In re SSA Bonds Antitrust Litigation

Plaintiff: Boston Retirement System, Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Irving Firemen's Relief and Retirement Fund and Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A, Gary McDonald, BNP Paribas, Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Holdings plc, Credit Suisse Group AG, Nomura Holdings, Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Bhardeep Singh Heer, Citibank N.A., Barclays Capital Inc., Gary Richard McDonald, Barclays Services Limited, TD Securities Limited, Shailen Pau, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, TD Bank, N.A., Nomura International plc, BNP Paribas S.A., Amandeep Singh Manku, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., RBC Europe Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Bank of America, Credit Agricole S.A., TD Securities (USA) LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse International, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse AG, Citigroup Inc., Merrill Lynch International, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., HSBC Bank plc, Barclays Bank plc, Citibank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Hiren Gudka and Citigroup Global Markets Limited
Consolidated Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-100, Nomura Securities International, Inc. and Bank Of America Corporation
Consolidated Plaintiff: The Police Retirement System of St. Louis, City of Atlanta Firefighters Pension Fund, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund, Inter-Local Pension Fund Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund, Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension Relief Fund, Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Pension Fund, City of Bristol Pension Fund and KBC Asset Management NV
Case Number: 1:2016cv03711
Filed: May 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 621 NOTICE AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL, PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, upon the annexed declaration of Laura M. King, and subject to the approval of the Court, Laura M. King hereby withdraws as counsel for Defendant Nomura Securities International, Inc. ("NSI") in the above-captioned matter. Laura M. King shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above captioned matter. Aidan Synnott of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP will continue to represent NSI. SO ORDERED. Attorney Laura M. King terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/14/2019) (kv)
August 13, 2019 Filing 620 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (King, Laura)
August 7, 2019 Filing 619 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank Of America Corporation. Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation.(Hakki, Adam)
August 7, 2019 Filing 618 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America, N.A.. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Hakki, Adam)
August 7, 2019 Filing 617 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America, N.A., Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited. Document filed by Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited.(Hakki, Adam)
August 7, 2019 Filing 616 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated. Document filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated.(Hakki, Adam)
August 7, 2019 Filing 615 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent ML UK Capital Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent BofAML EMEA Holdings 2 Limited, Corporate Parent BofAML Jersey Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Merrill Lynch International. Document filed by Merrill Lynch International.(Hakki, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 614 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from John D. Buretta dated June 13, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' letter filed on June 7, 2019. Document filed by Nomura International plc.(Buretta, John)
June 7, 2019 Filing 613 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated June 7, 2019 re: Nomura Investigation. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nomura Holdings Inc., Form 6-K)(Brockett, Daniel)
June 4, 2019 Filing 612 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated June 4, 2019 re: settlement status update. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania.(Brockett, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 611 MOTION for Matthew E. Guarnero to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The Police Retirement System of St. Louis.(Twersky, Mitchell)
March 14, 2019 Filing 610 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 14, 2019 Filing 609 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER granting #585 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/14/2019) (kv)
March 14, 2019 Filing 606 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
March 13, 2019 Filing 608 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 13, 2019 Filing 605 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
March 13, 2019 Filing 604 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (REDACTED). Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lent, Karen)
March 13, 2019 Filing 603 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited. (Sher, Barry)
March 13, 2019 Filing 602 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. , dated March 13, 2019 (REDACTED). Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
March 13, 2019 Filing 601 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada. (Willscher, Alexander)
March 13, 2019 Filing 600 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #540 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Harwood, Christopher)
March 13, 2019 Filing 599 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Gary McDonald's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam J. Hunt dated March 13, 2019. Document filed by Gary McDonald.(Hunt, Adam)
March 13, 2019 Filing 598 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #533 MOTION to Dismiss . (Redacted Version). Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
March 13, 2019 Filing 597 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #537 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku. (McGill, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 596 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. [REDACTED]. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Windels, James)
March 13, 2019 Filing 595 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Cohen, Derek)
March 13, 2019 Filing 594 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Synnott, Aidan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 593 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nomura International plc. (Buretta, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 592 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Fried, Lisa)
March 13, 2019 Filing 591 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Fried, Lisa)
March 13, 2019 Filing 590 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Januszewski, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 589 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by BNP Paribas, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Nomura International plc, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Januszewski, David)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER granting #587 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/12/2019) (kv)
March 12, 2019 Filing 587 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Reply Brief addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated March 12, 2019. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER granting #584 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/12/2019) (kv) Modified on 3/14/2019 (kv).
March 11, 2019 Filing 585 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher B. Harwood dated March 11, 2019. Document filed by Shailen Pau.(Harwood, Christopher) Modified on 3/14/2019 (kv).
March 8, 2019 Filing 584 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lisa J. Fried dated March 8, 2019. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Fried, Lisa) Modified on 3/14/2019 (kv).
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #582 Motion to Seal Document. Mr. Manku is granted leave to file his reply under seal. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER granting #581 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The application is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 8, 2019 Filing 582 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David H. McGill dated March 8, 2019. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(McGill, David)
March 7, 2019 Filing 581 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from the "Dealer Defendants" dated March 7, 2019. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Januszewski, David)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, CERTIFYING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE SETTLEMENT CLASS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: All terms in initial capitalization used in this Preliminary Approval Order shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlement Agreement, unless otherwise defined herein, as further set forth in this Order. All Class Members shall be bound by all determinations and judgments in the Action concerning the Settlement set forth in the Settlement Agreement, whether favorable or unfavorable to the Settlement Class. Any member of the Settlement Class may enter an appearance in the Action, at his, her, or its own expense, individually or through counsel of his, her, or its own choice. Any member of the Settlement Class who does not enter an appearance will be represented by Co-Lead Counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/6/2019) (kv)
February 19, 2019 Filing 579 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #537 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint., #540 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #542 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #533 MOTION to Dismiss ., #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. (Brockett, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 578 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #537 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint., #540 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #542 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #533 MOTION to Dismiss ., #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Class Action Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. (Brockett, Daniel)
February 14, 2019 Filing 577 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David H. McGill dated February 14, 2019 re: #569 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 11, 2019. . Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku. (McGill, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 576 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher B. Harwood dated February 14, 2019 re: #569 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 11, 2019. . Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Harwood, Christopher)
February 14, 2019 Filing 575 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated February 14, 2019 re: In re: SSA Bonds Antitrust Litig., No. 1:16-cv-03711 (ER). Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
February 14, 2019 Filing 574 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam J. Hunt dated February 14, 2019 re: #569 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 11, 2019. . Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
February 14, 2019 Filing 573 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David G. Januszewski and certain defendants dated February 14, 2019 re: #569 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 11, 2019. . Document filed by BNP Paribas, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Nomura International plc, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Januszewski, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 572 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Stephen Morrison on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Morrison, Gregory)
February 11, 2019 Filing 571 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
February 11, 2019 Filing 570 DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett in Opposition re: #542 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #533 MOTION to Dismiss ., #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #537 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint., #540 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Press Release Published by European Commission on December 20, 2018, #2 Exhibit 2 - Antitrust Definitions Published by European Commission, #3 Exhibit 3 - Article Published by Bloomberg on December 20, 2018, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement Published by Deutsche Bank on December 20, 2018)(Brockett, Daniel)
February 11, 2019 Filing 569 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 11, 2019. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania.(Brockett, Daniel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 568 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Mark Roseman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Spector Roseman & Kodroff P.C., 2001 Market Street, Suite 3420, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, United States 19103, 2154960300. (Roseman, Robert)
January 28, 2019 Filing 567 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashley M Robinson on behalf of Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. (Robinson, Ashley)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER granting #507 Motion for Ashley M. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
January 18, 2019 Filing 565 NOTICE of Compliance With 28 USC 1715. Document filed by HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Miller, Britt)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting #559 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/15/2019) (kv)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER granting #560 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER granting #558 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ashley Christine Burns terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER granting #556 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Judith Leonore Mogul terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
January 14, 2019 Filing 560 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated January 14, 2019. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania.(Brockett, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 559 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated January 14, 2019. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania.(Brockett, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 558 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ashley C. Burns to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Burns, Ashley) Modified on 2/1/2019 (ldi).
January 11, 2019 Filing 557 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Blake Harwood on behalf of Shailen Pau. (Harwood, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 556 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Judith L. Mogul to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Mogul, Judith) Modified on 2/1/2019 (ldi).
