Morales et al v. MW Bronx, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lissa Morales, Danny Jimenez-Corcione and Thomas R. Martinez
Defendant: MW Bronx, Inc., Master Wok, Inc., Ryan Reimond Sanchez, Norma Doe and Ken Doe
Case Number: 1:2015cv06296
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Bronx
Presiding Judge: Thomas P. Griesa
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION re: 42 FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees: Now before the court is plaintiffs' motion for approval of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of costs in connection with the above-captioned matter. For the reasons provided above, the c ourt awards plaintiffs the reasonable attorneys' fees and expenses reimbursement as requested. Accordingly, defendant is ordered to pay $29,462.50 for attorneys' fees and $650.00 in reimbursement costs, for a total of $30,112.50. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/5/2017) (jwh)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION: In sum, plaintiff Martinez is entitled to $813.87 in compensatory damages and $813.87 in liquidated damages under the NYLL and FLSA, $155.33 in prejudgment interest under the NYLL, and post-judgment interest. Plaintiff Morales is entitled to $725.00 in compensatory damages and $725.00 in liquidated damages under the NYLL and FLSA, $137.65 in prejudgment interest, and post-judgment interest. While Martinez and Morales are entitled to attorney's fees and costs, the Court reserves judgment on those amounts until the Court receives briefing from plaintiffs' counsel on that matter. (As further set forth in this Opinion.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/26/2017) (cf)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, plaintiffs' motion for a default judgment against defendant is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, the court holds, as to Part I of the complaint, that: (1) defendants violated plaintiff Jimenez Corcione's rights under the NYLL and FLSA, and defendants owe him for unpaid minimum wages, overtime wages, and spread-of-hours pay for a total of $1,145.75; (2) Jimenez Cordone is owed an additional $1,145.75 in liqu idated damages, plus $1,314.41 in pre-judgment interest as well as post-judgment interest; (3) Jimenez Cordone is owed attorney's fees and costs in an amount to be determined after counsel provides additional information to the court; (4) plaintiffs Martinez and Morales shall, by August 22, 2016, provide by affidavit the information requested by the court in this opinion so that the court can calculate whether and to what extent they are owed under the FLSA or NYLL for unpaid w ages, unpaid overtime, unpaid spread-of-hours pay, as well as liquidated damages, pre- and post-judgment interest, and/or attorney's fees; and (5) all plaintiffs are owed damages for defendants' failure to provide regular wage statements and annual wage notices as required by the WTPA. The court dismisses without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction each of Morales's sexual harassment-related claims in Part II of the complaint. (As further set forth in this Opinion) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/1/2016) (kl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales et al v. MW Bronx, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lissa Morales
Represented By: Leopold Raic, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Jimenez-Corcione
Represented By: Leopold Raic, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Martinez
Represented By: Leopold Raic, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Bronx, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Wok, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Reimond Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?