Phoenix Light SF Limited et al v. HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Plaintiff: Phoenix Light SF Limited, C-Bass CBO XVII Ltd. and Silver Elms CDO II Limited
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Case Number: 1:2014cv10101
Filed: December 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Shira A. Scheindlin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER terminating [422 Letter Motion for Extension of Time in 15-cv-2144.] It is hereby ORDERED that the pre-motion conference scheduled for May 13, 2021, is CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that the parties' briefing schedule for any motions to exclude experts (14 Civ. 10101, Dkt. No. 338; 15 Civ. 2144, Dkt. No. 350) is ADJOURNED sine die. It is further ORDERED that the parties in each case shall brief their summary judgment motions without regard to the other case. The previously ordered briefing schedule is AMENDED and the parties shall brief their proposed cross motions for summary judgment in each above-captioned case according to the following schedule (as further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at 15 Civ. 2144, Dkt. No. 422. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/11/2021) (cf)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the pre-motion conference is ADJOURNED to May 13, 2021, at 10:40 a.m. The conference will be telephonic and will occur on the following conference line: 888-363-4749, access code: 5583333. The time of the conferenc e is approximate, but the parties shall be prepared to begin at the scheduled time. (As further set forth in this Order.) ( Telephone Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/28/2021) (cf)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER: WHEREAS, a pre-motion conference is scheduled for April 29, 2021, at 10:40 a.m. 14 Civ. 10101, Dkt. No. 375; 15 Civ. 2144, Dkt. No. 424. It is hereby ORDERED that the pre-motion conference is ADJOURNED to April 29, 2021, at 10:50 a.m. The conference will be telephonic and will occur on the following conference line: 888-363-4749, access code: 5583333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be prepared to begin at the scheduled time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/26/2021) ( Telephone Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (ks)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a pre-motion conference will occur on April 29, 2021, at 10:40 a.m., to discuss the parties anticipated cross-motions for summary judgment and motions to exclude experts. The conference will be telephonic and will occur on the following conference line: 888-363-4749, access code: 55833333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be prepared to begin at the scheduled time. (As further set forth in this Order.) ( Telephone Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/15/2021) (cf)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 373 OPINION & ORDER re: 361 MOTION to Amend/Correct 62 Answer to Amended Complaint , filed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association. HSBC's motion to amend its Answer is GRANTED in part. It may amend its Answer to add its champe rty defense. The motion to add impossibility, impracticability, and frustration of purpose defenses, however, is DENIED. Respectfully, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 361. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/16/2021) (ras)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for Thursday, June 25, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Due to the public health crisis, this conference is s ubject to change to a telephone conference. So Ordered. (Settlement Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/14/2020) (js)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Light SF Limited et al v. HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Light SF Limited
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Christopher Ledley
Represented By: John A. Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Christopher Ledley
Represented By: John Libra
Represented By: John A. Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-Bass CBO XVII Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Christopher Ledley
Represented By: John A. Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Elms CDO II Limited
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Christopher Ledley
Represented By: John A. Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: George Anthony Borden
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Rosa
Represented By: Michael Orth Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?