January 9, 2019 Filing 555 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #553 MOTION to Approve / for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement with HSBC. . Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. (Brockett, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 554 DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett in Support re: #553 MOTION to Approve / for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement with HSBC.. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brockett, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 553 MOTION to Approve / for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement with HSBC. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Orders regarding Preliminary Approval and Final Approval)(Brockett, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 552 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #551 Letter filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Attorney Bryan Patrick McArdle terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/4/2019) (kv)
January 4, 2019 Filing 551 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bryan McArdle dated January 4, 2019 re: Withdrawing as Counsel. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(McArdle, Bryan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 550 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 26, 2018 Filing 549 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 26, 2018 Filing 547 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
December 21, 2018 Filing 548 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 21, 2018 Filing 546 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 21, 2018 Filing 545 DECLARATION of Karen Hoffman Lent in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2- Redacted, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lent, Karen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 544 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (Redacted). Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lent, Karen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 543 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #542 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Cohen, Derek)
December 21, 2018 Filing 542 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cohen, Derek)
December 21, 2018 Filing 541 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #540 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Albert, Richard)
December 21, 2018 Filing 540 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Albert, Richard)
December 21, 2018 Filing 539 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nomura International plc. (Buretta, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 538 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #537 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku. (Dockery, Clinton)
December 21, 2018 Filing 537 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(Dockery, Clinton)
December 21, 2018 Filing 536 DECLARATION of Gary McDonald in Support re: #533 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
December 21, 2018 Filing 535 DECLARATION of Kevin Roberts in Support re: #533 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hunt, Adam)
December 21, 2018 Filing 534 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #533 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
December 21, 2018 Filing 533 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Gary McDonald. Responses due by 2/11/2019(Hunt, Adam)
December 21, 2018 Filing 532 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Windels, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 531 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada. (Willscher, Alexander)
December 21, 2018 Filing 530 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited. (Sher, Barry)
December 21, 2018 Filing 529 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Synnott, Aidan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 528 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Fried, Lisa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 527 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lisa J. Fried dated December 21, 2018. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Fried, Lisa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 526 DECLARATION of Lisa J. Fried in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fried, Lisa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 525 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Fried, Lisa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 524 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Januszewski, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 523 DECLARATION of Jason Wright in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Barclays Bank plc. (Januszewski, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 522 DECLARATION of David G. Januszewski in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by BNP Paribas, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Nomura International plc, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Victoria E.C. Hardy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Hannah Ellwood, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Stephanie Gyetvan, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Thomas Reich, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Matt Jerman, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Olivier Chazareix, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Gene Kim, #8 Exhibit 8 - Supplemental Declaration of Gene Kim, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Daniel Klay, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Damian M. Bisseker, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Damian M. Bisseker, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Daisy Le Vay, #13 Exhibit 13 - Supplemental Declaration of Daisy Le Vay, #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Paul Serritella, #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Andriana Zacharia, #16 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Moti Jungreis)(Januszewski, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 521 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Januszewski, David)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #515 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
December 21, 2018 Filing 520 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Washer, Herbert)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #514 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER granting #513 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER granting #512 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER granting #511 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
December 20, 2018 Filing 515 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lisa J. Fried dated December 20, 2018. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sealing Order)(Fried, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 514 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated December 20, 2018. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
December 20, 2018 Filing 513 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam J. Hunt dated December 19, 2018. Document filed by Gary McDonald.(Hunt, Adam)
December 19, 2018 Filing 512 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Judith L. Mogul dated December 19, 2018. Document filed by Shailen Pau.(Mogul, Judith)
December 19, 2018 Filing 511 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Clinton J. Dockery dated December 19, 2018. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(Dockery, Clinton)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER granting #509 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The application is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
December 17, 2018 Filing 509 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lisa J. Fried dated December 17, 2018. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Fried, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 508 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura M. King on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (King, Laura)
December 12, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #507 MOTION for Ashley M. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16038973. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 507 MOTION for Ashley M. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16038973. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley M. Kelly, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for California, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing for Georgia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Ashley)
November 13, 2018 Filing 506 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #306 Amended Complaint,,,, against BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Hiren Gudka, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Amandeep Singh Manku, Gary McDonald, Merrill Lynch International, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Shailen Pau, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation. Related document: #306 Amended Complaint,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brockett, Daniel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 505 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
October 31, 2018 Filing 504 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
October 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2018. Motions due by 12/21/2018. Responses due by 2/11/2019. Replies due by 3/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(jwh)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER RE: SCHEDULE FOR FILING THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDA OF LAW REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS granting (502) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:16-cv-03711-ER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs must file their second consolidated amended complaint by November 6, 2018. 2. Defendants must file any motion(s) to dismiss by December 21, 2018. 3. Plaintiffs must file any opposition to motion(s) to dismiss by February 11, 2019. 4. Defendants must file their reply (or replies) to Plaintiffs' opposition by March 13, 2019. 5. Defendants expressly reserve all rights, including but not limited to the right to contest whether any party in this action is properly named, and all defenses, including but not limited to those related to personal jurisdiction and venue. 6. Nothing in this order is intended to curtail the rights under the Federal Rules that might otherwise exist absent this agreement. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/15/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al. (jwh)
October 11, 2018 Filing 502 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dan L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated October 11, 2018. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brockett, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 501 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Hoffman Lent on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Lent, Karen)
October 2, 2018 Filing 500 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #433 Motion to Withdraw. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/2/2018) (jwh)
September 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (25 in 1:16-cv-05755-ER, 499 in 1:16-cv-03711-ER, 57 in 1:16-cv-04151-ER, 37 in 1:16-cv-04485-ER) Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER, 1:16-cv-04151-ER, 1:16-cv-04485-ER, 1:16-cv-05755-ER(dt)
September 13, 2018 Filing 499 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters Pension Fund, Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Pension Fund, Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension Relief Fund. Related Document Number: #498 . (Kaplan, David) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 13, 2018 Filing 498 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Blair A. Nicholas. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters Pension Fund, Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension Relief Fund, Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER, 1:16-cv-04151-ER, 1:16-cv-04485-ER, 1:16-cv-05755-ER(Kaplan, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 497 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (DePizzo, Kristen-Elise)
August 29, 2018 Filing 496 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 OPINION AND ORDER re: #344 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David Januszewski dated December 12, 2017 filed by Barclays Services Limited, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Royal Bank of Canada, Credit Suisse International, RBC Capital Markets LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank, RBC Europe Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Nomura International plc, HSBC Bank plc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., TD Securities (USA) LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, #378 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hiren Gudka, #406 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 14, 2018 filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, #373 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Shailen Pau, #376 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Amandeep Singh Manku, #342 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Barclays Services Limited, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Royal Bank of Canada, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse International, The Toronto-Dominion Bank, RBC Europe Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Bank plc, Nomura International plc, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Bank plc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., TD Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Citibank N.A., #453 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bradley S. Lui dated March 23, 2018 filed by Gary McDonald, #358 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Gary McDonald, #365 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer, #468 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated March 23, 2018 filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim because Plaintiffs have failed to plausibly allege an injury-in-fact sufficient to establish antitrust standing. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, Docs. 342, 344, 358, 365, 373, 376, 378, 406, 453, 468. Plaintiffs may file a second consolidated amended complaint, if at all, on or before October 23, 2018. If Plaintiffs elect to not file a second consolidated amended complaint, they may apply to the Court for entry of judgment any time before then. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2018.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/24/2018) (mro)
July 3, 2018 Filing 494 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #493 Letter filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Attorney Joel M. Cohen terminated.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/3/2018) (jwh)
July 2, 2018 Filing 493 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from James H.R. Windels dated July 2, 2018 re: To Withdraw Joel M. Cohen as Counsel of Record. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Windels, James)
June 21, 2018 Filing 492 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Roger Anson Burlingame on behalf of Amandeep Singh Manku. New Address: Dechert LLP, 160 Queen Victoria Street, London EC4V 4QQ, UK +44 (20) 7184 7333. (Burlingame, Roger)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #490 Notice (Other) filed by Hiren Gudka. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Adam Castiel Mendel terminated.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/18/2018) (jwh)
June 14, 2018 Filing 490 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Hiren Gudka. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(Mendel, Adam)
May 24, 2018 Filing 489 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David H. McGill dated May 24, 2018 re: Joinder to Dealer Defendants' May 16, 2018 Letter. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(McGill, David)
May 21, 2018 Filing 488 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated May 21, 2018 re: response to Defendants' letter re: supplemental authority. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California.(Brockett, Daniel)
May 18, 2018 Filing 487 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated May 18, 2018 re: Joining Dealer Defendants' May 16, 2018 Letter. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
May 17, 2018 Filing 486 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bradley S. Lui dated May 17, 2018 re: Joinder to Dealer Defendants' 5/16/18 Letter Regarding Supplemental Authority (ECF No. 484). Document filed by Gary McDonald.(Lui, Bradley)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE re: #483 Notice (Other) filed by Hiren Gudka. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Katherine Doty Hanniford terminated.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/16/2018) (anc)
May 16, 2018 Filing 484 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lisa J. Fried dated May 16, 2018 re: to submit the Second Circuits recent decision in Harry v. Total Gas & Power North America, Inc., --- F.3d ---, 2018 WL 2070553 (2d Cir. May 4, 2018), as supplemental authority in further support of the Dealer Defendants pending motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. #342 ). Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision)(Fried, Lisa)
May 8, 2018 Filing 483 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Hiren Gudka. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(Hanniford, Katherine)
March 28, 2018 Filing 482 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #376 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (REDACTED). Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku. (Dockery, Clinton)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER granting #478 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Clerk of Court is directed to deleted the entry, doc. 465. Defendant is granted leave to re-file his reply. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/27/2018) (mro)
March 26, 2018 Filing 478 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David H. McGill dated March 26, 2018. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(McGill, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 477 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 26, 2018 Filing 475 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 26, 2018 Filing 473 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 23, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 465 Reply Memorandum of Law. The document was deleted pursuant to docket entry #481 . (mro)
March 23, 2018 Filing 480 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 23, 2018 Filing 479 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 23, 2018 Filing 476 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 23, 2018 Filing 474 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 23, 2018 Filing 472 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 23, 2018 Filing 471 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 23, 2018 Filing 470 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 23, 2018 Filing 469 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 23, 2018 Filing 468 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated March 23, 2018. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
March 23, 2018 Filing 467 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #365 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. (Redacted). Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Cohen, Derek)
March 23, 2018 Filing 466 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. [REDACTED]. Document filed by Nomura International plc. (Buretta, John)
March 23, 2018 Filing 464 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. [REDACTED]. Document filed by Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Eckles, Paul)
March 23, 2018 Filing 463 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. [REDACTED]. Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
March 23, 2018 Filing 462 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited. (Sher, Barry)
March 23, 2018 Filing 461 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. [Redacted]. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Windels, James)
March 23, 2018 Filing 460 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #373 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (REDACTED). Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Mogul, Judith)
March 23, 2018 Filing 459 DECLARATION of Paul Cross in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Stein, Daniel)
March 23, 2018 Filing 458 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #367 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion . Document filed by HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Stein, Daniel)
March 23, 2018 Filing 457 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Synnott, Aidan)
March 23, 2018 Filing 456 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Fried, Lisa)
March 23, 2018 Filing 455 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Fried, Lisa)
March 23, 2018 Filing 454 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. by the Foreign Dealer Defendants for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by BNP Paribas, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., HSBC Bank plc, Nomura International plc, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Januszewski, David)
March 23, 2018 Filing 453 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bradley S. Lui dated March 23, 2018. Document filed by Gary McDonald.(Lui, Bradley)
March 23, 2018 Filing 452 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. by the Credit Suisse Defendants for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Januszewski, David)
March 23, 2018 Filing 451 DECLARATION of Gary McDonald in Support re: #358 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
March 23, 2018 Filing 450 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #358 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
March 23, 2018 Filing 449 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada. (Willscher, Alexander)
March 23, 2018 Filing 448 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #443 Letter filed by Hiren Gudka. ENDORSEMENT: Pursuant to the express terms of the Settlement Agreements, all further proceedings with respect to Mr. Gudka are stayed pending final approval of the Settlement Agreements. Accordingly, Mr. Gudka is not required to submit a reply memorandum in support of his motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs may file any applications they may deem appropriate. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/23/2018) (jwh) Modified on 4/2/2018 (jwh).
