Kux-Kardos v. Vimpelcom, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Kux-Kardos
Defendant: Vimpelcom, Ltd., Jean-Yves Charlier, Jo Lunder, Alexander Izosimov, Andrew Davies and Cornelis Hendrik Van Dalen
Case Number: 1:2015cv08672
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Andrew L. Carter
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 OPINION & ORDER re: 176 MOTION to Appoint Boris Lvov to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. filed by Boris Lvov, 173 MOTION to Appoint Sherman Steele, Leonard Karpowich, Stan Sinitsa to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Stan Sinitsa, Leonard Karpowich, Sherman Steele. For the foregoing reasons, SKS's motions for appointment as Lead Plaintiff and motion for appointment of Lead Counsel are DENIED, and Lvov's motion for appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for appointment of Lead Counsel are GRANTED.The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close ECF 173 and ECF 176. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/29/2022) (rro)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 OPINION AND ORDER re: 161 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Veon LTD. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court grants VEON's motion to dismiss and dismisses Lead Plaintiff Westway from this action. This resolves ECF No. 161. The Court reopens the Lead Plaintiff selection process consistent with this opinion. Any motions for appointment as Lead Plaintiff shall be filed by April 8, 2021; VEON shall oppose the motions by May 6, 2021; and any replies shall be filed by May 12, 2021. SO ORDERED., Motions due by 4/8/2021., Responses due by 5/6/2021, Replies due by 5/12/2021. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/11/2021) (rj)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER denying without prejudice 132 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Accordingly, Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED without prejudice and Plaintiff Westway's second amended complaint is due April 14, 2020. This terminated ECF No. 132. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/31/2020) (va)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jo Lunder, 78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alexander Izosimov, 84 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Jean-Yves Charlier, Andrew Mark Davies, 96 MOTION to Dis miss With Prejudice the Claims Against Defendant Cornelis Hendrik van Dalen filed by Cornelis Hendrik Van Dalen. For the foregoing reasons, the claims against the Individual Defendants are DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is kindly requested to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 78, 81, 84, and 96. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/30/2018) (ama) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION AND ORDER re: 47 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by VEON LTD.. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court denies VEON's motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint in part and grants the motion in part. The Individual Defendant s who have appeared in this action must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before October 10, 2017. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to close Docket Entry Number 48. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/19/2017) (rj)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION AND ORDER re: 33 MOTION for Reconsideration re; (5 in 1:15-cv-09492-UA, 31 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC) Memorandum & Opinion . filed by Boris Lvov, Richard McColloch. For the reasons stated above, the motion to reconsider is de nied. This terminates ECF No. 33. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report no later than October 11, 2016, proposing a schedule for the filing of an amended consolidated complaint and Defendants' answer or response to the complaint. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/26/2016) (cla)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER re: (18 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC, 18 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC, 18 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Philip Tohme, Boris Lvov, Richard McColloch, (20 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC) MOTION to Withdraw (12) MOTION to Consolidate Cases . MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Approve Counsel . filed by Igor Melnikov, Max Nussbaumer, (8 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC) MOTION to Appoint Westway Alliance Corp. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) filed by Westway Alliance Corp., (11 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15-cv-09492 filed by Westway Alliance Corp., (15 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC, 15 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC, 15 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. MOTION to Appoint Vimal K. Kocher and Dhirendra Prasad Sangal to serve as le ad plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:15-cv-08672-ALC and 1:15-cv-09492 filed by Vimal K. Kocher, Dhirendra Prasad Sangal, (12 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC, 12 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC, 12 in 1:15-cv-08672-ALC) MOTION to Cons olidate Cases . MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Approve Counsel filed by Igor Melnikov, Max Nussbaumer: For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants the motions to consolidate Kux-Kardos v. VimpelCom, Ltd. et al, No. 15 Civ. 8672, and Westway Alliance Corp. v. VimpelCom, Ltd., et al, No. 15 Civ. 9492. The Court also grants Westway's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and approves Gainey McKenna & Eggleston as lead counsel. The remaini ng motions are denied. This terminates ECF Nos. 8, 11, 12, 15, 18, and 20. The Court will schedule an initial pretrial conference for the consolidated action by separate order. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/27/2016) (tn) Modified on 4/27/2016 (tn).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kux-Kardos v. Vimpelcom, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kux-Kardos
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vimpelcom, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Yves Charlier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Lunder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Izosimov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelis Hendrik Van Dalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?