Wah et al v. HSBC North America Holdings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chan Ah Wah and Lim Cheok Kee Willy
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. and HSBC Private Bank
Case Number: 1:2015cv08974
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: Lorna G. Schofield
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 OPINION AND ORDER re: 272 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank USA N.A., The Hong Kong & Shanghai Banking Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss the TAC is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Opinion and Order to the pro se Plaintiffs, close the motion at Docket No. 272 and close the case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/22/2019) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 OPINION AND ORDER re: 113 MOTION to Compel HSBC to. filed by HSBC Bank PLC, 118 MOTION to Amend/Correct. MOTION to Compel. filed by Lim Cheok Kee Willy, 122 MOTION to Amend/Correct 56 Amended Complaint,,. filed by Chan Ah W ah, Lim Cheok Kee Willy. Because neither the Sherman Act and CEA claims nor the state law claims are futile, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file the TAC is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file the TAC by June 15, 2017. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motions at Docket Nos. 113, 118 and 122, and mail a copy of this Opinion to the pro se Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/5/2017) (kgo) Modified on 6/5/2017 (kgo).
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER re: 87 MOTION to Dismiss filed by HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank USA N.A., The Hong Kong & Shanghai Banking Corporation, HSBC North America Holdings Inc. For the fo regoing reasons, Defendants motion to dismiss the Complaint is GRANTED in its entirety, mooting their alternative motion for a stay. Any motion by Plaintiffs for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint shall be filed within thirty days of this order. Plaintiffs are warned that any application must set forth in detail what additional allegations concerning Plaintiffs' transactions in FX instruments will be added to address the deficiencies described above. Absent allegations concerning domestic FX transactions, leave to amend will be denied as futile for the reasons set forth in this opinion.The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket No. 87. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/11/2016) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wah et al v. HSBC North America Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chan Ah Wah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lim Cheok Kee Willy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA N.A.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Casamento
Represented By: Edwin R Deyoung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Private Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?