaratte, Peter DiPaola, Carmen Diaz, Evelin Diaz, Fatima Diaz, Maria Diaz, Sairis Diaz, Tracy Diaz, Zuheidy Diaz, Sofia Diggs, Maritza Dilone, Lillian Dixon, Roxanne Dixon, Sparkle Dixon, Terence Dixon, Tiniekqua Dockery, Sharon Dolphin, Michael Domingo, Carmen Dominguez, Ashlei Donawa, Francis Donkor, Cynthia Donnelly, Jaella Dopwell, Geraldine Dorsaint, Marjorie Dorsaint, Jocelyn Dorset, Denise Dorsey, Rolsy Dorsinvil, Karen Douglas, Sheyna Douglas, Donna Doxen-Williams, Daniel Ducasse, Delarno Duncan, Ordella Dunn, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Evelyn Dupree, Marcelyn Dupree, Gerardo Duran, Zilly Duran, Bette Durham, Latasha Dyer, Kathleen Dyett, Leslyn Eastmond, Obehi Ebesunun, Genesis Ecclesiastes, Evelyn Echevarria, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Alexandra Echeverri, Edwin Edurie, Donalyn Edwards, Karen Edwards, Sharina Edwards, Tony Edwards, Tyanda Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Bidemi Ehimare, Chandra Eison, Florence Ekpenyong, Nadia El-Saieh, Maya ElSayed, Tameeka Elder, Maryem Elghazi, Lamar Ellerbe, Christine Ellis, Raquel Ellis, Tania Ellis, Aida Elshorbagi, Denise Emanuel, Chinedum Emenike, Ani Emenogu, Aghavese Enadeghe, Vanessa Encarnacion-King, Melissa Enyiema, Yemisi Epemolu, Falin Epps, Lavone Epps, Moronke Eromosele, Linilda Escolestio, Omo Esere, Carlos Espinal, Mercedes Espinal, Daiana Esquea, Yadirys Estefany, Marlenny Estevez, Alberto Estrada, Juan Estrada, Nadine Evans, Shera Evans, Tracy Evelyn, Charisse Everett, Clarence Everett, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Karen Facey, Jacquene Fairclough, Florence Fanja, Bridget Fannins, Donna Farray, Shateema Farris, Marzan Fatema, Sharon Faulk Jean-Pierre, Bridgette Faustin, Oladipo Fayemi, Emily Fayomi, Renata Felder, Cindy Feliciano, Luisa Felix, Michelle Feller, Sandra Felton, Brian Ferguson, Rashima Ferguson, Erica Fernandez, Janet Fernandez, Maria Ferrer, Latisha Fields, Norman Fields, Marcella Figueroa, Maria Figueroa, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Oluwasegun Filani, Nancy Fine, Howard Fink, Joshua Finkelstein, Mary Fitch, Evelyn Flaharty, Tracey Flood, Billie Flores, Otto Flores, Solomon Folashade, Lawrence Fondiller, Cassandra Fonollosa, Florence Fontaine, Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth, Atille Forbes, Mona Ford, Taramatie Forde, Sherriel Fords, Pamela Foreman, Dawn Forrester, Michelet Fortune, Denise Foster, Keisha Foster, George Foulkes, Aletnea Francis, Debra Francis, Elma Francis, Ramon Franco, Elaine Frank, Ngozika Frank, Sonia Fraser, Carolyn Frazier, Lorraine Frazier, Carmen Freeman, Regina French, Janice French-Garrett, Anatoly Frenkel, Dolores Frias, Horace Friend, Loquesha Frith, Gizella Frost, Jacqueline Fuentes, Jenny Fuentes, LaShonna Fullen, Juanita Fuller, Sharon Fuller, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Ahesha Fullwood, Terry Fulton, Christine Gabriel, Sandra Gabriel, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Yarjaira Galindez, Christopher Galligan, Jessica Gamble, Awilda Gamboa, Angela Garcia, Charles Garcia, Clarita Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Jr, Luz Garcia-Martin, Elise Garner, Patricia Garrison, Aretha Gary, Linda Gary, Yvette Gary-Price, Michelle Gaskin, Carol Ga
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on September 11, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 9/11/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/28/2014) (kgo)(laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint, against City of New York, New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Keisha Foster. Related document: 2 Complaint, filed by Kevin Pritchett, Keisha Foster, Jessica Reyes-Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet), # 2 Appendix B (Consent Forms, Part 1), # 3 Appendix B (Consent Forms, Part 2), # 4 Appendix B (Consent Forms, Part 3))(McGillivary, Gregory) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 8/21/14 re: Status Letter in Compliance with 6/24/14 Order. Document filed by Jacob Abadariki, Rossella Abbate, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Yetunde Abe, Fenise Abraham, Althea Abrahams, Larisa Abramova, Ana Abreu, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Herminia Acevedo, Miguelina Acevedo, Baffour Acheampong, Rosa Acosta, Koren Adams, Marlene Adams, Ronald Adams, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Curtis Addah, Adekemi Adebayo, Bertha Adedapo, Olitan Adedapo, Kayode Adeniyi, Margarette Adeyele, Abimbola Adeyeri, Kabir Adiro, Stephanie Adkins, Nancy Adolphe, Sakyiwa Adzenyah, Rumena Afruz, Esther Agront, Motolani Aiku, Rachel Airall, Bosede Akande, Mary Akarumeh, Anthony Akinduro, Olubusola Akinduro, Elizabeth Akinyemi, Daniel Akpata, Titilayo Akuyemi, Anne Alabre, James Alapat, Carmen