Trinity Investments Limited v. The Republic of Argentina
Plaintiff: Trinity Investments Limited
Defendant: The Republic of Argentina
Case Number: 1:2016cv01436
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Griesa
Referring Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/2/2021) (va)
February 1, 2021 Filing 75 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited..(O'Gorman, Debra)
December 11, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Debra Dubritz O'Gorman on behalf of Trinity Investments Limited..(O'Gorman, Debra)
September 23, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis H. Hranitzky on behalf of Trinity Investments Limited..(Hranitzky, Dennis)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 JUDGMENT: NOW, it is hereby, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that plaintiff shall recover from Defendant the Republic of Argentina (the "Republic") as follows: With respect to plaintiff Trinity Investments Designated Activity Company("Trinity")'s bond in the principal amount of $3,550,000 (11.375% Global Bond due January 30, 2017, ISIN US040114AR16), Trinity shall recover from the Republic $9,648,273.12, which is comprised of: (i) $3,550,000 (representing the unpaid value of the principal of the bond), plus (ii) $4,213,110.42 (representing the unpaid interest on the principal of the bond, solely to the extent that the unpaid coupons became due at a point on or after six years prior to the filing of the Complaint), plus (iii) $1,885,162.70 (representing statutory pre-judgment interest, at the rate of 9%, accruing on each recoverable unpaid interest coupon). With respect to plaintiff Trinity's bond in the principal amount of $295,000 (11.375% Global Bond due March 15, 2010, ISIN US040114FC91), Trinity shall recover from the Republic $826,051.36, which is comprised of: (i) $295,000 (representing the unpaid value of theprincipal of the bond), plus (ii) $362,593.92 (representing the unpaid interest on the principal of the bond, solely to the extent that the unpaid coupons became due at a point on or after six years prior to the filing of the Complaint), plus (iii) $168,457.43 (representing statutory pre-judgment interest, at the rate of 9%, accruing on each recoverable unpaid interest coupon). With respect to plaintiff Trinity's bond in the principal amount of $150,000 (9.750% Global Bond due September 19, 2027, ISIN US040114AV28), Trinity shall recover from the Republic $381,136.99, which is comprised of: (i) $150,000 (representing the unpaid value of the principal of the bond), plus (ii) $157,868.75 (representing the unpaid interest on the principal of the bond, solely to the extent that the unpaid coupons became due at a point on or after six years prior to the filing of the Complaint), plus (iii) $73,268.24 (representing statutory pre-judgment interest, at the rate of 9%, accruing on each recoverable unpaid interest coupon). It is further ORDERED that, until further notice from the Court, plaintiff must refrain from selling or otherwise transferring its beneficial interests in the bonds involved in this action without advising the Court in advance and obtaining permission of the Court. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/07/2020) (ama)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting #57 Motion for Summary Judgment. Having considered Trinity Investments Designated Activity Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against the Republic of Argentina and the entire record in this case, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. 2. On Counts I, II and III of the Amended Complaint, the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter JUDGMENT for Plaintiff, Trinity Investments Designated Activity Company, against Defendant Republic of Argentina in the form annexed hereto. The following tables contain the necessary identifying information regarding Plaintiff's beneficial interests in these bonds: (As further set forth herein this Order.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/7/2020) (va) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint letter dated July 2, 2020 [dkt. no. 82 in 14 Civ. 5489]. The Court finds that Plaintiff's proposed language allowing the assignment of pari passu rights without leave of the Court would (1) exacerbate the risk of double recovery on the bonds at issue and (2) run counter to the plain terms of Judge Griesa's Procedures Memorandum and to the historical practice of the Court in these cases. The Court will accordingly enter judgment without Plaintiff's proposed language. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/7/2020) (jca) Modified on 7/9/2020 (jca).
