Alaska Electrical Pension Fund v. Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency et al
Plaintiff: Alaska Electrical Pension Fund
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Jefferies LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency, Goldman, Sachs & Co., RBS Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Barclays Capital Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., UBS Securities LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated and RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv07420
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (334) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Hugh Daniel Sandler terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (330 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Melissa Carrie King terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(jca)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (329) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Elizabeth P. Papez terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (328) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Thomas Popejoy terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (jca)
August 1, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maude Paquin on behalf of RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc.,, RBS Securities, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Paquin, Maude)
August 1, 2018 Filing 171 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Steel Mishkin on behalf of RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc.,, RBS Securities, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Mishkin, Paul)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (169 in 1:15-cv-07420-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (210 in 1:15-cv-06129-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (173 in 1:15-cv-05931-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (137 in 1:15-cv-07329-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (215 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (139 in 1:15-cv-07642-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (106 in 1:15-cv-07631-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (177 in 1:15-cv-07385-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (128 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (201 in 1:15-cv-06474-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (102 in 1:16-cv-01177-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (215 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (147 in 1:15-cv-09803-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (148 in 1:15-cv-06003-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (145 in 1:15-cv-06892-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (95 in 1:15-cv-07855-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (245 in 1:15-cv-05807-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc.,, (138 in 1:15-cv-06853-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (163 in 1:15-cv-06782-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (127 in 1:15-cv-08149-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (218 in 1:15-cv-05957-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (162 in 1:15-cv-07688-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (180 in 1:15-cv-07006-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (171 in 1:15-cv-08766-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (179 in 1:15-cv-07390-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (98 in 1:16-cv-00180-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (169 in 1:15-cv-05830-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (299 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (147 in 1:15-cv-06072-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (120 in 1:15-cv-07111-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc., (89 in 1:15-cv-08484-PGG) Letter filed by RBS Securities Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Joel M. Cohen terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf)
June 29, 2018 Filing 169 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joel M. Cohen dated June 29, 2018 re: To Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc..(Cohen, Joel)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Stephanie Szaro Heglund terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/30/2018) ***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (anc) Modified on 8/13/2018 (anc).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CREDIT SUISSE INTERNATIONAL: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against Defendant CSI without prejudice to reassert such claims against CSI at a later time should evidence arise in discovery or otherwise that reveals information providing a basis for joining CSI on the claims being litigated in this case, as further set forth in this Order. Credit Suisse International terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf) Modified on 5/16/2018 (cf).
February 23, 2018 Filing 166 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claire Catalano Dean on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P Morgan Securities LLC, JP. Morgan Securities, LLC., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Dean, Claire)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS CITIGROUP INC.; CREDIT SUISSE GROUP AG; THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC.; JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.; MORGAN STANLEY; AND THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP PLC: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against Defendants Citigroup Inc.; Credit Suisse Group AG; The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.; JP Morgan Chase & Co.; Morgan Stanley; and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc without prejudice to reassert such claims against such Defendants at a later time should evidence arise in discovery (as further set forth in this Order.) JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, CitiGroup, Inc. and Credit Suisse Group AG terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: granting (242) MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.4. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Attorney David J. Woll terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (ap) Modified on 3/28/2018 (ap).
