In re American Capital Realties Litigation
Plaintiff: Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America, College Retirement Equities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Union Asset Management Holding AG, KBC Asset Management NV, Corsair Select 100 L.P., Corsair Select MF Ltd., Corsair Capital Partners L.P., Corsair Select L.P., Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P., Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd., The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund, Paul Matten, Simon Abadi, Mitchell Ellis, Bonnie Ellis and Berney Harris
Defendant: American Capital Realties Litigation, American Realty Capital Properties, Inc., Arc Properties Operating Partnership L.P., Brian S. Block, American Realty Capital Trust IV, Inc., Arc Capital LLC, RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Cole Real Estate Investments, Inc., Nicholas S. Schorsch, David S. Kay, Edward M. Weil, Peter M. Budko, Brian D. Jones, Lisa Pavelka McAlister, Lisa Beeson, William Kahane, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., Capital One Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, JMP Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc, Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Grant Thornton LLP, Leslie D. Michelson, William G. Stanley, Edward G. Rendell, Scott J. Bowman, Thomas A. Andruskevich, Scott P. Sealy, Sr., Bruce D. Frank, Nicholas Radesca, Abby M. Wenzel, Elizabeth K. Tuppeny, Christopher H. Cole, Marc T. Nemer, Jeffrey C. Holland, Stephan Keller, D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr., Leonard W. Wood, J.P Morgan Securities LLC, Keybanc Capital Markets Inc., Realty Capital Securities, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC., Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner &Smith, Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. and Piper Jaffray & Co
Case Number: 1:2015cv00421
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2022 Filing 168 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/12/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al..(Moya, Goretti)
January 16, 2022 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/12/2021 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER CLOSING CASES: On January 22, 2020, I approved the stipulated settlement and ordered the dismissal of the above-captioned case, see 15-mc-40, ECF No. 1309, which terminated the following cases: 14-cv-8659; 14-cv-8668; 14-cv-8669; 14-cv-8671; 14-cv-8721; 14-cv-8740; 14-cv-9006; 14-cv-9140; 14-cv-9444; 14-cv-10134; 15-cv-421; 15-cv-422; 15-cv-2934; 15-cv-8508; 15-cv-8563. The Clerk shall mark these cases closed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/30/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (va)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL ADDITIONAL INFORMATION RECEIVED FROM CERTAIN DISPUTED CLAIMANTS SUPPLEMENTING EXHIBITS 1, 2, 5 AND 14 TO THE DECLARATION OF MISHKA FERGUSON REGARDING THE CLAIM ADMINISTRATION PROCESS AND REMAINING DISPUTED CLAIMS (ECF NO. 1340) in case 1:14-cv-08668-AKH; granting (1343) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. 2. The clerk is ordered to maintain under seal the materials identified in the Motion under seal, which were previously provided to the Court for in camera review. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/27/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (yv)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MISHKA FERGUSON REGARDING THE CLAIM ADMINISTRATION PROCESS AND REMAINING DISPUTED CLAIMS granting (1336) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Under Seal the exhibits to the Declaration of Mishka Ferguson Regarding the Claim Administration Process and Remaining Disputed Claims, (the "Motion"), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk is ordered to maintain under seal the materials identified in the Motion which were previously provided to the Court for in camera review. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/22/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (vfr)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (1339 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) Notice (Other),, filed by Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund, Tiaa- Cref Life Equity Index Fund, Tiaa- Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/13/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (yv)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. The court accepts the April 15, 2021 report by Claims Administrator Gelardi, ECF No. 1332, as satisfactory compliance with its order of April 1, 2021. ECF No. 1331. The next report by the Claims Administrator, to be filed by July 9, 2021, shall describe the final resolution of all disputed and deficient claims, and tender to the court for resolution of the disputed claims. The Claims Administrator also shall recommend a date for distribution to approved claimants of the amounts respectively due to them, as early as feasible. The distribution may be partial if it is necessary to reserve against future allowances of claims. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/19/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (yv)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (1330 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) Notice (Other), filed by Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund, Tiaa- Cref Life Equity Index Fund, Tiaa- Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. ENDORSEMENT: The Claims Administrator shall file, by April 15, 2021, a supplemental report showing by categories the deficient claims, and describe how it proposes to proceed to resolve the deficiencies and approve, or reject, the claims. The Claims Administrator shall also describe who is to conduct the audit, the procedures to be used, and the standards to be followed. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/1/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (yv)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting (1326) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Regis C. Worley, Jr terminated in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/18/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (ama)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (1322 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) Notice (Other), filed by Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund, Tiaa- Cref Life Equity Index Fund, Tiaa- Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. ENDORSEMENT: The date for a report is enlarged to March 31, 2021. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/28/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (yv)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER CONCERNING PERIODIC REPORTS BY CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR. As discussed on the record during the January 21, 2020 hearing of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation (ECF No. 1282), claims administrator, Gilardi & Co. LLC, shall submit to the Court periodic reports as further set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/29/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(yv)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ELLEN GUSIKOFF STEWART in case 1:14-cv-08668-AKH; granting (1267) Motion for Ellen Gusikoff Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH. The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ellen Gusikoff Stewart in the above-captioned action is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-entitled action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/26/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (yv)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAW AL OF COUNSEL in case 1:14-cv-08668-AKH; granting (1263) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, upon the annexed declaration of Dermot W. Lynch, and subject to the approval of the Court, Dermot W. Lynch hereby withdraws as counsel for Defendant Lisa P. McAlister and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matter. Lisa P. McAlister will continue to be represented by Adam L. Fotiades, Daniel P. Moylan, and other members of Zuckerman Spaeder LLP in this proceeding. So Ordered. (Attorney Dermot Lynch terminated in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/11/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (yv)
