Thind v. Healthfirst, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kanwarpreet Thind
Defendant: Healthfirst, Inc., HF Management Services, LLC and Healthfirst PHSP, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv09539
Filed: December 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: Lorna G. Schofield
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 334 OPINION AND ORDER re: 320 MOTION to Dismiss These Cases. filed by HF Management Services, LLC. Defendant's motion to dismiss the Complaint is DENIED, and Defendant's motion for oral argument is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket No. 320. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/8/2017) (kgo)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 274 OPINION AND ORDER re: 254 MOTION To Decertify Collective Action B . filed by HF Management Services, LLC, 259 CROSS MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Final Certification of Newly Redefined Collectiv e Actio's motion to decertify Collective B is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED as to amending the Complaint to include Collective B1 and DENIED as to amending the Complaint to include Collective B2 and final certification. The claim s of the Collective B2 opt-in plaintiffs are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint that is consistent with this Opinion and the information that has come out in discovery, and may file a motion for final certifi cation of the new Collective B1 following the submission of the Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motions at Docket No. 254 and Docket No. 259. A scheduling order will be issued following this Opinion. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/9/2016) (kgo)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION & ORDER re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by HF Management Services, LLC. For these reasons herein, Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's second, fourth and fifth causes of action are dismissed. The following causes of action survive: The first cause of action for unpaid overtime under FLSA on behalf of both Collective A (Managers of Sales) and Collective B (Facilitated Enrollers); The third cause of action for unpaid overtime under the NYLL; and The sixth cause of action for failure to furnish proper wage statements under the NYLL. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 22. (As further set forth in this Opinion.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/29/2015) (kgo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thind v. Healthfirst, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanwarpreet Thind
Represented By: Michael John Borrelli
Represented By: Alexander Todd Coleman
Represented By: Kelly Anne Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthfirst, Inc.
Represented By: Scott B. Klugman
Represented By: Seth L. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HF Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Scott B. Klugman
Represented By: Seth L. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthfirst PHSP, Inc.
Represented By: Scott B. Klugman
Represented By: Seth L. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?