January 31, 2018 Filing 163 MOTION for David J. Woll to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Woll, David)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANTHONY R. VAN VUREN: granting (240) Motion for Anthony R. Van Vuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/31/2018). (Motion filed in 15-md-2673 # 240) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (ama)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Defendants' deadline to move against or answer the complaint will be extended from January 23, 2018 to February 23, 2018. 2. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their Opposition to any Motion(s) to Dismiss the complaint will be extended from March 9, 2018 to April 17, 2018. 3. Defendants' deadline to reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to any Motion(s) to Dismiss the complaint will be extended from April 17, 2018 to May 22, 2018. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Motions due by 2/23/2018., Responses due by 4/17/2018, Replies due by 5/22/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(cf)
September 29, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kavitha Satya Sivashanker on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutche Bank Securities Inc., Deustche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Sivashanker, Kavitha)
September 15, 2017 Filing 159 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time In Further Support of Proposed Scheduling Stipulation filed on September 1, 2017 (Dkt. 189) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, Jay L. Himes, J.Douglas Richards, dated September 15, 2017. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
September 1, 2017 Filing 158 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Proposed Scheduling Stipulation addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, Jay L. Himes, J. Douglas Richards, Robert Y. Sperling, Brad S. Karp and David J. Woll dated September 1, 2017. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation regarding deadlines for Consolidated Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Briefing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
August 31, 2017 Filing 157 NOTICE of Corporate Name Change to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Sperling, Robert)
July 28, 2017 Filing 156 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory D. Andres dated July 28, 2017 re: Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Inc.,, RBS Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Andres, Greg)
June 12, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Esinam Mawuena Daisy Agbemenu on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutche Bank Securities Inc., Deustche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Agbemenu, Esinam)
May 15, 2017 Filing 154 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Myers on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Myers, Jonathan)
May 15, 2017 Filing 153 MOTION for Patrick Joseph Campbell to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Campbell, Patrick)
May 3, 2017 Filing 152 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay, J. Douglas Richards & Jay L. Himes dated May 3, 2017 re: Recent Disclosures regarding US Treasuries Market. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, State-Boston Retirement System, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (173 in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Joel Steven Sanders terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/7/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (cla) Modified on 4/17/2017 (cla).
January 26, 2017 Filing 150 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from J. Douglas Richards, Jay L. Himes and Faith E. Gay dated January 26, 2017 re: Response to Mr. Zelcs' letter of January 23, 2017. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #137 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/12/2016) (kl)
September 16, 2016 Filing 148 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (94 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. . Document filed by Rock Capital Markets, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Fata, Anthony)
September 16, 2016 Filing 147 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (98 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Alongside Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP., (88 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC., (86 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. . Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
September 15, 2016 Filing 146 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Leah Friedman. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Friedman, Leah)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (75) MOTION for Daniel J. Veroff to Withdraw as Attorney. This motion for an order directing the withdrawal of Daniel J. Veroff as counsel for Plaintiffs Jane Franklin and Jonathan Richard Williamson ("Plaintiffs") is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Daniel J. Veroff is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs and fully discharged from any further representation or obligation in this case. 2. Pillsbury & Coleman, LLP will continue to represent Plaintiffs in this action. 3. Daniel J. Veroff (email: dveroff@pillsburycoleman.com) is removed from the mailing matrix and from receiving electronic filings in this case. SO ORDERED. Attorney Daniel J Veroff terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/6/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (kl)
September 6, 2016 Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (94 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Korein Tillery LLC, Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel PLLC, and Scott+Scott LLP. . Document filed by Rock Capital Markets, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Fata, Anthony)
September 6, 2016 Filing 143 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael Eisenkraft dated September 6, 2016 re: courtesy copies of Application to Appoint Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC Interim Co-lead Class Counsel Alongside Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