August 23, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #156 SCHEDULING ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (yv)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND THIRD AMENDMENT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties in the above-captioned actions, as follows: 1. The Protective Order entered by the Court on November 15, 2016 in In re American Realty Capital Properties, Inc. Litigation, Civil Action No. 1:15-mc-00040-AKH (ECF No. 324), and related actions, as amended in the First Amendment to the Protective Order and the Second Amendment to the Protective Order, shall apply with full force and effect to the Cohen & Steers Action. 2. Any written notice required by Paragraph 10(a) of the Protective Order shall be sufficient if made, given, furnished, or filed, in writing, to: (a) the counsel listed in Paragraph 10(b) of the Protective Order and Paragraph 2(b) of the First Amendment to the Protective Order; and (b) counsel to the plaintiffs in the Cohen & Steers Action, Sheila A. Sadighi, Lowenstein Sandler LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/22/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(mro)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:14-cv-08668-AKH; granting (606) Motion for Jonah H. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/3/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (ne)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (546 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION for Robert Khuzami to Withdraw as Attorney . filed by David S. Kay. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/28/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(yv)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER in case 1:14-cv-08668-AKH; denying (594) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH. ENDORSEMENT: Motion to Seal is denied. Reference to protective order is insufficient basis to seal. A review of the exhibits shows that they are public court conferences, and refers to events four years ago. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (ne) Modified on 7/26/2018 (ne). Modified on 10/18/2018 (ne).
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (565 in case 15-mc-40) Motion for Kevin S. Sciarani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/9/2018) As per chambers, filed in all member cases. (ras)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (546 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION for Robert Khuzami to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by David S. Kay, (67 in 1:14-cv-08721-AKH) MOTION for Robert Khuzami to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by David S. Kay. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/19/2018) As Per Chamber, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (ras)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (67 in case 1:14-cv-08721-AKH) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (546 in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Attorney Robert S. Khuzami terminated in case 1:14-cv-08721-AKH; Attorney Robert S. Khuzami terminated in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/19/2018) As Per Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (ras) Modified on 1/19/2018 (ras).
November 30, 2017 Filing 148 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (539 in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Motion to withdraw granted. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/30/2017) As Per Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (ras)
September 28, 2017 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/11/2017 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2017.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 27, 2017 Filing 146 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: in case 1:14-cv-08668-AKH; granting (523) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Motion to withdraw as counsel granted. Attorney Hannah Suzanne Sholl terminated in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (ap)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [521 in case 15-mc-00040] MOTION for Ethan P. Fallon to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/26/2017) ***As Per Chambers, Filed in All Member and Related Cases. (ras)
September 18, 2017 Filing 144 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joseph Harry Weiss on behalf of Simon Abadi. New Address: WeissLaw LLP, 1500 Broadway, Ste. 1601, New York, New York, United States 10036, (212) 682-3025. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Weiss, Joseph)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER ON MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND ECF NOTICES granting (142) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (512) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, the motion of Schulte Roth to withdraw as counsel of record in the above-captioned action is GRANTED and its attorneys shall be removed from all service lists relating to this action, including the Court's CM/ECF electronic notification list. (Attorney Martin L. Perschetz; Gary Stein; Randall Thomas Adams and Christopher Hyde Giampapa terminated in case 1:15-cv-00421-AKH.)(Attorney Martin L. Perschetz; Gary Stein; Randall Thomas Adams and Christopher Hyde Giampapa terminated in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/13/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH (ras)
September 12, 2017 Filing 142 MOTION for Martin L. Perschetz, Gary Stein, Christopher H. Giampapa and Randall T. Adams to Withdraw as Attorney and ECF Notices. Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
August 15, 2017 Filing 141 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 7/18/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 15, 2017 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: argument held on 7/18/2017 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2017.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 F.R.E. 502(d)-(e) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING THE ARCP AND ARC DEFENDANTS' LIMITED DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS: NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY AGREED [AND ORDERED]: 1. Pursuant to this Consent Order, the Defendants shall produce documents to the Plaintiffs on or before June 13, 2017 over which Defendants have previously asserted privileges and protections, including the attorney-client privilege and the work-product doctrine. In the event this order has not been entered by June 13, 2017, Defendants will produce these documents as soon as practicable after the order is entered. 2. Defendants shall clearly identify each document by Bates number that is being produced pursuant to this Consent Order, and the ARC Defendants shall identify the entry in their previously provided privilege or redaction log that corresponds to each document. 3. Pursuant to F.R.E. 502(d) and F.R.E. 502(e), no person shall argue in this or any other forum, proceeding, or investigation that the production of documents pursuant to Paragraph 1 of this Consent Order constitutes a waiver of any privilege as to the particular documents produced or constitutes a subject matter waiver with respect to any other document relating to the subject of a document produced pursuant to Paragraph 1 of this Order. 4. Nothing in this Consent Order shall prevent any party from challenging any assertion of privilege, protection or immunity over a document produced pursuant to the Consent Order, or arguing that Defendants have effected a subject matter waiver in connection with actions taken (or documents produced) outside of the scope of this Consent Order. The challenging party shall be permitted to use any document that is the subject of this Consent Order to challenge any assertion of privilege, protection or immunity over that document 5. Nothing m this Consent Order shall be construed to supersede the Court's May 18, 2017 Order. On the contrary, pursuant to the May 18, 2017 Order, Defendants "shall review their privilege logs to eliminate all documents not properly covered by the privilege." 6. Documents produced under this Consent Order shall be subject to, and afforded the protections of, the Joint Stipulation and Protective Order entered by the Court on November 15, 2016. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/12/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(mro)
May 5, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hannah Suzanne Sholl on behalf of Nicholas S. Schorsch. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Sholl, Hannah)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY CODY R. LEJEUNE granting (371) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon consideration of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Cody R. LeJeune, (the "Motion"), it is hereby ordered that: 1. The Motion is GRANTED. 2. The clerk is ordered to reflect on the docket the termination of attorney Cody R. LeJeune as counsel of record for Lead Plaintiff TIAA-CREF. Attorney Cody R. Lejeune terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/5/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al., docketed in all member and related cases pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) Modified on 5/5/2017 (mro).