March 23, 2018 Filing 447 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER granting #441 Motion to Seal Document: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/23/2018) (jwh)
March 22, 2018 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #445 Order on Motion to Seal Document to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (rjm)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER granting #439 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document: Forthcoming Reply Brief addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Judith L. Mogul dated March 20, 2018. Document filed by Shailen Pau. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/22/2018) (rjm)
March 22, 2018 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #444 Order on Motion to Seal Document to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (rjm)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting #438 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Forthcoming Reply Briefs addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos dated March 20, 2018. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/22/2018) (rjm)
March 22, 2018 Filing 443 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Wesley R. Powell dated March 22, 2018 re: Response to Plaintiffs' 3/22/18 letter. Document filed by Hiren Gudka.(Powell, Wesley)
March 22, 2018 Filing 442 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated March 22, 2018 re: Response to Defendant Hiren Gudka's March 21, 2018 Letter. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California.(Brockett, Daniel)
March 21, 2018 Filing 441 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David H. McGill dated March 21, 2018. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(McGill, David)
March 21, 2018 Filing 440 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Wesley R. Powell dated March 21, 2018 re: Preliminary Approval Orders. Document filed by Hiren Gudka.(Powell, Wesley)
March 20, 2018 Filing 439 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document : Forthcoming Reply Brief addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Judith L. Mogul dated March 20, 2018. Document filed by Shailen Pau.(Mogul, Judith)
March 20, 2018 Filing 438 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Forthcoming Reply Briefs addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos dated March 20, 2018. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Fried, Lisa)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #436 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
March 14, 2018 Filing 436 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Judith L. Mogul dated March 14, 2018. Document filed by Shailen Pau.(Mogul, Judith)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #434 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #434 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ( Replies due by 3/23/2018.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
March 12, 2018 Filing 434 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dealer Defendants dated March 12, 2018., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dealer Defendants dated March 12, 2018. Document filed by BNP Paribas, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Januszewski, David)
March 6, 2018 Filing 433 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Kevin T. Baumann. Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank.(Fried, Lisa)
March 6, 2018 Filing 432 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Andrew Fleming on behalf of Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Fleming, Benjamin)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, CERTIFYING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE SETTLEMENT CLASS re: #289 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: All terms in initial capitalization used in this Preliminary Approval Order shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlement Agreement, unless otherwise defined herein. Upon review of the record, the Court finds that the Settlement Agreement resulted from arms-length negotiations between highly experienced counsel and falls within the range of possible approval. The Court hereby preliminarily approves the Settlement Agreement, subject to further consideration at the Fairness Hearing described below. The Court preliminarily finds that the Settlement encompassed by the Settlement Agreement raises no obvious reasons to doubt its fairness and provides a reasonable basis for presuming that the Settlement Agreement satisfies the requirements of Rules 23(c)(2) and 23(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and due process so that an appropriate notice of the Settlement Agreement should be given, subject to the Courts approval of a notice plan as provided in this Preliminary Approval Order. Pursuant to Rule 23(g) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the law firms of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP are preliminarily appointed, solely for settlement purposes, as Co-Lead Counsel for the Settlement Class. All reasonable expenses incurred in identifying and notifying potential Settlement Class Members as well as administering the Settlement Fund shall be paid, as set forth herein, up to the sum of $500,000. All proceedings in the Action with respect to Released Parties are stayed until further order of the Court. Such stay does not apply, however, to the extent actions are necessary to implement the terms of the Settlement Agreement or comply with their terms, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/1/2018) (jwh)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 430 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AGAINST TD SECURITIES LIMITED: NOW, THEREFORE, ON THE BASIS OF THE FOREGOING REPRESENTATIONS, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. That the above-captioned action, In re SSA Bonds Antitrust Litigation, No. 16-cv-3711 (ER), is, as to only TD Securities Limited, dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party as against any other party. 2. The dismissal is without prejudice. Should discovery lead to facts providing a basis for joining TD Securities Limited back into the case, the parties agree that any statute of limitation, statute of repose, or any other time-related defense or claim shall be tolled as to TD Securities Limited from the date of this stipulation until the date that such discovery was received by Plaintiffs. TD Securities Limited terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/5/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(jwh) (Main Document 430 replaced on 3/5/2018) (jar). Modified on 3/9/2018 (jwh).
March 2, 2018 Filing 429 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated March 2, 2018 re: supplemental authority relevant to the various motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(Brockett, Daniel)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, CERTIFYING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE SETTLEMENT CLASS: granting #289 Motion for Settlement. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: All terms in initial capitalization used in this Preliminary Approval Order shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlement Agreement, unless otherwise defined herein. Upon review of the record, the Court finds that the Settlement Agreement resulted from arm's-length negotiations between highly experienced counsel and falls within the range of possible approval. Pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court preliminarily certifies, solely for settlement purposes, a Settlement Class defined as follows: Pursuant to Rule 23(g) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the law firms of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP are preliminarily appointed, solely for settlement purposes, as Co-Lead Counsel for the Settlement Class. Class Plaintiffs are preliminarily appointed, solely for settlement purposes, as class representatives for the Settlement Class. All persons or entities who, from January 1, 2005 to the date of the Preliminary Approval Order, entered into an SSA bond transaction with a Defendant; a direct or indirect parent, subsidiary, affiliate, or division of a Defendant; a Released Party; or an alleged co-conspirator, where such Persons were either domiciled in the United States or its territories or, if domiciled outside of the United States or its territories, entered into an SSA bond transaction in the United States or its territories or that otherwise involved United States trade or commerce. Excluded from the Settlement Class are Defendants, their co-conspirators identified herein, and their officers, directors, management, employees, current subsidiaries or affiliates, and all federal governmental entities; provided, however, that Investment Vehicles shall not be excluded from the definition of the Settlement Class. All reasonable expenses incurred in identifying and notifying potential Settlement Class Members as well as administering the Settlement Fund shall be paid, as set forth herein, up to the sum of $500,000, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/1/2018) (ap) Modified on 3/5/2018 (ap).
March 1, 2018 Filing 427 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated March 1, 2018 re: Stipulation and (Proposed) Order. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Stipulation and (Proposed) Order)(Brockett, Daniel)
March 1, 2018 Filing 426 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated March 1, 2018 re: Stipulation and (Proposed) Order. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Stipulation and (Proposed) Order)(Brockett, Daniel)
February 23, 2018 Filing 425 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #378 MOTION to Dismiss ., #373 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #376 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #358 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint., #365 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Class Action Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
February 23, 2018 Filing 424 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #378 MOTION to Dismiss ., #373 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #376 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint., #358 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint., #365 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Class Action Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #408 Motion of Gregory S. Asciolla to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Gregory Scott Asciolla terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/20/2018) (mro)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #412 Motion of Garrett J. Bradley to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Garrett J. Bradley terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/20/2018) (mro)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 421 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #411 Motion of Matthew J. Perez to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Matthew Joseph Perez terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/20/2018) (mro)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #410 Motion of Karin E. Garvey to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Karin Elizabeth Garvey terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/20/2018) (mro)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #409 Motion of Jay L. Himes to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Jay L. Himes terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/20/2018) (mro) Modified on 2/21/2018 (mro).
February 20, 2018 Filing 418 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David H. McGill dated 02/20/2018 re: Response to Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel's February 14, 2018 letter requesting pre-motion conference.. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(Dockery, Clinton)
February 20, 2018 Filing 417 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated February 20, 2018 re: #406 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 14, 2018. . Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Cohen, Derek)
February 20, 2018 Filing 416 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bradley S. Lui dated February 20, 2018 re: #406 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 14, 2018. . Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Lui, Bradley)
February 20, 2018 Filing 415 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Wesley R. Powell dated February 20, 2018 re: #406 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 14, 2018. . Document filed by Hiren Gudka. (Powell, Wesley)
February 20, 2018 Filing 414 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Judith L. Mogul dated February 20, 2018 re: Response to Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel's February 14, 2018 Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Shailen Pau.(Mogul, Judith)
February 20, 2018 Filing 413 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Foreign Dealer Defendants dated February 20, 2018 re: response to Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel's February 14, 2018 letter requesting pre-motion conference. Document filed by BNP Paribas, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., HSBC Bank plc, Nomura International plc, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 18, 2017 Hearing Transcript Excerpt)(Januszewski, David)
February 20, 2018 Filing 412 MOTION for Garrett J. Bradley to Withdraw as Attorney with request to be removed from service list.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Bradley, Garrett)
February 16, 2018 Filing 411 MOTION for Matthew J. Perez to Withdraw as Attorney with request to be removed from service list. Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Perez, Matthew)
February 16, 2018 Filing 410 MOTION for Karin E. Garvey to Withdraw as Attorney with request to be removed from service list. Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Garvey, Karin)
February 16, 2018 Filing 409 MOTION for Jay L. Himes to Withdraw as Attorney with request to be removed from service list. Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Himes, Jay)
February 16, 2018 Filing 408 MOTION for Gregory S. Asciolla to Withdraw as Attorney with request to be removed from service list. Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Asciolla, Gregory)
February 14, 2018 Filing 407 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
February 14, 2018 Filing 406 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated February 14, 2018. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California.(Brockett, Daniel)
February 7, 2018 Filing 405 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Daniel Andersen on behalf of Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Andersen, Jeremy)
January 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/14/2018 Replies due by 3/16/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(mro)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER RE: SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS FOR FILING MEMORANDA OF LAW OPPOSING MOTION TO DISMISS granting (403) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:16-cv-03711-ER. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs must file any opposition to motion(s) to dismiss by February 14, 2018. 2. Plaintiffs may file memoranda of law of up to 240 pages in opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss. 3. Defendants will file their reply (or replies) to Plaintiffs' opposition by March 16, 2018. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/18/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al, as per Chambers. (mro) Modified on 1/22/2018 (mro).
January 17, 2018 Filing 403 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline for Filing Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated January 17, 2018. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Schedule and Page Limits)(Brockett, Daniel)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting #401 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/16/2018) (cf)
January 11, 2018 Filing 401 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated January 11, 2018. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California.(Brockett, Daniel)
January 8, 2018 Filing 400 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 22, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 400 Notice of Court Conference. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jar)
December 20, 2017 Filing 399 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting #397 Motion for C. Scott Hataway to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
December 18, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #397 MOTION for C. Scott Hataway to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14488092. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
December 18, 2017 Filing 397 MOTION for C. Scott Hataway to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14488092. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of C. Scott Hataway, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hataway, Clayton)
December 15, 2017 Filing 396 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd.. (Mintz, Adam)
December 15, 2017 Filing 395 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 15, 2017 Filing 394 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 15, 2017 Filing 393 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 14, 2017 Filing 390 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 14, 2017 Filing 389 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 14, 2017 Filing 388 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 13, 2017 Filing 392 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 13, 2017 Filing 391 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting #343 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/13/2017) (mro)
December 13, 2017 Filing 384 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 12, 2017 Filing 386 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 12, 2017 Filing 385 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 12, 2017 Filing 383 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 12, 2017 Filing 382 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 12, 2017 Filing 381 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited. (Sher, Barry)
December 12, 2017 Filing 380 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited. Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(Sher, Barry)
December 12, 2017 Filing 379 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #378 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Hiren Gudka. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Powell, Wesley)
December 12, 2017 Filing 378 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Hiren Gudka. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Powell, Wesley)
December 12, 2017 Filing 377 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #376 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku. (McGill, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 376 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(McGill, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 375 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #373 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Mogul, Judith)
December 12, 2017 Filing 374 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada. (Willscher, Alexander)
December 12, 2017 Filing 373 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mogul, Judith)
December 12, 2017 Filing 372 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. [Redacted]. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Windels, James)
December 12, 2017 Filing 371 DECLARATION of Paul M. Eckles (Redacted) in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Description Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 (Description Redacted))(Eckles, Paul)
December 12, 2017 Filing 370 DECLARATION of Gene Kim in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 369 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (Redacted). Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Eckles, Paul)
December 12, 2017 Filing 368 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #365 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. (REDACTED). Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Cohen, Derek)
December 12, 2017 Filing 367 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. [REDACTED]. Document filed by HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Stein, Daniel)
December 12, 2017 Filing 366 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Synnott, Aidan)
December 12, 2017 Filing 365 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
December 12, 2017 Filing 364 DECLARATION of Gary McDonald in Support re: #358 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
December 12, 2017 Filing 363 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #370 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Gene Kim in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Januszewski, David) Modified on 12/14/2017 (db).