September 6, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anthony F. Fata to RE-FILE Document (141 in 1:15-cv-05830-PGG, 150 in 1:15-cv-07385-PGG, 121 in 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 138 in 1:15-cv-08287-PGG, 76 in 1:16-cv-01177-PGG, 70 in 1:15-cv-10116-PGG, 183 in 1:15-cv-06129-PGG, 191 in 1:15-cv-05957-PGG, 146 in 1:15-cv-05931-PGG, 103 in 1:15-cv-07325-PGG, 108 in 1:15-cv-07329-PGG, 184 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 187 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 66 in 1:15-cv-10118-PGG, 93 in 1:15-cv-07111-PGG, 135 in 1:15-cv-06782-PGG, 120 in 1:15-cv-06072-PGG, 99 in 1:15-cv-07481-PGG, 114 in 1:15-cv-06892-PGG, 218 in 1:15-cv-05807-PGG, 142 in 1:15-cv-07420-PGG, 152 in 1:15-cv-07390-PGG, 21 in 1:15-cv-09975-PGG, 92 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 107 in 1:15-cv-06853-PGG, 72 in 1:16-cv-00180-PGG, 99 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG, 70 in 1:16-cv-00005-PGG, 135 in 1:15-cv-06139-PGG, 62 in 1:15-cv-09968-PGG, 31 in 1:16-cv-00030-PGG, 153 in 1:15-cv-07006-PGG, 121 in 1:15-cv-09803-PGG, 55 in 1:15-cv-10117-PGG, 37 in 1:15-cv-09169-PGG, 174 in 1:15-cv-06474-PGG, 138 in 1:15-cv-05843-PGG) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rock Capital, LLC's/Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP's Motion to Appoint Scott+Scott, Korein Tillery and Kellog Huber as Co-Lead Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rock Capital, LLC's/Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP's Motion to Appoint Scott+Scott, Korein Tillery and Kellog Huber as Co-Lead Counsel. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - Motion to Appoint Counsel WAS NOT FILED. First file motion, then file and link any supporting documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(db)
September 2, 2016 Filing 142 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Appoint Counsel Rock Capital, LLC's/Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP's Motion to Appoint Scott+Scott, Korein Tillery and Kellog Huber as Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Rock Capital Markets, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Fata, Anthony) Modified on 9/6/2016 (db).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: After consultation with counsel for the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to motions to appoint lead counsel, submissions concerning the plaintiffs' steering committee, the filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint, and any motion to dismiss: 1. As to motions to appoint lead counsel: a. Moving papers must be filed by September 2, 2016, and are limited to 15 pages; b. Responses are due on September 16, 2016, and are limited to 10 pages; and c. Reply briefs, if any, are due on September 23, 2016, and are limited to 7 pages. 2. Within fourteen days of appointment of lead counsel, lead counsel will make a recommendation to the Court as to the membership and size of the plaintiffs' steering committee. Any party objecting to lead counsel's recommendation will file its objection with the Court within seven days. 3. The Consolidated Amended Complaint will be filed 60 days after the appointment of lead counsel. 4. Any motion to dismiss will be filed 60 days after the filing of the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Winston & Strawn LLP, Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP will serve as liaison counsel for Defendants. The attached Schedule A reflects the cases that have been consolidated for pretrial purposes. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/2/2016., Responses due by 9/16/2016, Replies due by 9/23/2016.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/22/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
August 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/22/2016. (Court Reporter Sonya Huggins) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(mr)
August 19, 2016 Filing 140 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Faith E. Gay dated August 19, 2016 re: Additions to Schedule of Consolidated Cases. Document filed by American Federation of Teachers, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Gay, Faith)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference scheduled for Monday, August 22, 2016 at 10:30 a.m., will take place in Courtroom 110 at the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. It is further ORDERED that Schedule A, which reflects the cases that have been consolidated for pretrial purposes, is modified as reflected in the attached version. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (60) Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al., per Chambers. (kko)
August 5, 2016 Filing 137 MOTION for Alexis A. Lien to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Collogan, Lauren)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING DIRECT FILING OF CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR THE PURPOSES OF PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and their respective counsel as follows: 1. Plaintiffs who file a Direct Filed Case are required to designate for each such case the original venue in which the case would have been filed but for the direct filing procedure (the "Designated Forum"). 2. Each Direct Filed Case filed in accordance with the direct filing procedure will be deemed to have been originally filed in the Designated Forum. 3. For any Direct Filed Case that meets the conditions set forth in paragraphs 1 and 2 above, Defendants will not object that the Southern District of New York is an improper venue for such Case. 4. Upon completion of all pretrial proceedings applicable to a Direct Filed Case, this Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), may transfer that case to the Designated Forum, after considering the recommendations of the parties to that case. 5. Except for an objection that the Southern District of New York is an improper venue for a Direct Filed Case, all other rights, arguments and defenses of Defendants are preserved and not waived, including, but not limited to, whether the Designated Forum is an improper venue and whether a Defendant is subject to personal jurisdiction in the Designated Forum. 6. Any plaintiff filing a Direct Filed Case who objects to any part of this Stipulation and [Proposed] Order shall have 10 days from the date that its case is filed to file a notice of motion with the Court to bring on a motion asserting such objection, and setting forth the basis for objection. If such a motion is granted in a Direct Filed Case, Defendants shall not be bound by the terms of this Stipulation and [Proposed] Order with respect to that case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/26/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
July 15, 2016 Filing 135 NOTICE of Filing of Updated Exhibit B to Letter of 7/14/2016 re: (130 in 1:15-cv-05843-PGG, 183 in 1:15-cv-05957-PGG, 112 in 1:15-cv-06072-PGG, 134 in 1:15-cv-07420-PGG, 54 in 1:15-cv-09968-PGG, 113 in 1:15-cv-06003-PGG, 210 in 1:15-cv-05807-PGG, 175 in 1:15-cv-06129-PGG, 138 in 1:15-cv-05931-PGG, 99 in 1:15-cv-06853-PGG, 88 in 1:15-cv-07735-PGG, 133 in 1:15-cv-05830-PGG, 125 in 1:15-cv-06782-PGG, 63 in 1:16-cv-00180-PGG, 62 in 1:16-cv-00005-PGG, 44 in 1:15-md-02673-PGG, 29 in 1:15-cv-09169-PGG, 85 in 1:15-cv-07111-PGG, 106 in 1:15-cv-06892-PGG, 13 in 1:15-cv-09975-PGG, 176 in 1:15-cv-05794-PGG, 127 in 1:15-cv-06139-PGG, 145 in 1:15-cv-07006-PGG, 113 in 1:15-cv-09803-PGG, 142 in 1:15-cv-07385-PGG, 62 in 1:15-cv-10116-PGG, 91 in 1:15-cv-07481-PGG, 47 in 1:15-cv-10117-PGG, 100 in 1:15-cv-07329-PGG, 23 in 1:16-cv-00030-PGG, 67 in 1:16-cv-01177-PGG, 144 in 1:15-cv-07390-PGG, 177 in 1:15-cv-05939-PGG, 95 in 1:15-cv-07325-PGG, 165 in 1:15-cv-06474-PGG, 130 in 1:15-cv-08287-PGG, 58 in 1:15-cv-10118-PGG) Letter,,. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Updated Exhibit B to Letter of 7/14/2016)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Himes, Jay)
