Burnett et al v. The Islamic Republic of Iran et al
Plaintiff: Richard E. Nogan, Doe AP45, John Nesbitt, Daniel Narlock, James Niebler, Michael O'Brien, Brian A. Neville, John E. Najmy, Bridget Nee, Frank O'Brien, Sean S. Newman, Kofi Nyantakyi, Santos Nunez, Louis Napoli, Christopher O'Connell, Fook Sam Ngooi, Sean M. O'Conner, Child Doe AP48, Elizabeth Nielsen, Terry Norton, Luis O'Campo, Allan P. Neuendorf, Child Doe AP47, John Nimmo, III, Radames Ocasio, Parasar Nandan, John F O'Brien, Robert E. O'Flaherty, Patrick J. O'Keefe, Kayode Oladunjoye, Joseph O'Hagan, Dalisay Saenz Olaes, Edward O'Hare, Kevin O'Neill, Richard O'Mack, Gerard O'Donnell, Christopher O'Keefe, Thomas O'Meara, Brian O'Flaherty, Joseph O'Neil, Eugene F. O'Reilly, Martin J O'Leary, Francisco Ortiz, John J. O'Donnell, William J. Pesature, Keith Pander, Thomas Papaccio, Guido Peralta, Louis M. Pecora, Mark Papadopulos, Carol Pantalone, Nathan Peterson, Richard Peitler, Ralph Pepe, Dean G. Pappas, Jennifer Panzella, Anant Patel, Robert E. Peters, Valentin Paredes, Venus Ortiz, Victor D. Panzella, Jr., Steven C. Perry, Salvatore Parisi, Steven Perez, Michael Pena, Vincent J. Panaro, Lori Pfeil, Winston Parris, Francesca Penora, Gregory Patsos, Maria I. Pellot, Joseph Petrassi, Ralph Paprocki, Milcia C. Pena, Paul Patsos, Gregory Petrik, Petero Otigho, Joseph G. Pesce, Ruben Pimentel, Leonard Pittz, Larrie Placide, Vincent Pinto, Edmund L. Plunkett, Gerard Pirraglia, Dan J. Potter, Christopher P Piazza, Carl Pisani, Doe AP41, Pedro Pichardo, John Prendergast, Daniel Pollicino, Maneula Pichardo, Robert Ramos, Michael J. Prior, Vincent Puleo, Vigita Ramnath, Paul G. Quirke, Robert Pulizzotto, Brian Pritchard, James Reddan, James P. Rae, Juan Ramirez, Joseph Reid, Daniel P. Purcell, William Privitar, Peter A Quinn, Sebastian Raspanti, John M. Quevedo, Jr., John Prenty, Salvatore Provenzano, Mildred Ramos, Michael J. Quevedo, Alfonso Ramos, raymond Ragucci, Salvatore T. Princiotta, Jr., Pamela Reeves, Edwin Quinn, Richard Regis, Richard Ramaizel, Antonio Quinones, Robert Rae, Josh M. Reder, Francis Paul Pursley, Kenneth M. Rallis, Godwin Quinones, Daniel Reeber, Frank Prescia, Michael Ramputi, Vincent Rivera, John E. Reinhardt, Richard Resto, Grace Rivera, Maurice Richardson, Alfred W Retundie, Lloyd Rendall, Kenneth J Robulak, Franco Riggio, Edwin Rivera, Christopher Revere, John Renna, Daniel Ricciardi, Douglas Robinson, Karem Reynoso, Timothy J. Reid, Francis W Renois, Omayra Rivera, Frank Ricca, Jose Rivera, David M. Rivas, Thomas Reilly, William J. Riccardulli, Arthur J Riccio, William Riordan, Anthony Rocco, Juan L. Reyes, Carlos A. Rivera, Steven J. Richards, Nelson Rocha, Charles Reilly, Michael Rizzo, Louis Ruggirello, Carlota Rodriguez, John R. Rogers, Mark J. Rowan, Victor J. Rosa, Julio Roig, Jr., David Rodriguez, Damian Rusin, Anthony A. Rosado, David Rowan, Teresa Roig, Miriam Rodriguez, Filomena Roman, Mark Ruppert, John T. Rokee, John Roche, Rosaulina Rodriguez, Steven Ruggiero, James J. Rozas, Michael J Rossello, Abimael Rodriguez, Thomas D. Ryan, William Romaka, Louis Rotondo, Frank J Romano, Gwennett Rosario, Marshall Ryan, Susana Rojas, Joseph C. Rotondi, John B. Rooney, Susan S Ryan, Bryan Rodrigues, Donald J. Ruland, Brian M Schmitt, Reina Salzedo, Barbara Serna, Concepcion Sanchez, Doe AP61, Glenn Savery, David Sears, Jose Antonio Sanchez, Jr., Audrey J Sammis, Abida Shaikh, Peter A. Schoepe, Thelma Savery, Carl Scheetz, Lawrence R Senzel, Anthony Scolaviano, Joe N Sanders, Clide R. Sampson, Ralph Seiter, David A Santise, Edward J. Schneider, David P Sandvik, Michael G Rynn, Carlos Sanchez, Donald Schipf, William Sergio, Howard Scott, Robert Santandrea, David Sedacca, Kevin M. Shea, Stephen Sharp, Thomas Scally, Robert Senn, Robert Salmon, Robert Schumacker, John Sheehan, Luis Santiago, Richard E Scola, Jeffrey Sentowski, Benedict Scarsella, Christopher Santos, Robert Scally, Anthony Sercia, Daniel R. Schofield, Kevin Shaeffer, Oscar F. Sandoval, Philip J Scarfi, LaShea Saunders, Daniel Schug, Matthew Salmon, Robert Schmitt, Scott Shields, Fabian Silva, Jr., Wendy Christina Silva, Steve Shtab, Linda Sims, Frederic Siboulet, Neil J. Skow, Doe AP167, Marilyn Joy Shepard, John Signorelli, Donna Singer, Edward John Shields, Clarence Singleton, Terence P Slane, Brian Singer, Eugene Slater, Rodney C. Sherard, Todd Smith, Andrew W Sochinski, Michael P. Smith, Salvatore Sodano, Neta Smith, Donald Spurrell, David Sozio, Brandon Smith, Michael Spiller, Lauren A Smith, Robert S Spinelli, Anthony Squillante, Richard Souto, Clifford Stabner, Gareth Smith, John Starace, William A. Steinbuch, III, Maximino Sterling, Peter Stathis, John M Stiastny, Dennis Stefanak, Stephen E Stroh, Ethan Strauss, Joseph R. Stach, Jr., Harry F. Stefandel, Rasmond E. Streker, Doe AP234, Paul Stroessner, Scott Stromer, Eugene Stolowski, Anthony E. Suchon, Nelly Stanicich, Edward Sullivan, Lawrence J. Sullivan, Michael P. Sullivan, James W. Sullivan, Kenneth A Summers, John Sullivan, Ronald Svec, Robert Sutton, Gerard Suden, John M. Sullivan, Alfred Suwara, Linda Sulfaro, Otto W. Suwara, Thomas Swannick, Randolph J. Supek, Gerard F. Sweeney, Devindra Sukhram, Soudabeh Tabatabai, Expedito Tavarez, Havergail Taylor, John F. Taggart, Roxanne Taylor, Carol Tannenbaum, Denise Thompson, Michael A. Telesca, Joseph Swick, Timothy J. Tarpey, Bidiwattie Tewari, Joseph Szymanski, Recioe Thomas, Lloyd Thompson, Geraldine Teixeira, Dennis Thomson, Steven M Syrop, Richard Tishler, Edward Tomaszewski, Salvatore S. Torcivia, John A Tiska, Gabriel Torres, Anthony Tito, William Tracy, Louis Torres, Frank R Thurlow, Michael K. Tobin, Miguel Torres, Roderic S Tierney, Michael Tracy, John Treglia, Johnny Torres, Joseph M. Trezza, Doe AP195, Louis M. Troisi, Kevin M. Tully, Steven Turilli, Stanley Trojanowski, Thomas V. Turilli, Larry Troy, Gisela Valencia, Antonina Tutkaj, Alfred Trinidad, Dell Truax, John M. Tyson, Michael Tripptree, Nosa E. Ugiagbe, Dennis J. Valentin, Joseph A. Tursi, Hilda Valentine, Douglas Tripken, Jennifer Van Zanten, Al Vega, Emmanuel Vega, Anthony Vanacore, Charles Vella, Robert Varese, Jr., John Verrengia, Lawrence Vento, Robert Van Houten, Yuni Vasquez, Nellie Verdejo, Bruce J. Van Nosdall, John S Verme, Timothy Villari, James A. Vella, Dominick Vincenti, William C. Van Name, Brian Voos, Brian P Wall, Patrick Wall, Edward Wagner, Doe AP241, Daniel S Walis, Richard H Ward, Neil P. Walsh, Bryan Violetto, Mickey Walker, Cecil R. Ward, Gerard Von Essen, Frank J. Ward, Sandra Ward, Kerry M. Walsh, Thomas P. Ward, Darlene Helen Vollenberg, Romuald Waszielewicz, William G. Weinert, Gregg Weisenburger, Christian Waugh, Michael A. Weaver, Sr., Paul A. Whalen, Michael Welsh, Thomas A. Warkenthien, David Weber Sr., James M. Werner, Wayne Warren, Kevin Whalen, Brendan Whelan, Gary Welge, Henry W White, Cynthia Warren, Barbara M. Williams, Walter Wissell, John J. Wojcik, George Wilton Jr., Clifford Wolken, Ken Wiltse, William K. Wright, William E. Woodlon, Yaeno White, Kenneth Winkler, William Woytkin, Michael Wilbur, Robert E. Wright, Gregory Wyckoff, Phidia Wong, John D. Yates, Steve Wiesner, Dianne Young, Dennis Zimmerman, Richard Zletz, John E Young, Thomas H. Young, Neil Yellen, Angelo Zecca, Christopher Young, Kah L. Yeoh, Raffaella Crisci, Susan Lynne Kinney, Barbara J. Lasko, Anthony Curatolo, Jr., Thomas H. McAllister, Jack A. Grandcolas, Lisa A. Ventura, Anne Marie McCann, Scott Hawkins, William D. Riverso, Albert A. Blackman, Phillip Smith, James S. Weisenburger, Jr., Paul Kirwin, Fanny Dejesus Molina, Kevin M. Burns, Michael J. Gibbons, John McAllister and Lillian C. Tetreault
Petitioner: James S. Weisenburger, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2015cv09903
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1605 A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER: On August 9, 2021, 51 plaintiffs in Burnett, et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN) (Dec. 18, 2015), filed the fifth motion for personal injury damages. ECF No. 7005. The Court has begun its review of the plaintiffs' motion and directs them to clarify the following four items: (See document.) The plaintiffs shall file the necessary materials or make any amendments required by September 22, 2021. Finally, the Court offers two further observations that will improve the processing of personal injury recommendations going forward. First, plaintiffs submitting medical records to support motions for personal injury damages must include pin cites directing the Court to the particular part of the medical record that supports the plaintiff's claimed injuries. Second, if a plaintiff has been determined to be ineligible for the September 11 Victim Compensation Fund, there must be an explanation for why they were found ineligible. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 502 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/9/2021 (dt).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 501 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (499 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 7005 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury 5).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit SS, #46 Exhibit TT, #47 Exhibit UU, #48 Exhibit VV, #49 Exhibit WW, #50 Exhibit XX, #51 Exhibit YY, #52 Exhibit ZZ)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (7005 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 499 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury 5). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury 5). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (502 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 7008 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 498 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John M. Eubanks dated August 6, 2021 re: Burnett/Iran XXIII Motion for the entry of partial final default judgments filed on March 2, 2021 (ECF 6632). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting (909) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; granting (6949) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (491) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. The individual listed on Exhibit A to the Motion shall be substituted into the Burnett cases. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 496 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 7/15/2021 (dt).
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 495 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (493 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 6951 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XXIV).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (493 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 6951 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XXIV). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XXIV). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (6959 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, (496 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 492 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Related Document Number: 6949 ..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 7/14/2021 (dt).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: New Party: As set forth on Exhibit A . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Wilfred DeJesus, Gregory Anthony Waters, Ophelia Waters, James Thomas Gray, Janet Walker Gray, Timothy Walker Gray..(Eubanks, John)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (492 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 910 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 6950 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER:On June 23, 2021, the Court issued an order granting the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' motion at ECF No. 6816. ECF No. 6872. That order was made under seal in light of some of the content in motions preceding that order. To increase public access to the docket and reduce the volume of material that must undergo redaction review, the Court now proposes to unseal the order at ECF No. 6872. If the parties have any objections to unsealing that order, those must be filed with the Court by July 9, 2021. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 7/9/2021) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/02/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ama)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER granting (904) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; granting (6888) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (485) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. The individuals included on Exhibit A to the Motion shall be substituted into the Burnett cases. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER granting (902) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; granting (6886) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (483) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. The individuals included on Exhibit A to the Motion shall be substituted into the Burnett cases. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Related Document Number: 6888 ..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: New Party: As set forth on Exhibit A . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 484 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Related Document Number: 6886 ..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Marjorie Farley, New Party: Lisa Ann Cenicola as Personal Representative of the Estate of Marjorie Ann Farley, Deceased. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 482 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Christian Crane Croner, Daniel Vito Hagis, Jaclyn Elizabeth Hagis, Jamie Houtz Jackson, Joseph Noel Shontere, Tina Marie Wasielewski, Michelle Ann Stabile, Ryan Thomas Nilsen, Scott Edward Nilsen, Kristin Kathleen Bennett, Heather Elizabeth Ferreira, Allison Irene Oakley, Virginia Ann Gecewicz, Cynthia Royer-Saloman, Justin Charles Saloman, Jesus Manuel Sanchez Declet, Paul Andrew Spagnoletti, Edward Joseph Callahan, II, Martha Marie King..(Eubanks, John)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER: Although Talarico does not need specific permission from the Court to file a motion for judgment following default, to avoid any doubt, the request is GRANTED, and Talarico may submit a motion for default judgment, including briefing on the question of her status as a "functional equivalent." The Court declines to set a deadline at this time for Talarico to file her motion and will resolve the motion once it is filed. Talarico is reminded that her motion must specify which categories of damages she seeks, the amount she seeks, and the basis for the request for each category and amount, and as further set forth herein. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the plaintiff. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/31/2021) (ras) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER granting (894) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; granting (6654) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (655) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; granting (478) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; granting (28) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; granting (18) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN; granting (18) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN; granting (19) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN; granting (18) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN; granting (18) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN; granting (63) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting (893) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; granting (6653) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (654) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; granting (477) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; granting (17) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN; granting (17) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN; granting (17) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN; granting (17) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN; granting (62) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (25 in 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN, 63 in 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 28 in 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN, 655 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN, 6654 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 58 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN, 478 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN, 894 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN) MOTION for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-24226966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (17 in 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN, 654 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN, 893 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 62 in 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN, 57 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN, 24 in 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN, 6653 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN, 24 in 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN, 477 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN) MOTION for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-24226953. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(aea)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 MOTION for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-24226966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Heyl, Charles)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MOTION for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-24226953. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission of Jade A. Haileselassie Pro Hac Vice, #2 Cert. of Good Standing (MD), #3 Cert. of Good Standing (SC), #4 Cert. of Good Standing (DC), #5 Proposed Order on Admission Pro Hac Vice)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Haileselassie, Jade)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (476 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 6635 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 476 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 475 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (6632 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 473 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XXIII).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 474 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6632 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 473 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XXIII). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XXIII). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Joseph Daniel Afflitto, Daniel Thomas Afflitto, Jr., Joseph Anthony Arena, Nina Louise Arena, Catherine Alice Crotty, William Howard Fields, Jr., Shantell Renee Fields, Michelle Lynn Bevevino, Dawn Marie Meygeri, Kristine Ann Reynolds, Charles Howard Horn, Jr., Kimberly H. Jacoby(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas Harrod Jacoby, Child of 9/11 Decedent Steven Donald Jacoby), Daniel Jeremy Lopez, Patrick Bernard McEneaney, Cassandra Hansen Tavolarella, Sean Patrick Murphy, Jay C. Saloman, Maria Mercedes Declet, Lourdes Sanchez, Maria Mercedes Sanchez, Miguel Angel Sanchez, Jesus Francisco Sanchez-Declet, Maria S. Spagnoletti, Mark Anthony Spagnoletti, Christopher Richard Spagnoletti, Sr...(Eubanks, John)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/5/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 3/16/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1773 1639, as per (6076 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 471 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Charlene Talarico consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Charlene Talarico.(sc)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 470 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from C. Talarico, dated 10/21/20 re: As a pro se plaintiff in the case of Burnett et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran et al., I respectfully ask the Court for consideration of my "functional equivalent" status. I ask to be considered a "functional equivalent" of Paul Laszczynski's spouse; and that the Court issue a Scheduling Order which would allow me to properly present my motions etc. Document filed by Charlene Talarico.(sc)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/7/2020; ECF no. 5888 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 160 2-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran c/o the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5325 0433, as per (6342 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020; ECF no. 5960 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 16 02-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran c/o the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 6084 9405, as per (6335 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020; ECF no. 5960 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 16 02-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, c/o the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 6086 4092, as per (6337 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/7/2020; ECF no. 5888 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 160 2-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. M ohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran c/o the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5327 8995, as per (6341 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 469 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Marie L. Scott, Julia LaFlamme, Laura Sztejnberg, Ashley Nicole Thompson, Chelsea Thompson, Doreen Cortez-Trinidad, Marianne Krueger, Michele Teresa Piper, Mark Thomas Uliano, Matthew P. Uliano, Nathan Detroit Uliano, Norman O. Wahlstrom, Jr., Lindsey Marissa Hill..(Eubanks, John)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 468 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Kenneth Arthur Froehner, Dorell Froehner McNamara, Barbara Vaughn Catuzzi, Lawrence Richard Catuzzi, Vaughn Ann Catuzzi Lohec, Dara Ann Near, Brian Joseph Grimner, Robert David Halligan, Stanley H. Kim, Miles Travis Boyd, Debra Lynn Brown, Christian J. Horrocks, William Lawrence Horrocks, Jr., Linda J. Horrocks, William Lawrence Horrocks, Sr., Brittany Dani Lopez, Laura Louise Manley, Maureen McEneaney Eckman, Jack Edward Niedermeyer, Richard Niedermeyer, Abigail Michelle Noel, Michael Thomas Noel, Jr., Dolores C. Quigley, Doreen Noone Wheeler, Marykutty Thomas..(Eubanks, John)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 467 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Edward J. Andrews, Carlos Pio Behr, Edith del Mar Behr, Rachael Paulina Brisman, William Eli Brisman, Neil L. Cohen, Robert Joseph Coll, III, Megan Bailey Coll, Davina Aryeh, Douglas G. Coombs, Charles B. Coombs, IV, William Michael Coombs, Caroline Frances Crotty, Troy Michael Barrett, Robert Anthony D'Esposito, David Martinez, Dorothy Martinez, Wilson Martinez, Courtney DeSoto, Adina Deborah Eisenberg, Michael Anthony Thomas, Yvette Maria Thomas-Huang, Gary Michael Evans, Charles Reggie Evans, Jr., Robert Scott Evans..(Eubanks, John)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/11/2020; ECF no. 5909 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 16 02-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5320 2637, as per (6338 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/7/2020; ECF no. 5879 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 160 2-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 7/22/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5329 4947, as per (6340 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; granting (6526) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (561) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; granting (511) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; granting (735) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; granting (147) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (132) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; granting (112) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; granting (131) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (96) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN; granting (91) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12381-GBD-SN; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN; granting (18) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:19-cv-11767-GBD-SN; granting (18) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:19-cv-11776-GBD-SN; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:19-cv-11865-GBD-SN. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Stephen Wah terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/10/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE By Charlene Talarico. (sc)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting (6456) Motion to Vacate in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (459) Motion to Vacate in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN: ORDERED that the following final judgments for solatium damages entered on behalf of the referenced individuals in the Burnett action, and only these judgments in the Burnett action, are vacated: Danielle McGuire, ECF No. 5848 at 7, line I ??(Burnett XIV); Mara Moran McGuire, ECF No. 5848 at 7, line 179(Burnett XIV); Ryan P. McGuire, ECF No. 5848 at 7, line I8I(Burnett XIV); Sean P. McGuire, ECF No. 5848 at 7, line l 78(Burnett XIV); and Shea E. McGuire, ECF No. 5848 at 7, line 180(Burnett XIV). ORDERED that the Court's Final Order of Judgment in the Burnett action at ECF No. 5848 remain otherwise in force and that no other final judgments awarded to the above-referenced individuals are affected by this Order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/22/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 461 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Related Document Number: 6456 ..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 460 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (6456 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 459 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION to Vacate Partial Final Judgments for 5 Burnett Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MOTION to Vacate Partial Final Judgments for 5 Burnett Plaintiffs. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (6458 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 461 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 458 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020; ECF no. 5968 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran, H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, on 8/11/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 6080 8184, c/o the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 457 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated February 7, 2020(ECF No 5879), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iran on 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002348725US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 456 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated February 13, 2020(ECF No 5932), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iran on 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002348694US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated February 11, 2020 (ECF No 5909), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iran on 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002348650US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated February 18, 2020(ECF No 5975), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iran on 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002348677US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated February 7, 2020(ECF No 5888), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iranon 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002349519US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated 12/13/2019 (ECF No 5356), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iran on 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002348765US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 451 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020 (ECF No 5979), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iran on 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH29589301US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated 2/5/2020 (ECF No 5848), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iran on 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002349479US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated February 18, 2020(ECF No 5960), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iran on 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002348779US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the the Notice of Default, Order of Partial Final Judgment for damages, dated February 18, 2020 (ECF No 5968), a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and Translators Affidavit (in English only) along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations of the above documents mailed to Central Bank of the Islamic Republic or Iran Abdolnaser Hemmati, Governor Mirdamad Blvd., No.198 Tehran Islamic Republic of Iran on 8/7/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RH002348822US, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 447 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/7/2020; ECF no. 5879 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, on 6/22/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5326 8994, c/o the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 446 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/7/2020; ECF no. 5888 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5325 0433, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/7/2020; ECF no. 5888 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5327 8995, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/7/2020; ECF no. 5879 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5329 4947, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/11/2020; ECF no. 5909 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5323 4437, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/11/2020; ECF no. 5909 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 5320 2637, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020; ECF no. 5960 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 6086 4092, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020; ECF no. 5968 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 6082 5810, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020; ECF no. 5960 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 6084 9405, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/13/2020; ECF no. 5932 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 6083 4733, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(smc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of 1)the Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/13/2020; ECF no. 5932 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, on 7/23/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7700 6084 1698, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Brian Daniels, Carl Jones Eisenberg, Russell Marc Eisenberg, Wayne Alan Emery, Allison Sarah Fekete, Michael Christopher Grimner, Nathan Jay Hersch, John Martin Lopez, Donna Michelle Posta, Giuseppe Salvatore Rizzo..(Eubanks, John)
June 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; granting (6280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (502) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; granting (729) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; granting (133) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (118) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; granting (126) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; granting (103) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; granting (122) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; granting (6277) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (499) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; granting (726) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; granting (130) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (115) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; granting (123) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; granting (100) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (Attorney Kanishka Agarwala terminated.) (ras)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Barbara Ann Arthur, Gabriel M. Behr, Dherran William Gilligan, Donna Marie McEwan, Bryant Taylor Mitchell, Carmen Quintana, Jose Ruben Quintana, Rubencio Quintana, Aaron Scott Warchola, Christopher Whelan, John Andrew Whelan, Robert Thomas Whelan, Thomas Michael Whelan, William Kenneth Whelan, Alfred L. Whelan, Jr., James Patrick Williams, Kelly Williams Abrams..(Eubanks, John)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Justin Nicholas Benitez, Michael Gritsipis, Jordana Sandler Manzano, James Monahan, Kevin Brian Monahan, Megan Monahan, Timothy Monahan, Franklyn Monahan, Jr., Lauren Elizabeth Munhall, Dennis O'Brien, Emiliano Perez, Joseph Francis Perez, Laura Perez, Luigi Anthony Rizzo, Pamela Rae Salvo, Edward Jack San Pio, Maria Jose San Pio, Pamela Sandler, Catherine Jean Seymour, Anne Elizabeth Sweeney, John Patrick Sweeney, Leonard Hugh Sweeney, Luise Anne Sweeney, Noelle Robin Tully, Maureen Yetman..(Eubanks, John)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Kanhai Boodram, Angad Budram, Brian Thomas Clendenin, Jr., Laura Denise Favuzza Bittel, Janice Warner Gadiel, Vera Glatt, Jeremy Matthew Glick, Doreen Julia Gray, David Patrick Grimner, James T. Hagan, Miriam Rose Jacobson, Rachel Bess Jacobson, Patricia Ann Keating, Margit Lichtschein, James Lynch, Jonathan Lynch, Mark Lynch, Patrick Lynch, Jean Faith Neufeld, Ashley Elizabeth Pastor, Surujpattie Persaud, Sybil Ramsaran, Dhanpaul Budram Takoor, Charlene Talarico, Lee A. Wright..(Eubanks, John)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mary Elizabeth Andrews, Paul M. Andrews, Karim Aryeh, Siobhan Callahan Berga, Christine Brooks, Donnalee Margaret Charette, Lawrence Royal Charette, Franklin Checo, Edward Augustine Cosgrove, Joseph John Cosgrove, Susan Elizabeth Cosgrove Janssen, Carol Ann D'Esposito, Brian Keith Emery, Martha Elizabeth Emery, Richard Lee Emery, Eileen J. Heffernan, Lynsey Marie Heffernan, Neil Thomas Heffernan, III, Jeanne M. Jamin, Maryjane Jones, Sheila Connors LeDuc, Daniella Peters-Nylen, Marianne Salisbury, Patricia Paula Schlosser, Dona Mae Wallich..(Eubanks, John)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting (6207) Motion to Vacate in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (428) Motion to Vacate in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN: ORDERED that the following final judgments for solatium damages entered on behalf of the referenced individuals in the Burnett action, and only these judgments in the Burnett action, are vacated, as further set forth in this order. ORDERED that the Court's Final Orders of Judgment in the Burnett action at ECF Nos. 5061, 5087, 5138, 5356, 5848, 5975, and 6038 remain otherwise in force and that no other final judgments awarded to the above-referenced individuals are affected by this Order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/18/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (430 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 6209 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs. Related Document Number: 6207 ..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (428 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 6207 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Vacate Partial Final Judgments for 25 Burnett Plaintiffs.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MOTION to Vacate Partial Final Judgments for 25 Burnett Plaintiffs. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 CORRECTED PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF BURNETT PLAINTIFF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER C. CONNORS: ORDERED that service of process was effected upon the Iran Defendants in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) for sovereign defendants and 28 U.S.C. 1608(b) for agencies and instrumentalities of sovereign defendants; and it is ORDERED that the partial final judgment entered against the Iran Defendants on September 6, 2019 on behalf of the Estate of Christopher C. Connors be modified and corrected in accordance with this Order; and it is ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Estate of Christopher C. Connors, who was the brother of Kevin Connors who was killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, and it is ORDERED that the Estate of Christopher C. Connors is awarded solatium damages of $4,250,000; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Estate of Christopher C. Connors is awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Estate of Christopher C. Connors may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/11/2020) (jwh)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 CORRECTED PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF BURNETT PLAINTIFF FRANK M. TATUM: ORDERED that service of process was effected upon the Iran Defendants in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) for sovereign defendants and 28 U.S.C. 1608(b) for agencies and instrumentalities of sovereign defendants: and it is ORDERED that the partial final judgment entered against the Iran Defendants on September 6, 2019 on behalf of Frank M. Tatum be modified and corrected in accordance with this Order; and it is ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of Frank M. Tatum, who was the son of Diane M. Parsons who was killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, and it is ORDERED that Frank M. Tatum is awarded solatium damages of $8,500,000; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Frank M. Tatum is awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Frank M. Tatum may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/11/2020) (jwh)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 CORRECTED PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF BURNETT PLAINTIFF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT C. CUCCINELLO: ORDERED that service of process was effected upon the Iran Defendants in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) for sovereign defendants and 28 U.S.C. 1608(b) for agencies and instrumentalities of sovereign defendants; and it is ORDERED that the partial final judgment entered against the Iran Defendants on September 3, 2019 on behalf of the Estate of Albert C. Cuccinello be modified and corrected in accordance with this Order; and it is ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Estate of Albert C. Cuccinello, who was the spouse of Thelma Cuccinello who was killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, and it is ORDERED that the Estate of Albert C. Cuccinello is awarded solatium damages of $12,500,000; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Estate of Albert C. Cuccinello is awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Estate of Albert C. Cuccinello may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/11/2020) (jwh)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (419 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 6186 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Correct Judgment re: (5061 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Judgment,,,,,,, . . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MOTION to Correct Judgment re: (5061 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Judgment,,,,,,, . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (416 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 6183 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Correct Judgment re: (5087 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,, . . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MOTION to Correct Judgment re: (5087 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,, . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6180 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 413 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION to Amend/Correct (5087 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,, . . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MOTION to Amend/Correct (5087 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,, . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENTS NUNC PRO TUNC. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgments Nunc Pro Tunc in the above-captioned matters, it is hereby; ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' motion is granted and judgments entered on March 6, 2020 at ECF Nos. 6034, 6035, 6037, 6038, 6039, and 6040 are to be given effect as of February 19, 2020. So ordered. Granting (6171) Motion for Judgments nunc pro tunc in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; Granting ( #409 ) Motion for Judgments nunc pro tunc in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; Granting (48) Motion for Judgments nunc pro tunc in case 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/5/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. (rjm) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. Modified on 5/5/2020 (rjm).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, All Plaintiffs in 19-44. Related Document Number: 6171 ..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (48 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN, 409 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 6171 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Entry of Judgments Nunc Pro Tunc re: (6037 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,,, (6034 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,,,,,, (6039 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,,, (6040 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgm . Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, All Plaintiffs in 19-44. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MOTION Entry of Judgments Nunc Pro Tunc re: (6037 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,,, (6034 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,,,,,, (6039 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,,, (6040 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,,, (6038 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,,,,, (6035 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Default Judgment,,,,,, Notice of Motion for Entry of Judgments Nunc Pro Tunc. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, All Plaintiffs in 19-44.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (6173 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 411 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 50 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN(ad)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1770 7152. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1769 7261. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 12/13/2019 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1770 1143. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/5/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), Federal Express tracking # 7700 1767 1294. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 1/30/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1774 7741. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/5/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1773 1639. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1772 7496. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 12/13/2019 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1772 1980. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1771 9330. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/18/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1776 7960. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/5/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1775 2258. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment (in English and Farsi); 2)Order of Partial Judgment for damages, dated 2/12/2020 (in English and Farsi); 3)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 1391(f), 1441(d), and 1602-1611, of title 28, United States Code (Pub. L. 94/583; 90 Stat. 2891) and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et. seq.) (in English only); and 4)Translators Affidavit (in English only) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, on 3/16/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 7700 1777 1600. