Stewart et al v. Lake et al
Plaintiff: Stewart, Ellie Stewart, Janette P. Bowen, Charles Sidden, Yvonne Singleton, Leveda Curry, Geane Hewitt Gittens, Delilah Burrowes, Dedrie E. Paris, Idrissa Gaye and Deborah Alex-Saunders
Defendant: Lake, Marianne Lake, Robert Bentley, James Mackey, John Gerspach, Bruce R. Thompson, Aleem Gillani, Bruce Rose, Daryl Bible, Kelly King, John Shrewsberry, John V. Britti, Christopher Halmy, Janet Mcclusky, Paul Ince, Lewis Howard Wishba, Taj J. Bindra, Andy Cecere, Stefan Krause, Marcus Schenck, Patrick A. Remmert, Jr., Linda Bodenstin, Mark Hedstrom, Paul Donofrio and John Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2016cv02684
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE OF & ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT re: #17 Clerk's Judgment. Document filed by non-party, G.R. Isidro (sc)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: The attached document, which is of no effect, has been received by the Court. No further response or action is required. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/3/2016) (cf)
July 15, 2016 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Bonded Registry Warrant Claim. Document filed by Janette P. Bowen. (rdz)
July 13, 2016 Filing 59 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ATTORNEY(S) APPEARANCE, FOR COURT OF RECORD. Document filed by Yvonne Singleton. (sc)
July 13, 2016 Filing 58 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION, MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDERS; re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Yvonne Singleton. (sc)
July 13, 2016 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT OF BONDED REGISTRY WARRANT CLAIM of Yvonne Singleton. Document filed by Yvonne Singleton. (sc)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The attached document, which is of no effect, has been received by the Court. No further response or action is required. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/13/2016) (ama)
July 13, 2016 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response to Attorneys to be served on Troutman Sanders LLP, Bryan Cave LLP, Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C., Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP, Morgan Lewis, and Jason Krellenstein PLLC on 6/28/16. Document filed by Ellie Stewart. (sc)
July 13, 2016 Filing 53 OPPOSITION TO JUDGE'S ORDER. Document filed by Janette P. Bowen. (sc)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The attached documents, which are of no effect, have been received by the Court. No further response or action is required. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/12/2016) (cf)
July 12, 2016 Filing 50 (Objection)OPPOSITION TO JUDGE'S ORDER; re: #17 Clerk's Judgment. Document filed by Delilah Burrowes. (sc)
July 11, 2016 Filing 55 OPPOSITION TO JUDGE'S ORDER. Document filed by Michael Douglas, non-party. (sc)
July 11, 2016 Filing 49 OPPOSITION TO THE JUDGE'S ORDER. Document filed by Charles Sidden. (sc)
July 11, 2016 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT OF BOND REGISTRY WARRANT CLAIM of Michael Douglas; re: Alex-Saunders Estate Property. (sc)
July 8, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ACTION. Document filed by Ellie Stewart. (sac)
July 8, 2016 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT OF BONDED REGISTRY WARRANT CLAIM of Deborah Alex-Saunders. Document filed by Deborah Alex-Saunders. (sc)
July 8, 2016 Filing 46 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION/MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDERS; re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Charles Sidden. (sc)
July 8, 2016 Filing 44 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION/ MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDERS; re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Geane Hewitt Gittens. (sc)
July 8, 2016 Filing 41 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION/ MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDERS; re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Janette P. Bowen. (sc)
July 8, 2016 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT OF BONDED REGISTRY WARRANT CLAIM. Document filed by Ellie Stewart. (sac)
July 8, 2016 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT OF BONDED REGISTRY WARRANT CLAIM. Document filed by Delilah Burrowes. (sac) (Main Document 39 replaced on 7/11/2016) (sac).
