Cummins v. Virtus Investment Partners Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Tom Cummins |
Defendant: |
Virtus Investment Partners Inc., George R. Aylward, Michael A. Angerthal, Francis G. Waltman and Mark S. Flynn |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv01249 |
Filed: |
February 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
XX Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Pauley |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 78 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 15, 2017 |
Filing
97
OPINION AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Lead Plaintiff's motion for class certification is granted. The class is defined as: all persons and entities that, during the period between January 25, 2013 and May 11, 2015, inclusive (the "C lass Period"), who purchased or otherwise acquired shares of the publicly traded common stock of Virtus Investment Partners, Inc. and were damaged thereby. This Court appoints Arkansas Teacher Retirement System as class representative and Labato n Sucharow LLP and Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP as Class Counsel. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 79. So ordered. re: 79 MOTION to Certify Class, Appoint Class Representative and Appoint Class Counsel filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Class Action Certified. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/15/2017) (rjm).
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing
68
OPINION & ORDER re: 52 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by Francis G. Waltman, Michael A. Angerthal, Jeffrey T. Cerutti, Virtus Investment Partners Inc., George R. Aylward, Virtus Opportunities Tru st. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Section 10(b) claims are dismissed against Angerthal, Cerutti, and Waltman and the Section 20(a) claims are dismissed against Angerthal. In all other respects, Defendants' motion is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 52. (As further set forth in this Opinion) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/1/2016) (kl)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?