April 28, 2017 Filing 136 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neil Robert Lieberman on behalf of Nicholas S. Schorsch. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Lieberman, Neil)
January 24, 2017 Filing 135 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Roger Blais on behalf of United States Of America. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Blais, Brian)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/10/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(cla)
October 26, 2016 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cody Herche on behalf of ARC Properties Advisors LLC, Ar Capital LLC, Scott J. Bowman, Peter M. Budko, Brian D. Jones, William M. Kahane, Edward M. Weil, Jr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Herche, Cody)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Antonia M. Apps dated 9/16/2016 re: the parties request that they be granted an extension of time until Thursday, September 22, 2016, to submit the proposed protective order. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/21/2016) ***As per chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(tn)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 SUMMARY ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT: in case 1:14-cv-08668-AKH; terminating (126) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-00421-AKH; terminating (189) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (192) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (194) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (198) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (200) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (203) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (205) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (207) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (210) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (239) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH. These rulings shall also apply to the opt-out cases, in which amended complaints were to be filed in accordance with my holdings on these motions. Defendants who have not already done so, shall answer by August 12, 2016. A case management shall be held Thursday, Sept. 8, at 11 :00 A.M. The clerk shall mark the motions (ECF Doc. Nos. 189, 192, 194, 198, 200, 203, 205, 207, 210, 234, 239) terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/05/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (ama)
August 5, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(ama)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (236 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by David S. Kay. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Attorney Danielle Renee Sassoon terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/7/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(kko)
May 10, 2016 Filing 129 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (126 in 1:15-cv-00421-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., (239 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
May 3, 2016 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Gary Stein in Support re: (239 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., (126 in 1:15-cv-00421-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Stein, Gary)
May 3, 2016 Filing 127 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (126 in 1:15-cv-00421-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., (239 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
May 3, 2016 Filing 126 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, Realty Capital Securities, LLC.(Perschetz, Martin)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER COORDINATING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER: that the time for the Outside, Non-Management Directors to answer the Second Amended Complaint is extended such that they will be required to file an answer on the same date that the Court determines that all defendants who file motions to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint on February 12, 2016 are required to answer after resolution of such motions to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/24/2016) ***As per chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(tn)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: that all claims under Section 12(a)(2) of the Securities Act of 1933 asserted against Defendant William G. Stanley in the Second Amended Complaint For Violations Of The Federal Securities Laws, dated December 11, 2015 (Dkt. No. 175) (the "Second Amended Complaint") are hereby dismissed for the reasons stated by the Court in its October 27, 2015 ruling, as memorialized in the Court's November 6, 2015 decision and order granting Mr. Stanley's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' claims under Section 12(a)(2) of the Securities Act. Claims under Section 11 of the Securities Act asserted against Mr. Stanley in the Second Amended Complaint are not part of this Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/16/2016) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(tn)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER REGARDING AUTOMATIC STAY: The automatic stay provided by Bankruptcy Code 362(a) will apply only to the defendants who filed for bankruptcy relief (RCS Capital Corporation and Realty Capital Securities, LLC); proceedings will continue as to all other parties. Plaintiffs, within 30 days, shall move the Bankruptcy Court presiding over said actions for leave to vacate the stay and to adjudicate plaintiffs' claims against said defendants in the U.S. District Court. Plaintiffs shall advise the parties and the Court of the filing of said motions, and all ensuing proceedings regarding said motions. Following any renewal of proceedings in this District Court related to said defendants, or any of them, said defendants may move this court for such relief as may be just and proper. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/9/2016) (tn)
February 2, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jonathan L. Shapiro. Document filed by Christopher H. Cole, Jeffrey C. Holland, Stephan Keller, D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr, Marc T. Nemer. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
February 1, 2016 Filing 121 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to RCS Capital Corporation and Realty Capital Securities, LLC . Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, Realty Capital Securities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
February 1, 2016 Filing 120 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Martin L. Perschetz dated 2/1/2016 re: notifying the court and all parties that all proceedings against RCAP and RCS Securities are now stayed. Document filed by Realty Capital Securities, LLC, RCS Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER TERMINATING MOTIONS terminating #103 Motion to Dismiss: This case is a member case in the consolidated docket, 15-mc-40 (AKH). I granted in part and denied in part defendants' motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint by Order dated November 6, 2015 (15-mc-40, Dkt. No. 167). For that reason, the clerk shall mark the motion (15-cv-421, Dkt No. 103) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/1/2015) (tn)