July 8, 2016 Filing 38 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATIONS/ MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDERS/ re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,. Document filed by Deborah Alex-Saunders. (sc)
July 8, 2016 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT OF BONDED REGISTRY WARRANT CLAIM of G. Gittens. Document filed by Geane Hewitt Gittens. (sc)
July 8, 2016 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT OF BOND REGISTRY WARRANT CLAIM of Janette Bowen. Document filed by Janette P. Bowen. (sc)
July 7, 2016 Filing 45 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ATTORNEY(S) APPEARANCE / FOR COURT OF RECORD; re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Deborah Alex-Saunders, Janette P. Bowen, Delilah Burrowes, Leveda Curry, Idrissa Gaye, Geane Hewitt Gittens, Dedrie E. Paris, Charles Sidden, Yvonne Singleton, Ellie Stewart. (sc)
July 7, 2016 Filing 43 OBJECTION TO MATISTRATE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION/ MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDERS/ re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Dedrie E. Paris. (sc)
July 7, 2016 Filing 42 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION/ MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDER; re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by non-party Michael Douglas (sc) Modified on 7/11/2016 (sc).
July 7, 2016 Filing 35 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ATTORNEY(S) APPEARANCE / FOR COURT OF RECORD. Document filed by Deborah Alex-Saunders, Janette P. Bowen, Delilah Burrowes, Leveda Curry, Idrissa Gaye, Geane Hewitt Gittens, Dedrie E. Paris, Charles Sidden, Yvonne Singleton, Ellie Stewart. (sc)
July 7, 2016 Filing 34 IN NATURE OF AFFIDAVIT OF ATTACHMENT TO SERVICE OF PROCESS /NOTICE OF CLAIM/COVER SHEET,of Summons and Complaint. Kelly King served on 5/16/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. Service was accepted by Tresse Baldwin, BB & T Bank Legal Dept., Winston Salem, NC. Document filed by Yvonne Singleton. (sc)
July 7, 2016 Filing 33 IN NATURE OF AFFIDAVIT OF ATTACHMENT TO SERVICE OF PROCESS/ NOTICE OF CLAIM/ Summons and Complaint. Daryl Bible served on 5/16/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. Service was accepted by Tressa Baldwin, BB& T Bank Legal Dept., Winston Salem, NC. Document filed by Delilah Burrowes; Janette P. Bowen; Ellie Stewart; Deborah Alex-Saunders; Geane Hewitt Gittens; Charles Sidden; Idrissa Gaye; Dedrie E. Paris; Yvonne Singleton; Leveda Curry. (sc) Modified on 7/8/2016 (sc).
July 6, 2016 Filing 32 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION/ MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDERS. Document filed by Delilah Burrowes. (sc)
July 6, 2016 Filing 31 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION/ MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDERS. Document filed by Ellie Stewart. (sc)
July 6, 2016 Filing 30 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION/ MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDER. Document filed by Yvonne Singleton. (sc)
July 6, 2016 Filing 29 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER/ REPORT & RECOMMENDATION/ MANDATORY NOTICE OF VOID ORDER. Document filed by Leveda Curry. (sc) Modified on 7/8/2016 (sc).