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(smc)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: It is hereby; ORDERED that service of process was effected upon the Iran Defendants in accordance with 28 U.S.C. l608(a) for sovereign defendants and 28 U.S.C. 1608(b) for agencies and instrumentalities of sovereign defendants; ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A were previously awarded compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as set forth in Exhibit A.ORDERED that the remaining Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages' for decedents pain and suffering from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (rro)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A were previously awarded compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2020) (jwh)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2020) (jwh)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBITS A AND B: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling ( or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit Bare awarded: compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as set forth in Exhibit B; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and Bare awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11,2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2020) (jwh)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFF IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiff in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, which is the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff identified in Exhibit A is awarded: compensatory damages for decedent's pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff identified in Exhibit A is awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2020) (jwh)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/1RAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBITS A AND B: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic off ran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling ( or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit B, who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit B, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit B are awarded: compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as set forth in Exhibit B; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2020) (jwh)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBITS A AND B: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling ( or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 200 l, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit B, who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit B, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit Bare awarded: compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as set forth in Exhibit B; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and Bare awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2020) (jwh)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting #385 Ex Parte Motion for Compromise Order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ***EX-PARTE***PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Lashawn Dickens(As personal representative of the Estate of Rodney Alonzo Dickens, Deceased). Related Document Number: #385 . Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #383 .(Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ***EX-PARTE***AFFIDAVIT of LaShawn Dickens in Support re: #385 MOTION Compromise Order .. Document filed by Lashawn Dickens(As personal representative of the Estate of Rodney Alonzo Dickens, Deceased). Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #383 .(Eubanks, John)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ***EX-PARTE***DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: #385 MOTION Compromise Order .. Document filed by Lashawn Dickens(As personal representative of the Estate of Rodney Alonzo Dickens, Deceased). Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #383 .(Eubanks, John)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION Compromise Order . Document filed by Lashawn Dickens(As personal representative of the Estate of Rodney Alonzo Dickens, Deceased).Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #383 .(Eubanks, John)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER granting (5990) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (383) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 LETTER MOTION to Seal submission regarding distribution of funds by the U.S. Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism for the Estate of Rodney A. Dickens addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from John M. Eubanks dated February 19, 2020. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs, Lashawn Dickens.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/18/2020) (jwh)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (373 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5957 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 18, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's February 13, 2020, Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant Plaintiffs' motion and recommending the amounts in which each plaintiff should be awarded pain and suffering damages (Report ECF No. 5932, at 4-5) is adopted; Plaintiffs Motion for Final Judgments (ECF No. 5816) is granted; it is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those PlaintiffsAppearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of Jonathan M Becker against Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 5,000,000.00, in favor of Estate of David Allen Bridgeforth against Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 7,000,000.00, and in favor of Joseph Falco against Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 7,000,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (dt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgement. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/18/2020) (jwh)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 15(d) granting #364 Motion to Substitute Party: ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs' motion is granted, and the individuals included on Exhibit A are to be substituted into the Burnett case in the manner set forth on Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs comply with the Clerk of Court's instructions as set forth in ECF No. 4295 regarding the addition of these plaintiffs to the Burnett action in the Court's ECF and docketing system.. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/18/2020) (jwh)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (5955 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 371 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's February 11, 2020, Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant Plaintiffs' motion and recommending the amounts in which each Plaintiff should be awarded pain and suffering damages. (Report, ECF o.5909, at 13-15) is adopted; Plaintiffs Motion for Final Judgments (ECF No. 5798) is granted; it is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic and/or damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffsappearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of Lynette Bangaree against Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 5,000,000.00, in favor of Eduardo E. Bruno against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Richard Collis against the Islamic republic of Iran in the amount of %5,000,000.00, in favor of Walter Henry Cramer Jr., against The Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Clifford Jenkins against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Mark D. Joseph against the Islamic republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Susanne Kikkenborg against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Stephen J. King, III against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, Joseph Pesce against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Nathan Peterson, Jr., against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Juan Ramirez against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Grace Rivera against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,000,000.00, in favor of Edwin River against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 12,000,000.00, in favor of John Rogers against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Abida Shaikh against the Islamic republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Dennis J. Valentin against the Islamic republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, and in favor of Lauren Manning against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $25,000,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (dt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (5951 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 370 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Order. Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al., v. The Islamic Republic of Iran et al., 15 Civ. 9903 (GBD) (SN) It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's January 10, 2020, Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs motion (Report, CF No. 5483, at 21-24) is adopted; Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments (ECF No. 5028) is granted in part and denied in part; it is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffsappearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of Deborah L. Barrett against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 12,500,000.00, in favor of Theresa Bevilacqua against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Susan carol Brady against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 12,500,000.00, in favor of Douglas C. Cleary against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Cheryl D. Cooper against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00 in favor of Mary Coughlin against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Margaret C. Cruz against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of John Cuccinello against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of William G. Dietrich against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Robert Giallombardo against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Veronica A. Giascoe against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Lisa C. Goldberg-McWilliams against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Lydeda Grant against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Anthony Newsome against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Monica Ianelli against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Frank G. Jensen against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Kerri Kelly against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Ina Leventhal against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Camille Nicole Martin against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Chelsea Rhea McCarthy against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Rhonda McCleary against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $4,250,000.00, in favor of Noreen V. McDonough against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Vincent A. Milotta against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,0000.00, in favor of Catherine M. Nolan against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of Gina Pinos against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, and in favor of Cheryl Rinbrand against the Islamic Republic or Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (dt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (367 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5946 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment. Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al., v. The Islamic Republic of Iran et al., 15 Civ. 9903 (GBD) (SN) It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's February 7, 2020, Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant Plaintiffs' motion and recommending the amounts in which each plaintiff should be awarded pain and suffering damages (Report ECF No. 5879, at 27-29) is adopted; Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments (ECF No. 5711) is granted; it is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those PlaintiffsAppearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of George Bachmann, RICHARD BERRY against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 7,000,000.00, in favor of Mary Ellen Barbieri against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $10,000,000.00, in favor of Richard A. Beatty against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $10,000,000.00, in favor of Jean M. Hunt against the republic of Iran in the amount of $10,000,000.00, in favor of David Kletsman against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Daniel Kruesi against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of John R. La Sala against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Veronica O. Li against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of James Raymond McCarthy against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Nancy Marie Morrison against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000,00, in favor of Kofi Osei Nyantakyi against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Sharon Premoli against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $10,000,000.00, in favor of Bryan Rodrigues against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Julio Roig, Jr., against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Kevin Shaeffer against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,000,000.00, in favor of Donna Singer against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Eugenia S. Singer against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $10,000,000.00, in favor of Lauren A. Smith against the Republic or Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Kenneth A. Summers against the republic of Iran in the amount of $10,000,000.00, in favor of Michael A. Telesca against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Bidiawattie Tewari against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Denise Thompson against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of John Lewis Thurman against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, and in favor of Phidia Wong against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $10,000,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (dt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (5948 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 368 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment. Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al., v. The Islamic Republic of Iran et al., 15 Civ. 9903 (GBD) (SN) It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's February 7, 2020, Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant Plaintiffs' motion and recommending the amounts in which each plaintiff should be awarded pain and suffering damages (Report ECF No. 5888 at 15-16) is adopted; Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments (ECF No. 5760) is granted; it is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgments for pain and suffering as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those PlaintiffsAppearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of Yvonne V. Abdool against Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 5,000,000.00, in favor of Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Frances Berdan against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Deborah E. Berk against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Michael P. Brodbeck against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Boris Bronshteyn against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Sharron L. Clemons against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Flory H. Danish, Jr., against the republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Michael T. Dempsey against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of John Drapas, Jr., against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Hernando Fernandez against the republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Paul E. Gonzales against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,000,000.00, in favor of Ruben Gordillo against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Rafael Gudmuch against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Robert Hall against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of David J. King, Jr., against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $10,000,000.00, in favor of Evelyn A. Lugo against the Republic or Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of Antonio Quinones against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000.00, in favor of Joseph Rotondi against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00, in favor of $Glenn Savery against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $7,000,000, and in favor of Barbara M. Williams against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $5,000,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (dt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (5949 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 369 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment. Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al., v. The Islamic Republic of Iran et al., 15 Civ. 9903 (GBD) (SN) It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's January 21, 2020, Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs motion (Report, CF No. 5697, at 12-13) is adopted; Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments (ECF No. 5433) is granted in part and denied in part; it is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those PlaintiffsAppearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings.In favor of Justin Benitez against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Paula Mary Carucci against Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Robert Dow against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, in favor of David E. Eschenbaum against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $4,250,000.00, in favor of Serena Giovi against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $12.500,000.00, in favor of Kara Lydia Jerez against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00 in favor of Paige Marie Rollison against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Sarah Elizabeth Rollison against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of David Spivock, Jr., against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, Jacqueline Steed against the Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, and Tanya Villanueva Tepper against the republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (dt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF No. 5816), is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgments for pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions in 03 MDL 1570, (ECF No. 5816), and 15 Civ. 9903, (ECF No. 330), accordingly. So ordered. Granting (5816) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03 md-01570-GBD-SN; Granting ( #330 ) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/18/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (rjm) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. Modified on 2/18/2020 (rjm).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk. Transmitted re: #367 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,,,, to the Orders and Judgments Clerk..(ama)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 372 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John M. Eubanks dated February 14, 2020 re: Status of Pending Motions for Partial Final Default Judgments against Iran. Document filed by Arias Plaintiffs, Burnett Plaintiffs, Prior Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER granting (5798) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (321) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN: Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF No. 5798), is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgments for pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions in 03 MDL 1570, (ECF No. 5798), and 15 Civ. 9903, (ECF No. 321), accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re: (205 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5028 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Entry of Partial Final Default Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Non-Immediate Family Members (Burnett X): Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF No. 5028), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions in 03 MDL 1570, (ECF No. 5028), and 15 Civ. 9903, (ECF No. 205), accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting (5433) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (269) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN: Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF No. 5433), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion in 03 MDL 1570, (ECF No. 5433), and in 15 Civ. 9903, (ECF No. 269), accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting (5760) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (316) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN: Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF No. 5760), is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgments for pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions in 03 MDL 1570, (ECF No. 5760), and 15 Civ. 9903, (ECF No. 316), accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: granting (5711) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (300) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF No. 5711), is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the Burnett Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions in 03 MDL 1570, (ECF No. 5711 ), and 15 Civ. 9903, (ECF No. 300), accordingly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (ama)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Related Document Number: 5941 ..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (364 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5941 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) EMERGENCY MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: As set forth on Exhibit A, New Party: As set forth on Exhibit A .. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 EMERGENCY MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: As set forth on Exhibit A, New Party: As set forth on Exhibit A . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (366 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Related Document Number: 5935 ..(Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 EMERGENCY MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: As set forth on Exhibit A, New Party: As set forth on Exhibit A . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: (5816 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 330 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury 4), filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs should receive pain and suffering damages as follows: (See document.) Plaintiffs should also be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, through the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. See ECF No. 3358, adopted by, ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by the Court on this issue. Any application for punitive damages should not be filed until after the Supreme Court has issued a decision in Opati v. Republic of Sudan, 139 S. Ct. 2771 (2019). Any Burnett Personal Injury Plaintiffs not appearing in this motion and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for damages awards in later stages. Finally, the Court recognizes that in order to participate in the next distribution from the United States Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism Fund ("VSSTF"), Plaintiffs must have a judgment by February 19, 2020. Accordingly, the Burnett IV Plaintiffs are ORDERED to notify the Honorable George B. Daniels no later than noon on Tuesday, February 18, 2020, whether any plaintiff intends to file an objection. For claims for which no objections are anticipated, the Court will issue judgments by the VSSTF deadline. For claims for which objections are filed, the Court will make every effort to address the objections by the VSSTF deadline, but a judgment cannot be guaranteed. And, to protect the due process rights of all parties, any objection timely filed within the 14-day period but after a judgment has been entered, will result in a stay of execution of the judgment until further order of the Court. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/13/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (363 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5936 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jodi Westbrook Flowers dated February 12, 2020 re: Response to Court Orders ECF Nos. 5879, 5888 & 5909. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Flowers, Jodi)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER: John J. Creamer, listed as the spouse of decedent Tara Kathleen Creamer, appears not to be eligible for recovery because he is not a named plaintiff to the case. The plaintiffs are therefore directed to either (1) file a Notice of Amendment, adding Mr. Creamer as a plaintiff to the case, or (2) if Mr. Creamer is in fact a named plaintiff, identify with specificity where his name can be found on the docket, in the Complaint, or in a Notice of Amendment. In order for the plaintiffs to receive an order on their motion prior to the February 19, 2020 VSSTF deadline, plaintiffs should take these steps and submit a letter apprising this Court of Mr. Creamer's status no later than Thursday, February 13, 2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER: The remaining plaintiffs who have not been properly identified are listed in Exhibit A to this Order. The plaintiffs are hereby directed to file a Notice of Amendment updating the names of the "Doe" Plaintiffs, so that each individual decedent is represented by a plaintiff identified by name on the docket. With regard to the remaining individuals in the attached Exhibit A who are not "Doe" Plaintiffs, the Plaintiffs are directed to file a letter apprising this Court of the exact names under which each individual plaintiff is identified on the docket. In order for the plaintiffs to receive an order on their motion prior to the February 19, 2020 VSSTF deadline, plaintiffs should submit these documents no later than Thursday, February 13, 2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: (321 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5798 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury III), filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs should receive pain and suffering damages as follows: (See document.) Plaintiffs should also be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, through the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. See ECF No. 3358, adopted by, ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by the Court on this issue. Any application for punitive damages should not be filed until after the Supreme Court has issued a decision in Opati v. Republic of Sudan, 139 S. Ct. 2771 (2019). Any Burnett Personal Injury Plaintiffs not appearing in this motion and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for damages awards in later stages. Finally, the Court recognizes that in order to participate in the next distribution from the United States Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism Fund ("VSSTF"), Plaintiffs must have a judgment by February 19, 2020. Accordingly, the Burnett III Plaintiffs are ORDERED to notify the Honorable George B. Daniels no later than noon on Friday, February 14, 2020, whether any plaintiff intends to file an objection. For claims for which no objections are anticipated, the Court will issue judgments by the VSSTF deadline. For claims for which objections are filed, the Court will make every effort to address the objections by the VSSTF deadline, but a judgment cannot be guaranteed. And, to protect the due process rights of all parties, any objection timely filed within the 14-day period but after a judgment has been entered, will result in a stay of execution of the judgment until further order of the Court. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 355 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5900 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 353 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiff Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XXII).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5900 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 353 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiff Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XXII). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiff Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XXII). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (5885 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 351 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (5904 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 356 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: (5760 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 316 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury II), filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs should receive pain and suffering damages as follows: (See document.) Plaintiffs should also be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, through the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. See ECF No. 3358, adopted by, ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by the Court on this issue. Any application for punitive damages should not be filed until after the Supreme Court has issued a decision in Opati v. Republic of Sudan, 139 S. Ct. 2771 (2019). Any Burnett Personal Injury Plaintiffs not appearing in this motion and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for damages awards in later stages. Finally, the Court recognizes that in order to participate in the next distribution from the United States Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism Fund ("VSSTF"), Plaintiffs must have a judgment by February 19, 2020. Accordingly, the Burnett II Plaintiffs are ORDERED to notify the Honorable George B. Daniels no later than Wednesday, February 12, 2020, whether any plaintiff intends to file an objection. For claims for which no objections are anticipated, the Court will issue judgments by the VSSTF deadline. For claims for which objections are filed, the Court will make every effort to address the objections by the VSSTF deadline, but a judgment cannot be guaranteed. And, to protect the due process rights of all parties, any objection timely filed within the 14-day period but after a judgment has been entered, will result in a stay of execution of the judgment until further order of the Court. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge George B. Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 2/21/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5882 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 348 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified in Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XXI).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (348 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5882 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified in Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XXI). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified in Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XXI). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: (5711 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 300 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury I), filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs should receive pain and suffering damages as follows: (See document.) Plaintiffs should also be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, through the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. See ECF No. 3358, adopted by, ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by the Court on this issue. Any application for punitive damages should not be filed until after the Supreme Court has issued a decision in Opati v. Republic of Sudan, 139 S. Ct. 2771 (2019). Any Burnett Personal Injury Plaintiffs not appearing in this motion and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for damages awards in later stages. Finally, the Court recognizes that in order to participate in the next distribution from the United States Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism Fund ("VSSTF"), Plaintiffs must have a judgment by February 19, 2020. Accordingly, the Burnett I Plaintiffs are ORDERED to notify the Honorable George B. Daniels no later than Wednesday, February 12, 2020, whether any plaintiff intends to file an objection. For claims for which no objections are anticipated, the Court will issue judgments by the VSSTF deadline. For claims for which objections are filed, the Court will make every effort to address the objections by the VSSTF deadline, but a judgment cannot be guaranteed. And, to protect the due process rights of all parties, any objection timely filed within the 14-day period but after a judgment has been entered, will result in a stay of execution of the judgment until further order of the Court. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge George B. Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 2/21/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from John M. Eubanks dated February 7, 2020 re: response to the Court's Order (ECF No. 5872) regarding status of Vertistine Beaman Mbaya, Rekha D. Packer, and Michael Sztejnberg as plaintiffs "in their own right". Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Burnett/Iran XVII motion for default judgment. ECF No. 5662. On the Burnett member case docket, solatium claimants Vertistine Beaman Mbaya, Rekha D. Packer, and Michael Sztejnberg are listed as plaintiffs in the case "on behalf of all beneficiaries" of the decedent. To request solatium damages as a parent or spouse of a 9/11 decedent, claimants must typically file their claims as plaintiffs "in their own right" as an immediate family member of the decedent, and not just as a representative of an estate. The Court requests that plaintiffs clarify whether these three individuals have filed claims in their own right to entitle them to solatium damages. If they have not, they may file a Notice of Amendment nunc pro tunc adding them to the case in their own right as the parent or spouse of the 9/11 decedent. To have their motion considered by the February 19, 2020 fund deadline, plaintiffs should file a letter response to this Order or file Notices of Amendment for these listed individuals by February 10, 2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/6/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John M. Eubanks dated February 5, 2020 re: response to the Court's Order (ECF No. 5832) pertaining to Plaintiffs' proposed order for default judgment (ECF No. 5670). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: It is hereby; ORDERED that service of process was effected upon the Iran Defendants in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) for sovereign defendants and 28 U.S.C. 1608(b) for agencies and instrumentalities of sovereign defendants; ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., Case No. 15-cv-9903 (GBD)(SN), as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue, and it is ORDERED that the remaining Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages' for decedents pain and suffering from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: (5552 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 284 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XIV). filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/5/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jca)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (342 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5841 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (5836 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 338 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 341 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (339 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5838 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified in Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XX).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5838 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 339 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified in Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XX). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified in Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XX). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (335 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5833 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Default Judgment as to Economic-Loss Damages on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran Supplement 2).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5833 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 335 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Default Judgment as to Economic-Loss Damages on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran Supplement 2). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 335 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Default Judgment as to Economic-Loss Damages on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran Supplement 2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER with respect to (5662) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; with respect to (290) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN: In light of this discussion, and in light of the fact that this Court cannot identify whether each of the 616 decedents are represented by a plaintiff in this case, the plaintiffs are hereby directed to file an amended exhibit indicating the name of the individual plaintiff-who must be identified by name on either the 9/11 multidistrict litigation docket or on the member case docket-representing each listed decedent. In order for the plaintiffs to receive an order on their motion prior to the February 19, 2020 VSSTF deadline, plaintiffs should submit their amended exhibit no later than Thursday, February 6, 2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/4/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (333 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5819 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5816 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 330 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury 4).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B w/o exhibits, #3 Exhibit C w/o exhibits, #4 Exhibit D w/o exhibits)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5816 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 330 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury 4). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury 4). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Megan Elizabeth Buckley, Jennifer Joy Cherry, Christian C. Croner(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia V. Flounders, Spouse of 9/11 Decedent Joseph W. Flounders), Brian George Crotty, Brian D. Deming, Auguland Forbes, James Robert Foti, Sagil George, Sunny George, Amy P. Hargrave, Casey A. Hargrave, Corinne Elizabeth Hargrave, Daniel A. Meehan, Kathryn C. Meehan, Genevieve Mercurio, Karen Ann Miller, Edward Piskadlo, John Piskadlo, Jeannette Marie Puccio-Pick, Margaret Preston Woodwell, Richard Herron Woodwell, Jr...(Eubanks, John)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5805 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 325 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified in Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XIX).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C Under Seal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5805 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 325 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified in Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XIX). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified in Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XIX). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5798 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 321 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury III).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5798 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 321 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury III). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury III). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN.(Eubanks, John)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5361 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1115 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 491 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN, 265 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 532 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 83 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (5180 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1085 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Decision Establishing a Common Benefit Fund Solely in Favor of Havlish Co . Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Haefele, Robert)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 319 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 318 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (316 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5760 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury II).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5760 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 316 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury II). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury II). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Lee Oh on behalf of Auguland Forbes. (Oh, Michael)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5725 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 309 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Default Judgment as to Economic-Loss Damages on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran Supplement 1). *CORRECTED*. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 311 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5725 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 309 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Default Judgment as to Economic-Loss Damages on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran Supplement 1).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Under Seal ECF 5716))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5725 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 309 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Default Judgment as to Economic-Loss Damages on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran Supplement 1). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 309 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Default Judgment as to Economic-Loss Damages on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran Supplement 1). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5721 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 305 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XVIII).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (ECF 5716))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5721 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 305 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XVIII). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibits A and B (Burnett/Iran XVIII). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting (5698) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (299) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN; granting (38) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. All parties submitting exhibits that include economic loss calculations and reports, and exhibits containing confidential information in support of a declaration regarding a request for damages, may file them by disc with the Clerk of the Court to be maintained under seal. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. (ras)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5711 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 300 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury I).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5711 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 300 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury I). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion For Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Personal-Injury Plaintiffs (Burnett/Iran Personal Injury I). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document RE: exhibits to declarations filed in support of motions for judgment on behalf of individuals injured on September 11, 2001 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from John M. Eubanks dated January 21, 2020. Document filed by Arias Plaintiffs, Burnett Plaintiffs, Prior Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: (5433 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 269 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XV Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration, filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. For the foregoing reasons, plaintiffs should receive solatium damages as follows: (See document.) The solatium claims for Jessica Nardone Feldman should be DENIED under the principles established in Hoglan IV. Plaintiffs should also be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, through the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. See ECF No. 3358, adopted by, ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by the Court on this issue. Finally, any Burnett Plaintiffs not appearing in this motion and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), (d) (adding three additional days when service is made under Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(C), (D), or (F)). A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge George B. Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 2/4/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/21/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. ( ras)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (296 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5669 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (297 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5670 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Burnett/Iran XVI) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (291 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5663 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XVI).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Burnett/Iran XVI, #2 Exhibit B - Burnett/Iran XVI)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5662 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 290 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XVII).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (291 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5663 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XVI). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5662 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 290 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XVII). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XVI). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XVII). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Nicholas Benjamin Chirls, Colin Creamer, Nora Creamer, Lauren Mackay, Matthew Mackay. (Eubanks, John)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting (5511) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (280) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Burnett/Iran XIV) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5552 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 284 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XIV).. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Burnett/Iran XIV)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5552 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 284 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XIV). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs Identified at Exhibit A (Burnett/Iran XIV). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE of Amendment re: (53 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Joseph John Angelini, III, Julianne Carlene Farrelly, Noelle Brianna Maerz, Sean Patrick McGuire, Mara Morgan McGuire, Shea Elizabeth McGuire, Ryan Patrick McGuire, Jacqueline Angelini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (5513 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 282 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Related Document Number: 5511 . (Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5511 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 280 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION to Amend/Correct (53 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MOTION to Amend/Correct (53 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Rachel W. Glavis, Danielle Marie Spinelli, Nicole Lauren Spinelli, Constance Myer Taylor, Thea Megan Trinidad, Timothy Michael Trinidad, Cynthia Veling, Kevin Veling, Ryan Veling, Savannah Rose Vicario, Sonja M. Vukosa, Amy Sarah Warchola, Gregory John White, Eleanor McCullough Woodwell. (Eubanks, John)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Dana Henry Gargano, Elaina Simpson Grant, Kelly Holmes, Christopher James Quackenbush, Kelsey Newsome Quackenbush, Whitney Strine Quackenbush, Peter Matthew Raimondi, Philip W. Raimondi, Daniel Rall, Joseph Rall, Matthew Rall, Hunter Everett Roberts, Jonathan Robert Shay, Ryan Patrick Shay, Robert John Shay, III, Leeann M. Simpson, Maxwell James Simpson, Blakeslee Elizabeth Snyder, Leland Snyder, Joyce Speisman, Seymour Speisman, Steven Speisman, Christopher Francis Spinelli, Traci Lee Viklund, Terri Weltman. (Eubanks, John)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Marianne Katherine Carpenter, Diane Majtan, Madilynn E. Morris, Jessica Ann Moskal, Rosanne Nelson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Caitlin Nelson, Child of 9/11 Decedent James Nelson), Anna Pansini, Claire Pansini, Paul Jack Pansini, Catherine Mary Papa, Kathleen Christine Papa, Margaret Kathleen Papa, Michael Papa, Michelle Rivera Papa, Julia Amelia Perconti, Anthony Joseph Picerno, Joseph Arthur Pinto, Nicholas Douglas Pinto, Erika Leigh Piver, Anthony Pullis, Edward Pullis, Maria Frances Pullis, Brianna Puma, Dylan Puma, Kiefer Puma, Elizabeth Papa Simons. (Eubanks, John)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Karelia A. Barahona, Linda Marie Fanene, John Joseph Fiorito, Anna Mae Froehner, Elizabeth Petrone Hatton, Jackson Sharp Hord, Molly Williams Hord, Sophie McCullough Hord, Toland Curry Lawrence, Jennifer Lauren Laychak, Zachary David Laychak, Patricia Madden Lezynski, Kristen Marie Lugano, Cassidy McCabe, Liam Patrick McCabe, Regan Grace McCabe, Dorell Froehner McNamara, Dylan Ross Meltzer, Jacob Andrew Meltzer, Joseph Mercurio, Colton James Miller, Curt James Miller, Hayley Shaw Morris, Kyle B. Morris, Gwen Opfell. (Eubanks, John)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jacqueline Angelini, Joseph John Angelini, III, Rita Baeszler, Frank Barbosa, Isiah RaShon Batey, Mary Kathleen Buckley, Michele Anne Buckley, Conor Cahill, Fiona Cahill, Brian J. Callahan, Riley Eileen Casey, Dylan S. Chirls, Nicholas Benjamin Chirls, Anthony Robert Cirri, Robert Cirri, Jr., Jessica Cirri-Perez, Colin Creamer, Nora Creamer, David Gerard Crotty, Jason Matthew Dahl, Jr., Georgia Rose Dipasquale, Christopher Graham Dunstan, Constantine Leon Economos, Katherine Audrey Economos, Andrea Wanner. (Eubanks, John)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 274 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jodi Westbrook Flowers dated January 10, 2020 re: brief regarding USVSSTF personal injury claims as discussed during the telephonic conference on December 13, 2019. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Flowers, Jodi)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 5028 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Entry of Partial Final Default Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Non-Immediate Family Members (Burnett X). Plaintiffs should receive solatium damages as follows: (See document.) The solatium claims for Rebecca Chang should be DENIED under the principles established in Hoglan IV. Plaintiffs should also be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, through the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. See ECF No. 3358, adopted by, ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by the Court on this issue. Finally, any Burnett Plaintiffs not appearing in this motion and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), (d) (adding three additional days when service is made under Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(C), (D), or (F)). A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 1/24/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/10/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5433 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 269 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XV Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration.. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5433 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 269 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XV Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration. . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XV Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re USVSST Fund, ECF Nos. 5338 and 5390 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Megan W. Benett dated 01/02/2020. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Benett, Megan)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jodi Westbrook Flowers dated December 20, 2019 re: scope of personal injury claims that might move for final judgment against Iran. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Flowers, Jodi)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Megan W. Benett dated 12/17/2019 re: in response to Court's 12/6/2019 Order (ECF No. 5338) providing proposed uniform judgments. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Benett, Megan)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MOTION for Reconsideration re; (5180 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1085 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Decision Establishing a Common Benefit Fund Solely in Favor of Havlish Counsel. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a parent or child of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/13/2019) (jwh)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (260 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5345 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XIII Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (260 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5345 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XIII Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration. . Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XIII Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John) Modified on 12/13/2019 (jwh).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Debra J. Anderson, Alexandra Blackwell, Ryan Blackwell, Samantha Blackwell, Alysha Audrey Bonheur, Marcus Paul Bonheur, Debra Ann Cameron, Christopher Randolph Campbell, Timothy William Campbell, James Coughlan, Carolyne Y. Hynes(on behalf of minor child O.T.H., Child of 9/11 Decedent Thomas Edward Hynes), Francisco Miguel Lopez, Lindsay K. Martini, Kenneth George Murphy, Alyson Rose Murray, Adam Rodrigues, Sara Rodrigues, Jenna L. Taormina, Meghan J. Taormina. (Eubanks, John)
November 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jodi Westbrook Flowers on behalf of The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committee for Personal Injury and Death Claims dated November 28, 2019 re: Status letter pursuant to Magistrate Judge Netburn's Order of November 21, 2019 regarding anticipated motions related to Iran in light of the passage of Title VII of Public Law 116-69 (Nov. 21, 2019). Document filed by All Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Flowers, Jodi)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Christopher S. Washington, Devin T. Washington, Malik Ziaire Washington, Christopher Waters, Daniel Waters. (Eubanks, John)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Gail Marie Callahan, Tara O'Keefe Kurella, Stella Lombardo, Darby Anne McHugh, Eileen Higgins McHugh, Michael Edward McHugh, Sr., Edward Joseph Murphy, Robert Edward Murphy, Sean Michael Murphy, Anne Nelson, Ian L. Pescaia, Lauren Saraniti, Kathleen McNeal Sheeler, Eleanor Stice, Christian B. Suarez, Kara P. Sutcliffe, Margaret Sutcliffe, Margaret Sutcliffe, Kelly Michelle Talty, Lauren Nicole Talty, Paul Richard Talty, Jr., Richard Tipaldi, Jr., William Addison Todd, III, Sarah O'Brien Van Oudenaren. (Eubanks, John)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jacob Joseph Campbell, Cindy Carlson, Neva Rae Coleman, Vaughn McGwire Coleman, Lindsay Judith Cook, Sophia Christine Cook, Anthony D. Fiumefreddo, Daniella Giammona, Francesca Giammona, Nicolette Giammona, ToniAnn Giammona, Amanda Rose Gullickson, Isabel Leah Gullickson, Joseph Paul Hashem, Tatiana Hernandez, Rosemarie Hoesly, Christa Leigh Horrocks, Michael Alan Horrocks, Martha Lopez, Susie Levet Lopez, Jack Walker Maler, Marina Denise Paulie, Rosa Maria Ramirez, Libbet Ann Ward. (Eubanks, John)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER: On November 1, 2019, Plaintiffs filed three Notices of Amendment pursuant to the Court's July 10, 2018 Order. ECF Nos. 25153. Plaintiffs are reminded that the July 2018 Order was superseded in its entirety on October 28, 2019. See No. 03-MD-01570, ECF No. 5234. In the future, any notices to conform, short form complaints, or notices of amendment should be filed in accordance with the October 28, 2019 Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/4/2019) (ras)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charlotte B. Smith, Margaret S. Smith, Casey Ann Spor, George E. Talhami, Jake Elias Talhami, Noah Talhami, Sean Tirado, Erin Elizabeth Wholey, Meagan Rose Wholey, Patrick Thomas Wholey, Joseph R. Zarba. (Eubanks, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Alfred Royce Maler, Michael Mangano, Philip Mangano, Jonathan Marrero, Jesse A. Matuza, Nico S. Matuza, Walter Philip Matuza, Kate Marie McAvoy, Kevin James McAvoy, Jeannine Marie McIntyre, Mary L. Middleton, Hayley Murach, Madison Murach, Morgan Shay Murphy, James Thomas Murphy, Jr., Kaitlin O'Keefe, Dillon Scott Reisman, Kasey Michelle Reisman, Lynnette Rivera, Isaias Rivera, Jr.. (Eubanks, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles Bunker Coombs, III, Dana M. Corey, Finbarr Coughlan, Nicholas J. Curioli, Ann Curti, Carter Dack, Olivia Dack, Caralyn Marie Fitzpatrick, Davin Richard Garcia, Dylan Peter Garcia, Connor Thomas Ginley, Taylor Ginley, Mark Herencia, Judith A. Keane, William Lee Krukowski, Seelochini Liriano(on behalf of minor child F.L., Child of 9/11 Decedent Francisco Alberto Liriano), Jordan Lyles, Justin Andrew Lyles, John Ryan Lynch, Michael F. Lynch, Jr.. (Eubanks, John)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER TO WITHDRAW BENJAMIN D. MARGO AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: It is ORDERED that Benjamin D. Margo be withdrawn as counsel for the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia in the above-referenced action. (Attorney Benjamin David Margo.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (jwh)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (5028) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (205) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Warren Irwin Fiedel, Patricia M. Greene-Wotton, Lorna Kaye, Robert Kobus(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leokadia Kobus, Parent of 9/11 Decedent Deborah Kobus), Lucille Lennon, Noreen V. McDonough, Cynthia Sue Sumner(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl Max Hammond, Sr., Parent of 9/11 Decedent Carl Max Hammond, Jr.), Anne Rose Thompson, Henry Walker, Samantha Walker, Marina Wang, Raymond Wang, Richard Wang, Arthur S. Wildman, Jr., Dorothea Jean Wotton, Emily Virginia Wright, Robert John Wright, John Wayne Wright, III, Mariam Adel Zakhary. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ina Leventhal, Melissa Prevey, Cheryl Rindbrand, Amanda Tempesta, Matthew Tempesta, Davon Tirado, Denzel Tirado, Omaira Tirado, Roberto Anthony Tirado, Brian Francis Travers, Elyse Virginia Travers, Kevin Travers, Christopher Scott Vadas, Alyssa N. Valentin, Danyelle Valentin, Jailene A. Valentin, Paul Edward Van Laere, Kevin Robert Vargas, Leslie Michelle Vargas, Christopher Walker, Rita Marie Wiley. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Kerri Kelly, Elise A. Lasko, Robert Appleton Lawrence III, Brian Leavey, Caitlin Leavey, Angela F. Lee, Kellie Lee, Allen H. Liu, Austin H. Liu, Christopher Joseph Maffeo, Lisa Mahon, Michael Alfred Maler Jr., Jenna L. Marrero, Jodi A. Marrero(Child of 9/11 Decedent Jose Marrero), Jordan C. Marrero, Michelle Mathai, Andrew Michael McCarthy, Stephanie Marie McCarthy, Christopher Robert Sodano, David Spivock Jr.. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Emma Scandole, Katie Scandole, Jeanette DeVito Schardt, Dina Marie Schott, Gabriella Scibetta, Vincenzo P. Scibetta, Angel Marie Scott, Caitlin Marie Spor, Colleen Casey Spor, Shannon Catherine Spor, Joseph Spor, III, Stacey A. Staub(on behalf of minor child J-C.S., Child of 9/11 Decedent Craig William Staub), Kaitlyn Claire Strada, Terry Strada, Patricia A. Straine(on behalf of minor child C.J.S., Child of 9/11 Decedent James J. Straine, Jr.), Briana Suhr, Conor Lawrence Sullivan, Dermot Joseph Sullivan, Kadijah Imani Sutton, Kyle Jamal Sutton. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hasani Houston, Aiden Huczko, Cullen Huczko, Katelyn Ann Huczko, Liam James Huczko, Matthew Anthony Jovic, Peter Thomas Jovic, Susan K. Keasler, Colleen Elizabeth Kerwin, Keith Walter Kerwin, Ryan Thomas Kerwin, Alexander Zhang Lam, Benjamin Zhang Lam, Nicholas Joshua Lanza, Brenda Larsen, Marisa Larsen, Scott Brian Larsen, Carolann Larsen (on behalf of minor child A.L., Child of 9/11 Decedent Scott Larsen), Mary Denise Lum, Katherine Pereira. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Christine Nippes, Philip Anthony Petti, Alexis Pietronico, Joseph B. Pietronico, Jordyn B. Pykon, Kevin Quinn, Anthony Salvatore Ragaglia, Leonard John Ragaglia, Jr., Jillian M. Raines, Kimberly Raines, Kyle C. Raines, Liam Matthew Raub, Rebecca Anne Raub, Lisa Ann Reina, Jeffrey Roberts, Rachel Susan Rothenberg, Danica Taylor Ruhalter, Marc Antoni Sanchez, Tiana Marie Argia Santore, Sujoy Sarkar. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ashley Goldflam Bisman, Lauren M. Cuttone, Jackson A. Fyfe, Haven A. Fyfe-Kiernan, Jacqueline S. Gavagan(on behalf of minor child C.L.G., Child of 9/11 Decedent Donald R. Gavagan, Jr.), Lara Suzanne Gavagan, Donald Richard Gavagan III, Nolan Sebastian Glascoe, Owen Alexander Glascoe, Katherine Grace Gorayeb, Anthony Domiano Guzzardo Sr., Brian Thomas Harlin, Christopher Edward Harlin, Katherine Marie Harlin, Kiersten Haub, Michael A. Haub, Alicia Marie Hofer, Hannah Houston, Veronica Andrea Squef, Theresa Velardi. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Derek Michael O'Brien, Kevin Patrick O'Brien, Sarah O'Brien, Patrick O'Hagan, Pierce O'Hagan, Jill Oakley, Noah D. Olsen, Tori R. Olsen, Katherine Orgielewicz, Amanda Ortiz, Emily Ortiz, Christopher Otten, Jason Otten, Jonathan Otten, Sarita E. Packer, Constantina Maria Paris, Lucy Belle Paterson, Wyatt James Paterson, Vincent Tranchina, Lauren Verhey. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Barry Patrick Driscoll, Kerry Ann Egan, Sean Christopher Egan, Denise M. Farrelly, Brian Tyler Fersini, Christopher Michael Fersini, Katelyn Elizabeth Fersini, Thomas Jeffrey Fersini, John Corley Fischer, Timothy Rudolph Fischer, Sarah Mary Fisher, Heather Anne Froehner, Kathleen Marie Froehner, Matthew John Froehner, Meghan Elizabeth Froehner, Paul James Furmato Jr., Stephanie Leigh Kernasovic, Laura Jean Nemeth, George Sayegh Jr.. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by John Vincent Cuccinello, Lauren Nicole Meisenheimer Fletcher, Brigid A. McDonald, Kathleen E. McDonald, Katharine Ann McDonnell, Katherine McGovern, Carolyne S. McGuinn, Elizabeth F. McGuinn, Christian S. McHugh, Connor J. McHugh, Michael E. McHugh, III, Caitlyn McIntyre, Donald James McIntyre, Jr., Kaitlynn Meisenheimer, Carl E. Molinaro, Sabrina Rose Molinaro, Richard Louis Montano, Jr., Nancy Niedermeyer, Jonathan Daniel Nolan, Kaitlyn Renee Nolan. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jonathan Hunter Charette, Lauren Casey Charette, Jasen Checo, Julian Checo, Sydney Rose Chirls, Delaney Colaio-Coppola, Joseph Colaio-Coppola, Alison Joy Coppola, Paul A. Curioli, Frank D'Amadeo, Jerry D'Amadeo, Michael D'Amadeo, Vincent D'Amadeo, Patrick Grady, Bianca Isabel Jerez, Kara Lydia Jerez, Julian Ann Lizzul, Rhonda McCleary, Brittany R. Oelschlager, Kayla R. Oelschlager. (Eubanks, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jennifer Angelini, Anteh John Aryee, Marina Bakalinskaya, Natalie Bakalinskaya, Theresa N. Beekman, Robert J. Bernstein(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Norma Bernstein, Deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent William Bernstein), Robert J. Bernstein(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Murray Bernstein, Deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent William Bernstein), Monique Bird, Danielle Marie Booker, Denzel Cameron Booker, Sean Booker Jr., Kevin Lewis Bowser, Pharr Ayn Bowser, Courtney Brown, John Joseph Burke Jr., Andrew Denton Charette, Michael Giordano, Dina Marie Morton, Brandice Williams, Courtney Lizabeth Acquaviva. (Eubanks, John)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a parent or child of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $8,500,000 per parent and $8,500,000 per child, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (jwh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (5150 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 234 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (231 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5147 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XII Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to Eubanks Declaration.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Burnett/Iran XII)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (231 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5147 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XII Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to Eubanks Declaration. . Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XII Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to Eubanks Declaration. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A, It is hereby; ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/10/2019) (kv)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (229 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5108 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Thomas Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5105 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 226 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XI Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Thomas Arias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Burnett/Iran XI)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5105 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 226 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XI Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration. . Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran XI Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 STATUS REPORT. Letter to Judge Daniels and Magistrate Judge Netburn in re: Memo Endorsement found at ECF No. 5044 Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each the estate of a victim of the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as set forth in Exhibit A; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/6/2019) (jwh)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/6/2019) (jwh)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (220 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5086 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Notice to attorney John Eubanks to RE-FILE Document No. (5077 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 219 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the proposed order is not correct, Exhibit A missing; ADD EXHIBIT A, then, Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Default Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders. - select the correct filer/filers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 9/5/2019 (dt).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (216 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5074 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran IX Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Angela Houtz)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (216 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5074 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran IX Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration. . Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran IX Plaintiffs Set Forth on Exhibit A to the Eubanks Declaration. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting (5013) Motion to Substitute Attorney, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (203) Motion to Substitute Attorney, in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting (5010) Motion to Substitute Attorney, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (202) Motion to Substitute Attorney, in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting (5006) Motion to Substitute Attorney, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 CORRECTED ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: It is hereby; ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a parent or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue, and it is ORDERED that the these plaintiffs and the remaining Burnett Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, to the extent such awards have not previously been addressed, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages for conscious pain and suffering of decedents from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(mro)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: It is hereby; ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue, and it is ORDERED that the remaining Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages' for decedents pain and suffering from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(mro)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (20 in 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 204 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5018 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN) Letter, filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has received the Burnett Plaintiffs' letter. At this time, the Court does not believe a telephonic conference is necessary to expedite the resolution of the pending motions. Since August, Plaintiffs in this multi-district litigation have collectively filed dozens of motions for partial final judgment. The Court will address these motions in due course but may not be able to act on motions filed weeks ago by a September 13 deadline. The Court, however, has some concern regarding the timeliness of new claims filed in 2019. Accordingly, the Burnett Plaintiffs shall file a status letter by Friday, September 6, 2019, addressing the timeliness of Plaintiffs' claims under the applicable statute of limitations, particularly those added through a Notice of Amendment in July and August of 2019. The Burnett Plaintiffs are directed to meet-and-confer with counsel for the Ashton and O'Neil Plaintiffs, who have filed similar motions for partial final judgment. To the extent the parties disagree on a particular point, they may file separate letters. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 09/03/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. (ras)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (5031 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 208 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (5035 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 212 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (209 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5032 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Entry of Partial Final Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran 9/11 Decedent Estate Claimants (Burnett VIII).. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Plaintiff List, #2 Ex. B - William Cashman Report, #3 Ex. C - Bud Flagg Report, #4 Ex. D - Dee Flagg Report, #5 Ex. E - James Hayden Report, #6 Ex. F - Natalie Lasden Report, #7 Ex. G - Judith Larocque Report, #8 Ex. H - Maclovio Lopez, Jr. Report, #9 Ex. I - Hilda Marcin Report, #10 Ex. J - Dora Menchaca Report, #11 Ex. K - Nicole Carol Miller Report, #12 Ex. L - Shawn Nassaney Report, #13 Ex. M - John Ogonowski Report, #14 Ex. N - Donald Peterson Report, #15 Ex. O - Jesus Sanchez Report, #16 Ex. P - Christine Snyder Report, #17 Ex. Q - Mary Alice Wahlstrom Report, #18 Ex. R - Kristen White-Gould Report)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (209 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5032 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Entry of Partial Final Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran 9/11 Decedent Estate Claimants (Burnett VIII). . Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Entry of Partial Final Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran 9/11 Decedent Estate Claimants (Burnett VIII). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (5028 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 205 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Entry of Partial Final Default Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Non-Immediate Family Members (Burnett X).. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Plaintiff List, #2 Ex. B - Dec. of Deborah Barrett, #3 Ex. C - Dec. of Theresa Bevilacqua, #4 Ex. D. - Dec. of Susann Carol Brady, #5 Ex. E - Dec. of Rebecca Chang, #6 Ex. F - Dec. of Douglas Cleary, #7 Ex. G - Dec. of Cheryl Cooper, #8 Ex. H - Dec. of Mary Coughlin, #9 Ex. I - Dec. of Margaret Cruz, #10 Ex. J - Dec. of John Cuccinello, #11 Ex. K - Dec. of William Dietrich, #12 Ex. L - Dec. of Robert Giallombardo, #13 Ex. M - Dec. of Veronica Glascoe, #14 Ex. N - Dec. of Lisa Goldberg-McWilliams, #15 Ex. O - Dec. of Lydeda Grant, #16 Ex. P - Dec. of Anthony Newsome, #17 Ex. Q - Dec. of Monica Ianelli, #18 Ex. R - Dec. of Frank Jensen, #19 Ex. S - Dec. of Kerri Kelly, #20 Ex. T - Dec. of Ina Leventhal, #21 Ex. U - Dec. of Camille Nicole Martin, #22 Ex. V - Dec. of Chelsea Rhea McCarthy, #23 Ex. W - Dec. of Rhonda McCleary, #24 Ex. X - Dec. of Noreen McDonough, #25 Ex. Y - Dec. of Vincent Milotta, #26 Ex. Z - Dec. of Catherine Nolan, #27 Ex. AA - Dec. of Gina Pinos, #28 Ex. BB - Dec. of Cheryl Rinbrand, #29 Ex. CC - Dec. of Silveria Segura, #30 Ex. DD - Dec. of Patricia Skic, #31 Ex. EE - Dec. of Jose Franco-Suarez, #32 Ex. FF - Dec. of Joscelyn Franco-Suarez)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (205 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5028 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Entry of Partial Final Default Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Non-Immediate Family Members (Burnett X). . Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Entry of Partial Final Default Judgment on Behalf of Burnett/Iran Non-Immediate Family Members (Burnett X). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John M. Eubanks dated 8/28/2019 re: Judgments in Iran litigation. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: John Michael Eubanks and Robert Turner Haefele, New Attorney: Dennis G. Pantazis Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel. Document filed by John Casazza, Spouse Doe AP18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Pantazis, Dennis)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: John Michael Eubanks and Robert Turner Haefele, New Attorney: Dennis G. Pantazis Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel. Document filed by Jacob Kleinberg, Lauren Kleinberg, Sam Kleinberg, Spouse Doe AP15. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Pantazis, Dennis)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: John Michael Eubanks and Robert Turner Haefele, New Attorney: Dennis G. Pantazis Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel. Document filed by Spouse Doe AP20, Matthew Van Auken, Sarah Van Auken. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Pantazis, Dennis)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (4896 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 200 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs. (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (197 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 4893 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran Judgment VII.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (197 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 4893 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran Judgment VII. . Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran Judgment VII. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903, Burnett Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Irene Lyons-Loeffler(on behalf of minor child P.M.L., Child of 9/11 Decedent Patrick John Lyons), Michael Alfred Maler, Jr., Samuel K. Maltby, Michael Jesse Martinez, Angelina Nicole Massaroli, Michael Cesare Massaroli, Paige Elizabeth Mastrandrea, Sydney Kristen Mastrandrea, Sarah Ryan McWilliams, Richard Louis Montano, Andrew Robert Moskal, Hannah Murphy, An Ho-Ngoc Nguyen, Christine Lee Nieves, Patricia Nilsen, Connor Daniel O'Callaghan, Rhiannon Rose O'Callaghan, Kia Polyxena Pavloff, Tammy Perconti(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucia Perconti, Parent of 9/11 Decedent Jon A. Perconti), Denise M. Tracey. (Eubanks, John)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Debra Foxx, Sam E. Kleinberg, Marci Kleinberg-Bandelli, Marla Parker. (Eubanks, John)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Notice of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ayitey Aryee, Ayikaile Aryee, Richard Lavern Booms Jr., John Joseph Burke Jr., Jeffrey S. Cangialosi, Peter T. Cangialosi, Jan M. Carstanjen, Delaney Colaio, Joseph Colaio, Neva Rae Coleman, Vaughn McGwire Coleman, Barbara Jean Cotter, Linda Dickinson-Pancila, Dylan Michael Grady, Kayla Patricia Grady, Jacob R. Kleinberg, Lauren N. Kleinberg, Lillian Maria O'Malley, Alexandra Ashley Wisniewski, Christopher James Zarba. (Eubanks, John)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Dannette Nicole Fortin, Anthony Christopher Guzzardo, John Alexander Hayden, Jennifer Hernandez, Stephanie Marie Hernandez, Tatiana Hernandez, Francis Matthew Hoffman, John William Hoffman, Amanda Lucia Hughes, Zoe Alexa Jacobs, Mazalee Morgan Keene, Ameiza Khan, Elizabeth Kaitlin Klucznik, Lawrence Irving Ksido, Carl Phillip Kumpel, Gregory James Kumpel, Robert Appleton Lawrence, III, Bryan C. Longing, Joseph Juaquin Lopez, Mary Denise Lum, Shaneeza Periana-Pillai. (Eubanks, John)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of Notice of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Janice L. Booth, Janice L. Booth, Noreen V. McDonough, Tyreek Dexter Nurse, Krystal Marie Oliva, Karen E. Renzo, Karen E. Renzo, Robert Sherry, Jerrald Smith, Kathy R. Stahlman, Daniel C. Stern, Kaitlyn Claire Strada, Thomas Joseph Strada, Christian M. Sullins, Julian A. Sullins, Pamela Mercene Tamayo, Christopher Lee Teague, James Stephen Teague, Tanya Villanueva Tepper, Matthew D. Van Auken, Sarah B. Van Auken, Jonathan Paul Wisniewski. (Eubanks, John)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Paula Mary Carucci, Jacqueline DiVirgilio, William H. Doyle, Barry Patrick Driscoll, David Eugene Eschenbaum, Joseph Anthony Fava, Shannon Marie Fergus, David John Ferrugio, Gina Marie Ferrugio-Hooker, Craig Fiedel, Lindsey Beth Fiedel, Allan James Filipov, David Michael Filipov, Jeffrey Thomas Filipov, Julia Sylvie Gardner, Michael James Gardner, Larissa Lynne Gay, Gillian Gogliormella, Janice Lucille Kurtz, Stephen A. Siller. (Eubanks, John)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Notice of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Sarah Elizabeth Dietrich, Francesca Marie Picerno, Matthew Michael Picerno, Genna Rose Plumitallo, Joseph Frank Plumitallo, Lisa Grace Plumitallo, David Alan Pykon, Elena Yuryevna Rapoport, Matthew Thomas Renda, Daniel Alexander Roberts, Michael Leo Roberts, Taylor Nicole Roberts, Ethan Agustus Rocha, Susan S. Rosenblum, Sara Jan Rothenberg, Ethan Myles Ruhalter, Charles Thomas Sabella, Charles Thomas Sabella, Jessica Frances Scott, Rebecca Elizabeth Scott. (Eubanks, John)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (189 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 4792 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Related Document Number: 4790 . (Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (187 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 4790 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Amend/Correct (4712 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Order,,,,,,, . . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION to Amend/Correct (4712 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Order,,,,,,, . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting (4698) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (180) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 08/09/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN. (ras)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OFBURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: It is hereby; ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue, and it is ORDERED that the remaining Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages' for decedents pain and suffering from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/29/2019) (ks)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/29/2019) (jwh)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 LETTERS ROGATORY (Doc. #4702) ISSUED July 25, 2019, as to Cathy Hawara Assistant Commissioner, Appeal Canada Rvenue Agency, Connaught Building, 555 MacKenzie Avenue, 7the Floor, Ottawa, Ontario in Canada. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Related Document Number: 4698 . (Eubanks, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (180 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 4698 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Amend/Correct ECF No. 53 in Burnett v. Islamic Republic of Iran, No. 15-CV-9903 (GBD)(SN). . Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION to Amend/Correct ECF No. 53 in Burnett v. Islamic Republic of Iran, No. 15-CV-9903 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mary Jane Edgar, Helen Jean Feola, Helen Jean Feola, William Allison Osterholm, Lindsay Grace Tighe, Arlene A. Tipping-Cestari, Maureen Tipping-Lipshie, Hector Tirado, III, Ronald Jaquan Tirado, Elijah Zane Titus, Zachery Ian Titus, Shanoa Dawn Titus-Poston, Douglas Vialonga, Michael B. Vitale, Austin A. Vukosa, Phillip Andrew Wahlstrom, Maria Catherine Waring, Alissa Loriann Weiss, Michael Paul Weiss. (Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jennifer Teague Ayers, Lisa S. Burch, Vincent A. Milotta, Lawrence A. Rosenblum, Ruth Anne Rosenblum, Helen Rosenthal, Andrea Sacerdote, Jennifer Salas, Juan Luis Salas, Steven Scarpitta, Christina Lyn Serva, Edward Sparacio, Jack Sparacio, Jr, Lauren Stabile, Edward C. Stajk, Barbara H. Stern, Emma Florence Stern, Michael H. Stern, Larry J. Temple, Laura Jean Troccoli. (Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Maria R. Alfano, Nancy Brady, Graig Aaron Olcott, Mary Olsen Olesky, Todd Keith Olsen, Cynthia A. Olsen-Dinkins, Ryan Orgielewicz, Thomas Orgielewicz, Ronald J. Palazzolo, Joan Pecoraro, David S. Peterson, Gina Pinos, Steven John Piskadlo, Louis Joseph Plumitallo, Jr, Adam Quinn, Stephen Anthony Ragaglia, Sanjay Raju, Soniya Susan Raju, Adam Mark Rosenblum, Phyllis Frances Volpe. (Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Rebecca Chang, Douglas C. Cleary, Annemarie D'Emic, Patrick James Hashem, Ryan Allen Hayes, Sean Bernard Heeran, William Heeran, David C. Hemschoot, Jeffrey W. Hemschoot, Derrick J. Hobin, Lyndsey Hughes, Patrick Thomas Hughes, Michael R. Kasper, Bernadette McCann, Monica Palatucci, Margaret Anne Pettus, Ashley Rose Reid, Melissa White, Harlan Gene Yancey. (Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Imani Marie Dorsey, Jaryd Alexander Dorsey, Thomas James Hart, Sr, Jacqueline Menchaca Karastamatis, Clare Regina Mayer, Michelle Ann McNulty, Richard Thomas McNulty, Enid Medina, Ignacia R. Menchaca, John J. Menchaca, Jose Menchaca, Jr, Mark Anthony Menchaca, Nancy Jo Menchaca, Christine Mitchell, Brian Charles Niederer, Marilyn Niederer, Juan Nieves, John Joseph O'Hagan, Christopher Graig Olcott, Sara Ann Schultz. (Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Kenneth G. Calewarts, Hanifa Donbalic, Christine Marie Galard, Roman Gertsberg(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anna Gertsberg, Deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Marina Romanovna Gertsberg), Mason Moseley Gilbey, Maxwell Thornton Gilbey, Bekim Gjonbalaj, Selim Gjonbalaj, Gary S. Graifman, Danielle Tiffany Green, Michael J. Greenstein, James Thomas Gregory, Michael Halderman, Steve Halderman, Christopher Paul Hashem, Debra Ann Lauro, Shkurta Nikaj, Christine Olsen, Kristie Lynn Perrotta, Sara E. Walling. (Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Roman Anthony, Maureen Rose Baumgartel, Kathleen McGovern DeCasper, Robert J Lunder, Natalia Lygina, Ashley Nicole Lynch, Kevin Thomas Lynch, Thomas Christopher Lynch, Mark Loomis Madden, Mark Loomis Madden, Christine Marie Marlo-Triemstra, Sean Thomas McCann, Chelsea McCarthy, Thomas Walter McDonnell, Danielle McGuinn, Michael J. McHugh, Bridgette Ann McNulty, Maryellen McCarthy Rice, Courtney Erin Sosna, Karen McCarthy Toomey. (Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Joan Cuneo, Anthony Joseph D'Atri, Michael Edward D'Atri, Jalin Danielle Debeuneure, Anthony DiFato, John DiFato, Nicole DiFato, Erin R. Dickinson, Shannon Marie Fergus, Thomas Fergus, Minnie Domenica Ferro, Elsa Sue Fisher, Jason Lee Foo, Samantha Lee Foo, David Konigsberg, Kristen Lima, Christine Ann Norris, Caroline Parks, Elizabeth Parks, Gail Marie Silke. (Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Deborah L. Barrett, Paul Kevin Burke, Terence Patrick Burke, Anna Clare Burnett, Halley Elizabeth Burnett, Madison Margaret Burnett, Michael Albert Caggiano, Albert E. Caggiano, Jr., Brett Cahill, Christine Kathryn Cochet, Dineen Ann Connolly, John Patrick Connolly, Patrick Liam Craig Connolly, Mischele Ann Crew-Williams, John Crisci, Alicia Ann Fitzgerald, Serena Giovi, Jessica Nardone, Cheryl Lynn O'Brien, Erin Ryan. (Eubanks, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Antonio Agnello, Jeremy Asher, Rachel Asher, Gila Barzvi(Personal Representative of the Estate of Arie Barzvi, Deceased, Parent of 9/11 Decedent Guy Barzvi), Steven A. Bernstein, Christopher D. Betterly, Matthew H. Booms, Thomas Edward Booms, Mary Ann Brennan, Meghan J. Brethel, Kelsey Coventry Buchanan, Lindsay S. Buchanan, Kevin Michael Burke, Charles Gavin McNulty, Catherine M. Nolan, Daniel A. Walisiak, Joel Avi Willcher, Shelby Tyler Williams, Santi Yambem, Brian Eric Yarnell. (Eubanks, John)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Mamdouh Mahmud Salim for October 8, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Wadith elHage for October 7, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Eubanks, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 DECLARATION of John M. Eubanks in Support re: (4662 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 164 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran wrongful death plaintiffs.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (4662 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 164 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran wrongful death plaintiffs. (Burnett/Iran VI). Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran wrongful death plaintiffs. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Eubanks, John)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (4561) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(lb)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom., (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy B. Fleming, #2 Exhibit Havlish Public Comments on USVSST Fund interpretations 6.29.16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Eubanks on behalf of Robert Abraham, Wayne Abrahams, James Abreu, John Actisdano, Cynthia Adam, Thomas Adams, Karl Aepelbacher, Joseph Agri, Vicki Anderson, Eric Ando, Thomas Arias, Claudio Barrera, Burnett Plaintiffs, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., John Odland, Elizabeth Parks, Gerard Prior. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Eubanks, John)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting (854) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; granting (4354) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (630) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; granting (160) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; granting (15) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; granting (13) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN; granting (11) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN; granting (7) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (14 in 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN, 630 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 160 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN, 13 in 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN, 7 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN, 854 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 4354 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN, 11 in 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN, 15 in 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN) MOTION for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16194547. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16194547. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Abraham, Wayne Abrahams, James Abreu, John Actisdano, Cynthia Adam, Thomas Adams, Karl Aepelbacher, Joseph Agri, Vicki Anderson, Eric Ando, Thomas Arias, Claudio Barrera, Burnett Plaintiffs, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., John Odland, Elizabeth Parks, Gerard Prior. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Michael Eubanks, #2 Proposed Order for Admission pro hac vice of John Michael Eubanks)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Anne B. Adams, Patricia Anne Skic, Gonzalo A. Hidalgo, Lucy Williamson. (Haefele, Robert)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Emem U. Adanga, Nene U. Adanga, Esang U. Adanga. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Blayney P. McEneaney. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Peter M. York, Alexander Zangrilli, Nicholas M. Zangrilli, Alan Zukelman, Nathaniel K. Holland. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Nicole Ventura, James V. Vigiano, John Vigiano, Joseph J. Vigiano, Ellen Vignola, Sarah C. Vignola, Adam Vukosa, Bradley M. Walz, Jamie Waring, Jessica M. Waring, Stephanie Waring, Allison M. Waters, Charles E. Waters, Jaclyn I. Waters, Barbara L. Werner, Matthew Whitford, Timothy Whitford, Jessica Williamson, Marc Williamson, Patrick E. York. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Eric T. Sparacio, Jonathan P. Sparacio, Andrew R. Stadelberger, Allison Stahlman, Jacob Stahlman, Finn P. Straine, Amanda C. Stuart, Anna E. Sweeney, Jack M. Sweeney, Alana Tartaro, Andrew C. Tartaro, Danielle Tartaro, Alexis M. Thorpe, Michael J. Tighe, Patrick J. Tighe, Sydney Timmes, Corinne Varacchi, Thomas Varacchi, Tyler Varacchi, Jessica Ventura. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Rishi Parmar, Shamir Parmar, Michele Puckett-Formolo, Robert J. Rasmussen, Samuel R. Rasmussen, Taylor M. Rasmussen, Emma Rathkey, Ian Rathkey, Matthew Rathkey, Jessica Rogers, Christopher Schardt, Robert Schardt(Child of 9/11 Decedent John Schardt), Alexandra Nicole Scott, James Sherry, John Sherry, Genevieve E. Siller, Jake A. Siller, Katherine M. Siller, Olivia A. Siller, Bradford William Smith. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Diane Lynn Martinez, Katelyn Marut, Brian McDonnell, Kevin M. McDonnell, Chloe B. McHugh, Joseph M. McHugh, Sophia J. McHugh, Michele C. Melendez, Kelsie S. Minor, Christa A. Montano, Liam F. Montano, Lukas R. Montano, Hopewell Murphy, Austin J. Negron, Alfonse J. Niedermeyer, IV, Elizabeth Tighe O'Connor, Amanda Ogilby, Caroline J. Ogonowski, Laura E. Ogonowski, Mary K. Ogonowski. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Joanne Gregory, Amanda C. Hetzel, Madeline C. Hoffman, Emma K. Hunt, Mert Ibis, Amanda Lee, Jeanee Lee, Winnee Lee, Karoline Lin, Katherine Lin, William A. Longing, Shay E. Mahon, Alfred R. Maler, Max W. Maltby, Morgan Maltby, Ashley M. Mannetta, Jessica A. Mannetta, Tyler Marino, Chandler H. Marshall, Christopher Michael Martinez. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Gina M. DiFazio, Joseph V. DiFazio, Doe 50, Brady Donovan, Kelsey E. Donovan, Megan L. Donovan, Megan Duger, Brendan Fitzpatrick, Gregory E. Fox, David Michael Gann, Dylan Garbarini, Philip Garbarini, Andrew Giovinazzo, Ashley M. Giovinazzo, Theresa J. Giovinazzo, Denise Ann Glaser, Tyler Goldman, Caitlin Ann Gray, Colleen Elizabeth Gray. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Meaghan Coombs, John J. Corcoran, Joseph D. Crisci, Michael E. Crisci, Kyle J. Crotty, Megan Crotty, Sean P. Crotty, Matthew Damaskinos, Christopher Damota, Clinton Davis, Jr., Priscilla D. Davis, Timothy Debin, Vito J. DeLeo, Jr., Kassidy DeLeo, Nicholas DeMeo, Edward DeSimone, IV, Stephanie C. DeSimone, Ashley M. D'Esposito, William C. Dietrich, Dana M. DiFazio. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Evgeny Borisovich Belilovsky, Alexander M. Berger, Christian D. Berger, Nicholas Berger, Harris I. Bergsohn, Samuel Bergsohn, Christine N. Betterly, Samantha R. Betterly, Vanessa Calderon, Jose O. Calderon-Garcia, Jessica Cashman, Benjamin R. Chairnoff, Brian K. Chalcoff, Eric J. Chalcoff, Brett S. Cherry, Colton P. Cherry, Nicholas P. Chiofalo, Jr., Gretchen D. Christophe, Julie Coombs, Matthew Coombs. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Erik A. Abrahamson, Sarah L. Acquaviva, Salvatore R. Agnello, Vincent J. Agnello, Dante Alario, James M. Alario, Jr., Christopher T. Allingham, Kyle P. Allingham, Brandon M. Anaya, Jr., Kristina M. Anaya, Jr., Rebecca R. Anaya, Jr., Deborah J. Anderson, Emma Arczynski, Maximilion P. Arczynski, Michael S. Arczynski, Sydney E. Arczynski, Loren Asciak, Joseph Barbaro, Paul Barbaro, Michael E. Beekman, Jr.. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Susan M. Lum, Brendan McEneaney, Jennifer J. McEneaney, Kevin McEneaney, Kevin E. McEneaney, Kyle McEneaney. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Alison Coffey, Marcus Flagg, Robert Joseph Hayes, Thomas P. Heidenberger, II, Jay W. Lai, Jean Ya Lai, Kristin Marino, Alyssa Rocha, Paige M. Rollison, Sarah E. Rollison, Robert Schardt, Erica Schott, Robert Schott, Brian Shaw, Richard C. Shaw, Donna Struzzieri, Geraldine T. Tobia. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Michael J. Chan, Brian Cosgrove, Claire M. Cosgrove, Elizabeth M. Cosgrove, Kirstin Gadiel, Richard M. Garbarini, Lynn M. Hill, Melissa J. Linehan, Thomas B. Linehan, Patrick G. Lynch, Michele C. Melendez, David S. Miller, Daniel J. Mladenik, Grace Mladenik, Joshua Mladenik, Kelly S. Mladenik, Dorine E. Toyen, Heather B. Toyen. (Haefele, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Melissa Ann Barrett, Louisa H. Fisher, Robert Giallombardo, Susan Salvo Glick, Donald William Hughes, Catherine Masak, Nicole McCabe, Melissa McGrath, Kathleen O'Hara, Antonio I. Rivera, Lisa A. Roberts, David Robert Salvo, Brielle Marie Saracini, Kirsten Anne Saracini, Michael Shaw, Wayne Stefani, Jr.. (Haefele, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by George P. Kousoulis, Peter G. Kousoulis, Drake D. Marshall, Ian Montesi, Matthew J. Montesi, Ryan Montesi, Francis G. Murphy, Mark E. Murphy, Michael T. Murphy, Diane V. Murphy-Boiven, Joan P. Murphy-Wolf, Peter W. Negron, Melissa Mil Pena, Sara Jaye Pena, Rosanne L. Spirito, Brian Terzian, Florela S. Yancey, Kevin M. Yancey, Mark A. Yancey. (Haefele, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Cassandra Lee Carter, Mathilda C. Conklin, Joseph V. Fersini, Sr., Ashley E. Fodor, Eleanor Fox, George L. W. Gadiel, Frieda Green, Christine Hamilton, Robert W. Hamilton, Jr., Colleen Hardacre, Matthew Herencia, Eslyn J. Hernandez, Jr., Sargam Jain, Vandna Jain, Richard A. Johnson, Jason A. Kershaw, Kristin D. Kershaw, Matthew A. Kershaw, Elizabeth Kondratenko, Josephine N. Ponger. (Haefele, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Amendment re: #53 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Marina Barbosa, Nancy J. Booms, Andrew W. Brunn, Erin Cain, Daniel A. Cain, III, Ellen Callahan, John Casazza, Peter Ross Cherry, Meghan L. Corcoran, Brenden W. Cummins, John L. Cummins, Michael J. Cummins, Martin J. Cummins, III, Martin J. Cummins, Jr., Cathleen Dodge, Lydeda Grant, Maria Losito, Nancy K. Nee, Anthony P. Newsome, Christina Brunn Thomas. (Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in long form or in altered short form addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Timothy B. Fleming dated 11/26/2018. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 CLERK'S CORRECTED JUDGMENT re: (947 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 947 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 130 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 130 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 43 in 1:02-cv-07230- GBD-SN, 43 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 4175 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 4175 in 1:03- md-01570-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment in favor of Frank Kminek, Frank Kminek Sr, Frank Kminek, Sr, Robert Kmak against The Advice and Reformation Committee(ARC), The Islamic Republic of Iran; in favor of Christina Kminek, Frank Kminek, Frank Kminek Sr, Frank Kminek, Sr against The Advice and Reformation Committee(ARC), The Islamic Republic of Iran; in favor of Christina Kminek, Christopher Kminek against The Advice and Reformation Committee(ARC), The Islamic Republic of Iran; in favor of Christina L. Kminek against The Islamic Republic of Iran; in favor of Andrew Petisce, Andrew Petisee, Andrew Petsce, Mary Ann Peters against The Advice and Reformation Committee(ARC), The Islamic Republic of Iran; in favor of Elba Iris Cedeno against The Advice and Reformation Committee(ARC), The Islamic Republic of Iran. This document relates to: Ashton et al. v. al Qaeda Islamic Army, et al., 02 Civ. 6977 (GED) (SN) Burlingame v. Bin Laden, et al., 02 Civ. 7230 (GED) (SN) Thomas Burnett, Sr. et al. v. The Islamic Republic or Iran, et al., 15 Civ. 9903 (GED) (SN) It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated September 13, 2018, judgment is entered against the Islamic Republic of Iran for a total of $42,500,000 as the sum of the following amounts: (1) Frank Kminek, Sr. for Mari-Rae Sopper in the amount of $8,500,000, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum, compounded annually in the amount of $10,872,151.41, for a total sum of $19,372,151.41 (2) Frank Kminck, Sr. for Mari-Rae Soppcr in the amount of $4,250,000, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum, compounded annually in the amount of $5,436,075.70, for a total sum of $9,686,075.70 (3) Christopher Kminek for Mari-Rae Sopper in the amount of $4,250,000, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum, compounded annually in the amount of $5,436,075.70, for a total sum of $9,686,075.70 (4) Christina L. Kminek for Mari-Rae Sopper in the amount of $4,250,000, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum, compounded annually in the amount of $5.436,075.70, for a total sum of $9,686,075.70 (5) Andrew Petisce for Kenneth Waldie in the amount of $8,500,000, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum, compounded annually in the amount of $10,872,151.41, for a total sum of $19,372, 151.41 (6) Elba Iris Cedeno for Catherine Smith in the amount of $12,500,000, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum, compounded annually in the amount of $15,988,457.96, for a total sum of $28,488,457.96 This Court denies the Burlingame Plaintiffs' claim on behalf of Kerby Laurent under the principles established in Hoglan IV. Both the Burnett and Burlingame Plaintiffs may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue. Finally, the remaining Burnett and Burlingame Plaintiffs not appearing in these motions and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/17/2018) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(km) Modified on 9/19/2018 (km).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting (4131) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting in part and denying in part (918) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; granting in part and denying in part (31) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; granting (115) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN: For the foregoing reasons, this Court enters judgment against the Islamic Republic of Iran for a total of $42,250,000 as the sum of the following amounts, as further set forth in this order. This Court denies the Burlingame Plaintiffs' claim on behalf of Kerby Laurent under the principles established in Hoglan IV. Both the Burnett and Burlingame Plaintiffs who receive solatium awards shall be awarded prejudgment interest on those damages from September 11, 2001, to the date of judgment at the rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. Both the Burnett and Burlingame Plaintiffs may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue. Finally, the remaining Burnett and Burlingame Plaintiffs not appearing in these motions and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 CORRECTED ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF JAROSLAWA SKALA: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of Plaintiff Jaroslawa Skala in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who is the parent of John P. Skala, who was killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Jaroslawa Skala is awarded solatium damages of $8,500,000 as the parent of John P. Skala as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Jaroslawa Skala is awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that that Plaintiff Jaroslawa Skala may submit an application for punitive damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue, and it is ORDERED that the this plaintiff and the remaining Burnett Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, to the extent such awards have not previously been addressed, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages for conscious pain and suffering of decedents from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2018) (jwh)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (128 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 4163 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Jaroslawa Skala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Haefele, Robert) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (126 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 4161 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiff Jaroslawa Skala. . Document filed by Jaroslawa Skala. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Plaintiff Jaroslawa Skala. Document filed by Jaroslawa Skala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: It is hereby ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Burnett/Iran V Plaintiffs, and it is ORDERED that the Burnett/Iran V Plaintiffs are awarded: solarium damages of $8,500,000 per parent (or estate of a parent) and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that the Burnett/Iran V Plaintiffs are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that the Burnett/Iran V Plaintiffs may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue, and it is ORDERED that the remaining Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solarium or by estates for compensatory damages' for decedents pain and suffering from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/4/2018) (mro)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (4145 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 124 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(dt)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. (Haefele, Robert) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: (4141 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 121 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran V.. Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (4141 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 121 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran V. . Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran V. Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3742 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' October 2017 motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3742) is DENIED. By September 28, 2018, Jelaidan is ORDERED to file a sworn declaration with the Court providing detailed responses to the questions listed above. In addition, a conference is scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. McMahon and the relevant members of the PECs are ORDERED to appear at the conference in person. The parties should be prepared to discuss the PECs' May 2018 motion for sanctions and McMahon's motion to withdraw. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3742. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPINION AND ORDER re: (4064 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (4043) Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. The Charity Officials' motion for reconsideration is DENIED. In addition, Mr. Alan Kabat, the Charity Officials' attorneys from Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC, and the appropriate representatives from the PECs are ORDERED to appear in person at the discovery conference scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Court intends to discuss why Mr. Kabat made representations on behalf of Al-Turki and Naseef during periods of time when he was not in communication with those clients. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4064. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. (Haefele, Robert) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: (115 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 4131 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran wrongful death plaintiffs.. Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B_Declaration of Elba I Cedeno, #3 Exhibit C_Declaration of Christina J Kminek, #4 Exhibit D_Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (4131 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 115 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran wrongful death plaintiffs. (Burnett/Iran IV). Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran wrongful death plaintiffs. Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3910 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Defendants, World Assembly of Muslim Youth-Saudi Arabia and World Assembly of Muslim Youth-International to to produce responsive documents pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a), filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 7 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to provide the PECs with a complete list of all of its branch offices from 1992 until 2002. Within 14 days of this Opinion and Order, the PECs are directed to provide WAMY with a list of no more than 20 branch offices that the PECs believe are most relevant to their claims. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to conduct a more thorough search for documents located in the 20 branch offices that the PECs identify and to produce any additional relevant documents. In addition, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to search for and produce the following: all documents responsive to the PECs' fourth set of document requests; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; WAMY's annual reports for 1992, 1993, and 1995; all documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government, Saudi ministries, and Saudi embassies; all documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; all records regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad; and unredacted versions of all documents that WAMY has previously produced in redacted form (with the exception of any documents listed on a privilege log). Finally, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration describing in detail its efforts to locate: additional documents in its branch offices; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government; documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; and documents regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3910. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER OF PARTIAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: (BURNETT/IRAN III) Upon consideration of the evidence and arguments submitted by Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A to this Order, plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903 ("Burnett/Iran"), who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of a victim killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, and the Judgment by Default for liability only against the Islamic Republic of Iran, the Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, and The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran (collectively, the "Iran Defendants") entered on January 31, 2017 (15-cv-9903 ECF No. 85), together with the entire record in this case, it is hereby; ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in the expert reports attached as Exhibits B - D to the Haefele Declaration, dated August 16, 2018 (and identified in Exhibit A), are awarded economic damages as set forth in Exhibit A and as supported by the expert reports and analyses submitted as Exhibits B, C, and D of the Haefele Declaration, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue, and it is ORDERED that the remaining Burnett/Iran Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages' for decedents pain and suffering from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/28/2018) (ne) Modified on 8/29/2018 (ne).
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying (817) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4077) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (450) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (626) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (579) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (392) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (607) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (50) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (62) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (91) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (76) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (56) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (53) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (54) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (33) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (46) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (36) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (30) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (29) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (1024) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (391) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. The Kingdom's motion to supplement the protective order is DENIED. The Court will not adopt the procedures the Kingdom has proposed. Instead, the parties are directed to comply with the existing protective order, ECF No. 1900, and the Court's Individual Practices when they wish to file any information with the Court that has been designated as confidential. The Court's temporary order prohibiting parties from filing any documents on the docket that have been designated as confidential by the Kingdom (ECF No. 4079) is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4077. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3822 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions, filed by Plaintiffs PI Executive Committee, Plaintiffs Executive Committees, (3827 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Muslim World League and International Islamic Relief Organization to Produce Responsive Documents, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3822) is DENIED as untimely. In addition, the PECs' motion to compel (ECF No. 3827) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, MWL and IIRO are ORDERED to search all of the branch offices that they have not already searched and produce any banking records from those offices and any documents falling within the categories identified in the Court's April 12, 2011 Order. MWL and IIRO are not required to search for any other documents at this time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3822 and 3827. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 OPINION AND ORDER re: (872 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 3823 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to to produce documents, filed by Kathleen Ashton, (3830 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to Document Production, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, Kadi is ORDERED to search for and produce the two reports discussed above that were prepared in anticipation of Rowad's liquidation and the 11 documents discussed above regarding Saudi Arabia's investigations of Kadi. If he is unable to locate or obtain all of these reports and documents, Kadi is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order that describes in detail his efforts to locate the reports and documents. Kadi is not required to produce any other documents at this time. In addition, within 30 days of this Opinion and Order, the parties are directed to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to resolve the disputes regarding Kadi's privilege log. Finally, the PECs' request for attorneys' fees is treated as withdrawn, and Kadi's request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3823, 3830 in the MDL and ECF No. 872 in 02-CV-6977. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: (4108 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 107 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran wrongful death plaintiffs.. Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (107 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran wrongful death plaintiffs. . Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran wrongful death plaintiffs. Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (4073) Letter Motion for Discovery; denying (4074) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The motions for protective orders filed by Al-Buthe, Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, and Basha are DENIED, and Naseef's motion for a protective order is DENIED as moot. In addition, Naseef is ORDERED to file a letter within 60 days of the date of this Order and every 60 days thereafter updating the Court on the status of his medical conditions and ability to participate in this action. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 4073 and 4074. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 8/27/2018, Doc. #4125 in case 1:03-md-1570. ORDER: No party shall publicly file any document on the docket designated as Confidential by the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("KSA") while the Court considers KSA's letter motion dated July 31, 2018. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may respond to KSA's letter motion by August 8, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/1/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) Modified on 8/28/2018 (ras).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: On July 20, 2018, Defendants Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al-Turki, Adnan Basha, and Abdullah Omar Naseef moved the Court to reconsider a portion of its July 6, 2018 Opinion and Order. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may file a response to the motion by August 3, 2018. The defendants may file a reply by August 10, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/3/2018. Replies due by 8/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMENDED ORDER APPROVING NOTICES TO CONFORM, SHORT FORM COMPLAINTS, AND NOTICES OF AMENDMENT: The Court has previously issued several orders approving forms and setting procedures for the filing of new claims against the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("Saudi Arabia") and the Islamic Republic of Iran ("Iran"). ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, 4010. Because of the piecemeal manner in which the various types of new claims have been addressed, the applicable forms and procedures have become convoluted and inconsistent. In addition, the plaintiffs have sought to find ways of adding more plaintiffs to a single case than the Court intended by utilizing a combination of short form complaints and notices of amendment. The Court is attempting to manage the influx of new cases and claims in the most efficient and organized manner possible. To that end, the Court will now establish new procedures governing all newly filed claims against Iran and Saudi Arabia. This Amended Order supersedes ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, and 4010 in their entirety. The parties are directed to adhere to both the letter and spirit of these procedures. In addition, any plaintiff wishing to withdraw from the case must seek leave from the Court to dismiss his or her claims in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Civil Rules, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/10/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(jwh)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER re: (546 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN, 987 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 3748 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 774 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 571 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 850 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 630 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN, 582 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions - Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Sanctions as to Charity Official Defendants Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, and Soliman Al-Buthe. filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. For the foregoing reasons, the PECs' motion for sanctions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are precluded from offering any testimony or further evidence, other than such evidence that has been produced as of the date of this Opinion and Order, to rebut admissible evidence offered by a party to establish these defendants' whereabouts on a particular date. In addition, Defendants Al-Buthe, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are ORDERED to produce certifications that fully comply with the Courts orders within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order. The certifications from Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef must describe the specific medical issues that have prevented them from fulfilling their discovery obligations in a timely manner, and the certifications from Al-Turki and Naseef must indicate whether they are continuing to participate in this litigation. In the alternative, if Al-Turki, Basha, or Naseef is incapacitated, that defendant may produce a competent sworn or affirmed certification from a qualified treating physician identifying the specific medical issues that have prevented the defendant from fulfilling his discovery obligations. If defense counsel is unable to contact Al-Turki and Naseef, counsel must file a letter with the Court within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order describing his efforts to contact his clients and indicating when he last had contact with them. The Court will then consider whether a default should be entered against them. If the Charity Officials remain noncompliant with the Court's orders, the Court may impose additional sanctions and may order them to show cause why they should not be held in contempt. Finally, the Court will require the Charity Officials to pay the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs that the PECs incurred in bringing their motion for sanctions. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to reach agreement on the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, the parties shall file a joint status letter indicating whether they have agreed upon the attorneys' fees and costs that should be imposed. If the parties have not reached agreement, the status letter should propose a reasonable schedule for briefing on the amount of the attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3748. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/6/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ne)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CORRECTED ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A amending #85 Judgment: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al, 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A,, and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solarium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/8/2018) (jwh)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (4013 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 73 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:17-cv-06519-GBD, 70 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 617 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 599 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN, 16 in 1:18-cv-00538-GBD, 57 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN, 442 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 41 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD, 385 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 48 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD, 25 in 1:17-cv-08617-GBD, 56 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 81 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 386 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 64 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN, 74 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN, 64 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:18-cv-03162-GBD, 1017 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 13 in 1:18-cv-03353-GBD, 804 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 80 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 573 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 47 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD, 42 in 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:18-cv-00947-GBD, 54 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 34 in 1:17-cv-07914-GBD) MOTION for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15144016. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Superseded by Judge's Order dated 7/10/2018, Doc. #4045 in case 1:03-md-1570. ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; terminating (4007) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The Court hereby approves the Iran Short Form Complaint, ECF No. 4007-1, and Ashton Short Form Saudi Arabia Complaint, ECF No. 4007-2, and further orders as follows: Iran Short Form Complaint. Any plaintiff who has not yet filed a claim against Iran, but intends to do so, may initiate an action against Iran through the filing of an Iran Short Form Complaint, substantially in the form attached as Exhibit A to the PECs' May 23, 2018 Letter, ECF No. 4007-1...As new complaints are being filed against Saudi Arabia, the Court would like to put all plaintiffs on notice that, in the event that liability is ultimately established against Saudi Arabia, solatium claimants shall be required to present documentary evidence of their family relationship to a 9/11 decedent for the Court's review. Such evidence would consist of birth or marriage certificates or, in their absence, sworn affidavits attesting to a family relationship eligible for recovery. For deceased solatium claimants, a death certificate or sworn affidavit shall be requested to ensure that the claimant did not predecease the 9/11 victim. Cf. ECF No. 3442, 3445 (orders vacating judgments against Islamic Republic of Iran and dismissing claims of solatium claimants who had pre-deceased victims). Although liability and damages are bifurcated in this case, the Court strongly encourages all plaintiffs to gather the necessary documentation before or shortly after the filing or amendment of their complaints because such documentation may be more difficult to obtain with the passage of time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4007, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) Modified on 8/28/2018 (ras).
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solarium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment, and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/30/2018) (jwh)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' motion to modify the procedures for adding or removing plaintiffs to or from existing cases without seeking further leave from the Court is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. A new plaintiff asserting claims for solatium damages with respect to a deceased family member may be added to the existing case of the decedent's estate without seeking further leave from the Court by (1) filing a Notice of Amendment in the form attached hereto as Exhibit A, and then (2) adding the new plaintiff's name to the docket of the existing case on ECF. Names added onto the docket must be in First Name Last Name format, with only first letters capitalized (i.e., not written in all capitalized letters). No more than 25 new plaintiffs may be added to an existing case with a single Notice of Amendment. Attorneys wishing to add new plaintiffs using this procedure are strongly encouraged to contact the Clerk of Court and make arrangements to send members of their technical staff to court-sponsored training regarding the proper protocols for adding new plaintiffs to existing dockets. Plaintiffs added by this procedure need not re-serve defendants who have already been served. Any motion previously ruled on by the Court will be considered to have been filed and decided in the same manner and shall apply with equal force with regard to the claims of each new plaintiff. All other new plaintiffs must follow the procedures established in the Court's May 3, 2017 and January 24, 2018 Orders. ECF Nos. 3543, 3883 (in case no. 03md1570). Any plaintiff wishing to withdraw from the case must seek leave from the Court to dismiss his or her claims in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Civil Rules. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3943 (in case no. 03md1570). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/27/2018). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al., as per Chambers. This Order is a duplicate of doc. no. 3982 entered in case no. 03md1570. (rjm)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: (95 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 3983 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran Wrongful Death Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (95 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 3983 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran Wrongful Death Plaintiffs. . Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burnett/Iran Wrongful Death Plaintiffs. Document filed by Thomas E. Burnett, Sr.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN(Haefele, Robert)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: On Wednesday, January 24, 2018, the Court held a telephone conference with the parties to discuss the remaining disputes regarding the deposition protocol. The Court has decided the disputed matters and has separately issued a Deposition Protocol Order. For the sake of clarity, the Court will briefly explain its decisions regarding the disputed matters. First, the Court determined that each side will be permitted to take 75 depositions. The plaintiffs proposed 100 depositions as a fair number. This number was based, in part, on the plaintiffs' Rule 26(a) Witness List and their deposition protocol proposal, which identified dozens of individuals from each of the five organizational defendants and six individual defendants that they intended to depose. In addition, plaintiffs reference a 2015 multidistrict litigation (involving products liability) that authorized 100 depositions for each side and included damages depositions (which this protocol does not). The plaintiffs state that they intend to depose current and former employees of the defendant organizations, former government officials and incarcerated al Qaeda members. Defendants, for their part, argue first for 50 depositions, but in the main argue for parity, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap) Modified on 2/1/2018 (ap).
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 DEPOSITION PROTOCOL ORDER: The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") established In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, 03 MDL 1570, and began transferring cases related to the 9/11 terrorist attacks from various judicial districts to this Court ("the MDL Court") for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. In addition to cases transferred into the MDL by the JPML, other cases related to the 9/11 terrorist attacks have been consolidated with this multidistrict proceeding (collectively, "MDL Proceeding"). A fundamental purpose of multidistrict litigation under 28 U.S.C. 1407 is to facilitate the conduct of efficient and non-duplicative discovery relating to questions of fact common to transferred and coordinated actions. The Parties have expressed an intention to conduct deposition discovery in the MDL Proceeding. Although several prior orders (see, e.g., ECF Nos. 247, 248, 1547, and 1900) contain provisions relating to depositions in the MDL Proceeding, the Court directed the Parties to meet and confer (see ECF No. 3541) to develop more specific protocols, and as further set forth in this order. (Deposition due by 1/31/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RETURN OF LETTERS ROGATORY as to Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs Unexecuted.(rro)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: terminating 3486 (in case 3md1570) Motion for Attorney Fees; terminating 3727 (in case 3md1570) Letter Motion for Conference. As discussed at the conference held on October 5, 2017, the following deadlines have been modified. Defendant World Assembly of Muslim Youth's ("WAMY's") document production shall be completed by November 30, 2017. Because WAMY has been given substantial time to produce documents, no further extensions of this deadline will be granted. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees ("PECs") shall file a status letter discussing WAMY's document production and whether it intends to file any discovery motions by January 5, 2018. The PECs shall file any discovery motion against Defendant Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi no later than December 1, 2017, by motion not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. Defendant Kadi shall oppose such motion no later than January 5, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. The PECs may file a reply no later than January 26, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 10 double-spaced pages. The PECs shall file any discovery motion against Defendants Muslim World League ("MWL") and International Islamic Relief Organization ("IIRO") no later than December 1, 2017, by motion not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. Defendants MWL and IIRO shall oppose such discovery motion no later than January 5, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. The PECs may file a reply no later than January 26, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 10 double-spaced pages. All other deadlines remain in effect. In addition, in light of Defendant Perouz Sedaghaty's ongoing bankruptcy proceedings, Plaintiffs' application for attorney fees and expenses, ECF No. 3486, is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3486 and 3727. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/12/2017) (ap) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF BURNETT/IRAN PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs Thomas Burnett, Sr., et al. v. The Islamic Republic of Iran, et al., 15-cv-9903, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, or an estate of a decedent killed in the attacks, as indicated in Exhibit A and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as indicated in Exhibit A and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: compensatory damages for conscious pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4. 96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that that the Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue, and it is ORDERED that the these plaintiffs and the remaining Burnett Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages for conscious pain and suffering of decedents from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/31/2017) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jwh) Modified on 8/17/2017 (jwh).
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: #88 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Iran Defendants (for Plaintiffs on Exhibit A to Declaration in Support of Partial Final Judgment).. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haefele, Robert)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Default Judgment as to Iran Defendants (for Plaintiffs on Exhibit A to Declaration in Support of Partial Final Judgment). Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Haefele, Robert) Modified on 9/13/2017 (ldi).