October 27, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Oral Argument held on 10/27/2015 re: (81 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by Lisa P. Mcalister, (98 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion To Dismiss Of Defendants American Realty Capital Properties, Inc., ARC Properties Operating Partnership, L.P., American Realty Capital Trust III, Inc., American Realty Capital Trust IV, Inc., and Cole Real Estate filed by American Realty Capital Trust III, Inc., ARC Properties Operating Partnership, L.P., American Realty Capital Trust IV, Inc., American Realty Capital Properties, Inc., Cole Real Estate Investments, Inc., (87 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Arc Capital LLC, Scott J. Bowman, Edward M. Weil, Jr., ARC Properties Advisors LLC, Peter M. Budko, William M. Kahane, Brian D. Jones, Nicholas Radesca, David M Gong, (69 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by Scott P. Sealy, Sr., Leonard W. Wood, (92 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Marc T. Nemer, Stephen Keller, D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr., Jeffrey C. Holland, Christopher H. Cole, (84 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Elizabeth K. Tuppeny, (71 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by David S. Kay, (114 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Nicholas S. Schorsch, (95 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. filed by Grant Thornton LLP, (90 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Edward G. Rendell, Bruce D. Frank, Leslie D. Michelson, William G. Stanley, Thomas A. Andruskevich, (100 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. filed by Brian Block, (73 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by Abby M. Wenzel, (102 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by Realty Capital Securities, LLC, RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, (76 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by Lisa E. Beeson. (Court Reporter Vincent Bologna, Eve Giniger) Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Jones, Brigitte)
August 27, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Jeffrey Toll on behalf of NYC Funds. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Toll, Steven)
August 27, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Goldsmith Reiser on behalf of NYC Funds. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Reiser, Julie)
August 27, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Brett Rehns on behalf of NYC Funds. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Rehns, Daniel)
August 12, 2015 Filing 115 DECLARATION of GARY STEIN in Support re: #103 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q)(Stein, Gary)
August 12, 2015 Filing 114 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #103 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. (Perschetz, Martin)
August 12, 2015 Filing 113 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (73 in 1:15-mc-00040-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Abby M. Wenzel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Wise, Tamar)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING AND TERMINATING MOTIONS granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Lometti terminated; terminating (11) Motion to Appoint; terminating (14) Motion to Appoint; terminating (17) Motion to Appoint; terminating (18) Motion to Appoint in case 1:14-cv-08668-AKH; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Lometti terminated; terminating (14) Motion to Appoint; terminating (17) Motion to Appoint; terminating (20) Motion to Appoint; terminating (21) Motion to Appoint in case 1:14-cv-08669-AKH; terminating (25) Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating (25) Motion to Appoint; terminating (25) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating (28) Motion to Appoint; terminating (31) Motion to Appoint; terminating (32) Motion to Appoint; terminating (37) Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating (37) Motion to Appoint; terminating (37) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating (40) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating (40) Motion to Appoint; terminating (40) Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating (45) Motion to Appoint; terminating (47) Motion to Appoint; terminating (50) Motion to Appoint; terminating (53) Motion to Withdraw; granting (69) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (70) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (81) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; terminating (7) Motion to Appoint; granting (97) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (113) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Lometti terminated; terminating (11) Motion to Appoint; terminating (14) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating (14) Motion to Appoint; terminating (14) Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating (16) Motion to Appoint; terminating (16) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating (19) Motion to Appoint; terminating (22) Motion to Appoint in case 1:14-cv-08659-AKH; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Lometti terminated; terminating (14) Motion to Appoint; terminating (17) Motion to Appoint; terminating (20) Motion to Appoint; terminating (21) Motion to Appoint in case 1:14-cv-08671-AKH; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Lometti terminated; terminating (6) Motion to Appoint; terminating (9) Motion to Appoint; terminating (12) Motion to Appoint; terminating (13) Motion to Appoint in case 1:14-cv-08721-AKH; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Lometti terminated; terminating (5) Motion to Appoint; terminating (8) Motion to Appoint; terminating (11) Motion to Appoint; terminating (12) Motion to Appoint in case 1:14-cv-08740-AKH; granting (38) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Lometti terminated; terminating (6) Motion to Appoint; terminating (7) Motion to Appoint; terminating (14) Motion to Appoint; terminating (17) Motion to Appoint in case 1:14-cv-09006-AKH; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Lometti terminated in case 1:14-cv-10134-AKH; granting (16) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (76) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (85) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (88) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (91) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (108) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Lometti terminated in case 1:15-cv-00421-AKH; granting (18) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (29) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (44) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (65) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-mc-00040-AKH: Motions to appear pro hac vice by the following individuals are granted: Darren Jay Robbins, Jason Adeeb Forge, Joseph F. Rice, Glen De Valerio, Bruce R. Braun, Michael H. Steinberg, Jessica C. Collins, Douglas W. Greene, John P. MacNaughton. The motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Christopher Lometti is granted. The following motions have been resolved and should be terminated in ECF as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al. (tn)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ELIZABETH K. TUPPENY, PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(2): that Tuppeny is dismissed from the Consolidated Class Proceeding without prejudice; Plaintiffs and Tuppeny shall each bear their own costs; Tuppeny agrees to extend and toll any applicable statute of limitations or other time-based defense whether statutory, contractual or otherwise and whether at law, in equity or otherwise including, but not limited to, laches and estoppel with respect to the Section 14(a) claim against her for the time period from the first date of the execution of this Stipulation by undersigned counsel until December 31, 2016; and as further set forth in this order. Elizabeth K. Tuppeny terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/14/2015) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(tn)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LEONARD W. WOOD, PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(2): Wood is dismissed from the Consolidated Class Proceeding without prejudice; Plaintiffs and Wood shall each bear their own costs; As a result of the dismissal and for as long as they remain dismissed from the action, Wood is not included in "Defendants herein" as that term is used in paragraph 382 of the Amended Complaint and is not excluded from the class in the Consolidated Class Proceeding, which is alleged in the same paragraph 382 to include "all persons or entities who purchased or otherwise acquired ARCP securities, including ARCP common stock, preferred stock and debt securities, as well as those who traded in option contracts on ARCP stock, between September 7, 2011 and October 29, 2014", and as further set forth in this order. Leonard W. Wood terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/14/2015) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(tn) Modified on 7/14/2015 (tn).
