Paxton v. Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Paxton
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv03737
Filed: May 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Dutchess
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Referring Judge: Henry B Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Filing 67 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice... without costs. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/30/2017) (gr)
June 30, 2017 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Brittany Weiner Document #66 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge Denise L. Cote for approval. (km)
June 29, 2017 Filing 66 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Barbara Paxton pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Barbara Paxton.(Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 6/30/2017 (km).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made by June 23, 2017. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/30/2017) (ap)
May 23, 2017 Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Amy J. Traub dated May 23, 2017 re: Advise Court of Settlement Agreement in Principle and Request Adjournment of Deadlines. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Traub, Amy)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Amy J. Traub dated May 5, 2017 re: Reply to Letter of Counsel for Plaintiff Regarding Defendant's Request for Extensions of Time to File the Joint Pretrial Order and Pretrial Submissions. ENDORSEMENT: The requests are denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/5/2017) (gr)
May 5, 2017 Filing 62 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Brittany Weiner dated 5/5/2017. Document filed by Barbara Paxton.(Weiner, Brittany)
May 5, 2017 Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Amy J. Traub dated May 5, 2017 re: Reply to Letter of Counsel for Plaintiff Regarding Extensions of Time to File the Joint Pretrial Order and Pretrial Submissions. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Traub, Amy)
May 4, 2017 Filing 60 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Letter in Response to Defendant's Request addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Brittany Weiner dated 5/4/2017. Document filed by Barbara Paxton.(Weiner, Brittany)
May 4, 2017 Filing 59 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Joint Pretrial Order and Pretrial Submissions addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Amy J. Traub dated May 4, 2017. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Scheduling Order)(Traub, Amy)
April 27, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2017. (bh)
April 25, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Asher Nadler on behalf of Barbara Paxton. (Nadler, Seth)
April 19, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Settlement Conference held on 4/19/2017. (bh)
March 15, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 3/15/2017. Settlement conference scheduled for 4/19/2017 at 2:00 pm. (bh)
March 9, 2017 Filing 57 MEMO ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Amy J. Traub dated March 7, 2017 regarding joint request for an Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial from April 12, 2017 to May 24, 2017 and to have the case placed on the August 14, 2017 Trial-Ready Calendar. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/9/2017) (gr)
March 9, 2017 A telephone conference to discuss the timing of the settlement conference is set for 3/15/2017 at 10:00 am before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 212-805-6105 when all parties are on the line.(bh)
March 7, 2017 Filing 56 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order and Place Case on Trial-Ready Calendar addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Amy J. Traub dated March 7, 2017. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Scheduling Order)(Traub, Amy)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court having denied in part the defendant's motion for summary judgment, the following schedule shall govern the further conduct of the proceedings in this case: The parties are instructed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Pitman prior to March 10, 2017 in order to pursue settlement discussions to occur in March under his supervision. The Joint Pretrial Order must be filed by April 12, 2017......IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that case is placed on the May 1, 2017 trial ready calendar. You must be ready to proceed on 24 hours notice. You may contact the Deputy Clerk, Gloria Rojas, to learn where your case stands on the calendar.....(See Pretrial Schedule Order for Judge Cote's practices.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/3/2017) (gr)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER.......Fluors October 26, 2016 motion for summary judgment is granted as to Paxtons discrimination and failure to accommodate claims, and it is denied as to her retaliation claim. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/3/2017) (gr)
November 22, 2016 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Amy J. Traub in Support re: #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - HIPAA Authorization Forms of Barbara Paxton (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B - Email from Brittany Weiner Dated November 9, 2016)(Traub, Amy)
November 22, 2016 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 18, 2016 Filing 52 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Traub, Amy)
November 10, 2016 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Brittany Weiner in Opposition re: #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Barbara Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Barbara Paxton, #2 Exhibit DOL Determination, #3 Exhibit Email, #4 Exhibit Medical documentation)(Weiner, Brittany)
November 10, 2016 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Barbara Paxton. (Weiner, Brittany)
October 26, 2016 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Traub, Amy)
October 26, 2016 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Amy J. Traub in Support re: #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Part 1-Transcript of Deposition of Barbara Paxton, #3 Exhibit A-Part 2, #4 Exhibit A-Part 3, #5 Exhibit A-Part 4, #6 Exhibit A-Part 5, #7 Exhibit A-Part 6, #8 Exhibit A-Part 7, #9 Exhibit A-Part 8, #10 Exhibit A-Part 9, #11 Exhibit A-Part 10, #12 Exhibit A-Part 11, #13 Exhibit A-Part 12, #14 Exhibit A-Part 13, #15 Exhibit A-Part 14, #16 Exhibit B-Part 1-Transcript of Deposition of Raymond Andreassen, #17 Exhibit B-Part 2, #18 Exhibit B-Part 3, #19 Exhibit B-Part 4, #20 Exhibit B-Part 5, #21 Exhibit B-Part 6, #22 Exhibit C-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers T000041-83, #23 Exhibit D-Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Document Requests, #24 Exhibit E-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton 91-92, #25 Exhibit F-Certification Form and Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers BGCP000011-12, #26 Exhibit G-Document Bearing Bates-Stamp Number Paxton000355, #27 Exhibit H-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton000403-06, #28 Exhibit I-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton000174-76, #29 Exhibit J-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton000195-97, #30 Exhibit K-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton000560-62, #31 Exhibit L-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton000418-22, #32 Exhibit M-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton000181-83, #33 Exhibit N-Document Bearing Bates-Stamp Number Paxton000669, #34 Exhibit O-Document Bearing Bates-Stamp Number Paxton000380, #35 Exhibit P-Document Bearing Bates-Stamp Number Paxton000670, #36 Exhibit Q-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton000159-61, #37 Exhibit R-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton000222-23, #38 Exhibit S-Documents Bearing Bates-Stamp Numbers Paxton000332-34)(Traub, Amy)