July 14, 2016 Filing 134 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay L. Himes, J. Douglas Richards and Faith E. Gay dated 07/14/2016 re: Plaintiffs' counsel's views re lead and liaison counsel, a Plaintiffs' steering committee, and proposed method and schedule re appointment of lead and liaison counsel. Document filed by State-Boston Retirement System, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Himes, Jay)
July 13, 2016 Filing 133 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12533215. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P Morgan Securities LLC, JP. Morgan Securities, LLC., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Liu, Henry) Modified on 7/13/2016 (wb).
July 7, 2016 Filing 132 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David J. Woll dated July 7, 2016 re: the protocol for the direct filing of additional cases in this District. Document filed by 3RED TRADING LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Countrywide Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, Jeffries LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Woll, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 131 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David J. Woll dated June 30, 2016 re: Order dated June 13, 2016. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Woll, David)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The civil actions listed on Schedule A are consolidated for pretrial purposes. Any "tag-along" actions later removed to or transferred to this Court, or directly filed in the Southern District of New York, will automatically be consolidated with this action without the necessity of future motions or orders. This consolidation, however, does not constitute a determination that the actions should be consolidated for trial, nor does it have the effect of making any entity a party to any action in which he, she, or it has not been named, served, or added in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. In the Court's view, a master case file limited to filings of significance to the MDL as a whole or a substantial number of member cases would be advantageous. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 16-MC-2673. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The caption shall read "In re: Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust Litigation." For administrative purposes only, in 16-MC-2673, Plaintiffs shall be listed as "Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust MDL Plaintiffs," and Defendants shall be listed as "Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust MDL Defendants." There will be no appearances entered unless and until the Court orders otherwise. The Court will transfer any and all relevant documents filed in 15-MD-2673 to 15-MD-2673. This Order and all subsequent entries docketed in 16-MC-2543 are to be docketed simultaneously in 15-MD-2673. The Clerk of the Court is directed to Transfer Docket No. 1 (Transfer Order) from 15-MD-2673 to 16-MC-2673. The Court will conduct an Initial Conference on Monday, August 22, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 at the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Counsel shall check in with the Courtroom Deputy at least fifteen minutes in advance. This Order vacates any case management or scheduling order issued by a court prior to the transfer of a case to 15-MD-2673. Pending the Initial Conference and further orders of this Court, all deadlines in this action (except those set forth herein), including Defendants' time to respond to any of the complaints and all discovery deadlines, are stayed. This Order does not, however, preclude the provision of voluntary discovery by any party. Any and all pending motions in the transferor courts are denied without prejudice, and will be adjudicated under the procedures set forth in this Order and subsequent orders issued by this Court. (As further set forth in this Order) Initial Conference set for 8/22/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/13/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:15-cv-05794-PGG; granting (33) Motion for Shannon Price Torres to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Shannon Price Torres terminated in case 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/7/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al. (kl)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT as of March 1, 2016, I, Joanna Shally, will no longer be an employee of Shearman & Sterling LLP and hereby withdraw as counsel of record for defendant Mizuho Securities USA Inc. ("Mizuho") in the above-captioned action and all related actions listed on the attached Exhibit 1. I respectfully request to be removed from the Court's service list for the above-captioned action and all related actions listed on Exhibit 1. Shearman & Sterling LLP continues to serve as counsel for Mizuho in this action and the listed related actions through its attorneys, counsel of record Stuart J. Baskin, Jerome S. Fortinsky, and H. Miriam Farber. Please direct all future correspondence and papers in this action and the listed related actions to Mr. Baskin, Mr. Fortinsky, and Ms. Farber. SO ORDERED. Attorney Joanna Shally terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/2/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(kl)
February 17, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Miriam Farber on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Mizuho Securities USA, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Farber, H.)
February 2, 2016 Filing 126 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jonathan L. Shapiro. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(Shapiro, Jonathan)
December 16, 2015 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (sjo)
December 16, 2015 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:15-md-02673-PGG. (sjo)
December 8, 2015 Filing 125 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett dated December 8, 2015 re: Schedule for Leadership Briefing. Document filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(Brockett, Daniel)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate the above-captioned actions under Case No. 15 Civ. 5794 (PGG). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(ama)
October 15, 2015 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:15-cv-05794-PGG.. (ama)
