Yesh Music, LLC et al v. S. Carter Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yesh Music, LLC and John K. Emanuele
Defendant: S. Carter Enterprises, LLC, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd. and Aspiro AB
Case Number: 1:2016cv01521
Filed: February 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Kimba M Wood
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2016 Filing 25 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 6/3/2016 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (kl)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiffs hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed as to all claims, with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Any pending motions are moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/3/2016) (kl)
June 3, 2016 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Richard Garbarini Document #23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge Kimba M. Wood for approval. (jk)
June 2, 2016 Filing 23 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd., S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. Document filed by John K. Emanuele, Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 6/3/2016 (jk).
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Rule 16 conference is adjourned to June 8, 2016, at 11:00 A.M. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/8/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kimba M. Wood. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 5/2/2016) (kl)
May 2, 2016 Filing 21 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Jordan W. Siev and Richard Garbarini dated May 2, 2016. Document filed by Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd..(Siev, Jordan)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for all parties that S. Carter Enterprises, LLC is dismissed as a party defendant in the above-captioned matter without prejudice on the express condition that Project Panther Bidco, LTD (sued incorrectly as Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.) and Aspiro AB represent that they consent to service of the complaint and the jurisdiction of this Court for purposes of this matter only. This Stipulation and Order may be signed in separate counterparts each of which shall be deemed to be an original. but all of which together shall constitute one and the same instrument. A facsimile or e-mailed copy of this Stipulation and Order shall have the same force and effect as an original. SO ORDERED. S. Carter Enterprises, LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/8/2016) (kl)
April 8, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Paul Hoffman on behalf of Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.. (Hoffman, Christopher)
April 6, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lillian C Worthley on behalf of Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.. (Worthley, Lillian)
April 6, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan W. Siev on behalf of Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.. (Siev, Jordan)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the conference currently scheduled for April 26, 2016, is adjourned to Thursday, May 5, 2016, at 4:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 5/5/2016 at 04:30 PM before Judge Kimba M. Wood.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/28/2016) (ama)
March 24, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Irene Stein on behalf of S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. (Stein, Alison)
March 24, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Harrison Bart on behalf of S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. (Bart, Andrew)
March 23, 2016 Filing 13 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Jordan W. Siev and Andrew Bart dated March 23, 2016 Document filed by Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd..(Siev, Jordan)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE: This action is scheduled for a conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 16 on April 26, 2016, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 18B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The parties must be prepared to discuss at the conference the subjects set forth in subdivisions (b) and (c) of Rule 16. (As further set forth in this Order) Initial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Kimba M. Wood. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/22/2016) (kl)
March 3, 2016 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Black Panther Bidco, Ltd. served on 3/2/2016, answer due 3/23/2016. Service was accepted by Mary Jackson. Document filed by John K. Emanuele; Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
March 3, 2016 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. S. Carter Enterprises, LLC served on 3/2/2016, answer due 3/23/2016. Service was accepted by Mary Jackson. Document filed by John K. Emanuele; Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
February 29, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (rch)
February 29, 2016 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (rch)
February 29, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kimba M. Wood. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (rch)
February 29, 2016 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.. (rch)
February 29, 2016 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. (rch)
February 29, 2016 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (rch)
February 29, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Yesh Music, LLC, John K. Emanuele. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party text contained a typographical error. (rch)
February 28, 2016 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement copyright)(Garbarini, Richard)
February 27, 2016 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING -PDF ERROR AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 2/29/2016 (rch).
February 27, 2016 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Black Panther Bidco, LTD, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Emanuele, Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
February 27, 2016 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to S. Carter Enterprises, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Emanuele, Yesh Music, LLC. (Garbarini, Richard)
February 27, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard)
February 27, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aspiro AB, Black Panther Bidco, Ltd., S. Carter Enterprises, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12006190)Document filed by Yesh Music, LLC, John Emanuele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yesh Music, LLC et al v. S. Carter Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Carter Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Represented By: Alison Irene Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Panther Bidco, Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Hoffman
Represented By: Jordan W. Siev
Represented By: Lillian C Worthley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspiro AB
Represented By: Christopher Paul Hoffman
Represented By: Jordan W. Siev
Represented By: Lillian C Worthley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesh Music, LLC
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K. Emanuele
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?