Conklin v. Specialist, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Conklin
Defendant: Specialist, L.L.C., New York Marine Towing, Incorporated, Tappan Zee Constuctors, LLC, Traylor Bros., Inc., Towing Vessel "Specialist and Towing Vessel "Realist
Case Number: 1:2016cv02515
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M. Karas
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: Beginning March 30, 2020, until further notice, all parties to civil conferences before Judge Davison shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 5999739 The parties should call in f rom a landline and announce their names before speaking. For Settlement Conferences: Clients should NOT be on the conference call. Counsel must have ready telephonic access to clients. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/9/2020) (ks)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the Oral Argument on December 4, 2019, the Court denies Claimant's Motion for Leave to File Claims Pursuant to Supplemental Rule F(4). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending Motion, (Dkt. No. 473), and terminate Claimant Helder J. Cordeiro from the docket. SO ORDERED. Helder J. Cordeiro, Helder J. Cordeiro and Helder J. Cordeiro terminated. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/5/2019) (jca)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting [522 in 16-cv-4643-KMK-PED] CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Concerning Solely Weeks' Medical Expert Report. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/4/2019) (jca)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: Accordingly, the claimants' allegations are insufficient as a matter of law to support affirmative unseaworthiness claims against the Weeks Marine vessels. Weeks Marine's motion to dismiss is therefore GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the following open motions in these and related cases: ECF No. 82 in 16-cv-2515; ECF No. 66 in 16-cv-3579; ECF No. 77 in 16-cv-3353; ECF No. 156 in 16-cv-4643; ECF No. 108 in 16-cv-5010; and ECF No. 8 6 in 16-cv-7001, and as further set forth in this order. Motions terminated: (77 in 1:16-cv-03353-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Unseaworthiness Claims (response deadline corrected), filed by Weeks Marine Inc. (66 in 1:16-cv-03579-KBF) MOT ION to Dismiss Unseaworthiness Claims (response deadline corrected), filed by Weeks Marine, Inc. (156 in 1:16-cv-04643-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Unseaworthiness Claims (response deadline corrected,) filed by Weeks Marine Inc, (86 in 1:16-cv-07001-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Unseaworthiness Claims (response deadline corrected), filed by Weeks Marine, Inc. (82 in 1:16-cv-02515-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Unseaworthiness Claims (response deadline corrected,) filed by Weeks Marine, Inc. (108 in 1:16-cv-05010-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Unseaworthiness Claims (response deadline corrected,) filed by Weeks Marine, Inc. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/6/2017) (ap)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION & ORDER re: (29 in 7:16-cv-02515-KMK) LETTER MOTION to Compel disposition of towing vessel "Specialist" addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Andrew V. Buchsbaum, Esq. dated July 18, 2016, filed by Leslie Conklin , (50 in 7:16-cv-04643-KMK) LETTER MOTION to Compel disposition of towing vessel "Specialist" addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Andrew V. Buchsbaum, Esq. dated July 18, 2016, filed by Leslie Conklin. The Court grants Petitioners' Motion to shift the cost of preservation of the Specialist to Respondent. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending Motion. ((Dkt. No. 23); (Dkt No. 50) 16-CV-4643 Dkt.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/22/16) (yv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conklin v. Specialist, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Conklin
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialist, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Marine Towing, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tappan Zee Constuctors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traylor Bros., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towing Vessel "Specialist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towing Vessel "Realist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?