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS CHRISTOPHER H. COLE, MARC T. NEMER, JEFFREY C. HOLLAND, STEPHAN KELLER AND D. KIRK MCALLASTER, JR PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(2): The Former CREI Executives are dismissed from the Consolidated Class Proceeding without prejudice; Plaintiffs and the Former CREI Executives shall each bear their own costs; and as further set forth in this order. Cole Real Estate Investments, Inc., Jeffrey C. Holland, Stephan Keller, D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr, Marc T. Nemer, and Christopher H. Cole terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(tn)
June 10, 2015 Filing 108 MOTION for CHRISTOPHER LOMETTI to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by NYC Funds. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Lometti, Christopher)
June 8, 2015 Filing 107 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate RCAP HOLDINGS, LLC for RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital Corporation. Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
June 4, 2015 Filing 106 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Christopher Lometti). Document filed by NYC Funds. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Lometti, Christopher)
May 29, 2015 Filing 105 DECLARATION of GARY STEIN in Support re: (103 in 1:15-cv-00421-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Stein, Gary)
May 29, 2015 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (103 in 1:15-cv-00421-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
May 29, 2015 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC.(Perschetz, Martin)
May 29, 2015 Filing 102 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by RCS Capital, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
May 29, 2015 Filing 101 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent RCS Capital Corporation, Corporate Parent RCS Capital Holdings, LLC for Realty Capital Securities, LLC. Document filed by Realty Capital Securities, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
May 29, 2015 Filing 100 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by RCS Capital Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin) Modified on 6/1/2015 (lb).
May 29, 2015 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Tamerlane Millkey on behalf of Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America, Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund. (Millkey, Mark)
May 29, 2015 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert M. Rothman on behalf of Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America, Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund. (Rothman, Robert)
May 28, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randall Thomas Adams on behalf of RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Adams, Randall)
May 28, 2015 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Hyde Giampapa on behalf of RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Giampapa, Christopher)
May 28, 2015 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Stein on behalf of RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Stein, Gary)
May 28, 2015 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin L. Perschetz on behalf of RCS Capital Corporation, RCS Capital, LLC, Realty Capital Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Perschetz, Martin)
May 22, 2015 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin on behalf of Elizabeth K. Tuppeny. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(York-Erwin, Genevieve)
May 20, 2015 Filing 92 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Bradley E. Oppenheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Arc Capital LLC, Scott J. Bowman, Peter M. Budko, Brian D. Jones, William Kahane, Nicholas Radesca, Edward M. Weil.(Goldsmith, Andrew) Modified on 5/20/2015 (bcu).
May 20, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #92 MOTION for Bradley E. Oppenheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing.Missing Proposed Order. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days and attach a Proposed Order (bcu)
May 19, 2015 Filing 91 MOTION for John P. MacNaughton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10937242. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scott P. Sealy, Sr, Leonard W. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Alperstein, Robin)
May 19, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #91 MOTION for John P. MacNaughton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10937242. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
May 18, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin L. Alperstein on behalf of Scott P. Sealy, Sr, Leonard W. Wood. (Alperstein, Robin)
May 18, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael David Margulies on behalf of Scott P. Sealy, Sr, Leonard W. Wood. (Margulies, Michael)
May 14, 2015 Filing 88 MOTION for Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10922034. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Elizabeth K. Tuppeny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Greene, Douglas)
May 14, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #88 MOTION for Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10922034. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
May 13, 2015 Filing 87 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10917790. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Elizabeth K. Tuppeny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Greene, Douglas) Modified on 5/13/2015 (bcu).