July 7, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #72 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (va)
July 2, 2020 Filing 69 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited..(Willett, Peter)
July 2, 2020 Filing 68 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. Related Document Number: #66 ..(Willett, Peter) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 2, 2020 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from P. Sabin Willett dated July 2, 2020 re: the parties' positions with respect to one unresolved issue related to the proposed judgments and orders. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited..(Willett, Peter)
July 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #68 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re: (84 in 1:14-cv-05849-LAP) Letter filed by The Republic of Argentina, The Court is in receipt of counsel's letter dated May 26, 2020 [dkt. no. 84 in 14 Civ. 5849]. Counsel shall confer with respect to the correct calculation of interest and the exclusion of time-barred claims and propose an order resolving the summary judgment motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/28/2020) (va)
May 26, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rahul Mukhi on behalf of The Republic of Argentina..(Mukhi, Rahul)
May 26, 2020 Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. dated May 26, 2020 re: Motions for Summary Judgment filed on May 5, 2020. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (82 in 1:14-cv-05849-LAP) Letter, filed by The Republic of Argentina. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed response date of May 26, 2020, is approved. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 5/26/2020.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/18/2020) (va)
May 15, 2020 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. dated May 15, 2020 re: Republic's response to Summary Judgement Motion. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure - SJ Procedures).(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER TO ADMIT PRO HAC VICE granting #56 Motion for Amanda Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/6/2020) (jwh)
May 5, 2020 Filing 60 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited..(Willett, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Matteo Zingaretti in Support re: #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fiscal Agency Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Record of Attestor's holdings of the FAA Bonds, #3 Exhibit C - Record of Trinity's holdings of the FAA Bonds, #4 Exhibit D - Summary Chart Showing Damage Calculations for the FAA Bonds).(Willett, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited..(Willett, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited..(Willett, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Amanda Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19713830. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order).(Ford, Amanda)
May 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #56 MOTION for Amanda Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19713830. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
May 1, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Thomas McTaggart on behalf of Trinity Investments Limited..(McTaggart, David)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Letter Motion for Conference. Counsel may proceed with the proposed motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/30/2020) (va)
April 29, 2020 Filing 53 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kenneth I. Schacter dated April 29, 2020. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited..(Schacter, Kenneth)
July 18, 2017 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Thomas P. Griesa is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 5, 2017 Filing 52 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
December 22, 2016 Filing 51 OPINION #106970 re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), dated July 20, 2016. filed by The Republic of Argentina. For the foregoing reasons, the court grants the Republic's motion. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/22/2016) (kgo) Modified on 1/4/2017 (jwh).
October 4, 2016 Filing 50 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Carmine D. Boccuzzi dated October 4, 2016 re: Plantiffs' September 30, 2016 Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
September 30, 2016 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), dated July 20, 2016. . Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Willett, Peter)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/30/2016) (kl)
September 27, 2016 Filing 47 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Surreply addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Sabin Willett dated 9/27/2016. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Surreply)(Willett, Peter)
September 16, 2016 Filing 46 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), dated July 20, 2016. . Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/14/2016) (kl)
September 14, 2016 Filing 44 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with respect to Defendant's reply memorandum of law, addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Carmine D. Boccuzzi dated September 14, 2016. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 25, 2016 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Christopher L. Carter in Opposition re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), dated July 20, 2016.. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Willett, Peter)
August 25, 2016 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), dated July 20, 2016. . Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Willett, Peter)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/24/2016) (kl)
August 22, 2016 Filing 40 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from P. Sabin Willett dated August 22, 2016. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited.(Willett, Peter)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #36 Motion for Christopher L. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/12/2016) (kgo) (Main Document 39 replaced on 8/16/2016) (kl).