Albelo, Lashonda Alderman, Nichole Alexander, Shaton Alexander, Wanda Alexander, Beverly Alexandre, Myrna Alexandre, Pamela Alfred, Cliff Ali, Lourdes Alicea, Shiela Alieva, Diane Allen, Ilicia Allen, Regina Allen, Shatina Allen, Sandra Allen, Ashley Alleyne, Yasarina Almanzar, Ismael Almondovar, Augustina Almonte, Jesse Almonte, Maria Almonte, Maria Luz Almonte, Eileen Alston, Rosa Altamirano, Daphne Altema, Daniel Alter, Joan Alvarado, Betsaira Alvarez, Nolvia Alvarez, Emmanuella Amazan, Frances Ambris, Samantha Amonoo-Thomas, Akm Amran, Moran Ananias, Juanita Ancrum, Annie Anderson, Irene Anderson, Joan Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Angela Andrew, Joseph Andrews, Demetry Anemojanis, Sandra Anglin, Sheila Aniekwe, Morufu Animashaun, Michael Anmane-Yeboah, Aninder Anra, Michael Antonello, Michael Anyane-Yeboah, Belkis Araujo, Afrika Archer, Shondell Archibald, Argenis Aristizabal, Marleny Ariza, Catherine Armen, Andnenne Armstrong, Tracie Armstrong, Emily Arowolo, Tiffany Arrington, Natalie Arthur, RoseAnn Ashby, Nicole Ashman, Shannon Aste, Sharon Atkins, Michelle Attonis, Felisha Audain, Sheena Audain, Emmanuel Auguste, Dana Augustin, Gertie Augusto, Georges Aumoithe, Stacy Austin, Omogu Avianna-Wheeler, Idalia Avila, Dorcas Avitabile, Ibilola Awosika, Evelyn Awuah, Hyon Baek, Dawda Bah, Latonya Bailey, Tawa Bakarey, Cathy Baker, Ezequiel Balbuena, Allison Ball, Anna Balock, Modesta Baltazar, Marlene Bancharan, Ruth Banks, Judith Baptiste, Alonzo Barber, Jr, Nicole Barker, Joy Barnes, Laura Barnes, Michelle Barnes-Kerr, Andrew Bartley, David Bartolo, Melda Bashien, Anthony Baskerville, Athena Bass, Marie Bassene-Diedhiou, Kadija Bates, Renita Bates, Amarilis Batista, Tiffany Battee, Jerome Batts, Jr, Dietrich Batts-Brown, Eliana Bauta, Trudy Baxter, Tiffany Baylock, Michelle Baylor, Lionel Beaubrun, Jeanine Beauvil, Kathleen Beckles, Trevor Bedeau, Julia Bekerman, Donella Bell, Sandra Bell, Terrice Bell, Suzanne Bellocchio, Traci Belton, Danielle Bembury, Tisha Benbow, Giovanna Benitez, Nicholas Benitez, Jonnie Bennett, Beatrice Benon, Christina Bermudez, Marie Bernard, Ivonne Bernier, Kathleen Best, Rosanna Betances, Yeva Beydieiman, Naresh Bhowmik, Kembey Biewan, Brandi Billings, Ricardo Bilton, Ayeasha Bishop, Isabella Bishop-George, Desiree Blackwood, Bridgette Blackwood-Tajah, Israel Blanco, Lizeth Blanco, Aureole Blanding, Stacy Blease, Marissa Blinder, Faye Blue, Kathy Bly, Richard Bond, Aurea Bonet, Henry Bonilla, Yendry Bonilla, Junior Bontemps, Beverley Booker, Muslima Boon, Moustapha Boukari, Andrea Bourgeois, Chrisida Bourne, Regine Boutin, Nicole Bowen, Brenda Boyce, Dwayne Boyce, Isha Boyce, Atiya Boyd, Jacqueline Boyd, Phyllis Boyd, Olaguea Boyo-Bankle, David Bracero, Shirley Braithwaite-Crawford, Shirley Bramble, Nahema Brandon, Karen Bratton-Kilgore, Darlene Breland, Emma Brew, Joy Brewster, Vanessa Brezilus, Jonelle Bristol, Altagracia Brito, Evelyn Brito, Tiffany Broadwater, Valerie Brookshire, Constantia Brown, Dolores Brown, Irma Brown, Lakeisha Brown, Myrna Brown, Netia Brown, Newton Brown, Nicole Brown, Sariya Brown, Shanika Brown, Stacy Ann Brown, Telee Brown, Errol Brown, Jenise Brown, Shatina Brown, Victoria Brown, Dorrine Brown-Layne, Lee-Anne Browne, Sharlene Browne, Milagros Bueno, Maria Buffa, Tremayne Bunche, Geoffrey Burgess, Elaine Buriss, Rose Burke, Tasha Burke, Renarta Burnette, Charlotte Burris, Maria Burton, Dalia Butcher, Joan Butcher, Charell Butler, Tayisha Butler, Edna Butler, Sheila Butler, Tanya Bynes-Covington, Luis Caballero, Mirlande Cadet, Antilla Caldwell, Daphne Caldwell, Angelica Callahan, Shenita Calloway, Daisy Cama, Cathy Camacho, James Cameron, Tracy Campbel, Eula Campbell, Jeffery Campbell, Marjorie Campbell, Nicole Campbell, Alicia Camps, Rosa Candelario, Madeline Candeloria, Diomaris Capellaw, Jennifer Caravaglio, Alecia Carentz, Diana Carlo, Angela Carr, Alice Carrington, William Carrion, Andre Carter, Chantel Carter, Jeannine Carter, Shatonja Carter, Lania Carter-Johnson, Karol Casey, Ramona Casimiro-Deleon, Carla Casseus, Mario Castaneda, Teresa Castelli, Gladys Castillo, Jenny Castro, Ann Cato, Sherene Cato, Nadhege Caze, Gabriella Cedeno, Irlande Celestin, Svetlana Cernei, Tonilyn Cerrito, Holly Chambers, Debora Chandler, Dara Chapman, Michael Chapman, Gabrielle Chapoteau, Michelle Chapoteau, Shondell Charles, Carmen Charriez, Joselin Checo, Ednita Cheek, Evelyn Cheng, Obi Chife, Horng Yu Chou, Musaddeque Choudhury, Natasha Christian, Lakaya Christopher, Vincent Ciccarello, Dragana Ciric, Victoria Cirigliano-Doria, Chanize Clark, Lashawn Clark, Robin Clark, Sandra Clark, Tammy Clark, Anika Clarke, Brenda Clarke, Natasha Clarke, Sandford Clarke, Tracy Cleckley-Cooke, Mamie Cobb, Katia Cociffi, Lorine Coelman, Sabrina Cohen, Andra Cojoc, Antoinetta Coleman, Cheri