Ravina v. Columbia University
Plaintiff: Enrichetta Ravina
Defendant: Columbia University
Case Number: 1:2016cv02137
Filed: March 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER: The Court's March 6, 2020 Opinion and Order directed Ravina to file the exhibits to her October 16, 2019 letter in unredacted form by April 1, 2020. Dkt. 391. Ravina has not yet filed the exhibits. She shall do so no later than April 10, 2020. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/7/2020) (rj)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 OPINION & ORDER re: 388 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alexandra Harwin dated October 16, 2019. filed by Enrichetta Ravina, 371 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. filed by Enrich etta Ravina. The Court grants Ravina's motion for attorneys' fees and costs, subject to the modifications discussed above. Ravina is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $1,336,861.63 and costs in the amount of $222,39 0.08 for a total award of $1,559,251.71 as further set forth in this Opinion. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Docket Entries 371 and 388. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/6/20) (yv)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 OPINION AND ORDER re: 295 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Proposed Search Terms addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Andrew Melzer dated 10/26/2018 filed by Enrichetta Ravina, 274 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Enrichetta Ravina, 297 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Response to arguments Plaintiff raised for the first time in her Reply brief in support of her motion for injunctive relief (Dkt.293) addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Be ttina B. Plevan dated 11/7/18 filed by Columbia University, 281 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, remittitur filed by Geert Bekaert. For the foregoing reasons, Bekaert's motion for judgment as a matt er of law and Ravina's motion for injunctive relief, as well as her sealing request, are denied. Bekaert's motion for a remittitur of the damages awards is granted. No later than April 22, 2019, Ravina shall inform the Court in writin g whether she will accept the reduced damages awards of $500,000 in compensatory damages and $250,000 in punitive damages. If she does not, the Court will grant Bekaert a new trial on the sole issue of damages. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at docket entries 274,281,295, and 297. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/31/2019) (ne)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravina v. Columbia University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrichetta Ravina
Represented By: Alexandra Harwin
Represented By: Jeremy Heisler
Represented By: Katherine M. Kimpel
Represented By: David W. Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia University
Represented By: Christopher Saleh Bouriat
Represented By: Susan Deegan Friedfel
Represented By: Joseph C. O'Keefe, Jr
Represented By: Bettina Barasch Plevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?