Gardner v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Allen Scott Gardner
Defendant: Dominic Robinson, Robert Cintron, William Cadena, Gersh and Melvin Moultrie
Case Number: 1:2016cv01548
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Queens
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER: The January 17, 2023 trial is adjourned until April 10, 2023. The January 4, 2023 pre-trial conference is adjourned until March 8, 2023 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/15/2022) ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2023 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (ks)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: granting 135 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The November 29, 2022 pre-trial conference is adjourned until January 4, 2023 at 9:45 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the open motion at ECF No. 135 (second letter motion to adjourn conference). SO ORDERED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/21/2022) (ama)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: granting 133 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The October 18, 2022 pre-trial conference is adjourned until November 29, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the open motion at ECF No. 133 (first letter motion to adjourn conference). SO ORDERED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/11/2022) (ama)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: The November 7, 2022 trial is adjourned until January 17, 2023. SO ORDERED., ( Jury Trial set for 1/17/2023 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/04/2022) (ama)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: The October 14, 2022 pre-trial conference is adjourned until October 18, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/03/2022) (ama)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: granting 126 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Pre-trial conference is adjourned to October 14, 2022 at 10:00 a.m SO ORDERED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/27/2022) (ama)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: granting 124 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The trial is adjourned to November 7, 2022 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. Jury Trial set for 11/7/2022 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/23/2022) (ama)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: The jury trial is adjourned to begin on November 8, 2021 at 9:45 a.m. The pretrial conference is adjourned from June 17, 2021 to September 22, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels., Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/16/2021) (ama)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: The Joint Pretrial Order is due by July 10, 2020. The May 21, 2020 pretrial conference is adjourned to July 23, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. The jury trial is adjourned to begin on August 10, 2020. (Pretrial Order due by 7/10/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/21/2020) (jwh)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER adopting 57 Report and Recommendations re: 44 Motion for Summary Judgment: Magistrate Judge Lehrburger's Report and Recommendation is adopted in part and rejected in part to the extent indicated. Defendants' motion for summary judgment, (ECF No. 44), is DENIED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/6/2018) (jwh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Scott Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cintron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cadena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gersh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Moultrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?