Coleman, Glenda Colon, Josephine Colon, Kenneth Colon, Natalie Colon, Juana Colon-Rivera, Rita Concepcion, Angela Contreras, Jamie Cooper, Patricia Cooper-Small, Djuana Copeland, Ginette Coppex, Jimmy Cora, Carmen Cordero, Maritza Cordeva, Christine Cornwall, Angel Cotto, Tiffany Covington, AnnKay Cowell, Robertino Cox, Kitisha Coy, Tracy Crane, Michel Crawford, Zenee Crews, Millicent Crisp, Lorraine Crockett, Alfredo Crossman, Melodie Crowell, Ulafayette Crump, Keila Cruz, Maria Cruz, Yuvelky Cruz, Massiel Cruz-Pichardo, Alexandra Cucchiaro, Carmelitta Cunningham, Dominque Cunningham, Diego Curatolo, Virginia Cureno, Leah Cutherbtson, Stephanie Cutignola, Carmalita Cyrus, Melissa D'Anna, Sharon Da Silva, Karlene Dacres, April Dail, Andrea Dallas, Silvia Danens, Calen Daniel, Shavonne Daniels-Martin, Barbara Daniely, Joanne Dash, Alanna Davis, Daisy Davis, Doretha Davis, Gregory Davis, Joshua Davis, Malika Davis, Rochelle Davis, Jacquelyn Davis O'Brien, Melody Davis-Casado, Deborah Davy, Svetlana Davydova, Muriel Dawson, Tanya Dawson, Maurice Day, Shamika Dayling-Reid, Eliana De La Cruz, Sergio De La Cruz, Sheila De La Cruz, Deyanira De Los Santos, Jeannie DeFelice, Yolanda DeJesus, Augusto DePass, Gernald DeShong, Karen Deans, Laura Decena, Brenda Defares, Andrea Deil, Yocasta Del Rosario, Rafael Del Valle, Yesenia DelValle, Ebony Delerme, Bernice Delgado, Grace Delgado, Marie Delice-Sheppard, Lindita Deloj, Nilsa Demorizi, Atnas Denis, Linda Dennis, Sabrina Dennis, Selasi Denu, Cynthia Depeiza, Nicole Desantis, Madelaine Desina-Chatoo, Catherine Desmaratte, Peter DiPaola, Carmen Diaz, Evelin Diaz, Fatima Diaz, Maria Diaz, Sairis Diaz, Tracy Diaz, Zuheidy Diaz, Sofia Diggs, Maritza Dilone, Lillian Dixon, Roxanne Dixon, Sparkle Dixon, Terence Dixon, Tiniekqua Dockery, Sharon Dolphin, Michael Domingo, Carmen Dominguez, Ashlei Donawa, Francis Donkor, Cynthia Donnelly, Jaella Dopwell, Geraldine Dorsaint, Marjorie Dorsaint, Jocelyn Dorset, Denise Dorsey, Rolsy Dorsinvil, Karen Douglas, Sheyna Douglas, Donna Doxen-Williams, Daniel Ducasse, Delarno Duncan, Ordella Dunn, Kimchyann Duong-Williams, Evelyn Dupree, Marcelyn Dupree, Gerardo Duran, Zilly Duran, Bette Durham, Latasha Dyer, Kathleen Dyett, Leslyn Eastmond, Obehi Ebesunun, Genesis Ecclesiastes, Evelyn Echevarria, Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari, Alexandra Echeverri, Edwin Edurie, Donalyn Edwards, Karen Edwards, Sharina Edwards, Tony Edwards, Tyanda Edwards, Adrien Egalite, Bidemi Ehimare, Chandra Eison, Florence Ekpenyong, Nadia El-Saieh, Maya ElSayed, Tameeka Elder, Maryem Elghazi, Lamar Ellerbe, Christine Ellis, Raquel Ellis, Tania Ellis, Aida Elshorbagi, Denise Emanuel, Chinedum Emenike, Ani Emenogu, Aghavese Enadeghe, Vanessa Encarnacion-King, Melissa Enyiema, Yemisi Epemolu, Falin Epps, Lavone Epps, Moronke Eromosele, Linilda Escolestio, Omo Esere, Carlos Espinal, Mercedes Espinal, Daiana Esquea, Yadirys Estefany, Marlenny Estevez, Alberto Estrada, Juan Estrada, Nadine Evans, Shera Evans, Tracy Evelyn, Charisse Everett, Clarence Everett, Emmanuel Evulukwu, Karen Facey, Jacquene Fairclough, Florence Fanja, Bridget Fannins, Donna Farray, Shateema Farris, Marzan Fatema, Sharon Faulk Jean-Pierre, Bridgette Faustin, Oladipo Fayemi, Emily Fayomi, Renata Felder, Cindy Feliciano, Luisa Felix, Michelle Feller, Sandra Felton, Brian Ferguson, Rashima Ferguson, Erica Fernandez, Janet Fernandez, Maria Ferrer, Latisha Fields, Norman Fields, Marcella Figueroa, Maria Figueroa, Carmen Figueroa-Asencio, Oluwasegun Filani, Nancy Fine, Howard Fink, Joshua Finkelstein, Mary Fitch, Evelyn Flaharty, Tracey Flood, Billie Flores, Otto Flores, Solomon Folashade, Lawrence Fondiller, Cassandra Fonollosa, Florence Fontaine, Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth, Atille Forbes, Mona Ford, Taramatie Forde, Sherriel Fords, Pamela Foreman, Dawn Forrester, Michelet Fortune, Denise Foster, Keisha Foster, George Foulkes, Aletnea Francis, Debra Francis, Elma Francis, Ramon Franco, Elaine Frank, Ngozika Frank, Sonia Fraser, Carolyn Frazier, Lorraine Frazier, Carmen Freeman, Regina French, Janice French-Garrett, Anatoly Frenkel, Dolores Frias, Horace Friend, Loquesha Frith, Gizella Frost, Jacqueline Fuentes, Jenny Fuentes, LaShonna Fullen, Juanita Fuller, Sharon Fuller, Michelle Fuller-Edwards, Ahesha Fullwood, Terry Fulton, Christine Gabriel, Sandra Gabriel, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Yarjaira Galindez, Christopher Galligan, Jessica Gamble, Awilda Gamboa, Angela Garcia, Charles Garcia, Clarita Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Jr, Luz Garcia-Martin, Elise Garner, Patricia Garrison, Aretha Gary, Linda Gary, Yvette Gary
