Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U. et al v. Argentine Republic et al
Plaintiff: Petersen Energia S.A.U. and Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U.
Defendant: Argentine Republic and YPF S.A.
Not Classified By Court: Burford Capital LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv02739
Filed: April 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #278 Motion to Seal. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' February 11, 2021 letter motion requesting to file under seal (i) portions of Plaintiffs' Pre-Motion Conference Letter and Report Regarding Status of Discovery, filed February 11, 2021 (the "Report"); and (ii) portions of Exhibits 6-8 to the Report. Upon review of the letter motion, it is hereby ORDERED that: Plaintiffs' letter motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED this 12 day of February, 2021.. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/12/2021) (ks) Modified on 2/12/2021 (ks).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(nmo)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and Report re Status of Discovery addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated February 11, 2021. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Defs 1st RFPs of Docs to Petersen, #2 Exhibit 02 - Defs 2nd RFPs of Docs to Petersen, #3 Exhibit 03 - 2021 01 15 Ltr from Cassady, #4 Exhibit 04 - Etchegorry Depo Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 05 - 2021 01 04 Ltr from Harris, #6 Exhibit 06 - REDACTED 2020 11 05 Ltr from YPF, #7 Exhibit 07 - REDACTED 2020 12 02 Ltr from Harris, #8 Exhibit 08 - REDACTED 2021 01 06 Ltr from YPF, #9 Exhibit 09 - Pls 1st RFPs of Docs to Argentine Republic, #10 Exhibit 10 - Pls 1st RFPs of Docs to YPF, #11 Exhibit 11 - YPF Move Puts Eskenazi Clan in Debt Binder, Financial Times, #12 Exhibit 12 - Por qu Eskenazi se quedar con YPF, La Nacion, #13 Exhibit 13 - Eskenazi, un constructor y banquero amigo de Kirchner, La Nacion, #14 Exhibit 14 - Kirchner impuso a Eskenazi para YPF, La Politica, #15 Exhibit 15 - Banks presented to Alberto Fernndez the electronic wallet, Explica.com, #16 Exhibit 16 - Alberto Fernandez Twitter, #17 Exhibit 17 - 2020 12 23 Email proposing meet and confer, #18 Exhibit 18 - 2021 01 25 Email from Goldsmith, #19 Exhibit 19 - 2021 01 09 Letter from Goldsmith, #20 Exhibit 20 - 2021 01 14 Ltr from Reisberg, #21 Exhibit Ex. 21 - 2021 01 23 Email from Reisberg, #22 Exhibit 22 - 2021 02 02 Ltr from Hansen, #23 Exhibit 23 - 2021 02 02 Ltr from Reisberg, #24 Exhibit 24 - 2021 02 02 Email from Goldsmith, #25 Exhibit 25 - NML Hearing Transcript, #26 Exhibit 26 - Amended Order, NML).(Hansen, Mark)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated February 11, 2021. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REDACTED 2021 02 11 Pre-Motion Conference Letter & Report re Status of Discovery, #2 Exhibit 06 - REDACTED 2020 11 05 Ltr from YPF, #3 Exhibit 07 - REDACTED 2020 12 02 Ltr from Harris, #4 Exhibit 08 - REDACTED 2021 01 06 Ltr from YPF, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Hansen, Mark)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #274 Letter Motion to Seal. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' February 1, 2021 letter motion requesting to file under seal portions of the Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Assertion of Privilege With Respect to Communications with Burford Capital ("Reply Brief"), Exhibit 3 attached thereto, portions of the declaration of Ignacio Tirado filed in support of the Reply Brief, Exhibit B attached thereto, and portions of Exhibits E, H, and I to the declaration of Andrew E. Goldsmith filed in support of the Reply Brief. Upon review of the letter motion and all prior proceedings in the above-captioned actions, and otherwise being duly advised, it is hereby ORDERED that: Plaintiffs' letter motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/2/2021) (va)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #263 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated January 11, 2021. . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 to Reply - Pagina 12 article, #2 Exhibit 02 to Reply - Financial Times article, #3 Exhibit 03 to Reply - PUBLIC - Slipsheet, #4 Exhibit 04 to Reply - 2019 Burford Annual Report Exerpts, #5 Exhibit 05 to Reply - 2016 Burford Annual Report Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 06 to Reply - 2019 Q4 Earnings Call, #7 Exhibit 07 to Reply - Bogart Depo Transcript Excerpts, #8 Affidavit Decl of AEG ISO Plfs Reply Memo of Law, #9 Exhibit A to AEG Decl - 2020 08 28 Petersen Resps & Objs to Defs 1st RFPs, #10 Exhibit B to AEG Decl - 2020 08 28 Plf Eton Park Resps & Objs to Defs 1st RFPs, #11 Exhibit C to AEG Decl - 2020 07 28 Defs Argentine Republic & YPF SA 1st RFP for Docs to Petersen, #12 Exhibit D to AEG Decl - 2020 07 28 Defs Argentine Republic & YPF SA 1st RFP for Docs to Eton Park, #13 Exhibit E to AEG Decl - PUBLIC - Redacted - 2020 10 12 Plfs Ltr from L Harris, #14 Exhibit F to AEG Decl - 2020 10 21 Petersen Plfs Resps & Objs to Defs 2nd RFPs, #15 Exhibit G to AEG Decl - 2020 10 21 Pltf Eton Park Resps & Objs to Defs 2nd RFPs, #16 Exhibit H to AEG Decl - PUBLIC - Redacted - 2020 10 28 Petersen Plfs Ltr from L Harris, #17 Exhibit I to AEG Decl - PUBLIC - Redacted - 2020 11 02 EP Plfs Resp Ltr from L Harris, #18 Affidavit Redacted - 2021 02 01 Decl of I Tirado Decl ISO Plfs Reply Memo of Law, #19 Exhibit A to Tirado Decl - I Tirado CV, #20 Exhibit B to Tirado Decl - Slipsheet, #21 Exhibit C to Tirado Decl - Spanish Court Decisions).(Hansen, Mark)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated February 1, 2021. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REDACTED 2021 02 01 Plfs Reply Memo of Law ISO Their Assertion of Privilege WRT Communications With Burford Capital, #2 Exhibit 03 to Reply - Slipsheet, #3 Exhibit E to AEG Decl - 2020 10 12 Plfs Ltr from L Harris - Redacted, #4 Exhibit H to AEG Decl - 2020 10 28 Petersen Plfs Ltr from L Harris - Redacted, #5 Exhibit I to AEG Decl - 2020 11 02 EP Plfs Resp Ltr from L Harris - Redacted, #6 Exhibit Redacted - 2021 02 01 Decl of I Tirado Decl ISO Plfs Reply Memo of Law, #7 Exhibit B to Tirado Decl - Slipsheet, #8 Text of Proposed Order).(Hansen, Mark)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated January 29, 2021 re: Burford Discovery Update. Document filed by Argentine Republic, Burford Capital LLC, YPF S.A...(Giuffra, Robert)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER: granting #268 Letter Motion to Seal. Defendants' sealing request is granted on the ground that the sealed material contains confidential business information. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/26/2021) (ama)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(nmo)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #263 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated January 11, 2021. . Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A...(Giuffra, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 DECLARATION of Thomas C. White in Opposition re: #263 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated January 11, 2021.. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20).(Giuffra, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 LETTER MOTION to Seal Opposition and Exhibits addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Thomas C. White dated January 25, 2021. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A...(Giuffra, Robert)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #263 Letter Motion to Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that: Plaintiffs' letter motion is GRANTED on the ground that the sealed material contains confidential business information. SO ORDERED this 12 day of January, 2021. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/12/2021) (va)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STIPULATION AND RULE 502(d) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for the Parties that: I. "Disclosed Protected Information," as that term is defined in Section 20 of the Protective Order, shall include Discovery Material as to which Burford claims, in accordance with applicable law, protection under the work product doctrine, attorney-client privilege or common interest privilege, regardless of whether Burford claims such protection before, at the time of, or after disclosure. Burford retains the burden of establishing the privileged or protected nature of the Disclosed Protected Information. 2. This Order shall be interpreted to provide the maximum protection allowed by Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/12/2021) (va)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order with Respect to Communications with Burford Capital. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 [REDACTED] Plfs Memo of Law ISO Plfs Brief re Assertion of Priv, #2 Exhibit 01 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Betancor Tr. (Nov. 5, 2020) [CONF.], #3 Exhibit 02 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] PT_000045773 (Feb. 18, 2015) [CONF.], #4 Exhibit 03 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Petersen CPA (Mar. 4, 2015), PT_000038600_PT009 [CONF, #5 Exhibit 04 - Bogart Tr. Excerpts (Oct. 29, 2020), #6 Exhibit 05 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Mindich Dep. Ex. 06, EP_000026558, (July 9, 2012) [CONF.], #7 Exhibit 06 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] [EXCERPTS] Mindich Tr. & Errata (Nov. 13, 2020) [CONF.], #8 Exhibit 07 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] [EXCERPTS] Engel Tr. & Errata (Nov. 10, 2020) [CONF.], #9 Exhibit 08 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Eton Park NDA, EP_000072932 (Oct. 28, 2016) [CONF.], #10 Exhibit 09 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Eton Park CPA, EP_000061489 (Nov. 3, 2016) [CONF.], #11 Exhibit 10 - Order, In re DMS AT Litig., MDL No. 2817 (N.D. Ill.), Dkt. No. 1113, #12 Exhibit 11 - Mem. Order, Elm 3Ds Innovations LLC, No. 14-1430 (D. Del.), Dkt. No. 372, #13 Text of Proposed Order).