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Motion for Entry of Partial Final Default Judgments. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Haefele, Robert)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 BRIEF - Burnett Plaintiffs' Memorandum Addressing "Functional Equivalent" Solatium Claims. Document filed by All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-903, All Plaintiffs in 15-cv-9903.(Flowers, Jodi)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER OF JUDGMENT: granting 68 Motion for Default Judgment. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' [Amended] Motion for Judgment by Default Against the Sovereign Defendants, The Islamic Republic of Iran, The Islamic Revolutionary Guard, and the Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran (the "Sovereign Defendants") is GRANTED and final judgment on liability is entered in favor of all Plaintiffs and against all Sovereign Defendants; ORDERED that Plaintiffs are hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Netburn to resolve any remaining issues, including but not limited to damages both compensatory and punitive. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/31/2017) (ama)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #85 ORDER OF JUDGMENT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ama)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER withdrawing #74 Motion for Judgment. In light of the Notice filed at ECF No. 81, this motion is withdrawn without prejudice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER withdrawing #72 Motion for Judgment. In light of the Notice filed at ECF No. 81, this motion is withdrawn without prejudice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER withdrawing #70 Motion for Judgment. In light of the Notice filed at ECF No. 81, this motion is withdrawn without prejudice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Withdrawal re: #74 FINAL MOTION for Judgment Partial Final Judgment Burnett III., #70 FINAL MOTION for Judgment PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENTS., #72 FINAL MOTION for Judgment Partial Final Judgment Burnett II.. Document filed by plaintiffs all. (Haefele, Robert)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert T. Haefele dated 01/23/2017 re: ECF 77. Document filed by plaintiffs all. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Haefele, Robert)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #78 Letter filed by plaintiffs all. ENDORSEMENT: The plaintiffs' request for an extension of time to submit the status letters described in the Court's January 11, 2017 Order is GRANTED. Plaintiffs in Burnett v. Islamic Republic of Iran, 15-CV-9903, and the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee in In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, 03-MDL-1570 shall submit their status letters by Monday, January 23, 2017. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/17/2017) (mro)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert T. Haefele dated 01/17/2017 re: Iran Status Updates Extension Request. Document filed by plaintiffs all.(Haefele, Robert)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the January 6, 2017 letter alerting it to the presence of claimants in a motion for default judgment in Burnett v. Islamic Republic of Iran, 15-CV-9903, who have already received judgments pursuant to October 31, 2016 orders of further partial judgment from Judge Daniels in the In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001 multidistrict litigation. ECF No. 3421. Given the alleged inconsistencies raised in the January 6, 2017 letter, the Court cannot recommend that the motions for final judgment at ECF No. 70, 72, and 74 in Burnett v. Islamic Republic of Iran, 15-CV-9903 be signed at this time. As a preliminary matter, the Court would like clarification as to why Burnett, a related case to Ashton v. Al Qaeda Islamic Army, 02-CV-6977, and whose currently pending motion for a default judgment on liability depends on the findings of fact and conclusions of law of MDL case Havlish v. Bin Laden, 03-CV-9848, has not been incorporated into the In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, 03-MDL-1570, multidistrict litigation proceedings. It appears that the failure of the Burnett plaintiffs to join the MDL proceedings may have accounted for some of the delay in bringing this important issue affecting the integrity of the Court's orders to its attention. Accordingly, the Court orders the following: 1) The Burnett Plaintiffs are to withdraw the motions currently pending at ECF No. 70, 72, and 74; 2) The Burnett Plaintiffs are to submit a status letter to the Court no later than Wednesday, January 18, 2017, explaining why they have not sought to join the multidistrict litigation and responding to the January 6, 2017 letter; 3) The Burnett Plaintiffs are to resubmit the motions for damages as one consolidated motion. Such motion is to be accompanied by a sworn statement by an attorney who affirms under penalty of perjury that no relief has previously been awarded to any particular plaintiff (or, if relief has been awarded, the nature of that relief). This statement shall be required for all future motions for damages by all groups of plaintiffs in the multidistrict litigation; 4) The Plaintiffs' Executive Committee is to review all prior orders granting partial default judgments against the Islamic Republic of Iran to ensure that no duplicate relief has been issued. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committee is to submit a status letter no later than Wednesday, January 18, 2017, which (1) verifies that no individual or estate plaintiff has received duplicate judgments in any of the Court's past orders or, if duplicate relief has been issued, naming such plaintiffs and such relief; (2) details the nature of coordination between the different groups of plaintiffs applying for default judgments to ensure that duplicate judgments are not entered; (3) explains the due diligence measures conducted by plaintiffs' counsel to verify the family relationship between 9/11 decedents and immediate family member plaintiffs claiming solatium damages; and (4) identifies safeguards that will be implemented to prevent the issuance of duplicate relief in the future. 5) Parties should be prepared to discuss these issues at the next general case management conference scheduled for February 8, 2017. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/11/2017) (mro)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/5/2017) (rjm)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so redesignated. (wb)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (ad)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: #74 FINAL MOTION for Judgment Partial Final Judgment Burnett III.. Document filed by Burnett III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haefele, Robert)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINAL MOTION for Judgment Partial Final Judgment Burnett III. Document filed by Burnett III.(Haefele, Robert)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: #72 FINAL MOTION for Judgment Partial Final Judgment Burnett II.. Document filed by plaintiffs all. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haefele, Robert)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINAL MOTION for Judgment Partial Final Judgment Burnett II. Document filed by plaintiffs all.(Haefele, Robert)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: #70 FINAL MOTION for Judgment PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENTS.. Document filed by plaintiffs all. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haefele, Robert)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 FINAL MOTION for Judgment PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENTS. Document filed by plaintiffs all.(Haefele, Robert)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #68 AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Liability. . Document filed by plaintiffs all. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Haefele, Robert)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Liability. Document filed by plaintiffs all. Responses due by 11/14/2016(Haefele, Robert)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to The Islamic Republic of Iran, The IslamicRevolutionary Guard Corps, and The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran. (km)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #65 MOTION for Entry of Default as to All Plaintiffs . . Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Haefele, Robert)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Entry of Default as to All Plaintiffs . Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Haefele, Robert)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for two copies of the two copies of the Attachment A- Complaint (English), Two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089, Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 500, and Part 2, pages 501 through 877, Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt, Attachment D- Notice of Suit, Attachment E-Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attachment F- Summons, Attachment G-Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attchment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602 mailed to The Islamic Revolution Guard Corps c/o H.E. Ali akbar Salehi, Ph.D Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomenini Street Tehran, Iran, Because the US does not maintain diplomatic relations with the government of Iran, the Department of State is assisted by the Foreign Interests Section for the Embassy of Switzerland in Teheran in delivering these documents to the Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs. The documents were delivered to the Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs. The documents were delivered to the Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs under cover of diplomatic note numbers 1069-IE and 1070-Ie dated and delivered on September 14, 2016. A certified copy of the diplomatic note is enclosed. on 5/24/2016 by Federal Express tracking # 776253147450, as per #59 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 9/14/2016. (jvs)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran served on 3/18/2016, answer due 5/17/2016; The Islamic Republic of Iran served on 9/14/2016, answer due 11/14/2016; The Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps served on 9/14/2016, answer due 11/14/2016. Service was accepted by Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs. Service was made by US Department of State. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Haefele, Robert)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against Islamic Republic of Iran, The Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, and The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran . Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Haefele, Robert)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted docket entry entered on 3/7/2016. CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jvs)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Attachment A - Complaint (English), two copies of the Amended Complaint ( ECF #53). Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF #53), translated into Farsi. Part 1, pages 1 through 500, and Part 2, pages 501 through 877Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt Attachment D- Notice of Suit Attachment E- Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment F- Summons Attachment G- Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602 mailed to Hezbollah c/o/ H.E. Ali Akbar Salehi, P.H.D. Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomenini Street Tehran Iran on 3/7/2016 by Registered Mail tracking # CX112131417US, as per #56 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 9/14/2016. (jvs) Modified on 11/10/2016 (jvs).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Attachment A - Complaint (English), two copies of the Amended Complaint ( ECF #53). Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF #53), translated into Farsi. Part 1, pages 1 through 500, andPart 2, pages 501 through 877Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt Attachment D- Notice of Suit Attachment E- Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment F- Summons Attachment G- Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602 mailed to The Islamic Republic of Iran c/o H.E. Ali Akbar Salehi, P.H.D. Ministry of fOreign Affairs Imam Khomenini Street Tehran Iran on 3/7/2016 by Registered Mail tracking # CX112131451US, as per #55 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 9/14/2016. (jvs) Modified on 11/10/2016 (jvs).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted docket entry. CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jvs)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for A - Complaint (English), two copies of the Amended Complaint ( ECF #53). Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF #53), translated into Farsi. Part 1, pages 1 through 500, andPart 2, pages 501 through 877Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt Attachment D- Notice of Suit Attachment E- Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment F- Summons Attachment G- Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602 mailed to The Islamic Revolution Guard Corps c/o H.E. Ali Akbar Salehi, P.H.D. Ministry Foreign Affairs Imam Khomenini Street Tehran Iran on 3/7/2016 by Registered Mail tracking # CX111919256US, as per #57 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 9/14/2016. (jvs) Modified on 11/10/2016 (jvs).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Attachment A- Complaint (English), Two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089, Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 500, and Part 2, pages 501 through 877, Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt, Attachment D- Notice of Suit, Attachment E-Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attachment F- Summons, Attachment G-Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attchment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602 mailed to The Islamic Republic of Iran c/o H.E. Ali Akbar Salehi, Ph. D. Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomenini Street, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) Because the US does not maintain diplomatic relations with the government of Iran, the Department of State is assisted by the Foreign Interests Section for the Embassy of Switzerland in Teheran in delivering these documents to the Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs. The documents were delivered to the Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs. The documents were delivered to the Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs under cover of diplomatic note numbers 1069-IE and 1070-Ie dated and delivered on September 14, 2016. A certified copy of the diplomatic note is enclosed. by Federal Express tracking # 7762 5314 7530, as per #58 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 9/14/2016. (jvs) Modified on 11/23/2016 (jvs).
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Removal of Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(d). Document filed by Rusty Henry, Jeffrey Lever, Richard O'Mack. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Haefele, Robert)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Removal of Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(d). Document filed by Linda Sims. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Haefele, Robert)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the two copies of the Attachment A- Complaint (English), Two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089, Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 500, and Part 2, pages 501 through 877, Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt, Attachment D- Notice of Suit, Attachment E-Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attachment F- Summons, Attachment G-Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attchment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602 mailed to Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 5/24/2016 by Federal Express tracking # 7762 5314 7736, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the two copies of the Attachment A- Complaint (English), Two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089, Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 500, and Part 2, pages 501 through 877, Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt, Attachment D- Notice of Suit, Attachment E-Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attachment F- Summons, Attachment G-Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attchment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602 mailed to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 5/24/2016 by Federal Express tracking # 7762 5314 7450, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Attachment A- Complaint (English), Two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089, Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF#53) Part 1, pages 1 through 500, and Part 2, pages 501 through 877, Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt, Attachment D- Notice of Suit, Attachment E-Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attachment F- Summons, Attachment G-Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem Translations, Attchment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602 mailed to U.S. Department of State CA/OCS/L, SA-17 10th Floor on 5/24/2016 by Federal Express tracking # 7762 5314 7530, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Attachment A - Complaint (English), two copies of the Amended Complaint ( ECF #53). Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF #53), translated into Farsi. Part 1, pages 1 through 500, andPart 2, pages 501 through 877Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt Attachment D- Notice of Suit Attachment E- Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment F- Summons Attachment G- Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602. mailed to The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran c/o Mahmoud Bahmani, Governor Miramoud Boulevard, #144 Tehran, Iran the head of the ministry of foreign affairs on 03/18/2016 by Registered Mail tracking # CX112131434US, as per 54 Clerk Certificate of Mailing,. Confirmation that delivery was executed was received by the Clerk's Office. (jvs) Presiding Judge: Daniels, George B. by Registered Mail as per #54 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. (jvs) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Attachment A - Complaint (English), two copies of the Amended Complaint ( ECF #53). Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF #53), translated into Farsi. Part 1, pages 1 through 500, andPart 2, pages 501 through 877Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt Attachment D- Notice of Suit Attachment E- Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment F- Summons Attachment G- Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602. mailed to The Islamic Revolution Guard Corps c/o H.E. Ali Akbar Salehi P.H.D. Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Imam Khomenini Street, Tehran, Iran on 3/7/2016 by Registered Mail tracking # CX111919256US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jvs)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Attachment A - Complaint (English), two copies of the Amended Complaint ( ECF #53). Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF #53), translated into Farsi. Part 1, pages 1 through 500, andPart 2, pages 501 through 877Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt Attachment D- Notice of Suit Attachment E- Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment F- Summons Attachment G- Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602. mailed to Hezbollah c/o H.E. Ali Akbar Salehi, P.H.D. Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Imam Khomenini Street, Tehran, Iran on 3/7/2016 by Registered Mail tracking # CX112131417US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jvs)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Attachment A - Complaint (English), two copies of the Amended Complaint ( ECF #53). Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF #53), translated into Farsi. Part 1, pages 1 through 500, andPart 2, pages 501 through 877Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt Attachment D- Notice of Suit Attachment E- Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment F- Summons Attachment G- Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602. mailed to The Islamic Republic of Iran c/o H.E. Ali Akbar Salehi, P.H.D. Ministry of Foreign Affair, Imam Khomenini Street Tehran Iran on 3/7/2016 by Registered Mail tracking # CX112131451US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jvs)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Attachment A - Complaint (English), two copies of the Amended Complaint ( ECF #53). Part 1, pages 1 through 545, and Part 2, pages 546 through 1089Attachment B- Complaint (Farsi), two copies of the Amended Complaint (ECF #53), translated into Farsi. Part 1, pages 1 through 500, andPart 2, pages 501 through 877Attachment C- Affidavit from translator, Sara Schmitt Attachment D- Notice of Suit Attachment E- Notice of Suit, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment F- Summons Attachment G- Summons, translated into Farsi and Affidavit from translator, Targem TranslationsAttachment H- Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (FSIA), 28 USCS 1602. on 3/7/2016 by Registered Mail tracking # CX112131434US, to The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran c/o Mahmoud Bahmani, Governor Miramoud Boulevard, #144 Tehran, Iran the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jvs) Modified on 3/8/2016 (jvs).
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,, against Hezbollah, Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei, Iran Airlines, Iranian Ministry of Commerce, Iranian Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics, Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, Iranian Ministry of Information and Security, Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran, The Iranian Ministry of Petroleum, The Islamic Republic of Iran, The Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, The National Iranian Gas Company, The National Iranian Oil Corporation, The National Iranian Petrochemical Company, The National Iranian Tanker Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Anisia C. Abarabar, Elaine Abate, Yvonne V. Abdool, Suzanne Abenmoha, Ammini G. Abraham, Ann M. Abrahamson, Celso J. Abreu, John J. Acerno, Humberto R. Acosta, Alfred Acquaviva, Courtney Acquaviva, Josephine Acquaviva, Dwight D. Adams, Elizabeth J. Adams, Jean Adams, Kevin John Adams, Lawrence Scott Adams, Robert C. Adams, Affiong Adanga, Dawn Addamo, Gregory Addamo, Rita Addamo, Alice D. Adler, Darryl J. Adone, Stacey Afflitto, George A Agaiby, Rita Agnello, Salvatore Agnello, Vinnie Carla Agnello, Jennifer Agresto, Diane B. Aguiar, Joao A. Aguiar, Taciana Aguiar, Judith M. Aiken, Mark Aiken, James Alario, Sr(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret Alario, Deceased), James Alario, Sr(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Margaret Alario), James F. Albach, Jr, Edward Albert, Thomas Albert, Maria Y. Aldaco, Elizabeth Alderman(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Craig Alderman, Deceased), Elizabeth Alderman(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Peter Craig Alderman), Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Peter Craig Alderman), Stephen Alderman(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Craig Alderman, Deceased), Laura Alessi(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Pamela J. Boyce), Laura Alessi(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Pamela J. Boyce, Deceased), Karium Ali, Louisa Allegretto, Luke C. Allen, Lynn P. Allen, Madelyn Gail Allen(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Richard Dennis Allen), Madelyn Gail Allen(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Dennis Allen, Deceased), Marguerite G. Allen, Matthew J. Allen, Michael J. Allen(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph R. Allen, Deceased), Michael J. Allen(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Joseph R. Allen), Richard D. Allen, Ronald Allen, Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson, Donna Allingham, James J. Allingham, Patricia C. Allingham, William J. Allingham, Jr, William J. Allingham, V. Blake Allison, Ivan Almendarez, Jr, Neil Alper, Leonor Alvarez, Elizabeth Alverson, Robert E. Alverson, Christopher Alviar, Gemma Alviar, Gianina Alviar, Grace Alviar(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Cesar A. Alviar, Deceased), Grace Alviar(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Cesar A. Alviar, Deceased), Jocelyne Ambroise, Kenneth Paul Ambrose, Sharon Ambrose, Mitchell Amerbach, Patricia Amo, Marie L. Anaya, Christine A. Anchundia, Elias J. Anchundia, Elias A. Anchundia, Elizabeth R. Anchundia, Dorothy Ancona, Elizabeth Andersen, Douglas Anderson, Jill G. Anderson, Joanne Anderson, Kathryn G. Anderson, Thomas Anderson, Betty Andrade, Edward S. Andrews, Meredith Andrews, Morien Angaroo, Donna L. Angelini, Marianne Angelo, Dawn Angrisani, Ralph Angrisani, Laura Renee Anspach, Diane Antolos, Ioannis Antoniadis, Joseph P Antony, Cecile M. Apollo, Peter Apollo, Margaret Apostol, Carol Ann Aquilino, Frank J. Aquilino, Alicia Arancibia, Janet Arbuiso, Daniel J Archbold, Peter Archer, Tony Archer, Lori Ann Arczynski, Wandalee Arena, Irene Arguelles, Andrew Arias, Donald Arias, Thomas Arias, Lorraine M Arias-Beliveau, Joseph Ariola, Gabriel Armstrong, Gerard Armstrong, Laura A. Armstrong, Marian Armstrong, Mary E Armstrong, Mary E. Armstrong, Michael Arniero, Cynthia Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Ruth Green Aron, Jules P Aronson, Emma Louise Arro, Benjamin Arroyo, Maria Aryee, Teiko Aryee, Maritza Arzayus(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Carlos Munoz), Maritza Arzayus(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos Munoz, Deceased), Adolfo Arzu, Andrea Asbury, Elaine Asciak, Vivian Asciak, Shawn Ashe, Dana Asher, Ethel Asher, Sigal Asher, Stuart Asher, Julia Rocia Asitimbay Quintuna, Rosa Elena Asitimbay Quintuna, Elaine Atwood, Elaine M Atwood, Gerald Atwood, Gregory P Atwood, John G Atwood, Raymond J Atwood, Se Jua Au, Philipson Azenabor, Carla Bacchus, Juana Bacchus, George Bachmann, Grace Badagliacca, John Badagliacca, Paul J. Bader, John P. Baeszler(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Jane Ellen Baeszler), John P. Baeszler(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Jane Ellen Baeszler, Deceased), Diana Baez, Judith A. Bailey, Katherine Bailey, Kevin J. Bailey, Paula Bailey, Todd G. Bailey, Vincent H Bailey, Yarah H. Bailey, Yuriah Bailey, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Maureen Lynch Baker, Martha Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Maureen Baksh Griffin, Mary Louise Ball, Lucia Balzan, Lynette Bangaree, Aristides Bantis, Evangelos Bantis, Soultana Bantis, Gentil Baptiste, Victor Barahona, Carol Baran(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter Baran, Deceased), Carol Baran(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Walter Baran), Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Barbaro, Deceased), Kim Barbaro(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Paul Barbaro), Nicholas Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Jr, Mary E. Barbieri, Garrett Barbosa, Armando Bardales, Thomas J. Baroz, Kathryn Lee Barrere, Audriene Barry, Bertrand Francis Barry, Bertrand Arthur Barry, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Diane Barry), Edmund Barry(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Barry, Deceased), John T. Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Marianne Joan Barry, Maureen Barry, Patricia Anne Barry, Patrick T. Barry, Frank Barton, Gila Barzvi(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Guy Barzvi), Gila Barzvi(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Guy Barzvi, Deceased), Chris Basnicki, Jean Basnicki, Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki(As personal representative of the of the Estate of Kenneth William Basnicki, Deceased), Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Kenneth William Basnicki), Robert J Basnicki, William Basnicki, Burney Bates, Pedro Batista, James A Bauer, Christopher A. Baumann, Evon Baumgardner, Rameses G. Bautista, John M. Bavis, Mary Bavis(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Mark Lawrence Bavis), Mary Bavis(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Lawrence Bavis, Deceased), Michael T. Bavis, Patrick J. Bavis, Kelly Bavis Morrissey, Dennis Baxter, Diane Baxter, Donald Baxter, Lawrence Baxter, Lillian Baxter, Mattie L. Baxter, Jedelle Baxter, Jr., Myrtle Bazil, Faveur Bazilme, Frank J. Bazzicalupo, Larry Bealer, Thomas Beattie, Janice Beatty, Richard A. Beatty, Robert W Beatty(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Jane Beatty), Robert W Beatty(As personal representative of the Estate of Jane Beatty, Deceased), Theodore Beck, Jonathan M Becker, Christian Bediako, Dolores Bedigian, Joseph J Bedigian, Robert Bedigian, Michael Beehler, Theodora Beekman, George Behr, Imnaculada Behr, Thomas J Beirne, Boris Belilovsky(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Helen Belilovsky, Deceased), Boris Belilovsky(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Helen Belilovsky), Michael J. Bell, John Bellew, Anthony Bellisari, Sean Bellows, Scott R. Beloten, John Benedetto, Vanessa Benjamin, Derek P. Bennett, Ian Bennett, Ondina Bennett(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Bryan Craig Bennett, Deceased), Ondina Bennett(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Bryan Craig Bennett), Frances Berdan, Gary Berger, Suzanne J. Berger(As Personal Representative of the Estate of James P. Berger, Deceased), Suzanne J. Berger(On behalf of all beneficiaries of James P. Berger), James W. Berghorn, Agnes Bergin, George R. Bergin, George M. Bergin, Juliette Bergman, Kenneth Bergsohn, Michele Bergsohn, Deborah E. Berk, Nancy Berliner, David M. Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein(As Personal Representative of the Estate of William M. Bernstein, Deceased), Robert J. Bernstein(On behalf of all beneficiaries of William M. Bernstein), Eric Bernsten, Evelyn Berry, Joseph S. Berry, Joseph T. Berry, Kimberly A. Berry, Todd P. Berry, Alice Bertorelli, Eileen Bertorelli-Zangrillo, Dominic Bertucci, Francisco Betancourt, Donald Betterly, Jr, Donald A. Betterly, Joan C. Betterly, Joanne F. Betterly(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Timothy D. Betterly), Joanne F. Betterly(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy D. Betterly, Deceased), Mark Betterly, Marle Luisa Bey, Donna D. Bhagwan, Prakash Bhatt, Indira Bhukhan, Jagdish Bhukhan, Cynthia Rancke Bienenmann, Donald Bigi, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Tina Marie Bilcher(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Bilcher, Deceased), Tina Marie Bilcher(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Brian Bilcher, Deceased), Carolyn Staub Bilelis, Stephen Bileski, Christopher Bilotti, Patricia Bingley, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Kris Romeo Bishundat, Deceased), Basmattie Bishundat(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Kris Romeo Bishundat), Bhola P. Bishundat(As Personal Represenative of the Estate of Kris Romeo Bishundat, Deceased), Bhola P. Bishundat(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Kris Romeo Bishundat), James A. Bittles, Shawn Bittner, Daniel Bivona, Albert A. Blackman, Hyacinth Blackman, Jane Blackwell, Virginia Bladen, Patrick Blaine, Leslie R. Blair, James Blake, Robert Blake, Victoria Blaksley, Jody Blanchard, Scott Blaney, Stan Blaskey, Barbara Blass, Keith Blass, Neil Blass, Richard J. Blatus, Ira Blau(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Rita Blau), Ira Blau(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Rita Blau, Deceased), Lucille Bleimann, Harvey Blomberg, Susan Uman Blomberg, Aaron Bogad, Eugenia Bogado, Erin Boland, Gregory Boland, Joyce Boland, Vincent Boland, Sr, Edward P. Bolger, Jan Bonanza, Joseph Bondarenko, William Bondarenko, Michelle Bonetti, Roxane Bonheur, Luis Bonilla, Concetta Bonner, George Bonomo, John Bonomo(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Yvonne Bonomo, Deceased), John Bonomo(On behalf of al
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iranian Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iranian Ministry of Commerce. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The National Iranian Petrochemical Company. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iran Airlines. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The National Iranian Gas Company. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The National Iranian Oil Corporation. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The National Iranian Tanker Corporation. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Iranian Ministry of Petroleum. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hezbollah. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iranian Ministry of Information and Security. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Islamic Republic of Iran. (dgo)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Turner Haefele to RE-FILE Document No. #20 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (moh)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Michael J. Gibbons, John McAllister, Lillian C. Tetreault added. Party added pursuant to #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Michael J. Gibbons, John McAllister, Lillian C. Tetreault.(Haefele, Robert)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Iranian Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Doe AP149, Doe AP150, Doe AP167, Doe AP195, Doe AP212, Doe AP234, Doe AP235, Doe AP241, Doe AP250, Doe AP40, Doe AP41, Doe AP45, Doe AP61, Doe AP926, Anisia C. Abarabar, Elaine Abate, Yvonne V. Abdool, Suzanne Abenmoha, Ammini G. Abraham, Ann M. Abrahamson, Celso J. Abreu, John J. Acerno, Humberto R. Acosta, Alfred Acquaviva, Courtney Acquaviva, Josephine Acquaviva, Dwight D. Adams, Elizabeth J. Adams, Jean Adams, Kevin John Adams, Lawrence Scott Adams, Robert C. Adams, Affiong Adanga, Dawn Addamo, Gregory Addamo, Rita Addamo, Alice D. Adler, Darryl J. Adone, Stacey Afflitto, George A Agaiby, Rita Agnello, Salvatore Agnello, Vinnie Carla Agnello, Jennifer Agresto, Diane B. Aguiar, Joao A. Aguiar, Taciana Aguiar, Judith M. Aiken, Mark Aiken, James Alario, James F. Albach, Jr, Edward Albert, Thomas Albert, Maria Y. Aldaco, Elizabeth Alderman, Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman, Laura Alessi, Karium Ali, Louisa Allegretto, Luke C. Allen, Lynn P. Allen, Madelyn Gail Allen, Marguerite G. Allen, Matthew J. Allen, Michael J. Allen, Richard D. Allen, Ronald Allen, Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson, Donna Allingham, James J. Allingham, Patricia C. Allingham, William J. Allingham, Jr, William J. Allingham, V. Blake Allison, Ivan Almendarez, Jr, Neil Alper, Leonor Alvarez, Elizabeth Alverson, Robert E. Alverson, Christopher Alviar, Gemma Alviar, Gianina Alviar, Grace Alviar, Jocelyne Ambroise, Kenneth Paul Ambrose, Sharon Ambrose, Mitchell Amerbach, Patricia Amo, Marie L. Anaya, Christine A. Anchundia, Elias J. Anchundia, Elias A. Anchundia, Elizabeth R. Anchundia, Dorothy Ancona, Elizabeth Andersen, Douglas Anderson, Jill G. Anderson, Joanne Anderson, Kathryn G. Anderson, Thomas Anderson, Betty Andrade, Edward S. Andrews, Meredith Andrews, Morien Angaroo, Donna L. Angelini, Marianne Angelo, Dawn Angrisani, Ralph Angrisani, Laura Renee Anspach, Diane Antolos, Ioannis Antoniadis, Joseph P Antony, Cecile M. Apollo, Peter Apollo, Margaret Apostol, Carol Ann Aquilino, Frank J. Aquilino, Alicia Arancibia, Janet Arbuiso, Daniel J Archbold, Peter Archer, Tony Archer, Lori Ann Arczynski, Wandalee Arena, Irene Arguelles, Andrew Arias, Donald Arias, Thomas Arias, Lorraine M Arias-Beliveau, Joseph Ariola, Gabriel Armstrong, Gerard Armstrong, Laura A. Armstrong, Marian Armstrong, Mary E Armstrong, Mary E. Armstrong, Michael Arniero, Cynthia Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Ruth Green Aron, Jules P Aronson, Emma Louise Arro, Benjamin Arroyo, Maria Aryee, Teiko Aryee, Maritza Arzayus, Adolfo Arzu, Andrea Asbury, Elaine Asciak, Vivian Asciak, Shawn Ashe, Dana Asher, Ethel Asher, Sigal Asher, Stuart Asher, Julia Rocia Asitimbay Quintuna, Rosa Elena Asitimbay Quintuna, Elaine Atwood, Elaine M Atwood, Gerald Atwood, Gregory P Atwood, John G Atwood, Raymond J Atwood, Se Jua Au, Philipson Azenabor, Carla Bacchus, Juana Bacchus, George Bachmann, Grace Badagliacca, John Badagliacca, Paul J. Bader, John P. Baeszler, Diana Baez, Judith A. Bailey, Katherine Bailey, Kevin J. Bailey, Paula Bailey, Todd G. Bailey, Vincent H Bailey, Yarah H. Bailey, Yuriah Bailey, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Maureen Lynch Baker, Martha Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Maureen Baksh Griffin, Mary Louise Ball, Lucia Balzan, Lynette Bangaree, Aristides Bantis, Evangelos Bantis, Soultana Bantis, Gentil Baptiste, Victor Barahona, Carol Baran, Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Jr, Mary E. Barbieri, Garrett Barbosa, Armando Bardales, Thomas J. Baroz, Kathryn Lee Barrere, Audriene Barry, Bertrand Francis Barry, Bertrand Arthur Barry, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Diane Barry), Edmund Barry(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Barry, Deceased), John T. Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Marianne Joan Barry, Maureen Barry, Patricia Anne Barry, Patrick T. Barry, Frank Barton, Gila Barzvi, Chris Basnicki, Jean Basnicki, Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki, Robert J Basnicki, William Basnicki, Burney Bates, Pedro Batista, James A Bauer, Christopher A. Baumann, Evon Baumgardner, Rameses G. Bautista, John M. Bavis, Mary Bavis(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Mark Lawrence Bavis), Mary Bavis(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Lawrence Bavis, Deceased), Michael T. Bavis, Patrick J. Bavis, Kelly Bavis Morrissey, Dennis Baxter, Diane Baxter, Donald Baxter, Lawrence Baxter, Lillian Baxter, Mattie L. Baxter, Jedelle Baxter, Jr., Myrtle Bazil, Faveur Bazilme, Frank J. Bazzicalupo, Larry Bealer, Thomas Beattie, Janice Beatty, Richard A. Beatty, Robert W Beatty, Theodore Beck, Jonathan M Becker, Christian Bediako, Dolores Bedigian, Joseph J Bedigian, Robert Bedigian, Michael Beehler, Theodora Beekman, George Behr, Imnaculada Behr, Thomas J Beirne, Boris Belilovsky, Michael J. Bell, John Bellew, Anthony Bellisari, Sean Bellows, Scott R. Beloten, John Benedetto, Vanessa Benjamin, Derek P. Bennett, Ian Bennett, Ondina Bennett, Frances Berdan, Gary Berger, Suzanne J. Berger, James W. Berghorn, Agnes Bergin, George R. Bergin, George M. Bergin, Juliette Bergman, Kenneth Bergsohn, Michele Bergsohn, Deborah E. Berk, Nancy Berliner, David M. Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein, Eric Bernsten, Evelyn Berry, Joseph S. Berry, Joseph T. Berry, Kimberly A. Berry, Todd P. Berry, Alice Bertorelli, Eileen Bertorelli-Zangrillo, Dominic Bertucci, Francisco Betancourt, Donald Betterly, Jr, Donald A. Betterly, Sr, Joan C. Betterly, Joanne F. Betterly, Mark Betterly, Marle Luisa Bey, Donna D. Bhagwan, Prakash Bhatt, Indira Bhukhan, Jagdish Bhukhan, Cynthia Rancke Bienenmann, Donald Bigi, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Tina Marie Bilcher, Carolyn Staub Bilelis, Stephen Bileski, Christopher Bilotti, Patricia Bingley, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat, Bhola P. Bishundat, James A. Bittles, Shawn Bittner, Daniel Bivona, Albert A. Blackman, Hyacinth Blackman, Jane Blackwell, Virginia Bladen, Patrick Blaine, Leslie R. Blair, James Blake, Robert Blake, Victoria Blaksley, Jody Blanchard, Scott Blaney, Stan Blaskey, Barbara Blass, Keith Blass, Neil Blass, Richard J. Blatus, Ira Blau, Lucille Bleimann, Harvey Blomberg, Susan Uman Blomberg, Aaron Bogad, Eugenia Bogado, Erin Boland, Gregory Boland, Joyce Boland, Vincent Boland, Sr, Edward P. Bolger, Jan Bonanza, Joseph Bondarenko, William Bondarenko, Michelle Bonetti, Roxane Bonheur, Luis Bonilla, Concetta Bonner, George Bonomo, John Bonomo, Sonia Bonomo, Rose Booker, Sharon Booker, Quinceyann Booker-Jackson, Richard Booms, Andrew Boone, Christopher Boone, Jason Boone, Linda K. Boone, Richard M. Borquist, Juana B. Borrero, Lilian Borrero, Miriam Borrero, Jessica Bors, Deborah Borza, William Bosco, Jr, Marlyse Bosley, Chester Botch, Frederick Earl Bouchard, Jr., Corrine E. Bounty, Tracey Clark Bourke, Kathryn C. Bowden, Paul Bowden, Sheilah L Bowden, Thomas H Bowden, Orla Bowie, Stephanie Ayn Bowser, Bella Boyarsky, Vladimir Boyarsky, Ronald Boyce, James J Boyle, James R. Boyle, John W. Boyle, Joseph M. Boyle, David John Braca, Edward P Bracken, Mary Bracken, Kevin Bradbury, Helen O'Mahony Bradley, Jennifer Brady, Mary Brady, Michael J. Brady, Peter Brady, Susann Brady, Nelly Braginsky, Diane Braitsch, Frank Brancato, Jason Brandemarti, Nancy Brandemarti, Nicholas M Brandemarti, Nicole Brandemarti, David B. Brandhorst, Susan M. Brannigan, Christopher B. Bratton, Erin G. Bratton, Mary E. Bratton, William J. Bratton, III, William J. Bratton, Jr, Michel Braut, Barbara H. Brennan, Brian T. Brennan, George Brennan, James John Brennan, Veronica Brennan, Raymond Bressingham, Carol A Brethel, Jeffrey A. Brezil, Carmen Bridgeforth, David Allen Bridgeforth, Arina Bridges, Barbara Bridges, James Briordy, Gerard Brisman, Juliette Brisman, Steven Brisman, Michael P. Brodbeck, Eric J Brodin, Boris Bronshteyn, Robert Broome, Isoline Broomfield, Bernard Curtis Brown, Edward M. Brown, Ernest O Brown, Everton Brown, Kevin J. Brown, Michael Everett Brown, Michael P Brown, Sinita Brown, Stephen C. Brown, Ann M. Browne, Sigalit Brunn, Eduardo E. Bruno, Thomas J. Bubelnik, Charilyn S. Buchanan, Ronald B. Buchanan, Johnathan Buchsbaum, Catherine Morrison Buck, Eric Buck, Ernest H. Buck, Josephine Buck, John C. Buckley, Kathleen M Buckley, Joseph Buda, Brook Budd, James Bueche, Linda Buffa, Michele Buffolino, Fran Bulaga, Gail M. Bulaga, Michelle A. Bulaga, John E. Bulaga, Sr., Vincent Bulzomi, Corinne Bunin, Kitty Bunin, Nancy Burcham, Denise Burger, Susan T. Burghouwt, Javier Burgos, Alicia P. Burke, Chris Burke, James M. Burke, John J. Burke, Thomas Burke, Timothy J. Burke, Bradley M Burlingame, Debra Burlingame, Mark W. Burlingame, Carrie Burlock, Beverly Burnett, Deena Burnett, Martha Jane Burnett, Thomas E. Burnett, Sr, Agnes D. Burns, Bernard J. Burns, Jennifer C. Burns, Kevin M. Burns, Kevin Burns, Michael R. Burns, Michael J. Burns, Robert Burns, Maureen Burns-Dewland, William F. Burns-Lynch, Sandra Burnside, Barry L Buss, Kevin Butler, Catherine Butt, Jacqueline Butt, Lois Buxbaum, Pasquale Buzzelli, Vivian Byas, Walter Byas, Richard Bylicki, Anne Byrne, Eileen Byrne, Francis X. Byrne, Garett C. Byrne, Judith Byrne, Robert G. Byrne, Jr, Robert G. Byrne, Sr, Thomas Byrne, William J. Byrne, Victoria Cabezas, Marmily Cabrera, Louie D. Cacchioli, Julio Caceres, James Caddigan, Veronica Caggiano, Colleen Cahill, Evelyn Cahill, James Cahill, Kevin J. Cahill, Kevin Cahill, Sharon O. Cahill, Lorraine Caiazzo, Rosa Caicedo, Michael Cain, Rosemary Cain, John Cairney, William Calahan, Christopher Calamia, Ronald Calcagno, Andrea Caldarella, Gloria E. Calderon, Marino Calderon, Darlene Caldwell, Bridget Callahan, Ellen Callahan, James Callahan, Joan E. Callahan, Jose Callejas, Fernando Camacho, Christina Cambeis, Joseph Cammarata, Joseph Cammarata, Jr, Kimberly Cammarata, Linda Cammarata, Cynthia J. Campb
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Iranian Ministry of Commerce, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Doe AP149, Doe AP150, Doe AP167, Doe AP195, Doe AP212, Doe AP234, Doe AP235, Doe AP241, Doe AP250, Doe AP40, Doe AP41, Doe AP45, Doe AP61, Doe AP926, Anisia C. Abarabar, Elaine Abate, Yvonne V. Abdool, Suzanne Abenmoha, Ammini G. Abraham, Ann M. Abrahamson, Celso J. Abreu, John J. Acerno, Humberto R. Acosta, Alfred Acquaviva, Courtney Acquaviva, Josephine Acquaviva, Dwight D. Adams, Elizabeth J. Adams, Jean Adams, Kevin John Adams, Lawrence Scott Adams, Robert C. Adams, Affiong Adanga, Dawn Addamo, Gregory Addamo, Rita Addamo, Alice D. Adler, Darryl J. Adone, Stacey Afflitto, George A Agaiby, Rita Agnello, Salvatore Agnello, Vinnie Carla Agnello, Jennifer Agresto, Diane B. Aguiar, Joao A. Aguiar, Taciana Aguiar, Judith M. Aiken, Mark Aiken, James Alario, James F. Albach, Jr, Edward Albert, Thomas Albert, Maria Y. Aldaco, Elizabeth Alderman, Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman, Laura Alessi, Karium Ali, Louisa Allegretto, Luke C. Allen, Lynn P. Allen, Madelyn Gail Allen, Marguerite G. Allen, Matthew J. Allen, Michael J. Allen, Richard D. Allen, Ronald Allen, Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson, Donna Allingham, James J. Allingham, Patricia C. Allingham, William J. Allingham, Jr, William J. Allingham, V. Blake Allison, Ivan Almendarez, Jr, Neil Alper, Leonor Alvarez, Elizabeth Alverson, Robert E. Alverson, Christopher Alviar, Gemma Alviar, Gianina Alviar, Grace Alviar, Jocelyne Ambroise, Kenneth Paul Ambrose, Sharon Ambrose, Mitchell Amerbach, Patricia Amo, Marie L. Anaya, Christine A. Anchundia, Elias J. Anchundia, Elias A. Anchundia, Elizabeth R. Anchundia, Dorothy Ancona, Elizabeth Andersen, Douglas Anderson, Jill G. Anderson, Joanne Anderson, Kathryn G. Anderson, Thomas Anderson, Betty Andrade, Edward S. Andrews, Meredith Andrews, Morien Angaroo, Donna L. Angelini, Marianne Angelo, Dawn Angrisani, Ralph Angrisani, Laura Renee Anspach, Diane Antolos, Ioannis Antoniadis, Joseph P Antony, Cecile M. Apollo, Peter Apollo, Margaret Apostol, Carol Ann Aquilino, Frank J. Aquilino, Alicia Arancibia, Janet Arbuiso, Daniel J Archbold, Peter Archer, Tony Archer, Lori Ann Arczynski, Wandalee Arena, Irene Arguelles, Andrew Arias, Donald Arias, Thomas Arias, Lorraine M Arias-Beliveau, Joseph Ariola, Gabriel Armstrong, Gerard Armstrong, Laura A. Armstrong, Marian Armstrong, Mary E Armstrong, Mary E. Armstrong, Michael Arniero, Cynthia Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Ruth Green Aron, Jules P Aronson, Emma Louise Arro, Benjamin Arroyo, Maria Aryee, Teiko Aryee, Maritza Arzayus, Adolfo Arzu, Andrea Asbury, Elaine Asciak, Vivian Asciak, Shawn Ashe, Dana Asher, Ethel Asher, Sigal Asher, Stuart Asher, Julia Rocia Asitimbay Quintuna, Rosa Elena Asitimbay Quintuna, Elaine Atwood, Elaine M Atwood, Gerald Atwood, Gregory P Atwood, John G Atwood, Raymond J Atwood, Se Jua Au, Philipson Azenabor, Carla Bacchus, Juana Bacchus, George Bachmann, Grace Badagliacca, John Badagliacca, Paul J. Bader, John P. Baeszler, Diana Baez, Judith A. Bailey, Katherine Bailey, Kevin J. Bailey, Paula Bailey, Todd G. Bailey, Vincent H Bailey, Yarah H. Bailey, Yuriah Bailey, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Maureen Lynch Baker, Martha Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Maureen Baksh Griffin, Mary Louise Ball, Lucia Balzan, Lynette Bangaree, Aristides Bantis, Evangelos Bantis, Soultana Bantis, Gentil Baptiste, Victor Barahona, Carol Baran, Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Jr, Mary E. Barbieri, Garrett Barbosa, Armando Bardales, Thomas J. Baroz, Kathryn Lee Barrere, Audriene Barry, Bertrand Francis Barry, Bertrand Arthur Barry, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Diane Barry), Edmund Barry(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Barry, Deceased), John T. Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Marianne Joan Barry, Maureen Barry, Patricia Anne Barry, Patrick T. Barry, Frank Barton, Gila Barzvi, Chris Basnicki, Jean Basnicki, Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki, Robert J Basnicki, William Basnicki, Burney Bates, Pedro Batista, James A Bauer, Christopher A. Baumann, Evon Baumgardner, Rameses G. Bautista, John M. Bavis, Mary Bavis(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Mark Lawrence Bavis), Mary Bavis(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Lawrence Bavis, Deceased), Michael T. Bavis, Patrick J. Bavis, Kelly Bavis Morrissey, Dennis Baxter, Diane Baxter, Donald Baxter, Lawrence Baxter, Lillian Baxter, Mattie L. Baxter, Jedelle Baxter, Jr., Myrtle Bazil, Faveur Bazilme, Frank J. Bazzicalupo, Larry Bealer, Thomas Beattie, Janice Beatty, Richard A. Beatty, Robert W Beatty, Theodore Beck, Jonathan M Becker, Christian Bediako, Dolores Bedigian, Joseph J Bedigian, Robert Bedigian, Michael Beehler, Theodora Beekman, George Behr, Imnaculada Behr, Thomas J Beirne, Boris Belilovsky, Michael J. Bell, John Bellew, Anthony Bellisari, Sean Bellows, Scott R. Beloten, John Benedetto, Vanessa Benjamin, Derek P. Bennett, Ian Bennett, Ondina Bennett, Frances Berdan, Gary Berger, Suzanne J. Berger, James W. Berghorn, Agnes Bergin, George R. Bergin, George M. Bergin, Juliette Bergman, Kenneth Bergsohn, Michele Bergsohn, Deborah E. Berk, Nancy Berliner, David M. Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein, Eric Bernsten, Evelyn Berry, Joseph S. Berry, Joseph T. Berry, Kimberly A. Berry, Todd P. Berry, Alice Bertorelli, Eileen Bertorelli-Zangrillo, Dominic Bertucci, Francisco Betancourt, Donald Betterly, Jr, Donald A. Betterly, Sr, Joan C. Betterly, Joanne F. Betterly, Mark Betterly, Marle Luisa Bey, Donna D. Bhagwan, Prakash Bhatt, Indira Bhukhan, Jagdish Bhukhan, Cynthia Rancke Bienenmann, Donald Bigi, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Tina Marie Bilcher, Carolyn Staub Bilelis, Stephen Bileski, Christopher Bilotti, Patricia Bingley, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat, Bhola P. Bishundat, James A. Bittles, Shawn Bittner, Daniel Bivona, Albert A. Blackman, Hyacinth Blackman, Jane Blackwell, Virginia Bladen, Patrick Blaine, Leslie R. Blair, James Blake, Robert Blake, Victoria Blaksley, Jody Blanchard, Scott Blaney, Stan Blaskey, Barbara Blass, Keith Blass, Neil Blass, Richard J. Blatus, Ira Blau, Lucille Bleimann, Harvey Blomberg, Susan Uman Blomberg, Aaron Bogad, Eugenia Bogado, Erin Boland, Gregory Boland, Joyce Boland, Vincent Boland, Sr, Edward P. Bolger, Jan Bonanza, Joseph Bondarenko, William Bondarenko, Michelle Bonetti, Roxane Bonheur, Luis Bonilla, Concetta Bonner, George Bonomo, John Bonomo, Sonia Bonomo, Rose Booker, Sharon Booker, Quinceyann Booker-Jackson, Richard Booms, Andrew Boone, Christopher Boone, Jason Boone, Linda K. Boone, Richard M. Borquist, Juana B. Borrero, Lilian Borrero, Miriam Borrero, Jessica Bors, Deborah Borza, William Bosco, Jr, Marlyse Bosley, Chester Botch, Frederick Earl Bouchard, Jr., Corrine E. Bounty, Tracey Clark Bourke, Kathryn C. Bowden, Paul Bowden, Sheilah L Bowden, Thomas H Bowden, Orla Bowie, Stephanie Ayn Bowser, Bella Boyarsky, Vladimir Boyarsky, Ronald Boyce, James J Boyle, James R. Boyle, John W. Boyle, Joseph M. Boyle, David John Braca, Edward P Bracken, Mary Bracken, Kevin Bradbury, Helen O'Mahony Bradley, Jennifer Brady, Mary Brady, Michael J. Brady, Peter Brady, Susann Brady, Nelly Braginsky, Diane Braitsch, Frank Brancato, Jason Brandemarti, Nancy Brandemarti, Nicholas M Brandemarti, Nicole Brandemarti, David B. Brandhorst, Susan M. Brannigan, Christopher B. Bratton, Erin G. Bratton, Mary E. Bratton, William J. Bratton, III, William J. Bratton, Jr, Michel Braut, Barbara H. Brennan, Brian T. Brennan, George Brennan, James John Brennan, Veronica Brennan, Raymond Bressingham, Carol A Brethel, Jeffrey A. Brezil, Carmen Bridgeforth, David Allen Bridgeforth, Arina Bridges, Barbara Bridges, James Briordy, Gerard Brisman, Juliette Brisman, Steven Brisman, Michael P. Brodbeck, Eric J Brodin, Boris Bronshteyn, Robert Broome, Isoline Broomfield, Bernard Curtis Brown, Edward M. Brown, Ernest O Brown, Everton Brown, Kevin J. Brown, Michael Everett Brown, Michael P Brown, Sinita Brown, Stephen C. Brown, Ann M. Browne, Sigalit Brunn, Eduardo E. Bruno, Thomas J. Bubelnik, Charilyn S. Buchanan, Ronald B. Buchanan, Johnathan Buchsbaum, Catherine Morrison Buck, Eric Buck, Ernest H. Buck, Josephine Buck, John C. Buckley, Kathleen M Buckley, Joseph Buda, Brook Budd, James Bueche, Linda Buffa, Michele Buffolino, Fran Bulaga, Gail M. Bulaga, Michelle A. Bulaga, John E. Bulaga, Sr., Vincent Bulzomi, Corinne Bunin, Kitty Bunin, Nancy Burcham, Denise Burger, Susan T. Burghouwt, Javier Burgos, Alicia P. Burke, Chris Burke, James M. Burke, John J. Burke, Thomas Burke, Timothy J. Burke, Bradley M Burlingame, Debra Burlingame, Mark W. Burlingame, Carrie Burlock, Beverly Burnett, Deena Burnett, Martha Jane Burnett, Thomas E. Burnett, Sr, Agnes D. Burns, Bernard J. Burns, Jennifer C. Burns, Kevin M. Burns, Kevin Burns, Michael R. Burns, Michael J. Burns, Robert Burns, Maureen Burns-Dewland, William F. Burns-Lynch, Sandra Burnside, Barry L Buss, Kevin Butler, Catherine Butt, Jacqueline Butt, Lois Buxbaum, Pasquale Buzzelli, Vivian Byas, Walter Byas, Richard Bylicki, Anne Byrne, Eileen Byrne, Francis X. Byrne, Garett C. Byrne, Judith Byrne, Robert G. Byrne, Jr, Robert G. Byrne, Sr, Thomas Byrne, William J. Byrne, Victoria Cabezas, Marmily Cabrera, Louie D. Cacchioli, Julio Caceres, James Caddigan, Veronica Caggiano, Colleen Cahill, Evelyn Cahill, James Cahill, Kevin J. Cahill, Kevin Cahill, Sharon O. Cahill, Lorraine Caiazzo, Rosa Caicedo, Michael Cain, Rosemary Cain, John Cairney, William Calahan, Christopher Calamia, Ronald Calcagno, Andrea Caldarella, Gloria E. Calderon, Marino Calderon, Darlene Caldwell, Bridget Callahan, Ellen Callahan, James Callahan, Joan E. Callahan, Jose Callejas, Fernando Camacho, Christina Cambeis, Joseph Cammarata, Joseph Cammarata, Jr, Kimberly Cammarata, Linda Cammarata, Cynthia J. Campbell, Malcolm P Campbell, S