November 11, 2014 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. City of New York, New York served on 6/16/2014, answer due 8/7/2014. Service was accepted by B. Mazyck, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Sulany Madrid; Lakeasha Williams; Mary Akarumeh; Abu Taslim; Eunice Rucker-Wolfe; Denise Johnson; Nelson Saavedra; Curstlinia Major; Shera Evans; Violet Moody; Kesha Jones; Arlene Holland; Jaqueline Raymomb; Zoila Lorenzo; Bette Durham; Akeem Onilenia; Linda Dennis; Genesis Ecclesiastes; Marie Delice-Sheppard; Andrea Deil; Suzanne Wiggins; Rafael Del Valle; Alexis Porter; Samuel Ofonagoro; Christina Pope-Travieso; Edward Green; Juanita Fuller; Raena McCarthy; Luisa Felix; Awilda Suarez; Tiffany Smith; Angela Gonzalez; Ivory Lee; Shirley Griffin; Wanda Ochshorn; Regina Sussmann; Luisa Haddock; Eliana De La Cruz; Josephine Colon; Jeannine Carter; Tina Johnson; Joselin Checo; Nonie Noel; Tonya Williams; Denise Emanuel; Brenda Stanley; Michelle Mireau; Olitan Adedapo; Natasha Glasgow; Christina Bermudez; Emmanuel Auguste; Dwight Vincent; Akita Jefferson; Nadhege Caze; Cynthia Serrano; Maria Luz Almonte; Svetlana Cernei; Titilayo Akuyemi; Jeffery Campbell; Diana Lee-Lewis; Marzan Fatema; Myriam Napoleon; Minerva Moreno-Roman; Josefina Infante; Carmen Cordero; Debora Junior; Jennifer Telford; Jaella Dopwell; Denise Trotter; Myrtle Petrus; Natasha Monchery-Polius; Paula McIntosh; Tommy Lau; Christian Paul; Norbert Wills ; Magdalena Leszko; Michelle Harris; Beverley Booker; Samantha Grabkowitz; Kembey Biewan; Tashawna Monestine; Atlanta Okhiria; Dawn Spiro; Lillian Irizary; Tremayne Bunche; Henry Bonilla; Joshua Finkelstein; Daniel Robinson; George Nathaniel; Haydee Medina; Jeannette Mota; Yasarina Almanzar; Aliseia Marcelle; Monet White ; Carrol Thomas; Sparkle Dixon; Valencia Pierre; Dorcas Avitabile; Donna Farray; Augustina Almonte; Teresa Ornas; Comlan Madou; Miriam Ramos-Ortiz; Nadine Lewis; Rozana Mandelberg; Althea Abrahams; Mariana Reveron; Dorothy Glover; Tavone Watts; Angeline Victor; Olasupo Kofoworola; Tasha Burke ; Tiffany Baylock; Shaunette Shebioba; Angela Andrew; Motiur Rahman; Latisha Fields; David Bartolo; Sidney Smalls; Massiel Cruz-Pichardo; Atiya Boyd; Burton Lewis; Siobhan Glynn; Andreina Molina; Abimbola Adeyeri; Marcia Moore; Otillo Moran; Daisy Davis; Karen Deans; Valanza Robinson; Tania Ellis; Tara Walden; Armenta Weekes; Evelyn Taylor; Jagdish Patel; Sheila McRae; Virginia Cureno; Robert Timmins; Krystle Oliver; Jerome Batts, Jr; Faith Oviasuyi-Brown; Deonarine Pitamber; Zuheidy Diaz; Tikema Milan; Deborah Davy; Betsaira Alvarez; Cliff Ali; Ewelina Lojek; Lillian Rodriguez; LaVone Wright; Sergio De La Cruz; Evelyn Dupree; Dana LaCasse; Jenesis Perez-Matos; Ayeasha Bishop; Rossella Abbate; Annette Rivera; Orian Shortt; Dean Martinez; Juan Estrada ; Stephanie Cutignola; Kristan Webb; Venita Sharper; Talia Herndon; Altagracia Brito; Bridgette Faustin; Aziza Zaid; Eunice Martin; Karen Sawyer-Barro; Cheryl Melton; Angela Hart; Terry Fulton; Karina Guerrero; Leona Velasquez; Ashley Johnson; Janelle Sargent; Keisha Foster ; Ordella Dunn; Irene Anderson; Afrika Archer; Esuabana Moses; Tiffany Arrington; Denise Sloan-Gates; Denise Robinson; Sharon Gayle; Juana Colon-Rivera; Siasha Rondon; Chris Williamson; Brian Ferguson; James Cameron; Carol Jones-Whitehorn; Patricia Phillips; Laura Barnes; Michelle Gillenwater; Khadesha Santana; Andra Cojoc; Sandra Heller; Shirley Odom; Danielle Bembury; Rachel Kemp; Juliet Walters; Lynn Parker; Rhina Singleton; Mirlande Cadet; Koren Adams; Gail Watson; Delisia Stewart; Olawabukola Oladoja; Marlene Wilson; Bernice Delgado; Alfred Johnson; Patricia Garrison; Catolina Lebron; Yasemin Tunca; Francis Donkor; Chevelle Robinson; Marie Louis; Julian Smith; Sonia Thomas; Nalini Seeballack; Marcia Patterson; Larita Holden; Heidi Lopez; Brenda Clarke; Barbara Jackson-Neville; Alba Segarra; Lonnie Reel, Jr; Newton Brown; Yvonne Talarico; Wendy Salazar; Jovan Romon ; Roseann Henry; Thomas Kamara; Jennifer Hampton; Christine Ellis; Michel Crawford; Kenia Olivero; Danielle Hall; Terethea Johnson; LaShonna Fullen; Mariluz Quinones; Laura Little; Felisha Audain; Tiffany Ward; Deborah Winfrey; Clarence Thomas; Veronique Streeter; Zaidn Miranda; Nicole Desantis; Glendora Osborne; Veronika Lodzheuskaya; Maria Gonzalez; Rose Burke ; Maria Diaz; James Alapat; Sandra Ramos; April Lestansky; Dominque Cunningham; Joan Butcher; Takiyah St. Louis; Illene Robinson; Amanda King; Tanya Hatcher; Carmen Charriez; Kenneth Walker; Mahmud Shamsuddin; Sonia Satchell; Leslyn Eastmond; Maryann Obilor; Edward Murray; Ethelyn McCalla; Argenis Aristizabal; Cindy Raoul; Mona Ford; Martina Williams; Shondell Archibald; Diane Richardson-Phillip; Tanesha Mosley; Takiya Green; Jude George; Gregory Davis; Valeria Echevarrieta-Djari; Luiza Marke; Karen Jeanty-Byer; Marie Morro; Natasha Simmons; Bridgette Manigault; Letecia White; Altagracia Pena; Christine