December 12, 2017 Filing 362 DECLARATION of Kevin Roberts in Support re: #358 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hunt, Adam)
December 12, 2017 Filing 361 DECLARATION of Thomas Reich in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 360 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #358 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. (Redacted). Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
December 12, 2017 Filing 359 DECLARATION of Daisy Alice Le Vay in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Nomura International plc. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 358 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Gary McDonald. Responses due by 1/31/2018(Hunt, Adam)
December 12, 2017 Filing 357 DECLARATION of Hannah Ellwood in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Barclays Services Limited. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 356 DECLARATION of Victoria E.C. Hardy in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Securities Limited. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 355 DECLARATION of Hannah Ellwood in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Barclays Bank plc. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 354 DECLARATION of Davd Quest in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by HSBC Bank plc. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 353 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets LLC. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC.(Willscher, Alexander)
December 12, 2017 Filing 352 DECLARATION of Nicola Black in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by HSBC Bank plc. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 351 DECLARATION of Stephanie Gyetvan in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by BNP Paribas. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 350 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nomura International plc, Nomura International plc. (Buretta, John)
December 12, 2017 Filing 349 DECLARATION of David Januszewski in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jerman Declaration, #2 Exhibit Chazareix Declaration, #3 Exhibit Kim Declaration (Redacted), #4 Exhibit Klay Declaration, #5 Exhibit Bisseker Declaration, #6 Exhibit Bisseker Declaration, #7 Exhibit Le Vay Declaration, #8 Exhibit Serritella Declaration, #9 Exhibit Zacharia Declaration, #10 Exhibit Jungreis Declaration, #11 Exhibit Godfrey Declaration)(Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 348 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Fried, Lisa)
December 12, 2017 Filing 347 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Fried, Lisa)
December 12, 2017 Filing 346 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., HSBC Bank plc, Nomura International plc, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 345 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 344 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David Januszewski dated December 12, 2017. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 343 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dealers Defendants dated December 12, 2017. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 342 MOTION to Dismiss thr Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Januszewski, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 341 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Corporate Parent TD Group US Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Toronto Dominion Holdings (U.S.A.), Inc. for TD Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC.(Windels, James)
December 12, 2017 Filing 340 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H.R. Windels on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC. (Windels, James)
December 12, 2017 Filing 339 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Patrick McArdle on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC. (McArdle, Bryan)
December 12, 2017 Filing 338 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Cohen on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC. (Cohen, Joel)
December 12, 2017 Filing 337 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke on behalf of RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Clarke, Stephen)
December 12, 2017 Filing 336 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Porpora on behalf of RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Porpora, Matthew)
December 12, 2017 Filing 335 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander John Willscher on behalf of RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Willscher, Alexander)
December 12, 2017 Filing 334 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Thomas Leech on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Leech, Timothy)
December 12, 2017 Filing 333 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Elena Vega-Gonzalez on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Vega-Gonzalez, Martha)
December 12, 2017 Filing 332 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BNP Paribas for BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
December 12, 2017 Filing 331 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
December 12, 2017 Filing 330 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Castiel Mendel on behalf of Hiren Gudka. (Mendel, Adam)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #321 Motion to Seal Document: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/12/2017) (jwh)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #323 Motion to Seal Document: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/12/2017) (jwh)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #322 Motion to Seal Document: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/12/2017) (jwh)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #318 Motion to Seal Document: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/12/2017) (jwh)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #317 Motion to Seal Document: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/12/2017) (jwh)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting #316 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
December 8, 2017 Filing 323 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Judith L. Mogul dated December 8, 2017. Document filed by Shailen Pau.(Mogul, Judith)
December 8, 2017 Filing 322 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated December 8, 2017. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
December 7, 2017 Filing 321 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David H. McGill dated December 7, 2017. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(McGill, David)
December 7, 2017 Filing 320 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Antonelli on behalf of Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited. (Antonelli, Anthony)
December 7, 2017 Filing 319 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry G. Sher on behalf of Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited. (Sher, Barry)
December 7, 2017 Filing 318 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bradley S. Lui dated December 7, 2017. Document filed by Gary McDonald.(Lui, Bradley)
December 7, 2017 Filing 317 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Wesley Powell dated December 7, 2017. Document filed by Hiren Gudka.(Powell, Wesley)
December 7, 2017 Filing 316 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David G. Januszewski dated December 7, 2017. Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Januszewski, David)
December 5, 2017 Filing 315 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheila Chithran Ramesh on behalf of Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Ramesh, Sheila)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE, TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND, AND OTHER PRELIMINARY MATTERS AS TO THE NEW DEFENDANTS LISTED IN THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT: 1. The undersigned counsel for each Defendant agrees to waive service of process in the consolidated action and each of the Individual Cases comprising this consolidated action, on behalf of his respective client, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party in this consolidated action is properly named, and without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue. 2. The deadlines for all Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to any complaint in this consolidated action are stayed as provided in all prior stipulations and orders, to the extent that such deadlines presently exist or may come to exist following the execution of this Stipulation. The stay shall be without prejudice to any party's right to seek relief from the stay. 3. The following schedule shall apply to all Defendants: a. Defendants will file any motion(s) to dismiss by December 12, 2017. b. Plaintiffs must file any opposition to motion(s) to dismiss by January 31, 2018. c. Defendants will file their reply (or replies) to Plaintiffs' opposition by March 2, 2018. d. Nothing in this stipulation is intended to curtail the rights under the Federal Rules that might otherwise exist absent this agreement. It is so ordered. The following deadline(s) was terminated: Answer Due Date. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/28/2017) (rjm)
November 22, 2017 Filing 313 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Matthew J. Porpora dated November 22, 2017 re: Proposed Stipulation. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Stipulation)(Porpora, Matthew)
November 20, 2017 Filing 312 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. TD Securities (USA) LLC served on 11/7/2017, answer due 11/28/2017. Service was accepted by Stephanie Ramirez-Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
November 20, 2017 Filing 311 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. BNP Paribas Securities Corp. served on 11/7/2017, answer due 11/28/2017. Service was accepted by Denise Pintus-Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
November 20, 2017 Filing 310 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 11/7/2017, answer due 11/28/2017. Service was accepted by Solomon Kibriye-Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
November 20, 2017 Filing 309 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. RBC Capital Markets LLC served on 11/7/2017, answer due 11/28/2017. Service was accepted by Pablo Kapusta-Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
November 6, 2017 Filing 308 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Services Limited, RBC Capital Markets LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC. (pc)
November 6, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Lawrence Brockett. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Barclays Services Limited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (pc)
November 3, 2017 Filing 307 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Services Limited, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., RBC Capital Markets LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, re: #306 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
November 3, 2017 Filing 306 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #130 Amended Complaint,,,, against BNP Paribas S.A., Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Hiren Gudka, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Bhardeep Singh Heer, Amandeep Singh Manku, Gary McDonald, Merrill Lynch International, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Shailen Pau, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Services Limited, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., RBC Capital Markets LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. Related document: #130 Amended Complaint,,,,.(Brockett, Daniel)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend shall be granted, and the Proposed Amended Complaint shall be filed as the operative pleading in this action. 2. The schedule set by the Court on August 18, 2017 for briefing of the Motion to Amend is vacated. 3. The following schedule will apply: a. Defendants will file any motion(s) to dismiss on or before December 12, 2017. b. Plaintiffs will file any papers in opposition to the motion(s) on or before January 31, 2018. c. Defendants will file any reply papers in further support of the motion(s) on or before March 2, 2018. (Motions due by 12/12/2017. Responses due by 1/31/2018. Replies due by 3/2/2018.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/3/2017) (jwh)
November 3, 2017 Filing 304 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Boston Retirement System, by and through its undersigned counsel, hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action, Boston Retirement System v. Bank of America, N.A., et al., No. 1:16-cv-03711-ER, is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, against defendants Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Credit Argicole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Nomure International plc, Hiren Gudka, Amandeep Singh Manku, Shailen Pau, and Bhardeep Sigh Heer. Boston Retirement System (On behalf of itself and all others similarly situated) terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/3/2017) (mro)
October 10, 2017 Filing 302 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #300 MOTION to Amend/Correct #130 Amended Complaint,,,, Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Class-Action Complaint. . Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
October 10, 2017 Filing 301 DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett in Support re: #300 MOTION to Amend/Correct #130 Amended Complaint,,,, Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Class-Action Complaint.. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint)(Brockett, Daniel)
October 10, 2017 Filing 300 MOTION to Amend/Correct #130 Amended Complaint,,,, Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Class-Action Complaint. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California.(Brockett, Daniel)
October 9, 2017 Filing 299 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen Frances DePizzo on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(DePizzo, Kristen)
October 6, 2017 Filing 303 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
October 5, 2017 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #298 Order on Motion to Seal Document to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (rjm)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #297 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated October 3, 2017. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/5/2017) (rjm)
October 5, 2017 Filing 297 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated October 3, 2017. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California.(Brockett, Daniel)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Priyanka Timblo terminated.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/28/2017) (jwh)
September 20, 2017 Filing 295 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Aidan Synnott dated September 19, 2017 re: N.Y.R.P.C. 1.12. Document filed by Nomura Holdings, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc..(Synnott, Aidan)
August 31, 2017 Filing 294 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Terzaken on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. New Address: Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, 900 G Street, NW, 9th Fl., Washington, DC, USA 20001, (202) 636-5858. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER, 1:16-cv-04151-ER(Terzaken, John)
