Adams et al v. The City Of New York ,
Plaintiff: Violeta Hernandez, Jerome Adams, Mechelle Agard, Marlin Alcantara, Guy Alcindor, Andy Almonte, Ekei Ani, Olaitan Aribidesi, Jacqueline Ataliede, Hector Austin, Tabitha Baez, Tina Baez, Mary Baker, Olayinka Balogun, Modesta Baltazar, Donjya Bardliving, Babatunde Baruwa, Andrea Baskett, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Robyn Battle, Rafael Beato, Regine Beauzile, Leonard Bishop, Nadean Blackwood, Bobby Blue, Shawna Blyther, Iris Bonet, Zorina Bostic, Quentin Brathwaite, Ana Bravo, Alexander Brent, Maxine Brereton, Elvis Breton, Lynette Brodie, Bridgett Brown, Felicia Brown, Katherine Brown, Paul Brown, Regina Brown, Sandra Brown, Danette Brown-Allen, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Tracey Bruno, Raymond Burgess, Rihanah Burnette, Himama Bushra, Joan Butcher, Godson Caruth, Sang Chae, Chawanda Charae, Rodney Charles, Margaret Cherry, Vielka Chery, Kenneth Clark, Denese Clue, Madeline Coles, Tashon Cooley, Joan Collins, Jasmine Crawford, Vicki Crosson, Rachel Curney, Jeannie Cyril, Fay Dacre, Annie Davie, Chuck Davis, Ebony Dawning, Iris De Jesus, Stevenson Delerme, Nderim Demirovic, Armando Diaz, Lisa Dicks, Deborah Dugger, Adrian Duncan, Emmanuel Duperval, Nicola Edwards, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Jonathan Emenike, Chantal Emile, Yojaida Estrella, Tyler Felder, Maria Feliu, Jose Fernandez, Vincent Feyi, Estrella Figueredo, Karen Fitten, Dolores Fleming, Sheriann Flot, Gale Flowers, Michelle Ford, Stephen Francis, Susan Fuller, Joseph Furlong, John Gaddam, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Eduardo Garcia, John Garcia, Joseph Garrett, Alina Gawronski, Lillian Glawson, Yvette Gomes, Lisa Gomez, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Cydia Graham, Wallisha Grant, Edward Grice, Sadie Guerra, Danary Guzman, Maricelis Guzman, Constance Habersham, Michelle Hackett, Wellington Hansberry, Renee Harper, Susan Harper, Felicia Harris, Auddretta Harrison, Anthony Hernandez, Michelle Hernandez, Neyda Herrera, Angela Heywood, Robert Hickson, Natasha Hooper, Wesley Hope, Elizabeth Hunte, Rasheed Ibrahim, Lawrence Ifidon, Thomas Ilori, Leola Innocent, Jarmaine Jackson, Lola James, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Shahora Jeffery, Olufemi Jegede, Allison Jenkins, Sergo Jeune, Ladinia Johnson, Tara Johnson, Tracy Johnson, Charles Jones, Karess Jones, Lindell Jones, Juliana Joseph, Tiffany Kan, Christopher Kapetanos, Adunni Kayode, Pamela Kearse, Shazad Khan, Akinwole Killanin, Julia Kolmakova, Marie Laratte, Marie Lazarre, Lan Lee, Paul Lee, Carol Lenard, Joann Liatto, Laura Little, Efrain Lopez, Pierre Louisere, Evelyn Lucas, Christine Magestic, Simone Manning, Deidre Manns, Cynthia Manuel, Roberta Martin, Merlyn Martinez, Gary Mayo, Patricia McCall-Walker, Ana McFarline, Jasmine Menardy, Salvatore Messina, Selvin Mighty, Regina Miguel, JoAnn Milton, Lennox Mitchell, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Donnettee Moret, Elton Morris, Irving Moulon, Robert Muldrow, Rachel Mulligan, Aqilah Mu'Min, Milagros Muniz, Hindu Murray, Tunishia Murray, Helen Mwaluko, Joseph Myer, Sr., Fitzroy Nelson, Nonie Noel, Boniface Nwosu, Damon O'Donnell, Harrison Ogbolu, Vanessa Okonta, Onyemaechi Okpara, Edwin Olali, Brian Orr, Omodolapo Oshode, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Tomica Paisley, Eric Parrish, Mic-Arlem Patrice, Joel Pena, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Denise Peoples, Antoinette Phillips, Bikens Pierre, Maria Polanco, Wanda Pollydore, Dean Powell, Jeanette Profit, Thomas Putko, William Quinonez, Maritza Quito, Ayazul Qurashi, Jose Ramos, Helen Randolph, Denise Reed, Johnny Reed, Javier Reyes, Luis Rivera, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Cashion Roberts, Lucette Robinson, Sefton Rodney, Andres Rodriguez, Doris Rodriguez, Julio Rodriguez, Olga Rodriguez, Michelle Rollins, Tedra Rosa, Antonina Rubanova, Paulina Rueda, Anthony Ruggiero, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Cathy Rush, Alix Saintil, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Khalid Salmon, Jervine Samuel, Edwin Sanabria, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Jose Santos, Dmitriy Savenok, Derek Scott, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Judy Sharpe, Joseph Shiva, Nancy Sibily, Ann Maria Singh, Simone Smikie, Celeste Smith, Cynthia Smith, Reginald Souffrant, Roberta Sowell, Mikhail Spektor, Michelle Stephenson, Michael Stettin, Mitchell Stroud, Reginald Studwood, Evelyn Suarez, Yakubu Sulaiman, Lamine Sylla, Nicole Symon, Juan Taronji, Shontoinette Teague, Comfort Thomas, Gregg Thompson, Richard Valentine, Rafaela Vargas, Fernandez Vaz, Xavier Vega, James Venezia, Lorraine Vesa, Joseph Villamar, Adriana Vivieca, Larry Walker, Wendy Wallace, Stephanie Walthour, Natasha Ward, Wayne Warren, Cassandra Washington, Shonedhua Westry, Christina Wigfall, Delores Williams, Lola Williams, Richard Williams, Deshann Willis, Edward Wilson, Monica Wilson, Janice Winns, Ken Wisdom, Yung Wong, Robert Wu, Jay Yee, Mohammad Zaman, Sharon Segbefia-Adika, Alexandra Echeverri, Stefani German, Loriene Harris, Suzette Holder, Kouacou Kouassi, Kimberly McKie, Miguel Qadira, Shannon Reed, Livius Vesa, Vanessa Wooten, Rafat Baruwa, Indira Prashad, Janet Stovall, Cristina Alvericci, Windy Brothers-Green, Ventura Cambrelen Sr, Merlene Campbell, Ernestine Christian, Vivian Cleckley, Lori Cruz, Cheryl Eddie, Siide Gil-Frederick, Khadija Goddard, Lavonia Googe, Isaac Harry, Rose Joseph, Nina Louissant, Hilda Panting, Rashid Rashid, Sonia Santiago, Keith Smith, Michael Tartaglia, Odessa Taylor, Theresa Wescott, Margaret Adeleke-Bomide, Ademola Adesanya, Adewale Adeso, Pamela Agorriuo, Mikhail Agron, Syeda Ahmed, Salan Ajiboye, Celeste Akulin, Rebecca Alfaro, Maria Allwood, Keshun Anderson, Althea Appleton, Alicia Banister, Chadwick Beauford, Alesha Bovell-John, Lillie Bradford, Victor Bruno, Joseph Caesar, Marjorie Campbell, Maria Canty-Jackson, Sharon Clark, Linda Clipper, Carolyn Crawford, Joseph Dare, Yanet Diaz-Fiores, Tonya Dickens, Mattie Drayton-Dixon, Sulann Elkhouly, Venessa Faison, Sydney Frantz, Adwina Gil, Kenneth Goldson, Rita Green, Romania Griffin, Patricia Hamilton, Audrey Hasell, Sandra Hill, Deirdre Holland, Philomene Hood, Miranda Hyde, Yira Izquierdo, Gustavo Jaramillo, Charlotte Kendrink, Igor Kolesnik, Jessica Lans, Sharon Lewis, Jose Loveras, Felix Mady, Kelly Manns, Mercado Marquima, Allan Martinez, Dorina Martinez, Elizabeth Medina, Allan Medinsky, Joan Michael, Shante Monroe, Cesar Mosquete, Niesha Morris, Catiana Munoz, Jose Negron, Chulsy Nelson, Anthony Noel, Edward Orji, Olufumke Osineye, Kemi Oyebisi, Cherylann Parris, Rodney Pena, Elton Petzold, Allen Plit, Aleksanar Poplavsriy, Chandrowtie Ram, Ilene Reff, Rosa Roman, Ilam Rubin, Nirmala Sahsarran-Moti, Obafemi Salau, Joseph Santovasco, Lerna Smith, Maria Smith, Kim Spann-Sykes, Rachel Thompson, Michael Trano, Joy Wiggan, Zina Williams, Celeste Willis, Candia Wolf, Ida Albergottie, Ruth Alexandre, Dona Alleyne, Maria Apisa, Michelle Artis, Lawrence Askew, Tawana Bethune, Jacquelin Cohen, Sharon Davis, Lavern Favorite, Sheldon Garrick, Olga Glushdrenko, Orlando Gomez, Karen Green, Yvette Harris, Sharnet Hilton, LaVerne Jones, Maya Jones, Tamara Kelch, Iftekhar Khan, Cathy Larsen, Shernette Lyons, Gisella Oliver, Dennis Piedra, Mary Potts, Tonya Quinnonez, Marilyn Santana, James Sessoms, James Sumo, Katty Vargas, Ava Wheeler, Pacheatte White, Marguerite Williams, Myrtle Wilson, Stephen Abreu, Helen Adeleye, Ebenezer Agoha, Daniel Alexander, Anita Beekram, Lisa Bobb, Norma Bonet, Annetta Cameron, Virginie C-Jacinthe, Dara Clement, Sandra Dickson, Fernando Donalds, Joy Frederick, Christiana George, Donald Graff, Lynnette Hyde, Lavenia Jamison, Eleanor Jones Fortune, Jack Kaminsky, KellyMarie Melendez, Priscilla Paxton, Pamela Paxy, Angel Ramirez, Tanisha Roach, Valerie Rock, Charlotte Rodgers, Felix Sacasa, Sharene Savoy, Tatyana Shagas, Latesha Slater, Judy Thomas-Ofori, Sonia Villegas, Rahel Yigzaw, Olatumbosun Adeagbo, Tanya Allsopp-Andrew, Velma Callender, Damien Clarke, Francisca Cuello, Loise Duncan, Scarvia Gray, Marilyn Jewels, Jacqueline Kratz, Michael Orekunrin, Andres Severino, Stephanie Vargas, Shante Chamblee, Daouda Drame, Romeo Martello, Nircida Martinez, Sushil Saha, Yolene Ulysse, Welmillage Wijesiri, Maria Alberi-Otah, Elliott Clemente, Darlene Gibson, Marisol Leon and Hayden O'Brien
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Case Number: 1:2016cv03445
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Sara L. Faulman dated September 17, 2021 re: Settlement Approval. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Sara L. Faulman, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Hope Pordy).(Faulman, Sara)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF FORTY INELIGIBLE PLAINTIFFS: Pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Parties hereby stipulate to the voluntary dismissal of the below-listed forty Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case. The dismissals are without prejudice and with no fees or costs. This notice of dismissal pertains only to the claims of the above-listed individuals; all other claims by all other 456 plaintiffs remain pending. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Althea Appleton, Lawrence Askew, Donjya Bardliving, Chadwick Beauford, Anita Beekram, Tawana Bethune, Velma Callender, Annetta Cameron, Dara Clement, Denese Clue, Armando Diaz, Venessa Faison, Joseph Garrett, Stefani German, Darlene Gibson, Karen Green, Constance Habersham, Suzette Holder, Wesley Hope, Lynnette Hyde, Marilyn Jewels, Jack Kaminsky, Kouacou Kouassi, Cathy Larsen, Pierre Louisere, Nina Louissant, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Catiana Munoz, Helen Mwaluko, Cherylann Parris, Tonya Quinnonez, Obafemi Salau, Jose Santos, Jose Santos, Michael Stettin, Natasha Ward, Vanessa Wooten, Rahel Yigzaw, Ida Albergottie and Maria Allwood terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/15/2021) (jca)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Donjya Bardliving, Denese Clue, Tonya Quinnonez, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Jose Santos, Tawana Bethune, Cherylann Parris, Suzette Holder, Chadwick Beauford, Joseph Garrett, Nina Louissant, Obafemi Salau, Dara Clement, Jack Kaminsky, Anita Beekram, Cathy Larsen, Darlene Gibson, Pierre Louisere, Vanessa Wooten, Karen Green, Stefani German, Althea Appleton, Kouacou Kouassi, Venessa Faison, Constance Habersham, Maria Allwood, Catiana Munoz, Natasha Ward, Lynnette Hyde, Rahel Yigzaw, Wesley Hope, Armando Diaz, Ida Albergottie, Lawrence Askew, Velma Callender, Marilyn Jewels, Annetta Cameron, Michael Stettin, Helen Mwaluko. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Faulman, Sara)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #186 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Ronnie Abrams for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #184 Letter filed by Jerome Adams. ENDORSEMENT: The trial scheduled for November 29, 2021, and all associated pretrial deadlines, are hereby adjourned sine die. By September 17, 2021, the parties shall submit the proposed settlement agreement, along with a joint letter explaining why the agreement is fair and reasonable and any necessary supporting materials (including contemporaneous billing records for the attorneys fees and costs provided for in the agreement). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/19/2021) (tg)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David Ricksecker dated August 18, 2021 re: Settlement in Principle. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(Ricksecker, David)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #182 Letter filed by The City Of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for the update and directs them to provide an additional update on or before August 15, 2021. The parties should also inform the Court if it can be of any assistance in helping them reach a settlement, whether by way of a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Aaron or a referral to the District's mediation program. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/16/2021) (cf)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated July 15, 2021 re: Settlement Negotiations. Document filed by The City Of New York,..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #180 Letter filed by Jerome Adams. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The parties are directed to file a status update on or before July 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/9/2021) (rro)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David Ricksecker dated June 8, 2021 re: Status Update on Settlement Discussions. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(Ricksecker, David)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 OPINION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, both motions for summary judgment (Dkts. 153, 157) are denied, and Plaintiff's letter motion to seal (Dkt. 163) is denied. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/5/2021) (nb)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #177 Letter filed by Jerome Adams. ENDORSEMENT: Trial is hereby scheduled for the week of November 29, 2021. The Court adopts the dates proposed by the parties for pretrial submissions. The parties are further directed to submit a status update on settlement discussions on or before June 15, 2021. SO ORDERED., (Motions due by 9/10/2021., Responses due by 9/17/2021) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/5/2021) (nb)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David Ricksecker dated April 30, 2021 re: Proposed Trial Dates and Pretrial Deadlines. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(Ricksecker, David)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying #153 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #157 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #163 Motion to Seal. The Court having considered the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment, see Dkts. 153, 157, both motions are denied. Plaintiffs' letter motion to seal, see Dkt. 163, is also denied. A written opinion will follow shortly. No later than May 3, 2021, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file a status update on the next steps in this litigation, including (a) a statement of whether a referral to Magistrate Judge Aaron for a settlement conference would be productive; and (b) proposed trial dates beginning in September 2021. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkts. 153, 157, and 163. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/31/2021) (rj)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., #163 LETTER MOTION to Seal Confidential Information in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 153) at the Request of Defendant addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gregory K. McGillivary dated July 13, 2 . Document filed by Jerome Adams, The City Of New York,. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #163 .(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment . REDACTED PURSUANT TO DKT. 163. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #166 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by The City Of New York,..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 DECLARATION of Dominique F. Saint-Fort in Support re: #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit VV).(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by The City Of New York,..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Gregory K. McGillivary in Opposition re: #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., #163 LETTER MOTION to Seal Confidential Information in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 153) at the Request of Defendant addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gregory K. McGillivary dated July 13, 2. Document filed by Jerome Adams, The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - CityTime 856-57, #2 Exhibit 6 - CityTime 820-21, #3 Exhibit 7 - CityTime 837-38, #4 Pestana FRCP 30(b)(6) Tr. 155)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #163 .(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ***SELECTED PARTIES***COUNTER STATEMENT TO #154 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Jerome Adams, The City Of New York,. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #163 .(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., #163 LETTER MOTION to Seal Confidential Information in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 153) at the Request of Defendant addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gregory K. McGillivary dated July 13, 2 . Document filed by Jerome Adams, The City Of New York,. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #163 .