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Doe AP149, Doe AP150, Doe AP167, Doe AP195, Doe AP212, Doe AP234, Doe AP235, Doe AP241, Doe AP250, Doe AP40, Doe AP41, Doe AP45, Doe AP61, Doe AP926, Anisia C. Abarabar, Elaine Abate, Yvonne V. Abdool, Suzanne Abenmoha, Ammini G. Abraham, Ann M. Abrahamson, Celso J. Abreu, John J. Acerno, Humberto R. Acosta, Alfred Acquaviva, Courtney Acquaviva, Josephine Acquaviva, Dwight D. Adams, Elizabeth J. Adams, Jean Adams, Kevin John Adams, Lawrence Scott Adams, Robert C. Adams, Affiong Adanga, Dawn Addamo, Gregory Addamo, Rita Addamo, Alice D. Adler, Darryl J. Adone, Stacey Afflitto, George A Agaiby, Rita Agnello, Salvatore Agnello, Vinnie Carla Agnello, Jennifer Agresto, Diane B. Aguiar, Joao A. Aguiar, Taciana Aguiar, Judith M. Aiken, Mark Aiken, James Alario, James F. Albach, Jr, Edward Albert, Thomas Albert, Maria Y. Aldaco, Elizabeth Alderman, Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman, Laura Alessi, Karium Ali, Louisa Allegretto, Luke C. Allen, Lynn P. Allen, Madelyn Gail Allen, Marguerite G. Allen, Matthew J. Allen, Michael J. Allen, Richard D. Allen, Ronald Allen, Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson, Donna Allingham, James J. Allingham, Patricia C. Allingham, William J. Allingham, Jr, William J. Allingham, V. Blake Allison, Ivan Almendarez, Jr, Neil Alper, Leonor Alvarez, Elizabeth Alverson, Robert E. Alverson, Christopher Alviar, Gemma Alviar, Gianina Alviar, Grace Alviar, Jocelyne Ambroise, Kenneth Paul Ambrose, Sharon Ambrose, Mitchell Amerbach, Patricia Amo, Marie L. Anaya, Christine A. Anchundia, Elias J. Anchundia, Elias A. Anchundia, Elizabeth R. Anchundia, Dorothy Ancona, Elizabeth Andersen, Douglas Anderson, Jill G. Anderson, Joanne Anderson, Kathryn G. Anderson, Thomas Anderson, Betty Andrade, Edward S. Andrews, Meredith Andrews, Morien Angaroo, Donna L. Angelini, Marianne Angelo, Dawn Angrisani, Ralph Angrisani, Laura Renee Anspach, Diane Antolos, Ioannis Antoniadis, Joseph P Antony, Cecile M. Apollo, Peter Apollo, Margaret Apostol, Carol Ann Aquilino, Frank J. Aquilino, Alicia Arancibia, Janet Arbuiso, Daniel J Archbold, Peter Archer, Tony Archer, Lori Ann Arczynski, Wandalee Arena, Irene Arguelles, Andrew Arias, Donald Arias, Thomas Arias, Lorraine M Arias-Beliveau, Joseph Ariola, Gabriel Armstrong, Gerard Armstrong, Laura A. Armstrong, Marian Armstrong, Mary E Armstrong, Mary E. Armstrong, Michael Arniero, Cynthia Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Ruth Green Aron, Jules P Aronson, Emma Louise Arro, Benjamin Arroyo, Maria Aryee, Teiko Aryee, Maritza Arzayus, Adolfo Arzu, Andrea Asbury, Elaine Asciak, Vivian Asciak, Shawn Ashe, Dana Asher, Ethel Asher, Sigal Asher, Stuart Asher, Julia Rocia Asitimbay Quintuna, Rosa Elena Asitimbay Quintuna, Elaine Atwood, Elaine M Atwood, Gerald Atwood, Gregory P Atwood, John G Atwood, Raymond J Atwood, Se Jua Au, Philipson Azenabor, Carla Bacchus, Juana Bacchus, George Bachmann, Grace Badagliacca, John Badagliacca, Paul J. Bader, John P. Baeszler, Diana Baez, Judith A. Bailey, Katherine Bailey, Kevin J. Bailey, Paula Bailey, Todd G. Bailey, Vincent H Bailey, Yarah H. Bailey, Yuriah Bailey, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Maureen Lynch Baker, Martha Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Maureen Baksh Griffin, Mary Louise Ball, Lucia Balzan, Lynette Bangaree, Aristides Bantis, Evangelos Bantis, Soultana Bantis, Gentil Baptiste, Victor Barahona, Carol Baran, Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Jr, Mary E. Barbieri, Garrett Barbosa, Armando Bardales, Thomas J. Baroz, Kathryn Lee Barrere, Audriene Barry, Bertrand Francis Barry, Bertrand Arthur Barry, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Diane Barry), Edmund Barry(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Barry, Deceased), John T. Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Marianne Joan Barry, Maureen Barry, Patricia Anne Barry, Patrick T. Barry, Frank Barton, Gila Barzvi, Chris Basnicki, Jean Basnicki, Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki, Robert J Basnicki, William Basnicki, Burney Bates, Pedro Batista, James A Bauer, Christopher A. Baumann, Evon Baumgardner, Rameses G. Bautista, John M. Bavis, Mary Bavis(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Mark Lawrence Bavis), Mary Bavis(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Lawrence Bavis, Deceased), Michael T. Bavis, Patrick J. Bavis, Kelly Bavis Morrissey, Dennis Baxter, Diane Baxter, Donald Baxter, Lawrence Baxter, Lillian Baxter, Mattie L. Baxter, Jedelle Baxter, Jr., Myrtle Bazil, Faveur Bazilme, Frank J. Bazzicalupo, Larry Bealer, Thomas Beattie, Janice Beatty, Richard A. Beatty, Robert W Beatty, Theodore Beck, Jonathan M Becker, Christian Bediako, Dolores Bedigian, Joseph J Bedigian, Robert Bedigian, Michael Beehler, Theodora Beekman, George Behr, Imnaculada Behr, Thomas J Beirne, Boris Belilovsky, Michael J. Bell, John Bellew, Anthony Bellisari, Sean Bellows, Scott R. Beloten, John Benedetto, Vanessa Benjamin, Derek P. Bennett, Ian Bennett, Ondina Bennett, Frances Berdan, Gary Berger, Suzanne J. Berger, James W. Berghorn, Agnes Bergin, George R. Bergin, George M. Bergin, Juliette Bergman, Kenneth Bergsohn, Michele Bergsohn, Deborah E. Berk, Nancy Berliner, David M. Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein, Eric Bernsten, Evelyn Berry, Joseph S. Berry, Joseph T. Berry, Kimberly A. Berry, Todd P. Berry, Alice Bertorelli, Eileen Bertorelli-Zangrillo, Dominic Bertucci, Francisco Betancourt, Donald Betterly, Jr, Donald A. Betterly, Sr, Joan C. Betterly, Joanne F. Betterly, Mark Betterly, Marle Luisa Bey, Donna D. Bhagwan, Prakash Bhatt, Indira Bhukhan, Jagdish Bhukhan, Cynthia Rancke Bienenmann, Donald Bigi, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Tina Marie Bilcher, Carolyn Staub Bilelis, Stephen Bileski, Christopher Bilotti, Patricia Bingley, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat, Bhola P. Bishundat, James A. Bittles, Shawn Bittner, Daniel Bivona, Albert A. Blackman, Hyacinth Blackman, Jane Blackwell, Virginia Bladen, Patrick Blaine, Leslie R. Blair, James Blake, Robert Blake, Victoria Blaksley, Jody Blanchard, Scott Blaney, Stan Blaskey, Barbara Blass, Keith Blass, Neil Blass, Richard J. Blatus, Ira Blau, Lucille Bleimann, Harvey Blomberg, Susan Uman Blomberg, Aaron Bogad, Eugenia Bogado, Erin Boland, Gregory Boland, Joyce Boland, Vincent Boland, Sr, Edward P. Bolger, Jan Bonanza, Joseph Bondarenko, William Bondarenko, Michelle Bonetti, Roxane Bonheur, Luis Bonilla, Concetta Bonner, George Bonomo, John Bonomo, Sonia Bonomo, Rose Booker, Sharon Booker, Quinceyann Booker-Jackson, Richard Booms, Andrew Boone, Christopher Boone, Jason Boone, Linda K. Boone, Richard M. Borquist, Juana B. Borrero, Lilian Borrero, Miriam Borrero, Jessica Bors, Deborah Borza, William Bosco, Jr, Marlyse Bosley, Chester Botch, Frederick Earl Bouchard, Jr., Corrine E. Bounty, Tracey Clark Bourke, Kathryn C. Bowden, Paul Bowden, Sheilah L Bowden, Thomas H Bowden, Orla Bowie, Stephanie Ayn Bowser, Bella Boyarsky, Vladimir Boyarsky, Ronald Boyce, James J Boyle, James R. Boyle, John W. Boyle, Joseph M. Boyle, David John Braca, Edward P Bracken, Mary Bracken, Kevin Bradbury, Helen O'Mahony Bradley, Jennifer Brady, Mary Brady, Michael J. Brady, Peter Brady, Susann Brady, Nelly Braginsky, Diane Braitsch, Frank Brancato, Jason Brandemarti, Nancy Brandemarti, Nicholas M Brandemarti, Nicole Brandemarti, David B. Brandhorst, Susan M. Brannigan, Christopher B. Bratton, Erin G. Bratton, Mary E. Bratton, William J. Bratton, III, William J. Bratton, Jr, Michel Braut, Barbara H. Brennan, Brian T. Brennan, George Brennan, James John Brennan, Veronica Brennan, Raymond Bressingham, Carol A Brethel, Jeffrey A. Brezil, Carmen Bridgeforth, David Allen Bridgeforth, Arina Bridges, Barbara Bridges, James Briordy, Gerard Brisman, Juliette Brisman, Steven Brisman, Michael P. Brodbeck, Eric J Brodin, Boris Bronshteyn, Robert Broome, Isoline Broomfield, Bernard Curtis Brown, Edward M. Brown, Ernest O Brown, Everton Brown, Kevin J. Brown, Michael Everett Brown, Michael P Brown, Sinita Brown, Stephen C. Brown, Ann M. Browne, Sigalit Brunn, Eduardo E. Bruno, Thomas J. Bubelnik, Charilyn S. Buchanan, Ronald B. Buchanan, Johnathan Buchsbaum, Catherine Morrison Buck, Eric Buck, Ernest H. Buck, Josephine Buck, John C. Buckley, Kathleen M Buckley, Joseph Buda, Brook Budd, James Bueche, Linda Buffa, Michele Buffolino, Fran Bulaga, Gail M. Bulaga, Michelle A. Bulaga, John E. Bulaga, Sr., Vincent Bulzomi, Corinne Bunin, Kitty Bunin, Nancy Burcham, Denise Burger, Susan T. Burghouwt, Javier Burgos, Alicia P. Burke, Chris Burke, James M. Burke, John J. Burke, Thomas Burke, Timothy J. Burke, Bradley M Burlingame, Debra Burlingame, Mark W. Burlingame, Carrie Burlock, Beverly Burnett, Deena Burnett, Martha Jane Burnett, Thomas E. Burnett, Sr, Agnes D. Burns, Bernard J. Burns, Jennifer C. Burns, Kevin M. Burns, Kevin Burns, Michael R. Burns, Michael J. Burns, Robert Burns, Maureen Burns-Dewland, William F. Burns-Lynch, Sandra Burnside, Barry L Buss, Kevin Butler, Catherine Butt, Jacqueline Butt, Lois Buxbaum, Pasquale Buzzelli, Vivian Byas, Walter Byas, Richard Bylicki, Anne Byrne, Eileen Byrne, Francis X. Byrne, Garett C. Byrne, Judith Byrne, Robert G. Byrne, Jr, Robert G. Byrne, Sr, Thomas Byrne, William J. Byrne, Victoria Cabezas, Marmily Cabrera, Louie D. Cacchioli, Julio Caceres, James Caddigan, Veronica Caggiano, Colleen Cahill, Evelyn Cahill, James Cahill, Kevin J. Cahill, Kevin Cahill, Sharon O. Cahill, Lorraine Caiazzo, Rosa Caicedo, Michael Cain, Rosemary Cain, John Cairney, William Calahan, Christopher Calamia, Ronald Calcagno, Andrea Caldarella, Gloria E. Calderon, Marino Calderon, Darlene Caldwell, Bridget Callahan, Ellen Callahan, James Callahan, Joan E. Callahan, Jose Callejas, Fernando Camacho, Christina Cambeis, Joseph Cammarata, Joseph Cammarata, Jr, Kimberly Cammarata, Linda Cammarata, Cynthia J. Campbell, M
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Doe AP149, Doe AP150, Doe AP167, Doe AP195, Doe AP212, Doe AP234, Doe AP235, Doe AP241, Doe AP250, Doe AP40, Doe AP41, Doe AP45, Doe AP61, Doe AP926, Anisia C. Abarabar, Elaine Abate, Yvonne V. Abdool, Suzanne Abenmoha, Ammini G. Abraham, Ann M. Abrahamson, Celso J. Abreu, John J. Acerno, Humberto R. Acosta, Alfred Acquaviva, Courtney Acquaviva, Josephine Acquaviva, Dwight D. Adams, Elizabeth J. Adams, Jean Adams, Kevin John Adams, Lawrence Scott Adams, Robert C. Adams, Affiong Adanga, Dawn Addamo, Gregory Addamo, Rita Addamo, Alice D. Adler, Darryl J. Adone, Stacey Afflitto, George A Agaiby, Rita Agnello, Salvatore Agnello, Vinnie Carla Agnello, Jennifer Agresto, Diane B. Aguiar, Joao A. Aguiar, Taciana Aguiar, Judith M. Aiken, Mark Aiken, James Alario, James F. Albach, Jr, Edward Albert, Thomas Albert, Maria Y. Aldaco, Elizabeth Alderman, Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman, Laura Alessi, Karium Ali, Louisa Allegretto, Luke C. Allen, Lynn P. Allen, Madelyn Gail Allen, Marguerite G. Allen, Matthew J. Allen, Michael J. Allen, Richard D. Allen, Ronald Allen, Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson, Donna Allingham, James J. Allingham, Patricia C. Allingham, William J. Allingham, Jr, William J. Allingham, V. Blake Allison, Ivan Almendarez, Jr, Neil Alper, Leonor Alvarez, Elizabeth Alverson, Robert E. Alverson, Christopher Alviar, Gemma Alviar, Gianina Alviar, Grace Alviar, Jocelyne Ambroise, Kenneth Paul Ambrose, Sharon Ambrose, Mitchell Amerbach, Patricia Amo, Marie L. Anaya, Christine A. Anchundia, Elias J. Anchundia, Elias A. Anchundia, Elizabeth R. Anchundia, Dorothy Ancona, Elizabeth Andersen, Douglas Anderson, Jill G. Anderson, Joanne Anderson, Kathryn G. Anderson, Thomas Anderson, Betty Andrade, Edward S. Andrews, Meredith Andrews, Morien Angaroo, Donna L. Angelini, Marianne Angelo, Dawn Angrisani, Ralph Angrisani, Laura Renee Anspach, Diane Antolos, Ioannis Antoniadis, Joseph P Antony, Cecile M. Apollo, Peter Apollo, Margaret Apostol, Carol Ann Aquilino, Frank J. Aquilino, Alicia Arancibia, Janet Arbuiso, Daniel J Archbold, Peter Archer, Tony Archer, Lori Ann Arczynski, Wandalee Arena, Irene Arguelles, Andrew Arias, Donald Arias, Thomas Arias, Lorraine M Arias-Beliveau, Joseph Ariola, Gabriel Armstrong, Gerard Armstrong, Laura A. Armstrong, Marian Armstrong, Mary E Armstrong, Mary E. Armstrong, Michael Arniero, Cynthia Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Ruth Green Aron, Jules P Aronson, Emma Louise Arro, Benjamin Arroyo, Maria Aryee, Teiko Aryee, Maritza Arzayus, Adolfo Arzu, Andrea Asbury, Elaine Asciak, Vivian Asciak, Shawn Ashe, Dana Asher, Ethel Asher, Sigal Asher, Stuart Asher, Julia Rocia Asitimbay Quintuna, Rosa Elena Asitimbay Quintuna, Elaine Atwood, Elaine M Atwood, Gerald Atwood, Gregory P Atwood, John G Atwood, Raymond J Atwood, Se Jua Au, Philipson Azenabor, Carla Bacchus, Juana Bacchus, George Bachmann, Grace Badagliacca, John Badagliacca, Paul J. Bader, John P. Baeszler, Diana Baez, Judith A. Bailey, Katherine Bailey, Kevin J. Bailey, Paula Bailey, Todd G. Bailey, Vincent H Bailey, Yarah H. Bailey, Yuriah Bailey, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Maureen Lynch Baker, Martha Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Maureen Baksh Griffin, Mary Louise Ball, Lucia Balzan, Lynette Bangaree, Aristides Bantis, Evangelos Bantis, Soultana Bantis, Gentil Baptiste, Victor Barahona, Carol Baran, Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Jr, Mary E. Barbieri, Garrett Barbosa, Armando Bardales, Thomas J. Baroz, Kathryn Lee Barrere, Audriene Barry, Bertrand Francis Barry, Bertrand Arthur Barry, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Diane Barry), Edmund Barry(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Barry, Deceased), John T. Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Marianne Joan Barry, Maureen Barry, Patricia Anne Barry, Patrick T. Barry, Frank Barton, Gila Barzvi, Chris Basnicki, Jean Basnicki, Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki, Robert J Basnicki, William Basnicki, Burney Bates, Pedro Batista, James A Bauer, Christopher A. Baumann, Evon Baumgardner, Rameses G. Bautista, John M. Bavis, Mary Bavis(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Mark Lawrence Bavis), Mary Bavis(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Lawrence Bavis, Deceased), Michael T. Bavis, Patrick J. Bavis, Kelly Bavis Morrissey, Dennis Baxter, Diane Baxter, Donald Baxter, Lawrence Baxter, Lillian Baxter, Mattie L. Baxter, Jedelle Baxter, Jr., Myrtle Bazil, Faveur Bazilme, Frank J. Bazzicalupo, Larry Bealer, Thomas Beattie, Janice Beatty, Richard A. Beatty, Robert W Beatty, Theodore Beck, Jonathan M Becker, Christian Bediako, Dolores Bedigian, Joseph J Bedigian, Robert Bedigian, Michael Beehler, Theodora Beekman, George Behr, Imnaculada Behr, Thomas J Beirne, Boris Belilovsky, Michael J. Bell, John Bellew, Anthony Bellisari, Sean Bellows, Scott R. Beloten, John Benedetto, Vanessa Benjamin, Derek P. Bennett, Ian Bennett, Ondina Bennett, Frances Berdan, Gary Berger, Suzanne J. Berger, James W. Berghorn, Agnes Bergin, George R. Bergin, George M. Bergin, Juliette Bergman, Kenneth Bergsohn, Michele Bergsohn, Deborah E. Berk, Nancy Berliner, David M. Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein, Eric Bernsten, Evelyn Berry, Joseph S. Berry, Joseph T. Berry, Kimberly A. Berry, Todd P. Berry, Alice Bertorelli, Eileen Bertorelli-Zangrillo, Dominic Bertucci, Francisco Betancourt, Donald Betterly, Jr, Donald A. Betterly, Sr, Joan C. Betterly, Joanne F. Betterly, Mark Betterly, Marle Luisa Bey, Donna D. Bhagwan, Prakash Bhatt, Indira Bhukhan, Jagdish Bhukhan, Cynthia Rancke Bienenmann, Donald Bigi, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Tina Marie Bilcher, Carolyn Staub Bilelis, Stephen Bileski, Christopher Bilotti, Patricia Bingley, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat, Bhola P. Bishundat, James A. Bittles, Shawn Bittner, Daniel Bivona, Albert A. Blackman, Hyacinth Blackman, Jane Blackwell, Virginia Bladen, Patrick Blaine, Leslie R. Blair, James Blake, Robert Blake, Victoria Blaksley, Jody Blanchard, Scott Blaney, Stan Blaskey, Barbara Blass, Keith Blass, Neil Blass, Richard J. Blatus, Ira Blau, Lucille Bleimann, Harvey Blomberg, Susan Uman Blomberg, Aaron Bogad, Eugenia Bogado, Erin Boland, Gregory Boland, Joyce Boland, Vincent Boland, Sr, Edward P. Bolger, Jan Bonanza, Joseph Bondarenko, William Bondarenko, Michelle Bonetti, Roxane Bonheur, Luis Bonilla, Concetta Bonner, George Bonomo, John Bonomo, Sonia Bonomo, Rose Booker, Sharon Booker, Quinceyann Booker-Jackson, Richard Booms, Andrew Boone, Christopher Boone, Jason Boone, Linda K. Boone, Richard M. Borquist, Juana B. Borrero, Lilian Borrero, Miriam Borrero, Jessica Bors, Deborah Borza, William Bosco, Jr, Marlyse Bosley, Chester Botch, Frederick Earl Bouchard, Jr., Corrine E. Bounty, Tracey Clark Bourke, Kathryn C. Bowden, Paul Bowden, Sheilah L Bowden, Thomas H Bowden, Orla Bowie, Stephanie Ayn Bowser, Bella Boyarsky, Vladimir Boyarsky, Ronald Boyce, James J Boyle, James R. Boyle, John W. Boyle, Joseph M. Boyle, David John Braca, Edward P Bracken, Mary Bracken, Kevin Bradbury, Helen O'Mahony Bradley, Jennifer Brady, Mary Brady, Michael J. Brady, Peter Brady, Susann Brady, Nelly Braginsky, Diane Braitsch, Frank Brancato, Jason Brandemarti, Nancy Brandemarti, Nicholas M Brandemarti, Nicole Brandemarti, David B. Brandhorst, Susan M. Brannigan, Christopher B. Bratton, Erin G. Bratton, Mary E. Bratton, William J. Bratton, III, William J. Bratton, Jr, Michel Braut, Barbara H. Brennan, Brian T. Brennan, George Brennan, James John Brennan, Veronica Brennan, Raymond Bressingham, Carol A Brethel, Jeffrey A. Brezil, Carmen Bridgeforth, David Allen Bridgeforth, Arina Bridges, Barbara Bridges, James Briordy, Gerard Brisman, Juliette Brisman, Steven Brisman, Michael P. Brodbeck, Eric J Brodin, Boris Bronshteyn, Robert Broome, Isoline Broomfield, Bernard Curtis Brown, Edward M. Brown, Ernest O Brown, Everton Brown, Kevin J. Brown, Michael Everett Brown, Michael P Brown, Sinita Brown, Stephen C. Brown, Ann M. Browne, Sigalit Brunn, Eduardo E. Bruno, Thomas J. Bubelnik, Charilyn S. Buchanan, Ronald B. Buchanan, Johnathan Buchsbaum, Catherine Morrison Buck, Eric Buck, Ernest H. Buck, Josephine Buck, John C. Buckley, Kathleen M Buckley, Joseph Buda, Brook Budd, James Bueche, Linda Buffa, Michele Buffolino, Fran Bulaga, Gail M. Bulaga, Michelle A. Bulaga, John E. Bulaga, Sr., Vincent Bulzomi, Corinne Bunin, Kitty Bunin, Nancy Burcham, Denise Burger, Susan T. Burghouwt, Javier Burgos, Alicia P. Burke, Chris Burke, James M. Burke, John J. Burke, Thomas Burke, Timothy J. Burke, Bradley M Burlingame, Debra Burlingame, Mark W. Burlingame, Carrie Burlock, Beverly Burnett, Deena Burnett, Martha Jane Burnett, Thomas E. Burnett, Sr, Agnes D. Burns, Bernard J. Burns, Jennifer C. Burns, Kevin M. Burns, Kevin Burns, Michael R. Burns, Michael J. Burns, Robert Burns, Maureen Burns-Dewland, William F. Burns-Lynch, Sandra Burnside, Barry L Buss, Kevin Butler, Catherine Butt, Jacqueline Butt, Lois Buxbaum, Pasquale Buzzelli, Vivian Byas, Walter Byas, Richard Bylicki, Anne Byrne, Eileen Byrne, Francis X. Byrne, Garett C. Byrne, Judith Byrne, Robert G. Byrne, Jr, Robert G. Byrne, Sr, Thomas Byrne, William J. Byrne, Victoria Cabezas, Marmily Cabrera, Louie D. Cacchioli, Julio Caceres, James Caddigan, Veronica Caggiano, Colleen Cahill, Evelyn Cahill, James Cahill, Kevin J. Cahill, Kevin Cahill, Sharon O. Cahill, Lorraine Caiazzo, Rosa Caicedo, Michael Cain, Rosemary Cain, John Cairney, William Calahan, Christopher Calamia, Ronald Calcagno, Andrea Caldarella, Gloria E. Calderon, Marino Calderon, Darlene Caldwell, Bridget Callahan, Ellen Callahan, James Callahan, Joan E. Callahan, Jose Callejas, Fernando Camacho, Christina Cambeis, Joseph Cammarata, Joseph Cammarata, Jr, Kimberly Cammarata, Linda Cammarata, Cynthia J. Campbell, M
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The National Iranian Petrochemical Company, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Doe AP149, Doe AP150, Doe AP167, Doe AP195, Doe AP212, Doe AP234, Doe AP235, Doe AP241, Doe AP250, Doe AP40, Doe AP41, Doe AP45, Doe AP61, Doe AP926, Anisia C. Abarabar, Elaine Abate, Yvonne V. Abdool, Suzanne Abenmoha, Ammini G. Abraham, Ann M. Abrahamson, Celso J. Abreu, John J. Acerno, Humberto R. Acosta, Alfred Acquaviva, Courtney Acquaviva, Josephine Acquaviva, Dwight D. Adams, Elizabeth J. Adams, Jean Adams, Kevin John Adams, Lawrence Scott Adams, Robert C. Adams, Affiong Adanga, Dawn Addamo, Gregory Addamo, Rita Addamo, Alice D. Adler, Darryl J. Adone, Stacey Afflitto, George A Agaiby, Rita Agnello, Salvatore Agnello, Vinnie Carla Agnello, Jennifer Agresto, Diane B. Aguiar, Joao A. Aguiar, Taciana Aguiar, Judith M. Aiken, Mark Aiken, James Alario, James F. Albach, Jr, Edward Albert, Thomas Albert, Maria Y. Aldaco, Elizabeth Alderman, Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman, Laura Alessi, Karium Ali, Louisa Allegretto, Luke C. Allen, Lynn P. Allen, Madelyn Gail Allen, Marguerite G. Allen, Matthew J. Allen, Michael J. Allen, Richard D. Allen, Ronald Allen, Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson, Donna Allingham, James J. Allingham, Patricia C. Allingham, William J. Allingham, Jr, William J. Allingham, V. Blake Allison, Ivan Almendarez, Jr, Neil Alper, Leonor Alvarez, Elizabeth Alverson, Robert E. Alverson, Christopher Alviar, Gemma Alviar, Gianina Alviar, Grace Alviar, Jocelyne Ambroise, Kenneth Paul Ambrose, Sharon Ambrose, Mitchell Amerbach, Patricia Amo, Marie L. Anaya, Christine A. Anchundia, Elias J. Anchundia, Elias A. Anchundia, Elizabeth R. Anchundia, Dorothy Ancona, Elizabeth Andersen, Douglas Anderson, Jill G. Anderson, Joanne Anderson, Kathryn G. Anderson, Thomas Anderson, Betty Andrade, Edward S. Andrews, Meredith Andrews, Morien Angaroo, Donna L. Angelini, Marianne Angelo, Dawn Angrisani, Ralph Angrisani, Laura Renee Anspach, Diane Antolos, Ioannis Antoniadis, Joseph P Antony, Cecile M. Apollo, Peter Apollo, Margaret Apostol, Carol Ann Aquilino, Frank J. Aquilino, Alicia Arancibia, Janet Arbuiso, Daniel J Archbold, Peter Archer, Tony Archer, Lori Ann Arczynski, Wandalee Arena, Irene Arguelles, Andrew Arias, Donald Arias, Thomas Arias, Lorraine M Arias-Beliveau, Joseph Ariola, Gabriel Armstrong, Gerard Armstrong, Laura A. Armstrong, Marian Armstrong, Mary E Armstrong, Mary E. Armstrong, Michael Arniero, Cynthia Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Ruth Green Aron, Jules P Aronson, Emma Louise Arro, Benjamin Arroyo, Maria Aryee, Teiko Aryee, Maritza Arzayus, Adolfo Arzu, Andrea Asbury, Elaine Asciak, Vivian Asciak, Shawn Ashe, Dana Asher, Ethel Asher, Sigal Asher, Stuart Asher, Julia Rocia Asitimbay Quintuna, Rosa Elena Asitimbay Quintuna, Elaine Atwood, Elaine M Atwood, Gerald Atwood, Gregory P Atwood, John G Atwood, Raymond J Atwood, Se Jua Au, Philipson Azenabor, Carla Bacchus, Juana Bacchus, George Bachmann, Grace Badagliacca, John Badagliacca, Paul J. Bader, John P. Baeszler, Diana Baez, Judith A. Bailey, Katherine Bailey, Kevin J. Bailey, Paula Bailey, Todd G. Bailey, Vincent H Bailey, Yarah H. Bailey, Yuriah Bailey, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Maureen Lynch Baker, Martha Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Maureen Baksh Griffin, Mary Louise Ball, Lucia Balzan, Lynette Bangaree, Aristides Bantis, Evangelos Bantis, Soultana Bantis, Gentil Baptiste, Victor Barahona, Carol Baran, Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Jr, Mary E. Barbieri, Garrett Barbosa, Armando Bardales, Thomas J. Baroz, Kathryn Lee Barrere, Audriene Barry, Bertrand Francis Barry, Bertrand Arthur Barry, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Diane Barry), Edmund Barry(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Barry, Deceased), John T. Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Marianne Joan Barry, Maureen Barry, Patricia Anne Barry, Patrick T. Barry, Frank Barton, Gila Barzvi, Chris Basnicki, Jean Basnicki, Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki, Robert J Basnicki, William Basnicki, Burney Bates, Pedro Batista, James A Bauer, Christopher A. Baumann, Evon Baumgardner, Rameses G. Bautista, John M. Bavis, Mary Bavis(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Mark Lawrence Bavis), Mary Bavis(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Lawrence Bavis, Deceased), Michael T. Bavis, Patrick J. Bavis, Kelly Bavis Morrissey, Dennis Baxter, Diane Baxter, Donald Baxter, Lawrence Baxter, Lillian Baxter, Mattie L. Baxter, Jedelle Baxter, Jr., Myrtle Bazil, Faveur Bazilme, Frank J. Bazzicalupo, Larry Bealer, Thomas Beattie, Janice Beatty, Richard A. Beatty, Robert W Beatty, Theodore Beck, Jonathan M Becker, Christian Bediako, Dolores Bedigian, Joseph J Bedigian, Robert Bedigian, Michael Beehler, Theodora Beekman, George Behr, Imnaculada Behr, Thomas J Beirne, Boris Belilovsky, Michael J. Bell, John Bellew, Anthony Bellisari, Sean Bellows, Scott R. Beloten, John Benedetto, Vanessa Benjamin, Derek P. Bennett, Ian Bennett, Ondina Bennett, Frances Berdan, Gary Berger, Suzanne J. Berger, James W. Berghorn, Agnes Bergin, George R. Bergin, George M. Bergin, Juliette Bergman, Kenneth Bergsohn, Michele Bergsohn, Deborah E. Berk, Nancy Berliner, David M. Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein, Eric Bernsten, Evelyn Berry, Joseph S. Berry, Joseph T. Berry, Kimberly A. Berry, Todd P. Berry, Alice Bertorelli, Eileen Bertorelli-Zangrillo, Dominic Bertucci, Francisco Betancourt, Donald Betterly, Jr, Donald A. Betterly, Sr, Joan C. Betterly, Joanne F. Betterly, Mark Betterly, Marle Luisa Bey, Donna D. Bhagwan, Prakash Bhatt, Indira Bhukhan, Jagdish Bhukhan, Cynthia Rancke Bienenmann, Donald Bigi, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Tina Marie Bilcher, Carolyn Staub Bilelis, Stephen Bileski, Christopher Bilotti, Patricia Bingley, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat, Bhola P. Bishundat, James A. Bittles, Shawn Bittner, Daniel Bivona, Albert A. Blackman, Hyacinth Blackman, Jane Blackwell, Virginia Bladen, Patrick Blaine, Leslie R. Blair, James Blake, Robert Blake, Victoria Blaksley, Jody Blanchard, Scott Blaney, Stan Blaskey, Barbara Blass, Keith Blass, Neil Blass, Richard J. Blatus, Ira Blau, Lucille Bleimann, Harvey Blomberg, Susan Uman Blomberg, Aaron Bogad, Eugenia Bogado, Erin Boland, Gregory Boland, Joyce Boland, Vincent Boland, Sr, Edward P. Bolger, Jan Bonanza, Joseph Bondarenko, William Bondarenko, Michelle Bonetti, Roxane Bonheur, Luis Bonilla, Concetta Bonner, George Bonomo, John Bonomo, Sonia Bonomo, Rose Booker, Sharon Booker, Quinceyann Booker-Jackson, Richard Booms, Andrew Boone, Christopher Boone, Jason Boone, Linda K. Boone, Richard M. Borquist, Juana B. Borrero, Lilian Borrero, Miriam Borrero, Jessica Bors, Deborah Borza, William Bosco, Jr, Marlyse Bosley, Chester Botch, Frederick Earl Bouchard, Jr., Corrine E. Bounty, Tracey Clark Bourke, Kathryn C. Bowden, Paul Bowden, Sheilah L Bowden, Thomas H Bowden, Orla Bowie, Stephanie Ayn Bowser, Bella Boyarsky, Vladimir Boyarsky, Ronald Boyce, James J Boyle, James R. Boyle, John W. Boyle, Joseph M. Boyle, David John Braca, Edward P Bracken, Mary Bracken, Kevin Bradbury, Helen O'Mahony Bradley, Jennifer Brady, Mary Brady, Michael J. Brady, Peter Brady, Susann Brady, Nelly Braginsky, Diane Braitsch, Frank Brancato, Jason Brandemarti, Nancy Brandemarti, Nicholas M Brandemarti, Nicole Brandemarti, David B. Brandhorst, Susan M. Brannigan, Christopher B. Bratton, Erin G. Bratton, Mary E. Bratton, William J. Bratton, III, William J. Bratton, Jr, Michel Braut, Barbara H. Brennan, Brian T. Brennan, George Brennan, James John Brennan, Veronica Brennan, Raymond Bressingham, Carol A Brethel, Jeffrey A. Brezil, Carmen Bridgeforth, David Allen Bridgeforth, Arina Bridges, Barbara Bridges, James Briordy, Gerard Brisman, Juliette Brisman, Steven Brisman, Michael P. Brodbeck, Eric J Brodin, Boris Bronshteyn, Robert Broome, Isoline Broomfield, Bernard Curtis Brown, Edward M. Brown, Ernest O Brown, Everton Brown, Kevin J. Brown, Michael Everett Brown, Michael P Brown, Sinita Brown, Stephen C. Brown, Ann M. Browne, Sigalit Brunn, Eduardo E. Bruno, Thomas J. Bubelnik, Charilyn S. Buchanan, Ronald B. Buchanan, Johnathan Buchsbaum, Catherine Morrison Buck, Eric Buck, Ernest H. Buck, Josephine Buck, John C. Buckley, Kathleen M Buckley, Joseph Buda, Brook Budd, James Bueche, Linda Buffa, Michele Buffolino, Fran Bulaga, Gail M. Bulaga, Michelle A. Bulaga, John E. Bulaga, Sr., Vincent Bulzomi, Corinne Bunin, Kitty Bunin, Nancy Burcham, Denise Burger, Susan T. Burghouwt, Javier Burgos, Alicia P. Burke, Chris Burke, James M. Burke, John J. Burke, Thomas Burke, Timothy J. Burke, Bradley M Burlingame, Debra Burlingame, Mark W. Burlingame, Carrie Burlock, Beverly Burnett, Deena Burnett, Martha Jane Burnett, Thomas E. Burnett, Sr, Agnes D. Burns, Bernard J. Burns, Jennifer C. Burns, Kevin M. Burns, Kevin Burns, Michael R. Burns, Michael J. Burns, Robert Burns, Maureen Burns-Dewland, William F. Burns-Lynch, Sandra Burnside, Barry L Buss, Kevin Butler, Catherine Butt, Jacqueline Butt, Lois Buxbaum, Pasquale Buzzelli, Vivian Byas, Walter Byas, Richard Bylicki, Anne Byrne, Eileen Byrne, Francis X. Byrne, Garett C. Byrne, Judith Byrne, Robert G. Byrne, Jr, Robert G. Byrne, Sr, Thomas Byrne, William J. Byrne, Victoria Cabezas, Marmily Cabrera, Louie D. Cacchioli, Julio Caceres, James Caddigan, Veronica Caggiano, Colleen Cahill, Evelyn Cahill, James Cahill, Kevin J. Cahill, Kevin Cahill, Sharon O. Cahill, Lorraine Caiazzo, Rosa Caicedo, Michael Cain, Rosemary Cain, John Cairney, William Calahan, Christopher Calamia, Ronald Calcagno, Andrea Caldarella, Gloria E. Calderon, Marino Calderon, Darlene Caldwell, Bridget Callahan, Ellen Callahan, James Callahan, Joan E. Callahan, Jose Callejas, Fernando Camacho, Christina Cambeis, Joseph Cammarata, Joseph Cammarata, Jr, Kimberly Cammarata, Linda Cammarata, Cynthia J. Campbell, Malcolm