(Hansen, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated January 11, 2021. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 [REDACTED] Plfs Memo of Law ISO Plfs Brief re Assertion of Priv, #2 Exhibit 01 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Betancor Tr. (Nov. 5, 2020) [CONF.], #3 Exhibit 02 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] PT_000045773 (Feb. 18, 2015) [CONF.], #4 Exhibit 03 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Petersen CPA (Mar. 4, 2015), PT_000038600_PT009 [CONF, #5 Exhibit 05 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Mindich Dep. Ex. 06, EP_000026558, (July 9, 2012) [CONF.], #6 Exhibit 06 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] [EXCERPTS] Mindich Tr. & Errata (Nov. 13, 2020) [CONF.], #7 Exhibit 07 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] [EXCERPTS] Engel Tr. & Errata (Nov. 10, 2020) [CONF.], #8 Exhibit 08 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Eton Park NDA, EP_000072932 (Oct. 28, 2016) [CONF.], #9 Exhibit 09 - [FILED UNDER SEAL] Eton Park CPA, EP_000061489 (Nov. 3, 2016) [CONF.], #10 Text of Proposed Order).(Hansen, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' PRIVILEGE CLAIMS: NOW THEREFORE, in consideration of the foregoing, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, through their undersigned counsel, AND SO ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiffs stipulate that they have not withheld any documents based on privileges under Spanish law; 2. Plaintiffs stipulate that they will not rely on any privileges under Spanish law for the remainder of these proceedings;1 and 3. The parties agree to the following briefing schedule on the applicability of privilege based on a litigation funding arrangement: Plaintiffs' moving brief: January 11, 2021. Defendants' opposition brief: January 25, 2021. Plaintiffs' reply brief: February 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 1/11/2021. Responses due by 1/25/2021. Replies due by 2/1/2021.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/11/2021) (va)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Burford Capital LLC..(Joseph, Gregory)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Ho, Derek)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark P. Goodman dated January 8, 2021 re: regarding former law clerks. Document filed by YPF S.A...(Goodman, Mark)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #257 Letter filed by Burford Capital LLC, YPF S.A., Argentine Republic. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants and Burford shall provide a further status report to the Court on these issues by January 29, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/8/2021) (va)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated January 7, 2021 re: Burford Discovery Update. Document filed by Argentine Republic, Burford Capital LLC, YPF S.A...(Giuffra, Robert)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #233 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for YPF S.A (dkt. no. 233 in 15-cv-2739; dkt. no. 174 in 16-cv-8569) is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Michael A Paskin terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/6/2021) (va)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated January 4, 2021 re: DE 239 & Substitution of YPF Counsel. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Hansen, Mark)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/22/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/22/2020 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER denying #241 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Accordingly, the Petersen Plaintiffs' oral request during the December 22 conference for reconsideration of the Court's November 23 order (Order, dated Nov. 23, 2020 [dkt. no. 219 in 15-cv2739; dkt. no. 158 in 16-cv-8569)]) is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/28/2020) (va)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: (190 in 1:16-cv-08569-LAP) Letter filed by Argentine Republic, (250 in 1:15-cv-02739-LAP) Letter filed by Argentine Republic. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/23/2020) (nb)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Status Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (va)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 12/22/2020. (mph)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra dated December 22, 2020 re: Update on Burford Discovery. Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER: In its November 23, 2020 Order, the Court directed the parties to confer and propose a briefing schedule on the applicability of privilege, if any, under Spanish law. To the extent that Plaintiffs still assert that such a privilege applies in this litigation, the parties shall confer and propose a briefing schedule on this issue. Additionally, to the extent that Plaintiffs still assert privilege based on a litigation funding arrangement with non-parties, the parties shall confer and propose a briefing schedule on this issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/22/2020) (va)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's order of November 23, 2020 (ECF No. 219 in case 1:15cv-02739) instructing the parties to confer on a new schedule in light of the 90-dayextension of the fact discovery deadline, Plaintiffs hereby submit, with Defendants' agreement, the following proposed schedule for these consolidated cases: Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2021. Status Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2021. Motions due by 6/21/2021. Responses due by 7/19/2021. Replies due by 8/9/2021. Status Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. The proposed schedule is approved subject to the modifications above. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/22/2020) (va) Modified on 1/25/2021 (va).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated December 21, 2020 re: #241 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated December 17, 2020. . Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated December 21, 2020 re: Submission of Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Hansen, Mark)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (244 in 1:15-cv-02739-LAP) Letter filed by YPF S.A., (185 in 1:16-cv-08569-LAP) Letter filed by YPF S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Cravath, Swaine & Moore is excused from the December 22, 2020 conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/21/2020) (rro)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated December 21, 2020 re: conference scheduled for December 22, 2020. Document filed by YPF S.A...(Paskin, Michael)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark P. Goodman dated December 18, 2020 re: DE 239 LETTER from Mark C. Hansen dated December 9, 2020.. Document filed by YPF S.A...(Goodman, Mark)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER. The Court is in receipt of letters from counsel to Defendant (dkt. no. 240 in 15-cv-2739) and Plaintiffs (dkt. no. 241 in 15-cv-2739). Counsel for the Republic shall provide any response to Plaintiffs' letter no later than December 21, 2020. Counsel shall appear by telephone for a conference on December 22, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The dial-in for that conference is (888) 363-4734, access code: 4645450. So ordered. re: #241 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated December 17, 2020. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U. #240 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated December 15, 2020 re: Status of Hague Convention Letters. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Responses due by 12/21/2020). (Telephone Conference set for 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/18/2020) (rjm)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated December 17, 2020. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dec. 2, 2020 Ltr. from L. Harris to M. Paskin, et al.).(Hansen, Mark)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated December 15, 2020 re: Status of Hague Convention Letters. Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated December 9, 2020 re: DE 232, Defendant YPF Motion to Substitute New Counsel. Document filed by Burford Capital LLC, Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Hansen, Mark)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dietmar Prager on behalf of YPF S.A...(Prager, Dietmar)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Rose Selden on behalf of YPF S.A...(Selden, Shannon)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark P. Goodman on behalf of YPF S.A...(Goodman, Mark)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald Francis Donovan on behalf of YPF S.A...(Donovan, Donald)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 DECLARATION of Michael A. Paskin in Support re: #233 MOTION for Michael A. Paskin to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by YPF S.A...