Onwu-Okpala; Dawn Graham; Frances Ambris; Gladys Castillo; Patricia Somersall; Janet Graham; Doris Taylor-Aiken; William Carrion; Bernadette Jayco; Suxian Wu; Andrea Thomas; Akm Amran; Melissa Enyiema; Eliana Bauta; Amarilis Batista; Marcella Figueroa; Monique Thorne; Angela Garcia; Barbara Harris; Deyanira De Los Santos; Irenna Orzikh; Tiffany Broadwater; Derika Nealy; Marie Bernard; Elaine Smalls; Varda Snape; Ana Perez; Venus Mercer; Ani Emenogu; Yvonne Palmer; Fatimah Latif; Hemangini Thakar; Titilayo Osindero; Cesarina Martinez; Sandra Howell-Jones; Oladipo Fayemi; Ana Nunez-Martinz; Modesta Baltazar; Carmen Smith ; Chantel Carter; Tyease Gatewood; Linda Shorts; Cynthia Williams; Gloria Triblet; Raphael Oliver; Aureole Blanding; Yvetter LeCraft; Jacquene Fairclough; Tyanda Edwards; Patricia Horsford; Darlene Breland; Constantia Brown; Victoria Cirigliano-Doria; Anthony Baskerville; Anita Newsome; Beverly Wilson; Nolvia Alvarez; Tahisha Fontaine-Longworth; Burton Lewis, III; Marlenny Estevez; Diana Gray; Richard Bond; Janet Hughes; Daphne Perry; Monique Gibbs; Lisa Samuels; Shawnte Moore; Israel Blanco; Annmarie Robinson-Warren; Carla Casseus; Tracie Armstrong; Giovanna Benitez; Delia Samuels; Ezequiel Balbuena; Miguelina Acevedo; Chanize Clark; Ursula Goldson; Christine Spence; Ebone Gedeon; Justin Jarvis; Georgette Lawrence ; Terry Montanez; Rebecca Marquez; Derrick Hawkins; Gerardo Duran; Christine Cornwall; Brenda Defares; Jeannie Salcedo; Carol Gaston; Sariya Brown; Lijia Sinclair; Emmanuel Sledge; Moronke Eromosele; Bonita Johnson; Verna Gaston; Carla-Lelani Samms-Lezzama; Sharon Welch ; Elizabeth Melendez; Shemika McNeil; Daryl Gittens; Obi Chife; Cheri Coleman; Crisania Leiva; Pamela Miller; Nathaniel Koszer; Kerry Rush; Joan Higgins; Leslie Velasquez; Marcella Sapp; Daphne Caldwell; David Bracero; Jerome Pope; Aletnea Francis; Dana Weber; Karen Douglas; Rosa Parra; Telee Brown; Lamar Staton; Michael Domingo; Brandon Zager; Gertie Augusto; Morufu Animashaun; Maritza Quinones; Ginette Coppex; Ronald Adams; Rolando Roman; Ayana Pair; Annie McClain; Anatoly Frenkel; Emiliya Revich; Paul Oyeinole; Thandera Knight; Nilsa Demorizi; Erica Fernandez; Marie Silien; Elizabeth Rivera; Joy Brewster; Joanna Polidura; Elina Kvasha; Steven Hernandez; Myrna Alexandre; Avon Wilson-Pinckney; Donna Howard; Patricia Miller; Cheryl Shelton; Beverly Russell; Shavonne Daniels-Martin; Oluwasegun Filani; Melvin Irby; Edna Guevara; Aida Elshorbagi; Rosa Hernandez; Lola Ingram; Shatina Brown ; Eileen Alston; Latachia Wright; Jennifer Toussaint; Alexandra Echeverri; Christina Nazario; Maryem Elghazi; Whinston Morris; Yvonne Reynolds; Curtis Addah; Michelle Sellare; Melissa Thompson; Bertha Adedapo; Jonelle Bristol; Calen Daniel; Leslie Johns; Chanel Stokes; Dawda Bah; Tanya Reyes; Scott McCall; Farzana Yasmeen; Erik Mendez; Tiffany Covington; Shiela Alieva; Nicole Barker; Joann Sayed; Janet Fernandez; Shakeena Lesane; Evelyn Awuah; Hang Youssef; Gwendolyn Shannon; Bessie Rodriguez; Alphonse Rimpel; Michelle Chapoteau; Kristina Perez; Edwin George; Malika Davis; Jennifer Ross; Zuleyka Morales-Francis; Kim Jeter; Cynthia Murden; Shameka Smalls; Tanya Jones; Alia Khatari; Maurice Day; Nielandra Thomas; Viktoria Sirota; Miguel Garcia, Jr; Vivene Simpson; Andrea Patterson; Kendrah Johnson; Clarita Garcia; Yarjaira Galindez; Craig McCosker; Shemain Webb-Alexander; Yoselin Perdomo; Tasha Lopez; Lorena Velasquez; Ivy Smith; Trevor Bedeau; Rafael Valerio; Vickie Matheny; Cecilia Malone; George Grellet; Samantha Kitt; Diana Carlo; Sodelyne Joseph; Digna Hoyos; Darnley Thomas ; Terrice Bell; Olaguea Boyo-Bankle; Lashawn Clark; Selasi Denu; Lisa St. Cloud; Marie Bassene-Diedhiou; Crystal Hussein; Veronica Moreno; Amar Moody; Sean Scott-Charles; Janice McNeil; Evelyn Hernandez; Cherita Jones; Crystal Wallace; Francica Williams; Yesenia Pagan; Cleante Jean; Teresa Rodriguez; Catherine Armen; Jellicia Simpson; Deborah Olukogbon; Melda Bashien; Carmelitta Cunningham; Liliya Ladyzhenskya; Patricia Cooper-Small; Deborah Rozier; Ferdine Polynice; Cathy Camacho; Darryl Thomas; Lenire Holmes; Cheryl Leone; Kenneth Romero; Jean Rollan; Wanda Lawrence; Ophelia Inniss; Dana Augustin ; Danielle Harper; Marie Jadotte; Tracy Diaz; Marilyn Mizzell; Sherie Maxwell; Jacqueline Gordon; Florine Sills; Shatonja Carter; Samuel Roker; Diane Ramos; Tracey Mitchell; Carmen Libran; Katherine Maldonado; Sharmilla Girdharrie; Janice Williams; Ngozika Frank; Tishana Valentine; Ann Cato; Yomyra Lopez; Kevin Pritchett; Latisha Gonzalez; Darlene Sullivan; Carolyn Frazier; Sharina Edwards; Nataliya Zhmiyevskaya; Daiana Esquea; Carlos Espinal; Billie Flores; Renee Hernandez; Tamara Stewart; Shayne Roberts ; Elizabeth Akinyemi; Chrisida Bourne; Brenda Thomas; Ronald Johnson, Jr; Muriel Dawson; Faye Blue; Elizabeth Osuala; Annie Anderson; Tanya Bynes-Covington; Glenda Colon; Evelyn Ortiz-Hardy; Joanna Kellman; Cassandra Fonollosa; Elsa Toro; Sharon Jackson; Shelee Parker-Jones; Natasha Lyons; Maria Mariani; Catherine Wilkins; Alexandra Remond; Rae Phillips; Denise Foster; Tangier Wallace; Sherryl Reese; Idowu Kingsley; Gloria Ormsby; Ilicia Allen; Cecilia Nwachukwu; Roberta Martin; Nurys Gonzalez; Cynthia Depeiza; Fatima Diaz; Sofia Diggs; Tracey Jimenez; Kathleen Bes