October 14, 2015 Filing 123 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc, Corporate Parent HSBC North America Holdings Inc. for HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc..(Liman, Lewis)
October 14, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis J. Liman on behalf of HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Liman, Lewis)
October 13, 2015 Filing 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Nathaniel Moss on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC. (Moss, Edward)
October 13, 2015 Filing 120 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TD Holdings II Inc., Other Affiliate The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Other Affiliate Toronto Dominion Holdings (U.S.A.), Inc. for TD Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC.(Miller, Pamela)
October 13, 2015 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela Addison Miller on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC. (Miller, Pamela)
October 12, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Adam Kirsch on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Kirsch, Mark)
October 12, 2015 Filing 117 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas, Inc., Other Affiliate UBS Group AG for UBS Securities LLC. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC.(Levin, Gabrielle)
October 12, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabrielle Frances Levin on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Levin, Gabrielle)
October 9, 2015 Filing 115 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chrome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. Document filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.(Karp, Brad)
October 9, 2015 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Anthony Gallo on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Gallo, Kenneth)
October 9, 2015 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susanna Michele Buergel on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Buergel, Susanna)
October 9, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Rosen on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Rosen, Richard)
October 9, 2015 Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Karp, Brad)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION SETTING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND FOR THE PARTIES TO PROPOSE CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT DATES: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: The undersigned counsel accept service of the complaint in the above-captioned lawsuit on behalf of their respective clients, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party in the complaint is properly named, and without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue, except as to the sufficiency of process and the service of process. The undersigned counsel further agree, subject to the approval of the Court, to extend,until at least 60 days after the foregoing cases and any Related Actions have been coordinated or consolidated and any lead and liaison counsel have been identified for the proceedings, the time for submitting the proposed Case Management Plan specified in the Court's Pretrial Conference Notice. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/08/2015) (ama)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #88 Motion for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #87 Motion for Brian O. O'Mara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #33 Motion for Elizabeth P. Papez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/08/2015) (ama)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for Robert Y. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/08/2015) (ama)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #97 Motion for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro)
October 5, 2015 Filing 104 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nomura Holding America Inc. for Nomura Securities International, Inc.. Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc..(Holley, Steven)
October 5, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Lyon Holley on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Holley, Steven)
October 5, 2015 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Flug Davidoff on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Davidoff, Amanda)
September 29, 2015 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sophie-Charlotte Rohnke on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Rohnke, Sophie-Charlotte)
September 29, 2015 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leah Friedman on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Friedman, Leah)
September 29, 2015 Filing 99 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC.(Fishman, Marshall)
September 29, 2015 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marshall Howard Fishman on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Fishman, Marshall)
September 29, 2015 Filing 97 MOTION for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11446252. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolasky, William)
September 29, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #97 MOTION for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11446252. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
September 28, 2015 Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Patrick J. Coughlin dated September 28, 2015 re: Your Honor's September 24, 2015 letter. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund.(Coughlin, Patrick)
September 28, 2015 Filing 95 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC for RBS Securities Inc.. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc..(Cohen, Joel)
September 28, 2015 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Carrie King on behalf of RBS Securities Inc.. (King, Melissa)
September 28, 2015 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Greg Donald Andres on behalf of RBS Securities Inc.. (Andres, Greg)
September 28, 2015 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Murray Cohen on behalf of RBS Securities Inc.. (Cohen, Joel)
September 28, 2015 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Steven Fishman on behalf of SG Americas Securities, LLC. (Fishman, Todd)
September 28, 2015 Filing 90 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Societe Generale for SG Americas Securities, LLC. Document filed by SG Americas Securities, LLC.(Esseks, David)
September 28, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David C. Esseks on behalf of SG Americas Securities, LLC. (Esseks, David)
September 28, 2015 Filing 88 MOTION for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11438711. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, David)
September 28, 2015 Filing 87 MOTION for Brian O. O'Mara to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11438520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Mara, Brian)