(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 DECLARATION of Gregory K. McGillivary in Opposition re: #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I - Plaintiff Transcript Cites, #2 Appendix II - FRCP 30(b)(6) Transcript Cites (Pestana FRCP 30(b)(6) Tr. 155 REDACTED Pursuant to Dkt. 163), #3 Appendix III - Expert Witness Transcript Cites, #4 Appendix IV - Plaintiff Interrogatory Responses, #5 Exhibit 1 - Second Declaration of Dr. Louis R. Lanier, #6 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Dr. Christopher Erath, #7 Exhibit 3 - Interpretive Memo, #8 Exhibit 4 - CityTime Web Training, #9 Exhibit 5 - CityTime 856-57 (REDACTED Pursuant to Dkt. 163), #10 Exhibit 6 - CityTime 820-21 (REDACTED Pursuant to Dkt. 163), #11 Exhibit 7 - CityTime 837-38 (REDACTED Pursuant to Dkt. 163)).(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #154 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment . REDACTED Pursuant to Dkt. 163. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 LETTER MOTION to Seal Confidential Information in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 153) at the Request of Defendant addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gregory K. McGillivary dated July 13, 2020. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #159 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by The City Of New York,..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by The City Of New York,..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 DECLARATION of Gregory K. McGillivary in Support re: #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I - Plaintiff Deposition Transcripts, #2 Appendix II - FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcripts, #3 Appendix III - Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 1 - Citys Notices of Examination for the position of Fraud Investigator,, #5 Exhibit 2 - Citys Job Posting Notices for the position of Fraud Investigator,, #6 Exhibit 3 - Citys Notices of Examination for the position of AFI, #7 Exhibit 4 - Citys job description for the position of AFI, #8 Exhibit 5 - HRA Employee Code of Conduct, #9 Exhibit 6 - HRA Employee Time and Leave Policy, #10 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Louis R. Lanier, Ph.D., #11 Exhibit 8 - FAQs for HRA Staff, #12 Exhibit 9 - HRA Procedure No. P-13-01, Overtime Authorization).(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Jerome Adams..(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Jerome Adams. Responses due by 7/13/2020.(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 DECLARATION of Dominique F. Saint-Fort in Support re: #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit SS, #46 Exhibit TT, #47 Exhibit UU).(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by The City Of New York,..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The City Of New York,..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by The City Of New York,..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #151 Letter re: Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by Jerome Adams. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., Motions due by 6/15/2020., Responses due by 7/13/2020, Replies due by 7/27/2020. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/16/2020) (rj)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 4/15/2020 re: Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Jerome Adams..(McGillivary, Gregory)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER: On March 3, 2020, the Court adopted Magistrate Judge Aaron's Report and Recommendation, and denied the City's motion for decertification. See Dkt. 149. In light of the parties' prior indication that they would move for summary judgment following the resolution of the City's motion for decertification, no later than April 17, 2020, the parties shall jointly file a letter indicating whether any party intends to move for summary judgment and if so, a proposed briefing schedule for the motion(s). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/13/2020) (mml)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: for #141 Report and Recommendation. For the foregoing reasons, the Court adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Accordingly, the City's motion for decertification is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. 127. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/03/2020) (ama)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gregory McGillivary dated 2/28/2020 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Worley Opinion and Order).(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 RESPONSE re: #146 Objection to Report and Recommendations dated August 29, 2019. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (McGillivary, Gregory)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 OBJECTION to #141 Report and Recommendations dated August 29, 2019 Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #142 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #143 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/6/2019) (cf)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Objections to R&R due by 9/26/2019 (cf)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David Ricksecker dated 9/5/19 re: Opposition to Defendant's Request for Extension of Time to File Obections to Magistrate Judge Aaron's August 29, 2019 Report and Recommendation. Document filed by Jerome Adams.(Ricksecker, David)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to August 29, 2019 Report and Recommendation addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated September 4, 2019. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to August 29, 2019 Report and Recommendation addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated September 4, 2019. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. For the foregoing reasons, I respectfully recommend that Defendant's motion for decertification be DENIED. SO ORDERED. re: #127 MOTION Decertification filed by The City Of New York. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/29/2019). (rjm)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #138 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the undersigned counsel for Plaintiffs will move this Court, at the United States Courthouse located at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, for an Order permitting the withdrawal of the appearance of Afroz Baig, Esq. on behalf of Plaintiffs effective immediately. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Attorney Afroz Baig terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/5/2019) (mro)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 DECLARATION of Afroz Baig in Support re: #138 MOTION for Afroz Baig to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Ricksecker, David)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION for Afroz Baig to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jerome Adams.(Ricksecker, David)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Afroz Baig to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ricksecker, David) Modified on 8/5/2019 (db).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney David William Ricksecker to RE-FILE Document #137 MOTION for Afroz Baig to Withdraw as Attorney . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents (Declaration in Support) are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. (db)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #127 MOTION Decertification .. Motions referred to Stewart D. Aaron. (lb)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) Particular Motion: Motion for Decertification. Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron and Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. Motions referred to Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/19/2019) (rj)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 DECLARATION of Dominique F. Saint-Fort in Support re: #127 MOTION Decertification .. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit M-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit P-1)(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #127 MOTION Decertification . . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 DECLARATION of Gregory K. McGillivary in Opposition re: #127 MOTION Decertification .. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I, #2 Appendix II, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #127 MOTION Decertification . . Document filed by Jerome Adams. (McGillivary, Gregory)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #130 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney William Li terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/16/2019) (kv)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for William Li to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ricksecker, David)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECLARATION of Dominique F. Saint-Fort in Support re: #127 MOTION Decertification .. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF)(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #127 MOTION Decertification . . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION Decertification . Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William Li on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Li, William)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Welling Stewart on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Stewart, John)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Hillary Lebeau on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Lebeau, Hillary)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Afroz Baig on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Baig, Afroz)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Diana J. Nobile on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Nobile, Diana)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sara Lyn Faulman on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Faulman, Sara)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David William Ricksecker on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Ricksecker, David)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (Block, Sarah)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory Keith McGillivary on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP, 1101 Vermont Ave NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, 20005,. (McGillivary, Gregory)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: As discussed at conference on March 7, 2019, Defendant's motion for decertification ofthe class action is due by May 10, 2019. Plaintiffs' opposition shall be due by June 7, 2019, and Defendant's reply by June 28, 2019. The Court will set a schedule for summary judgment following its resolution of Defendant's decertification motion. Defendant's motion to dismiss certain plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l) will be decided at the summary judgment stage. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 5/10/2019, Responses due by 6/7/2019, Replies due by 6/28/2019.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/8/2019) (jca)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Status Conference held on 3/7/2019. (arc)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David Ricksecker dated 2/28/19 re: Status of the Case. Document filed by Jerome Adams.(Ricksecker, David)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #114 Letter re:Post-Discovery Conference Request filed by The City Of New York, ENDORSEMENT: The post-discovery conference in this case shall take place on Thursday, March 7, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/15/2019) (rj) Modified on 2/19/2019 (rj).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated February 14, 2019 re: Post-Discovery Conference Request. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #112 Letter filed by Jerome Adams. ENDORSEMENT: Contrary to the statement contained in the first paragraph of this letter, this is not the "parties' first request for an extension of the expert discovery deadline." See ECF Nos. 78, 79, 91 & 92. Discovery in this case simply must end. Thus, it is not sufficient for the parties to "anticipate completing both expert depositions on February 15, 2019." The expert depositions must be completed on or before February 15, 2019. The request for an extension of the expert discovery deadline to February 15, 2019 is granted; on the condition that any expert deposition not taken by February 15 shall be deemed waived. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 2/15/2019, Expert Discovery due by 2/15/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 1/17/2019) (jca)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from David Ricksecker dated 1/17/19 re: Request for Extension of Expert Discovery. Document filed by Jerome Adams.(Ricksecker, David)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from David Ricksecker dated 12/7/18 re: Discovery Update. Document filed by Jerome Adams.(Ricksecker, David)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 11/2/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 11/2/2018 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Request GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/30/2018) (kl)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Renewal of ECF Dkt. No. 99 addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated November 30, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Status Conference proceeding held on 10/11/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.(aea)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Status Conference held on 10/11/2018 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2019.(aea)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer on behalf of Jerome Adams. New Address: Spivak Lipton LLP, 1700 Broadway, 21st Fl., New York, New York, 10019, (212) 765-2100. (Sprotzer, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying without prejudice #99 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The City's Letter-Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The depositions scheduled for November 27, 28 and 30 shall proceed as planned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/26/2018) (kl)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated November 26, 2018 re: #99 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated November 16, 2018. . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from David Ricksecker dated November 21, 2018 re: #99 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated November 16, 2018. . Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Ricksecker, David)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #99 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated November 16, 2018, filed by The City Of New York. ENDORSEMENT: No later than Wednesday, November 21, 2018, Plaintiffs' shall respond to this Letter-Motion. Defendant shall submit any reply no later than Tuesday, November 27, 2018. Prior to making their submissions, the parties shall meet and confer regarding the use and contents of a sworn questionnaire to be completed by the prospective deponents in lieu of deposition. In their submissions, the parties shall address the outcome of the meet and confer process and their respective positions with respect thereto. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 11/21/2018, Replies due by 11/27/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/19/2018) (kl)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated November 16, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CAROLINE CRAWFORD, LORI CRUZ, AND MICHAEL TRANO ONLY: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties hereby stipulate to the voluntary dismissal of Plaintiffs Caroline Crawford, Lori Cruz, and Michael Trano as plaintiffs in the above-captioned case. The dismissals are with prejudice, This notice of dismissal pertains to the claims of Caroline Crawford, Lori Cruz, and Michael Trano only; all other claims by all other plaintiffs remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/2/2018) (jca)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Telephone Conference held on 11/2/2018. (Court Reporter Martha Martin) (arc)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference to discuss certain Plaintiffs' requests to voluntarily dismiss their FLSA claims with prejudice. See Dkt. 95, 96. The parties shall jointly call the Court at 212-805-0162 on November 2, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 11/2/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/26/2018) (rj)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from David Ricksecker dated 10/25/2018 re: the Court's October 19th, 2018 Order. Document filed by Jerome Adams.