Neri Flores et al v. Hill Country Chicken NY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Sotero Neri Flores and Cornelio Guerrero |
Defendant: |
Hill Country Chicken NY, LLC and Marc Glosserman |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv02916 |
Filed: |
April 19, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Queens |
Presiding Judge: |
Analisa Torres |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. ยง 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 25, 2018 |
Filing
45
OPINION AND ORDER: I approve the settlement in this matter. In light of the settlement, the action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. The Clerk is respectfully requested to mark this matter closed, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 5/23/2018) Copies Transmitted By Chambers. (ras)
|
April 2, 2018 |
Filing
43
OPINION AND ORDER: I am still unable to approve the proposed settlement agreement currently before me because it still contains an impermissible release...The parties are directed to submit a revised settlement agreement that contains a properly limited release within 30 days of this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/2/2018) Copies Transmitted By Chambers. (ras)
|
October 25, 2017 |
Filing
34
OPINION AND ORDER re: 32 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Although the parties' modified language no longer releases claims plaintiffs may have against defendants' former employees, shareholders, or members, the proposed agreement still releases cl aims plaintiffs may have that are unrelated to wage and hour issues against former directors, officers and representatives, among others (Faillace Letter, Ex. 1 paragraph 5(A)). Accordingly, within 30 days of this Order, the parties are to submit a revised settlement agreement that corrects the foregoing deficiencies, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 10/25/2017) Copies Transmitted By Chambers. (ras)
|
August 11, 2017 |
Filing
31
OPINION AND ORDER re: 27 MOTION for Settlement Approval in FLSA Action, filed by Sotero Neri Flores, Cornelio Guerrero. I cannot approve the settlement at this time. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, the parties are either t o provide the information sought and a revised settlement agreement that addresses the foregoing issues or to file a letter indicating their intention to abandon the settlement and proceed with litigation. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to close Docket Item 27, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 8/11/2017) Copies Transmitted By Chambers. (ras)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?