October 26, 2016 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Raymond Andreassen in Support re: #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Handwritten Notes Bearing Bates-Numbers Paxton000671-83)(Traub, Amy)
October 26, 2016 Filing 46 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Traub, Amy)
October 26, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Traub, Amy)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. No additional changes to the briefing schedule will be entertained. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/23/2016) (kko)
September 23, 2016 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brittany Weiner dated 9/23/2016. Document filed by Barbara Paxton.(Weiner, Brittany)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying #41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time Response to Defendant's Correction. DENIED. The Court adheres to the briefing scheduled set forth at ECF No. 39. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/23/2016) (kko)
September 23, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/26/2016. Responses due by 11/11/2016. Replies due by 11/18/2016. (kko)
September 22, 2016 Filing 41 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Defendant's Correction addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brittany Weiner dated 9/22/2016. Document filed by Barbara Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Confirmation)(Weiner, Brittany)
September 22, 2016 Filing 40 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jacqlyn Rovine dated September 22, 2016 re: Correcting the Request Submitted Earlier Today for an Extension of the Deadlines Set for the Summary Judgment Motion, Response, and Reply. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Rovine, Jacqlyn)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time in the Deadlines set for the Summary Judgment Motion, Response, and Reply. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/22/2016) (kko)
September 22, 2016 Filing 38 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time in the Deadlines set for the Summary Judgment Motion, Response, and Reply addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amy J. Traub dated September 22, 2016. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Traub, Amy)
September 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/26/2016. Responses due by 11/7/2016. Replies due by 11/14/2016. (kko)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #35 Letter Motion for Conference. Having reviewed the parties' letters dated September 16 and 21, 2016, it is ORDERED that: 1. The request for a pre-motion conference is DENIED; 2. By October 19, 2016, Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment; 3. By November 2, 2016, Plaintiff shall file its opposition; and 4. By November 9, 2016, Defendant shall reply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/21/2016) (kko)
September 21, 2016 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brittany Weiner dated 9/21/2016 re: Response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Barbara Paxton.(Weiner, Brittany)
September 21, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/19/2016. Responses due by 11/2/2016. Replies due by 11/9/2016. (kko)
September 16, 2016 Filing 35 LETTER MOTION for Conference by Defendant Fluor Enterprises, Inc. Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference in Connection with Its Anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amy J. Traub dated September 16, 2016. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts with Plaintiff's Responses Thereto, and Plaintiff's Statement of Disputed Material Facts with Defendant's Responses Thereto)(Traub, Amy)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's request is GRANTED to the extent that any motion for summary judgment will be deemed untimely unless a request for a pre-motion conference is made in writing by September 16, 2016. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/7/2016) (mro)
September 7, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/16/2016. (mro)
September 7, 2016 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brittany Weiner dated 9/7/2016. Document filed by Barbara Paxton.(Weiner, Brittany)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/18/2016) (ama)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Amended Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the parties in accordance with Rule 26(f)(3), Fed. R. Civ. P. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. This case is be tried to a jury. All Expert Discovery due by 9/12/2016. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is three (3) days. The case management conference scheduled for August 16, 2016, is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: #30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Request a Pre-Motion Conference and Extend the Pretial Deadlines on Consent addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amy J. Traub dated August 3, 2016. filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/04/2016) (ama)
August 3, 2016 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Request a Pre-Motion Conference and Extend the Pretial Deadlines on Consent addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amy J. Traub dated August 3, 2016. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proposed Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Traub, Amy)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is be tried to a jury. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than July 29, 2016. Depositions were completed on April 8, 2016. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than September 12, 2016. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is three (3) days. Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2016 at 04:15 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/2/2016) (mro)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. The parties shall adhere to the schedule set forth in the amended Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order dated June 2, 2016. The case management conference scheduled for June 28, 2016, is ADJOURNED to August 16, 2016, at 4:15p.m. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/2/2016) (mro)