(Ricksecker, David)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: On October 19, 2018, the parties filed a stipulation of voluntary dismissal with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), as to Plaintiffs Caroline Crawford, Lori Cruz, and Michael Trano. (ECF No. 94.) However, as Plaintiffs claims arise under the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA"), the parties may not stipulate to dismissal with prejudice without approval of the Court or the Department of Labor. See Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199, 206 (2d Cir. 2015).Thus, no later than Friday, October 26, 2018, the parties shall either: (1) submit a joint letter explaining the basis for the dismissal with prejudice and why it should be approved by the Court; or (2) submit a stipulation or notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice. See Yunjian Lin v. Grand Sichuan 74 St Inc., No. 15-CV-02950 (RA), 2018 WL 3222519, at *4 (S.D.N.Y. July 2, 2018) (stipulations of dismissal without prejudice need not be approved by the Court under the FLSA). So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/19/2018) (js)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Lori Cruz, Michael Trano, Carolyn Crawford. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff..(Ricksecker, David)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #94 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Ronnie Abrams for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: Following a conference with the parties on October 11, 2018, it is hereby Ordered as follows: 1.No later than Thursday, October 18, 2018, the City shall produce all documents regarding the identified discovery Plaintiffs. 2.The deadline for fact discovery is extended until November 30, 2018. 3.The deadline for expert discovery is extended until January 31, 2019. No further extensions shall be granted except in exigent circumstances, and then only for a limited purpose. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 1/31/2019., Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/11/2018) (kl)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Status Conference held on 10/11/2018. (kl)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #91 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ENDORSEMENT: The Letter-Motion (ECF No. 91) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court hereby grants an interim extension of fact discovery until October 31, 2018. The Court will not grant a blanket extension of fact discovery past October 31, 2018. At the status conference to be held on October 11, 2018, the parties shall identify for the Court the specific items of fact discovery that they seek to complete, and the Court will consider extending fact discovery for these limited items by a November 30, 2018 deadline. At the October 11 conference, the Court also will address extending the expert discovery deadline, but the Court sees no reason for an extension until February 2019, especially given the fact that this case was filed in 2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/25/2018) (kl)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated September 24, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated September 11, 2018 re: Discovery Plaintiffs' Depositions. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #88 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated August 31, 2018 re: Joint Discovery Status Letter. Document filed by The City Of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The conference currently scheduled for September 12, 2018 is adjourned to October 11, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/31/2018) (rjm)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Dominique F. Saint-Fort dated August 31, 2018 re: Joint Discovery Status Letter. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer on behalf of Jerome Adams. (Sprotzer, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 Motion for William Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for William Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15424676. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Li, William)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #85 MOTION for William Li to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15424676. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15412236. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nobile, Diana)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #83 MOTION for Diana J. Nobile to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15412236. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #81 Letter filed by The City Of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Court declines to "so order" a schedule for specific dates of depositions. The Court expects the parties to cooperate with one another to complete discovery. Should any concrete discovery disputes arise, the parties shall comply with the Court's Individual Practices. The parties shall file a joint letter regarding the status of discovery on August 31, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/31/2018) (kl)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from City of New York dated July 30, 2018 re: Status of Discovery. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Perelman, Liliya)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas James Johnson on behalf of Jerome Adams. (Johnson, Nicholas)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Request GRANTED. Fact discovery to conclude by September 28, 2018. Expert discovery to conclude by November 30, 2018. No further extensions shall be granted except for good cause shown and then only for limited purpose. Parties shall file a joint report as to the status of discovery on July 30, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/1/2018) (kl)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 11/30/2018. Fact Discovery due by 9/28/2018. (kl)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and re: Status Update of Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Liliya Perelman dated 5/31/2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Perelman, Liliya)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT'S ASSERTION OF THE GOOD FAITH DEFENSE: IT IS THEREFORE AGREED BY AND BETWEEN THE PARTIES AND ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendant agrees to produce: a. Documents and communications between (1) the New York City Law Department ("Law Department"), attorneys within the Human Resources Administration ("HRA"), and/or outside counsel and (2) non-lawyer employees, or lawyers acting in a non-legal capacity, of the City and/or HRA pertaining to the legal requirements of the FLSA as applied to HRA pay policies, practices, and procedures. b. Documents and communications between (1) the Law Department, attorneys within HRA, and/or outside counsel and (2) employees of the City Office of Payroll Administration and/or Office of Labor Relations concerning the formulation and drafting of the CityTime certification and/or timekeeping system as it relates to any claims or defenses asserted in this lawsuit as set forth in this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/30/2018) (rj)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...For all motions and papers to be addressed by this Court and/or the rules of Magistrate Judge Aaron, to whom this case is assigned for general pretrial, for any motions or papers that he will address. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/31/2018) (rj)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Lyn Faulman on behalf of Jerome Adams. (Faulman, Sara)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominique F. Saint-Fort on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Liliya Perelman on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Perelman, Liliya)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #71 MOTION for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, John)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14899146. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, John) Modified on 4/4/2018 (jc).
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #70 MOTION for John Welling Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14899146. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia (our court does not accept certificates from the Virginia State Bar). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #68 Letter filed by Jerome Adams. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall submit a joint letter regarding the status of discovery on May 31, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 3/16/2018) (ama) Modified on 3/16/2018 (ama).
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from David Ricksecker dated 03/16/18 re: Status Update. Document filed by Jerome Adams.(Ricksecker, David)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Afroz Baig to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Afroz Baig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14776440. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baig, Afroz)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #66 MOTION for Afroz Baig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14776440. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hillary Lebeau on behalf of Jerome Adams. (Lebeau, Hillary)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Maria Alberi-Otah, Elliott Clemente, Darlene Gibson, Marisol Leon, Hayden O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 8/30/2018. Fact Discovery due by 6/29/2018. Expert Discovery due by 8/30/2018. Discovery due by 8/30/2018. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. Post-discovery Conference set for 9/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/8/2017) (mml)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (jc)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis no longer referred to the case. (jc)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from David Ricksecker dated November 17, 2017 re: Finalizing discovery plaintiffs. Document filed by Jerome Adams.(Ricksecker, David)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Welmillage Wijesiri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from David Ricksecker dated 10/23/2017 re: parties anticipated finalizing the "discovery plaintiffs". ENDORSEMENT: Confirm with Court finalizing of "discovery plaintiffs". (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 10/25/2017) (Ellis, Ronald)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from David Ricksecker dated October 23, 2017 re: Status of Discovery Plaintiffs. Document filed by Jerome Adams.(Ricksecker, David)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Shante Chamblee, Daouda Drame, Romeo Martello, Nircida Martinez, Sushil Saha, Yolene Ulysse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Olatumbosun Adeagbo, Tanya Allsopp-Andrew, Velma Callender, Damien Clarke, Francisca Cuello, Loise Duncan, Scarvia Gray, Marilyn Jewels, Jacqueline Kratz, Michael Orekunrin, Andres Severino, Stephanie Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Stephen Abreu, Helen Adeleye, Ebenezer Agoha, Daniel Alexander, Anita Beekram, Lisa Bobb, Norma Bonet, Annetta Cameron, Virginie C-Jacinthe, Dara Clement, Sandra Dickson, Fernando Donalds, Joy Frederick, Christiana George, Donald Graff, Lynnette Hyde, Lavenia Jamison, Eleanor Jones Fortune, Jack Kaminsky, KellyMarie Melendez, Priscilla Paxton, Pamela Paxy, Angel Ramirez, Tanisha Roach, Valerie Rock, Charlotte Rodgers, Felix Sacasa, Sharene Savoy, Tatyana Shagas, Latesha Slater, Judy Thomas-Ofori, Sonia Villegas, Rahel Yigzaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Ida Albergottie, Ruth Alexandre, Dona Alleyne, Maria Apisa, Michelle Artis, Lawrence Askew, Tawana Bethune, Jacquelin Cohen, Sharon Davis, Lavern Favorite, Sheldon Garrick, Olga Glushdrenko, Orlando Gomez, Karen Green, Yvette Harris, Sharnet Hilton, LaVerne Jones, Maya Jones, Tamara Kelch, Iftekhar Khan, Cathy Larsen, Shernette Lyons, Gisella Oliver, Dennis Piedra, Mary Potts, Tonya Quinnonez, Marilyn Santana, James Sessoms, James Sumo, Katty Vargas, Ava Wheeler, Pacheatte White, Marguerite Williams, Myrtle Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Margaret Adeleke-Bomide, Ademola Adesanya, Adewale Adeso, Pamela Agorriuo, Mikhail Agron, Syeda Ahmed, Salan Ajiboye, Celeste Akulin, Rebecca Alfaro, Maria Allwood, Keshun Anderson, Althea Appleton, Alicia Banister, Chadwick Beauford, Alesha Bovell-John, Lillie Bradford, Victor Bruno, Joseph Caesar, Marjorie Campbell, Maria Canty-Jackson, Sharon Clark, Linda Clipper, Carolyn Crawford, Joseph Dare, Yanet Diaz-Fiores, Tonya Dickens, Mattie Drayton-Dixon, Sulann Elkhouly, Venessa Faison, Sydney Frantz, Adwina Gil, Kenneth Goldson, Rita Green, Romania Griffin, Patricia Hamilton, Audrey Hasell, Sandra Hill, Deirdre Holland, Philomene Hood, Miranda Hyde, Yira Izquierdo, Gustavo Jaramillo, Charlotte Kendrink, Igor Kolesnik, Jessica Lans, Sharon Lewis, Jose Loveras, Felix Mady, Kelly Manns, Mercado Marquima, Allan Martinez, Dorina Martinez, Elizabeth Medina, Allan Medinsky, Joan Michael, Shante Monroe, Cesar Mosquete, Niesha Morris, Catiana Munoz, Jose Negron, Chulsy Nelson, Anthony Noel, Edward Orji, Olufumke Osineye, Kemi Oyebisi, Cherylann Parris, Rodney Pena, Elton Petzold, Allen Plit, Aleksanar Poplavsriy, Chandrowtie Ram, Ilene Reff, Rosa Roman, Ilam Rubin, Nirmala Sahsarran-Moti, Obafemi Salau, Joseph Santovasco, Lerna Smith, Maria Smith, Kim Spann-Sykes, Rachel Thompson, Michael Trano, Joy Wiggan, Zina Williams, Celeste Willis, Candia Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Status Conference held on 8/21/2017 at 10:50 a.m. (rsh)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DISCOVERY STIPULATION: The Parties have agreed to the following: Plaintiffs commenced this action seeking to represent a class of employees who worked at the New York City Department of Human Resources Administration in the following civil service titles: (1) Fraud Investigator 1; (2) Fraud Investigator 2; and (3) Associate Fraud Investigator 1, as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 8/17/2017) (mml)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Cristina Alvericci, Windy Brothers-Green, Ventura Cambrelen Sr, Merlene Campbell, Ernestine Christian, Vivian Cleckley, Lori Cruz, Cheryl Eddie, Siide Gil-Frederick, Khadija Goddard, Lavonia Googe, Isaac Harry, Rose Joseph, Nina Louissant, Hilda Panting, Rashid Rashid, Sonia Santiago, Keith Smith, Michael Tartaglia, Odessa Taylor, Theresa Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #51 Notice (Other) filed by Jerome Adams. ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated June 29, 2017, see Dkt. 50, the proposed Notice is approved. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/6/2017) (cf)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Revised Notice of Lawsuit re: #50 Memorandum & Opinion, Add and Terminate Parties,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jerome Adams. (McGillivary, Gregory)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION AND ORDER re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). filed by Violeta Hernandez. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification of a collective action consisting of all individuals who work or have worked in the positions of Associate Fraud Investigator 1, Fraud Investigator 1, or Fraud Investigator 2 for the City of New York at any of its Human Resources Administration facilities since May 9, 2013. The City is directed to provide to Plaintiffs' counsel the names, mailing addresses, and email addresses of all putative collective action members within twenty days of this Opinion and Order. Plaintiffs are directed to provide the City a revised Notice, consistent with this Opinion and Order, within seven days of this Opinion and Order. Finally, Plaintiffs' counsel shall distribute the Notice to putative collective action members within five days of the Court's approval of the revised Notice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remove Violeta Hernandez's name from the caption and to terminate the motion pending at Docket No. 33. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/29/2017) (cf)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/21/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah, 212-805-0242.(rsh)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Gregory McGillivary dated 6/8/17 re: discovery schedule. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 6/12/17) (Ellis, Ronald)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 6/8/2017 re: Discovery Schedule. Document filed by Jerome Adams.