August 29, 2017 Filing 293 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/18/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 29, 2017 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/18/2017 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 17, 2017 Filing 291 DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett in Support re: #289 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval.. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement With Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Merrill Lynch International, and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, #2 Exhibit 2 Proposed Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement With Deutsche Bank AG and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.)(Brockett, Daniel)
August 17, 2017 Filing 290 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #289 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. . Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
August 17, 2017 Filing 289 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Merrill Lynch International, and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, #2 Attachment 2 Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement for Deutsche Bank AG and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.)(Brockett, Daniel)
August 10, 2017 Filing 288 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie A North on behalf of Nomura International plc. (North, Julie)
August 10, 2017 Filing 287 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: A pre-motion conference will be held before the Hon. Edgardo Ramos, U.S.D.J. on August 18, 2017 at 11:30 am at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007, Courtroom 619. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/18/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos.)(jwh)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #285 Letter Motion for Conference. Mr. Hunt is granted leave to appear by telephone. Mr. Hunt shall call the Court at (212) 805-0169. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
August 7, 2017 Filing 285 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #276 Notice of Hearing, ; Request for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the Pre-Motion Conference Scheduled for August 18, 2017 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam J. Hunt dated August 7, 2017. Document filed by Gary McDonald.(Hunt, Adam)
August 4, 2017 Filing 284 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Judith L. Mogul dated August 4, 2017 re: Response to Pre-Motion Conference Request. Document filed by Shailen Pau.(Mogul, Judith)
August 4, 2017 Filing 283 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Leonore Mogul on behalf of Shailen Pau. (Mogul, Judith)
August 4, 2017 Filing 282 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated August 1, 2017. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Redacted, #2 Exhibit B Redacted, #3 Exhibit C Redacted)(Brockett, Daniel)
August 4, 2017 Filing 281 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated August 4, 2017 re: Response to Interim Co-Lead Counsel's Letter Seeking a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
August 4, 2017 Filing 280 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Wesley R. Powell dated 08/04/2017 re: response to pre-motion conference request (redacted). Document filed by Hiren Gudka.(Powell, Wesley)
August 4, 2017 Filing 279 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bradley S. Lui dated August 4, 2017 re: (Redacted) Response to Letter Seeking a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Gary McDonald.(Lui, Bradley)
August 4, 2017 Filing 278 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David G. Januszewski dated August 4, 2017 re: response to Pre-motion conference request (redacted). Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Januszewski, David)
August 4, 2017 Filing 277 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David H. McGill dated August 4, 2017 re: Response Letter re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(McGill, David)
August 4, 2017 Filing 276 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: A pre-motion conference will be held before the Hon. Edgardo Ramos, U.S.D.J. on August 18, 2017 at 11:30 am at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007, Courtroom 619. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/18/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos.)(jwh)
July 20, 2017 Filing 275 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 18, 2017 Filing 274 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 18, 2017 Filing 273 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 18, 2017 Filing 272 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SEALING ORDER: granting #253 Motion to Seal Document. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/17/2017) (js)
July 17, 2017 Filing 270 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Mintz, Adam)
July 17, 2017 Filing 269 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 14, 2017 Filing 268 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 14, 2017 Filing 267 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 14, 2017 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #265 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. (REDACTED). Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Cohen, Derek)
July 14, 2017 Filing 265 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
July 14, 2017 Filing 264 DECLARATION of Paul M. Eckles (Redacted) in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Description Redacted))(Eckles, Paul)
July 14, 2017 Filing 263 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint. . Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Eckles, Paul)
July 14, 2017 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #261 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku. (McGill, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 261 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(McGill, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 260 DECLARATION of Joann Leon in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Windels, James)
July 14, 2017 Filing 259 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint. [REDACTED]. Document filed by TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Windels, James)
July 14, 2017 Filing 258 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint. . Document filed by RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada. (Willscher, Alexander)
July 14, 2017 Filing 257 DECLARATION of Gary McDonald in Support re: #254 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
July 14, 2017 Filing 256 DECLARATION of Kevin Roberts in Support re: #254 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Roberts' Declaration)(Hunt, Adam)
July 14, 2017 Filing 255 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #254 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
July 14, 2017 Filing 254 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Gary McDonald.(Hunt, Adam)
July 14, 2017 Filing 253 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David G. Januszewski dated July 14, 2017. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 252 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David G. Januszewski dated July 14, 2017. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG.(Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 251 DECLARATION of Paul Serritella in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 250 DECLARATION of John Godfrey in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 249 DECLARATION of Moti Jungreis in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 248 DECLARATION of Andriana Zacharia in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 247 DECLARATION of Daisy Le Vay in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 246 DECLARATION of Yasushi in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 245 DECLARATION of Mark Chambers in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 244 DECLARATION of Nicola Black in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 243 DECLARATION of Gavin A. Francis in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 242 DECLARATION of Gene Kim in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 241 DECLARATION of Olivier Chazareix in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 240 DECLARATION of Pierre Minor in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 239 DECLARATION of Damian M. Bisseker in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 238 DECLARATION of Damian M. Bisseker in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 237 DECLARATION of Daniel Klay in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Albert, Richard)
July 14, 2017 Filing 235 DECLARATION of Daniel Klay in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 234 DECLARATION of Matt Jerman in Support re: #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 233 DECLARATION of Stephanie Gyetvan in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Shailen Pau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Albert, Richard)
July 14, 2017 Filing 231 DECLARATION of Adam Mintz in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint. . Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, Nomura Holdings, Inc., Nomura International plc, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint. . Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura Holdings, Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 228 MOTION to Dismiss the consolidated class action complaint. Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura Holdings, Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Januszewski, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 227 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 14, 2017 Filing 226 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #225 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Hiren Gudka. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Powell, Wesley)
July 14, 2017 Filing 225 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Hiren Gudka. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Powell, Wesley)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting #214 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #217 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #218 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #219 Motion to Seal Document. On July 13, 2017, Defendants Amandeep Singh Manku, Shailen Pau, Bhardeep Singh Heer, and Hiren Gudka, individually, filed letter-motions requesting leave to file memoranda of law in support of their motions to dismiss under seal. Docs. 214, 217, 218 and 219, respectively. The motions are granted.The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, docs. 214, 217, 218 and 219.. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/13/2017) (jar)
July 13, 2017 Filing 223 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Toronto-Dominion Bank.(Windels, James)
July 13, 2017 Filing 222 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Patrick McArdle on behalf of TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (McArdle, Bryan)
July 13, 2017 Filing 221 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Cohen on behalf of TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Cohen, Joel)
July 13, 2017 Filing 220 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H.R. Windels on behalf of TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, The Toronto-Dominion Bank. (Windels, James)
July 13, 2017 Filing 219 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Wesley R. Powell dated 7/13/2017. Document filed by Hiren Gudka.(Powell, Wesley)
July 13, 2017 Filing 218 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Derek A. Cohen dated July 13, 2017. Document filed by Bhardeep Singh Heer.(Cohen, Derek)
July 13, 2017 Filing 217 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard F. Albert dated July 13, 2017. Document filed by Shailen Pau.(Albert, Richard)
July 13, 2017 Filing 216 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clinton Joseph Dockery on behalf of Amandeep Singh Manku. (Dockery, Clinton)
July 13, 2017 Filing 215 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Thomas Leech on behalf of BNP Paribas S.A.. (Leech, Timothy)
July 13, 2017 Filing 214 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David H. McGill dated July 13, 2017. Document filed by Amandeep Singh Manku.(McGill, David)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #205 Motion to Seal Document: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/12/2017) (jwh)
July 12, 2017 Filing 212 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Washer, Herbert)
July 12, 2017 Filing 211 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elai E. Katz on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Katz, Elai)
July 12, 2017 Filing 210 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Shawn Mintz on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Mintz, Adam)
July 12, 2017 Filing 209 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Hall on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Hall, Jason)
July 12, 2017 Filing 208 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Januszewski, David)
July 12, 2017 Filing 207 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David George Januszewski on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Januszewski, David)
July 11, 2017 Filing 206 STIPULATION REGARDING REFERENCES TO TORONTO-DOMINION BANK GROUP: ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs and The Toronto-Dominion Bank shall treat all of Plaintiffs' past references to "Toronto-Dominion Bank Group" in documents filed in this action as references to The Toronto-Dominion Bank for the purposes of litigating this case. For instance, The Toronto-Dominion Bank shall be considered to have been named a defendant for the purposes of the Consolidated Amended Complaint (CAC para. 57-60), as well as being subject to the Stipulation Regarding Service for all purposes. 2. Plaintiffs and The Toronto- Dominion Bank will henceforth refer to The Toronto- Dominion Bank as a named defendant in lieu of "Toronto-Dominion Bank Group" for future filings in this action. 3. The Toronto-Dominion Bank will promptly file a Rule 7.1 corporate disclosure statement with the Court. 4. For the avoidance of doubt, The Toronto- Dominion Bank, TD Bank, N.A., and TD Securities Limited expressly reserve the right to contest whether any party in this action is properly named, and do not waive any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue. 5. For the avoidance of doubt, this Stipulation does not reset or alter any responsive deadlines for any defendant other than The Toronto-Dominion Bank. The deadline for The Toronto-Dominion Bank to answer, move, or otherwise respond to any complaint in this action is stayed as set forth in the Stipulation Regarding Service, and the schedule in Paragraph 3 of the Stipulation Regarding Service shall also apply to The Toronto-Dominion Bank. 6. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/11/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(rj)
July 11, 2017 Filing 205 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bradley S. Lui dated July 11, 2017. Document filed by Gary McDonald.(Lui, Bradley)
July 11, 2017 Filing 204 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #196 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/11/2017) (jwh)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer MacNaughton terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #195 Motion for Benjamin F. Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting #181 Motion for Robert E. Entwisle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #179 Motion for Andrew S. Marovitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #139 Motion for Christopher F. Moriarty to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #178 Motion for Britt M. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
July 10, 2017 Filing 197 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Stipulation Regarding References to Toronto-Dominion Bank Group addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated July 10, 2017. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Stipulation Regarding References to Toronto-Dominion Bank Group))(Brockett, Daniel) Modified on 8/31/2017 (ldi).