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #37 Motion for Sabin Willett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/12/2016) (kgo)
August 11, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION for Sabin Willett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12640354. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Willett, Peter)
August 11, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION for Christopher L. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12640143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carter, Christopher)
August 11, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 MOTION for Christopher L. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12640143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 11, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Sabin Willett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12640354. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 21, 2016 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Carmine D. Boccuzzi dated July 21, 2016 re: to clarify the Republic's motion to dismiss filed on July 20th, etc.. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
July 20, 2016 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Elizabeth C. Block, dated July 20, 2016 in Support re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), dated July 20, 2016.. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Pt. 1, #3 Exhibit B, Pt. 2, #4 Exhibit B, Pt. 3, #5 Exhibit B, Pt. 4, #6 Exhibit B, Pt. 5, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F-G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, Pt. 1, #14 Exhibit J, Pt. 2, #15 Exhibit K-M)(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
July 20, 2016 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), dated July 20, 2016. . Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
July 20, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), dated July 20, 2016. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
June 23, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Scotch-Marmo on behalf of Trinity Investments Limited. (Scotch-Marmo, Stephen)
June 23, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ian Schacter on behalf of Trinity Investments Limited. (Schacter, Kenneth)
June 23, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Barrett DeSieno on behalf of Trinity Investments Limited. (DeSieno, Timothy)
June 22, 2016 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against The Republic of Argentina.Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A- Fiscal agency agreement 10-19-94 Trinity, #2 Exhibit Exh. B- Trinity Investments Limited Account Holdings Statement - 23rd Feb 2016 further redacted for am comp, #3 Exhibit Exh. C- Law 26017 Trinity, #4 Exhibit Exh. D- Law 26547 trinity, #5 Exhibit Exh. E- 12-07-11 Order granting summary judgment, #6 Exhibit Exh F- 02-23-12 Order Trinity, #7 Exhibit Exh. G- 11-21-12 Amended 02-23-12 Order.Trinity, #8 Exhibit Exh. H- 09-29-14 Order. Trinity, #9 Exhibit Exh. I- 10-03-14 Order Trinity, #10 Exhibit Exh. J- 01-31-97 Boletin Trinity, #11 Exhibit Exh. K- 06-17-98 Boletin, #12 Exhibit Exh. L- 03-17-00 Boletin, #13 Exhibit Exh. M- New Lock Law, #14 Exhibit Exh. N- 03-31-15 Trimester Statement, #15 Exhibit Exh. O- Form 18K)(Costantini, Anthony)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendant the Republic of Argentina (the "Republic"), by its attorneys, Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, and plaintiffs White Hawthorne, LLC and White Hawthorne II, LLC, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP and Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, and Trinity Investments Limited, by their attorneys, Duane Morris, LLP stipulate and agree as follows: 1. Plaintiffs shall file amended complaints in the above-captioned actions on or before June 22, 2016. The Republic reserves all objections and defenses to the amended complaints; 2. On or before July 20, 2016, the Republic shall move to dismiss or for summary judgment is to the amended complaints (the "Motion"); 3. On or before August 25, 2016, plaintiffs shall oppose the Motion; 4. On or before September 16, 2016, the Republic shall serve reply papers, if any, in further support of the Motion; 5. Plaintiffs' pending motions for partial summary judgment and specific performance in the above-captioned actions are hereby withdrawn without prejudice. ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/22/2016., Motions due by 7/20/2016., Responses due by 8/25/2016.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 6/21/2016) (mro) Modified on 7/18/2016 (mro).
June 21, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr on behalf of The Republic of Argentina. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SECOND AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER: The Order for Appointment of Special Master, June 23, 2014, as amended and supplemented by the Amended and Supplemental Order of Appointment of Special Master, November 3, 2014, is further amended and supplemented as follows: 1. From and after April 22, 2016, Elliot Capital Management and Aurelius Capital Management, who have settled their claims with the Republic of Argentina, shall have no further responsibility for the fees and expenses of the Special Master. 2. From and after April 22, 2016, those parties who avail themselves of the services of the Special Master in negotiations with the Republic of Argentina shall have responsibility for their share of the fees and expenses of the Special Master. 3. The Special Master shall have the right to invoice the clients of Morgan Lewis & Bockius and Duane Morris for his services from April 22, 2016 through June 22, 2016 (and for services thereafter as the Special Master may determine appropriate) by invoicing the law firms as the representatives of their clients. These clients shall include Attestor Master Value Fund LP; Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP; Hazelton Master Fund LP; Trinity Investments Limited; White Hawthorne, LLC; and White Hawthorne II, LLC. Unless otherwise agreed between and among these clients, each shall be responsible for an equal share of one-half of the Special Master's fees and expenses. The Republic of Argentina shall remain responsible for its one-half of the Special Master's fees and expenses. 4. This Order shall apply to the above-captioned cases, all of which remain open, as well as any other cases against the Republic of Argentina in which the parties avail themselves of the services of the Special Master. 5. In all other respects the Order of Appointment of Special Master, June 23, 2014, as amended and supplemented by Order of November 3, 2014, shall remain in full force and effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 6/20/2016) (kl)