(McGillivary, Gregory)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Status Conference held on 6/6/2017 at 11:00 a.m. (rsh)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/6/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah, 212-805-0242. (rsh)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Rafat Baruwa, Indira Prashad, Janet Stovall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGillivary, Gregory)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). . Document filed by Jerome Adams. (McGillivary, Gregory)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION of Tanu Rupani in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b).. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Marcus, Natalie)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECLARATION of Natalie S. Marcus in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b).. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Marcus, Natalie)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Marcus, Natalie)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Marcus, Natalie)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, against The City Of New York, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Thomas Ilori, Maxine Brereton, Larry Walker, Stephen Francis, Maria Polanco, Michelle Hernandez, Lisa Dicks, Lisa Gomez, Donjya Bardliving, Denese Clue, Estrella Figueredo, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Reginald Studwood, Edwin Olali, Tashon Cooley, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Cynthia Manuel, Michelle Ford, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Alexander Brent, Bridgett Brown, Tabitha Baez, Dean Powell, John Gaddam, Yung Wong, Quentin Brathwaite, Ken Wisdom, Eric Parrish, Susan Harper, Julio Rodriguez, Joan Collins, William Quinonez, Paul Lee, Modesta Baltazar, Yvette Gomes, Adrian Duncan, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Jeannie Cyril, Iris De Jesus, Jose Santos, Tomica Paisley, Charles Jones, Jarmaine Jackson, Wayne Warren, Lorraine Vesa, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Ann Maria Singh, Javier Reyes, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Ana McFarline, Tunishia Murray, Sergo Jeune, Olayinka Balogun, Adunni Kayode, Sang Chae, Irving Moulon, Nadean Blackwood, Lola Williams, Karess Jones, Elizabeth Hunte, Cydia Graham, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Aqilah Mu'Min, Cathy Rush, Carol Lenard, Leonard Bishop, Eduardo Garcia, Evelyn Lucas, Christine Magestic, Joan Butcher, Olaitan Aribidesi, Joseph Garrett, Katherine Brown, Tracey Bruno, Fernandez Vaz, Brian Orr, Guy Alcindor, Rafael Beato, Edward Wilson, Onyemaechi Okpara, Neyda Herrera, Rachel Mulligan, Derek Scott, Deidre Manns, Judy Sharpe, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Emmanuel Duperval, Rachel Curney, Antonina Rubanova, Felicia Harris, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Joel Pena, Renee Harper, Lan Lee, Boniface Nwosu, Mohammad Zaman, Comfort Thomas, Susan Fuller, Sadie Guerra, Sheriann Flot, Lennox Mitchell, Jonathan Emenike, Jose Ramos, Cashion Roberts, Regina Brown, Annie Davie, John Garcia, Tina Baez, Danette Brown-Allen, Margaret Cherry, Tedra Rosa, Rihanah Burnette, Evelyn Suarez, Khalid Salmon, Nonie Noel, Stevenson Delerme, Violeta Hernandez, Ladinia Johnson, Auddretta Harrison, Christopher Kapetanos, Lillian Glawson, Lucette Robinson, Bobby Blue, Richard Williams, Angela Heywood, Vincent Feyi, Roberta Sowell, Elton Morris, Johnny Reed, Edwin Sanabria, Natasha Hooper, Tiffany Kan, Cassandra Washington, Rafaela Vargas, Bikens Pierre, Pierre Louisere, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Regine Beauzile, Himama Bushra, Alix Saintil, Andy Almonte, Felicia Brown, Ayazul Qurashi, Hindu Murray, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Rodney Charles, Shontoinette Teague, Jasmine Menardy, Shahora Jeffery, Selvin Mighty, Mic-Arlem Patrice, Andrea Baskett, Rasheed Ibrahim, Raymond Burgess, Iris Bonet, James Venezia, Simone Manning, Damon O'Donnell, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Robyn Battle, Maricelis Guzman, Paulina Rueda, Dmitriy Savenok, Marie Lazarre, Akinwole Killanin, Deshann Willis, Chantal Emile, Jay Yee, Edward Grice, Adriana Vivieca, Efrain Lopez, Chuck Davis, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Denise Peoples, Yakubu Sulaiman, Tracy Johnson, Maria Feliu, Tara Johnson, Vicki Crosson, Delores Williams, Dolores Fleming, Joseph Shiva, Antoinette Phillips, Monica Wilson, Merlyn Martinez, Babatunde Baruwa, Jerome Adams, Joseph Myer, Sr., Jose Fernandez, Constance Habersham, Shazad Khan, Michelle Rollins, Richard Valentine, Nderim Demirovic, Wellington Hansberry, Regina Miguel, Harrison Ogbolu, Andres Rodriguez, Fitzroy Nelson, Sefton Rodney, Shonedhua Westry, Lamine Sylla, Yojaida Estrella, Robert Hickson, Maritza Quito, Lawrence Ifidon, Jervine Samuel, Celeste Smith, Reginald Souffrant, Natasha Ward, Donnettee Moret, Jeanette Profit, Denise Reed, Michelle Stephenson, Anthony Hernandez, Salvatore Messina, Elvis Breton, Fay Dacre, Ekei Ani, Tyler Felder, Shawna Blyther, Olga Rodriguez, Alina Gawronski, Deborah Dugger, Robert Muldrow, Juan Taronji, Mikhail Spektor, Milagros Muniz, Danary Guzman, Wendy Wallace, Joseph Furlong, Anthony Ruggiero, Hector Austin, Doris Rodriguez, Juliana Joseph, Wanda Pollydore, Nicole Symon, Patricia McCall-Walker, Godson Caruth, Olufemi Jegede, Janice Winns, Wesley Hope, Julia Kolmakova, Chawanda Charae, Thomas Putko, Mitchell Stroud, JoAnn Milton, Madeline Coles, Ebony Dawning, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Robert Wu, Kenneth Clark, Joseph Villamar, Armando Diaz, Gary Mayo, Gale Flowers, Ana Bravo, Lindell Jones, Leola Innocent, Cynthia Smith, Zorina Bostic, Christina Wigfall, Nicola Edwards, Sandra Brown, Allison Jenkins, Laura Little, Vanessa Okonta, Simone Smikie, Jasmine Crawford, Helen Randolph, Stephanie Walthour, Marie Laratte, Xavier Vega, Lola James, Joann Liatto, Vielka Chery, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Gregg Thompson, Luis Rivera, Mary Baker, Michael Stettin, Wallisha Grant, Karen Fitten, Mechelle Agard, Helen Mwaluko, Nancy Sibily, Michelle Hackett, Jacqueline Ataliede, Pamela Kearse, Paul Brown, Marlin Alcantara, Lynette Brodie, Roberta Martin, Omodolapo Oshode, Sharon Segbefia-Adika. Related document: #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Andres Rodriguez, Himama Bushra, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, William Quinonez, Evelyn Lucas, Michelle Hernandez, Jose Santos, Marie Lazarre, Felicia Harris, Natasha Ward, Patricia McCall-Walker, Maria Polanco, Adriana Vivieca, Joan Collins, Ayazul Qurashi, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Simone Smikie, Nderim Demirovic, Wendy Wallace, Deidre Manns, Michael Stettin, Jasmine Menardy, John Gaddam, Kenneth Clark, Babatunde Baruwa, Xavier Vega, Jeanette Profit, Mikhail Spektor, Roberta Sowell, Natasha Hooper, Ebony Dawning, Paul Brown, Milagros Muniz, Luis Rivera, Shonedhua Westry, Thomas Putko, Tunishia Murray, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Jose Ramos, Fernandez Vaz, Lennox Mitchell, Joan Butcher, Harrison Ogbolu, Robyn Battle, Alina Gawronski, Brian Orr, Comfort Thomas, Elizabeth Hunte, Katherine Brown, Adrian Duncan, Antonina Rubanova, Quentin Brathwaite, Alix Saintil, Elton Morris, Sharon Segbefia-Adika, Godson Caruth, Nicola Edwards, Lawrence Ifidon, Lynette Brodie, Reginald Souffrant, Julia Kolmakova, Regine Beauzile, Hindu Murray, Yakubu Sulaiman, Reginald Studwood, Michelle Stephenson, Karess Jones, Selvin Mighty, Mary Baker, Tara Johnson, Deborah Dugger, Margaret Cherry, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Olga Rodriguez, Larry Walker, Sandra Brown, Nadean Blackwood, JoAnn Milton, Rachel Mulligan, Fitzroy Nelson, Gregg Thompson, Jose Fernandez, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Nancy Sibily, Jervine Samuel, Tedra Rosa, Eric Parrish, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Pamela Kearse, Monica Wilson, Shahora Jeffery, Simone Manning, Boniface Nwosu, Andrea Baskett, Joseph Villamar, Olaitan Aribidesi, Wayne Warren, Felicia Brown, Bikens Pierre, Ken Wisdom, Denise Peoples, Auddretta Harrison, Maria Feliu, Chuck Davis, Tracy Johnson, John Garcia, Mechelle Agard, Vielka Chery, Robert Hickson, Chawanda Charae, Ann Maria Singh, Antoinette Phillips, Jarmaine Jackson, Lindell Jones, Tyler Felder, Wallisha Grant, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Stephanie Walthour, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Lola James, Nonie Noel, Lillian Glawson, Thomas Ilori, Julio Rodriguez, Lisa Gomez, Dean Powell, Delores Williams, Joseph Shiva, Edward Wilson, Shontoinette Teague, Johnny Reed, Bridgett Brown, Shawna Blyther, Damon O'Donnell, Maritza Quito, Anthony Ruggiero, Jonathan Emenike, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Wellington Hansberry, Cydia Graham, Armando Diaz, Michelle Hackett, Tiffany Kan, Helen Randolph, Michelle Rollins, Vicki Crosson, Pierre Louisere, Guy Alcindor, Alexander Brent, Rachel Curney, Anthony Hernandez, Richard Valentine, Jacqueline Ataliede, Helen Mwaluko, Olayinka Balogun, Carol Lenard, Edwin Sanabria, Renee Harper, Violeta Hernandez, Leonard Bishop, Donnettee Moret, Judy Sharpe, Doris Rodriguez, Angela Heywood, Tomica Paisley, Evelyn Suarez, Jay Yee, Mohammad Zaman, Iris Bonet, Rodney Charles, Christopher Kapetanos, Juliana Joseph, Shazad Khan, Joel Pena, Danary Guzman, Tashon Cooley, Edwin Olali, Lucette Robinson, Laura Little, Regina Brown, Joseph Furlong, Roberta Martin, Charles Jones, Donjya Bardliving, Adunni Kayode, Wanda Pollydore, Jerome Adams, Paulina Rueda, Dmitriy Savenok, Constance Habersham, Iris De Jesus, Leola Innocent, Annie Davie, Madeline Coles, Cathy Rush, Fay Dacre, Rihanah Burnette, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Vincent Feyi, Sadie Guerra, Tracey Bruno, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Andy Almonte, Wesley Hope, Tina Baez, Cynthia Smith, Sang Chae, Rafaela Vargas, Chantal Emile, Merlyn Martinez, Ana McFarline, Cynthia Manuel, Hector Austin, Joseph Garrett, Omodolapo Oshode, Maricelis Guzman, Vanessa Okonta, Robert Wu, Jasmine Crawford, Denise Reed, Susan Fuller, Lisa Dicks, Estrella Figueredo, Raymond Burgess, Sergo Jeune, Lamine Sylla, Akinwole Killanin, Christina Wigfall, Javier Reyes, Yojaida Estrella, Irving Moulon, Elvis Breton, Joseph Myer, Sr., Mic-Arlem Patrice, Paul Lee, Nicole Symon, Joann Liatto, Salvatore Messina, Ladinia Johnson, Juan Taronji, Derek Scott, Ekei Ani, Sefton Rodney, Tabitha Baez, Emmanuel Duperval, Eduardo Garcia, Marie Laratte, Stephen Francis, Neyda Herrera, Modesta Baltazar, Aqilah Mu'Min, Gale Flowers, Olufemi Jegede, Khalid Salmon, Deshann Willis, Marlin Alcantara, Rafael Beato, Stevenson Delerme, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Michelle Ford, Onyemaechi Okpara, Cashion Roberts, Robert Muldrow, Lorraine Vesa, Jeannie Cyril, Ana Bravo, James Venezia, Janice Winns, Celeste Smith, Lola Williams, Cassandra Washington, Richard Williams, Yung Wong, Maxine Brereton, Karen Fitten, Susan Harper, Danette Brown-Allen, Denese Clue, Edward Grice, Zorina Bostic, Allison Jenkins, Rasheed Ibrahim, Sheriann Flot, Bobby Blue, Regina Miguel, Gary Mayo, Lan Lee, Christine Magestic, Efrain Lopez, Yvette Gomes, Mitchell Stroud, Dolores Fleming.(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory Keith McGillivary to RE-FILE Document No. #39 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Caption title must include all the parties involved in the case. Et al. cannot be used. Defendant name does not match what is listed on CM ECF. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a DECISION proceeding held on 1/23/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: DECISION held on 1/23/2017 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #18 Amended Complaint against The City Of New York, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Margaret Cherry, Jerome Adams, Juan Taronji, Michelle Hackett. Related document: #18 Amended Complaint filed by Andres Rodriguez, Himama Bushra, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, William Quinonez, Evelyn Lucas, Michelle Hernandez, Jose Santos, Marie Lazarre, Felicia Harris, Natasha Ward, Patricia McCall-Walker, Maria Polanco, Adriana Vivieca, Joan Collins, Ayazul Qurashi, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Simone Smikie, Nderim Demirovic, Wendy Wallace, Deidre Manns, Michael Stettin, Jasmine Menardy, John Gaddam, Kenneth Clark, Babatunde Baruwa, Xavier Vega, Jeanette Profit, Mikhail Spektor, Roberta Sowell, Natasha Hooper, Ebony Dawning, Paul Brown, Milagros Muniz, Luis Rivera, Shonedhua Westry, Thomas Putko, Tunishia Murray, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Jose Ramos, Fernandez Vaz, Lennox Mitchell, Joan Butcher, Harrison Ogbolu, Robyn Battle, Alina Gawronski, Brian Orr, Comfort Thomas, Elizabeth Hunte, Katherine Brown, Adrian Duncan, Antonina Rubanova, Quentin Brathwaite, Alix Saintil, Elton Morris, Sharon Segbefia-Adika, Godson Caruth, Nicola Edwards, Lawrence Ifidon, Lynette Brodie, Reginald Souffrant, Julia Kolmakova, Regine Beauzile, Hindu Murray, Yakubu Sulaiman, Reginald Studwood, Michelle Stephenson, Karess Jones, Selvin Mighty, Mary Baker, Tara Johnson, Deborah Dugger, Margaret Cherry, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Olga Rodriguez, Larry Walker, Sandra Brown, Nadean Blackwood, JoAnn Milton, Rachel Mulligan, Fitzroy Nelson, Gregg Thompson, Jose Fernandez, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Nancy Sibily, Jervine Samuel, Tedra Rosa, Eric Parrish, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Pamela Kearse, Monica Wilson, Shahora Jeffery, Simone Manning, Boniface Nwosu, Andrea Baskett, Joseph Villamar, Olaitan Aribidesi, Wayne Warren, Felicia Brown, Bikens Pierre, Ken Wisdom, Denise Peoples, Auddretta Harrison, Maria Feliu, Chuck Davis, Tracy Johnson, John Garcia, Mechelle Agard, Vielka Chery, Robert Hickson, Chawanda Charae, Ann Maria Singh, Antoinette Phillips, Jarmaine Jackson, Lindell Jones, Tyler Felder, Wallisha Grant, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Stephanie Walthour, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Lola James, Nonie Noel, Lillian Glawson, Thomas Ilori, Julio Rodriguez, Lisa Gomez, Dean Powell, Delores Williams, Joseph Shiva, Edward Wilson, Shontoinette Teague, Johnny Reed, Bridgett Brown, Shawna Blyther, Damon O'Donnell, Maritza Quito, Anthony Ruggiero, Jonathan Emenike, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Wellington Hansberry, Cydia Graham, Armando Diaz, Michelle Hackett, Tiffany Kan, Helen Randolph, Michelle Rollins, Vicki Crosson, Pierre Louisere, Guy Alcindor, Alexander Brent, Rachel Curney, Anthony Hernandez, Richard Valentine, Jacqueline Ataliede, Helen Mwaluko, Olayinka Balogun, Carol Lenard, Edwin Sanabria, Renee Harper, Violeta Hernandez, Leonard Bishop, Donnettee Moret, Judy Sharpe, Doris Rodriguez, Angela Heywood, Tomica Paisley, Evelyn Suarez, Jay Yee, Mohammad Zaman, Iris Bonet, Rodney Charles, Christopher Kapetanos, Juliana Joseph, Shazad Khan, Joel Pena, Danary Guzman, Tashon Cooley, Edwin Olali, Lucette Robinson, Laura Little, Regina Brown, Joseph Furlong, Roberta Martin, Charles Jones, Donjya Bardliving, Adunni Kayode, Wanda Pollydore, Jerome Adams, Paulina Rueda, Dmitriy Savenok, Constance Habersham, Iris De Jesus, Leola Innocent, Annie Davie, Madeline Coles, Cathy Rush, Fay Dacre, Rihanah Burnette, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Vincent Feyi, Sadie Guerra, Tracey Bruno, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Andy Almonte, Wesley Hope, Tina Baez, Cynthia Smith, Sang Chae, Rafaela Vargas, Chantal Emile, Merlyn Martinez, Ana McFarline, Cynthia Manuel, Hector Austin, Joseph Garrett, Omodolapo Oshode, Maricelis Guzman, Vanessa Okonta, Robert Wu, Jasmine Crawford, Denise Reed, Susan Fuller, Lisa Dicks, Estrella Figueredo, Raymond Burgess, Sergo Jeune, Lamine Sylla, Akinwole Killanin, Christina Wigfall, Javier Reyes, Yojaida Estrella, Irving Moulon, Elvis Breton, Joseph Myer, Sr., Mic-Arlem Patrice, Paul Lee, Nicole Symon, Joann Liatto, Salvatore Messina, Ladinia Johnson, Juan Taronji, Derek Scott, Ekei Ani, Sefton Rodney, Tabitha Baez, Emmanuel Duperval, Eduardo Garcia, Marie Laratte, Stephen Francis, Neyda Herrera, Modesta Baltazar, Aqilah Mu'Min, Gale Flowers, Olufemi Jegede, Khalid Salmon, Deshann Willis, Marlin Alcantara, Rafael Beato, Stevenson Delerme, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Michelle Ford, Onyemaechi Okpara, Cashion Roberts, Robert Muldrow, Lorraine Vesa, Jeannie Cyril, Ana Bravo, James Venezia, Janice Winns, Celeste Smith, Lola Williams, Cassandra Washington, Richard Williams, Yung Wong, Maxine Brereton, Karen Fitten, Susan Harper, Danette Brown-Allen, Denese Clue, Edward Grice, Zorina Bostic, Allison Jenkins, Rasheed Ibrahim, Sheriann Flot, Bobby Blue, Regina Miguel, Gary Mayo, Lan Lee, Christine Magestic, Efrain Lopez, Yvette Gomes, Mitchell Stroud, Dolores Fleming.(McGillivary, Gregory) Modified on 2/15/2017 (pc).