July 7, 2017 Filing 196 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David G. Januszewski dated July 7, 2017 re: Leave to file a joint memorandum of law of up to 40 pages. Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Nomura Holdings, Inc., Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited.(Januszewski, David)
July 6, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #195 MOTION for Benjamin F. Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13857554. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
July 5, 2017 Filing 195 MOTION for Benjamin F. Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13857554. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Holt, Benjamin)
June 27, 2017 Filing 194 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SAS Rue La Boetie for Credit Agricole S.A.. Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A..(Fried, Lisa)
June 27, 2017 Filing 193 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Garima Malhotra on behalf of Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A.. (Malhotra, Garima)
June 27, 2017 Filing 192 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Timothy Baumann on behalf of Credit Agricole S.A.. (Baumann, Kevin)
June 27, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Jean Fried on behalf of Credit Agricole S.A.. (Fried, Lisa)
June 15, 2017 Filing 190 NOTICE of FIRM NAME CHANGE. Document filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Spector, Eugene)
June 12, 2017 Filing 189 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. Merrill Lynch International served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. Service was accepted by Craig Corrett, Designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
June 12, 2017 Filing 188 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe" Who refused to give her name, Designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
June 12, 2017 Filing 187 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. Citigroup Global Markets Limited served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe" Who refused to give her name, Designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
June 12, 2017 Filing 186 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe" Who refused to give her name, designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
June 12, 2017 Filing 185 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. Credit Suisse International served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe" who refused to give her name, Designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
June 12, 2017 Filing 184 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. RBC Europe Limited served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe" who refused to give her name, Designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
June 12, 2017 Filing 183 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. TD Securities Limited served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. Service was accepted by Nicola Overton, Designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
June 12, 2017 Filing 182 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. Gary Richard McDonald served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. Service was accepted by Claire McDonald, Wife. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
June 7, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #181 MOTION for Robert E. Entwisle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13751124. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #178 MOTION for Britt M. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13750729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #179 MOTION for Andrew S. Marovitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13751021. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 6, 2017 Filing 181 MOTION for Robert E. Entwisle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13751124. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert E. Entwisle, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Entwisle, Robert)
June 6, 2017 Filing 180 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC USA, Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings PLC, Other Affiliate HSBC North America Holdings, Inc. for HSBC Bank USA, N.A.; Corporate Parent HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings PLC, Other Affiliate HSBC North America Holdings Inc. for HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.; Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings PLC for HSBC Bank plc. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc..(Stein, Daniel)
June 6, 2017 Filing 179 MOTION for Andrew S. Marovitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13751021. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew S. Marovitz, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marovitz, Andrew)
June 6, 2017 Filing 178 MOTION for Britt M. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13750729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Britt Miller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Britt)
June 6, 2017 Filing 177 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Marie Rosa on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Rosa, Jennifer)
June 6, 2017 Filing 176 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Lawrence Stein on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Stein, Daniel)
June 2, 2017 Filing 175 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nomura Holdings, Inc..(Synnott, Aidan)
June 1, 2017 Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Elena Vega-Gonzalez on behalf of BNP Paribas S.A.. (Vega-Gonzalez, Martha)
June 1, 2017 Filing 173 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
June 1, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr on behalf of BNP Paribas S.A.. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
May 25, 2017 Filing 171 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Patrick McArdle on behalf of TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited. (McArdle, Bryan)
May 25, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Cohen on behalf of TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited. (Cohen, Joel)
May 25, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H.R. Windels on behalf of TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited. (Windels, James)
May 25, 2017 Filing 168 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Other Affiliate Toronto Dominion Holdings (U.K.) Limited, Other Affiliate Toronto Dominion Investments B.V. for TD Securities Limited; Corporate Parent The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Other Affiliate TD Bank US Holding Company, Other Affiliate TD Group US Holdings LLC for TD Bank, N.A.. Document filed by TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, Toronto-Dominion Bank Group.(Cohen, Joel)
May 25, 2017 Filing 167 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint served on Toronto-Dominion Bank Group on 5/5/17. Service was accepted by Caroline Vincent, designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
May 25, 2017 Filing 166 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint served on Royal Bank of Canada on 5/5/2017. Service was accepted by Ralph Cuccurullo, designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
May 25, 2017 Filing 165 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. TD Bank, N.A. served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. Service was accepted by Briana Mosley, designated agent. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE, TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND, AND OTHER PRELIMINARY MATTERS AS TO THE NEW DEFENDANTS LISTED IN THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT: 1. The undersigned counsel for each Defendant agrees to waive service of process in the consolidated action and each of the Individual Cases comprising this consolidated action, on behalf of his respective client, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party in this consolidated action is properly named, and without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue. 2. The deadlines for all Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to any complaint in this consolidated action are stayed as provided in all prior stipulations and orders, to the extent that such deadlines presently exist or may come to exist following the execution of this Stipulation. The stay shall be without prejudice to any party's right to seek relief from the stay. 3. The following schedule shall apply to all Defendants: a. Defendants will file any motion(s) to dismiss by July 14, 2017. b. Plaintiffs must file any opposition to motion(s) to dismiss by August 29, 2017. c. Defendants will file their reply (or replies) to Plaintiff's opposition by September 26, 2017. d. Nothing in this stipulation is intended to curtail the rights under the Federal Rules that might otherwise exist absent this agreement. ( Motions due by 7/14/2017., Responses due by 8/29/2017, Replies due by 9/26/2017.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/24/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al., as per Chambers. (mro) Modified on 6/21/2017 (mro).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #160 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The May 25 conference is adjourned. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #155 Motion for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
May 24, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #155 MOTION for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13699741. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
May 23, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke on behalf of RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada. (Clarke, Stephen)
May 23, 2017 Filing 160 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference of May 25, 2017 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Matthew J. Porpora dated May 23, 2017. Document filed by RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Porpora, Matthew)
May 23, 2017 Filing 159 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Europe Limited. Document filed by RBC Europe Limited.(Willscher, Alexander)
May 23, 2017 Filing 158 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Royal Bank of Canada.(Willscher, Alexander)
May 23, 2017 Filing 157 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Porpora on behalf of RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada. (Porpora, Matthew)
May 23, 2017 Filing 156 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander John Willscher on behalf of RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada. (Willscher, Alexander)
May 23, 2017 Filing 155 MOTION for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13699741. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jeremy D. Andersen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Andersen, Jeremy)
May 23, 2017 Filing 154 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Priyanka Timblo on behalf of Nomura Holdings, Inc.. (Timblo, Priyanka)
May 23, 2017 Filing 153 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aidan John Synnott on behalf of Nomura Holdings, Inc.. (Synnott, Aidan)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Bradley S. Lui to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
May 19, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #150 MOTION for Bradley S. Lui to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13687415. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
May 19, 2017 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam James Hunt on behalf of Gary McDonald. (Hunt, Adam)
May 19, 2017 Filing 150 MOTION for Bradley S. Lui to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13687415. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bradley S. Lui in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lui, Bradley)
May 10, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff Irving Firemen's Relief and Retirement Fund. Document filed by Irving Firemen's Relief and Retirement Fund. (Baglanzis, Angela)
May 10, 2017 Filing 148 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs. Document filed by City of Bristol Pension Fund, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER, 1:16-cv-05203-ER, 1:16-cv-06133-ER, 1:16-cv-07991-ER(Lawrence, Amanda)
May 9, 2017 Filing 147 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
May 5, 2017 Filing 146 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. Citigroup Global Markets Inc. served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. Service was accepted by Rodd Corner, Vice President. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
May 5, 2017 Filing 145 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,,, served. Citigroup Inc. served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. Service was accepted by Rodd Corner, Vice President. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
May 5, 2017 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. Citibank N.A. served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. Service was accepted by Jo Heldenbrand, Legal Support Specialist. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
May 5, 2017 Filing 143 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 3, 2017 Filing 142 MOTION for Jennifer MacNaughton to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer MacNaughton)(MacNaughton, Jennifer)
April 26, 2017 Filing 141 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. Service was accepted by Meredith L. Friedman, Senior Vice President, Associate General Counsel. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
April 26, 2017 Filing 140 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. Service was accepted by Meredith L. Friedman, Senior Vice President, Associate General Counsel. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania; Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
April 25, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #139 AMENDED MOTION for Christopher F. Moriarty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
April 25, 2017 Filing 139 AMENDED MOTION for Christopher F. Moriarty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher F. Moriarty, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Moriarty, Christopher)
April 24, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #138 MOTION for Christopher F. Moriarty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13572487. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit/Declaration Missing. Please Read Local Rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
April 21, 2017 Filing 138 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christopher F. Moriarty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13572487. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Moriarty, Christopher) Modified on 4/24/2017 (bcu).
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The April 19 conference is adjourned to May 25, 2017, at 2:30 pm. (Status Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 17, 2017 Filing 136 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David G. Januszewski dated April17, 2017. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Januszewski, David)
April 12, 2017 Filing 135 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNP Paribas S.A., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Gary McDonald, Merrill Lynch International, Nomura Holdings, Inc., RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, Toronto-Dominion Bank Group. (pc)
April 12, 2017 Filing 134 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Nomura International plc. (pc)
April 12, 2017 Filing 133 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Nomura International plc, re: #130 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
April 12, 2017 Filing 132 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrill Lynch International, BNP Paribas S.A., Citigroup Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse International, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Bank plc, Nomura Holdings, Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, RBC Europe Limited, Toronto-Dominion Bank Group, TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, Gary McDonald, re: #130 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
April 12, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. #131 Request for Issuance of Summons,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited and Nomura International plc have already been issued summons' for so those parties will require an Amended Summons with the word "Amended" in front of "Summons in a civil action" on the summons form. The other parties will need to have a separate request for issuance of summons filing. (pc)
April 12, 2017 Filing 131 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Merrill Lynch International, BNP Paribas S.A., Citigroup Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse International, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Bank plc, Nomura Holdings, Inc., Nomura International plc, Royal Bank of Canada, RBC Europe Limited, Toronto-Dominion Bank Group, TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, Gary McDonald, re: #130 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2017 (pc).
April 11, 2017 Filing 130 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against BNP Paribas S.A., Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch International, Nomura Holdings, Inc., Nomura International plc, RBC Europe Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, TD Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Ly nch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Crdit Agricole Corporate and Investment Ban, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, TD Securities Limited, Toronto-Dominion Bank Group, Bank of America, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Gary McDonald with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Boston Retirement System.(Brockett, Daniel) Modified on 4/11/2017 (pc).
April 11, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel Lawrence Brockett to RE-FILE re: Document No. #128 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Gary Richard McDonald is listed on the amended complaint as Gary McDonald; Add Bank of America, Credit Agricole S.A., Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC to CM ECF. Please be sure to include all parties listed in the parties section of the amended complaint in the filing of the amended complaint. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) Modified on 4/11/2017 (pc). Modified on 4/11/2017 (pc).
April 10, 2017 Filing 129 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Merrill Lynch International, BNP Paribas S.A., Citigroup Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse International, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Bank plc, Nomura Holdings, Inc., Nomura International plc, Royal Bank of Canada, RBC Europe Limited, Toronto-Dominion Bank Group, TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, Gary Richard McDonald, re: #128 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel) Modified on 4/11/2017 (pc).
April 10, 2017 Filing 128 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Merrill Lynch International, BNP Paribas S.A., Citigroup Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse International, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Bank plc, Nomura Holdings, Inc., Nomura International plc, Royal Bank of Canada, RBC Europe Limited, Toronto-Dominion Bank Group, TD Bank, N.A., TD Securities Limited, Gary Richard McDonald with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Boston Retirement System.(Brockett, Daniel) Modified on 4/11/2017 (pc).
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #124 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The status conference is adjourned to Wednesday, April 19, 2017 at 3:00 PM. The application is granted. Status Conference set for 4/19/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/10/2017) (mro) Modified on 4/11/2017 (mro).
April 10, 2017 Filing 126 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 10, 2017 Filing 125 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William H. Narwold on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV. (Narwold, William)
April 7, 2017 Filing 124 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett & David W. Mitchell dated April 7, 2017. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California.(Brockett, Daniel)
April 7, 2017 Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 7, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/10/2017. (jwh)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Motion to Seal Document: The application is granted subject to further order of the court. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/7/2017) (jwh)
April 6, 2017 Filing 121 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell dated April 6, 2017. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California.(Brockett, Daniel)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Stephen Matthew Tillery to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Randall Paul Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #56 Motion for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
March 17, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven M Jodlowski on behalf of Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Jodlowski, Steven)
March 17, 2017 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carmen A. Medici on behalf of Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Medici, Carmen)
March 17, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian O. O'Mara on behalf of Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (O'Mara, Brian)
March 17, 2017 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David W. Mitchell on behalf of Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Mitchell, David)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Plaintiffs must file a consolidated amended complaint no later than April 7, 2017. 2. Defendants will file any motion(s) to dismiss by June 12, 2017. 3. Plaintiffs must file any opposition to motion(s) to dismiss by July 25, 2017. 4. Defendants will file their reply (or replies) to Plaintiff's opposition by September 8, 2017. 5. Nothing in this stipulation is intended to curtail the rights under the Federal Rules that might otherwise exist absent this agreement. The March 22 status conference is adjourned to April 11, 2017, at 11:00 am. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2017., Motions due by 6/12/2017., Responses due by 7/25/2017, Replies due by 9/8/2017., Status Conference set for 4/11/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/10/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al (as per Chambers).(mro)
March 7, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Enrico Guarnero on behalf of The Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Guarnero, Matthew)
March 7, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Atara Hirsch on behalf of The Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Hirsch, Atara)
March 7, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Simon Abraham on behalf of The Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Abraham, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell M.Z. Twersky on behalf of The Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Twersky, Mitchell)
March 3, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damaris Hernandez on behalf of Nomura International PLC,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER, 1:16-cv-04603-ER(Hernandez, Damaris)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. On January 13, 2017, the Police Retirement System of St. Louis filed a Complaint under case number 17 Civ. 298 (the "Police Retirement System Action"), along with a Statement of Relatedness to the Lead Action. On January 18, 2017, the Police Retirement System Action was accepted as related to the Lead Action, and the Police Retirement System Action was reassigned to the undersigned. Pursuant to the August 22, 2016 Order, the Police Retirement System Action and the Lead Action are consolidated. All future filings in this case shall be filed in the Lead Action and bear the same caption as that case number. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/1/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al. Entry made in cases as per Chambers. (rjm)
January 19, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Mun-Yin Seck on behalf of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. New Address: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP, 51 Madison Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10010, 212-849-7631. (Seck, Christopher)
January 19, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Priyanka Timblo on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Timblo, Priyanka)
January 18, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Mun-Yin Seck on behalf of Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Seck, Christopher)
January 18, 2017 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashley Christine Burns on behalf of Shailen Pau. (Burns, Ashley)
January 18, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole L Buseman on behalf of Shailen Pau. (Buseman, Nicole)
January 18, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Franklin Albert on behalf of Shailen Pau. (Albert, Richard)
January 17, 2017 Filing 99 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #96 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from All Parties dated January 13, 2017 re: Deadline for Filing Consolidated Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. A status conference will be held on March 22, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. (Status Conference set for 3/22/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/17/2017) (rjm)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DEADLINE FOR FILING CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. To the extent they exist, Defendants' deadlines to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaints ir this action are hereby vacated. 2. Plaintiffs must file a consolidated amended complaint no later than March 17, 2017. 3. Defendants will file any motion(s) to dismiss by May 16, 2017. 4. Plaintiffs must file any opposition to motion(s) to dismiss by June 30, 2017. 5. Defendants will file their reply (or replies) to Plaintiff's opposition by August 14, 2017. 6. Nothing in this stipulation is intended to curtail the rights under the Federal Rules that might otherwise exist absent this agreement. It is so ordered. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2017. Motions due by 5/16/2017. Responses due by 6/30/2017. Replies due by 8/14/2017.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/17/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al., as per Chambers. (rjm)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, upon the annexed declaration of Kristen-Elise F. Brooks, and subject to the approval of the Court, Kristen-Elise F. Brooks hereby withdraws as counsel for defendant Nomura Securities International, Inc. in the above-captioned matters. Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP will continue to represent Nomura Securities International, Inc. in these proceedings. So ordered. Attorney Kristen Frances Brooks terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/17/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al. (rjm)
January 13, 2017 Filing 96 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from All Parties dated January 13, 2017 re: Deadline for Filing Consolidated Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mitchell, David)
January 13, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roger Anson Burlingame on behalf of Amandeep Singh Manku. (Burlingame, Roger)
January 13, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Harrison McGill on behalf of Amandeep Singh Manku. (McGill, David)
January 12, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Doty Hanniford on behalf of Hiren Gudka. (Hanniford, Katherine)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Katherine Doty Hanniford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
January 4, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #91 MOTION for Katherine Doty Hanniford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 4, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION for Katherine Doty Hanniford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hiren Gudka. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificates of Good Standing)(Hanniford, Katherine)
December 23, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #90 MOTION for Katherine Doty Hanniford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit needs to be notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (jcu)
December 23, 2016 Filing 90 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Katherine Doty Hanniford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hiren Gudka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanniford, Katherine) Modified on 12/23/2016 (jcu).