May 13, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #87 MOTION for Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10917790. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Pro Hac Vice is $200.00 per case. You cannot spread text and will have to file an individual Motion for Pro Hac Vice and pay the fee.. (bcu)
April 29, 2015 Filing 86 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Institutional Investor Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Katz, Rebecca)
April 6, 2015 Filing 85 MOTION for Jessica C. Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Arc Capital LLC, Scott J. Bowman, Peter M. Budko, Brian D. Jones, William M. Kahane, Nicholas Radesca, Edward M. Weil, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Collins, Jessica)
April 6, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #83 MOTION for Jessica C. Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10774289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Proposed Order. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a Proposed Order. (wb)
April 6, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #85 MOTION for Jessica C. Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
April 2, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reid Mason Figel on behalf of Peter M. Budko. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Figel, Reid)
April 2, 2015 Filing 83 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jessica C. Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10774289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Arc Capital LLC, Scott J. Bowman, Peter M. Budko, Brian D. Jones, William Kahane, Nicholas Radesca, Edward M. Weil.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Collins, Jessica) Modified on 4/6/2015 (wb).
April 2, 2015 Filing 82 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Arc Capital LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Goldsmith, Andrew)
April 2, 2015 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of Peter M. Budko. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Goldsmith, Andrew)
April 2, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #83 MOTION for Jessica C. Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10774289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10774505.(Collins, Jessica)
March 31, 2015 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Leonard W. Wood served on 1/30/2015, answer due 2/20/2015. Service was accepted by Leonard W. Wood, personal service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Peter M. Budko served on 1/27/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Peter M. Budko, personal service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 27, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of Scott J. Bowman, Brian D. Jones, William Kahane, Edward M. Weil. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Goldsmith, Andrew)
March 27, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reid Mason Figel on behalf of Scott J. Bowman, Brian D. Jones, William Kahane, Edward M. Weil. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH, 1:15-cv-00421-AKH(Figel, Reid)
March 18, 2015 Filing 76 MOTION for Michael H. Steinberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Christopher H. Cole, Jeffrey C. Holland, Stephan Keller, D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr, Marc T. Nemer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steinberg, Michael)
March 18, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #76 MOTION for Michael H. Steinberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
March 17, 2015 Filing 75 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael H. Steinberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10710571. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Christopher H. Cole, Jeffrey C. Holland, Stephan Keller, D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr, Marc T. Nemer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steinberg, Michael) Modified on 3/17/2015 (bcu).
March 17, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anil Karim Vassanji on behalf of Christopher H. Cole, Jeffrey C. Holland, Stephan Keller, D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr, Marc T. Nemer. (Vassanji, Anil)
March 17, 2015 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Lucas Shapiro on behalf of Christopher H. Cole, Jeffrey C. Holland, Stephan Keller, D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr, Marc T. Nemer. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
March 17, 2015 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Louis Hardiman on behalf of Christopher H. Cole, Jeffrey C. Holland, Stephan Keller, D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr, Marc T. Nemer. (Hardiman, John)
March 17, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #75 MOTION for Michael H. Steinberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10710571. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing. Certificate of Good Standing must be issued from the Supreme Court of California and not from a State Bar Association. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (bcu)
March 13, 2015 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. William Kahane served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. Service was accepted by Pamela Eslard, co-occupant. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Wells Fargo Securities, LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Thomas A. Andruskevich served on 2/7/2015, answer due 3/2/2015. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Wife/Co-Occupant. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Stephan Keller served on 1/23/2015, answer due 2/13/2015. Service was accepted by Stephan Keller. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. William G. Stanley served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by William G. Stanley. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Scott P. Sealy, Sr served on 1/27/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Elizabeth, co-occupant. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Realty Capital Securities, LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. RCS Capital, LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. RCS Capital Corporation served on 1/28/2015, answer due 2/18/2015. Service was accepted by Jaclyn Cheyne, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. RBS Securities Inc. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. PNC Capital Markets LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Lyanne Gares, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Piper Jaffray & Co served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Nicholas S. Schorsch served on 1/28/2015, answer due 2/18/2015. Service was accepted by Olga Churly, house manager. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Nicholas Radesca served on 2/7/2015, answer due 3/2/2015. Service was accepted by Nicholas Radesca. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Elena Boutokova, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Mizuho Securities USA Inc. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Elena Boutokova, Person Authroized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Marc T. Nemer served on 2/5/2015, answer due 2/26/2015. Service was accepted by Marc Nemer. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Lisa Beeson served on 1/28/2015, answer due 2/18/2015. Service was accepted by Alexandra Beeson, daughter. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Leslie D. Michelson served on 1/23/2015, answer due 2/13/2015. Service was accepted by Leslie D. Michelson. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Kevin Montgomery, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Kevin Vohnoutka, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. JMP Securities LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Elena Boutokova, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Jeffrey C. Holland served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Shelly O'Donin, Spouse. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Janney Montgomery Scott LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. J.P Morgan Securities LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Grant Thornton LLP served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Elizabeth K. Tuppeny served on 2/4/2015, answer due 2/25/2015. Service was accepted by Elizabeth K. Tuppeny. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Edward M. Weil served on 2/7/2015, answer due 3/2/2015. Service was accepted by Luigi Mancusco, concierge at defendant's apartment and by first-class U.S. mail. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Elena Boutokova, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. David S. Kay served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. Service was accepted by David S. Kay. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr served on 1/24/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Mrs. McAllaster. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Kevin Vohnoutka, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Cole Real Estate Investments, Inc. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Billie Swoboda, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Citigroup Global Markets Inc. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Capital One Securities, Inc. served on 1/27/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Paula Glaser, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Bruce D. Frank served on 1/23/2015, answer due 2/13/2015. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Brian D. Jones served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, co-occupant of household. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. BMO Capital Markets Corp. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Elena Boutokova, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Brian S. Block served on 1/27/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Brian S. Block, personal service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Elena Boutokova, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Arc Properties Operating Partnership L.P. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Kevin Vohnoutka, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Arc Capital LLC served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Lyanne Gares, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. American Realty Capital Trust IV, Inc. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. American Realty Capital Properties, Inc. served on 1/26/2015, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was accepted by Elinam Renner, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Abby M. Wenzel served on 2/9/2015, answer due 3/2/2015. Service was accepted by Doorman at Defendant's Apartment Building. Document filed by Corsair Select L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund; Simon Abadi; Corsair Select 100 L.P.; Union Asset Management Holding AG; Mitchell Ellis; Corsair Capital Partners L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund; Berney Harris; Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund; Corsair Select MF Ltd.; College Retirement Equities Fund; KBC Asset Management NV; Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America; Paul Matten; Bonnie Ellis; Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund; The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund; Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.; Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund; Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.; Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
March 3, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leah Margaret Quadrino on behalf of Brian Block. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Quadrino, Leah)
March 3, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lara Elizabeth Romansic on behalf of Brian Block. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-00040-AKH et al.(Romansic, Lara)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: As explained on the record at the February 10, 2015 status conference, the lead plaintiff in the consolidated class action shall be the Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America ("TIAA-CREF") and the lead counsel shall be Darren Robbins of the law firm of Robbins, Geller, Rudman, and Dowd, LLP. At the status conference, I also set the following briefing schedule for Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). 1. Defendants' motion is due April 10, 2015. 2. Plaintiff's opposition is due May 15, 2015. 3. Defendants' reply is due June 3, 2015. Plaintiff Jet Capital, although pursuing its case independently from the class, will follow the same briefing schedule and shall coordinate with the lead counsel for the class so as not to submit duplicative briefing. The Clerk shall consolidate the cases identified in the caption, with the exception of 15 Civ. 307 (AKH), for pre-trial proceedings in the docket under the title In re American Capital Realties Litigation, and assign an "mc" docket number to the case. The "mc" case shall be the lead case, and the individual civil cases shall be consolidated as member cases in the "mc" case. ( Motions due by 4/10/2015., Responses due by 5/15/2015, Replies due by 6/3/2015.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/11/2015) (mro)
February 13, 2015 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:15-mc-00040-AKH.. (laq)
February 13, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Bruce Roger Braun on behalf of Grant Thornton LLP. New Address: Sidley Austin LLP, One South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, USA 60603, (312) 853-7000. (Braun, Bruce)
February 10, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reid Mason Figel on behalf of Arc Capital LLC, Nicholas Radesca. (Figel, Reid)
February 10, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Louis Garcia on behalf of Thomas A. Andruskevich, Bruce D. Frank, Leslie D. Michelson, Edward G. Rendell, William G. Stanley. (Garcia, Christopher)
February 10, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard William Slack on behalf of Thomas A. Andruskevich, Bruce D. Frank, Leslie D. Michelson, Edward G. Rendell, William G. Stanley. (Slack, Richard)
February 10, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of Arc Capital LLC, Nicholas Radesca. (Goldsmith, Andrew)
February 5, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Bruce R. Braun to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10570815. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Braun, Bruce)
February 5, 2015 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP.(Bendinger, Gary)
February 5, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Frederick Bendinger on behalf of Grant Thornton LLP. (Bendinger, Gary)
February 5, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Bruce R. Braun to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10570815. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
January 30, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Submission in Response to January 22, 2015 Scheduling Order. Document filed by Simon Abadi, Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd., Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P., Corsair Capital Partners L.P., Corsair Select 100 L.P., Corsair Select L.P., Corsair Select MF Ltd., Bonnie Ellis, Mitchell Ellis, Berney Harris, KBC Asset Management NV, Paul Matten, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America, The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund, Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund, Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Rudman, Samuel)
January 30, 2015 Filing 12 JOINDER to join re: #11 Letter / Underwriter Defendants' Joinder of American Realty Capital Properties, Inc.'s Proposed Civil Case Management Plan. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Capital One Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc, Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBS Securities Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC.(Hakki, Adam)
January 30, 2015 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Scott A. Edelman dated 01/30/2015 re: Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by American Realty Capital Properties, Inc..(Edelman, Scott)
January 30, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Craig Lewis on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Capital One Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc, Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBS Securities Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Lewis, Daniel)
January 30, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., Capital One Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, JMP Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc, Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Hakki, Adam)
January 30, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Gerard Scavelli on behalf of Brian S. Block. (Scavelli, Michael)
January 30, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Lynn Levin on behalf of Brian S. Block. (Levin, Michelle)
January 30, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Campion Miller on behalf of Brian S. Block. (Miller, Michael)
January 30, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reid Weingarten on behalf of Brian S. Block. (Weingarten, Reid)
January 26, 2015 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Scott A. Edelman dated 1/26/2015 Document filed by American Realty Capital Properties, Inc..(Edelman, Scott)
January 26, 2015 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-cv-08659-AKH. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu)
January 26, 2015 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
January 26, 2015 Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (pgu)
January 20, 2015 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh)
January 20, 2015 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14cv8659. Document filed by Simon Abadi, College Retirement Equities Fund, Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd., Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P., Corsair Capital Partners L.P., Corsair Select 100 L.P., Corsair Select L.P., Corsair Select MF Ltd., Bonnie Ellis, Mitchell Ellis, Berney Harris, KBC Asset Management NV, Paul Matten, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America, The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund, Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund, Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund, Union Asset Management Holding AG.(moh)