April 26, 2016 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Zelbo, Howard)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (20 in 1:16-cv-01042-TPG) Letter, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (17 in 1:16-cv-00950-TPG) Letter, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (18 in 1:15-cv-09481-TPG) Letter, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (24 in 1:16-cv-01350-TPG) Letter, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (22 in 1:16-cv-01436-TPG) Letter, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (23 in 1:16-cv-00991-TPG) Letter, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (22 in 1:16-cv-01192-TPG) Letter, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (20 in 1:15-cv-09601-TPG) Letter, filed by The Republic of Argentina. ENDORSEMENT: APPROVED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/6/2016) (kl)
April 5, 2016 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael A. Paskin dated April 5, 2016 re: Republic of Argentina's responses to plaintiffs' motions be stayed pending a decision by the Court of Appeals in Aurelius Capital Master, Ltd. v. Republic of Argentina. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Paskin, Michael)
April 1, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damaris Hernandez on behalf of The Republic of Argentina. (Hernandez, Damaris)
April 1, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Slifkin on behalf of The Republic of Argentina. (Slifkin, Daniel)
March 21, 2016 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. The Republic of Argentina served on 2/26/2016, answer due 4/26/2016. Service was accepted by Roberto Barrientos, Vice President-Chief Compliance Officer. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Costantini, Anthony)
March 18, 2016 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Brian S. Rosen dated March 18, 2016 re: in response to March 11, 2016 letter from Michael A. Paskin. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited.(Rosen, Brian)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPROVED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/11/2016) (kl)
March 11, 2016 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time from March 14, 2016 to April 13, 2016 to respond to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and specific performance addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael A. Paskin dated March 11, 2016. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Paskin, Michael)
March 11, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/13/2016 (kl)
February 28, 2016 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Anthony J. Costantini in Opposition re: #14 Memorandum of Law in Opposition,. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Costantini, Anthony)
February 28, 2016 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Argentina's Letter Motion Seeking Formalization of This Court's "Indicative Ruling," or, Alternatively, in Support of an Amended Order. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Costantini, Anthony)
February 28, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard L. Levine on behalf of Trinity Investments Limited. (Levine, Richard)
February 28, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Efrem Yolkut on behalf of Trinity Investments Limited. (Yolkut, David)
February 28, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Scott Rosen on behalf of Trinity Investments Limited. (Rosen, Brian)
February 26, 2016 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . MOTION Specific Performance . . Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Costantini, Anthony)
February 26, 2016 Filing 9 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Costantini, Anthony)
February 26, 2016 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Anthony J. Costantini, Esq. in Support re: #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . MOTION Specific Performance .. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Trinity Holdings of 1994 Bonds submitted in case 16-cv-991, #2 Exhibit B- Trinity's Holdings of 1994 FAA Bonds submitted in case 16-cv-01436)(Costantini, Anthony)
February 26, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ., MOTION Specific Performance . Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Costantini, Anthony)
February 25, 2016 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Republic of Argentina. (dgo)
February 25, 2016 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Thomas P. Griesa as possibly related to 08-cv-6978. (dgo)
February 25, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dgo)
February 25, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (dgo)
February 25, 2016 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (wb)
February 25, 2016 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
February 25, 2016 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:08-cv-06978-TPG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
February 24, 2016 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Republic of Argentina, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Costantini, Anthony)
February 24, 2016 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited.(Costantini, Anthony)
February 24, 2016 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Anthony J. Costantini, Esq. re: that this action be filed as related to 08-cv-6978. Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited.(Costantini, Anthony)
February 24, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Costantini, Anthony)
February 24, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Republic of Argentina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11992577)Document filed by Trinity Investments Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fiscal agency agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Trinity Investments Account Holding Statement 2/23/16, #3 Exhibit C - Law 26017, #4 Exhibit D - Law 26547, #5 Exhibit E - 12-07-11 Order, #6 Exhibit F - 02-23-12 Order, #7 Exhibit G - 11-21-12 Amended Order, #8 Exhibit H - 09-29-14 Order, #9 Exhibit I - 10-03-14 Order)(Costantini, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinity Investments Limited v. The Republic of Argentina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Republic of Argentina
Represented By: Michael A Paskin
Represented By: Damaris Hernandez
Represented By: Howard S. Zelbo
Represented By: Daniel Slifkin
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Represented By: Rahul Mukhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Investments Limited
Represented By: Richard L. Levine
Represented By: Amanda Ford
Represented By: Brian Scott Rosen
Represented By: Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Represented By: David Efrem Yolkut
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Represented By: David Thomas McTaggart
Represented By: Stephen Scotch-Marmo
Represented By: Christopher L. Carter
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Represented By: Anthony J. Costantini
Represented By: Dennis H. Hranitzky
Represented By: Debra Dubritz O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?