November 11, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey W. Brecher on behalf of City of New York, New York. (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Simeon Gross on behalf of City of New York, New York. (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Joshua Seidenfeld on behalf of City of New York, New York. (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felice B. Ekelman on behalf of City of New York, New York. (laq)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Gregory K. McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/11/2014) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9983103. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keisha Foster. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory K. McGillivary, # 2 Exhibit 1: Certificates of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(O'Connor, Andrea) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. The Conference is adjourned to August 28, 2014 at 11:30 A.M. The Clerk will terminate the motion (Dkt. #7) (Initial Conference set for 8/28/2014 at 11:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/18/2014) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/18/2014) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for August 21, 2014 addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 7/17/2014. Document filed by Keisha Foster.(McGillivary, Gregory) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/21/2014 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/24/2014) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion (New York answer due 8/7/2014.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/20/2014) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 2 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrea O'Connor dated June 19, 2014. Document filed by City of New York, New York.(O'Connor, Andrea) (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrea Mary O'Connor on behalf of City of New York, New York. (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq)
November 11, 2014 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
November 11, 2014 Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (laq)
November 11, 2014 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, New York. (laq)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DUPLICATE ORDER: the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to perform the following tasks: 1. Establish a separate docket number for a severed case on behalf of the plaintiffs listed in Exhibit 1 to the plaintiff's' October 30, 2014 Notice of Filing. 2. Accept as filed the Complaint (Exh. 2 to Plaintiff's October 30, 2014 Notice of Filing) filed on behalf of current or former JOS and AJOS employees. For purposes of the statute of limitations, those plaintiffs listed in Exhibit 1 to the October 30, 2014 Notice of Filing will have the statute of limitations tolled for their claims as of the date they joined the Foster case.Enter all docket entries in Foster v. City of New York, C.A. No. 1 :14-cv-4142, under the docket number described in Paragraph 1. Plaintiff's will not be required to pay a second filing fee for the new docket number. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/11/2014) - ORIGINALLY FILED IN 14CV4142. (laq)
November 11, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, New York. Document filed by Ronald Adams, Titilayo Akuyemi, Ana Abreu, Esther Agront, Eliana De La Cruz, Motolani Aiku, Kabir Adiro, Bertha Adedapo, Larisa Abramova, Jacob Abadariki, Rosa Acosta, Cheryl Adams-Johnson, Daniel Akpata, Olitan Adedapo, Abimbola Adeyeri, Cruz-Maria Acevedo, Vivene Abdur-Rashid, Koren Adams, Mary Akarumeh, Yetunde Abe.(laq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Cruz et al v. City of New York, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rozana Mandelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raphael Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Luz Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Guilf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joselin Checo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Junior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Dyett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gertie Augusto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lunilda Escolestio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nivedita Komar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameka Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramis Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguelina Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Jayco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Gorelik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelin Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherriel Fords