September 28, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #88 MOTION for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11438711. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 28, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #87 MOTION for Brian O. O'Mara to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11438520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 28, 2015 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sdi)
September 28, 2015 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sdi)
September 28, 2015 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:15-cv-05794-PGG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (sdi)
September 25, 2015 Filing 86 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Y. Sperling dated 9/25/2015 re: 9/3/2015 consolidation order, and Court's 9/24/2015 request for parties' positions on consolidation, on behalf of all Defendants. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Sperling, Robert)
September 25, 2015 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Suzanne McArthur on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc.. (McArthur, Kathleen)
September 25, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Alexander Schwartz on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc.. (Schwartz, Matthew)
September 25, 2015 Filing 83 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent BARCLAYS BANK PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Braff, David)
September 25, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Harold Braff on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc.. (Braff, David)
September 24, 2015 Filing 81 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co..(Popok, Michael)
September 24, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Steven Popok on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Popok, Michael)
September 24, 2015 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Paul on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Paul, David)
September 24, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shepard Goldfein on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Goldfein, Shepard)
September 24, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Madison Eckles on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Eckles, Paul)
September 24, 2015 Filing 76 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Kasner, Jay)
September 24, 2015 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Kasner, Jay)
September 23, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Malik Havalic on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Havalic, Malik)
September 23, 2015 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ethan Edward Litwin on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Litwin, Ethan)
September 23, 2015 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Campbell on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Campbell, Patrick)
September 23, 2015 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey H. Knox on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Knox, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2015 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Omari Largos Royter Mason on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Mason, Omari)
September 23, 2015 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Price Torres on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Torres, Shannon)
September 23, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Elbaum on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Elbaum, David)
September 23, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Woll on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Woll, David)
September 23, 2015 Filing 66 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Rice, Thomas)
September 23, 2015 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas C. Rice on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
September 22, 2015 Filing 64 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Group LLC, Corporate Parent Limestone Merger Sub LLC, Corporate Parent Leucadia National Corporation for Jefferies LLC. Document filed by Jefferies LLC.(Schacter, Kenneth)
September 22, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ian Schacter on behalf of Jefferies LLC. (Schacter, Kenneth)
September 21, 2015 Filing 62 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Corporate Parent Mizuho Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Mizuho Securities Co., Ltd. for Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. Document filed by Mizuho Securities USA Inc..(Fortinsky, Jerome)
September 21, 2015 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Shally on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Shally, Joanna)
September 21, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John A. Nathanson on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Nathanson, John)
September 21, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome Steven Fortinsky on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Fortinsky, Jerome)
September 21, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Jay Baskin on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Baskin, Stuart)
September 21, 2015 Filing 57 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Filing 56 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Filing 55 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jefferies LLC. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Filing 54 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Filing 53 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Filing 52 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc.. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Filing 50 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Countrywide Securities Corporation. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Filing 48 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (laq)
September 21, 2015 Filing 47 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (laq)
September 21, 2015 Filing 46 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (laq)
September 21, 2015 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (laq)
September 21, 2015 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barclays Capital Inc.. (laq)
September 21, 2015 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency. (laq)
September 21, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John D. Friel on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Friel, John)
September 21, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Yeres on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Yeres, David)
September 21, 2015 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp.. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp..(Houck, Robert)