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RULE 41 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF VIOLETA HERNANDEZ ONLY: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Violeta Hernandez hereby voluntarily dismisses her claims without prejudice, in the above-captioned action against Defendant City of New York. As required by Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this Notice is being filed before Defendant City of New York has served an Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or a Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Plaintiff Violeta Hernandez's claims may be dismissed without prejudice by the filing of this notice. This noticeof dismissal pertains to Violeta Hernandez's claims only; all other claims by all other plaintiffs remain pending. Violeta Hernandez terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/13/2017) (cf)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file their Second Amended Complaint is granted. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Docket Number 35. SO ORDERED. Granting #35 Motion for Leave to File Document. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/13/2017) (rjm)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 BRIEF re: #35 CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Violeta Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Violeta Hernandez.(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). . Document filed by Violeta Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proposed Notice, #2 Exhibit B. Declaration Tashon Cooley, #3 Exhibit C. Declaration Jerome Adams, #4 Exhibit D. Declaration Margaret Cherry, #5 Exhibit E. Declaration Juan Taronji, #6 Exhibit F. Declaration Michelle Hackett, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(McGillivary, Gregory)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Certify Class and for Notice to Putative Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Violeta Hernandez.(McGillivary, Gregory)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #31 Letter filed by Violeta Hernandez. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Motions due by 2/3/2017., Responses due by 3/15/2017, Replies due by 3/29/2017.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/27/2017) (cf)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David Ricksecker dated January 25, 2017 re: Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Violeta Hernandez.(Ricksecker, David)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss; denying #21 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated during today's conference, Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' amended complaint is denied. In addition, Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' original complaint is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Docket Numbers 13 and 21. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/23/2017) (cf)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Status Conference held on 1/23/2017. (Court Reporter Vincent Bologna) (arc)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natalie Sharon Marcus on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Marcus, Natalie)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: A conference is hereby scheduled in this matter for January 23, 2017 at 2:30 p.m in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 1/23/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/18/2017) (cf)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jerome Adams, Mechelle Agard, Marlin Alcantara, Guy Alcindor, Andy Almonte, Ekei Ani, Olaitan Aribidesi, Jacqueline Ataliede, Hector Austin, Tabitha Baez, Tina Baez, Mary Baker, Olayinka Balogun, Modesta Baltazar, Donjya Bardliving, Babatunde Baruwa, Andrea Baskett, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Robyn Battle, Rafael Beato, Regine Beauzile, Leonard Bishop, Nadean Blackwood, Bobby Blue, Shawna Blyther, Iris Bonet, Zorina Bostic, Quentin Brathwaite, Ana Bravo, Alexander Brent, Maxine Brereton, Elvis Breton, Lynette Brodie, Bridgett Brown, Felicia Brown, Katherine Brown, Paul Brown, Regina Brown, Sandra Brown, Danette Brown-Allen, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Tracey Bruno, Raymond Burgess, Rihanah Burnette, Himama Bushra, Joan Butcher, Godson Caruth, Sang Chae, Chawanda Charae, Rodney Charles, Margaret Cherry, Vielka Chery, Kenneth Clark, Denese Clue, Madeline Coles, Joan Collins, Tashon Cooley, Jasmine Crawford, Vicki Crosson, Rachel Curney, Jeannie Cyril, Fay Dacre, Annie Davie, Chuck Davis, Ebony Dawning, Iris De Jesus, Stevenson Delerme, Nderim Demirovic, Armando Diaz, Lisa Dicks, Deborah Dugger, Adrian Duncan, Emmanuel Duperval, Nicola Edwards, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Jonathan Emenike, Chantal Emile, Yojaida Estrella, Tyler Felder, Maria Feliu, Jose Fernandez, Vincent Feyi, Estrella Figueredo, Karen Fitten, Dolores Fleming, Sheriann Flot, Gale Flowers, Michelle Ford, Stephen Francis, Susan Fuller, Joseph Furlong, John Gaddam, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Eduardo Garcia, John Garcia, Joseph Garrett, Alina Gawronski, Lillian Glawson, Yvette Gomes, Lisa Gomez, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Cydia Graham, Wallisha Grant, Edward Grice, Sadie Guerra, Danary Guzman, Maricelis Guzman, Constance Habersham, Michelle Hackett, Wellington Hansberry, Renee Harper, Susan Harper, Felicia Harris, Auddretta Harrison, Anthony Hernandez, Michelle Hernandez, Violeta Hernandez, Neyda Herrera, Angela Heywood, Robert Hickson, Natasha Hooper, Wesley Hope, Elizabeth Hunte, Rasheed Ibrahim, Lawrence Ifidon, Thomas Ilori, Leola Innocent, Jarmaine Jackson, Lola James, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Shahora Jeffery, Olufemi Jegede, Allison Jenkins, Sergo Jeune, Ladinia Johnson, Tara Johnson, Tracy Johnson, Charles Jones, Karess Jones, Lindell Jones, Juliana Joseph, Tiffany Kan, Christopher Kapetanos, Adunni Kayode, Pamela Kearse, Shazad Khan, Akinwole Killanin, Julia Kolmakova, Marie Laratte, Marie Lazarre, Lan Lee, Paul Lee, Carol Lenard, Joann Liatto, Laura Little, Efrain Lopez, Pierre Louisere, Evelyn Lucas, Christine Magestic, Simone Manning, Deidre Manns, Cynthia Manuel, Roberta Martin, Merlyn Martinez, Gary Mayo, Patricia McCall-Walker, Ana McFarline, Jasmine Menardy, Salvatore Messina, Selvin Mighty, Regina Miguel, JoAnn Milton, Lennox Mitchell, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Donnettee Moret, Elton Morris, Irving Moulon, Aqilah Mu'Min, Robert Muldrow, Rachel Mulligan, Milagros Muniz, Hindu Murray, Tunishia Murray, Helen Mwaluko, Joseph Myer, Sr., Fitzroy Nelson, Nonie Noel, Boniface Nwosu, Damon O'Donnell, Harrison Ogbolu, Vanessa Okonta, Onyemaechi Okpara, Edwin Olali, Brian Orr, Omodolapo Oshode, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Tomica Paisley, Eric Parrish, Mic-Arlem Patrice, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Joel Pena, Denise Peoples, Antoinette Phillips, Bikens Pierre, Maria Polanco, Wanda Pollydore, Dean Powell, Jeanette Profit, Thomas Putko, William Quinonez, Maritza Quito, Ayazul Qurashi, Jose Ramos, Helen Randolph, Denise Reed, Johnny Reed, Javier Reyes, Luis Rivera, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Cashion Roberts, Lucette Robinson, Sefton Rodney, Andres Rodriguez, Doris Rodriguez, Julio Rodriguez, Olga Rodriguez, Michelle Rollins, Tedra Rosa, Antonina Rubanova, Paulina Rueda, Anthony Ruggiero, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Cathy Rush, Alix Saintil, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Khalid Salmon, Jervine Samuel, Edwin Sanabria, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Jose Santos, Dmitriy Savenok, Derek Scott, Sharon Segbefia-Adika, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Judy Sharpe, Joseph Shiva, Nancy Sibily, Ann Maria Singh, Simone Smikie, Celeste Smith, Cynthia Smith, Reginald Souffrant, Roberta Sowell, Mikhail Spektor, Michelle Stephenson, Michael Stettin, Mitchell Stroud, Reginald Studwood, Evelyn Suarez, Yakubu Sulaiman, Lamine Sylla, Nicole Symon, Juan Taronji, Shontoinette Teague, Comfort Thomas, Gregg Thompson, Richard Valentine, Rafaela Vargas, Fernandez Vaz, Xavier Vega, James Venezia, Lorraine Vesa, Joseph Villamar, Adriana Vivieca, Larry Walker, Wendy Wallace, Stephanie Walthour, Natasha Ward, Wayne Warren, Cassandra Washington, Shonedhua Westry, Christina Wigfall, Delores Williams, Lola Williams, Richard Williams, Deshann Willis, Edward Wilson, Monica Wilson, Janice Winns, Ken Wisdom, Yung Wong, Robert Wu, Jay Yee, Mohammad Zaman, Alexandra Echeverri, Stefani German, Loriene Harris, Suzette Holder, Kouacou Kouassi, Kimberly McKie, Miguel Qadira, Shannon Reed, Livius Vesa, Vanessa Wooten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Andrea O'Connor in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(O'Connor, Andrea)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (O'Connor, Andrea)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Violeta Hernandez. (McGillivary, Gregory)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (O'Connor, Andrea)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Andrea O'Connor in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2))(O'Connor, Andrea)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by The City Of New York,. Responses due by 9/8/2016(O'Connor, Andrea)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/29/2016) (cf)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Andrea O'Connor dated July 29, 2016. Document filed by The City Of New York.(O'Connor, Andrea) Modified on 8/10/2016 (db).