July 6, 2016 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Patrick A. Remmert, Jr. served on 6/17/2016, answer due 7/8/2016. Service was accepted by Grace Shentwu, Credit Suisse Group of New York, NY. Document filed by Delilah Burrowes; Janette P. Bowen; Deborah Alex-Saunders; Leveda Curry. (sc)
July 6, 2016 Filing 25 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ATTORNEY(S) APPEARANCE/ FOR COURT OF RECORD. Document filed by Janette P. Bowen. (sc)
July 5, 2016 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint etc. Aleem Gillani served on 5/24/2016, answer due 6/14/2016. Service was accepted by Aleem Gilani, CFO and VP. Document filed by Delilah Burrowes; Janette P. Bowen; Ellie Stewart; Deborah Alex-Saunders; Geane Hewitt Gittens; Charles Sidden; Idrissa Gaye; Dedrie E. Paris; Yvonne Singleton; Leveda Curry. (sc)
July 5, 2016 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Robert Bentley served on 5/24/2016, answer due 6/14/2016. Service was accepted by Robert Bentley, C.O. of Mortgage Assurance, Inc. Document filed by Delilah Burrowes; Janette P. Bowen; Deborah Alex-Saunders; Geane Hewitt Gittens; Charles Sidden; Idrissa Gaye; Dedrie E. Paris; Leveda Curry. (sc)
July 1, 2016 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF BONDED REGISTRY WARRANT CLAIM of Charles E. Sidden. Document filed by Charles Sidden. (sc)
June 30, 2016 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Bonded Registry Warrant Claim. (rdz)
June 29, 2016 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Attorney(s) Appearance 6/21/2016. Document filed by Ellie Stewart. (rdz)
June 29, 2016 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Attorney(s) Appearance 6/15/2016. Document filed by Ellie Stewart. (rdz)
June 29, 2016 Filing 20 IN NATURE OF AFFIDAVIT OF ATTACHMENT TO SERVICE OF PROCESS/ NOTICE OF CLAIM; re: of Summons, Claim, Request for Admissions per Rule 36 etc. served on James MacKay on 5/17/16. Service was accepted by James MacKay. Document filed by Charles Sidden. (sc)
June 29, 2016 Filing 19 IN NATURE OF AFFIDAVIT OF ATTACHMENT TO SERVICE OF PROCESS/NOTICE OF CLAIM; re: of Summons, Claim, Request for Admissions per Rule 36 etc. served on James MacKay on 5/17/16. Service was accepted by James MacKay. Document filed by Charles Sidden. (sc)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed the annexed correspondence, styled as "Plaintiffs' Move [sic] to Strike Attomey(s) Appearance & Arguments and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss." These motions are denied, as they lack any arguable basis in law or fact. The Court further notes that this case has been dismissed and is now closed. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/28/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cf)
June 27, 2016 Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated June 24, 2016, the Court has reviewed Defendants Bible and King's unopposed motion to dismiss and, for the reasons set forth in the accompanying memorandum of law (Docket Entry No. 5), that motion is granted. Furthermore, having carefully reviewed the complaint in this action, the Court finds that it is not materially different from the complaint filed in Case No.14CV7425-PKC. Therefore, for the reasons set out in the thoughtful and well-reasoned Memorandum and Order of Judge Chen in that case, the Court dismisses Plaintiffs' complaint as against all Defendants in this case; and judgment is entered in Defendants favor; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/27/2016) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal, #2 Right to Appeal) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (km) (Main Document 17 replaced on 7/25/2016) (km)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #17 Clerk's Judgment, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Ellie Stewart P.O. Box 360844 Decatur, GA 30034. (mro)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #17 Clerk's Judgment,,, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Deborah Alex-Saunders Deborah Alex-Saunders P.O. Box 360844 Decatur, GA 30034. (mro)
June 27, 2016 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #17 Clerk's Judgment to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (km)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #17 Clerk's Judgment,,, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Idrissa Gaye 4786 Golod Way Lithonia, GA 30038. (mro)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #17 Clerk's Judgment,,, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Janette P. Bowen 4030 Weelaunee Road Ellenwood, GA 30294. (mro)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #17 Clerk's Judgment, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Geane Hewitt Gittens P.O. Box 3196 Duluth, GA 30096. (mro)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #17 Clerk's Judgment,,, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Yvonne Singleton 879 Honey LN, Crete, IL 60417. (mro)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #17 Clerk's Judgment,,, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Delilah Burrowes 3473 S. King Drive #439 Chicago, IL 61616. (mro)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #17 Clerk's Judgment,,, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Dedrie E. Paris 300 Opelika Rd #2435 Auburn, AL 36831. (mro)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #17 Clerk's Judgment, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Charles Sidden 3955 NC Hwy 152 West China Grove, NC 28023. (mro)