September 21, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert G. Houck on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Houck, Robert)
September 21, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Lucas Shapiro on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
September 21, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Ehrenberg on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Ehrenberg, Stephen)
September 21, 2015 Filing 36 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Shane, Penny)
September 21, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Penny Shane on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Shane, Penny)
September 21, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susannah Providence Torpey on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Torpey, Susannah)
September 21, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION for Elizabeth P. Papez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11412301. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Papez, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION for Robert Y. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11412132. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sperling, Robert)
September 21, 2015 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate The Bank of Nova Scotia for Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency. Document filed by Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency.(Pepperman, Richard)
September 21, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Joseph Hughes, III on behalf of Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency. (Hughes, John)
September 21, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency. (Pepperman, Richard)
September 21, 2015 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
September 21, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Samuel Howard Rudman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:78j(b)ss; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:15; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pc)
September 21, 2015 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 15cv5794. (pc)
September 21, 2015 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 21, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Robert Y. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11412132. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #33 MOTION for Elizabeth P. Papez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11412301. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
September 21, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Samuel Howard Rudman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc)
September 18, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randi Dawn Bandman on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Bandman, Randi)
September 18, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Coughlin on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Coughlin, Patrick)
September 18, 2015 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBS Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TD Securities (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SG Americas Securities, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RBS Securities Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RBC Capital Markets, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nomura Securities International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mizuho Securities USA Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jefferies LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goldman, Sachs & Co., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Countrywide Securities Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BMO Capital Markets Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Capital Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Samuel H. Rudman re: that this action be filed as related to 15-cv-05794. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated.(Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 18, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11407918)Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund.(Rudman, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Electrical Pension Fund v. Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Represented By: David C. Esseks
Represented By: Todd Steven Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Omari Largos Royter Mason
Represented By: Thomas C. Rice
Represented By: David J. Woll
Represented By: Shannon Price Torres
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Campbell
Represented By: David Elbaum
Represented By: Kavitha Satya Sivashanker
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Knox
Represented By: Esinam Mawuena Daisy Agbemenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency
Represented By: John Joseph Hughes, III
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Susannah Providence Torpey
Represented By: Penny Shane, II
Represented By: Stephen Ehrenberg
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Papez
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jonathan Lucas Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities Inc.
Represented By: Greg Donald Andres
Represented By: Melissa Carrie King
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Represented By: Maude Paquin
Represented By: Joel M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Represented By: Henry Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.
Represented By: David A. Paul
Represented By: William J. Kolasky
Represented By: Malik Havalic
Represented By: Michael Steven Popok
Represented By: Ethan Edward Litwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Securities Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: David Harold Braff
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: John D. Friel
Represented By: Robert G. Houck
Represented By: David J. Yeres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Gabrielle Frances Levin
Represented By: Mark Adam Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Edward Nathaniel Moss
Represented By: Pamela Addison Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Susanna Michele Buergel
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Represented By: Kenneth Anthony Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Flug Davidoff
Represented By: Steven Lyon Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA Inc.
Represented By: Jerome Steven Fortinsky
Represented By: John A. Nathanson
Represented By: Stuart Jay Baskin
Represented By: H. Miriam Farber
Represented By: Joanna Shally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Leah Friedman
Represented By: Sophie-Charlotte Rohnke
Represented By: Marshall Howard Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Electrical Pension Fund
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?