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/25/2016. (cf)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, against The City Of New York, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Thomas Ilori, Maxine Brereton, Larry Walker, Stephen Francis, Maria Polanco, Michelle Hernandez, Lisa Dicks, Lisa Gomez, Donjya Bardliving, Denese Clue, Estrella Figueredo, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Reginald Studwood, Edwin Olali, Tashon Cooley, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Cynthia Manuel, Michelle Ford, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Alexander Brent, Bridgett Brown, Tabitha Baez, Dean Powell, John Gaddam, Yung Wong, Quentin Brathwaite, Ken Wisdom, Eric Parrish, Susan Harper, Julio Rodriguez, Joan Collins, William Quinonez, Paul Lee, Modesta Baltazar, Yvette Gomes, Adrian Duncan, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Jeannie Cyril, Iris De Jesus, Jose Santos, Tomica Paisley, Charles Jones, Jarmaine Jackson, Wayne Warren, Lorraine Vesa, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Ann Maria Singh, Javier Reyes, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Ana McFarline, Tunishia Murray, Sergo Jeune, Olayinka Balogun, Adunni Kayode, Sang Chae, Irving Moulon, Nadean Blackwood, Lola Williams, Karess Jones, Elizabeth Hunte, Cydia Graham, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Aqilah Mu'Min, Cathy Rush, Carol Lenard, Leonard Bishop, Eduardo Garcia, Evelyn Lucas, Christine Magestic, Joan Butcher, Olaitan Aribidesi, Joseph Garrett, Katherine Brown, Tracey Bruno, Fernandez Vaz, Brian Orr, Guy Alcindor, Rafael Beato, Edward Wilson, Onyemaechi Okpara, Neyda Herrera, Rachel Mulligan, Derek Scott, Deidre Manns, Judy Sharpe, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Emmanuel Duperval, Rachel Curney, Antonina Rubanova, Felicia Harris, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Joel Pena, Renee Harper, Lan Lee, Boniface Nwosu, Mohammad Zaman, Comfort Thomas, Susan Fuller, Sadie Guerra, Sheriann Flot, Lennox Mitchell, Jonathan Emenike, Jose Ramos, Cashion Roberts, Regina Brown, Annie Davie, John Garcia, Tina Baez, Danette Brown-Allen, Margaret Cherry, Tedra Rosa, Rihanah Burnette, Evelyn Suarez, Khalid Salmon, Nonie Noel, Stevenson Delerme, Violeta Hernandez, Ladinia Johnson, Auddretta Harrison, Christopher Kapetanos, Lillian Glawson, Lucette Robinson, Bobby Blue, Richard Williams, Angela Heywood, Vincent Feyi, Roberta Sowell, Elton Morris, Johnny Reed, Edwin Sanabria, Natasha Hooper, Tiffany Kan, Cassandra Washington, Rafaela Vargas, Bikens Pierre, Pierre Louisere, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Regine Beauzile, Himama Bushra, Alix Saintil, Andy Almonte, Felicia Brown, Ayazul Qurashi, Hindu Murray, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Rodney Charles, Shontoinette Teague, Jasmine Menardy, Shahora Jeffery, Selvin Mighty, Mic-Arlem Patrice, Andrea Baskett, Rasheed Ibrahim, Raymond Burgess, Iris Bonet, James Venezia, Simone Manning, Damon O'Donnell, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Robyn Battle, Maricelis Guzman, Paulina Rueda, Dmitriy Savenok, Marie Lazarre, Akinwole Killanin, Deshann Willis, Chantal Emile, Jay Yee, Edward Grice, Adriana Vivieca, Efrain Lopez, Chuck Davis, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Denise Peoples, Yakubu Sulaiman, Tracy Johnson, Maria Feliu, Tara Johnson, Vicki Crosson, Delores Williams, Dolores Fleming, Joseph Shiva, Antoinette Phillips, Monica Wilson, Merlyn Martinez, Babatunde Baruwa, Jerome Adams, Joseph Myer, Sr., Jose Fernandez, Constance Habersham, Shazad Khan, Michelle Rollins, Richard Valentine, Nderim Demirovic, Wellington Hansberry, Regina Miguel, Harrison Ogbolu, Andres Rodriguez, Fitzroy Nelson, Sefton Rodney, Shonedhua Westry, Lamine Sylla, Yojaida Estrella, Robert Hickson, Maritza Quito, Lawrence Ifidon, Jervine Samuel, Celeste Smith, Reginald Souffrant, Natasha Ward, Donnettee Moret, Jeanette Profit, Denise Reed, Michelle Stephenson, Anthony Hernandez, Salvatore Messina, Elvis Breton, Fay Dacre, Ekei Ani, Tyler Felder, Shawna Blyther, Olga Rodriguez, Alina Gawronski, Deborah Dugger, Robert Muldrow, Juan Taronji, Mikhail Spektor, Milagros Muniz, Danary Guzman, Wendy Wallace, Joseph Furlong, Anthony Ruggiero, Hector Austin, Doris Rodriguez, Juliana Joseph, Wanda Pollydore, Nicole Symon, Patricia McCall-Walker, Godson Caruth, Olufemi Jegede, Janice Winns, Wesley Hope, Julia Kolmakova, Chawanda Charae, Thomas Putko, Mitchell Stroud, JoAnn Milton, Madeline Coles, Ebony Dawning, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Robert Wu, Kenneth Clark, Joseph Villamar, Armando Diaz, Gary Mayo, Gale Flowers, Ana Bravo, Lindell Jones, Leola Innocent, Cynthia Smith, Zorina Bostic, Christina Wigfall, Nicola Edwards, Sandra Brown, Allison Jenkins, Laura Little, Vanessa Okonta, Simone Smikie, Jasmine Crawford, Helen Randolph, Stephanie Walthour, Marie Laratte, Xavier Vega, Lola James, Joann Liatto, Vielka Chery, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Gregg Thompson, Luis Rivera, Mary Baker, Michael Stettin, Wallisha Grant, Karen Fitten, Mechelle Agard, Helen Mwaluko, Nancy Sibily, Michelle Hackett, Jacqueline Ataliede, Pamela Kearse, Paul Brown, Marlin Alcantara, Lynette Brodie, Roberta Martin, Omodolapo Oshode, Sharon Segbefia-Adika. Related document: #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Andres Rodriguez, Himama Bushra, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, William Quinonez, Evelyn Lucas, Michelle Hernandez, Jose Santos, Marie Lazarre, Felicia Harris, Natasha Ward, Patricia McCall-Walker, Maria Polanco, Adriana Vivieca, Joan Collins, Ayazul Qurashi, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Simone Smikie, Nderim Demirovic, Wendy Wallace, Deidre Manns, Michael Stettin, Jasmine Menardy, John Gaddam, Kenneth Clark, Babatunde Baruwa, Xavier Vega, Jeanette Profit, Mikhail Spektor, Roberta Sowell, Natasha Hooper, Ebony Dawning, Paul Brown, Milagros Muniz, Luis Rivera, Shonedhua Westry, Thomas Putko, Tunishia Murray, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Jose Ramos, Fernandez Vaz, Lennox Mitchell, Joan Butcher, Harrison Ogbolu, Robyn Battle, Alina Gawronski, Brian Orr, Comfort Thomas, Elizabeth Hunte, Katherine Brown, Adrian Duncan, Antonina Rubanova, Quentin Brathwaite, Alix Saintil, Elton Morris, Godson Caruth, Nicola Edwards, Lawrence Ifidon, Lynette Brodie, Reginald Souffrant, Julia Kolmakova, Regine Beauzile, Hindu Murray, Yakubu Sulaiman, Reginald Studwood, Michelle Stephenson, Karess Jones, Selvin Mighty, Mary Baker, Tara Johnson, Deborah Dugger, Margaret Cherry, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Olga Rodriguez, Larry Walker, Sandra Brown, Nadean Blackwood, JoAnn Milton, Rachel Mulligan, Fitzroy Nelson, Gregg Thompson, Jose Fernandez, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Nancy Sibily, Jervine Samuel, Tedra Rosa, Eric Parrish, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Pamela Kearse, Monica Wilson, Shahora Jeffery, Simone Manning, Boniface Nwosu, Andrea Baskett, Joseph Villamar, Olaitan Aribidesi, Wayne Warren, Felicia Brown, Bikens Pierre, Ken Wisdom, Denise Peoples, Auddretta Harrison, Maria Feliu, Chuck Davis, Tracy Johnson, John Garcia, Mechelle Agard, Vielka Chery, Robert Hickson, Chawanda Charae, Ann Maria Singh, Antoinette Phillips, Jarmaine Jackson, Lindell Jones, Tyler Felder, Wallisha Grant, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Stephanie Walthour, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Lola James, Nonie Noel, Lillian Glawson, Thomas Ilori, Julio Rodriguez, Lisa Gomez, Dean Powell, Delores Williams, Joseph Shiva, Edward Wilson, Shontoinette Teague, Johnny Reed, Bridgett Brown, Shawna Blyther, Damon O'Donnell, Maritza Quito, Anthony Ruggiero, Jonathan Emenike, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Wellington Hansberry, Cydia Graham, Armando Diaz, Michelle Hackett, Tiffany Kan, Helen Randolph, Michelle Rollins, Vicki Crosson, Pierre Louisere, Guy Alcindor, Alexander Brent, Rachel Curney, Anthony Hernandez, Richard Valentine, Jacqueline Ataliede, Helen Mwaluko, Olayinka Balogun, Carol Lenard, Edwin Sanabria, Renee Harper, Violeta Hernandez, Leonard Bishop, Donnettee Moret, Judy Sharpe, Doris Rodriguez, Angela Heywood, Tomica Paisley, Evelyn Suarez, Jay Yee, Mohammad Zaman, Iris Bonet, Rodney Charles, Christopher Kapetanos, Juliana Joseph, Shazad Khan, Joel Pena, Danary Guzman, Tashon Cooley, Edwin Olali, Lucette Robinson, Laura Little, Regina Brown, Joseph Furlong, Roberta Martin, Charles Jones, Donjya Bardliving, Adunni Kayode, Wanda Pollydore, Jerome Adams, Paulina Rueda, Dmitriy Savenok, Constance Habersham, Iris De Jesus, Leola Innocent, Annie Davie, Madeline Coles, Cathy Rush, Fay Dacre, Rihanah Burnette, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Vincent Feyi, Sadie Guerra, Tracey Bruno, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Andy Almonte, Wesley Hope, Tina Baez, Cynthia Smith, Sang Chae, Rafaela Vargas, Chantal Emile, Merlyn Martinez, Ana McFarline, Cynthia Manuel, Hector Austin, Joseph Garrett, Omodolapo Oshode, Maricelis Guzman, Vanessa Okonta, Robert Wu, Jasmine Crawford, Denise Reed, Susan Fuller, Lisa Dicks, Estrella Figueredo, Raymond Burgess, Sergo Jeune, Lamine Sylla, Akinwole Killanin, Christina Wigfall, Javier Reyes, Yojaida Estrella, Irving Moulon, Elvis Breton, Joseph Myer, Sr., Mic-Arlem Patrice, Paul Lee, Nicole Symon, Joann Liatto, Salvatore Messina, Ladinia Johnson, Juan Taronji, Derek Scott, Ekei Ani, Sefton Rodney, Tabitha Baez, Emmanuel Duperval, Eduardo Garcia, Marie Laratte, Stephen Francis, Neyda Herrera, Modesta Baltazar, Aqilah Mu'Min, Gale Flowers, Olufemi Jegede, Khalid Salmon, Deshann Willis, Marlin Alcantara, Rafael Beato, Stevenson Delerme, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Michelle Ford, Onyemaechi Okpara, Cashion Roberts, Robert Muldrow, Lorraine Vesa, Jeannie Cyril, Ana Bravo, James Venezia, Janice Winns, Celeste Smith, Lola Williams, Cassandra Washington, Richard Williams, Yung Wong, Maxine Brereton, Karen Fitten, Susan Harper, Danette Brown-Allen, Denese Clue, Edward Grice, Zorina Bostic, Allison Jenkins, Rasheed Ibrahim, Sheriann Flot, Bobby Blue, Regina Miguel, Gary Mayo, Lan Lee, Christine Magestic, Efrain Lopez, Yvette Gomes, Mitchell Stroud, Dolores Fleming.(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gregory K. McGillivary dated 7/25/2016 re: First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Violeta Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(McGillivary, Gregory)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Michelle Block on behalf of Violeta Hernandez. (Block, Sarah)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (O'Connor, Andrea)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Andrea O'Connor in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (part 2 of 2))(O'Connor, Andrea)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by The City Of New York,. Responses due by 7/28/2016(O'Connor, Andrea)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for David Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for David Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12360695. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Violeta Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ricksecker, David)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12360655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Violeta Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(McGillivary, Gregory)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Gregory Keith McGillivary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12360655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for David Ricksecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12360695. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 7/18/2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Civil Cover Sheet Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Andrea O'Connor dated May 24, 2016. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(O'Connor, Andrea)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrea Mary O'Connor on behalf of The City Of New York,. (O'Connor, Andrea)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/17/2016) (tn)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City Of New York,. (rch)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Hope Allison Pordy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code none. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331. (rch)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hope Allison Pordy re: Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF, Sharon Segbefia-Adika is not listed on the docket nor in the docket text. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file Document No. 2 Complaint. (rch)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Thomas Ilori, Maxine Brereton, Larry Walker, Stephen Francis, Maria Polanco, Michelle Hernandez, Lisa Dicks, Lisa Gomez, Donjya Bardliving, Denese Clue, Estrella Figueredo, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Reginald Studwood, Edwin Olali, Tashon Cooley, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Cynthia Manuel, Michelle Ford, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Alexander Brent, Bridgett Brown, Tabitha Baez, Dean Powell, John Gaddam, Yung Wong, Quentin Brathwaite, Ken Wisdom, Eric Parrish, Susan Harper, Julio Rodriguez, Joan Collins, William Quinonez, Paul Lee, Modesta Baltazar, Yvette Gomes, Adrian Duncan, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Jeannie Cyril, Iris De Jesus, Jose Santos, Tomica Paisley, Charles Jones, Jarmaine Jackson, Wayne Warren, Lorraine Vesa, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Ann Maria Singh, Javier Reyes, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Ana McFarline, Tunishia Murray, Sergo Jeune, Olayinka Balogun, Adunni Kayode, Sang Chae, Irving Moulon, Nadean Blackwood, Lola Williams, Karess Jones, Elizabeth Hunte, Cydia Graham, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Aqilah Mu'Min, Cathy Rush, Carol Lenard, Leonard Bishop, Eduardo Garcia, Evelyn Lucas, Christine Magestic, Joan Butcher, Olaitan Aribidesi, Joseph Garrett, Katherine Brown, Tracey Bruno, Fernandez Vaz, Brian Orr, Guy Alcindor, Rafael Beato, Edward Wilson, Onyemaechi Okpara, Neyda Herrera, Rachel Mulligan, Derek Scott, Deidre Manns, Judy Sharpe, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Emmanuel Duperval, Rachel Curney, Antonina Rubanova, Felicia Harris, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Joel Pena, Renee Harper, Lan Lee, Boniface Nwosu, Mohammad Zaman, Comfort Thomas, Susan Fuller, Sadie Guerra, Sheriann Flot, Lennox Mitchell, Jonathan Emenike, Jose Ramos, Cashion Roberts, Regina Brown, Annie Davie, John Garcia, Tina Baez, Danette Brown-Allen, Margaret Cherry, Tedra Rosa, Rihanah Burnette, Evelyn Suarez, Khalid Salmon, Nonie Noel, Stevenson Delerme, Violeta Hernandez, Ladinia Johnson, Auddretta Harrison, Christopher Kapetanos, Lillian Glawson, Lucette Robinson, Bobby Blue, Richard Williams, Angela Heywood, Vincent Feyi, Roberta Sowell, Elton Morris, Johnny Reed, Edwin Sanabria, Natasha Hooper, Tiffany Kan, Cassandra Washington, Rafaela Vargas, Bikens Pierre, Pierre Louisere, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Regine Beauzile, Himama Bushra, Alix Saintil, Andy Almonte, Felicia Brown, Ayazul Qurashi, Hindu Murray, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Rodney