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Iran Airlines, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Doe AP149, Doe AP150, Doe AP167, Doe AP195, Doe AP212, Doe AP234, Doe AP235, Doe AP241, Doe AP250, Doe AP40, Doe AP41, Doe AP45, Doe AP61, Doe AP926, Anisia C. Abarabar, Elaine Abate, Yvonne V. Abdool, Suzanne Abenmoha, Ammini G. Abraham, Ann M. Abrahamson, Celso J. Abreu, John J. Acerno, Humberto R. Acosta, Alfred Acquaviva, Courtney Acquaviva, Josephine Acquaviva, Dwight D. Adams, Elizabeth J. Adams, Jean Adams, Kevin John Adams, Lawrence Scott Adams, Robert C. Adams, Affiong Adanga, Dawn Addamo, Gregory Addamo, Rita Addamo, Alice D. Adler, Darryl J. Adone, Stacey Afflitto, George A Agaiby, Rita Agnello, Salvatore Agnello, Vinnie Carla Agnello, Jennifer Agresto, Diane B. Aguiar, Joao A. Aguiar, Taciana Aguiar, Judith M. Aiken, Mark Aiken, James Alario, James F. Albach, Jr, Edward Albert, Thomas Albert, Maria Y. Aldaco, Elizabeth Alderman, Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman, Laura Alessi, Karium Ali, Louisa Allegretto, Luke C. Allen, Lynn P. Allen, Madelyn Gail Allen, Marguerite G. Allen, Matthew J. Allen, Michael J. Allen, Richard D. Allen, Ronald Allen, Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson, Donna Allingham, James J. Allingham, Patricia C. Allingham, William J. Allingham, Jr, William J. Allingham, V. Blake Allison, Ivan Almendarez, Jr, Neil Alper, Leonor Alvarez, Elizabeth Alverson, Robert E. Alverson, Christopher Alviar, Gemma Alviar, Gianina Alviar, Grace Alviar, Jocelyne Ambroise, Kenneth Paul Ambrose, Sharon Ambrose, Mitchell Amerbach, Patricia Amo, Marie L. Anaya, Christine A. Anchundia, Elias J. Anchundia, Elias A. Anchundia, Elizabeth R. Anchundia, Dorothy Ancona, Elizabeth Andersen, Douglas Anderson, Jill G. Anderson, Joanne Anderson, Kathryn G. Anderson, Thomas Anderson, Betty Andrade, Edward S. Andrews, Meredith Andrews, Morien Angaroo, Donna L. Angelini, Marianne Angelo, Dawn Angrisani, Ralph Angrisani, Laura Renee Anspach, Diane Antolos, Ioannis Antoniadis, Joseph P Antony, Cecile M. Apollo, Peter Apollo, Margaret Apostol, Carol Ann Aquilino, Frank J. Aquilino, Alicia Arancibia, Janet Arbuiso, Daniel J Archbold, Peter Archer, Tony Archer, Lori Ann Arczynski, Wandalee Arena, Irene Arguelles, Andrew Arias, Donald Arias, Thomas Arias, Lorraine M Arias-Beliveau, Joseph Ariola, Gabriel Armstrong, Gerard Armstrong, Laura A. Armstrong, Marian Armstrong, Mary E Armstrong, Mary E. Armstrong, Michael Arniero, Cynthia Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Ruth Green Aron, Jules P Aronson, Emma Louise Arro, Benjamin Arroyo, Maria Aryee, Teiko Aryee, Maritza Arzayus, Adolfo Arzu, Andrea Asbury, Elaine Asciak, Vivian Asciak, Shawn Ashe, Dana Asher, Ethel Asher, Sigal Asher, Stuart Asher, Julia Rocia Asitimbay Quintuna, Rosa Elena Asitimbay Quintuna, Elaine Atwood, Elaine M Atwood, Gerald Atwood, Gregory P Atwood, John G Atwood, Raymond J Atwood, Se Jua Au, Philipson Azenabor, Carla Bacchus, Juana Bacchus, George Bachmann, Grace Badagliacca, John Badagliacca, Paul J. Bader, John P. Baeszler, Diana Baez, Judith A. Bailey, Katherine Bailey, Kevin J. Bailey, Paula Bailey, Todd G. Bailey, Vincent H Bailey, Yarah H. Bailey, Yuriah Bailey, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Maureen Lynch Baker, Martha Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Maureen Baksh Griffin, Mary Louise Ball, Lucia Balzan, Lynette Bangaree, Aristides Bantis, Evangelos Bantis, Soultana Bantis, Gentil Baptiste, Victor Barahona, Carol Baran, Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Jr, Mary E. Barbieri, Garrett Barbosa, Armando Bardales, Thomas J. Baroz, Kathryn Lee Barrere, Audriene Barry, Bertrand Francis Barry, Bertrand Arthur Barry, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Diane Barry), Edmund Barry(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Barry, Deceased), John T. Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Marianne Joan Barry, Maureen Barry, Patricia Anne Barry, Patrick T. Barry, Frank Barton, Gila Barzvi, Chris Basnicki, Jean Basnicki, Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki, Robert J Basnicki, William Basnicki, Burney Bates, Pedro Batista, James A Bauer, Christopher A. Baumann, Evon Baumgardner, Rameses G. Bautista, John M. Bavis, Mary Bavis(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Mark Lawrence Bavis), Mary Bavis(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Lawrence Bavis, Deceased), Michael T. Bavis, Patrick J. Bavis, Kelly Bavis Morrissey, Dennis Baxter, Diane Baxter, Donald Baxter, Lawrence Baxter, Lillian Baxter, Mattie L. Baxter, Jedelle Baxter, Jr., Myrtle Bazil, Faveur Bazilme, Frank J. Bazzicalupo, Larry Bealer, Thomas Beattie, Janice Beatty, Richard A. Beatty, Robert W Beatty, Theodore Beck, Jonathan M Becker, Christian Bediako, Dolores Bedigian, Joseph J Bedigian, Robert Bedigian, Michael Beehler, Theodora Beekman, George Behr, Imnaculada Behr, Thomas J Beirne, Boris Belilovsky, Michael J. Bell, John Bellew, Anthony Bellisari, Sean Bellows, Scott R. Beloten, John Benedetto, Vanessa Benjamin, Derek P. Bennett, Ian Bennett, Ondina Bennett, Frances Berdan, Gary Berger, Suzanne J. Berger, James W. Berghorn, Agnes Bergin, George R. Bergin, George M. Bergin, Juliette Bergman, Kenneth Bergsohn, Michele Bergsohn, Deborah E. Berk, Nancy Berliner, David M. Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein, Eric Bernsten, Evelyn Berry, Joseph S. Berry, Joseph T. Berry, Kimberly A. Berry, Todd P. Berry, Alice Bertorelli, Eileen Bertorelli-Zangrillo, Dominic Bertucci, Francisco Betancourt, Donald Betterly, Jr, Donald A. Betterly, Sr, Joan C. Betterly, Joanne F. Betterly, Mark Betterly, Marle Luisa Bey, Donna D. Bhagwan, Prakash Bhatt, Indira Bhukhan, Jagdish Bhukhan, Cynthia Rancke Bienenmann, Donald Bigi, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Tina Marie Bilcher, Carolyn Staub Bilelis, Stephen Bileski, Christopher Bilotti, Patricia Bingley, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat, Bhola P. Bishundat, James A. Bittles, Shawn Bittner, Daniel Bivona, Albert A. Blackman, Hyacinth Blackman, Jane Blackwell, Virginia Bladen, Patrick Blaine, Leslie R. Blair, James Blake, Robert Blake, Victoria Blaksley, Jody Blanchard, Scott Blaney, Stan Blaskey, Barbara Blass, Keith Blass, Neil Blass, Richard J. Blatus, Ira Blau, Lucille Bleimann, Harvey Blomberg, Susan Uman Blomberg, Aaron Bogad, Eugenia Bogado, Erin Boland, Gregory Boland, Joyce Boland, Vincent Boland, Sr, Edward P. Bolger, Jan Bonanza, Joseph Bondarenko, William Bondarenko, Michelle Bonetti, Roxane Bonheur, Luis Bonilla, Concetta Bonner, George Bonomo, John Bonomo, Sonia Bonomo, Rose Booker, Sharon Booker, Quinceyann Booker-Jackson, Richard Booms, Andrew Boone, Christopher Boone, Jason Boone, Linda K. Boone, Richard M. Borquist, Juana B. Borrero, Lilian Borrero, Miriam Borrero, Jessica Bors, Deborah Borza, William Bosco, Jr, Marlyse Bosley, Chester Botch, Frederick Earl Bouchard, Jr., Corrine E. Bounty, Tracey Clark Bourke, Kathryn C. Bowden, Paul Bowden, Sheilah L Bowden, Thomas H Bowden, Orla Bowie, Stephanie Ayn Bowser, Bella Boyarsky, Vladimir Boyarsky, Ronald Boyce, James J Boyle, James R. Boyle, John W. Boyle, Joseph M. Boyle, David John Braca, Edward P Bracken, Mary Bracken, Kevin Bradbury, Helen O'Mahony Bradley, Jennifer Brady, Mary Brady, Michael J. Brady, Peter Brady, Susann Brady, Nelly Braginsky, Diane Braitsch, Frank Brancato, Jason Brandemarti, Nancy Brandemarti, Nicholas M Brandemarti, Nicole Brandemarti, David B. Brandhorst, Susan M. Brannigan, Christopher B. Bratton, Erin G. Bratton, Mary E. Bratton, William J. Bratton, III, William J. Bratton, Jr, Michel Braut, Barbara H. Brennan, Brian T. Brennan, George Brennan, James John Brennan, Veronica Brennan, Raymond Bressingham, Carol A Brethel, Jeffrey A. Brezil, Carmen Bridgeforth, David Allen Bridgeforth, Arina Bridges, Barbara Bridges, James Briordy, Gerard Brisman, Juliette Brisman, Steven Brisman, Michael P. Brodbeck, Eric J Brodin, Boris Bronshteyn, Robert Broome, Isoline Broomfield, Bernard Curtis Brown, Edward M. Brown, Ernest O Brown, Everton Brown, Kevin J. Brown, Michael Everett Brown, Michael P Brown, Sinita Brown, Stephen C. Brown, Ann M. Browne, Sigalit Brunn, Eduardo E. Bruno, Thomas J. Bubelnik, Charilyn S. Buchanan, Ronald B. Buchanan, Johnathan Buchsbaum, Catherine Morrison Buck, Eric Buck, Ernest H. Buck, Josephine Buck, John C. Buckley, Kathleen M Buckley, Joseph Buda, Brook Budd, James Bueche, Linda Buffa, Michele Buffolino, Fran Bulaga, Gail M. Bulaga, Michelle A. Bulaga, John E. Bulaga, Sr., Vincent Bulzomi, Corinne Bunin, Kitty Bunin, Nancy Burcham, Denise Burger, Susan T. Burghouwt, Javier Burgos, Alicia P. Burke, Chris Burke, James M. Burke, John J. Burke, Thomas Burke, Timothy J. Burke, Bradley M Burlingame, Debra Burlingame, Mark W. Burlingame, Carrie Burlock, Beverly Burnett, Deena Burnett, Martha Jane Burnett, Thomas E. Burnett, Sr, Agnes D. Burns, Bernard J. Burns, Jennifer C. Burns, Kevin M. Burns, Kevin Burns, Michael R. Burns, Michael J. Burns, Robert Burns, Maureen Burns-Dewland, William F. Burns-Lynch, Sandra Burnside, Barry L Buss, Kevin Butler, Catherine Butt, Jacqueline Butt, Lois Buxbaum, Pasquale Buzzelli, Vivian Byas, Walter Byas, Richard Bylicki, Anne Byrne, Eileen Byrne, Francis X. Byrne, Garett C. Byrne, Judith Byrne, Robert G. Byrne, Jr, Robert G. Byrne, Sr, Thomas Byrne, William J. Byrne, Victoria Cabezas, Marmily Cabrera, Louie D. Cacchioli, Julio Caceres, James Caddigan, Veronica Caggiano, Colleen Cahill, Evelyn Cahill, James Cahill, Kevin J. Cahill, Kevin Cahill, Sharon O. Cahill, Lorraine Caiazzo, Rosa Caicedo, Michael Cain, Rosemary Cain, John Cairney, William Calahan, Christopher Calamia, Ronald Calcagno, Andrea Caldarella, Gloria E. Calderon, Marino Calderon, Darlene Caldwell, Bridget Callahan, Ellen Callahan, James Callahan, Joan E. Callahan, Jose Callejas, Fernando Camacho, Christina Cambeis, Joseph Cammarata, Joseph Cammarata, Jr, Kimberly Cammarata, Linda Cammarata, Cynthia J. Campbell, Malcolm P Campbell, Steven T. Campbe
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The National Iranian Gas Company, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Doe AP149, Doe AP150, Doe AP167, Doe AP195, Doe AP212, Doe AP234, Doe AP235, Doe AP241, Doe AP250, Doe AP40, Doe AP41, Doe AP45, Doe AP61, Doe AP926, Anisia C. Abarabar, Elaine Abate, Yvonne V. Abdool, Suzanne Abenmoha, Ammini G. Abraham, Ann M. Abrahamson, Celso J. Abreu, John J. Acerno, Humberto R. Acosta, Alfred Acquaviva, Courtney Acquaviva, Josephine Acquaviva, Dwight D. Adams, Elizabeth J. Adams, Jean Adams, Kevin John Adams, Lawrence Scott Adams, Robert C. Adams, Affiong Adanga, Dawn Addamo, Gregory Addamo, Rita Addamo, Alice D. Adler, Darryl J. Adone, Stacey Afflitto, George A Agaiby, Rita Agnello, Salvatore Agnello, Vinnie Carla Agnello, Jennifer Agresto, Diane B. Aguiar, Joao A. Aguiar, Taciana Aguiar, Judith M. Aiken, Mark Aiken, James Alario, James F. Albach, Jr, Edward Albert, Thomas Albert, Maria Y. Aldaco, Elizabeth Alderman, Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman, Laura Alessi, Karium Ali, Louisa Allegretto, Luke C. Allen, Lynn P. Allen, Madelyn Gail Allen, Marguerite G. Allen, Matthew J. Allen, Michael J. Allen, Richard D. Allen, Ronald Allen, Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson, Donna Allingham, James J. Allingham, Patricia C. Allingham, William J. Allingham, Jr, William J. Allingham, V. Blake Allison, Ivan Almendarez, Jr, Neil Alper, Leonor Alvarez, Elizabeth Alverson, Robert E. Alverson, Christopher Alviar, Gemma Alviar, Gianina Alviar, Grace Alviar, Jocelyne Ambroise, Kenneth Paul Ambrose, Sharon Ambrose, Mitchell Amerbach, Patricia Amo, Marie L. Anaya, Christine A. Anchundia, Elias J. Anchundia, Elias A. Anchundia, Elizabeth R. Anchundia, Dorothy Ancona, Elizabeth Andersen, Douglas Anderson, Jill G. Anderson, Joanne Anderson, Kathryn G. Anderson, Thomas Anderson, Betty Andrade, Edward S. Andrews, Meredith Andrews, Morien Angaroo, Donna L. Angelini, Marianne Angelo, Dawn Angrisani, Ralph Angrisani, Laura Renee Anspach, Diane Antolos, Ioannis Antoniadis, Joseph P Antony, Cecile M. Apollo, Peter Apollo, Margaret Apostol, Carol Ann Aquilino, Frank J. Aquilino, Alicia Arancibia, Janet Arbuiso, Daniel J Archbold, Peter Archer, Tony Archer, Lori Ann Arczynski, Wandalee Arena, Irene Arguelles, Andrew Arias, Donald Arias, Thomas Arias, Lorraine M Arias-Beliveau, Joseph Ariola, Gabriel Armstrong, Gerard Armstrong, Laura A. Armstrong, Marian Armstrong, Mary E Armstrong, Mary E. Armstrong, Michael Arniero, Cynthia Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Ruth Green Aron, Jules P Aronson, Emma Louise Arro, Benjamin Arroyo, Maria Aryee, Teiko Aryee, Maritza Arzayus, Adolfo Arzu, Andrea Asbury, Elaine Asciak, Vivian Asciak, Shawn Ashe, Dana Asher, Ethel Asher, Sigal Asher, Stuart Asher, Julia Rocia Asitimbay Quintuna, Rosa Elena Asitimbay Quintuna, Elaine Atwood, Elaine M Atwood, Gerald Atwood, Gregory P Atwood, John G Atwood, Raymond J Atwood, Se Jua Au, Philipson Azenabor, Carla Bacchus, Juana Bacchus, George Bachmann, Grace Badagliacca, John Badagliacca, Paul J. Bader, John P. Baeszler, Diana Baez, Judith A. Bailey, Katherine Bailey, Kevin J. Bailey, Paula Bailey, Todd G. Bailey, Vincent H Bailey, Yarah H. Bailey, Yuriah Bailey, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Maureen Lynch Baker, Martha Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Maureen Baksh Griffin, Mary Louise Ball, Lucia Balzan, Lynette Bangaree, Aristides Bantis, Evangelos Bantis, Soultana Bantis, Gentil Baptiste, Victor Barahona, Carol Baran, Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Jr, Mary E. Barbieri, Garrett Barbosa, Armando Bardales, Thomas J. Baroz, Kathryn Lee Barrere, Audriene Barry, Bertrand Francis Barry, Bertrand Arthur Barry, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Diane Barry), Edmund Barry(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Barry, Deceased), John T. Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Marianne Joan Barry, Maureen Barry, Patricia Anne Barry, Patrick T. Barry, Frank Barton, Gila Barzvi, Chris Basnicki, Jean Basnicki, Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki, Robert J Basnicki, William Basnicki, Burney Bates, Pedro Batista, James A Bauer, Christopher A. Baumann, Evon Baumgardner, Rameses G. Bautista, John M. Bavis, Mary Bavis(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Mark Lawrence Bavis), Mary Bavis(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Lawrence Bavis, Deceased), Michael T. Bavis, Patrick J. Bavis, Kelly Bavis Morrissey, Dennis Baxter, Diane Baxter, Donald Baxter, Lawrence Baxter, Lillian Baxter, Mattie L. Baxter, Jedelle Baxter, Jr., Myrtle Bazil, Faveur Bazilme, Frank J. Bazzicalupo, Larry Bealer, Thomas Beattie, Janice Beatty, Richard A. Beatty, Robert W Beatty, Theodore Beck, Jonathan M Becker, Christian Bediako, Dolores Bedigian, Joseph J Bedigian, Robert Bedigian, Michael Beehler, Theodora Beekman, George Behr, Imnaculada Behr, Thomas J Beirne, Boris Belilovsky, Michael J. Bell, John Bellew, Anthony Bellisari, Sean Bellows, Scott R. Beloten, John Benedetto, Vanessa Benjamin, Derek P. Bennett, Ian Bennett, Ondina Bennett, Frances Berdan, Gary Berger, Suzanne J. Berger, James W. Berghorn, Agnes Bergin, George R. Bergin, George M. Bergin, Juliette Bergman, Kenneth Bergsohn, Michele Bergsohn, Deborah E. Berk, Nancy Berliner, David M. Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein, Eric Bernsten, Evelyn Berry, Joseph S. Berry, Joseph T. Berry, Kimberly A. Berry, Todd P. Berry, Alice Bertorelli, Eileen Bertorelli-Zangrillo, Dominic Bertucci, Francisco Betancourt, Donald Betterly, Jr, Donald A. Betterly, Sr, Joan C. Betterly, Joanne F. Betterly, Mark Betterly, Marle Luisa Bey, Donna D. Bhagwan, Prakash Bhatt, Indira Bhukhan, Jagdish Bhukhan, Cynthia Rancke Bienenmann, Donald Bigi, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Tina Marie Bilcher, Carolyn Staub Bilelis, Stephen Bileski, Christopher Bilotti, Patricia Bingley, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat, Bhola P. Bishundat, James A. Bittles, Shawn Bittner, Daniel Bivona, Albert A. Blackman, Hyacinth Blackman, Jane Blackwell, Virginia Bladen, Patrick Blaine, Leslie R. Blair, James Blake, Robert Blake, Victoria Blaksley, Jody Blanchard, Scott Blaney, Stan Blaskey, Barbara Blass, Keith Blass, Neil Blass, Richard J. Blatus, Ira Blau, Lucille Bleimann, Harvey Blomberg, Susan Uman Blomberg, Aaron Bogad, Eugenia Bogado, Erin Boland, Gregory Boland, Joyce Boland, Vincent Boland, Sr, Edward P. Bolger, Jan Bonanza, Joseph Bondarenko, William Bondarenko, Michelle Bonetti, Roxane Bonheur, Luis Bonilla, Concetta Bonner, George Bonomo, John Bonomo, Sonia Bonomo, Rose Booker, Sharon Booker, Quinceyann Booker-Jackson, Richard Booms, Andrew Boone, Christopher Boone, Jason Boone, Linda K. Boone, Richard M. Borquist, Juana B. Borrero, Lilian Borrero, Miriam Borrero, Jessica Bors, Deborah Borza, William Bosco, Jr, Marlyse Bosley, Chester Botch, Frederick Earl Bouchard, Jr., Corrine E. Bounty, Tracey Clark Bourke, Kathryn C. Bowden, Paul Bowden, Sheilah L Bowden, Thomas H Bowden, Orla Bowie, Stephanie Ayn Bowser, Bella Boyarsky, Vladimir Boyarsky, Ronald Boyce, James J Boyle, James R. Boyle, John W. Boyle, Joseph M. Boyle, David John Braca, Edward P Bracken, Mary Bracken, Kevin Bradbury, Helen O'Mahony Bradley, Jennifer Brady, Mary Brady, Michael J. Brady, Peter Brady, Susann Brady, Nelly Braginsky, Diane Braitsch, Frank Brancato, Jason Brandemarti, Nancy Brandemarti, Nicholas M Brandemarti, Nicole Brandemarti, David B. Brandhorst, Susan M. Brannigan, Christopher B. Bratton, Erin G. Bratton, Mary E. Bratton, William J. Bratton, III, William J. Bratton, Jr, Michel Braut, Barbara H. Brennan, Brian T. Brennan, George Brennan, James John Brennan, Veronica Brennan, Raymond Bressingham, Carol A Brethel, Jeffrey A. Brezil, Carmen Bridgeforth, David Allen Bridgeforth, Arina Bridges, Barbara Bridges, James Briordy, Gerard Brisman, Juliette Brisman, Steven Brisman, Michael P. Brodbeck, Eric J Brodin, Boris Bronshteyn, Robert Broome, Isoline Broomfield, Bernard Curtis Brown, Edward M. Brown, Ernest O Brown, Everton Brown, Kevin J. Brown, Michael Everett Brown, Michael P Brown, Sinita Brown, Stephen C. Brown, Ann M. Browne, Sigalit Brunn, Eduardo E. Bruno, Thomas J. Bubelnik, Charilyn S. Buchanan, Ronald B. Buchanan, Johnathan Buchsbaum, Catherine Morrison Buck, Eric Buck, Ernest H. Buck, Josephine Buck, John C. Buckley, Kathleen M Buckley, Joseph Buda, Brook Budd, James Bueche, Linda Buffa, Michele Buffolino, Fran Bulaga, Gail M. Bulaga, Michelle A. Bulaga, John E. Bulaga, Sr., Vincent Bulzomi, Corinne Bunin, Kitty Bunin, Nancy Burcham, Denise Burger, Susan T. Burghouwt, Javier Burgos, Alicia P. Burke, Chris Burke, James M. Burke, John J. Burke, Thomas Burke, Timothy J. Burke, Bradley M Burlingame, Debra Burlingame, Mark W. Burlingame, Carrie Burlock, Beverly Burnett, Deena Burnett, Martha Jane Burnett, Thomas E. Burnett, Sr, Agnes D. Burns, Bernard J. Burns, Jennifer C. Burns, Kevin M. Burns, Kevin Burns, Michael R. Burns, Michael J. Burns, Robert Burns, Maureen Burns-Dewland, William F. Burns-Lynch, Sandra Burnside, Barry L Buss, Kevin Butler, Catherine Butt, Jacqueline Butt, Lois Buxbaum, Pasquale Buzzelli, Vivian Byas, Walter Byas, Richard Bylicki, Anne Byrne, Eileen Byrne, Francis X. Byrne, Garett C. Byrne, Judith Byrne, Robert G. Byrne, Jr, Robert G. Byrne, Sr, Thomas Byrne, William J. Byrne, Victoria Cabezas, Marmily Cabrera, Louie D. Cacchioli, Julio Caceres, James Caddigan, Veronica Caggiano, Colleen Cahill, Evelyn Cahill, James Cahill, Kevin J. Cahill, Kevin Cahill, Sharon O. Cahill, Lorraine Caiazzo, Rosa Caicedo, Michael Cain, Rosemary Cain, John Cairney, William Calahan, Christopher Calamia, Ronald Calcagno, Andrea Caldarella, Gloria E. Calderon, Marino Calderon, Darlene Caldwell, Bridget Callahan, Ellen Callahan, James Callahan, Joan E. Callahan, Jose Callejas, Fernando Camacho, Christina Cambeis, Joseph Cammarata, Joseph Cammarata, Jr, Kimberly Cammarata, Linda Cammarata, Cynthia J. Campbell, Malcolm P Campbel
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The national Iranian Oil Corporation, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Doe AP149, Doe AP150, Doe AP167, Doe AP195, Doe AP212, Doe AP234, Doe AP235, Doe AP241, Doe AP250, Doe AP40, Doe AP41, Doe AP45, Doe AP61, Doe AP926, Anisia C. Abarabar, Elaine Abate, Yvonne V. Abdool, Suzanne Abenmoha, Ammini G. Abraham, Ann M. Abrahamson, Celso J. Abreu, John J. Acerno, Humberto R. Acosta, Alfred Acquaviva, Courtney Acquaviva, Josephine Acquaviva, Dwight D. Adams, Elizabeth J. Adams, Jean Adams, Kevin John Adams, Lawrence Scott Adams, Robert C. Adams, Affiong Adanga, Dawn Addamo, Gregory Addamo, Rita Addamo, Alice D. Adler, Darryl J. Adone, Stacey Afflitto, George A Agaiby, Rita Agnello, Salvatore Agnello, Vinnie Carla Agnello, Jennifer Agresto, Diane B. Aguiar, Joao A. Aguiar, Taciana Aguiar, Judith M. Aiken, Mark Aiken, James Alario, James F. Albach, Jr, Edward Albert, Thomas Albert, Maria Y. Aldaco, Elizabeth Alderman, Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman, Laura Alessi, Karium Ali, Louisa Allegretto, Luke C. Allen, Lynn P. Allen, Madelyn Gail Allen, Marguerite G. Allen, Matthew J. Allen, Michael J. Allen, Richard D. Allen, Ronald Allen, Ingrid Alleyne-Robertson, Donna Allingham, James J. Allingham, Patricia C. Allingham, William J. Allingham, Jr, William J. Allingham, V. Blake Allison, Ivan Almendarez, Jr, Neil Alper, Leonor Alvarez, Elizabeth Alverson, Robert E. Alverson, Christopher Alviar, Gemma Alviar, Gianina Alviar, Grace Alviar, Jocelyne Ambroise, Kenneth Paul Ambrose, Sharon Ambrose, Mitchell Amerbach, Patricia Amo, Marie L. Anaya, Christine A. Anchundia, Elias J. Anchundia, Elias A. Anchundia, Elizabeth R. Anchundia, Dorothy Ancona, Elizabeth Andersen, Douglas Anderson, Jill G. Anderson, Joanne Anderson, Kathryn G. Anderson, Thomas Anderson, Betty Andrade, Edward S. Andrews, Meredith Andrews, Morien Angaroo, Donna L. Angelini, Marianne Angelo, Dawn Angrisani, Ralph Angrisani, Laura Renee Anspach, Diane Antolos, Ioannis Antoniadis, Joseph P Antony, Cecile M. Apollo, Peter Apollo, Margaret Apostol, Carol Ann Aquilino, Frank J. Aquilino, Alicia Arancibia, Janet Arbuiso, Daniel J Archbold, Peter Archer, Tony Archer, Lori Ann Arczynski, Wandalee Arena, Irene Arguelles, Andrew Arias, Donald Arias, Thomas Arias, Lorraine M Arias-Beliveau, Joseph Ariola, Gabriel Armstrong, Gerard Armstrong, Laura A. Armstrong, Marian Armstrong, Mary E Armstrong, Mary E. Armstrong, Michael Arniero, Cynthia Arnold, Suzanne Arnold, Ruth Green Aron, Jules P Aronson, Emma Louise Arro, Benjamin Arroyo, Maria Aryee, Teiko Aryee, Maritza Arzayus, Adolfo Arzu, Andrea Asbury, Elaine Asciak, Vivian Asciak, Shawn Ashe, Dana Asher, Ethel Asher, Sigal Asher, Stuart Asher, Julia Rocia Asitimbay Quintuna, Rosa Elena Asitimbay Quintuna, Elaine Atwood, Elaine M Atwood, Gerald Atwood, Gregory P Atwood, John G Atwood, Raymond J Atwood, Se Jua Au, Philipson Azenabor, Carla Bacchus, Juana Bacchus, George Bachmann, Grace Badagliacca, John Badagliacca, Paul J. Bader, John P. Baeszler, Diana Baez, Judith A. Bailey, Katherine Bailey, Kevin J. Bailey, Paula Bailey, Todd G. Bailey, Vincent H Bailey, Yarah H. Bailey, Yuriah Bailey, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Maureen Lynch Baker, Martha Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Maureen Baksh Griffin, Mary Louise Ball, Lucia Balzan, Lynette Bangaree, Aristides Bantis, Evangelos Bantis, Soultana Bantis, Gentil Baptiste, Victor Barahona, Carol Baran, Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Jr, Mary E. Barbieri, Garrett Barbosa, Armando Bardales, Thomas J. Baroz, Kathryn Lee Barrere, Audriene Barry, Bertrand Francis Barry, Bertrand Arthur Barry, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Diane Barry), Edmund Barry(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Barry, Deceased), John T. Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Marianne Joan Barry, Maureen Barry, Patricia Anne Barry, Patrick T. Barry, Frank Barton, Gila Barzvi, Chris Basnicki, Jean Basnicki, Maureen Elizabeth Basnicki, Robert J Basnicki, William Basnicki, Burney Bates, Pedro Batista, James A Bauer, Christopher A. Baumann, Evon Baumgardner, Rameses G. Bautista, John M. Bavis, Mary Bavis(On behalf of all beneficiaries of Mark Lawrence Bavis), Mary Bavis(As Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Lawrence Bavis, Deceased), Michael T. Bavis, Patrick J. Bavis, Kelly Bavis Morrissey, Dennis Baxter, Diane Baxter, Donald Baxter, Lawrence Baxter, Lillian Baxter, Mattie L. Baxter, Jedelle Baxter, Jr., Myrtle Bazil, Faveur Bazilme, Frank J. Bazzicalupo, Larry Bealer, Thomas Beattie, Janice Beatty, Richard A. Beatty, Robert W Beatty, Theodore Beck, Jonathan M Becker, Christian Bediako, Dolores Bedigian, Joseph J Bedigian, Robert Bedigian, Michael Beehler, Theodora Beekman, George Behr, Imnaculada Behr, Thomas J Beirne, Boris Belilovsky, Michael J. Bell, John Bellew, Anthony Bellisari, Sean Bellows, Scott R. Beloten, John Benedetto, Vanessa Benjamin, Derek P. Bennett, Ian Bennett, Ondina Bennett, Frances Berdan, Gary Berger, Suzanne J. Berger, James W. Berghorn, Agnes Bergin, George R. Bergin, George M. Bergin, Juliette Bergman, Kenneth Bergsohn, Michele Bergsohn, Deborah E. Berk, Nancy Berliner, David M. Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein, Eric Bernsten, Evelyn Berry, Joseph S. Berry, Joseph T. Berry, Kimberly A. Berry, Todd P. Berry, Alice Bertorelli, Eileen Bertorelli-Zangrillo, Dominic Bertucci, Francisco Betancourt, Donald Betterly, Jr, Donald A. Betterly, Sr, Joan C. Betterly, Joanne F. Betterly, Mark Betterly, Marle Luisa Bey, Donna D. Bhagwan, Prakash Bhatt, Indira Bhukhan, Jagdish Bhukhan, Cynthia Rancke Bienenmann, Donald Bigi, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Tina Marie Bilcher, Carolyn Staub Bilelis, Stephen Bileski, Christopher Bilotti, Patricia Bingley, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat, Bhola P. Bishundat, James A. Bittles, Shawn Bittner, Daniel Bivona, Albert A. Blackman, Hyacinth Blackman, Jane Blackwell, Virginia Bladen, Patrick Blaine, Leslie R. Blair, James Blake, Robert Blake, Victoria Blaksley, Jody Blanchard, Scott Blaney, Stan Blaskey, Barbara Blass, Keith Blass, Neil Blass, Richard J. Blatus, Ira Blau, Lucille Bleimann, Harvey Blomberg, Susan Uman Blomberg, Aaron Bogad, Eugenia Bogado, Erin Boland, Gregory Boland, Joyce Boland, Vincent Boland, Sr, Edward P. Bolger, Jan Bonanza, Joseph Bondarenko, William Bondarenko, Michelle Bonetti, Roxane Bonheur, Luis Bonilla, Concetta Bonner, George Bonomo, John Bonomo, Sonia Bonomo, Rose Booker, Sharon Booker, Quinceyann Booker-Jackson, Richard Booms, Andrew Boone, Christopher Boone, Jason Boone, Linda K. Boone, Richard M. Borquist, Juana B. Borrero, Lilian Borrero, Miriam Borrero, Jessica Bors, Deborah Borza, William Bosco, Jr, Marlyse Bosley, Chester Botch, Frederick Earl Bouchard, Jr., Corrine E. Bounty, Tracey Clark Bourke, Kathryn C. Bowden, Paul Bowden, Sheilah L Bowden, Thomas H Bowden, Orla Bowie, Stephanie Ayn Bowser, Bella Boyarsky, Vladimir Boyarsky, Ronald Boyce, James J Boyle, James R. Boyle, John W. Boyle, Joseph M. Boyle, David John Braca, Edward P Bracken, Mary Bracken, Kevin Bradbury, Helen O'Mahony Bradley, Jennifer Brady, Mary Brady, Michael J. Brady, Peter Brady, Susann Brady, Nelly Braginsky, Diane Braitsch, Frank Brancato, Jason Brandemarti, Nancy Brandemarti, Nicholas M Brandemarti, Nicole Brandemarti, David B. Brandhorst, Susan M. Brannigan, Christopher B. Bratton, Erin G. Bratton, Mary E. Bratton, William J. Bratton, III, William J. Bratton, Jr, Michel Braut, Barbara H. Brennan, Brian T. Brennan, George Brennan, James John Brennan, Veronica Brennan, Raymond Bressingham, Carol A Brethel, Jeffrey A. Brezil, Carmen Bridgeforth, David Allen Bridgeforth, Arina Bridges, Barbara Bridges, James Briordy, Gerard Brisman, Juliette Brisman, Steven Brisman, Michael P. Brodbeck, Eric J Brodin, Boris Bronshteyn, Robert Broome, Isoline Broomfield, Bernard Curtis Brown, Edward M. Brown, Ernest O Brown, Everton Brown, Kevin J. Brown, Michael Everett Brown, Michael P Brown, Sinita Brown, Stephen C. Brown, Ann M. Browne, Sigalit Brunn, Eduardo E. Bruno, Thomas J. Bubelnik, Charilyn S. Buchanan, Ronald B. Buchanan, Johnathan Buchsbaum, Catherine Morrison Buck, Eric Buck, Ernest H. Buck, Josephine Buck, John C. Buckley, Kathleen M Buckley, Joseph Buda, Brook Budd, James Bueche, Linda Buffa, Michele Buffolino, Fran Bulaga, Gail M. Bulaga, Michelle A. Bulaga, John E. Bulaga, Sr., Vincent Bulzomi, Corinne Bunin, Kitty Bunin, Nancy Burcham, Denise Burger, Susan T. Burghouwt, Javier Burgos, Alicia P. Burke, Chris Burke, James M. Burke, John J. Burke, Thomas Burke, Timothy J. Burke, Bradley M Burlingame, Debra Burlingame, Mark W. Burlingame, Carrie Burlock, Beverly Burnett, Deena Burnett, Martha Jane Burnett, Thomas E. Burnett, Sr, Agnes D. Burns, Bernard J. Burns, Jennifer C. Burns, Kevin M. Burns, Kevin Burns, Michael R. Burns, Michael J. Burns, Robert Burns, Maureen Burns-Dewland, William F. Burns-Lynch, Sandra Burnside, Barry L Buss, Kevin Butler, Catherine Butt, Jacqueline Butt, Lois Buxbaum, Pasquale Buzzelli, Vivian Byas, Walter Byas, Richard Bylicki, Anne Byrne, Eileen Byrne, Francis X. Byrne, Garett C. Byrne, Judith Byrne, Robert G. Byrne, Jr, Robert G. Byrne, Sr, Thomas Byrne, William J. Byrne, Victoria Cabezas, Marmily Cabrera, Louie D. Cacchioli, Julio Caceres, James Caddigan, Veronica Caggiano, Colleen Cahill, Evelyn Cahill, James Cahill, Kevin J. Cahill, Kevin Cahill, Sharon O. Cahill, Lorraine Caiazzo, Rosa Caicedo, Michael Cain, Rosemary Cain, John Cairney, William Calahan, Christopher Calamia, Ronald Calcagno, Andrea Caldarella, Gloria E. Cald