January 20, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Realty Capital Properties, Inc., Arc Properties Operating Partnership L.P.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401115033)Document filed by Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund, Corsair Select L.P., Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund, Simon Abadi, KBC Asset Management NV, College Retirement Equities Fund, Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P., Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America, Corsair Select 100 L.P., Union Asset Management Holding AG, Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund, Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd., Berney Harris, Mitchell Ellis, Paul Matten, Bonnie Ellis, Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund, Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund, Corsair Capital Partners L.P., Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund, The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund, Corsair Select MF Ltd..(moh)
January 20, 2015 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Realty Capital Properties, Inc., Arc Properties Operating Partnership L.P.. (moh)
January 20, 2015 Case Designated ECF. (moh)
January 20, 2015 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 14cv8659. (moh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re American Capital Realties Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Capital Realties Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Realty Capital Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arc Properties Operating Partnership L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Block
Represented By: Reid Weingarten
Represented By: Michael Campion Miller
Represented By: Michael Gerard Scavelli
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Realty Capital Trust IV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arc Capital LLC
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Jessica Caroline Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCS Capital Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Hyde Giampapa
Represented By: Gary Stein
Represented By: Martin L. Perschetz
Represented By: Randall Thomas Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCS Capital, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Hyde Giampapa
Represented By: Gary Stein
Represented By: Martin L. Perschetz
Represented By: Randall Thomas Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Real Estate Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas S. Schorsch
Represented By: Neil Robert Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Weil
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Jessica Caroline Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter M. Budko
Represented By: Jessica Caroline Collins
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. Jones
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Jessica Caroline Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Pavelka McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kahane
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Jessica Caroline Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janney Montgomery Scott LLC
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMP Securities LLC
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Thornton LLP
Represented By: Gary Frederick Bendinger
Represented By: Bruce Roger Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie D. Michelson
Represented By: Christopher Louis Garcia
Represented By: Richard William Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Stanley
Represented By: Christopher Louis Garcia
Represented By: Richard William Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward G. Rendell
Represented By: Christopher Louis Garcia
Represented By: Richard William Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J. Bowman
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Jessica Caroline Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Andruskevich
Represented By: Christopher Louis Garcia
Represented By: Richard William Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott P. Sealy, Sr.
Represented By: Michael David Margulies
Represented By: Robin L. Alperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Frank
Represented By: Christopher Louis Garcia
Represented By: Richard William Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Radesca
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Jessica Caroline Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby M. Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth K. Tuppeny
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher H. Cole
Represented By: Anil Karim Vassanji
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Represented By: Jonathan Lucas Shapiro
Represented By: Michael Howard Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc T. Nemer
Represented By: Anil Karim Vassanji
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Represented By: Jonathan Lucas Shapiro
Represented By: Michael Howard Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey C. Holland
Represented By: Anil Karim Vassanji
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Represented By: Jonathan Lucas Shapiro
Represented By: Michael Howard Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephan Keller
Represented By: Anil Karim Vassanji
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Represented By: Jonathan Lucas Shapiro
Represented By: Michael Howard Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Kirk McCallaster, Jr.
Represented By: Anil Karim Vassanji
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Represented By: Jonathan Lucas Shapiro
Represented By: Michael Howard Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard W. Wood
Represented By: Robin L. Alperstein
Represented By: Michael David Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keybanc Capital Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Capital Securities, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Hyde Giampapa
Represented By: Gary Stein
Represented By: Martin L. Perschetz
Represented By: Randall Thomas Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner &Smith, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Baird & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America
Represented By: Mark Tamerlane Millkey
Represented By: Robert M. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: College Retirement Equities Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiaa-Cref Equity Index Fund
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dowd
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Mark Tamerlane Millkey
Represented By: Robert M. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiaa-Cref Real Estate Securities Fund
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dowd
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Mark Tamerlane Millkey
Represented By: Robert M. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiaa-Cref Large Cap Value Index Fund
Represented By: Mark Tamerlane Millkey
Represented By: Robert M. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiaa-Cref Small Cap Blend Index Fund
Represented By: Mark Tamerlane Millkey
Represented By: Robert M. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiaa-Cref Life Real Estate Securities Fund
Represented By: Mark Tamerlane Millkey
Represented By: Robert M. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiaa-Cref Life Equity Index Fund
Represented By: Mark Tamerlane Millkey
Represented By: Robert M. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Represented By: Donald Alan Migliori
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Asset Management Holding AG
Represented By: Donald Alan Migliori
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KBC Asset Management NV
Represented By: Donald Alan Migliori
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corsair Select 100 L.P.
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corsair Select MF Ltd.
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corsair Capital Partners L.P.
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corsair Select L.P.
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corsair Capital Partners 100 L.P.
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corsair Capital Investors, Ltd.
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City Of Tampa General Employees Retirement Fund
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Matten
Represented By: William Scott Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Abadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Ellis
Represented By: Nicholas Ian Porritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Ellis
Represented By: Nicholas Ian Porritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berney Harris
Represented By: Howard Theodore Longman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?