December 23, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #89 MOTION for Katherine Doty Hanniford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13134645. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Attorney Affidavit - information cannot be placed in body of motion;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (jcu)
December 23, 2016 Filing 89 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Katherine Doty Hanniford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13134645. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hiren Gudka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanniford, Katherine) Modified on 12/23/2016 (jcu).
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OPINION AND ORDER re: (47 in 1:16-cv-03711-ER) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, City of Bristol Pension Fund, (42 in 1:16-cv-03711-ER) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. filed by Boston Retirement System, (45 in 1:16-cv-03711-ER) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Berger & Montague, P.C. to Plaintiffs' Executive Committee filed by Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund, (50 in 1:16-cv-03711-ER) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California, Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania. For the aforementioned reasons, Plaintiffs Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania's application to appoint Quinn Emanuel and Robbins Geller as interim co-lead class counsel is GRANTED. All other applications regarding the appointment of counsel are DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, Docs. 42, 45, 47, 50. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/22/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(cla)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. On December 14, 2016, the Irving Firemen's Relief and Retirement Fund filed a Complaint under case number 16 Civ. 9656 (the "Irving Firemen's Action"), along with a Statement of Relatedness to the Lead Action. On December 20, 2016, the Irving Firemen's Action was accepted as related to the Lead Action, and the Irving Firemen's Action was reassigned to the undersigned. Pursuant to the August 22, 2016 Order, the Irving Firemen's Action and the Lead Action are consolidated. All future filings in this case shall be filed in the Lead Action and bear the same caption as that case number. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/21/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al., as per Chambers. (rjm)
December 20, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Madison Eckles on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc.. (Eckles, Paul)
December 20, 2016 Filing 85 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Citigroup Inc.; Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citicorp for Citibank, N.A.; Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.; Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Markets Europe Limited, Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Bahamas Limited, Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Limited. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc..(Kasner, Jay)
December 20, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (Kasner, Jay)
December 16, 2016 Filing 83 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Angela L. Baglanzis dated 12/16/2016 re: pending applications for class leadership. Document filed by Irving Firemen's Relief and Retirement Fund.(Baglanzis, Angela)
December 16, 2016 Filing 82 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Frederic S. Fox dated December 16, 2016 re: pending applications for class leadership. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fox, Frederic)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE, TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND, AND OTHER PRELIMINARY MATTERS AS TO THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS HIREN GUDKA, SHAILEN PAU, AND BHARDEEP SINGH HEER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT: 1. The undersigned counsel for each Individual Defendant agrees to waive service of process in each of the Individual Cases comprising this consolidated action on behalf of his respective client, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party in this consolidated action is properly named, and without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue. 2. The deadlines for all Individual Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to any complaint in this consolidated action is stayed as provided in the Stipulation and Consolidation Order, to the extent that such deadlines presently exist or may come to exist following the execution of this Stipulation but before a response and briefing schedule is set for any consolidated complaint. The stay shall be without prejudice to any party's right to seek relief from the stay. 3. The following schedule, set forth in paragraph 4(b) of the Stipulation and Consolidation Order, shall apply to the Individual Defendants: a. Initial Status Conference: Within 21 days after entry of the Court's Order appointing interim lead counsel, interim lead counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter that (i) sets a proposed deadline for lead counsel to file a consolidated amended complaint, (ii) establishes a proposed briefing schedule for the defendants' motion(s) to dismiss, (iii) requests that the Court schedule a status conference, and (iv) provides the Court with a proposed agenda for the conference. If the parties are unable to agree on whether or not to include a particular item on the agenda, the letter shall note the fact of disagreement without argument of either side's position. 4. If a complaint containing substantially similar allegations as those in this consolidated action is filed in another federal judicial district (a "Non-Consolidated Action"), the Individual Defendants, together with the other parties in this consolidated action, will meet and confer within five business days of such filing regarding possible adjustments to the proceedings contemplated by this Stipulation. If agreement cannot be reached, any party in this consolidated action may apply to this Court for such relief as it deems appropriate. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/13/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv 03711-ER et al. Entry in cases as per Chambers. (rjm)
December 13, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Aron Uris on behalf of City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund. (Uris, Jason)
December 13, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Powers McCahill on behalf of City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund. (McCahill, Matthew)
December 13, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald R. Hall, Jr on behalf of City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund. (Hall, Donald)
December 13, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederic Scott Fox, Sr on behalf of City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund. (Fox, Frederic)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Pursuant to the August 22, 2016 Order, the City of Riviera Beach Action and the Lead Action are consolidated. All future filings in this case shall be filed in the Lead Action and bear the same caption as that case number. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/12/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(ama)
November 28, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wesley Railey Powell on behalf of Hiren Gudka, Hiren Gudka. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(Powell, Wesley)
November 18, 2016 Filing 74 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Gregory S. Asciolla dated 11/18/2016 re: enclosing courtesy copy of Reply Memorandum of Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP in Further Support of Their Application for Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Asciolla, Gregory)
November 17, 2016 Filing 73 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. . Document filed by Boston Retirement System. (Asciolla, Gregory)
November 17, 2016 Filing 72 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. . Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
November 17, 2016 Filing 71 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by City of Bristol Pension Fund, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (Lawrence, Amanda)
November 17, 2016 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. . Document filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Buchman, Michael)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Subsequently, on November 4, 2016, KBC Asset Management NV filed a Complaint under case number, 16 Civ. 8621 (the "KBC Action"), along with a Statement of Relatedness to the Lead Action. On November 10, 2016, the KBC Action was accepted as related to the Lead Action, and the KBC Action was reassigned to the undersigned. Pursuant to the August 22, 2016 Order, the KBC Action and the Lead Action are consolidated. All future filings in this case shall be filed in the Lead Action and bear the same caption as that case number. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(lmb)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: On November 7, 2016, KBC Asset Management NV ("KBC"), on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, filed an action alleging a conspiracy by certain defendants to manipulate the prices of sub-sovereign, supranational, and agency ("SSA") bonds (the "KBC Action"). On the same day, KBC filed an application to appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan as interim co-lead class counsel (the "Application"). Subsequently, on November 14, 2016, the Court entered an Order consolidating the KBC Action with ten other related actions under the caption, "In re SSA Bonds Antitrust Litigation," and case number, 16 Civ. 3711 (the "Lead Action"). The Application is DENIED without prejudice, and KBC is granted leave to re-file its Application in the Lead Action. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/14/2016) (lmb)
November 9, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Undlin on behalf of Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (Undlin, Thomas)
November 8, 2016 Filing 66 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Dell'Angelo dated November 8, 2016 re: enclosing courtesy copy of Response in Support of Motion to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and to Appoint Berger & Montague, P.C. to Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document filed by Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund.(Dell'Angelo, Michael)
November 8, 2016 Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Gregory S. Asciolla dated 11/08/2016 re: enclosing courtesy copy of Response of Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP to Competing Applications for Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Asciolla, Gregory)
November 7, 2016 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. . Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Coughlin, Patrick)
November 7, 2016 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . in Further Support. Document filed by City of Bristol Pension Fund, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (Lawrence, Amanda)
November 7, 2016 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (42 in 1:16-cv-03711-ER) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel., (45 in 1:16-cv-03711-ER) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Berger & Montague, P.C. to Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. . Document filed by Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(Dell'Angelo, Michael)
November 7, 2016 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Response of Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP to Competing Applications for Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Boston Retirement System. (Asciolla, Gregory)
November 7, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Coughlin on behalf of Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Coughlin, Patrick)
November 1, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #59 MOTION for Stephen Matthew Tillery to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12937082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 1, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION for Stephen Matthew Tillery to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12937082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IL and MO Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Text of [Proposed] Order)(Tillery, Stephen)
October 31, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #58 MOTION for Randall Paul Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12933193. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #57 MOTION for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12933095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #56 MOTION for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12932948. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 31, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION for Randall Paul Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12933193. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IL and MO Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Text of [Proposed] Order)(Ewing, Randall)
October 31, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12933095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IL Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Text of [Proposed] Order)(Bell, Chad)
October 31, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12932948. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IL Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Text of [Proposed] Order)(Zelcs, George)
October 28, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren A Bowman on behalf of Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Bowman, Lauren)
October 28, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Derek A. Cohen on behalf of Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Cohen, Derek)
October 28, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Joseph Harrington on behalf of Bhardeep Singh Heer. (Harrington, William)
October 25, 2016 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. . Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California. (Brockett, Daniel)
October 25, 2016 Filing 50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California.(Brockett, Daniel)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. On October 12, 2016, the Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System filed a Complaint under case number, 16 Civ. 7991 (the "Louisiana Municipal Action"), along with a Statement of Relatedness to the Lead Action. On October 18, 2016, the Louisiana Municipal Action was accepted as related to the Lead Action, and the Louisiana Municipal Action was reassigned to the undersigned. Pursuant to the August 22, 2016 Order, the Louisiana Municipal Action and the Lead Action are consolidated. All future filings in this case shall be filed in the Lead Action and bear the same caption as that case number. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/24/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al. Entry in specified cases as per Chambers. (rjm)
October 24, 2016 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Gregory S. Asciolla dated 10/24/2016 re: enclosing courtesy copies of Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Asciolla, Gregory)
October 21, 2016 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by City of Bristol Pension Fund, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Lawrence, Amanda)
October 21, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by City of Bristol Pension Fund, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System.(Lawrence, Amanda)
October 21, 2016 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Berger & Montague, P.C. to Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. and in Support of Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
October 21, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Berger & Montague, P.C. to Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document filed by Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund.(Dell'Angelo, Michael)
October 21, 2016 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Irving Scher in Support re: #42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Asciolla, Gregory)
October 21, 2016 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Gregory S. Asciolla in Support re: #42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Asciolla, Gregory)
October 21, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Asciolla, Gregory)
October 18, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Louis Fox Burke on behalf of City of Bristol Pension Fund, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (Burke, Louis)
