Geo-Group Communications, Inc. v. Goldberg et al
Plaintiff: Geo-Group Communications, Inc.
Defendant: Joseph P. Goldberg, Hodgson Russ LLP, Ravi Chopra, Mahendra Shah, Vipin Shah and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2015cv01756
Filed: March 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 OPINION AND ORDER re: 297 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 295 Memorandum & Opinion Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of September 25, 2020 Opinion and Order (Dk. 295). filed by Geo-Group Communications, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 297. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/16/2020) (rro)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. (See Dkt. #297-298). Respondents Sanjiv Chand, 728 Melville Petro LLC, Kedis Enterprises LLC, and JMVD Hillside LLC shall file a consolidated opposition on or by November 3, 2020. Plaintiff's reply papers, if any, shall be due on or by November 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 11/3/2020, Replies due by 11/10/2020.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/13/2020) (rro)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 OPINION AND ORDER re: 276 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Motion seeks an Order Denying the Chand/LLC Defendants' October 18, 2019 Letter Request for an Extension of the September 10, 2019 Briefing Schedule (Dk. 269 as modified by Dk . 271) addressed to filed by Geo-Group Communications, Inc., 272 MOTION to Reopen re: 269 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines, 271 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Motion to Reopen Case Against the LLC Defendants and Mahendra Shah, to Join Sanjiv Chand as a Defendant, to file Amended and Supple filed by Geo-Group Communications, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motion to reopen the case as to 728 Melville Petro LLC, Kedis Enterprises LLC, JMVD Hi llside LLC, and Mahendra Shah is DENIED; Plaintiff's motion to join Sanjiv Chand is DENIED; and Plaintiff's motion to file a Fourth Amended Complaint is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at docket entri es 272 and 276. The parties remaining in the case are directed to submit a joint letter to the Court on or before October 23, 2020, discussing their availability for trial in the second half of 2021 and, as appropriate, any interest in alterna tive dispute resolution of this matter. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Opinion and Order to Defendants Vipin Shah and Mahendra Shah. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/25/2020) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 OPINION AND ORDER re: 193 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint. filed by Ravi Chopra, NYC Telecommunications Corp. Chopra's and NYC Telecom's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; M. Shah 9;s motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; and V. Shah's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Ravi Chopra, NYC Telecommunications Corp., and M. Shah as parties to this matter, and is further dir ected to terminate the motion at Docket Entry 193. Plaintiff and V. Shah are directed to appear for a conference with the Court on Friday, August 17, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Sq uare, New York, New York 10007, to discuss setting a trial date. SO ORDERED., (Status Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/30/18) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (yv)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 OPINION AND ORDER re: 118 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vipin Shah, 112 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mahendra Shah, 114 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by 728 Melville Petro LLC, Kedis Enterprises LLC, JMVD Hillside LLC: For the reasons stated in this Opinion, the LLC Defendants' motion to dismiss the TAC is GRANTED, and the Shah Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at docke t entries 112, 114, and 118. The TAC represents Plaintiff's fourth attempt at pleading; the Court will not offer it a fifth, as the Court finds that any further attempt to replead the claims against the dismissed Defendants would be futile. S ee Loreley Fin. (Jersey) No. 3 Ltd. v. Wells Fargo Sec., LLC, 797 F.3d 191 (2d Cir. 2015) (framing the central inquiry when considering the appropriateness of leave to replead as whether such repleading would be futile). All parties remaining in this matter are directed to appear for a conference to discuss next steps in this case on August 17, 2016, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. The parties are directed to submit a Proposed Case Management Plan as described at docket entry 3. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/27/2016) (tn)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Mahendra Shah, 68 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vipin Shah, 50 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Joseph P. Goldberg, Hodgson Russ LLP, 59 FIRS T MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ravi Chopra, NYC Telecommunications Corp., 56 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants 728 Melville Petro LLC, Kedis Enterprises LLC, and JMVD Hillside LLC filed by 728 Melville Petro LLC, Kedis Ent erprises LLC, JMVD Hillside LLC: For the reasons stated in this Opinion, the motions to dismiss all claims against Goldberg and Hodgson Russ, as well as Counts II, III, IV, and V of the SAC as alleged against all remaining Defendants, are D ENIED AS MOOT. Defendants' respective motions to dismiss Count I against Mahendra Shah, Vipin Shah, Shalu Suri, Kedis, Melville, JMVD, and NYCT are GRANTED. Chopra's motion to dismiss Count I, as alleged against him, is DENIED. GCI may file a Third Amended Complaint no later than February 22, 2016. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint will be March 14, 2016. An Initial Pretrial Conference in this matter will be scheduled for Mar ch 16, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at docket entries number 50, 56, 59, 68, and 71. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/1/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geo-Group Communications, Inc. v. Goldberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geo-Group Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Norman Solovay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Andrew Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hodgson Russ LLP
Represented By: Michael Andrew Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravi Chopra
Represented By: Matin Emouna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahendra Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vipin Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?