June 27, 2016 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #17 Clerk's Judgment, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Leveda Curry 640 E. 51St St #1W Chicago, IL 60615. (mro)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss. The Court has reviewed Defendants Bible and King's unopposed motion to dismiss and, for the reasons set forth in the accompanying memorandum of law (Docket Entry No. 5), that motion is granted. Furthermore, having carefully reviewed the complaint in this action, the Court finds that it is not materially different from the complaint filed in Case No.14CV7425-PKC. Therefore, for the reasons set out in the thoughtful and well-reasoned Memorandum and Order of Judge Chen in that case, the Court dismisses Plaintiffs' complaint as against all Defendants in this case. (See Docket Entry No.9 at ECF pp. 4-11.) This Order resolves Docket Entry No. 4. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to enter judgment in Defendants' favor and to close this case. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/24/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
June 24, 2016 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (ama)
June 16, 2016 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Bentley.(sc)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The requested extension of time is granted. DE # 13 resolved. Janet Mcclusky answer due 7/22/2016. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/14/2016) (mro)
June 14, 2016 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason M. Krellenstein dated June 14, 2016. Document filed by Janet Mcclusky.(Krellenstein, Jason)
June 14, 2016 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service of Notice of Appearance served on Claimants and Defendants on 06-13-16. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Janet Mcclusky. (Krellenstein, Jason)
June 13, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Krellenstein on behalf of Janet Mcclusky. (Krellenstein, Jason)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The requested extension of time to respond is granted, without prejudice to defendant's position as to sufficiency of service. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/8/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (spo)
June 7, 2016 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Mark S. Landman dated June 7, 2016. Document filed by James Mackey.(Landman, Mark)
June 7, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark S. Landman on behalf of James Mackey. (Landman, Mark)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/7/2016) (spo)
June 6, 2016 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion on 06/06/2016. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Daryl Bible, Kelly King. (Genovese, Amanda)
June 6, 2016 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Daryl Bible, Kelly King. (Genovese, Amanda)
June 6, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Daryl Bible, Kelly King.(Genovese, Amanda)
June 6, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Lyn Genovese on behalf of Daryl Bible, Kelly King. (Genovese, Amanda)
April 11, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daryl Bible, Taj J. Bindra, Linda Bodenstin, John V. Britti, Andy Cecere, Paul Donofrio, John Gerspach, Aleem Gillani, Christopher Halmy, Mark Hedstrom, Paul Ince, John Does 1-100, Kelly King, Stefan Krause, Marianne Lake, James Mackey, Janet Mcclusky, Patrick A. Remmert, Jr., Bruce Rose, Marcus Schenck, John Shrewsberry, Bruce R. Thompson, Lewis Howard Wishba. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401150089)Document filed by Delilah Burrowes, Janette P. Bowen, Ellie Stewart, Deborah Alex-Saunders, Geane Hewitt Gittens, Charles Sidden, Idrissa Gaye, Dedrie E. Paris, Yvonne Singleton, Leveda Curry.(pc) (pc).
April 11, 2016 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (pc)
April 11, 2016 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Bentley, Daryl Bible, Taj J. Bindra, Linda Bodenstin, John V. Britti, Andy Cecere, Paul Donofrio, John Gerspach, Aleem Gillani, Christopher Halmy, Mark Hedstrom, Paul Ince, John Does 1-100, Kelly King, Stefan Krause, Marianne Lake, James Mackey, Janet Mcclusky, Patrick A. Remmert, Jr., Bruce Rose, Marcus Schenck, John Shrewsberry, Bruce R. Thompson, Lewis Howard Wishba. (pc)
April 11, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Lake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mackey
Represented By: Mark S Landman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gerspach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleem Gillani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Bible
Represented By: Amanda Lyn Genovese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly King
Represented By: Amanda Lyn Genovese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shrewsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V. Britti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Halmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Mcclusky
Represented By: Jason Michael Krellenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Howard Wishba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taj J. Bindra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Cecere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Schenck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick A. Remmert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Bodenstin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hedstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Donofrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellie Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette P. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Sidden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leveda Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geane Hewitt Gittens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delilah Burrowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedrie E. Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idrissa Gaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Alex-Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?