October 17, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter W. Noss on behalf of City of Bristol Pension Fund, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER, 1:16-cv-05203-ER, 1:16-cv-06133-ER(Noss, Walter)
October 14, 2016 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nomura Holding America Inc. for Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc.. Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(Synnott, Aidan)
October 14, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen Frances Brooks on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(Brooks, Kristen)
October 14, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aidan John Synnott on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(Synnott, Aidan)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE, PROPOSED CONSOLIDATION, TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND, AND OTHER PRELIMINARY MATTERS: The undersigned counsel for each Defendant agrees to waive service of process in each of the individual cases comprising the Pending SSA Litigation on behalf of its respective client(s), expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party in the Pending SSA Litigation is properly named, and without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue. The deadlines for all defendants named in the complaints to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaints in each of the cases comprising the Pending SSA Litigation are stayed as provided in this Stipulation, to the extent that such deadlines presently exist or may come to exist following the execution of this Stipulation but before the cases comprising the Pending SSA Litigation are formally consolidated and a response and briefing schedule is set for any consolidated complaint. The stay shall be without prejudice to any party's right to seek relief from the stay. Subject to the Court's approval, the nine individual actions comprising the Pending SSA litigation are consolidated under the docket number 16-cv-03711 and captioned as "In re SSA Bonds Antitrust Litigation." (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/22/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03711-ER et al.(kko)
July 6, 2016 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nomura Europe Holdings plc for Nomura International plc. Document filed by Nomura International plc.(Buretta, John)
July 6, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John D Buretta on behalf of Nomura International plc. (Buretta, John)
June 28, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jana Steenholdt on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Steenholdt, Jana)
June 17, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Jason Resetarits on behalf of Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America, N.A.. (Resetarits, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Franklin Schwed on behalf of Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America, N.A.. (Schwed, Richard)
June 17, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America, N.A.. (Hakki, Adam)
June 17, 2016 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation for Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited. Document filed by Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited.(Hakki, Adam)
June 17, 2016 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Hakki, Adam)
June 17, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Roberti on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Roberti, John)
June 16, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Thomas Fitzpatrick on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Fitzpatrick, Brian)
June 16, 2016 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Terzaken, John)
June 16, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Terzaken on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Terzaken, John)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Motion for John Francis Terzaken, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/15/2016) (kko)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion to Stay time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/13/2016) (kko)
June 10, 2016 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION to Stay time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from the parties dated June 10, 2016. Document filed by Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America, N.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Nomura International plc.(Januszewski, David)
June 10, 2016 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Credit Agricole S.A. for Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. Document filed by Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank.(Fried, Lisa)
June 10, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Timothy Baumann on behalf of Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Baumann, Kevin)
June 10, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Jean Fried on behalf of Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank. (Fried, Lisa)
June 10, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for John Francis Terzaken, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 10, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION for John Francis Terzaken, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Terzaken, John)
June 9, 2016 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse AG. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG.(Washer, Herbert)
June 9, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Credit Suisse AG. (Washer, Herbert)
June 9, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheila Chithran Ramesh on behalf of Credit Suisse AG. (Ramesh, Sheila)
June 9, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elai E. Katz on behalf of Credit Suisse AG. (Katz, Elai)
June 9, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Hall on behalf of Credit Suisse AG. (Hall, Jason)
June 9, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David George Januszewski on behalf of Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
June 9, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #10 MOTION for John Francis Terzaken, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12396367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
June 8, 2016 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John Francis Terzaken, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12396367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Terzaken, John) Modified on 6/9/2016 (bcu).
June 6, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Karin Elizabeth Garvey on behalf of Boston Retirement System. New Address: Labaton Sucharow LLP, 140 Broadway, New York, New York, United States of America 10005-1108, 212-907-0700. (Garvey, Karin)
May 20, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karin Elizabeth Garvey on behalf of Boston Retirement System. (Garvey, Karin)
May 20, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Garrett J. Bradley on behalf of Boston Retirement System. (Bradley, Garrett)
May 20, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Perez on behalf of Boston Retirement System. (Perez, Matthew)
May 20, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay L. Himes on behalf of Boston Retirement System. (Himes, Jay)
May 19, 2016 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America, N.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Hiren Gudka, Bhardeep Singh Heer, Amandeep Singh Manku, Nomura International plc, Shailen Pau. (dgo) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/19/2016) (dgo). (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/19/2016) (dgo).
May 19, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (dgo)
May 19, 2016 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. (dgo)
May 19, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dgo)
May 19, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Scott Asciolla. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (dgo)
May 18, 2016 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America, N.A.; Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited; Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank; Credit Suisse AG; Deutsche Bank AG; Nomura International plc; Hiren Gudka; Amandeep Singh Manku; Shailen Pau; Bhardeep Singh Heer, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Boston Retirement System. (Asciolla, Gregory)
May 18, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Asciolla, Gregory)
May 18, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Bank of America, N.A., Credit Agricole Corporate & Investment Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Hiren Gudka, Bhardeep Singh Heer, Amandeep Singh Manku, Nomura International plc, Shailen Pau. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12317290)Document filed by Boston Retirement System.(Asciolla, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re SSA Bonds Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Retirement System
Represented By: Karin Elizabeth Garvey
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Gregory Scott Asciolla
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Perez
Represented By: Garrett J. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Ashley M Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Firemen's Relief and Retirement Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Ashley M Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McDonald
Represented By: Bradley S. Lui
Represented By: Adam James Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings plc
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Stein
Represented By: Britt Marie Miller
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: Robert Entwisle
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Aidan John Synnott
Represented By: Priyanka Timblo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Canada
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Alexander John Willscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhardeep Singh Heer
Represented By: Lauren A Bowman
Represented By: William Joseph Harrington
Represented By: Derek A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Antonelli
Represented By: Clayton Scott Hataway
Represented By: Barry G. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Richard McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Services Limited
Represented By: Anthony Antonelli
Represented By: Clayton Scott Hataway
Represented By: Barry G. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities Limited
Represented By: James H.R. Windels
Represented By: Bryan Patrick McArdle
Represented By: Joel M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shailen Pau
Represented By: Richard Franklin Albert
Represented By: Judith Leonore Mogul
Represented By: Nicole L Buseman
Represented By: Christopher Blake Harwood
Represented By: Ashley Christine Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Stein
Represented By: Britt Marie Miller
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: Robert Entwisle
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Brian Thomas Fitzpatrick
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Jana Steenholdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: James H.R. Windels
Represented By: Bryan Patrick McArdle
Represented By: Joel M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura International plc
Represented By: John D Buretta
Represented By: Julie A North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas S.A.
Represented By: Martha Elena Vega-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Thomas Leech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amandeep Singh Manku
Represented By: Roger Anson Burlingame
Represented By: David Harrison McGill
Represented By: Clinton Joseph Dockery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd.
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Europe Limited
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Alexander John Willscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Toronto-Dominion Bank
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Morrison
Represented By: James H.R. Windels
Represented By: Bryan Patrick McArdle
Represented By: Joel M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Securities Limited
Represented By: Anthony Antonelli
Represented By: Clayton Scott Hataway
Represented By: Barry G. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Stein
Represented By: Britt Marie Miller
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: Robert Entwisle
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole S.A.
Represented By: Lisa Jean Fried
Represented By: Garima Malhotra
Represented By: Benjamin Frederick Holt
Represented By: Kevin Timothy Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Morrison
Represented By: James H.R. Windels
Represented By: Bryan Patrick McArdle
Represented By: Joel M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Martha Elena Vega-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Thomas Leech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank
Represented By: Lisa Jean Fried
Represented By: Garima Malhotra
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Represented By: Benjamin Frederick Holt
Represented By: Kevin Timothy Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse International
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Alexander John Willscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Elai E. Katz
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank plc
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Stein
Represented By: Britt Marie Miller
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: Robert Entwisle
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank plc
Represented By: Anthony Antonelli
Represented By: Clayton Scott Hataway
Represented By: Barry G. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiren Gudka
Represented By: Wesley Railey Powell
Represented By: Katherine Doty Hanniford
Represented By: Adam Castiel Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Limited
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Represented By: Laura M. King
Represented By: Kristen-Elise Frances DePizzo
Represented By: Aidan John Synnott
Represented By: Priyanka Timblo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bank Of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: The Police Retirement System of St. Louis
Represented By: Mitchell M.Z. Twersky
Represented By: Jeffrey Simon Abraham
Represented By: Atara Hirsch
Represented By: Matthew Enrico Guarnero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: City of Atlanta Firefighters Pension Fund
Represented By: Benjamin Galdston
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Represented By: Lucas E. Gilmore
Represented By: Brandon Marsh
Represented By: Scott Allan Martin
Represented By: David R. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin
Represented By: Amanda F. Lawrence
Represented By: Chad Emerson Bell
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: Thomas Lepri
Represented By: Steig Olson
Represented By: Christopher Mun-Yin Seck
Represented By: Sascha Nicholas Rand
Represented By: Carmen A. Medici
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: Thomas Lepri
Represented By: Steig Olson
Represented By: Christopher Mun-Yin Seck
Represented By: Sascha Nicholas Rand
Represented By: Carmen A. Medici
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: Ashley M Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Louis Fox Burke
Represented By: Amanda F. Lawrence
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Jason Aron Uris
Represented By: Donald R. Hall, Jr
Represented By: Matthew Powers McCahill
Represented By: Frederic Scott Fox, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Inter-Local Pension Fund Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Heidi M. Silton
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Represented By: Robert Mark Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund
Represented By: Merrill G Davidoff
Represented By: Michael C. Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Jennifer MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension Relief Fund
Represented By: Benjamin Galdston
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Represented By: Lucas E. Gilmore
Represented By: Brandon Marsh
Represented By: Scott Allan Martin
Represented By: David R. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Pension Fund
Represented By: Scott Allan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: City of Bristol Pension Fund
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Louis Fox Burke
Represented By: Amanda F. Lawrence
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: KBC Asset Management NV
Represented By: Christopher F. Moriarty
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?