Charles, Shontoinette Teague, Jasmine Menardy, Shahora Jeffery, Selvin Mighty, Mic-Arlem Patrice, Andrea Baskett, Rasheed Ibrahim, Raymond Burgess, Iris Bonet, James Venezia, Simone Manning, Damon O'Donnell, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Robyn Battle, Maricelis Guzman, Paulina Rueda, Dmitriy Savenok, Marie Lazarre, Akinwole Killanin, Deshann Willis, Chantal Emile, Jay Yee, Edward Grice, Adriana Vivieca, Efrain Lopez, Chuck Davis, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Denise Peoples, Yakubu Sulaiman, Tracy Johnson, Maria Feliu, Tara Johnson, Vicki Crosson, Delores Williams, Dolores Fleming, Joseph Shiva, Antoinette Phillips, Monica Wilson, Merlyn Martinez, Babatunde Baruwa, Jerome Adams, Joseph Myer, Sr., Jose Fernandez, Constance Habersham, Shazad Khan, Michelle Rollins, Richard Valentine, Nderim Demirovic, Wellington Hansberry, Regina Miguel, Harrison Ogbolu, Andres Rodriguez, Fitzroy Nelson, Sefton Rodney, Shonedhua Westry, Lamine Sylla, Yojaida Estrella, Robert Hickson, Maritza Quito, Lawrence Ifidon, Jervine Samuel, Celeste Smith, Reginald Souffrant, Natasha Ward, Donnettee Moret, Jeanette Profit, Denise Reed, Michelle Stephenson, Anthony Hernandez, Salvatore Messina, Elvis Breton, Fay Dacre, Ekei Ani, Tyler Felder, Shawna Blyther, Olga Rodriguez, Alina Gawronski, Deborah Dugger, Robert Muldrow, Juan Taronji, Mikhail Spektor, Milagros Muniz, Danary Guzman, Wendy Wallace, Joseph Furlong, Anthony Ruggiero, Hector Austin, Doris Rodriguez, Juliana Joseph, Wanda Pollydore, Nicole Symon, Patricia McCall-Walker, Godson Caruth, Olufemi Jegede, Janice Winns, Wesley Hope, Julia Kolmakova, Chawanda Charae, Thomas Putko, Mitchell Stroud, JoAnn Milton, Madeline Coles, Ebony Dawning, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Robert Wu, Kenneth Clark, Joseph Villamar, Armando Diaz, Gary Mayo, Gale Flowers, Ana Bravo, Lindell Jones, Leola Innocent, Cynthia Smith, Zorina Bostic, Christina Wigfall, Nicola Edwards, Sandra Brown, Allison Jenkins, Laura Little, Vanessa Okonta, Simone Smikie, Jasmine Crawford, Helen Randolph, Stephanie Walthour, Marie Laratte, Xavier Vega, Lola James, Joann Liatto, Vielka Chery, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Gregg Thompson, Luis Rivera, Mary Baker, Michael Stettin, Wallisha Grant, Karen Fitten, Mechelle Agard, Helen Mwaluko, Nancy Sibily, Michelle Hackett, Jacqueline Ataliede, Pamela Kearse, Paul Brown, Marlin Alcantara, Lynette Brodie, Roberta Martin, Omodolapo Oshode added. Party added pursuant to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Thomas Ilori, Maxine Brereton, Larry Walker, Stephen Francis, Maria Polanco, Michelle Hernandez, Lisa Dicks, Lisa Gomez, Donjya Bardliving, Denese Clue, Estrella Figueredo, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Reginald Studwood, Edwin Olali, Tashon Cooley, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Cynthia Manuel, Michelle Ford, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Alexander Brent, Bridgett Brown, Tabitha Baez, Dean Powell, John Gaddam, Yung Wong, Quentin Brathwaite, Ken Wisdom, Eric Parrish, Susan Harper, Julio Rodriguez, Joan Collins, William Quinonez, Paul Lee, Modesta Baltazar, Yvette Gomes, Adrian Duncan, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Jeannie Cyril, Iris De Jesus, Jose Santos, Tomica Paisley, Charles Jones, Jarmaine Jackson, Wayne Warren, Lorraine Vesa, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Ann Maria Singh, Javier Reyes, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Ana McFarline, Tunishia Murray, Sergo Jeune, Olayinka Balogun, Adunni Kayode, Sang Chae, Irving Moulon, Nadean Blackwood, Lola Williams, Karess Jones, Elizabeth Hunte, Cydia Graham, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Aqilah Mu'Min, Cathy Rush, Carol Lenard, Leonard Bishop, Eduardo Garcia, Evelyn Lucas, Christine Magestic, Joan Butcher, Olaitan Aribidesi, Joseph Garrett, Katherine Brown, Tracey Bruno, Fernandez Vaz, Brian Orr, Guy Alcindor, Rafael Beato, Edward Wilson, Onyemaechi Okpara, Neyda Herrera, Rachel Mulligan, Derek Scott, Deidre Manns, Judy Sharpe, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Emmanuel Duperval, Rachel Curney, Antonina Rubanova, Felicia Harris, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Joel Pena, Renee Harper, Lan Lee, Boniface Nwosu, Mohammad Zaman, Comfort Thomas, Susan Fuller, Sadie Guerra, Sheriann Flot, Lennox Mitchell, Jonathan Emenike, Jose Ramos, Cashion Roberts, Regina Brown, Annie Davie, John Garcia, Tina Baez, Danette Brown-Allen, Margaret Cherry, Tedra Rosa, Rihanah Burnette, Evelyn Suarez, Khalid Salmon, Nonie Noel, Stevenson Delerme, Violeta Hernandez, Ladinia Johnson, Auddretta Harrison, Christopher Kapetanos, Lillian Glawson, Lucette Robinson, Bobby Blue, Richard Williams, Angela Heywood, Vincent Feyi, Roberta Sowell, Elton Morris, Johnny Reed, Edwin Sanabria, Natasha Hooper, Tiffany Kan, Cassandra Washington, Rafaela Vargas, Bikens Pierre, Pierre Louisere, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Regine Beauzile, Himama Bushra, Alix Saintil, Andy Almonte, Felicia Brown, Ayazul Qurashi, Hindu Murray, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Rodney Charles, Shontoinette Teague, Jasmine Menardy, Shahora Jeffery, Selvin Mighty, Mic-Arlem Patrice, Andrea Baskett, Rasheed Ibrahim, Raymond Burgess, Iris Bonet, James Venezia, Simone Manning, Damon O'Donnell, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Robyn Battle, Maricelis Guzman, Paulina Rueda, Dmitriy Savenok, Marie Lazarre, Akinwole Killanin, Deshann Willis, Chantal Emile, Jay Yee, Edward Grice, Adriana Vivieca, Efrain Lopez, Chuck Davis, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Denise Peoples, Yakubu Sulaiman, Tracy Johnson, Maria Feliu, Tara Johnson, Vicki Crosson, Delores Williams, Dolores Fleming, Joseph Shiva, Antoinette Phillips, Monica Wilson, Merlyn Martinez, Babatunde Baruwa, Jerome Adams, Joseph Myer, Sr., Jose Fernandez, Constance Habersham, Shazad Khan, Michelle Rollins, Richard Valentine, Nderim Demirovic, Wellington Hansberry, Regina Miguel, Harrison Ogbolu, Andres Rodriguez, Fitzroy Nelson, Sefton Rodney, Shonedhua Westry, Lamine Sylla, Yojaida Estrella, Robert Hickson, Maritza Quito, Lawrence Ifidon, Jervine Samuel, Celeste Smith, Reginald Souffrant, Natasha Ward, Donnettee Moret, Jeanette Profit, Denise Reed, Michelle Stephenson, Anthony Hernandez, Salvatore Messina, Elvis Breton, Fay Dacre, Ekei Ani, Tyler Felder, Shawna Blyther, Olga Rodriguez, Alina Gawronski, Deborah Dugger, Robert Muldrow, Juan Taronji, Mikhail Spektor, Milagros Muniz, Danary Guzman, Wendy Wallace, Joseph Furlong, Anthony Ruggiero, Hector Austin, Doris Rodriguez, Juliana Joseph, Wanda Pollydore, Nicole Symon, Patricia McCall-Walker, Godson Caruth, Olufemi Jegede, Janice Winns, Wesley Hope, Julia Kolmakova, Chawanda Charae, Thomas Putko, Mitchell Stroud, JoAnn Milton, Madeline Coles, Ebony Dawning, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Robert Wu, Kenneth Clark, Joseph Villamar, Armando Diaz, Gary Mayo, Gale Flowers, Ana Bravo, Lindell Jones, Leola Innocent, Cynthia Smith, Zorina Bostic, Christina Wigfall, Nicola Edwards, Sandra Brown, Allison Jenkins, Laura Little, Vanessa Okonta, Simone Smikie, Jasmine Crawford, Helen Randolph, Stephanie Walthour, Marie Laratte, Xavier Vega, Lola James, Joann Liatto, Vielka Chery, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Gregg Thompson, Luis Rivera, Mary Baker, Michael Stettin, Wallisha Grant, Karen Fitten, Mechelle Agard, Helen Mwaluko, Nancy Sibily, Michelle Hackett, Jacqueline Ataliede, Pamela Kearse, Paul Brown, Marlin Alcantara, Lynette Brodie, Roberta Martin, Omodolapo Oshode. Related document: #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Andres Rodriguez, Himama Bushra, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, William Quinonez, Evelyn Lucas, Michelle Hernandez, Jose Santos, Marie Lazarre, Felicia Harris, Natasha Ward, Patricia McCall-Walker, Maria Polanco, Adriana Vivieca, Joan Collins, Ayazul Qurashi, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Simone Smikie, Nderim Demirovic, Wendy Wallace, Deidre Manns, Michael Stettin, Jasmine Menardy, John Gaddam, Kenneth Clark, Babatunde Baruwa, Xavier Vega, Jeanette Profit, Mikhail Spektor, Roberta Sowell, Natasha Hooper, Ebony Dawning, Paul Brown, Milagros Muniz, Luis Rivera, Shonedhua Westry, Thomas Putko, Tunishia Murray, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Jose Ramos, Fernandez Vaz, Lennox
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (rch)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (rch)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (rch)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jerome Adams, Mechelle Agard, Marlin Alcantara, Guy Alcindor, Andy Almonte, Ekei Ani, Olaitan Aribidesi, Jacqueline Ataliede, Hector Austin, Tabitha Baez, Tina Baez, Mary Baker, Olayinka Balogun, Modesta Baltazar, Donjya Bardliving, Babatunde Baruwa, Andrea Baskett, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Robyn Battle, Rafael Beato, Regine Beauzile, Leonard Bishop, Nadean Blackwood, Bobby Blue, Shawna Blyther, Iris Bonet, Zorina Bostic, Quentin Brathwaite, Ana Bravo, Alexander Brent, Maxine Brereton, Elvis Breton, Lynette Brodie, Bridgett Brown, Felicia Brown, Katherine Brown, Paul Brown, Regina Brown, Sandra Brown, Danette Brown-Allen, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Tracey Bruno, Raymond Burgess, Rihanah Burnette, Himama Bushra, Joan Butcher, Godson Caruth, Sang Chae, Chawanda Charae, Rodney Charles, Margaret Cherry, Vielka Chery, Kenneth Clark, Denese Clue, Madeline Coles, Joan Collins, Tashon Cooley, Jasmine Crawford, Vicki Crosson, Rachel Curney, Jeannie Cyril, Fay Dacre, Annie Davie, Chuck Davis, Ebony Dawning, Iris De Jesus, Stevenson Delerme, Nderim Demirovic, Armando Diaz, Lisa Dicks, Deborah Dugger, Adrian Duncan, Emmanuel Duperval, Nicola Edwards, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Jonathan Emenike, Chantal Emile, Yojaida Estrella, Tyler Felder, Maria Feliu, Jose Fernandez, Vincent Feyi, Estrella Figueredo, Karen Fitten, Dolores Fleming, Sheriann Flot, Gale Flowers, Michelle Ford, Stephen Francis, Susan Fuller, Joseph Furlong, John Gaddam, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Eduardo Garcia, John Garcia, Joseph Garrett, Alina Gawronski, Lillian Glawson, Yvette Gomes, Lisa Gomez, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Cydia Graham, Wallisha Grant, Edward Grice, Sadie Guerra, Danary Guzman, Maricelis Guzman, Constance Habersham, Michelle Hackett, Wellington Hansberry, Renee Harper, Susan Harper, Felicia Harris, Auddretta Harrison, Anthony Hernandez, Michelle Hernandez, Violeta Hernandez, Neyda Herrera, Angela Heywood, Robert Hickson, Natasha Hooper, Wesley Hope, Elizabeth Hunte, Rasheed Ibrahim, Lawrence Ifidon, Thomas Ilori, Leola Innocent, Jarmaine Jackson, Lola James, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Shahora Jeffery, Olufemi Jegede, Allison Jenkins, Sergo Jeune, Ladinia Johnson, Tara Johnson, Tracy Johnson, Charles Jones, Karess Jones, Lindell Jones, Juliana Joseph, Tiffany Kan, Christopher Kapetanos, Adunni Kayode, Pamela Kearse, Shazad Khan, Akinwole Killanin, Julia Kolmakova, Marie Laratte, Marie Lazarre, Lan Lee, Paul Lee, Carol Lenard, Joann Liatto, Laura Little, Efrain Lopez, Pierre Louisere, Evelyn Lucas, Christine Magestic, Simone Manning, Deidre Manns, Cynthia Manuel, Roberta Martin, Merlyn Martinez, Gary Mayo, Patricia McCall-Walker, Ana McFarline, Jasmine Menardy, Salvatore Messina, Selvin Mighty, Regina Miguel, JoAnn Milton, Lennox Mitchell, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Donnettee Moret, Elton Morris, Irving Moulon, Aqilah Mu'Min, Robert Muldrow, Rachel Mulligan, Milagros Muniz, Hindu Murray, Tunishia Murray, Helen Mwaluko, Joseph Myer, Sr., Fitzroy Nelson, Nonie Noel, Boniface Nwosu, Damon O'Donnell, Harrison Ogbolu, Vanessa Okonta, Onyemaechi Okpara, Edwin Olali, Brian Orr, Omodolapo Oshode, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Tomica Paisley, Eric Parrish, Mic-Arlem Patrice, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Joel Pena, Denise Peoples, Antoinette Phillips, Bikens Pierre, Maria Polanco, Wanda Pollydore, Dean Powell, Jeanette Profit, Thomas Putko, William Quinonez, Maritza Quito, Ayazul Qurashi, Jose Ramos, Helen Randolph, Denise Reed, Johnny Reed, Javier Reyes, Luis Rivera, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Cashion Roberts, Lucette Robinson, Sefton Rodney, Andres Rodriguez, Doris Rodriguez, Julio Rodriguez, Olga Rodriguez, Michelle Rollins, Tedra Rosa, Antonina Rubanova, Paulina Rueda, Anthony Ruggiero, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Cathy Rush, Alix Saintil, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Khalid Salmon, Jervine Samuel, Edwin Sanabria, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Jose Santos, Dmitriy Savenok, Derek Scott, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Judy Sharpe, Joseph Shiva, Nancy Sibily, Ann Maria Singh, Simone Smikie, Celeste Smith, Cynthia Smith, Reginald Souffrant, Roberta Sowell, Mikhail Spektor, Michelle Stephenson, Michael Stettin, Mitchell Stroud, Reginald Studwood, Evelyn Suarez, Yakubu Sulaiman, Lamine Sylla, Nicole Symon, Juan Taronji, Shontoinette Teague, Comfort Thomas, Gregg Thompson, Richard Valentine, Rafaela Vargas, Fernandez Vaz, Xavier Vega, James Venezia, Lorraine Vesa, Joseph Villamar, Adriana Vivieca, Larry Walker, Wendy Wallace, Stephanie Walthour, Natasha Ward, Wayne Warren, Cassandra Washington, Shonedhua Westry, Christina Wigfall, Delores Williams, Lola Williams, Richard Williams, Deshann Willis, Edward Wilson, Monica Wilson, Janice Winns, Ken Wisdom, Yung Wong, Robert Wu, Jay Yee, Mohammad Zaman. (Pordy, Hope)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED BY PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12279844)Document filed by Thomas Ilori, Maxine Brereton, Larry Walker, Stephen Francis, Maria Polanco, Michelle Hernandez, Lisa Dicks, Lisa Gomez, Donjya Bardliving, Denese Clue, Estrella Figueredo, Diana Ruiz-Maldonado, Reginald Studwood, Edwin Olali, Tashon Cooley, Sylvia Rivera-LaPrince, Cynthia Manuel, Michelle Ford, Julia Mitchell-Henry, Alexander Brent, Bridgett Brown, Tabitha Baez, Dean Powell, John Gaddam, Yung Wong, Quentin Brathwaite, Ken Wisdom, Eric Parrish, Susan Harper, Julio Rodriguez, Joan Collins, William Quinonez, Paul Lee, Modesta Baltazar, Yvette Gomes, Adrian Duncan, Kanzader Elisa-Wright, Jeannie Cyril, Iris De Jesus, Jose Santos, Tomica Paisley, Charles Jones, Jarmaine Jackson, Wayne Warren, Lorraine Vesa, Carmen Sakepo (Hernandez), Ann Maria Singh, Javier Reyes, Eunice Pen-Ogbolu, Ana McFarline, Tunishia Murray, Sergo Jeune, Olayinka Balogun, Adunni Kayode, Sang Chae, Irving Moulon, Nadean Blackwood, Lola Williams, Karess Jones, Elizabeth Hunte, Cydia Graham, Machlie Jean-Baptiste, Aqilah Mu'Min, Cathy Rush, Carol Lenard, Leonard Bishop, Eduardo Garcia, Evelyn Lucas, Christine Magestic, Joan Butcher, Olaitan Aribidesi, Joseph Garrett, Katherine Brown, Tracey Bruno, Fernandez Vaz, Brian Orr, Guy Alcindor, Rafael Beato, Edward Wilson, Onyemaechi Okpara, Neyda Herrera, Rachel Mulligan, Derek Scott, Deidre Manns, Judy Sharpe, Nirmala Sansarran-Moti, Emmanuel Duperval, Rachel Curney, Antonina Rubanova, Felicia Harris, Roxanne Gooding-DuBois, Joel Pena, Renee Harper, Lan Lee, Boniface Nwosu, Mohammad Zaman, Comfort Thomas, Susan Fuller, Sadie Guerra, Sheriann Flot, Lennox Mitchell, Jonathan