(Paskin, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for Michael A. Paskin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by YPF S.A...(Paskin, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Michael A. Paskin, New Attorney: Mark P. Goodman addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated December 9, 2020. Document filed by YPF S.A...(Paskin, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 230 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER: As instructed by the Court at the conference held on November 24, 2020, counsel for Defendants and Burford Capital LLC shall meet and confer on the scope of discovery as to Burford. Counsel shall provide the Court with an update no later than December 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/23/2020) (va)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 11/24/2020. (mph)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 11/23/2020. (mph)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER re: (194 in 1:15-cv-02739-LAP) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 10, 2020, filed by YPF S.A., Argentine Republic; (207 in 1:15-cv-02739-LAP) Response to Motion, filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.; (217 in 1:15-cv-02739-LAP) Reply to Response to Motion, filed by YPF S.A., Argentine Republic. Having considered Defendants' letters of November 10, 2020 and November 20, 2020 (dkt. nos. 194, 217) and the November 17, 2020 letter from Plaintiffs Petersen Energa Inversora, S.A.U. and Petersen Energa, S.A.U. ("Petersen") (dkt. no. 207), and after consideration of the parties' arguments put forth at the November 23, 2020 conference (the "Conference"), the Court hereby memorializes its instructions given at the Conference to the parties as follows: (As further set forth herein.) The Court reserves on the issue of privilege and will await the parties' briefing on the issue of the applicability of privileges, if any, under Spanish law. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/23/2020) (va)
November 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 21, 2020 re: #216 LETTER MOTION to Seal Letter and Exhibits addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 20, 2020. and #217 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A).(Giuffra, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 20, 2020 re: #194 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 10, 2020. . Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Giuffra, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 LETTER MOTION to Seal Letter and Exhibits addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 20, 2020. Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Rebecca Rettig dated November 20, 2020 re: #194 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 10, 2020. (response to Plaintiffs' letter dated November 17, 2020). Document filed by YPF S.A...(Rettig, Rebecca)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Lauren Rettig on behalf of YPF S.A...(Rettig, Rebecca)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 19, 2020 re: #199 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 13, 2020. . Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Giuffra, Robert)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 LETTER MOTION to Seal Letter addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 19, 2020. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A...(Giuffra, Robert)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #209 Letter Motion to Seal. The sealing request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/19/2020) (va)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Gregory P. Joseph dated November 18, 2020 re: #199 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 13, 2020. . Document filed by Burford Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Joseph, Gregory)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 LETTER MOTION to Seal Letter and Exhibit A addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Gregory P. Joseph dated November 18, 2020. Document filed by Burford Capital LLC..(Joseph, Gregory)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated November 17, 2020 re: #194 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 10, 2020. . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Betancor Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 02 - Credit Suisse Subpoena).(Hansen, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #204 Letter filed by Burford Capital LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel for Defendants and Burford Capital LLC shall appear by telephone for a conference on November 24, 2020 at 9:00 am. The dial-in for that conference is (888) 363-4734, access code: 4645450. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/17/2020) (ama)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #198 LETTER MOTION to Seal Letter and Exhibits addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 13, 2020. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A. Defendants' request to file under seal the November 13, 2020 letter and Exhibit 5 thereto is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/16/2020) (rjm)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Gregory P. Joseph dated November 16, 2020 re: Letter Motion for Conference. Document filed by Burford Capital LLC..(Joseph, Gregory)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Gregory P. Joseph dated November 16, 2020 re: Letter Motion for Conference. Document filed by Burford Capital LLC..(Joseph, Gregory)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Mead Cherington on behalf of Burford Capital LLC..(Cherington, Rachel)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela H. Jarvis on behalf of Burford Capital LLC..(Jarvis, Pamela)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory P. Joseph on behalf of Burford Capital LLC..(Joseph, Gregory)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 13, 2020. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13).(Giuffra, Robert)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 LETTER MOTION to Seal Letter and Exhibits addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 13, 2020. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A...(Giuffra, Robert)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Rhys Brebner on behalf of Argentine Republic..(Brebner, Adam)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #194 Letter Motion for Conference. Plaintiffs Petersen Energa Inversora, S.A.U. and Petersen Energa, S.A.U. ("Petersen") shall respond to Defendants' letter of November 10, 2020 (dkt. no. 194) no later than November 17, 2020. Defendants may reply no later than November 20, 2020. Defendants' request for a 90-day extension of the fact discovery deadline is GRANTED. Counsel shall appear by telephone for a conference on November 23, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. EST. The dial-in for that conference is (888) 363-4734, access code: 4645450. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/12/2020) (va)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 10, 2020. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 - Maria Alejandra Etchegorry Declaration, #6 Ex. 1 to Etchegorry Declaration, #7 Ex. 2 to Etchegorry Declaration, #8 Ex. 3 to Etchegorry Declaration, #9 Ex. 4 to Etchegorry Declaration, #10 Ex. 5 to Etchegorry Declaration, #11 Ex. 6 to Etchegorry Declaration, #12 Ex. 7 to Etchegorry Declaration, #13 Ex. 8 to Etchegorry Declaration, #14 Ex. 9 to Etchegorry Declaration, #15 Ex. 10 to Etchegorry Declaration, #16 Exhibit 6, #17 Exhibit 7).(Giuffra, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 LETTER MOTION to Seal Letter and Exhibits addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated November 10, 2020. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A...(Giuffra, Robert)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED on November 6, 2020, and mailed to Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP, Worldwide Plaza, 825 Eighth Avenue NY NY 10019, Attn: Kathryn Bolas, and to be served on the Kingdom of Spain.***.(km)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING REMOTE DEPOSITIONS: NOW, THEREFORE, it is ORDERED that the Remote Depositions shall proceed subject to the following rules and procedures, which have been agreed upon by the Parties: (As further set forth herein this Stipulation.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/29/2020) (va)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Hansen, Mark)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Hansen, Mark) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 10/28/2020 (km).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Mark Hansen to RE-FILE Document #190 Proposed Order. Use the event type proposed orders, proposed stipulation and order. The stipulation also needs to have handwritten signatures of the attorneys. (km)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED on October 23, 2020, and mailed to Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP, 125 Broad Street, NY NY 10004, to be served in Argentina. (8 letters rogatory issued).(km)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Issuance of Letters of Request addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Thomas C. White dated October 15, 2020. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter of Request for Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter of Request for Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter of Request for Documents, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter of Request for Documents, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter of Request for Testimony, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter of Request for Testimony, #7 Exhibit 7 - Letter of Request for Testimony, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter of Request for Testimony, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter of Request for Documents Redline, #10 Exhibit 10 - Letter of Request for Testimony Redline).(White, Thomas)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE of corrected letter of request re: #187 Order,. Document filed by YPF S.A...(Paskin, Michael)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to strike the following docket entries: dkt. nos. 182-84 in No. 15 Civ. 2739 and dkt. nos. 126-27 in No. 16 Civ. 8569. The parties shall re-submit the letters rogatory with the above issues corrected no later than October 21, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/14/2020) (va)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated October 9, 2020 re: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Letters Rogatory Requests. Document filed by YPF S.A...(Paskin, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert. J. Giuffra, Jr. dated October 9, 2020 re: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Letters Rogatory Requests. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Giuffra, Robert)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #184 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #187 Order . (va) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letter Rogatory): REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE TO OBTAIN EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/6/2020) (va) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. Modified on 10/14/2020 (va).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #183 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #187 Order. (va) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letter Rogatory). ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/6/2020) (va) Modified on 10/6/2020 (va). Modified on 10/14/2020 (va).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #126 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #128 Order. (va) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letter Rogatory). ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/6/2020) (va) Modified on 10/6/2020 (va). Modified on 10/14/2020 (va).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #175 Letter Motion for Discovery. The Court will permit issuance of the letters rogatory but, by doing so, does not make any finding as to the necessity of the information requested. Moreover, the Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' letter dated October 5, 2020 (dkt. no. 180 in 15 Civ. 2739) noting what they characterize as Defendants' slow pace of document production. Given the age of this case, the Court will be reluctant to extend the current discovery schedule absent unforeseen and unforeseeable circumstances. The Court is also hopeful that, given the quality of counsel for both sides, motions to compel will not be necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/6/2020) (va)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document re: transmission from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #187 Order . (va) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk. Transmitted re: #182 Order to the Orders and Judgments Clerk. (va) Modified on 10/14/2020 (va).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document re: transmission from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #187 Order . (va) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk. Transmitted re: #183 Order, to the Orders and Judgments Clerk. (va) Modified on 10/14/2020 (va).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated October 5, 2020 re: Response to Defendants' Letters Rogatory Requests [DEs 175, 178]. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Hansen, Mark)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated October 2, 2020 re: Defendants Pre-Motion Conference Letters [DEs 175, 178]. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Hansen, Mark)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated October 2, 2020 re: request for a pre-motion conference. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Paskin, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 PROTECTIVE ORDER:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. This Order shall take effect when entered and shall be binding upon all counsel of record and their law firms, the Parties, and persons made subject to this Order by its terms. Unless otherwise agreed or ordered, this Order shall remain in force after dismissal or entry of final judgment not subject to further appeal. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over all persons subject to this Order to the extent necessary to enforce any obligations arising hereunder or to impose sanctions for any contempt thereof. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/29/2020) (ama)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Hansen, Mark)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Issuance of Letters of Request addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. and Michael A. Paskin dated September 24, 2020. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter of Request for Documents, #2 Exhibit A to Letter of Request for Documents, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter of Request for Testimony).(Giuffra, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Edward Kornmehl on behalf of Argentine Republic..(Kornmehl, Jason)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Elizabeth Harris on behalf of Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Harris, Laura)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's order of July 13, 2020 (ECF No. 170 in Case 1:15-cv 02739), the parties hereby submit the following schedule for these consolidated cases: Fact Discovery due by 11/16/2020. Expert Discovery due by 2/22/2021. Motions due by 3/8/2021. Responses due by 3/29/2021. Replies due by 4/9/2021. SO ORDERED this 20th day of July, 2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/20/2020) (va)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated July 17, 2020 re: Submission of Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order requested by Court in DE 170. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation & Proposed Scheduling Order).(Hansen, Mark)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER: The Court has considered the parties' proposals concerning discovery and case management in the above-captioned actions. (See dkt. nos. 164, 165 in 15 Civ. 2739.) The Court has also considered the arguments raised by the parties at the conference before the Court on July 9, 2020. (See dkt. no. 167 in 15 Civ. 2739.) In an effort to hasten the final resolution of these consolidated cases, the Court concludes that both expert discovery on issues of Argentine law and fact discovery shall proceed simultaneously. The case shall proceed in accordance with the schedule proposed by Plaintiffs in their letter dated June 26, 2020. (See dkt. no. 164 in 15 Civ. 2739 at 1-2.) The parties shall confer and submit a proposed order effectuating the above. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/13/2020) (va)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/9/2020. (mph)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel's request to withdraw is granted. SO ORDERED. Granting #168 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott D. Musoff; Jennifer Lynn Permesly; Boris Bershteyn and Michael David Moritz terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/9/2020) (rjm)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION for Jennifer L. Permesly, Scott D. Musoff, Boris Bershteyn, Shaud G. Tavakoli, Michael D. Moritz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Permesly, Jennifer)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER: Counsel for the parties in the above-captioned actions shall appear for a telephonic conference on July 9, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. EST. The dial-in for that conference is (888) 363-4734, access code: 4645450. The parties are directed to call in promptly at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/1/2020) (va)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated June 26, 2020 re: Proposed Next Steps. Document filed by YPF S.A...(Paskin, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Robert J. Giuffra Jr. dated June 26, 2020 re: Proposed Next Steps. Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated June 26, 2020 re: Proposed Next Steps. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U...(Hansen, Mark)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (162 in 1:15-cv-02739-LAP) Letter filed by YPF S.A. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed extension is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/19/2020) (va)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated June 18, 2020 re: a date to confer and to inform the Court of their proposal(s) for a path forward in both actions. Document filed by YPF S.A...(Paskin, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 OPINION & ORDER. Defendants' motion to dismiss this action pursuant to the doctrine of forum non conveniens (dkt. no. 110 in 15 Civ. 2739; dkt. no. 51 in 16 Civ. 8569) is DENIED. To the extent that they are not addressed above, the Court has considered the parties' remaining arguments and has found them unavailing. The parties shall confer and shall inform the Court by letter no later than June 19, 2020, how they wish to proceed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/5/20) (yv)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #147 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney Maura Barry Grinalds terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/4/2020) (va)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #158 Letter filed by Argentine Republic. ENDORSEMENT: Upon the Republic's information that it does not object to the withdrawal of Mr. Lerner or Ms. Grinalds, (dkt. no. 147 in 15 Civ. 2739; dkt. nos. 88, 20 in 16 Civ. 8569), the appearance scheduled for March 11 is cancelled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/4/2020) (va)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Joseph E. Neuhaus dated March 3, 2020 re: Motions to Withdraw as Counsel. Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Neuhaus, Joseph)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Argentine Republic. New Address: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York, 10001-8602,..(Musoff, Scott)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel are directed to appear incourtroom 12A, or such other courtroom as may be designated, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007 on March 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. as a return date for the motion for Maura Barry Grinalds to withdraw as counsel for the defendant Argentine Republic. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/13/2020) (kv)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 DECLARATION of Maximo Langer in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Langer Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Langer Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Langer Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Langer Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Langer Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Langer Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Langer Declaration).(Giuffra, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens"). . Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 DECLARATION of Guillermo Cabanellas in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 DECLARATION of Rafael M. Manovil in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 DECLARATION of Gustavo Martin Gonzalo de Urquieta in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 DECLARATION of Alfonso Santiago in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Santiago Declaration).(Giuffra, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lynn Permesly on behalf of Argentine Republic..(Permesly, Jennifer)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 DECLARATION of Maura Barry Grinalds in Support re: #147 MOTION for Maura Barry Grinalds to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Grinalds, Maura)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for Maura Barry Grinalds to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Argentine Republic..(Grinalds, Maura)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A Cassady on behalf of Argentine Republic..(Cassady, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Charles White on behalf of Argentine Republic..(White, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus on behalf of Argentine Republic..(Neuhaus, Joseph)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sergio J. Galvis on behalf of Argentine Republic..(Galvis, Sergio)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr on behalf of Argentine Republic..(Giuffra, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #140 Letter filed by YPF S.A., Argentine Republic. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/22/2020) (va)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated January 21, 2020 re: Defendants' consolidated reply memorandum of law. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #134 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Republic's reply shall be filed no later than February 7. SO ORDERED. Replies due by 2/7/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/20/2019) (mml)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated December 18, 2019 re: Reply in further support of the request for extension. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Scott D. Musoff dated December 18, 2019 re: Reply in further support of the request for extension. Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Musoff, Scott)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated December 17, 2019 re: #134 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Scott D. Musoff dated December 16, 2019. . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated December 16, 2019. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Scott D. Musoff dated December 16, 2019. Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Musoff, Scott)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 DECLARATION of Dr. Alfredo L. Rovira in Opposition re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rovira CV)(Hansen, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 DECLARATION of Professor Alejandro M. Garro in Opposition re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 A - Garro CV)(Hansen, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 DECLARATION of Alejandro Freeland in Opposition re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Freeland CV, #2 Exhibit B - Letter Rogatory, #3 Exhibit C - Spanish Bankr. Ct Submission, #4 Exhibit D - Judge Lijo Production Order, #5 Exhibit E - Argentine Economic Treason Law)(Hansen, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DECLARATION of Alberto B. Bianchi and Gustavo Naveira in Opposition re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bianchi CV, #2 Exhibit B - Naveira CV)(Hansen, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECLARATION of Jose Maria Figuerero in Opposition re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Monti Decl)(Hansen, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 DECLARATION of Marcy Engel in Opposition re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 DECLARATION of Christopher P. Bogart in Opposition re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 DECLARATION of Armando Betancor Alamo in Opposition re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Letter Rogatory, #2 Exhibit B Spanish Bankr. Ct. Submission)(Hansen, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens"). . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER terminating #110 Motion to Dismiss. In light of the Court's order of September 17, which extends briefing in the motions to dismiss in these cases [dkt. no. 119 in 15 Civ. 2739 and dkt. no. 60 in 16 Civ. 8569], those motions [dkt. no. 110 in 15 Civ. 2739 and dkt. no. 51 in 16 Civ. 8569]are marked off the calendar to be restored upon docketing of the reply papers. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/16/2019) (tro)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying as moot #86 Letter Motion for Conference. In light of the filing of the motion, the request is denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/16/2019) (tro)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (61 in 1:16-cv-08569-LAP) Letter filed by Argentine Republic, (120 in 1:15-cv-02739-LAP) Letter filed by Argentine Republic. ENDORSEMENT: The incorrect implication that counsel suggests was certainly not intended. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/2/2019) (mml)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated September 27, 2019 re: Court's Order, dated September 17, 2019 (Dkt. No. 119). Document filed by YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Maura Barry Grinalds dated September 27, 2019 re: Court's Order, dated September 17, 2019 (Dkt. No. 119). Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Grinalds, Maura)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re: (110 in 1:15-cv-02739-LAP) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens"). filed by YPF S.A.. In light of the upcoming elections in the Republic of Argentina, the Court adjourns the briefing dates on the Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens [dkt. no. 110] until there is a clearer sense of which administration will have the power to speak for the Republic. Accordingly, Petersen Energia Inversore and Eton Park Capital Management's time to file opposition papers is extended to December 7; and the Republic's time to reply is extended to January 7, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 12/7/2019, Replies due by 1/7/2020.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/17/2019) (kv)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated August 30, 2019 re: requesting oral argument on joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DECLARATION of Alfonso Santiago in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Santiago Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Santiago Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Santiago Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Santiago Declaration)(Paskin, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 DECLARATION of Guillermo Cabanellas in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Cabanellas Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Cabanellas Declaration)(Paskin, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DECLARATION of Rafael M. Manovil in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Manovil Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Manovil Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Manovil Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Manovil Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Manovil Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Manovil Declaration)(Paskin, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 DECLARATION of Maria Alejandra Etchegorry in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Paskin, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 DECLARATION of Bernardo Saravia Frias in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Frias Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Frias Declaration)(Paskin, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 DECLARATION of Michael A. Paskin in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens").. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Eton Park's Schedule 13G/A dated 12/31/2016, #2 Exhibit B--YPF U.S. IPO Prospectus, Form F-1, #3 Exhibit C--Burford Investor Presentation dated 7/25/2018, #4 Exhibit D--YPF 6/4/2012 Shareholders' Meeting Minutes, #5 Exhibit E--YPF's Form 6-K dated 6/5/2012, #6 Exhibit F--YPF's Form 6-K dated 5/9/2014)(Paskin, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens"). ("Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens"). Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Paskin, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens"). Document filed by YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Argentine Republic. (Musoff, Scott)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Letter Motion for Conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/23/2019) (mml)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Maura Barry Grinalds dated August 20, 2019. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A..(Grinalds, Maura)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET SCHEDULE. 1. Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss for forum non conveniens (the "FNC Motions") on [August 30, 2019]. 2. Plaintiffs shall file their oppositions to the FNC Motions on [October 30, 2019]. 3. Defendants shall file their replies to the oppositions on [November 29, 2019]. 4. All other deadlines and proceedings in the Petersen and Eton Park actions shall be held in abeyance pending the resolution of the FNC Motions. So ordered. (Motions due by 8/30/2019. Responses due by 10/30/2019. Replies due by 11/29/2019.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/24/2019) (rjm)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the firm of AKERMAN LLP hereby withdraws as counsel for Defendant the Argentine Republic ("Argentina") in the above-captioned action and requests such attorneys' names be "terminated" from the court's docket. The firm of SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP is replacing AKERMAN LLP as counsel for Argentina in this matter. The substitution of attorneys is hereby approved and SO ORDERED. Attorney George Volsky; Bryan Thomas West; Martin Domb and Benjamin Reid Joelson terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/24/2019) (rjm)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Maura Barry Grinalds dated July 23, 2019 re: Briefing motions to dismiss on the basis of forum non conveniens. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Grinalds, Maura)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #102 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Thomas Joseph Hall terminated.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/15/2019) (jwh)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/11/2019. (mph)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Thomas J. Hall and Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP to Withdraw as Attorney /Counsel. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Hall, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Aaron Herman on behalf of YPF S.A.. (Herman, David)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Maura Barry Grinalds dated July 8, 2019 re: Reply to Plaintiffs' July 3, 2019 Letter. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A..(Grinalds, Maura)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Grinalds, Maura)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maura Barry Grinalds on behalf of Argentine Republic. (Grinalds, Maura)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael David Moritz on behalf of Argentine Republic. (Moritz, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Bershteyn on behalf of Argentine Republic. (Bershteyn, Boris)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A Paskin on behalf of YPF S.A.. (Paskin, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Akerman LLP by Martin Domb, Benjamin R. Joelson, Bryan T. West and George Volsky, New Attorney: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP by Maura Barry Grinalds, Address: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, Four Times Square, New York, NY, 10036, (212) 735-3000. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Domb, Martin)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated July 5, 2019 re: #85 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated June 24, 2019. . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Maura Barry Grinalds dated July 3, 2019 re: Response to the June 24, 2019 letter of Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U. and Petersen Energia, S.A.U. (together, "Petersen"). Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Grinalds, Maura)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated July 3, 2019 re: #86 LETTER MOTION for Conference and to file excess pages addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Maura Barry Grinalds dated June 24, 2019. . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated July 3, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' letter requesting a pre-motion conference (ECF No. 85). Document filed by YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Stay Lifted. Pursuant to instructions from Chambers on 7/11/2019, see entry 88 in case 15cv2739. (tro)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #85 Letter Motion for Conference. The parties shall submit response letters to each other's recent request by July 3rd. The parties shall appear for a conference on July 11 at 11 a.m. in Courtroom 12A, U.S. District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, NY, NY. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/25/2019) Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (ks)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated June 24, 2019 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 LETTER MOTION for Conference and to file excess pages addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Maura Barry Grinalds dated June 24, 2019. Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Grinalds, Maura)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated June 24, 2019. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U..(Hansen, Mark)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying #78 Letter Motion for Conference; granting #79 Letter Motion for Conference. Construing Defendants' April 28, 2019 and April 29, 2019 letters [dkt. no. 34 in 16-CV-8569; dkt. no. 79 in 15-CV-2739] as motions for stays, those motions are granted pending resolution of the certiorari petition currently pending before the Supreme Court of the United States. Plaintiff's request for a conference [dkt. no. 78 in 15-CV-2739] is denied also pending resolution of the certiorari petition. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/30/2019) (mro)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated April 30, 2019 re: #79 LETTER MOTION for Conference requesting a pre-motion conference to seek an order staying proceedings in Eton Park and Petersen until disposition of Defendants' certiorari petitions in Petersen, Nos. 18-575, 18-581. addressed to Judge Lo retta Preska. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A.. (Paskin, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damaris Hernandez on behalf of YPF S.A.. (Hernandez, Damaris)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated 04/29/2019 re: #78 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #75 USCA Mandate,, Requesting Status Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated April 27, 2019. . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Maura Barry Grinalds dated April 29, 2019 re: #78 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #75 USCA Mandate,, Requesting Status Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated April 27, 2019. . Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A.. (Grinalds, Maura)
April 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 LETTER MOTION for Conference requesting a pre-motion conference to seek an order staying proceedings in Eton Park and Petersen until disposition of Defendants' certiorari petitions in Petersen, Nos. 18-575, 18-581. addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Paskin dated April 28, 2019. Document filed by Argentine Republic, YPF S.A..(Paskin, Michael)
April 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #75 USCA Mandate,, Requesting Status Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated April 27, 2019. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U..(Hansen, Mark)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #76 Letter, filed by Argentine Republic. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/22/2019) (jwh)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Maura Barry Grinalds dated April 18, 2019 re: Requesting that the Court refrain from entering any order pursuant to S.D.N.Y. Local Rule 58.1. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Circuit Filing)(Grinalds, Maura)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #67 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by YPF S.A., #66 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Argentine Republic, USCA Case Number 16-3303(L); 16-3304(Con). The appeal in the above captioned case from an order of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York was argued on the district court's record and the parties' briefs. Upon consideration thereof, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the order of the district court is AFFIRMED in part and DISMISSED in part. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 4/17/2019. (tp)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #75 USCA Mandate. (tp)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For the above reasons, under the authority granted this Court by 28 U.S.C. 1292(b), Defendants' motions for certification on the act of state issue dated Sept. 27, 2016 (dkt. nos. 68, 69) are GRANTED. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/7/2016) (kl)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Thomas J. Hall dated September 30, 2016 re: reply to Plaintiffs' September 29, 2016 letter opposing YPF's request for certification. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Hall, Thomas)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Martin Domb dated September 30, 2016 re: in reply to letter from Mark C. Hansen dated September 29, 2016 (Dkt. 70) and in further support of letter from Martin Domb dated September 27, 2016 (Dkt. 68). Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Domb, Martin)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated September 29, 2016 re: Response to YPF's 9/27/2016 Request for Certification. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U..(Hansen, Mark)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated September 29, 2016 re: Response to Republic of Argentina's 9/27/16 Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U..(Hansen, Mark)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Thomas J. Hall dated September 27, 2016 re: requesting that the Court certify the Opinion and Order dated September 9, 2016 for interlocutory appeal or, in the alternative, allow YPF to file a 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) motion seeking such certification. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Hall, Thomas)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Martin Domb dated September 27, 2016 re: requesting a pre-motion conference for a motion for certification under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Domb, Martin)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #63 Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by YPF S.A.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-12792678. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Hall, Thomas)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #63 Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Argentine Republic. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Domb, Martin)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Martin Domb dated September 23, 2016 re: proceedings in the district court pending the appeal. Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Domb, Martin)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Document filed by Argentine Republic. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Domb, Martin) Modified on 9/23/2016 (tp).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Domb, Martin to RE-FILE Document No. #64 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order/judgment being appealed was not selected. Re-file the appeal using the event type Notice of Interlocutory Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. (tp)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #67 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #67 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by YPF S.A. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Appeal Fee Payment: for #66 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-12792973. (Domb, Martin)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #66 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Appeal Fee Due: for #66 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Appeal fee due by 10/7/2016. (tp)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #66 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Argentine Republic were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION & ORDER #106723 re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by YPF S.A.; re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Argentine Republic. For the above reasons, Defendants' motions to dismiss (Arg. Mot. to Dismiss, dated Sept. 8, 2015 [dkt. no. 23]; YPF Mot. to Dismiss, dated Sept. 8, 2015 [dkt. no. 32]) are granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, the motions to dismiss the promissory estoppel claims against both Defendants are granted; the motion to dismiss the good faith and fair dealing claim against YPF is granted but denied as to Argentina. These motions are denied in all other respects. (As further set forth in this Opinion) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/9/2016) (kl)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/20/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/20/2016 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Oral Argument held on 7/20/2016 re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Argentine Republic. (Court Reporter Present) (mph)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to appear in courtroom 12A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, on July 20, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. for oral argument in the above-captioned action. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 7/20/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/27/2016) (kl)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Mark C. Hansen dated June 24, 2016 re: Oral Argument and Status Conference. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U..(Hansen, Mark)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Thomas P. Griesa is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Martin Domb dated February 12, 2016 re: Supplemental Authority (In Response to Plaintiffs' 2/10/16 Letter). Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Joelson, Benjamin)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark C. Hansen dated February 10, 2016 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark C. Hansen dated 12/07/2015 re: Defendants' 12/01/2015 Letter. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U..(Ho, Derek)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Martin Domb dated December 2, 2015 re: supplementary authority relevant to pending motions to dismiss [Dkt. 23 and 32]. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Slip opinion in OBB Personenverkehr AG v. Sachs, 577 U.S. ___ (December 1, 2015))(Domb, Martin)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Hall, Thomas)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Domb, Martin)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Javier Errecondo in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Domb, Martin)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Ismael Mata in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Domb, Martin)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECLARATION of Javier Garcia Marrero in Opposition re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DECLARATION of Gustavo A. Naveira in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DECLARATION of Alberto B. Bianchi in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION of Dr. Alfredo L. Rovira in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECLARATION of Derek T. Ho in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hansen, Mark)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Mark Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/5/2015) (kl)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #41 Motion for George Volsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/24/2015) (spo)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for George Volsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Volsky, George)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for George Volsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Martin Domb dated September 16, 2015 re: correcting deadline for filing responses to motion to dismiss (Dkt. 23). Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Domb, Martin)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR MOTION to Dismiss (correcting date by which responses are due). Document filed by Argentine Republic. Responses due by 10/19/2015(Domb, Martin) (As per email dated 9/15/2015) (kj). Modified on 9/16/2015 (kj).
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for George Volsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11370364. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Good Standing Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Volsky, George) Modified on 9/10/2015 (bcu).
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #38 MOTION for George Volsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11370364. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECLARATION of Ernesto Alberto Marcer in Support re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Annex 1, #2 Annex 2, #3 Annex 3, #4 Annex 4, #5 Annex 5, #6 Annex 6)(Hall, Thomas)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of Aida Kemelmajer de Carlucci in Support re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Annex A, #2 Annex B, #3 Annex C, #4 Annex D, #5 Annex E, #6 Annex F)(Hall, Thomas)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Hall in Support re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hall, Thomas)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Raul Bercovitz in Support re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hall, Thomas)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by YPF S.A.. (Hall, Thomas)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by YPF S.A.. Responses due by 10/23/2015(Hall, Thomas)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Blackburn, Marcelo)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marcelo Marlow Blackburn on behalf of YPF S.A.. (Blackburn, Marcelo)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Joseph Hall on behalf of YPF S.A.. (Hall, Thomas)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Domb, Martin)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Martin Domb in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15 Part 1, #16 Exhibit 15 Part 2, #17 Exhibit 16 Part 1, #18 Exhibit 16 Part 2, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21)(Domb, Martin)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Javier Errecondo in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Domb, Martin)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DECLARATION of Carlos Gustavo Pistarini in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Domb, Martin)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Ismael Mata in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Domb, Martin)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Argentine Republic. Responses due by 10/29/2015(Domb, Martin)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Consent Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Approved. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/28/2015) (kl)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Martin Domb dated August 24, 2015. Document filed by Argentine Republic.(Domb, Martin)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Reid Joelson on behalf of Argentine Republic. (Joelson, Benjamin)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/6/2015) (kl)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: #11 Letter request contesting plaintiffs' claim of relatedness of this case to a prior pending case, filed by Argentine Republic. On August 3, 2015, nearly four months after the complaint was referred to the undersigned, the Republic wrote the court a letter asking that the case be "returned to the Clerk for random selection of a judge to preside." See Letter from the Republic to the Court (Aug. 3, 2015) (Dkt. #11). The Republic argues that it was improper for the court to accept the case as related given that the Repsol action is no longer pending. Although Rule 13(a)(2) establishes a presumption against relatedness unless both cases are pending, the court feels that plaintiffs' overall showing of relatedness overcomes this presumption. Plaintiffs themselves are allegedly absent members of the Repsol class whose claims were un-adjudicated when Repsol settled. Defendant is the same party, the Republic of Argentina. Moreover, there is considerable factual overlap between the two cases. Finally, the court notes that the Republic did not challenge the relatedness of these cases for four months, during which the parties and the court approved extensions to certain matters. For these reasons, the Republic's request to reassign the case is here by denied. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/6/2015) (kl)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: YPF S.A. answer due 9/8/2015. (kl)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Bryan Thomas West on behalf of Argentine Republic. New Address: Akerman LLP, One SE Third Ave., 25th Floor, Miami, Florida, USA 33131, 305-982-5504. (West, Bryan)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Thomas West on behalf of Argentine Republic. (West, Bryan)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint from August 17, 2015 to September 8, 2015 addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Thomas J. Hall dated August 4, 2015. . Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Hansen, Mark)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint from August 17, 2015 to September 8, 2015 addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Thomas J. Hall dated August 4, 2015. Document filed by YPF S.A..(Hall, Thomas)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Domb on behalf of Argentine Republic. (Domb, Martin)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark C. Hansen dated August 3, 2015 re: claim of relatedness of this case to a prior pending case. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Martin Domb dated August 3, 2015 re: contesting plaintiffs' claim of relatedness of this case to a prior pending case. Document filed by Argentine Republic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Related Case Statement)(Domb, Martin)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT ARGENTINE REPUBLIC'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: Argentina shall file and serve its answer or motion to dismiss the Complaint on or before September 8, 2015. If Argentina moves to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs shall file and serve any opposition to Argentina's motion to dismiss by no later than 40 days after electronic service of Argentina's motion to dismiss. (As further set forth in this Order) Argentine Republic answer due 9/8/2015. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 7/31/2015) (kl)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT YPF S.A.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: YPF shall file and serve its answer or motion to dismiss the Complaint on or before August 17, 2015. If YPF moves to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs shall file and serve any opposition to YPF's motion to dismiss by no later than 45 days, but no earlier than 30 days, after electronic service of YPF's motion to dismiss. If Plaintiffs elect to file their opposition to YPF's motion to dismiss prior to 45 days after electronic service of YPF's motion to dismiss, Plaintiffs shall provide YPF with three business days advance notice of when their opposition will be served. YPF shall file and serve its reply to Plaintiffs' opposition on or before 25 days after electronic service of Plaintiffs' opposition. YPF S.A. answer due 8/17/2015. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 6/10/2015) (kl)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Reginald Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 5/14/2015) (kl)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Reginald R. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10912643. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U..(Smith, Reginald)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Reginald R. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10912643. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Mark C. Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10836876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Mark C. Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10836876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-cv-03877-TPG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (pgu)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A., Corporate Parent Petersen Inversiones Spain, S.A.U. for Petersen Energia S.A.U.; Corporate Parent Petersen Energia Inversora Holdings, S.A.U., Corporate Parent Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A. for Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U.. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ho, Derek)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Israel Dahan on behalf of Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U.. New Address: KING & SPALDING LLP, 1185 AVENUE OF THE AMERICAS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, 10036, 212-556-2100. (Dahan, Israel)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (rz).
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 12-cv-3877. Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U..(moh) (rz).
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Argentine Republic, YPF S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401122285)Document filed by Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U., Petersen Energia S.A.U..(moh) (rz).
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Argentine Republic, YPF S.A.. (moh)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (moh)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Thomas P. Griesa as possibly related to 12-cv-3877. (moh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U. et al v. Argentine Republic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Burford Capital LLC
Represented By: Pamela H. Jarvis
Represented By: Rachel Mead Cherington
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argentine Republic
Represented By: Martin Domb
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Reid Joelson
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Represented By: Jason Edward Kornmehl
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Permesly
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus
Represented By: Maura Barry Grinalds
Represented By: Michael David Moritz
Represented By: Sergio J. Galvis
Represented By: Adam Rhys Brebner
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Bryan Thomas West
Represented By: Thomas Charles White
Represented By: George Volsky
Represented By: Elizabeth A Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YPF S.A.
Represented By: David Aaron Herman
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Hall
Represented By: Damaris Hernandez
Represented By: Marcelo Marlow Blackburn
Represented By: Donald Francis Donovan
Represented By: Michael A Paskin
Represented By: Mark P. Goodman
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Dietmar Prager
Represented By: Rebecca Lauren Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petersen Energia S.A.U.
Represented By: Mark Charles Hansen
Represented By: Reginald R. Smith
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Represented By: Derek Tam Ho
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petersen Energia Inversora, S.A.U.
Represented By: Mark Charles Hansen
Represented By: Reginald R. Smith
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Represented By: Derek Tam Ho
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?