Green v. Schneiderman
Petitioner: Marcus Green
Respondent: Eric T. Schneiderman
Case Number: 1:2015cv02825
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: Vincent L. Briccetti
Presiding Judge: Lisa Margaret Smith
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: On January 25, 2021, the Court received a letter from petitioner, proceeding pro se and in forma pauperis. (Doc. #38). Petitioner requests an extension to file objections to the Report & Recommendation. (Doc. #36). Petitioners application i s GRANTED. Petitioner shall file any objections to the Report & Recommendation by March 31, 2021. The Court also notes that petitioners letter was mailed from an address different than the one listed on the docket. The Court reminds petitioner to u pdate the Court in writing as to any change to his address. The Clerk is directed to update petitioners address on the docket to: Marcus Green, DIN #10-A-3156 Auburn Correctional Facility P.O. Box 618 Chambers will mail a copy of this Order to petitioner at the address above. ( Objections to R&R due by 3/31/2021) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/26/2021) (cf)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Pro Se Petitioner Marcus Green filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenging his conviction in New York State court for multiple offenses. At the time he initiated this case, Petitioner was incarcerated at the Elmira Correctio nal facility. See ECF. No. 1. In June 2017, Petitioner sent a letter to the Court to report that he was then housed at the Green Haven Correctional Facility, see ECF No. 27, and in July 9, 2018, Petitioner notified the Court that he had moved to the Clinton Correctional Facility, see ECF No. 30. As of the date of this Order, the docket sheet in this matter lists the Clinton Correctional Facility as Petitioner's current address. Recent communications from Petitioner appear to have bee n sent from other New York State prison locations. See ECF No. 32 (August 2020 letter with return address of Upstate Correctional Facility); ECF No. 33 (September 2020 letter with return address of Southport Correctional Facility). Moreover, the New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision Inmate Lookup website (http://nysdoccslookup.doccs.ny.gov/) indicates that as of the date of this Order, Petitioner is currently housed at the Auburn Correctional Facility. See Ex. 1 (attached hereto). All parties are required to keep the Court apprised of their current addresses ; this is particularly important for pro se litigants who are receiving notification of court filings by mail. Indeed, Petitioner appears to be aw are of this, given that he has submitted two address updates to the Court during the pendency of this case. It appears, however, that the current address listed on the docket sheet may be incorrect. Particularly given the age of this case, to atte mpt to ensure that Petitioner timely receives a copy of this Court's Report and Recommendation, ECF No. 36, and other recent items docketed in this matter, chambers staff will mail a copy of the Repo1i and Recommendation, copies of certain ca ses cited in the Report and Recommendation, see ECF No. 36 at 14 n.14, a copy of the order entered on January 7, 2021, ECF No. 35, and a copy of this order to Petitioner's attention at both the Clinton Correctional Facility address listed on the docket and at the Auburn Correctional Facility (P.O. Box 618, Aubmn, NY 13024) based on the results of the search of the Inmate Lookup website. Petitioner is directed to promptly submit a letter to the Court confirming his correct address so t hat the docket sheet can be updated, if necessary. If Petitioner's address on the docket is not corrected, there is a substantial risk that Petitioner will not receive future communications from the Court in this matter. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 1/12/2021) (nb)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SEALING ORDER: In this matter, both Petitioner and Respondent have filed on ECF documents that include references to the name of the victim of the sex offense for which Petitioner was convicted. Pursuant to Section 50-b of the New York Civil Rights Law, those documents either should have been redacted in part or filed under seal to ensure that the identity of the victim remains confidential.Accordingly, the Court hereby directs the Clerk of the Court to place the following documents under seal: ECF Nos. 15-10; 15-12; 15-13; 15-14; 15-16; and 26. Access to these documents shall be restricted to Pro Se Petitioner Marcus Green, Respondent Eric T. Schneiderman (now Letitia James, pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as set forth above), and the Court.The Clerk of the Court is also directed to mail a copy of this order to the Pro Se Petitioner. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 1/7/2021) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Schneiderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric T. Schneiderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?