June 2, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Fact Discovery due by 7/29/2016.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2016 at 04:15 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (mro)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE, that S. Jeanine Conley of Baker & Hostetler LLP, hereby withdraws her appearance as counsel for defendant Fluor Enterprises, Inc. GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Sylvia Jeanine Conley's appearance from the docket and name from the ECF distribution list. Attorney Sylvia Jeanine Conley terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/31/2016) (spo)
May 31, 2016 Filing 26 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amy J. Traub dated May 31, 2016. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Traub, Amy)
May 25, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqlyn Rebecca Rovine on behalf of Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Rovine, Jacqlyn)
May 25, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Joy Traub on behalf of Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Traub, Amy)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The case management conference scheduled for May 26, 2016, is ADJOURNED to June 28, 2016, at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/16/2016) (kko)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. GRANTED. The parties shall complete depositions by May 9, 2016, and fact discovery by June 13, 2016. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/23/2016) (kko)
March 23, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 5/9/2016. Fact Discovery due by 6/13/2016. (kko)
March 18, 2016 Filing 21 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery /Depositions and Fact Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from S. Jeanine Conley dated March 18, 2016. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Conley, Sylvia)
November 4, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/27/2015. (KH)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. Deposition due by 4/8/2016. Fact Discovery due by 5/12/2016. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/27/2015) (kko)
October 21, 2015 Filing 19 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from S. Jeanine Conley dated October 21, 2015 re: Submission of Updated Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order Pursuant to the Court's September 18, 2015 Order. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Conley, Sylvia)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial conference scheduled for September 24, 2015, is ADJOURNED to October 27, 2015, at 4:15 p.m. The parties shall submit an updated proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by October 23, 2015. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/27/2015 at 04:15 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/18/2015) (ajs)
September 17, 2015 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for September 24, 2015 on Consent addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from S. Jeanine Conley dated September 17, 2015. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Conley, Sylvia)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by Barbara Paxton, re: Mediation status. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 4:00 p.m., on September 24, 2015, in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. The parties may submit an updated proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by September 21, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/24/2015 at 04:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/15/2015) (ajs)
September 15, 2015 Mediator Session Held on 09/11/2015 at 40 Foley Square.(ms)
September 14, 2015 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brittany Weiner dated 9/14/2015 re: Mediation status. Document filed by Barbara Paxton.(Weiner, Brittany)
August 6, 2015 MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 9/11/15, 9:30 AM at 40 Foley Square Courthouse (Centre Street).(ms)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for August 11, 2015 is ADJOURNED sine die. By September 18, 2015, the parties shall submit a joint letter on the status of mediation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/5/2015) (ajs)
August 5, 2015 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Currently Scheduled for August 11, 2015 addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from S. Jeanine Conley dated August 5, 2015. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Conley, Sylvia)
August 4, 2015 Filing 11 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from S. Jeanine Conley, Esq. dated August 4, 2015 re: In Anticipation of the Pretrial Conference on August 11, 2015. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Conley, Sylvia)
July 17, 2015 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/17/2015.(ms)
July 13, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittany Sloane Weiner on behalf of Barbara Paxton. (Weiner, Brittany)
July 1, 2015 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number Notice of assignment of mediator. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (cda)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Order filed January 3, 2011). Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/6/2015. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/24/2015) (rpr)
June 24, 2015 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fluor Corporation for Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Conley, Sylvia)
June 24, 2015 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Conley, Sylvia)
June 24, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sylvia Jeanine Conley on behalf of Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Conley, Sylvia)
May 27, 2015 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Initial Conference Order and Court's Individual Rules served on Fluor Enterprises, Inc. on 05/27/2015. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Barbara Paxton. (Mozammel, Marsha)
May 27, 2015 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fluor Enterprises, Inc. served on 5/19/2015, answer due 6/9/2015. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Barbara Paxton. (Mozammel, Marsha)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/11/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/27/2015) (ajs)
May 14, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (mps).
May 14, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401125401)Document filed by Barbara Paxton.(moh) (mps).
May 14, 2015 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (moh)
May 14, 2015 Case Designated ECF. (moh)
May 14, 2015 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (moh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paxton v. Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Paxton
Represented By: Marsha Mozammel
Represented By: Seth Asher Nadler
Represented By: Brittany Sloane Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Sylvia Jeanine Conley
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Jacqlyn Rebecca Rovine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?