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eula Mae Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Guerrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ludd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibilola Awosika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonnie Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalyani Natarajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyease Gatewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelyn Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Paulino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Fuller-Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muriel Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorriane Edinboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Clear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannine Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jurema Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivene Abdur-Rashid
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dealphia Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherita Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiela Alieva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayeasha Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melodie Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abimbola Adeyeri
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idalia Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Danens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Mota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivek Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlington Nlemchukwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Obilor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Cleckley-Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Marti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minam Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tajudeen Omamuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jean-Baptiste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlanta Okhiria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Gelpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kabir Adiro
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horng Yu Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindita Loma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valle Gedeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Haddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Andino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elina Kvasha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Kaleeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlenny Estevez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Ochiobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irenna Orzikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Moncherry-Polius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Ragin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melda Bashien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cooper-Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emiliya Revich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Enyiema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Parra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Evulukwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oluwasegun Filani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Bashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Laboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronika Lodzhevskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorine Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuvelky Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Brew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varetta Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Aniekwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleksandra Panchyskym
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Bishop-George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamila Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Otone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorie Quan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Ancrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mena Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanna Benitez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette Grizzalti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig McCosker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinette Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Cato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Osei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Desmaratte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Dalgetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Ndubuisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyneth Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Chin-On
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Alleyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diomaris Capellaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argenis Aristizabal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Batts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larisa Abramova
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Delerme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Hogans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ojeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Koverzneva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretha Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michemello Jeam-Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Marte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Jeanty-Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Casimiro-Deleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Monastyrsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opal Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahesha Fullwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Akarumeh
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Odeyemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Atalede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolette Lissade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimchyann Duong-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osman Mat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deonarine Pitamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Jadotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shatina Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gizella Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Foulkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Cirigliano-Doria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naresh Bhowmik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Gillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Meachem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Gerena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Lauretano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseann Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alcelio Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dabney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawda Bah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucila Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoselin Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junius Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliana Bauta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Facey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Medas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Nibot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Reyes-Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Asante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comlan Madou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Guerrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeva Beydieiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jahin Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subedat Habeeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crisanta Leiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Howell-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shu Mei Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline Raymomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Grellet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letricia Leverett-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidre Pryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.O. Denise Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corthaner Littles-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Arowolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliana De La Cruz
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: David William Ricksecker
Represented By: Diana J. Nobile
Represented By: Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs
Represented By: Molly Ann Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKM Amran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers |