Anthem, Inc. v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthem, Inc.
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv02048
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION for Evan M. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17136592. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission of Evan M. Goldenberg Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldenberg, Evan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #223 MOTION for Evan M. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17136592. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER REDACTING AND SEALING PORTIONS OF TRANSCRIPT: granting #221 Motion to Seal Document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the May 14, 2019 hearing transcript be redacted and sealed pursuant to the proposed redactions contained in yellow highlighting in Exhibit 1 attached to ESI's letter motion, dated June 20, 2019; and it is further ORDERED that the public release of the May 14, 2019 hearing transcript be stayed until such time as the ordered redactions are implemented by the Court Reporter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/24/2019) (js)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #222 Order on Motion to Seal Document,,, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (js)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #216 Transcript,, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated June 20, 2019. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Corkhill, Andrew)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 REVISED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Summary judgment Motions due by 4/22/2020. Responses due by 6/3/2020. Replies due by 7/1/2020. Fact Depositions due by 9/30/2019. Expert Depositions due by 3/23/2020. Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2019. All Discovery due by 3/23/2020. Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/7/2019) (mro)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated June 5, 2019 re: [Proposed] Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order)(Kurtz, Glenn)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #218 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kurtz, Glenn) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 5/14/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTIION held on 5/14/2019 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Corkhill, Andrew) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #215 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 OPINION AND ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's January 17, 2019 order, Express Scripts, Inc., ("ESI") submitted a privilege log, a chronology of its retention of Milliman, Inc., a consulting company, and documents in its possession and in the possession of Milliman. Anthem has also submitted a chronology of ESI's retention of Milliman, as well as supporting documents. Both parties have submitted these documents under seal and for in camera review. ESI has invoked the work-product, attorney-client, and non-testifying expert privileges as reasons for withholding production of the documents in its possession; as set forth herein. For the non-testifying expert privilege, "[o]rdinarily, a party may not, by interrogatories or deposition, discover facts known or opinions held by an expert who has been retained or specially employed by another party in anticipation of litigation or to prepare for trial and who is not expected to be called as a witness at trial." Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(4)(D). This privilege does not apply when a party shows "exceptional circumstances under which it is impracticable for the party to obtain facts or opinions on the same subject by other means." Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(4)(D)(ii). With these precedents in mind, the Court has reviewed ESI's corrected privilege log (attached as Exhibit 2 to its January 24, 2019 letter), the parties' chronologies, and the remaining documents that were submitted for in camera review. It finds that ESI has properly invoked the work-product, non-testifying expert, and attorney-client privileges for every document identified by the privilege log and obtained from Milliman, a non-testifying expert, "because of the prospect of litigation," Schaeffler, 806 F.3d at 43. This includes the following Entry Numbers; as set forth herein. Because the Court finds that ESI retained Milliman for the purpose of preparing for potential litigation, the privileges may also apply to the documents in Milliman's possession. This resolves all documents in the privilege log. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/14/2019) (mro)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Discovery Hearing held on 5/14/2019. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. (jar)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated May 7, 2019 re: #202 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andres S. Corkhill dated April 26, 2019. [Public Redacted Version]. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Transcript dated April 26, 2017, #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C- Transcript dated November 21, 2017, #4 Exhibit D- Transcript dated August 1, 2017, #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit H (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit I (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit J (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit K (Filed Under Seal))(Kurtz, Glenn)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING RESPONSE TO PRE-MOTION LETTER AND EXHIBITS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for ESI and Anthem that: 1. Anthem is authorized to file the Response to Pre-Motion Letter and its exhibits under seal; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/9/2019) (kv)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated May 7, 2019 re: response to Express Scripts, Inc.'s April 26,2019 letter seeking a Local Civil Rule 37.2 Conference #201 . Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kurtz, Glenn)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #208 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The application is granted. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 5/7/2019 (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/6/2019) (kv)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Columbres, Claudine)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #202 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andres S. Corkhill dated April 26, 2019., #201 Letter addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated May 3, 2019. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael J. Lyle dated April 29, 2019 re: #187 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated March 27, 2019. . Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal))(Lyle, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated April 29, 2019 re: Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.'s March 27, 2019, letter #188 . Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andres S. Corkhill dated April 26, 2019. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Corkhill, Andrew)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated April 26, 2019 re: Cigna Litigation deposition materials. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Corkhill, Andrew)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING PRE-MOTION LETTER AND EXHIBITS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the Parties, that: 1. ESI is authorized to file the Pre-Motion Letter and any exhibits under seal, and to file redacted copies of the Pre-Motion Letter and any exhibits on the public docket; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/26/2019) (kv)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING RESPONSE TO PRE-MOTION LETTER AND EXHIBITS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the Parties, that: 1. ESI is authorized to file the Response (including exhibits) under seal, and to file a redacted copy of the Response on the public docket; 2. This stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/25/2019) (kv)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Lyle, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING PRE-MOTION LETTER AND EXHIBITS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the Parties, that: 1. ESI is authorized to file the Pre-Motion Letter and any exhibits under seal, and to file redacted copies of the Pre-Motion Letter and any exhibits on the public docket; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/22/2019) (kv)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Corkhill, Andrew)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Corkhill, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 12/20/2019. Responses due by 1/31/2020 Replies due by 2/28/2020. Deposition due by 11/21/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/14/2019. All Discovery due by 11/21/2019. Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/1/2019) (kv)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #191 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The application is granted. The time to respond to pre-motion letters is extended to April 29, 2019. The pre-motion conference is adjourned to Tuesday, May 14, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/1/2019) (ne)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (ne)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated March 29, 2019 re: Proposed Revised Schedule. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order)(Corkhill, Andrew)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses/Replies to March 27, 2019 Pre-Motion Letters (ECF Nos. 187, 188) and Joint Continuance of April 2, 2019 Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mike Lyle dated March 29, 2019. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated March 27, 2019 re: Discovery Dispute. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated March 27, 2019. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal))(Kurtz, Glenn)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mike Lyle dated March 25, 2019 re: Response to Anthem, Inc.'s March 15, 2019 Letter. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING PREMOTION LETTER AND EXHIBITS, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the Parties, that: l. ESI is authorized to file the Pre-Motion Letter and any exhibits under seal, and to file redacted copies of the Pre-Motion Letter and any exhibits on the public docket; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/25/2019) (kv)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING PRE-MOTION LETTER AND EXHIBITS, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for ESI and Anthem that: 1. Anthem is authorized to file the Pre-Motion Letter and its exhibits under seal; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each or which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/25/2019) (kv)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kurtz, Glenn)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Keith Forst dated March 22, 2019 re: in Response to Anthem's March 13, 2019 Letter. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal)(Forst, Keith)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Corkhill, Andrew)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING PRE-MOTION LETTER AND EXHIBIT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the Parties, that: l. ESI is authorized to file the Response (including exhibits) under seal, and to file a redacted copy of the Response on the public docket; 2. This stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/22/2019) (kv)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING PREMOTION LETTER AND EXHIBITS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the Parties, that: 1. ESI is authorized to file the PML Response (including exhibits) under seal, and to file redacted copies of the PML Response on the public docket; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/22/2019) (kv)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Forst, Keith)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Corkhill, Andrew)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #172 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The matter will be heard at the April 2 pre-motion conference. Express Scripts' response to Anthem's letter is due March 25, 2019. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, doc. 173. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff Anthem's March 15, 2019 Pre-Motion Letter (ECF No. 172) addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mike Lyle dated March 19, 2019. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated March 15, 2019. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal))(Kurtz, Glenn)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #167 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on April 2, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. Defendant is directed to submit a written response not longer than 3 pages by March 22, 2019. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. ) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING EXHIBITS TO PRE-MOTION LETTER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for ESI and Anthem that: 1. Anthem is authorized to file the Pre-Motion Letter and its exhibits under seal; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/14/2019) (kv)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kurtz, Glenn)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 LETTER MOTION for Conference Local Rule 37.2 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated March 13, 2019. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Scheduling Notice - A telephone conference will be held on Thursday, February 28, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. The parties are directed to jointly call the Court at (212) 805-0169. (jar) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jar).
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REVISED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties will complete fact depositions no later than April 26, 2019. Motions due by 10/16/2019. Responses due by 11/20/2019 Replies due by 12/18/2019. Expert Deposition due by 9/12/2019. Fact Discovery due by 4/26/2019. Discovery due by 9/12/2019. Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/8/2019) (kv)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated February 7, 2019 re: [Proposed] Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order)(Corkhill, Andrew)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Keith H. Forst dated January 24, 2019 re: Chronology for Milliman Retention. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of ESI Privilege Log, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Filed Under Seal)(Forst, Keith)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Anthem, Inc.'s Chronology of Express Scripts, Inc.'s Retention of Milliman [Redacted]. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 [Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 [Filed Under Seal], #5 Exhibit 5 [Filed Under Seal], #6 Exhibit 6 [Filed Under Seal], #7 Exhibit 7 [Filed Under Seal])(Kurtz, Glenn)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING MILLIMAN CHRONOLOGIES AND EXHIBITS, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the Parties, that: 1. The Parties are authorized to file the Milliman Chronologies (including exhibits) under seal, and to file redacted copies of the Milliman Chronologies on the public docket; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. Motions terminated: #159 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Seal Document /Joint Letter Motion to Seal Milliman Chronologies and Exhibits addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated January 23, 2019. filed by Anthem, Inc. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/24/2019) (kv)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Seal Document /Joint Letter Motion to Seal Milliman Chronologies and Exhibits addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated January 23, 2019. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Sealing Milliman Chronologies and Exhibits)(Kurtz, Glenn)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company, Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts, Inc.. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Andrew Stuart Corkhill to RE-FILE Document #157 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc.. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew) Modified on 1/18/2019 (lb).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Andrew Stuart Corkhill to RE-FILE Document #156 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew) Modified on 1/17/2019 (lb).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #153 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for January 4, 2019 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated December 13, 2018. Document filed by Anthem, Inc. Conference adjourned until Thursday, January 17, 2019, at 3:15 PM. The application is granted. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 03:15 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos). (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/17/2018) (rjm)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for January 4, 2019 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated December 13, 2018. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING RESPONSE, WITH EXHIBITS, TO PRE-MOTION LETTER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for ESI and Anthem that: 1. ESI is authorized to file the Response (including exhibits) under seal and to file a redacted copy on the public docket. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/12/2018) (jwh)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE re: #148 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and pursuant to Section 2(A)(i) of this Court's Individual Practices addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated December 3, 2018. . Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Jeffrey W. Mittleman, #3 Exhibit 3 Filed Under Seal)(Ward Merkel, Ellison)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Letter with Exhibits Under Seal addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated December 11, 2018. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Sealing Response, with Exhibits, to Pre-Motion Letter)(Corkhill, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on January 4, 2019, at 11:45 a.m. Defendant is directed to respond by Wednesday, December 12, 2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and pursuant to Section 2(A)(i) of this Court's Individual Practices addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated December 3, 2018. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kurtz, Glenn)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 REVISED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting #146 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial This case is to be tried to a jury. Except for good cause shown, joinder of additional parties is no longer permitted. The parties will complete fact depositions no later than February 8, 2019. Fact discovery shall be completed by February 8, 2019. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY June 27, 2019. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/31/2019. Responses due by 9/3/2019. Replies due by 9/27/2019. The next case management conference is scheduled for June 27, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. The July 19, 2019 case management conference is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/6/2018) (jwh)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Deposition due by 6/27/2019., Discovery due by 6/27/2019., Fact Discovery due by 2/8/2019., Motions due by 7/31/2019., Responses due by 9/3/2019, Replies due by 9/27/2019.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (jwh)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery /Letter Motion for Proposed Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Claudine Columbres dated October 30, 2018. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order)(Columbres, Claudine)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/21/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: confernece held on 8/21/2018 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita Trombetta, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: On July 23, 2018, Anthem, Inc. ("Anthem") sought a conference to resolve discovery disputes concerning Express Scripts, Inc.'s ("Express Scripts'") responses to three of Anthem's interrogatories. See Doc. 128. The Court held the requested conference on August 21, 2018, and resolved the parties' disagreement over Express Scripts' response to Interrogatory 4. The Court informed the parties that its decision on the adequacy of Express Scripts' responses to Interrogatories 7 and 11 would be taken under advisement. For the reasons stated below, Anthem's request is now GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court finds that Anthem's request has put the cart before the horse. Interrogatories 7 and 11 ask Express Scripts whether it believes its Anthem pricing was competitive (or at "competitive benchmark" levels), and asks Express Scripts to identify the bases for its contention. See Doc. 128 Ex. 3. Express Scripts has not answered the second part of Anthem's interrogatories, and it must do so. To the extent that Express Scripts relied on its pricing to other customers to determine that its pricing to Anthem was at market competitive levels (taking into account the 2009 transaction), it must provide that information to Anthem and identify the pricing data on which it is relying. If, however, Express Scripts did not rely on its pricing to other customers in reaching that conclusion, it need not provide that data but must disclose its basis for its contention and identify the supporting data on which it did rely. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/23/2018) (jwh)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for ESI and Anthem that: 1. Anthem and ESI are authorized to file letters under seal and to file a redacted copy on the public docket. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/23/2018) (jwh)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated August 23, 2018 re: Express Scripts, Inc.'s letter dated August 22, 2018 #137 . Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 REVISED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Except for good cause shown, joinder of additional parties is no longer permitted. Motions due by 5/22/2019. Responses due by 6/25/2019 Replies due by 7/19/2019. Fact Deposition due by 11/30/2019. Expert Deposition due by 4/18/2019. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2018. Discovery due by 4/18/2019. Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/22/2018) (jwh)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kurtz, Glenn)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated August 22, 2018. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Sealing Certain Confidential and Highly Confidential Documents)(Kurtz, Glenn)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Keith H. Forst dated August 22, 2018 re: Response to Anthem Inc.'s post-hearing letter (Dkt. 136). Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Forst, Keith)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated August 21, 2018 re: supplemental authority. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated August 21, 2018 re: Proposed Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order)(Corkhill, Andrew)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Discovery Hearing held on 8/21/2018. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. (jar)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated July 31, 2018 re: #128 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and pursuant to Section 2(A)(i) of this Court's Individual Practices addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated July 23, 2018. . Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B-Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C-Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit D-Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit E-Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit F-Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit G-Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit H-Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit I-Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit J-Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit K-Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit L-Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit M-Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit N-Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit O-Filed Under Seal, #16 Exhibit P-Filed Under Seal, #17 Exhibit Q-Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit R-Filed Under Seal, #19 Exhibit S-Filed Under Seal, #20 Exhibit T-Filed Under Seal, #21 Exhibit U-Filed Under Seal, #22 Exhibit V-Filed Under Seal)(Corkhill, Andrew)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING RESPONSE, WITH EXHIBITS, TO PRE-MOTION LETTER:IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for ESI and Anthem that: 1. Express Scripts is authorized to file the Response (including exhibits) under seal and to file a redacted copy on the public docket. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/31/2018) (jwh)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File under seal a letter with exhibits in response to the July 23, 2018 letter from Plaintiff Anthem. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated July 30, 2018. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Corkhill, Andrew)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The application is granted. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/26/2018) (jwh)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference until August 21, 2018 at 11 a.m. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated July 25, 2018. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #128 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on August 15, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. Defendant is directed to file its response, of no more than three pages, by July 31, 2018. Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/15/2018 at 12:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/24/2018) (mro)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and pursuant to Section 2(A)(i) of this Court's Individual Practices addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated July 23, 2018. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Kurtz, Glenn)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion to Seal Document: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/20/2018) (jwh)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document / Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated July 19, 2018. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Sealing Pre-Motion Letter and Exhibits)(Kurtz, Glenn)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (43 in 1:18-mc-00013-AKH) Letter filed by Express Scripts, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. The case is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk shall mark the case as closed and tax costs as appropriate. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/19/2018) (ras)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR OPTUMRX, INC. regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/5/2018) (jwh)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REVISED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Except for good cause shown, joinder of additional parties is no longer permitted. The parties will complete fact depositions no later than August 31, 2018. Notwithstanding this deadline, the parties will endeavor to complete all fact depositions by July 31, 2018. Fact discovery shall be completed by August 31, 2018. Expert depositions shall be completed by January 18, 2019. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY JANUARY 18, 2019. Opening briefs by any party seeking summary judgment shall be served and filed no later than February 22, 2019. Opposition briefs shall be served and filed no later than March 25, 2019. Reply briefs shall be served and filed no later than April 19, 2019. The Magistrate Judge assigned to this case is the Hon. Debra Freeman. The next case management conference is scheduled for January 18, 2019, at 11:00 AM. Motions due by 2/22/2019. Responses due by 3/25/2019 Replies due by 4/19/2019. Deposition due by 1/18/2019. Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2018. Discovery due by 1/18/2019. Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/2/2018) (ras)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated March 30, 2018 re: Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order)(Corkhill, Andrew)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR CVS/CAREMARK regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/6/2018) (jwh)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael J. Lyle dated March 5, 2018 re: Withdrawing the February 28, 2018 Letter (ECF Docket No. 117). Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Lyle, Michael)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: with respect to #117 Letter Motion for Conference. Anthem and CVS should file a response of no longer than three pages by March 5, 2018. ESI is directed to provide a copy of this order to counsel for CVS. CVS may file its response by email to the Court at chambersnysdramos@nysd.uscourts.gov. It is SO ORDERED. Response due by 3/5/2018. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/1/2018) (ap)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael J. Lyle dated February 28, 2018. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Order, #2 Exhibit B First Document Subpoena to CVS, #3 Exhibit C Second Document Subpoena to CVS, #4 Exhibit D Deposition Subpoena to CVS)(Lyle, Michael)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Debra Kobrin Levy, Associate General Counsel, dated February 23, 2018, re: Former Law Clerk to the Honorable Debra C. Freeman. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Columbres, Claudine)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert E Tiedemann, III on behalf of Anthem, Inc.. (Tiedemann, Robert)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claudine Columbres on behalf of Anthem, Inc.. (Columbres, Claudine)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Glenn Kurtz on behalf of Anthem, Inc.. New Address: White & Case LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, 10020, (212) 819-8200. (Kurtz, Glenn)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael C. Loughran Potter on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. New Address: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, 1300 I Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, District of Columbia, U.S.A. 20005, (202) 538-8100. (Potter, Michael)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael John Lyle on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. New Address: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, 1300 I Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, District of Columbia, U.S.A. 20005, (202) 538-8100. (Lyle, Michael)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Keith H. Forst on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. New Address: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, 1300 I Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, District of Columbia, U.S.A. 20005, (202) 538-8100. (Forst, Keith)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ellison Sylvina Ward Merkel on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. (Ward Merkel, Ellison)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/13/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/13/2017 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a confernece proceeding held on 12/13/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 12/13/2017 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/29/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting [146 in 16-CV-3399] Letter Motion for Conference: The parties may raise this issue at the status conference scheduled for December 13, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. Anthem may submit a written response of no longer than three pages by December 12, 2017. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/11/2017) (jwh)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jwh)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR OPTUMRX, INC... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... So ordered. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/28/2017) (rjm)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING WRITTEN DISCOVERY DEADLINES: NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants, that: 1. Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production of Documents shall be served no later than February 28, 2018, and responses thereto are to be served within thirty (30) days thereafter. The provisions of Local Civil Rule 33.3 shall not apply to this case. 2. These dates are set without prejudice to the parties submitting a stipulation or any party submitting a motion to the Court to further extend any or all of these deadlines, or any other deadlines in this action or the Anthem-ESI Action. 3. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/22/2017) (jwh)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting [139 in 16-CV-3399] Letter Motion for Conference: The parties may raise this issue at the status conference currently scheduled for December 6, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. Defendants are directed to submit a written response, no longer than three pages, by November 30, 2017. (Responses due by 11/30/2017) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/21/2017) (jwh)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION SCHEDULING AND DURATION: NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the Parties, that: 1. The Parties shall cooperate fully in scheduling depositions. 2. Before a Party notices a deposition of an adverse party, a present or former employee of an adverse party, or a person that is represented by counsel for an adverse party (all of whom are referred to herein as the "Adverse Party"), it shall notify counsel for the non-adverse party and make a good faith effort to meet and confer with the non-adverse party as to the scheduling of the deposition, the order of questioning at the deposition, and the length of time that they believe they will cumulatively need to take the deposition, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/7/2017) (jwh)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. Loughran Potter on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. (Potter, Michael)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REVISED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting #97 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Except for good cause shown, joinder of additional parties is no longer permitted. The parties will complete fact depositions no later than March 30, 2018. Fact discovery shall be completed by March 30, 2018. Expert depositions shall be completed by August 3, 2018. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY AUGUST 3, 2018. Summary judgment motions shall be filed as follows: a. Opening briefs by any party seeking summary judgment shall be served and filed no later than September 7, 2018. b. Opposition briefs shall be served and filed no later than October 19, 2018. c. Reply briefs shall be served and filed no later than November 16, 2018. The next case management conference is scheduled for August 7, 2018, at 10:30 A.M. The case management conference previously scheduled for April 3, 2018 is hereby adjourned. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/3/2017) (jwh)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated October 3, 2017. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Corkhill, Andrew)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 8/3/2018. Discovery due by 8/3/2018. Fact Discovery due by 3/30/2018. Motions due by 9/7/2018. Responses due by 10/19/2018. Replies due by 11/16/2018. (jwh)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #98 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rjm)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #97 Transcript. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rjm).
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/1/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/1/2017 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 08/01/2017 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Jackson, Jasmine)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/1/2017 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2017.(Jackson, Jasmine)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: On August 1, 2017, the Court held a discovery conference. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's letter motion regarding discovery disputes concerning requests for production numbers 5, 7, and 30, Doc. 77, is DENIED. With respect to request number 5, as indicated on the record, Plaintiff shall provide formal documentation outlining in greater detail Anthem's actual use of the proceeds from the sale of NextRx. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/1/2017) (mro)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Discovery Hearing held on 8/1/2017. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley) (jar)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated July 25, 2017 re: #77 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael J. Lyle dated July 14, 2017. . Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kurtz, Glenn)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING RESPONSE TO PRE-MOTION LETTER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for ESI and Anthem that: Anthem is authorized to file the Response to Pre-Motion Letter under seal, and to file a redacted copy on the public docket. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/25/2017) (mro)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document / Letter Motion to seal Response to Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated July 24, 2017. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Sealing Response to Pre-Motion Letter)(Kurtz, Glenn)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #80 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Pre-Motion Conference is rescheduled for August 1, 2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Lucile H. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #82 Motion for John D. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #81 Motion for James T. Irvin, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #82 MOTION for John D. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13930285. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #81 MOTION for James T. Irvin, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13929012. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #83 MOTION for Lucile H. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13930335. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Lucile H. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13930335. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lucile H. Cohen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Lucile)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for John D. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13930285. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John D. Martin in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, John)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for James T. Irvin, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13929012. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James T. Irvin, III in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Irvin, James)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference /pre-motion conference to August 1, 2017, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated July 21, 2017. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on August 3, 2017 at 10:00 am. Plaintiff is directed to submit a written response not longer than 3 pages by 5:00 pm on Thursday, July 27, 2017. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/3/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael J. Lyle dated July 14, 2017. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Keith H. Frost to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING PRE-MOTION LETTER AND EXHIBITS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for ESI and Anthem that: 1.ESI is authorized to file the Pre-Motion Letter under seal, and to file a redacted copy on the public docket. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, doc. 74.Motions terminated: #74 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated July 12, 2017. filed by Express Scripts, Inc. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/13/2017) (rj)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Corkhill dated July 12, 2017. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Corkhill, Andrew)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR CVS/CAREMARK regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/6/2017) (jwh)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REVISED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Except for good cause, joinder of additional parties is no longer permitted. Motions due by 5/23/2018. Responses due by 7/9/2018 Replies due by 8/10/2018. Fact Deposition due by 11/30/2017. Expert Deposition due by 4/2/2018. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2017. Discovery due by 4/2/2018. Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/2/2017) (jwh)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Keith H. Forst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13731176. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Keith H. Forst in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing May 31, 2017, #3 Proposed Order)(Forst, Keith)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #71 MOTION for Keith H. Forst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13731176. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted Docket Annotation. The annotation was incorrectly filed in this case. (jar)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/26/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/26/2017 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Seal Document; re: #50 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated April 4, 2017: On April 26, 2017, the Court held a discovery conference. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's letter motion regarding discovery disputes, Doc. 50, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's requests for discovery related to Defendant's other customers, including their pricing information and profitability margins, is DENIED. Plaintiff's request for discovery concerning Defendant's competition with Plaintiff is DEFERRED pending a meet-and-confer and further discussions between the parties. Plaintiff's request for post-complaint discovery is GRANTED. Defendant's motion to seal its letter seeking a pre-motion conference, exhibits, and to file redacted versions of the documents on the public docket, Doc. 52, is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 52. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/1/2017) (jwh)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated April 26, 2017 re: in response to defendant ESI's letter (docket no. 66). Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated April 25, 2017 re: to update the Court on the status and pace of discovery. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Carlinsky, Michael)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #66 LETTER MOTION. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ldi)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Discovery Hearing set for 4/26/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference regarding discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated April 18, 2017. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Carlinsky, Michael)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated April 14, 2017 re: Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.'s April 4, 2017 letter (i) for a protective order allowing it to conceal critical evidence concerning pricing and other core issues in the case, and (ii) to compel Anthem to produce certain documents. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kurtz, Glenn)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated April 14, 2017 re: #50 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated April 4, 2017. . Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carlinsky, Michael)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ANSWER to #33 Counterclaim. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESCHEDULING NOTICE: The discovery conference scheduled for April 27, 2017, is hereby rescheduled until April 25, 2017, at 11:00 am in Courtroom 110 before the Hon. Edgardo Ramos, at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. (Discovery Hearing set for 4/25/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (jwh)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Each Party's Response to Pre-Motion Letters (ECF Nos. 50, 52). Responses to the pre-motion letters are now due April 14, 2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for Anthem and ESI, that: 1. The deadline for Anthem to file and serve an Answer to the Amended Counterclaims, shall be extended by 7 days, up to and including April 14, 2017. 2. This Stipulation may he executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes or this Stipulation. (Anthem, Inc. answer due 4/14/2017.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/7/2017) (jwh)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Each Party's Response to Pre-Motion Letters (ECF Nos. 50, 52) addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated April 7, 2017. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Carlinsky, Michael)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #52 MOTION to Seal Document re: Letter Seeking a Pre-Motion Conference, and Exhibits, and to File Redacted Versions on the Public Docket filed by Express Scripts, Inc. AMENDED ENDORSEMENT: TO SUPERSEDE MEMO ENDORSEMENT, DOC. #54 : A discovery conference pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.2 will be held on April 27, 2017 at 10:30 AM. Any response to this letter shall be filed by April 11, 2017. Any response to the motion to seal, Doc. 52, shall be filed by April 14, 2017. Any reply shall be filed by April 21, 2017. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/6/2017) (jwh)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #50 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference: A discovery conference pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.2 will be held on April 27, 2017 at 10:30 AM. Any response to this letter shall be filed by April 11, 2017. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion. (Discovery Hearing set for 4/27/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/6/2017) (jwh)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #52 MOTION to Seal Document re: Letter Seeking a Pre-Motion Conference, and Exhibits, and to File Redacted Versions on the Public Docket filed by Express Scripts, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: A discovery conference pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.2 will be held on April 27, 2017 at 10:30 AM. Any response to this letter shall be filed by April 14, 2017. Any response to the motion to seal, Doc. 52, shall be filed by April 14, 2017. Any reply shall be filed by April 21, 2017. (Discovery Hearing set for 4/27/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #52 MOTION to Seal Document: Responses due by 4/14/2017, Replies due by 4/21/2017.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/6/2017) (jwh)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: MOTION AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE BY ROBERT TRISOTTO: granting #51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to remove Mr. Trisotto as counsel of record. Attorney Robert Steven Trisotto terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/5/2017) (ap)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Seal Document re: Letter Seeking a Pre-Motion Conference, and Exhibits, and to File Redacted Versions on the Public Docket. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Corkhill Declaration, #3 Ex. 1, #4 Ex. 2)(Corkhill, Andrew) Modified on 5/19/2017 (ldi).
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Robert Trisotto to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Express Scripts, Inc.,. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated April 4, 2017. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kurtz, Glenn)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION AND ORDER re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthem, Inc. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims II and VI is GRANTED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the Motion, Doc. 39. (As further set forth in this Opinion and Order.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/23/2017) (mro)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/8/2016) (cla)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jacob J Waldman on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. New Address: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, NY, USA 10010, 212-849-7000. (Waldman, Jacob)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kurtz, Glenn)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated August 5, 2016 re: Oral Argument on Anthem's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Carlinsky, Michael)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Carlinsky, Michael)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated July 8, 2016 re: Request for Oral Argument on Anthem's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DECLARATION of Glenn M. Kurtz in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kurtz, Glenn)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kurtz, Glenn)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. Responses due by 8/5/2016(Kurtz, Glenn)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING EXHIBIT TO THE DECLARATION OF GLENN M. KURTZ IN SUPPORT OF ANTHEM'S MOTION TO DISMISS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for Anthem and ESI, that: Anthem is authorized to file a true and correct copy of the PBM Agreement as a sealed exhibit to the Kurtz Declaration. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #37 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated July 7, 2016. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/7/2016) (kko)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated July 7, 2016. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order Sealing Exhibit to the Declaration of Glenn M. Kurtz)(Kurtz, Glenn)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #38 Stipulation and Order, Terminate Motions to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (kko)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #22 Motion for Michael J. Lyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/28/2016) (tn)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 6/3/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 6/3/2016 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED ANSWER to #18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Anthem, Inc.. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Corkhill, Andrew)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER FOR MOTION TO DISMISS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for Anthem and ESI, that: 1. ESI must file its Amended Answer and Counterclaims, if any, no later than June 13, 2016. 2. Anthem must file its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Answer and Counterclaims, if any, no later than July 8, 2016. 3. ESI must file its Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss no later than August 5, 2016. 4. Anthem must file its Reply no later than August 19, 2016. SO ORDERED. Express Scripts, Inc. answer due 6/13/2016. (Motions due by 7/8/2016. Responses due by 8/5/2016, Replies due by 8/19/2016.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/13/2016) (kko)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 6/3/2016. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. Parties are directed to confer and submit to the Court by Friday, June 10, 2016, a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiff's motion to dismiss and to report to the Court whether Defendant intends to amend its counterclaims. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (jar)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated May 27, 2016 re: #25 LETTER MOTION for Conference for Anthem's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss Counts Two and Six of ESI's Counterclaims, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated May 13, 2016. . Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Carlinsky, Michael)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jar)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. The Magistrate Judge assigned to this case is the Hon. Debra Freeman. Expert Deposition due by 12/1/2017. Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2017. All Discovery due by 12/1/2017. Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/24/2016) (kko) (Main Document 30 replaced on 5/25/2016) (jar). Modified on 5/25/2016 (jar). (Main Document 30 replaced on 5/25/2016) (jar).
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from White & Case LLP and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP re: Proposed Joint Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order)(Kurtz, Glenn)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on June 3, 2016, at 10:30 am. Defendant/Counter Claimant is directed to submit a written response not longer than 3 pages by 5:00 pm on Friday, May 27, 2016. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/3/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher G. Kelly on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. (Kelly, Christopher)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE LETTER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for Anthem and ESI, that: Anthem is authorized to file its Pre-Motion Conference Letter under seal and to file a redacted copy of the letter-that redacts portions of the letter containing Confidential Terms-publicly via ECF. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #24 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated May 12, 2016. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/13/2016) (kko)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Conference for Anthem's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss Counts Two and Six of ESI's Counterclaims, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated May 13, 2016. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #26 Stipulation and Order, Terminate Motions to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (kko)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated May 12, 2016. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proposed Stipulation and Order)(Kurtz, Glenn)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Michael J. Lyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Glenn M. Kurtz dated May 10, 2016 re: Statement of Relatedness in Case No. 16 Civ. 3399. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Michael J. Lyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certficate of Good Standing Illinois, #2 Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia Court of Appeals, #3 Proposed Order)(Lyle, Michael)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Chad Johnson on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. New Address: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, 51 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10010, 212.849.7000. (Johnson, Christopher)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Michael J. Lyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12279209. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (sdi)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated May 9, 2016 re: Contesting Statement of Relatedness in Case No. 16 Civ. 3399. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carlinsky, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael J. Lyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12279209. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Lyle, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2016 (sdi).
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Anthem, Inc.. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Corkhill, Andrew)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Lyle on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. (Lyle, Michael)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob J Waldman on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. (Waldman, Jacob)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER SEALING ANSWER: ESI is authorized to file its Answer under seal and to file a redacted copy of the Answer--that redacts portions of the Answer containing Confidential Terms--publicly via ECF. Motions terminated: #13 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated April 18, 2016, filed by Express Scripts, Inc. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/18/2016) (tro)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated April 18, 2016. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order Sealing Answer)(Carlinsky, Michael)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for Anthem and Express Scripts, that: 1. The deadline for Express Scripts to file and serve a response to the Complaint, whether by answer or motion, shall be extended by 15 days, up to and including April 26, 2016. 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and by e-mail or facsimile transmission, each of which shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. Express Scripts, Inc. answer due 4/26/2016. Motions terminated: #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated April 6, 2016 filed by Express Scripts, Inc. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/7/2016) (rjm)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/26/2016. (rjm)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated April 6, 2016. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Carlinsky, Michael)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Steven Trisotto on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. (Trisotto, Robert)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Stuart Corkhill on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. (Corkhill, Andrew)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Barry Carlinsky on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc.. (Carlinsky, Michael)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc.. Document filed by Express Scripts, Inc..(Carlinsky, Michael)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet #1 , Summons in a Civil Action, Confidential Unredacted Complaint #3 , Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order Sealing Complaint #5 , Individual Practices of Judge Edgardo Ramos and Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions served on Express Scripts, Inc. on March 21, 2016. Service was accepted by Shelly Lewis, Office Manager (CSC). Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kurtz, Glenn)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SEALING COMPLAINT. This matter having come before the Court on Application of Plaintiff Anthem, Inc., for an order sealing the Complaint in this action (the "Application"); and The Court, having considered Plaintiff's Application to Seal the Complaint; and after due deliberation and sufficient cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Application is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff Anthem is authorized to file the Complaint under seal and file a redacted copy of the Complaint publicly via ECF. The Court grants the requested relief provisionally to allow Plaintiff to file the unredacted complaint under seal. This ruling may be reevaluated and modified by the assigned judge. The Court makes no finding regarding the confidentiality of the redacted elements of the complaint. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods in Part I on 3/21/2016) (rjm).
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #5 Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (rjm)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Anthem, Inc..(Kurtz, Glenn)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Express Scripts, Inc.. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - (Redacted))(Kurtz, Glenn)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (moh).
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (moh)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Express Scripts, Inc.. (moh)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (moh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthem, Inc. v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E Tiedemann, III
Represented By: Claudine Columbres
Represented By: John D. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Kurtz
Represented By: Lucile H. Cohen
Represented By: James T. Irvin
Represented By: Evan Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Andrew Stuart Corkhill
Represented By: Ellison Sylvina Ward Merkel
Represented By: Christopher G. Kelly
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Represented By: Michael C. Loughran Potter
Represented By: Keith H. Forst
Represented By: Jacob J Waldman
Represented By: Robert Steven Trisotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?