Emenike, Jose Ramos, Cashion Roberts, Regina Brown, Annie Davie, John Garcia, Tina Baez, Danette Brown-Allen, Margaret Cherry, Tedra Rosa, Rihanah Burnette, Evelyn Suarez, Khalid Salmon, Nonie Noel, Stevenson Delerme, Violeta Hernandez, Ladinia Johnson, Auddretta Harrison, Christopher Kapetanos, Lillian Glawson, Lucette Robinson, Bobby Blue, Richard Williams, Angela Heywood, Vincent Feyi, Roberta Sowell, Elton Morris, Johnny Reed, Edwin Sanabria, Natasha Hooper, Tiffany Kan, Cassandra Washington, Rafaela Vargas, Bikens Pierre, Pierre Louisere, Ivy Bruce-Davis, Regine Beauzile, Himama Bushra, Alix Saintil, Andy Almonte, Felicia Brown, Ayazul Qurashi, Hindu Murray, Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey, Rodney Charles, Shontoinette Teague, Jasmine Menardy, Shahora Jeffery, Selvin Mighty, Mic-Arlem Patrice, Andrea Baskett, Rasheed Ibrahim, Raymond Burgess, Iris Bonet, James Venezia, Simone Manning, Damon O'Donnell, Crystal Gaffin-Scott, Robyn Battle, Maricelis Guzman, Paulina Rueda, Dmitriy Savenok, Marie Lazarre, Akinwole Killanin, Deshann Willis, Chantal Emile, Jay Yee, Edward Grice, Adriana Vivieca, Efrain Lopez, Chuck Davis, Anthony Oyibo-Ebije, Denise Peoples, Yakubu Sulaiman, Tracy Johnson, Maria Feliu, Tara Johnson, Vicki Crosson, Delores Williams, Dolores Fleming, Joseph Shiva, Antoinette Phillips, Monica Wilson, Merlyn Martinez, Babatunde Baruwa, Jerome Adams, Joseph Myer, Sr., Jose Fernandez, Constance Habersham, Shazad Khan, Michelle Rollins, Richard Valentine, Nderim Demirovic, Wellington Hansberry, Regina Miguel, Harrison Ogbolu, Andres Rodriguez, Fitzroy Nelson, Sefton Rodney, Shonedhua Westry, Lamine Sylla, Yojaida Estrella, Robert Hickson, Maritza Quito, Lawrence Ifidon, Jervine Samuel, Celeste Smith, Reginald Souffrant, Natasha Ward, Donnettee Moret, Jeanette Profit, Denise Reed, Michelle Stephenson, Anthony Hernandez, Salvatore Messina, Elvis Breton, Fay Dacre, Ekei Ani, Tyler Felder, Shawna Blyther, Olga Rodriguez, Alina Gawronski, Deborah Dugger, Robert Muldrow, Juan Taronji, Mikhail Spektor, Milagros Muniz, Danary Guzman, Wendy Wallace, Joseph Furlong, Anthony Ruggiero, Hector Austin, Doris Rodriguez, Juliana Joseph, Wanda Pollydore, Nicole Symon, Patricia McCall-Walker, Godson Caruth, Olufemi Jegede, Janice Winns, Wesley Hope, Julia Kolmakova, Chawanda Charae, Thomas Putko, Mitchell Stroud, JoAnn Milton, Madeline Coles, Ebony Dawning, Stephanie Batista-Fernandez, Robert Wu, Kenneth Clark, Joseph Villamar, Armando Diaz, Gary Mayo, Gale Flowers, Ana Bravo, Lindell Jones, Leola Innocent, Cynthia Smith, Zorina Bostic, Christina Wigfall, Nicola Edwards, Sandra Brown, Allison Jenkins, Laura Little, Vanessa Okonta, Simone Smikie, Jasmine Crawford, Helen Randolph, Stephanie Walthour, Marie Laratte, Xavier Vega, Lola James, Joann Liatto, Vielka Chery, Sharon Segbelfia-Adika, Gregg Thompson, Luis Rivera, Mary Baker, Michael Stettin, Wallisha Grant, Karen Fitten, Mechelle Agard, Helen Mwaluko, Nancy Sibily, Michelle Hackett, Jacqueline Ataliede, Pamela Kearse, Paul Brown, Marlin Alcantara, Lynette Brodie, Roberta Martin, Omodolapo Oshode. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope) Modified on 5/10/2016 (rch).
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Names and Addresses for Plaintiffs)(Pordy, Hope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. The City Of New York ,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violeta Hernandez
Represented By: David Ricksecker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Adams
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Nicholas James Johnson
Represented By: Afroz Baig
Represented By: David Ricksecker
Represented By: Diana J. Nobile
Represented By: Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer
Represented By: Hillary Diana LeBeau
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Represented By: William Li
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechelle Agard
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlin Alcantara
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Alcindor
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Almonte
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ekei Ani
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olaitan Aribidesi
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Ataliede
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Austin
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Baez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Baez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Baker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olayinka Balogun
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesta Baltazar
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donjya Bardliving
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babatunde Baruwa
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Baskett
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Batista-Fernandez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Battle
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Beato
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regine Beauzile
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Bishop
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadean Blackwood
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Blue
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Blyther
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Bonet
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorina Bostic
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Brathwaite
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Bravo
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Brent
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Brereton
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Breton
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Brodie
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgett Brown
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Brown
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Brown
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Brown
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Brown
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Brown
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danette Brown-Allen
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Bruce-Davis
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Bruno
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Burgess
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rihanah Burnette
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Himama Bushra
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Butcher
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Godson Caruth
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sang Chae
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chawanda Charae
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Charles
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Cherry
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vielka Chery
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Clark
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denese Clue
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Coles
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashon Cooley
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Collins
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Crawford
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Crosson
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Curney
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Cyril
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fay Dacre
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Davie
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Davis
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Dawning
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris De Jesus
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevenson Delerme
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nderim Demirovic
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Diaz
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Dicks
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Dugger
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Duncan
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Duperval
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicola Edwards
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanzader Elisa-Wright
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Emenike
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantal Emile
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yojaida Estrella
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Felder
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Feliu
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Fernandez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Feyi
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estrella Figueredo
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Fitten
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Fleming
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheriann Flot
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Flowers
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Ford
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Francis
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Fuller
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Furlong
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gaddam
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Gaddist-Dorsey
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Gaffin-Scott
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Garcia
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Garcia
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Garrett
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alina Gawronski
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Glawson
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Gomes
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Gomez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Gooding-DuBois
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cydia Graham
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallisha Grant
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Grice
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Guerra
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danary Guzman
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricelis Guzman
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Habersham
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hackett
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellington Hansberry
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Harper
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Harper
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Harris
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auddretta Harrison
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hernandez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hernandez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neyda Herrera
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Heywood
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hickson
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Hooper
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Hope
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hunte
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheed Ibrahim
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Ifidon
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ilori
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leola Innocent
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarmaine Jackson
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola James
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machlie Jean-Baptiste
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahora Jeffery
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olufemi Jegede
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Jenkins
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergo Jeune
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladinia Johnson
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Johnson
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Johnson
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jones
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karess Jones
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindell Jones
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliana Joseph
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Kan
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kapetanos
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adunni Kayode
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Kearse
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shazad Khan
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akinwole Killanin
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Kolmakova
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Laratte
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Lazarre
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lan Lee
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lee
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Lenard
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Liatto
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Little
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Lopez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Louisere
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Lucas
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Magestic
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Manning
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidre Manns
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Manuel
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Martin
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlyn Martinez
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Mayo
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia McCall-Walker
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana McFarline
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Menardy
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Messina
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selvin Mighty
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Miguel
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Milton
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennox Mitchell
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Mitchell-Henry
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnettee Moret
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elton Morris
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Moulon
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Muldrow
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Mulligan
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aqilah Mu'Min
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milagros Muniz
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hindu Murray
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tunishia Murray
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Mwaluko
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Myer, Sr.
Represented By: Gregory Keith McGillivary
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web |